12/12/1942 |
To Service |
8301 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
01/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
8301 |
DAR |
Darlington |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/06/1943 |
To Service |
8302 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
30/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
21/09/1943 |
To Service |
8303 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
21/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
8303 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
22/11/1943 |
To Service |
8304 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
22/12/1943 |
To Service |
8305 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
09/01/1944 |
Reallocation |
8304 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
14/01/1944 |
Reallocation |
8305 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/02/1944 |
To Service |
8306 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
04/03/1944 |
Reallocation |
8303 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
|
17/03/1944 |
To Service |
8307 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
24/03/1944 |
Reallocation |
8306 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/04/1944 |
To Service |
8308 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/05/1944 |
To Service |
8309 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
15/05/1944 |
Reallocation |
8308 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
03/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
DAR |
Darlington |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
19/06/1944 |
To Service |
8310 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
25/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
25/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
8304 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
06/07/1944 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
13/07/1944 |
Reallocation |
8304 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
03/08/1944 |
Reallocation |
8307 |
DAR |
Darlington |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
18/08/1944 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
11/12/1944 |
Reallocation |
8301 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
11/12/1944 |
Reallocation |
8307 |
GOR |
Gorton |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
03/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
03/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
05/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
8307 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
11/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/02/1945 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
28/02/1945 |
Reallocation |
8307 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
03/03/1945 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/03/1945 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
28/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
8304 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
8301 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
02/11/1945 |
Reallocation |
8305 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
03/02/1946 |
Reallocation |
8306 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
16/04/1946 |
To Service |
1040 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
26/04/1946 |
To Service |
1041 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
04/05/1946 |
To Service |
1042 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
14/05/1946 |
To Service |
1043 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/05/1946 |
To Service |
1044 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/05/1946 |
To Service |
1045 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/05/1946 |
To Service |
1046 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
03/06/1946 |
To Service |
1047 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
06/06/1946 |
To Service |
1048 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/06/1946 |
To Service |
1049 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/06/1946 |
To Service |
1050 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/06/1946 |
To Service |
1051 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/06/1946 |
To Service |
1052 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
27/06/1946 |
To Service |
1053 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
02/07/1946 |
To Service |
1054 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
04/07/1946 |
To Service |
1055 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
04/07/1946 |
To Service |
1056 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
08/07/1946 |
To Service |
1057 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
10/07/1946 |
To Service |
1058 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
19/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1041 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
21/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1000 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1040 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
22/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1042 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1001 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1003 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
24/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1004 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
24/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1005 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/07/1946 |
To Service |
1059 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
01/08/1946 |
To Service |
1060 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
03/08/1946 |
To Service |
1061 |
|
NEW |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
|
07/08/1946 |
To Service |
1062 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
10/08/1946 |
To Service |
1063 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
1006 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/08/1946 |
To Service |
1064 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
15/08/1946 |
To Service |
1065 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
17/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
1008 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
STR |
Stratford |
|
17/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
1052 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
19/08/1946 |
To Service |
1066 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
22/08/1946 |
To Service |
1067 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
23/08/1946 |
To Service |
1068 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
26/08/1946 |
To Service |
1069 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
28/08/1946 |
To Service |
1070 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
29/08/1946 |
To Service |
1071 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
30/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
1071 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
06/09/1946 |
To Service |
1073 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
07/09/1946 |
To Service |
1072 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
07/09/1946 |
To Service |
1074 |
|
NEW |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
16/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
1070 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
1073 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/09/1946 |
To Service |
1075 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/09/1946 |
To Service |
1076 |
|
NEW |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
18/09/1946 |
To Service |
1077 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
1072 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
23/09/1946 |
To Service |
1078 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
24/09/1946 |
To Service |
1079 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/09/1946 |
To Service |
1080 |
|
NEW |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
03/10/1946 |
To Service |
1081 |
|
NEW |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
04/10/1946 |
To Service |
1082 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
07/10/1946 |
To Service |
1083 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/10/1946 |
To Service |
1084 |
|
NEW |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
11/10/1946 |
To Service |
1085 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/10/1946 |
To Service |
1086 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/10/1946 |
To Service |
1087 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
18/10/1946 |
To Service |
1088 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
19/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
1000 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
19/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
1005 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
22/10/1946 |
To Service |
1089 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/10/1946 |
To Service |
1090 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/10/1946 |
To Service |
1091 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/10/1946 |
To Service |
1092 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
02/11/1946 |
To Service |
1010 |
|
NEW |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
04/11/1946 |
To Service |
1093 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/11/1946 |
To Service |
1094 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/11/1946 |
To Service |
1095 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/11/1946 |
To Service |
1096 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
15/11/1946 |
To Service |
1097 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
19/11/1946 |
To Service |
1098 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
21/11/1946 |
To Service |
1099 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
26/11/1946 |
To Service |
1100 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
28/11/1946 |
To Service |
1101 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
30/11/1946 |
To Service |
1011 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
30/11/1946 |
To Service |
1012 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
02/12/1946 |
To Service |
1102 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
04/12/1946 |
To Service |
1103 |
|
NEW |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
06/12/1946 |
To Service |
1104 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
1001 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
07/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
1005 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
09/12/1946 |
To Service |
1105 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
11/12/1946 |
To Service |
1106 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
13/12/1946 |
To Service |
1107 |
|
NEW |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
14/12/1946 |
To Service |
1013 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
16/12/1946 |
To Service |
1108 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
18/12/1946 |
To Service |
1109 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
20/12/1946 |
To Service |
1110 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/12/1946 |
To Service |
1014 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/12/1946 |
To Service |
1111 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
27/12/1946 |
To Service |
1112 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
31/12/1946 |
To Service |
1113 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
04/01/1947 |
To Service |
1015 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
08/01/1947 |
To Service |
1114 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
10/01/1947 |
To Service |
1115 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
13/01/1947 |
To Service |
1116 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
15/01/1947 |
To Service |
1117 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
16/01/1947 |
To Service |
1016 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
17/01/1947 |
To Service |
1118 |
|
NEW |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
20/01/1947 |
To Service |
1119 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
22/01/1947 |
To Service |
1120 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
24/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
1004 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/01/1947 |
To Service |
1121 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
25/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
1005 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
25/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
1006 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
25/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
1008 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/01/1947 |
To Service |
1017 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
28/01/1947 |
To Service |
1122 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/01/1947 |
To Service |
1123 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
31/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
1003 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
STR |
Stratford |
|
04/02/1947 |
To Service |
1018 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
04/02/1947 |
To Service |
1124 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/02/1947 |
To Service |
1125 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
07/02/1947 |
To Service |
1126 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
08/02/1947 |
Reallocation |
1003 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
12/02/1947 |
To Service |
1127 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/02/1947 |
To Service |
1128 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
18/02/1947 |
To Service |
1129 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
24/02/1947 |
To Service |
1019 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
24/02/1947 |
To Service |
1130 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
25/02/1947 |
To Service |
1131 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/02/1947 |
To Service |
1132 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
28/02/1947 |
To Service |
1020 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
28/02/1947 |
To Service |
1133 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
02/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
1078 |
GOR |
Gorton |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
02/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
1085 |
GOR |
Gorton |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
04/03/1947 |
To Service |
1134 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
09/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
1085 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
10/03/1947 |
To Service |
1135 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/03/1947 |
To Service |
1021 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
18/03/1947 |
To Service |
1136 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/03/1947 |
To Service |
1137 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/03/1947 |
To Service |
1022 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
31/03/1947 |
To Service |
1138 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/04/1947 |
To Service |
1023 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
01/04/1947 |
To Service |
1139 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
06/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1138 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
11/04/1947 |
To Service |
1140 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/04/1947 |
To Service |
1141 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/04/1947 |
To Service |
1024 |
|
NEW |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
14/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1064 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
15/04/1947 |
To Service |
1142 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/04/1947 |
To Service |
1143 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/04/1947 |
To Service |
1144 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/04/1947 |
To Service |
1145 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/04/1947 |
To Service |
1025 |
|
NEW |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
22/04/1947 |
To Service |
1146 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
22/04/1947 |
To Service |
1147 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
23/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1140 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1141 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1143 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
25/04/1947 |
To Service |
1148 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
25/04/1947 |
To Service |
1149 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1063 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1066 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1087 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1088 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
1142 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/04/1947 |
To Service |
1026 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
29/04/1947 |
To Service |
1150 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/04/1947 |
To Service |
1151 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/05/1947 |
To Service |
1152 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/05/1947 |
To Service |
1153 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1070 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NWE |
New England |
|
04/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1073 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NWE |
New England |
|
04/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1128 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
06/05/1947 |
To Service |
1154 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/05/1947 |
To Service |
1155 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
08/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1108 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
08/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1144 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
08/05/1947 |
To Service |
1190 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1075 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NWE |
New England |
|
09/05/1947 |
To Service |
1156 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/05/1947 |
To Service |
1157 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/05/1947 |
To Service |
1027 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
13/05/1947 |
To Service |
1191 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/05/1947 |
To Service |
1158 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/05/1947 |
To Service |
1159 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1109 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
15/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1145 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
16/05/1947 |
To Service |
1160 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/05/1947 |
To Service |
1161 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/05/1947 |
To Service |
1192 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
17/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1079 |
GOR |
Gorton |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
17/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1082 |
GOR |
Gorton |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
18/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1077 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
19/05/1947 |
To Service |
1193 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/05/1947 |
To Service |
1162 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/05/1947 |
To Service |
1194 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
23/05/1947 |
To Service |
1163 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/05/1947 |
To Service |
1164 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
24/05/1947 |
To Service |
1195 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
27/05/1947 |
To Service |
1196 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/05/1947 |
To Service |
1165 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/05/1947 |
To Service |
1197 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
30/05/1947 |
To Service |
1028 |
|
NEW |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
30/05/1947 |
To Service |
1166 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/05/1947 |
To Service |
1167 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1004 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
31/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1135 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
31/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
1149 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1086 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1110 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1111 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1130 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1150 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1151 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
02/06/1947 |
To Service |
1198 |
|
NEW |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1122 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1123 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1131 |
GOR |
Gorton |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1152 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1153 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
04/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1154 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
04/06/1947 |
To Service |
1168 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/06/1947 |
To Service |
1199 |
|
NEW |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
06/06/1947 |
To Service |
1169 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/06/1947 |
To Service |
1170 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1192 |
DON |
Doncaster |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
06/06/1947 |
To Service |
1200 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
07/06/1947 |
To Service |
1029 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
09/06/1947 |
To Service |
1172 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/06/1947 |
To Service |
1173 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/06/1947 |
To Service |
1201 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/06/1947 |
To Service |
1171 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/06/1947 |
To Service |
1202 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
13/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1172 |
GOR |
Gorton |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
13/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1173 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
14/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1165 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1083 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1136 |
GOR |
Gorton |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1137 |
GOR |
Gorton |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1138 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1139 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1140 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1141 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1142 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1143 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
NWE |
New England |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1144 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
NWE |
New England |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1166 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1167 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1168 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
17/06/1947 |
To Service |
1176 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
17/06/1947 |
To Service |
1203 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
18/06/1947 |
To Service |
1174 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
18/06/1947 |
To Service |
1175 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/06/1947 |
To Service |
1204 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
23/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1163 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
23/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1164 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
23/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
1169 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
23/06/1947 |
To Service |
1178 |
|
NEW |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
24/06/1947 |
To Service |
1205 |
|
NEW |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
25/06/1947 |
To Service |
1177 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/06/1947 |
To Service |
1030 |
|
NEW |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
27/06/1947 |
To Service |
1179 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/06/1947 |
To Service |
1207 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
30/06/1947 |
To Service |
1180 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/07/1947 |
To Service |
1209 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
02/07/1947 |
To Service |
1181 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/07/1947 |
To Service |
1206 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
03/07/1947 |
To Service |
1210 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
04/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
1171 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
04/07/1947 |
To Service |
1182 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
08/07/1947 |
To Service |
1208 |
|
NEW |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
08/07/1947 |
To Service |
1212 |
|
NEW |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
09/07/1947 |
To Service |
1183 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/07/1947 |
To Service |
1184 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/07/1947 |
To Service |
1185 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/07/1947 |
To Service |
1031 |
|
NEW |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
10/07/1947 |
To Service |
1213 |
|
NEW |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
14/07/1947 |
To Service |
1211 |
|
NEW |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
15/07/1947 |
To Service |
1216 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
16/07/1947 |
To Service |
1186 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/07/1947 |
To Service |
1214 |
|
NEW |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
19/07/1947 |
To Service |
1215 |
|
NEW |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
20/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
1170 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
20/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
1174 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
20/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
1175 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
20/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
1177 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
29/07/1947 |
To Service |
1187 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/07/1947 |
To Service |
1188 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/08/1947 |
To Service |
1218 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
06/08/1947 |
To Service |
1220 |
|
NEW |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
07/08/1947 |
To Service |
1032 |
|
NEW |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
08/08/1947 |
To Service |
1189 |
|
NEW |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
09/08/1947 |
To Service |
1219 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
10/08/1947 |
Reallocation |
1179 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/08/1947 |
Reallocation |
1183 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
11/08/1947 |
To Service |
1217 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
11/08/1947 |
To Service |
1222 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
15/08/1947 |
To Service |
1224 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
16/08/1947 |
To Service |
1221 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
21/08/1947 |
To Service |
1226 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/08/1947 |
To Service |
1227 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
24/08/1947 |
Reallocation |
1181 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/08/1947 |
To Service |
1223 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
28/08/1947 |
To Service |
1225 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
28/08/1947 |
To Service |
1228 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
29/08/1947 |
To Service |
1033 |
|
NEW |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
02/09/1947 |
To Service |
1229 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
04/09/1947 |
To Service |
1230 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
1004 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
07/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
1104 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
09/09/1947 |
To Service |
1231 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
10/09/1947 |
To Service |
1232 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/09/1947 |
To Service |
1233 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/09/1947 |
To Service |
1234 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/09/1947 |
To Service |
1235 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
1033 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
21/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
1229 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
21/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
1230 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
24/09/1947 |
To Service |
1237 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
26/09/1947 |
To Service |
1236 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
26/09/1947 |
To Service |
1238 |
|
NEW |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
02/10/1947 |
To Service |
1239 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
03/10/1947 |
To Service |
1034 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
06/10/1947 |
To Service |
1240 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
08/10/1947 |
To Service |
1241 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
10/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
1221 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
10/10/1947 |
To Service |
1242 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
14/10/1947 |
To Service |
1243 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
20/10/1947 |
To Service |
1244 |
|
NEW |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
20/10/1947 |
To Service |
1245 |
|
NEW |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
22/10/1947 |
To Service |
1246 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
24/10/1947 |
To Service |
1247 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
27/10/1947 |
To Service |
1248 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
31/10/1947 |
To Service |
1035 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
31/10/1947 |
To Service |
1249 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
31/10/1947 |
To Service |
1250 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1185 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1186 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1187 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1188 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1223 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1225 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1227 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1228 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1231 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
04/11/1947 |
To Service |
1251 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
05/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1174 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
06/11/1947 |
To Service |
1252 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
10/11/1947 |
To Service |
1253 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/11/1947 |
To Service |
1254 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/11/1947 |
To Service |
1255 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
16/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1253 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
17/11/1947 |
To Service |
1256 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
19/11/1947 |
To Service |
1257 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
20/11/1947 |
To Service |
1036 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1251 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
21/11/1947 |
To Service |
1258 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
24/11/1947 |
To Service |
1259 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
26/11/1947 |
To Service |
1260 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
28/11/1947 |
To Service |
1037 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/11/1947 |
To Service |
1261 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
29/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
1034 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
01/12/1947 |
To Service |
1262 |
|
NEW |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
03/12/1947 |
To Service |
1263 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
05/12/1947 |
To Service |
1038 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
05/12/1947 |
To Service |
1264 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/12/1947 |
To Service |
1265 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
10/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
1254 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/12/1947 |
To Service |
1266 |
|
NEW |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
12/12/1947 |
To Service |
1039 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
12/12/1947 |
To Service |
1267 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
16/12/1947 |
To Service |
1268 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
1264 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/12/1947 |
To Service |
1269 |
|
NEW |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
25/12/1947 |
To Service |
1270 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
26/12/1947 |
To Service |
1271 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/12/1947 |
To Service |
1272 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/12/1947 |
To Service |
1273 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
02/01/1948 |
To Service |
1274 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
1144 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
1144 |
GRA |
Grantham |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
12/01/1948 |
To Service |
1275 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
14/01/1948 |
To Service |
1276 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
16/01/1948 |
To Service |
1277 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
18/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
1226 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
19/01/1948 |
To Service |
1278 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
21/01/1948 |
To Service |
1279 |
|
NEW |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
23/01/1948 |
To Service |
1280 |
|
NEW |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
1226 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
25/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
1254 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
27/01/1948 |
To Service |
1281 |
|
NEW |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
28/01/1948 |
To Service |
1282 |
|
NEW |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
01/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1000 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1001 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1104 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
02/02/1948 |
To Service |
1283 |
|
NEW |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
05/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1094 |
DON |
Doncaster |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
06/02/1948 |
To Service |
1284 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1000 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1001 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1104 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
08/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1232 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
09/02/1948 |
To Service |
1285 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
11/02/1948 |
To Service |
1286 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
12/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1209 |
NWE |
New England |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
13/02/1948 |
To Service |
1287 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1094 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1209 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1232 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
16/02/1948 |
To Service |
1288 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
18/02/1948 |
To Service |
1289 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
19/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
20/02/1948 |
To Service |
1290 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
KX |
Kings Cross |
|
24/02/1948 |
To Service |
1291 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
25/02/1948 |
To Service |
1292 |
|
NEW |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
27/02/1948 |
To Service |
1293 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
01/03/1948 |
To Service |
1294 |
|
NEW |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
03/03/1948 |
To Service |
1295 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
06/03/1948 |
To Service |
1296 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
10/03/1948 |
To Service |
1297 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/03/1948 |
To Service |
1298 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/03/1948 |
To Service |
1299 |
|
NEW |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1029 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
15/03/1948 |
To Service |
1300 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
17/03/1948 |
To Service |
1301 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
21/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1209 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
22/03/1948 |
To Service |
1302 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
26/03/1948 |
To Service |
1303 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1209 |
ANN |
Annesley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
28/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1072 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
28/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
1292 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
31/03/1948 |
To Service |
61304 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
01/04/1948 |
To Service |
61305 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
03/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
1072 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
03/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
1292 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
05/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
1035 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
05/04/1948 |
To Service |
61306 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
07/04/1948 |
To Service |
61307 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
09/04/1948 |
To Service |
61308 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
1035 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
15/04/1948 |
To Service |
61309 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
19/04/1948 |
To Service |
61310 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
21/04/1948 |
To Service |
61311 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/04/1948 |
To Service |
61312 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
27/04/1948 |
To Service |
61313 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/04/1948 |
To Service |
61314 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/04/1948 |
To Service |
61315 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/05/1948 |
To Service |
61316 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/05/1948 |
To Service |
61317 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/05/1948 |
To Service |
61318 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
14/05/1948 |
To Service |
61319 |
|
NEW |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61060 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1068 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61071 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
YK |
York (North) |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61074 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1080 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61084 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
YK |
York (North) |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1239 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1240 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61304 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61305 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61306 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
18/05/1948 |
To Service |
61320 |
|
NEW |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
20/05/1948 |
To Service |
61321 |
|
NEW |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61060 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1068 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61071 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61074 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1080 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61084 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1239 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1240 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61304 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61305 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
61306 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
23/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1216 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
23/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1239 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
YK |
York (North) |
|
25/05/1948 |
To Service |
61322 |
|
NEW |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
27/05/1948 |
To Service |
61323 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1216 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1239 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1017 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
30/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
1018 |
YK |
York (North) |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
01/06/1948 |
To Service |
61324 |
|
NEW |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
03/06/1948 |
To Service |
61325 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1017 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1018 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
08/06/1948 |
To Service |
61326 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/06/1948 |
To Service |
61327 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/06/1948 |
To Service |
61328 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
17/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1096 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
MAR |
March |
|
17/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1098 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
MAR |
March |
|
17/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1228 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
18/06/1948 |
To Service |
61329 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1096 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1098 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1228 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
23/06/1948 |
To Service |
61330 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
25/06/1948 |
To Service |
61331 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
28/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
1007 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
30/06/1948 |
To Service |
61332 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
02/07/1948 |
To Service |
61333 |
|
NEW |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
1007 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
07/07/1948 |
To Service |
61334 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
61332 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
15/07/1948 |
To Service |
61335 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
61332 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
25/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
1007 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
25/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
1291 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
25/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
61292 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
31/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
1007 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
31/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
1291 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
05/08/1948 |
To Service |
61336 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/08/1948 |
To Service |
61337 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
15/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
15/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
20/08/1948 |
To Service |
61338 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
21/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
21/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
22/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
1037 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
28/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
1037 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
1025 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
1176 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
STR |
Stratford |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
STR |
Stratford |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
61337 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
1025 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
1176 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
61337 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
08/09/1948 |
To Service |
61339 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
26/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
1288 |
DAR |
Darlington |
YK |
York (North) |
|
26/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1288 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
03/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61313 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61314 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61315 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
09/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61313 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
09/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61314 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
09/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61315 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
09/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61316 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
13/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61316 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1025 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1096 |
MAR |
March |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
MAR |
March |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1176 |
STM |
St Margarets |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
1228 |
MAR |
March |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
STM |
St Margarets |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
31/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
61337 |
STM |
St Margarets |
YK |
York (North) |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1025 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1096 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1176 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1228 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61337 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1021 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1022 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1224 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1021 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1022 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1224 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61087 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1303 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
15/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61087 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1303 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
21/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
21/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1282 |
CLK |
Colwick |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
22/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61092 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61092 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
1282 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
27/11/1948 |
To Service |
61340 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
18/12/1948 |
To Service |
61341 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
26/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
01/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
02/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
DAR |
Darlington |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
03/01/1949 |
To Service |
61342 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
16/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61341 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
23/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
1029 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
1029 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
1114 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
NEA |
Neasden |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/02/1949 |
To Service |
61343 |
|
NEW |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
05/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
1034 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61086 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61087 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
06/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
1291 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
1034 |
SKN |
Stockton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61086 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61087 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
1291 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61128 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61128 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
27/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
05/03/1949 |
To Service |
61344 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
06/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
NEA |
Neasden |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
13/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
13/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
13/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61108 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
13/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
NEA |
Neasden |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61108 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
1300 |
MAR |
March |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
1300 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
03/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
08/04/1949 |
To Service |
61345 |
|
NEW |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
10/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
61267 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
10/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
1268 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
10/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
1297 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
61267 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
1268 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
1297 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
30/04/1949 |
To Service |
61346 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
15/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
15/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61282 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61132 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
16/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
16/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
16/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61343 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
16/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61345 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61132 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61282 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61343 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
61345 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
21/05/1949 |
To Service |
61347 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
29/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
1225 |
GOR |
Gorton |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
05/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
1225 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/06/1949 |
To Service |
61348 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
12/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
MAR |
March |
|
12/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
MAR |
March |
|
12/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
NWE |
New England |
MAR |
March |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
MAR |
March |
MAR |
March |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
1066 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61317 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61327 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
ANN |
Annesley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61317 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
61327 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
02/07/1949 |
To Service |
61349 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
03/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
03/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
GOR |
Gorton |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
03/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61146 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
03/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61147 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61146 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61147 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
DAR |
Darlington |
YK |
York (North) |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
1038 |
DAR |
Darlington |
YK |
York (North) |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
1038 |
YK |
York (North) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
28/07/1949 |
To Service |
61350 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
31/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
06/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
07/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/08/1949 |
To Service |
61351 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
21/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61282 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/08/1949 |
To Service |
61352 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61282 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
28/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61064 |
KEI |
Keith |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
28/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
28/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61064 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
06/09/1949 |
To Service |
61353 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
11/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61148 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
11/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
14/09/1949 |
To Service |
61354 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61148 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
DON |
Doncaster |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
KEI |
Keith |
KEI |
Keith |
|
21/09/1949 |
To Service |
61355 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
25/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61067 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
28/09/1949 |
To Service |
61356 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
29/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
GRA |
Grantham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61067 |
64A |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
02/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
GOR |
Gorton |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
02/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
1297 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
1297 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
10/10/1949 |
To Service |
61357 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
18/10/1949 |
To Service |
61358 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
20/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
MAR |
March |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
20/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
MAR |
March |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
20/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
MAR |
March |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
26/10/1949 |
To Service |
61359 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
CLK |
Colwick |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
16/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
18/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61144 |
GRA |
Grantham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
64A |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
20/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
20/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
20/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
20/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61341 |
PKD |
Parkhead |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
61341 |
64A |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
01/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
KEI |
Keith |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
02/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
1036 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
64A |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
07/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61175 |
GRA |
Grantham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61175 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
11/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
GRA |
Grantham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
KEI |
Keith |
KEI |
Keith |
|
18/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
GRA |
Grantham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
01/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
09/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61346 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
09/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
KEI |
Keith |
|
22/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
29/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
61148 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
05/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
05/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
NWE |
New England |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
05/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61263 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
61263 |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
63A |
Perth South |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61092 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
DAR |
Darlington |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
12/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
DAR |
Darlington |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
13/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61263 |
63A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61092 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61263 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
22/03/1950 |
To Service |
61360 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
24/03/1950 |
To Service |
61361 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
26/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
STR |
Stratford |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
26/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
30/03/1950 |
To Service |
61400 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
31/03/1950 |
To Service |
61362 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
01/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
05/04/1950 |
To Service |
61363 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
12/04/1950 |
To Service |
61401 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
17/04/1950 |
Condemned |
61057 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1950 |
To Service |
61364 |
|
NEW |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/04/1950 |
To Service |
61365 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
24/04/1950 |
To Service |
61366 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/04/1950 |
To Service |
61402 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
27/04/1950 |
To Service |
61403 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
28/04/1950 |
To Service |
61367 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
32B |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
DON |
Doncaster |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
GOR |
Gorton |
30A |
Stratford |
|
04/05/1950 |
To Service |
61404 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
05/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61368 |
|
|
38A |
Colwick |
|
07/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
07/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
32B |
Ipswich |
35A |
New England |
|
10/05/1950 |
To Service |
61405 |
|
NEW |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
16/05/1950 |
To Service |
61369 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/05/1950 |
To Service |
61406 |
|
NEW |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
61406 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
08/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61125 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
10/06/1950 |
To Service |
61407 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
13/06/1950 |
To Service |
61408 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
15/06/1950 |
To Service |
61409 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61190 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61191 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61190 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
61191 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
GOR |
Gorton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
61402 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
61403 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
16/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
61125 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
11/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
39A |
Gorton |
|
11/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
61326 |
GOR |
Gorton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
24/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
24/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
61052 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
24/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
61326 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
39A |
Gorton |
|
04/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
KEI |
Keith |
|
Rugby Testing Station |
|
08/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
STR |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
08/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61226 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
10/10/1950 |
To Service |
61370 |
|
NEW |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
15/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
15/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
31B |
March |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
24/10/1950 |
To Service |
61371 |
|
NEW |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
12/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61404 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
19/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52B |
Heaton |
|
19/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52B |
Heaton |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
52B |
Heaton |
52B |
Heaton |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
52B |
Heaton |
52B |
Heaton |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
61404 |
64B |
Haymarket |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
03/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61126 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
08/12/1950 |
To Service |
61372 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
10/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61226 |
31B |
March |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
21/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61346 |
61C |
|
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
21/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
61C |
|
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
26/12/1950 |
To Service |
61373 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61126 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61226 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61346 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
01/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
52B |
Heaton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
01/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
52B |
Heaton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
14/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61132 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61132 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
12/02/1951 |
To Service |
61374 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
18/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
61310 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
23/02/1951 |
To Service |
61375 |
|
NEW |
40B |
Immingham |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61067 |
STM |
St Margarets |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
STM |
St Margarets |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
40A |
Lincoln |
35A |
New England |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
40B |
Immingham |
35A |
New England |
|
06/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
NWE |
New England |
35B |
Grantham |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
18/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61067 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
18/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
35A |
New England |
31B |
March |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
35A |
New England |
31B |
March |
|
12/04/1951 |
To Service |
61376 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
31B |
March |
31B |
March |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
31B |
March |
31B |
March |
|
15/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
STM |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
15/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61356 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
61356 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
01/05/1951 |
To Service |
61377 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
06/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
12/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
35B |
Grantham |
35B |
Grantham |
|
12/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
13/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
13/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
13/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
13/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61368 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
25/05/1951 |
To Service |
61378 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61368 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/06/1951 |
To Service |
61379 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
17/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
17/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
31B |
March |
40B |
Immingham |
|
23/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
23/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
40A |
Lincoln |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
01/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
08/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61379 |
38A |
Colwick |
40B |
Immingham |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61379 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
29/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
04/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
19/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
22/08/1951 |
To Service |
61380 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
28/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
|
|
61C |
Keith |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
61C |
Keith |
61C |
Keith |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
52A |
Gateshead |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61049 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61053 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
50A |
York (North) |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
64A |
St Margarets |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61339 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
61C |
Keith |
51A |
Darlington |
|
07/09/1951 |
To Service |
61381 |
|
NEW |
38A |
Colwick |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61049 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61053 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61339 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
35B |
Grantham |
35A |
New England |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
18/09/1951 |
To Service |
61382 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
61C |
Keith |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61356 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
CLX |
|
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
61376 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
03/10/1951 |
To Service |
61383 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
61C |
Keith |
61C |
Keith |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61356 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61376 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61147 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/10/1951 |
To Service |
61384 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
30A |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61144 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
STR |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61175 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
STR |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61191 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
40A |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61375 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
25/10/1951 |
To Service |
61385 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61098 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61130 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61144 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61175 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61191 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61375 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
28/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
37A |
Ardsley |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
GOR |
Gorton |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/10/1951 |
To Service |
61386 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
02/11/1951 |
To Service |
61387 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61147 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
DAR |
Darlington |
51E |
Stockton |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61275 |
DAR |
Darlington |
51E |
Stockton |
|
09/11/1951 |
To Service |
61388 |
|
NEW |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
10/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
51E |
Stockton |
51E |
Stockton |
|
10/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61275 |
51E |
Stockton |
51E |
Stockton |
|
11/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
11/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61129 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
17/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
17/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
17/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61129 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
18/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
24/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
25/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
25/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
30/11/1951 |
To Service |
61389 |
|
NEW |
35A |
New England |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
09/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
38A |
Colwick |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
09/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
38A |
Colwick |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/12/1951 |
To Service |
61390 |
|
NEW |
35A |
New England |
|
13/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
37A |
Ardsley |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
16/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
37A |
Ardsley |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
37A |
Ardsley |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
18/12/1951 |
To Service |
61391 |
|
NEW |
35A |
New England |
|
23/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
37A |
Ardsley |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
27/12/1951 |
To Service |
61392 |
|
NEW |
35A |
New England |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
30/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
30/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
61376 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
06/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61310 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
06/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61387 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
11/01/1952 |
To Service |
61393 |
|
NEW |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
23/01/1952 |
To Service |
61394 |
|
NEW |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61310 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61376 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61387 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61086 |
DON |
Doncaster |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
39A |
Gorton |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61258 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
27/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
01/02/1952 |
To Service |
61395 |
|
NEW |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/02/1952 |
To Service |
61396 |
|
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61086 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61110 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
39A |
Gorton |
39A |
Gorton |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61258 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
24/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
61174 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
13/03/1952 |
To Service |
61397 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
61174 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/03/1952 |
To Service |
61398 |
|
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
38A |
Colwick |
|
06/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
38A |
Colwick |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
38A |
Colwick |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
20/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
38A |
Colwick |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
22/04/1952 |
To Service |
61399 |
|
NEW |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
NWE |
New England |
31B |
March |
|
27/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
31B |
March |
31B |
March |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
34E |
Neasden |
|
18/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61136 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
34E |
Neasden |
|
18/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
61140 |
NEA |
Neasden |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
08/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
31B |
March |
35A |
New England |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
34E |
Neasden |
34E |
Neasden |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61136 |
34E |
Neasden |
34E |
Neasden |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61140 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
22/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
30A |
Stratford |
34E |
Neasden |
|
22/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
STR |
Stratford |
34E |
Neasden |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
32B |
Ipswich |
38A |
Colwick |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61129 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
30A |
Stratford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61225 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61258 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
29/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
61390 |
35A |
New England |
38A |
Colwick |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
DAR |
Darlington |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
DAR |
Darlington |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
34E |
Neasden |
34E |
Neasden |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
34E |
Neasden |
34E |
Neasden |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
50A |
York (North) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61129 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61258 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61390 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
27/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
37A |
Ardsley |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
10/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
07/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
52A |
Gateshead |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
52A |
Gateshead |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
CLK |
Colwick |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
40A |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
22/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
37A |
Ardsley |
30A |
Stratford |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61078 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
05/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61114 |
GOR |
Gorton |
30A |
Stratford |
|
05/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61157 |
GOR |
Gorton |
30A |
Stratford |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61369 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
30A |
Stratford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
30A |
Stratford |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61157 |
30A |
Stratford |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61378 |
38A |
Colwick |
30A |
Stratford |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
30A |
Stratford |
|
19/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
61399 |
36A |
Doncaster |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61114 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61157 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61369 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61378 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61399 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
02/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
07/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
14/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61139 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
35A |
New England |
|
14/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
35A |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
21/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61137 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61266 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
21/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61137 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61139 |
35A |
New England |
35A |
New England |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61266 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61113 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
35A |
New England |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
35A |
New England |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
35A |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
61331 |
NWE |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
11/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
61099 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
11/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
61105 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
25/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
61380 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
28/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
01/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
15/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
15/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
61186 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
22/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
08/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
61139 |
35A |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
08/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
35A |
New England |
|
29/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
61202 |
IMM |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
17/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
YK |
York (North) |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
17/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
DON |
Doncaster |
35A |
New England |
|
17/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61273 |
DAR |
Darlington |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
17/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
DAR |
Darlington |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
18/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
18/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
18/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
STR |
Stratford |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
19/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
38A |
Colwick |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
19/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
38A |
Colwick |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
19/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
30A |
Stratford |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
19/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
50A |
York (North) |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
20/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
65A |
Eastfield |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
20/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61148 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
20/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61219 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
20/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64A |
St Margarets |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
23/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
23/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
30A |
Stratford |
|
23/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
27/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
38A |
Colwick |
|
07/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61044 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
50A |
York (North) |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61133 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61148 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61167 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61168 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61219 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61273 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
51A |
Darlington |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
51A |
Darlington |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
50A |
York (North) |
|
25/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
Neasden |
|
19/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
51A |
Darlington |
52B |
Heaton |
|
19/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
61176 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
19/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
61224 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
26/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
23/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
SKN |
Stockton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61099 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61108 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61184 |
GOR |
Gorton |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61191 |
30A |
Stratford |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61246 |
DON |
Doncaster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61294 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61330 |
NWE |
New England |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61332 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61407 |
40B |
Immingham |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
37A |
Ardsley |
35A |
New England |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
37A |
Ardsley |
35A |
New England |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
32B |
Ipswich |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61204 |
IMM |
Immingham |
35A |
New England |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
STR |
Stratford |
35A |
New England |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61239 |
YK |
York (North) |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61271 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61290 |
SKN |
Stockton |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61364 |
40A |
Lincoln |
35A |
New England |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
40A |
Lincoln |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
61282 |
STR |
Stratford |
35A |
New England |
|
04/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36B |
Mexborough |
|
04/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
61167 |
40B |
Immingham |
36B |
Mexborough |
|
11/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
61295 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
18/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
61158 |
GOR |
Gorton |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
25/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
35A |
New England |
|
01/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
61365 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
15/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
YK |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
06/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
17/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
61014 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
17/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
TWO |
|
52A |
Gateshead |
|
31/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
14/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
21/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
21/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
28/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
28/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61114 |
30A |
Stratford |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61249 |
DON |
Doncaster |
30A |
Stratford |
|
28/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
19/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
64F |
Bathgate |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
09/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61294 |
65A |
Eastfield |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
09/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
65A |
Eastfield |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61075 |
NWE |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61155 |
GOR |
Gorton |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61156 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61159 |
GOR |
Gorton |
40B |
Immingham |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
GOR |
Gorton |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
39A |
Gorton |
40B |
Immingham |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61228 |
GOR |
Gorton |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
20/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
GOR |
Gorton |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
20/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
39A |
Gorton |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
27/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
27/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61265 |
DON |
Doncaster |
39A |
Gorton |
|
27/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
61326 |
39A |
Gorton |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
04/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
61028 |
NEA |
Neasden |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
61163 |
NEA |
Neasden |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
61C |
Keith |
|
25/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
34E |
Neasden |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
05/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
61113 |
35A |
New England |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
61279 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
61317 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
61355 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
03/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
38A |
Colwick |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
24/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
24/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
61390 |
38A |
Colwick |
40B |
Immingham |
|
07/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61275 |
51E |
Stockton |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
07/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
07/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
11/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61398 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
21/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61028 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
34E |
Neasden |
|
21/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61279 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
28/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
61155 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
05/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
34E |
Neasden |
|
05/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61113 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
35A |
New England |
|
06/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61330 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61092 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61163 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61248 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
19/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
26/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
61187 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
34E |
Neasden |
|
09/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
03/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61357 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
06/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
13/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61364 |
35A |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
20/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
20/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
61403 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
28/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
61357 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
08/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
61248 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
61064 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61180 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
35A |
New England |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
35A |
New England |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
35A |
New England |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
35A |
New England |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
61291 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
07/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
61270 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61176 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61224 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61291 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
STR |
Stratford |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
40A |
Lincoln |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61225 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61270 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
23/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
61371 |
40A |
Lincoln |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
07/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
61117 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
20/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
27/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
18/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
37A |
Ardsley |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
65A |
Eastfield |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
27/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
61172 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
29/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
30/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
61246 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
61407 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
17/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
61398 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
19/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
61248 |
40B |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
19/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
61281 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
20/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
61330 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
35A |
New England |
30A |
Stratford |
|
25/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
01/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
34E |
Neasden |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
61320 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
16/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61286 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
23/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61013 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
SKN |
Stockton |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61214 |
SKN |
Stockton |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
23/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
61320 |
25A |
Wakefield |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
35A |
New England |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
35A |
New England |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61066 |
ANN |
Annesley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
38A |
Colwick |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61302 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
35A |
New England |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
40A |
Lincoln |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
31A |
Cambridge |
35A |
New England |
|
14/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61209 |
ANN |
Annesley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
15/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61401 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
21/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
ANN |
Annesley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
31A |
Cambridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
31A |
Cambridge |
38A |
Colwick |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61177 |
31A |
Cambridge |
38A |
Colwick |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61285 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
STR |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
11/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
11/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61141 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61185 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
15/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
61088 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
02/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
Neasden |
|
09/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
10/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
61376 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61000 |
STR |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61360 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61361 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
30A |
Stratford |
30E |
Colchester |
|
13/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61289 |
DAR |
Darlington |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
20/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
34E |
Neasden |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
20/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61083 |
NEA |
Neasden |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
27/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
34E |
Neasden |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
28/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
61C |
Keith |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
03/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
10/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
10/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61100 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
10/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61238 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
10/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61164 |
NEA |
Neasden |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
38A |
Colwick |
38B |
Annesley |
|
17/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61279 |
40A |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
18/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
61C |
Keith |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
18/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
61C |
|
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
24/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61060 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
35B |
Grantham |
|
24/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61074 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
35B |
Grantham |
|
25/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61323 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
25/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
03/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
03/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
17/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
Neasden |
|
21/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
61260 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
21/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
61261 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
02/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61330 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
02/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61358 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
04/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
65A |
Eastfield |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
05/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61016 |
YK |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
05/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
YK |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
05/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
38A |
Colwick |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
05/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
38A |
Colwick |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
19/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
34E |
Neasden |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
36A |
Doncaster |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61204 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61267 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61268 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61271 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61296 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
24/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
31/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
19/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
19/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
61351 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
22/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
61349 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
01/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61186 |
38A |
Colwick |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61256 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61267 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61320 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61382 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61383 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
30E |
Colchester |
30A |
Stratford |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61152 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61156 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
61314 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
38A |
Colwick |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61060 |
35B |
Grantham |
35A |
New England |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61066 |
38A |
Colwick |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61074 |
35B |
Grantham |
35A |
New England |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
38A |
Colwick |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61389 |
35A |
New England |
35B |
Grantham |
|
06/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
35A |
New England |
35B |
Grantham |
|
20/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61203 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
20/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
20/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
35A |
New England |
|
21/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
28/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
61344 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
10/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
61009 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
10/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
17/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
61143 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
17/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
61152 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
17/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
61299 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
08/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
38A |
Colwick |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
08/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
09/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
61219 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
15/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
61080 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
61382 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
61383 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
26/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
38B |
Annesley |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
17/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
61246 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
02/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
02/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
02/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
61135 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
13/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
13/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
40A |
Lincoln |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
38A |
Colwick |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61281 |
40B |
Immingham |
38A |
Colwick |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61015 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
50A |
York (North) |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51A |
Darlington |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51A |
Darlington |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61037 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61049 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61115 |
YK |
York (North) |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61319 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61321 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
61339 |
50A |
York (North) |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
61105 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
10/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
61279 |
30A |
Stratford |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
25/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
61072 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
07/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61188 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
40E |
Colwick |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61065 |
52A |
Gateshead |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61066 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61256 |
52A |
Gateshead |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61267 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61319 |
56A |
Wakefield |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61321 |
56A |
Wakefield |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61382 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61387 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
21/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61066 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
21/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
05/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
51A |
Darlington |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
12/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61235 |
STR |
Stratford |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
19/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61174 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
19/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61179 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
19/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
26/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
38A |
Colwick |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
61213 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
30/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
51A |
Darlington |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61047 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61083 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31F |
Spital Bridge |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61137 |
36A |
Doncaster |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61300 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
30E |
Colchester |
|
14/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30E |
Colchester |
|
19/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61404 |
64B |
Haymarket |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
24/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61355 |
64B |
Haymarket |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61069 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61086 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50A |
York (North) |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
26/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61261 |
64B |
Haymarket |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
26/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
64B |
Haymarket |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
STR |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61121 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61135 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61249 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61362 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61378 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61399 |
30A |
Stratford |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61028 |
34E |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
15/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61255 |
DAR |
Darlington |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
|
22/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
22/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
22/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
22/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
12/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61333 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
15/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
22/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
22/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
24/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61343 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
61404 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
12/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
12/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61236 |
STR |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
12/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
12/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61360 |
30E |
Colchester |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
19/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61200 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
19/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
61272 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
03/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
31A |
Cambridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61164 |
30A |
Stratford |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
03/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61234 |
STR |
Stratford |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61083 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61111 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
36B |
Mexborough |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61119 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61233 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61249 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61161 |
GOR |
Gorton |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
61265 |
39A |
Gorton |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61010 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61014 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61032 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61034 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61037 |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
50E |
Scarborough |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61080 |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61090 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61093 |
DON |
Doncaster |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61119 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61139 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
51E |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
DAR |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61215 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61220 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61233 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61238 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61251 |
KX |
Kings Cross |
34F |
Grantham |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61255 |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61273 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61276 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61289 |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61291 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61303 |
SKN |
Stockton |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61304 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
50E |
Scarborough |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61305 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
50E |
Scarborough |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61306 |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61319 |
51A |
Darlington |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
35A |
New England |
34F |
Grantham |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
30E |
Colchester |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
61387 |
51A |
Darlington |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
02/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61027 |
NWE |
New England |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
02/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61028 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
19/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
20/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61265 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61161 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
26/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
61054 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
61094 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
61201 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
30/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
61198 |
56F |
Low Moor |
50A |
York (North) |
|
30/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
50A |
York (North) |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61032 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
20/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
27/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
61136 |
34E |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
34E |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61187 |
34E |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61298 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61369 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
04/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61228 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
04/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61279 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
11/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61314 |
31A |
Cambridge |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
18/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61270 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
25/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61135 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
25/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
30E |
Colchester |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61000 |
30E |
Colchester |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61052 |
32B |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61062 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61100 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61240 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61252 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61253 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61254 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61257 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
30E |
Colchester |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61360 |
31A |
Cambridge |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
04/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61106 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61049 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61055 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
15/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
31B |
March |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61136 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
32B |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61058 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61120 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61213 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61248 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61284 |
IMM |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61001 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61059 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
29/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
61409 |
40B |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61142 |
IMM |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61185 |
38A |
Colwick |
40B |
Immingham |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61300 |
30E |
Colchester |
30A |
Stratford |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
30E |
Colchester |
30A |
Stratford |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61361 |
30E |
Colchester |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
06/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
30E |
Colchester |
30A |
Stratford |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61114 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61300 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61390 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
20/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
61000 |
31B |
March |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
03/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61235 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40B |
Immingham |
|
03/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
41D |
Canklow |
|
03/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61187 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
14D |
Neasden |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
31B |
March |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61252 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61253 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61254 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61300 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
10/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
11/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61132 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61225 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
17/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61228 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
31B |
March |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
24/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
34E |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61059 |
31B |
March |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61096 |
31F |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61156 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61204 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61323 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
61399 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
61006 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
14/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
61317 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
28/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
06/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
40B |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
06/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
13/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
20/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
20/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
20/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61305 |
50E |
Scarborough |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
20/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61317 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61058 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
50E |
Scarborough |
51A |
Darlington |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
40E |
Colwick |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61200 |
34E |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
40B |
Immingham |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61304 |
50E |
Scarborough |
51A |
Darlington |
|
27/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
61331 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
03/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61054 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
03/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
51A |
Darlington |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
03/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
03/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61403 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
10/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
13/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61401 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
18/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
18/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61260 |
64B |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
18/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61262 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
18/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
61277 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
15/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
61090 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
15/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
61316 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
64A |
St Margarets |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
30/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
61294 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61000 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40E |
Colwick |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61025 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61046 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61048 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61155 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61247 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40E |
Colwick |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61266 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61285 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40E |
Colwick |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61390 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40E |
Colwick |
|
30/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61007 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
61244 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
03/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
61059 |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
31B |
March |
|
15/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56D |
Gorton |
|
17/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
56D |
Mirfield |
9G |
Gorton |
|
17/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
61012 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
17/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
61161 |
9G |
Gorton |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
07/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
61091 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
34E |
New England |
|
07/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
61097 |
HITL |
Hitchin (GNR) |
34E |
New England |
|
05/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61146 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61018 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61020 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61021 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61037 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51A |
Darlington |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
56B |
Ardsley |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61049 |
56D |
Mirfield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61054 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61062 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61203 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61240 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
30/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
06/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
61085 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
09/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
61075 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
09/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
61174 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
16/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
61175 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
23/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
61153 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
02/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61146 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61046 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61048 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61060 |
35A |
New England |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61066 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61113 |
35A |
New England |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61171 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61182 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61236 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61252 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61253 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61254 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
20/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
31A |
Cambridge |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
30A |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
30A |
Stratford |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61227 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
40E |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61264 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
40E |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61336 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
40E |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61361 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
40E |
Colwick |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
27/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
61373 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61149 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61226 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61311 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61362 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61378 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
03/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61401 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
03/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61403 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61016 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61035 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61216 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61237 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
30/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
61340 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
05/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
61218 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
05/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
61259 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
19/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
61156 |
31B |
March |
30A |
Stratford |
|
23/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
41D |
Canklow |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
61152 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
41D |
Canklow |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
30/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
61237 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
11/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
11/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
51A |
Darlington |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
11/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61046 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
11/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61048 |
31B |
March |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61324 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
18/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
STR |
Stratford |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61345 |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61346 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61350 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61352 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
63B.1 |
Mallaig |
|
19/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
61400 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
31/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
61265 |
9G |
Gorton |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
9G |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
13/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61016 |
52A |
Gateshead |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61100 |
52A |
Gateshead |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61161 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
23/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
61324 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61014 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61040 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61153 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61161 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61166 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61238 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61252 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61253 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61283 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
41D |
Canklow |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61335 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
24/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61233 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
24/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61252 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
24/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
61377 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
01/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
61007 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
01/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
61244 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
01/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
61260 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
16/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
61340 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
16/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
61401 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
12/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
61340 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
13/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
61077 |
NEA |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
13/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
61187 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
13/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
34E |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
27/11/1961 |
Condemned |
61085 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
31B |
March |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
03/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
31B |
March |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
31/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
61083 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
31/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
61093 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1962 |
Condemned |
61201 |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
61011 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
9G |
Gorton |
|
18/01/1962 |
Condemned |
61222 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1962 |
Condemned |
61368 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61043 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61045 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61054 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61205 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61254 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
04/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
61280 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
05/02/1962 |
Condemned |
61376 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1962 |
Condemned |
61265 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61255 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61303 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
05/03/1962 |
Condemned |
61000 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61165 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
11/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61316 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
12/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61192 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
15/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
14D |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
15/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61136 |
14D |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61063 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61187 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61206 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61380 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
18/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61137 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
21/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
61077 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
21/03/1962 |
Condemned |
61217 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
21/03/1962 |
Condemned |
61290 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1962 |
Condemned |
61063 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1962 |
Condemned |
61380 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1962 |
Condemned |
61046 |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
61298 |
26B |
Agecroft |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
14/05/1962 |
Condemned |
61077 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
16/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
61350 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
17/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
9G |
Gorton |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
28/05/1962 |
Condemned |
61137 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
03/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
03/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61075 |
34E |
New England |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
03/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
03/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61364 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
34E |
New England |
|
12/06/1962 |
Condemned |
61247 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
14/06/1962 |
Condemned |
61298 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61048 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61237 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61239 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61286 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61287 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61300 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61301 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
31A |
Cambridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61371 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
61395 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
61079 |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
01/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61160 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
09/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61043 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61170 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61183 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61064 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
19/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61381 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
26B |
Agecroft |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
26B |
Agecroft |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61369 |
26B |
Agecroft |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
23/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61203 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61005 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
29/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
61045 |
31B |
March |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61231 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1962 |
Condemned |
61271 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
50A |
York (North) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/08/1962 |
Condemned |
61379 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61064 |
65A |
Eastfield |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61352 |
63B.1 |
Mallaig |
9G |
Gorton |
|
13/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61117 |
65C |
Parkhead |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/08/1962 |
Condemned |
61234 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61344 |
65C |
Parkhead |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
61404 |
65C |
Parkhead |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
27/08/1962 |
Condemned |
61239 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61187 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61206 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61090 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61216 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61241 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
10/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61091 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61164 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61391 |
35A |
New England |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61005 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61009 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61027 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61036 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61045 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61047 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61048 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61052 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61054 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61055 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61060 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61066 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61096 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61111 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61114 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61119 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61122 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34E |
New England |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61124 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61127 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61130 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61139 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61149 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61150 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61151 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61154 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61156 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61163 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61166 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61171 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61182 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61193 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61202 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61209 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61226 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61228 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61235 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61236 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61250 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34E |
New England |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61253 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61254 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61266 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61280 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61282 |
35A |
New England |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61283 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61284 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61286 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61287 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61301 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61311 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61314 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34E |
New England |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61317 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61335 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61362 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61363 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61364 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61371 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61373 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61375 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61377 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61378 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61405 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61076 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
23/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61149 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61219 |
64B |
Haymarket |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
23/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
23/09/1962 |
Condemned |
61363 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
61233 |
98W |
|
31B |
March |
|
01/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61395 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61028 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61078 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61192 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61064 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61136 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1962 |
Condemned |
61352 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
61329 |
31B |
March |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61381 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61011 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61106 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61025 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52B |
Heaton |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
04/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61056 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
40B |
Immingham |
|
05/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61186 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61211 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61324 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61332 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61369 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
9G |
Gorton |
|
19/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61015 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61100 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61230 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61269 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
9G |
Gorton |
|
19/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61296 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61034 |
51L |
Thornaby |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61061 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61068 |
50A |
York (North) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
51L |
Thornaby |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61215 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61218 |
51L |
Thornaby |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61240 |
50A |
York (North) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61259 |
51L |
Thornaby |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61268 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61291 |
50A |
York (North) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61295 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61297 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61339 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
25/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
50A |
York (North) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
61020 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61025 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61033 |
40A |
Lincoln |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61155 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61241 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61327 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61399 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61086 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61004 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61104 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61112 |
41D |
Canklow |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61155 |
41D |
Canklow |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61169 |
41D |
Canklow |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61257 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
10/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61267 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61366 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61274 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
23/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61387 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
26/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61346 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61007 |
64A |
St Margarets |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61067 |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61082 |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61108 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61112 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61128 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61184 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61200 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61246 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61260 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61316 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61332 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61333 |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
61408 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
30/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
30/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61365 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61197 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61243 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61261 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61355 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
61396 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
20/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61095 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
20/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61181 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
31B |
March |
|
21/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61007 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67C |
Ayr |
|
21/01/1963 |
Condemned |
61383 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
27/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
10/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
61035 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
11/02/1963 |
Condemned |
61071 |
YK |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
52B |
Heaton |
|
24/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
52B |
Heaton |
|
24/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
25/02/1963 |
Condemned |
61053 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
03/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61152 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
40B |
Immingham |
|
10/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
10/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61197 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61243 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61261 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61355 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61396 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
24/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61220 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
25/03/1963 |
Condemned |
61033 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
31/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61024 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61131 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
07/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
61044 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
07/05/1963 |
Condemned |
61273 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
12/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
61275 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
50A |
York (North) |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61035 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61038 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61075 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61094 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61105 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61153 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61176 |
51A |
Darlington |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61179 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61224 |
51A |
Darlington |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61237 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61249 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61250 |
34E |
New England |
34F |
Grantham |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61312 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61313 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61315 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
51A |
Darlington |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
51A |
Darlington |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
41D |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61382 |
51A |
Darlington |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61393 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
16/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
17/06/1963 |
Condemned |
61068 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1963 |
Condemned |
61069 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61074 |
35A |
New England |
|
COND |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61016 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61115 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61214 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61250 |
34F |
Grantham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61251 |
34F |
Grantham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61367 |
34F |
Grantham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61389 |
35B |
Grantham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
08/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
35B |
Grantham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61081 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61178 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61221 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61245 |
HAY |
Haymarket |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61001 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61006 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61073 |
NWE |
New England |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61075 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61083 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61088 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61090 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61097 |
34E |
New England |
40E |
Colwick |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61113 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61126 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61135 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61142 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61159 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61160 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61177 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
35A |
New England |
40E |
Colwick |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61223 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61227 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61251 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61270 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61279 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61318 |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61325 |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61328 |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61331 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61336 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61374 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40B |
Immingham |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61393 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61399 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1963 |
Condemned |
61409 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1963 |
Condemned |
61305 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
10/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61105 |
41D |
Canklow |
34E |
New England |
|
10/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61109 |
41D |
Canklow |
34E |
New England |
|
10/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
41D |
Canklow |
34E |
New England |
|
11/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61403 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
18/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61081 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
18/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61178 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
18/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61221 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
24/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61041 |
40A |
Lincoln |
34E |
New England |
|
24/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61097 |
40E |
Colwick |
34E |
New England |
|
24/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
61162 |
40A |
Lincoln |
34E |
New England |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61059 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61119 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61122 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61156 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61181 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61204 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61205 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61233 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61252 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61300 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
24 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61375 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1963 |
Condemned |
61378 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
01/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
9G |
Gorton |
41D |
Canklow |
|
01/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
61334 |
41D |
Canklow |
9G |
Gorton |
|
01/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61334 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
61245 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
15/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
61032 |
51A |
Darlington |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
15/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
61176 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
21/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61269 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
21/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61369 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61358 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61004 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61095 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61125 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61169 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61174 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61175 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61207 |
NWE |
New England |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61314 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61341 |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
61359 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61034 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61058 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61115 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61129 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Condemned |
61258 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61320 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
06/01/1964 |
Condemned |
61288 |
YK |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61221 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
26/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
61138 |
41F |
Mexborough |
34E |
New England |
|
06/02/1964 |
Condemned |
61007 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1964 |
Condemned |
61117 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1964 |
Condemned |
61178 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1964 |
Condemned |
61143 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
01/03/1964 |
Condemned |
61155 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
01/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
61167 |
36B |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
01/03/1964 |
Condemned |
61312 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
01/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
41F |
Mexborough |
41D |
Canklow |
|
12/03/1964 |
Condemned |
61146 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/03/1964 |
Condemned |
61044 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1964 |
Condemned |
61080 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61016 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61023 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61115 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61214 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
17/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61401 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61104 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61041 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61056 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61144 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61152 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61213 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
61251 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1964 |
Condemned |
61038 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1964 |
Condemned |
61243 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
18/05/1964 |
Condemned |
61037 |
51A |
Darlington |
|
COND |
|
02/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61277 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
04/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61249 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61014 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
50A |
York (North) |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61224 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61238 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61304 |
51A |
Darlington |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61321 |
51A |
Darlington |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61338 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61353 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61197 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61219 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61346 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61355 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61402 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61179 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61242 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61351 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61389 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
14/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
15/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
61081 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61081 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61084 |
YK |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
61229 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
COND |
|
12/07/1964 |
Condemned |
61109 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
13/07/1964 |
Condemned |
61351 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
61398 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
21/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
61196 |
98W |
|
36A |
Doncaster |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
61118 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
61242 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
61356 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
61134 |
67C |
Ayr |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
31/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
61261 |
67C |
Ayr |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
31/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
61396 |
67C |
Ayr |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
03/08/1964 |
Condemned |
61062 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
09/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
61400 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
10/08/1964 |
Condemned |
61321 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
01/09/1964 |
Condemned |
61065 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61031 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61176 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61256 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61303 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61382 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
61385 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
05/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
61400 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
11/10/1964 |
Condemned |
61185 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
61245 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
01/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61165 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61212 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61398 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61031 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61294 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1964 |
Condemned |
61274 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61167 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
07/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61382 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61162 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61400 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
21/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61034 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61105 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1964 |
Condemned |
61268 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61070 |
NWE |
New England |
40E |
Colwick |
|
03/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61097 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61138 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61194 |
34E |
New England |
40E |
Colwick |
|
03/01/1965 |
Condemned |
25 |
34E |
New England |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61302 |
35A |
New England |
40E |
Colwick |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
40B |
Immingham |
41D |
Canklow |
|
10/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61179 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61190 |
40B |
Immingham |
41D |
Canklow |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61221 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61225 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61248 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
10/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
40B |
Immingham |
41D |
Canklow |
|
11/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61338 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
17/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61153 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
31/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61022 |
52A |
Gateshead |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/01/1965 |
Condemned |
61120 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
14/02/1965 |
Condemned |
61327 |
41D |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
07/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
40B |
Immingham |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
08/03/1965 |
Condemned |
61215 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1965 |
Condemned |
61221 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61039 |
41D |
Canklow |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
41D |
Canklow |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
41D |
Canklow |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61093 |
41D |
Canklow |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61145 |
41D |
Canklow |
40E |
Colwick |
|
28/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
41D |
Canklow |
40B |
Immingham |
|
04/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
61147 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
05/04/1965 |
Condemned |
61198 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
05/04/1965 |
Condemned |
61310 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/05/1965 |
Condemned |
61214 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
09/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
61195 |
IMM |
Immingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
09/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
61370 |
40B |
Immingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
09/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
61389 |
40B |
Immingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
20/05/1965 |
Condemned |
61291 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
06/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61002 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
08/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61357 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61055 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61058 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61094 |
41D |
Canklow |
40E |
Colwick |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61107 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61127 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61190 |
41D |
Canklow |
40E |
Colwick |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61208 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61313 |
41D |
Canklow |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61315 |
41D |
Canklow |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61372 |
41D |
Canklow |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61392 |
41D |
Canklow |
40E |
Colwick |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
61394 |
41D |
Canklow |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
20/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61094 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
20/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61190 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
20/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61225 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
20/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61372 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
20/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61392 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61397 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
27/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61039 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
28/06/1965 |
Condemned |
61276 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61218 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
04/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61370 |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
COND |
|
05/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61245 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61050 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61051 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61089 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61093 |
36A |
Doncaster |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
11/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61098 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61127 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
11/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
11/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61365 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61093 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61141 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1965 |
Condemned |
61299 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
01/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61157 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
15/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61107 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
15/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61127 |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
COND |
|
16/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61353 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61320 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61191 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61070 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61367 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61259 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
29/08/1965 |
Condemned |
61194 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61076 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61292 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61396 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
13/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61061 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61129 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
61250 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
26/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
61003 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
26/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
26/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
40B |
Immingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
26/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61196 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
26/09/1965 |
Condemned |
61208 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61019 |
52A |
Gateshead |
50A |
York (North) |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61035 |
52A |
Gateshead |
50A |
York (North) |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61058 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
03/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61168 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61199 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
50A |
York (North) |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61216 |
52B |
Heaton |
50A |
York (North) |
|
03/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61384 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
04/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61220 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
COND |
|
04/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61257 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
COND |
|
04/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
04/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
04/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61134 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
12/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61324 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61275 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61244 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61013 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61016 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61017 |
56B |
Ardsley |
50A |
York (North) |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61023 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61110 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61237 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61238 |
56B |
Ardsley |
50A |
York (North) |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61240 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61304 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61322 |
52A |
Gateshead |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61385 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
61387 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61010 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61018 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61049 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61176 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61248 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61256 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61404 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61188 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61195 |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61313 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
61348 |
36C |
Frodingham |
40E |
Colwick |
|
14/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61389 |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61394 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
21/11/1965 |
Condemned |
61264 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
28/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
61042 |
40E |
Colwick |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
61210 |
40E |
Colwick |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
05/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61087 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61147 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61172 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
19/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
61026 |
40E |
Colwick |
40B |
Immingham |
|
19/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61285 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61003 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61348 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1965 |
Condemned |
61361 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
02/01/1966 |
Condemned |
61145 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
02/01/1966 |
Condemned |
61223 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
61099 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
09/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
09/01/1966 |
Condemned |
61384 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
61250 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
06/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
61406 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61026 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61050 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61051 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61058 |
40B |
Immingham |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61210 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1966 |
Condemned |
32 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61092 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61232 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61281 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61390 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61322 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
27/02/1966 |
Condemned |
61055 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
03/03/1966 |
Condemned |
61343 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
20/03/1966 |
Condemned |
61326 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61089 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61302 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
03/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
03/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61308 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61042 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61121 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61158 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61250 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61329 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61360 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1966 |
Condemned |
61406 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61099 |
64F |
Bathgate |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
64F |
Bathgate |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61344 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61347 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61349 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
15/05/1966 |
Condemned |
61024 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
13/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
61008 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
61116 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
10/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61040 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61103 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61345 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61403 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61116 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1966 |
Condemned |
61224 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61407 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
61293 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
61349 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61014 |
56F |
Low Moor |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
21/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61386 |
56F |
Low Moor |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
28/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61180 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
28/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61307 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61099 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61132 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61133 |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61148 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61261 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1966 |
Condemned |
61344 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
06/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
06/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61072 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
06/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61180 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
10/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61140 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
10/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61342 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61115 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61173 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61309 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61340 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61354 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
13/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61388 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
15/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61017 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61307 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61308 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61330 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61350 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
21/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61303 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61022 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1966 |
Condemned |
61032 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
61180 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
04/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
61029 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
04/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
61072 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
06/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61013 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61131 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61161 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61237 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61240 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61008 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61035 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61319 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
61012 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
50A |
York (North) |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61014 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61029 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61101 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61140 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61263 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61342 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
61386 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
COND |
|
05/01/1967 |
Condemned |
61199 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
61072 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
15/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
61189 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
22/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
22/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
61123 |
56A |
Wakefield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
23/01/1967 |
Condemned |
61173 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
23/01/1967 |
Condemned |
61216 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
23/01/1967 |
Condemned |
61309 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1967 |
Condemned |
61238 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1967 |
Condemned |
61019 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
61180 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
04/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61347 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61102 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61262 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61278 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61340 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61354 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
61407 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
61072 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
61180 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1967 |
Condemned |
61115 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1967 |
Condemned |
61123 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1967 |
Condemned |
61189 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
06/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61021 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61012 |
50A |
York (North) |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61002 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61255 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61289 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
61388 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
25/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
61030 |
50A |
York (North) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
25/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
61306 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
25/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
61337 |
YK |
York (North) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
61030 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
61306 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
61337 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|