Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 122 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6098 Week
» 12232 Month
» 240116 Year
» 1461681 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Thompson "B1" Class 4-6-0


Class LNER (1943) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR DP (Dept) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B1 8301 1000   61000   12/12/1942 DAR
GOR
CAM
NOR
STR
PKS
STR
30E
31B
36A
40E
W
Darlington
Gorton
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Colchester
March
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
12/12/1942
01/03/1943
11/12/1944
29/09/1945
21/07/1946
19/10/1946
01/02/1948
06/01/1957
01/11/1959
20/12/1959
12/06/1960
05/03/1962
05/03/1962
B1 8302 1001   61001   12/06/1943 DAR
STR
NOR
IPS
PKS
IPS
STR
PKS
STR
32B
30A
34E
35C
32B
32A
36A
W
Darlington
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Ipswich
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Neasden
Spital Bridge
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Doncaster
Withdrawn
12/06/1943
30/06/1943
10/07/1943
25/06/1944
11/01/1945
28/02/1945
24/07/1946
07/12/1946
01/02/1948
26/03/1950
30/04/1950
22/06/1952
20/01/1957
03/03/1957
27/09/1959
29/11/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1 8303 1002   61002   21/09/1943 DAR
HAY
PTH
64A
64C
51A
50A
50B
W
Darlington
Haymarket
Perth (LNER)
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Darlington
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
21/09/1943
21/11/1943
04/03/1944
05/02/1950
11/03/1951
02/09/1951
11/11/1951
06/06/1965
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
B1 8304 1003   61003   22/11/1943 DAR
NOR
IPS
CAM
NOR
CAM
STR
PKS
30A
30F
31B
36A
40B
40E
W
Darlington
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Doncaster
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
22/11/1943
09/01/1944
25/06/1944
13/07/1944
28/09/1945
24/07/1946
31/01/1947
08/02/1947
02/03/1958
13/04/1958
01/11/1959
15/11/1959
30/12/1962
26/09/1965
26/12/1965
26/12/1965
B1 8305 1004   61004   22/12/1943 DAR
STR
NOR
CAM
PKS
STR
PKS
30A
30F
30A
30F
31B
41A
41F
41D
W
Darlington
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
22/12/1943
14/01/1944
02/11/1945
24/07/1946
24/01/1947
31/05/1947
07/09/1947
02/03/1958
13/04/1958
14/12/1958
08/02/1959
13/12/1959
10/01/1960
09/09/1962
09/12/1962
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1 8306 1005   61005   19/02/1944 DAR
STR
CAM
STR
PKS
STR
PKS
35A
35C
30A
30F
31B
31A
30A
31B
W
Darlington
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
New England
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
19/02/1944
24/03/1944
03/02/1946
24/07/1946
19/10/1946
07/12/1946
25/01/1947
07/10/1956
03/02/1957
16/06/1957
08/02/1959
01/11/1959
11/06/1961
17/06/1962
29/07/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1 8307 1006   61006   17/03/1944 DAR
GOR
IPS
PKS
IPS
STR
PKS
35A
35C
30A
30F
31B
40A
W
Darlington
Gorton
Ipswich
Parkeston Quay
Ipswich
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
New England
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Lincoln
Withdrawn
17/03/1944
03/08/1944
11/12/1944
05/01/1945
28/02/1945
14/08/1946
25/01/1947
07/10/1956
06/01/1957
16/06/1957
08/02/1959
08/11/1959
07/02/1960
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1 8308 1007   61007   14/04/1944 DAR
HAY
DEE
HAY
64C
64A
65A
67C
W
Darlington
Haymarket
Dundee Tay Bridge
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Eastfield
Ayr
Withdrawn
14/04/1944
15/05/1944
28/06/1948
25/07/1948
30/06/1960
01/10/1961
29/12/1962
21/01/1963
06/02/1964
06/02/1964
B1 8309 1008   61008   13/05/1944 DAR
GHD
NEV
PKS
STR
NOR
STR
PKS
STR
34A
38C
26B
2F
65A
66E
W
Darlington
Gateshead
Neville Hill
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Kings Cross
Leicester (G.C.)
Agecroft
Woodford Halse
Eastfield
Carstairs
Withdrawn
13/05/1944
03/06/1944
18/08/1944
03/01/1945
03/03/1945
29/09/1945
17/08/1946
25/01/1947
16/05/1948
23/10/1955
10/06/1956
26/09/1959
21/07/1962
16/03/1963
13/06/1966
09/12/1966
09/12/1966
B1 8310 1009   61009   19/06/1944 DAR
NEV
PKS
STR
34E
38C
34E
41A
36A
40A
W
Darlington
Neville Hill
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Lincoln
Withdrawn
19/06/1944
06/07/1944
03/01/1945
03/03/1945
22/06/1952
25/07/1954
05/12/1954
10/06/1956
29/09/1957
10/11/1957
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1010   61010   02/11/1946 HLB
53A
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
02/11/1946
14/06/1959
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1011   61011   30/11/1946 GHD
56B
56A
56D
9G
9G
2F
9G
W
Gateshead
Ardsley
Wakefield
Mirfield
Gorton (on loan)
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Withdrawn
30/11/1946
23/09/1956
22/02/1959
22/03/1959
15/07/1960
17/07/1960
05/08/1961
13/01/1962
02/11/1962
02/11/1962
B1   1012   61012   30/11/1946 GHD
50B
50A
W
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/11/1946
17/07/1960
18/12/1966
12/06/1967
12/06/1967
B1   1013   61013   14/12/1946 GHD
56B
56A
W
Gateshead
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
14/12/1946
23/09/1956
31/10/1965
06/12/1966
06/12/1966
B1   1014   61014   23/12/1946 GHD
52D
52A
52H
56F
52F
W
Gateshead
Tweedmouth
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Low Moor
Blyth (North)
Withdrawn
23/12/1946
17/01/1954
14/06/1959
10/09/1961
07/06/1964
21/08/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1   1015   61015   04/01/1947 YK
91S
50A
50B
50A
51A
56A
W
York (North)
To Southern Region
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Darlington
Wakefield
Withdrawn
04/01/1947
17/05/1953
21/06/1953
15/11/1953
21/02/1954
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
B1   1016   61016   16/01/1947 YK
50B
52A
56C
56D
56F
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Gateshead
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
16/01/1947
05/05/1957
15/01/1961
13/08/1961
08/09/1963
12/04/1964
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1   1017   61017   28/01/1947 YK
NEV
SKN
50B
50A
56C
56A
56B
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Stockton
Neville Hill
York (North)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Wakefield
Ardsley
York (North)
Withdrawn
28/01/1947
30/05/1948
06/02/1949
23/08/1953
20/11/1955
08/06/1958
22/02/1959
25/11/1962
31/10/1965
15/11/1966
15/11/1966
B1   1018   61018   04/02/1947 YK
NEV
SKN
51G
51L
51A
56A
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Stockton
Haverton Hill
Thornaby
Darlington
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/02/1947
30/05/1948
06/02/1949
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
20/09/1959
12/06/1960
11/09/1960
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1019   61019   24/02/1947 HTN
HAY
DAR
TWD
52A
52C
52A
52C
52d
52B
52A
50A
W
Heaton
Haymarket
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Gateshead
Blaydon
Gateshead
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Heaton
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
24/02/1947
29/08/1948
31/10/1948
02/01/1949
17/01/1954
10/02/1957
01/11/1959
11/09/1960
04/11/1962
24/02/1963
16/06/1963
03/10/1965
12/03/1967
12/03/1967
B1   1020   61020   28/02/1947 HTN
DAR
YK
50B
50A
51A
56F
56A
50A
W
Heaton
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Darlington
Low Moor
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
28/02/1947
07/11/1948
17/07/1949
15/11/1953
21/02/1954
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
08/11/1959
11/09/1960
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
B1   1021   61021   12/03/1947 HTN
DAR
52A
51A
50A
51A
51G
51L
51A
56A
50A
W
Heaton
Darlington
Gateshead
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Haverton Hill
Thornaby
Darlington
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/03/1947
07/11/1948
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
26/06/1955
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
20/09/1959
12/06/1960
11/09/1960
06/06/1967
06/06/1967
B1   1022   61022   22/03/1947 HTN
DAR
50A
51A
52B
52A
52H
52d
52B
52A
56A
W
Heaton
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Heaton
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Alnmouth
Heaton
Gateshead
Wakefield
Withdrawn
22/03/1947
07/11/1948
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
19/07/1953
26/07/1953
10/09/1961
04/11/1962
24/02/1963
16/06/1963
31/01/1965
25/11/1966
25/11/1966
B1   1023   61023   01/04/1947 HTN
DAR
52A
51A
50A
51A
56F
56B
56C
56F
56D
56F
W
Heaton
Darlington
Gateshead
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Low Moor
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/04/1947
07/11/1948
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
26/06/1955
25/09/1955
08/06/1958
08/11/1959
17/06/1962
08/09/1963
05/01/1964
12/04/1964
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1   1024   61024   12/04/1947 TWD
52A
51A
50A
51A
51G
51L
51A
56A
56B
56A
W
Tweedmouth
Gateshead
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Haverton Hill
Thornaby
Darlington
Wakefield
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
12/04/1947
01/07/1951
02/09/1951
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
20/09/1959
12/06/1960
25/11/1962
31/03/1963
15/05/1966
15/05/1966
B1   1025   61025   22/04/1947 TWD
HAY
TWD
52C
52d
W
Tweedmouth
Haymarket
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Alnmouth
Withdrawn
22/04/1947
29/08/1948
31/10/1948
12/06/1960
04/11/1962
02/12/1962
02/12/1962
B1   1026   61026   28/04/1947 DON
40A
40B
40A
40B
40E
40B
W
Doncaster
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Immingham
Withdrawn
28/04/1947
10/11/1957
29/11/1959
06/03/1960
22/09/1963
26/09/1965
19/12/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1   1027   61027   11/05/1947 NWE
41A
W
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
11/05/1947
02/07/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1028   61028   30/05/1947 NEA
38C
34E
15E
2F
W
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
30/05/1947
04/07/1954
21/11/1954
12/02/1959
02/07/1959
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
B1   1029   61029   07/06/1947 KX
GOR
COP
37A
37B
37A
39B
64A
62A
62C
62B
W
Kings Cross
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
07/06/1947
23/01/1949
02/10/1949
04/06/1950
24/09/1950
18/02/1951
13/12/1951
13/09/1953
03/04/1966
06/11/1966
04/12/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1   1030   61030   26/06/1947 SKN
51L
51A
55H
56B
56A
50A
56F
W
Stockton
Thornaby
Darlington
Neville Hill
Ardsley
Wakefield
York (North)
Low Moor
Withdrawn
26/06/1947
14/06/1959
20/09/1959
11/06/1961
25/11/1962
31/10/1965
22/01/1967
25/06/1967
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
B1   1031   61031   10/07/1947 COP
37A
37C
56F
51A
51L
50A
56C
56B
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Darlington
Thornaby
York (North)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
10/07/1947
04/06/1950
13/05/1951
12/01/1958
14/09/1958
30/11/1958
11/09/1960
07/06/1964
06/09/1964
09/11/1964
09/11/1964
B1   1032   61032   07/08/1947 SKN
51L
51A
50B
W
Stockton
Thornaby
Darlington
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
07/08/1947
14/06/1959
20/09/1959
15/12/1963
27/11/1966
27/11/1966
B1   1033   61033   29/08/1947 BFD
COP
37A
37B
37A
30A
38A
31A
41A
40A
41D
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Stratford
Colwick
Cambridge
Sheffield Darnall
Lincoln
Canklow
Withdrawn
29/08/1947
21/09/1947
04/06/1950
15/10/1950
06/01/1952
22/09/1952
19/10/1952
24/10/1954
28/10/1956
04/11/1962
02/12/1962
25/03/1963
25/03/1963
B1   1034   61034   03/10/1947 YK
NEV
SKN
51L
56B
56A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Stockton
Thornaby
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
03/10/1947
29/11/1947
06/02/1949
14/06/1959
25/11/1962
05/01/1964
21/12/1964
21/12/1964
B1   1035   61035   31/10/1947 YK
NEV
52C
52B
52A
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Blaydon
Heaton
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
31/10/1947
05/04/1948
15/01/1961
10/02/1963
16/06/1963
03/10/1965
12/12/1966
12/12/1966
B1   1036   61036   20/11/1947 GOR
DON
STR
CAM
DON
W
Gorton
Doncaster
Stratford
Cambridge
Doncaster
Withdrawn
20/11/1947
03/07/1949
25/08/1949
20/11/1949
02/12/1949
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1037   61037   28/11/1947 DAR
SKN
51G
51L
51A
W
Darlington
Stockton
Haverton Hill
Thornaby
Darlington
Withdrawn
28/11/1947
22/08/1948
08/06/1958
14/06/1959
11/09/1960
18/05/1964
18/05/1964
B1   1038   61038   05/12/1947 DAR
YK
50B
52A
52G
52C
52B
52C
52B
52A
W
Darlington
York (North)
Neville Hill
Gateshead
Sunderland
Blaydon
Heaton
Blaydon
Heaton
Gateshead
Withdrawn
05/12/1947
17/07/1949
05/05/1957
15/01/1961
30/04/1961
17/06/1962
09/09/1962
04/11/1962
24/02/1963
16/06/1963
01/05/1964
01/05/1964
B1   1039   61039   12/12/1947 DAR
50A
51A
56F
56B
50A
2F
9G
41D
36A
W
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Low Moor
Ardsley
York (North)
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Canklow
Doncaster
Withdrawn
12/12/1947
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
08/06/1958
08/11/1959
11/09/1960
06/08/1962
10/11/1962
01/12/1963
28/03/1965
27/06/1965
27/06/1965
B1   1040   61040   16/04/1946 STR
NOR
51A
50A
51A
56F
56A
56D
56F
56A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Low Moor
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
16/04/1946
21/07/1946
02/09/1951
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
08/06/1958
15/03/1959
22/03/1959
20/08/1961
10/09/1961
10/07/1966
10/07/1966
B1   1041   61041   26/04/1946 STR
NOR
91S
32A
39B
41H
40A
34E
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
To Southern Region
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Staveley (G.C.)
Lincoln
New England
Withdrawn
26/04/1946
19/07/1946
18/05/1953
27/05/1953
07/06/1953
03/06/1962
27/01/1963
24/11/1963
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1042   61042   04/05/1946 CAM
NOR
32D
32A
31B
40A
40B
40E
36A
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
March
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Doncaster
Withdrawn
04/05/1946
22/07/1946
06/01/1957
24/02/1957
29/11/1959
21/02/1960
22/09/1963
26/09/1965
28/11/1965
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1   1043   61043   14/05/1946 NOR
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
14/05/1946
04/02/1962
09/07/1962
09/07/1962
B1   1044   61044   20/05/1946 NOR
39B
41D
W
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Withdrawn
20/05/1946
07/06/1953
07/04/1963
17/03/1964
17/03/1964
B1   1045 1045 61045   24/05/1946 NOR
31B
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
24/05/1946
04/02/1962
29/07/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1046 1046 61046   29/05/1946 NOR
31A
31B
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
29/05/1946
12/06/1960
20/11/1960
11/06/1961
24/04/1962
24/04/1962
B1   1047   61047   03/06/1946 NOR
40A
32A
35A
35C
41A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Norwich Thorpe
New England
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
03/06/1946
27/05/1951
24/06/1951
25/10/1953
27/11/1955
14/12/1958
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1048   61048   06/06/1946 NOR
31A
31B
31A
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
March
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/06/1946
12/06/1960
20/11/1960
11/06/1961
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1049   61049   11/06/1946 NOR
51A
56F
56D
50A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Darlington
Low Moor
Mirfield
York (North)
Withdrawn
11/06/1946
02/09/1951
08/06/1958
08/11/1959
11/09/1960
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1050   61050 30 17/06/1946 NOR
37A
32A
91S
32A
41A
41D
36E
36A
41J
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Norwich Thorpe
To Southern Region
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
17/06/1946
13/05/1951
28/10/1951
18/05/1953
23/05/1953
10/06/1956
16/06/1963
28/03/1965
13/06/1965
11/07/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1   1051 1051 61051 31 20/06/1946 NOR
37A
32A
41A
41D
36A
41J
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Doncaster
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
20/06/1946
13/05/1951
16/12/1951
10/06/1956
16/06/1963
28/03/1965
11/07/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1   1052   61052   24/06/1946 IPS
NOR
32B
31B
W
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
24/06/1946
17/08/1946
24/09/1950
01/11/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1053   61053   27/06/1946 IPS
50A
W
Ipswich
York (North)
Withdrawn
27/06/1946
02/09/1951
25/02/1963
25/02/1963
B1   1054   61054   02/07/1946 IPS
32A
32C
32A
31B
W
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
02/07/1946
26/07/1959
03/04/1960
11/09/1960
04/02/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1055   61055   04/07/1946 IPS
36A
36E
36A
W
Ipswich
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
04/07/1946
08/11/1959
16/09/1962
13/06/1965
27/02/1966
27/02/1966
B1   1056 1056 61056   04/07/1946 IPS
37A
32B
38A
32B
31B
41A
40B
W
Ipswich
Ardsley
Ipswich
Colwick
Ipswich
March
Sheffield Darnall
Immingham
Withdrawn
04/07/1946
13/05/1951
16/12/1951
29/06/1952
06/10/1957
22/11/1959
24/01/1960
04/11/1962
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1057   61057   08/07/1946 IPS
W
Ipswich
Withdrawn
08/07/1946
17/04/1950
17/04/1950
B1   1058   61058   10/07/1946 IPS
31B
40A
36E
36A
40B
W
Ipswich
March
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
10/07/1946
22/11/1959
27/03/1960
05/01/1964
13/06/1965
03/10/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1   1059   61059 17 27/07/1946 IPS
31B
31C
31B
W
Ipswich
March
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
27/07/1946
29/11/1959
31/01/1960
03/07/1960
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1060   61060   01/08/1946 NEV
HLD
35B
35A
40A
W
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
Grantham
New England
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/08/1946
16/05/1948
24/02/1957
06/10/1957
20/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1061   61061   03/08/1946 PTH
64A
51A
56F
51A
51C
56B
W
Perth (LNER)
St Margarets
Darlington
Low Moor
Darlington
West Hartlepool
Ardsley
Withdrawn
03/08/1946
05/02/1950
02/09/1951
08/06/1958
14/09/1958
05/10/1958
25/11/1962
13/09/1965
13/09/1965
B1   1062   61062   07/08/1946 NEV
51L
50A
W
Neville Hill
Thornaby
York (North)
Withdrawn
07/08/1946
01/11/1959
11/09/1960
03/08/1964
03/08/1964
B1   1063   61063   10/08/1946 SHF
WFD
ANN
38A
38C
14D
15E
2F
W
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Annesley
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
10/08/1946
27/04/1947
19/06/1949
21/10/1956
11/11/1956
06/03/1960
30/09/1960
17/03/1962
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
B1   1064 1064 61064   14/08/1946 KIT
KEI
EFD
68E
65A
12C
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Eastfield
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
14/08/1946
14/04/1947
28/08/1949
18/05/1955
15/07/1962
12/08/1962
15/10/1962
15/10/1962
B1   1065   61065   15/08/1946 NEV
52B
50B
52A
53A
W
Neville Hill
Heaton
Neville Hill
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
15/08/1946
19/11/1950
01/01/1951
15/09/1957
14/09/1958
01/09/1964
01/09/1964
B1   1066 1066 61066   19/08/1946 SHF
WFD
ANN
38A
31A
30A
31A
31B
W
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Annesley
Colwick
Cambridge
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
19/08/1946
27/04/1947
19/06/1949
07/10/1956
06/10/1957
14/09/1958
21/09/1958
20/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1067   61067   22/08/1946 KIT
64A
65A
65C
W
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Eastfield
Parkhead
Withdrawn
22/08/1946
25/09/1949
04/03/1951
18/03/1951
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1068 1068 61068   23/08/1946 NEV
HLD
53B
50E
51A
51L
50A
56B
W
Neville Hill
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Scarborough
Darlington
Thornaby
York (North)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
23/08/1946
16/05/1948
14/02/1954
14/06/1959
27/03/1960
03/04/1960
11/09/1960
25/11/1962
17/06/1963
17/06/1963
B1   1069 1069 61069   26/08/1946 NEV
50A
W
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
26/08/1946
25/01/1959
26/08/1963
26/08/1963
B1   1070   61070   28/08/1946 EFD
GOR
NWE
40E
W
Eastfield
Gorton
New England
Colwick
Withdrawn
28/08/1946
16/09/1946
04/05/1947
03/01/1965
22/08/1965
22/08/1965
B1   1071   61071   29/08/1946 EFD
HLB
YK
W
Eastfield
Hull Botanic Gardens
York (North)
Withdrawn
29/08/1946
30/08/1946
16/05/1948
11/02/1963
11/02/1963
B1   1072 1072 61072   07/09/1946 EFD
HAY
THJ
62C
62B
61B
62B
W
Eastfield
Haymarket
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
07/09/1946
21/09/1946
28/03/1948
25/08/1958
06/11/1966
04/12/1966
06/01/1967
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
B1   1073 1073 61073   06/09/1946 EFD
GOR
NWE
W
Eastfield
Gorton
New England
Withdrawn
06/09/1946
16/09/1946
04/05/1947
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1074   61074   07/09/1946 HLB
HLD
35B
35A
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Grantham
New England
Withdrawn
07/09/1946
16/05/1948
24/02/1957
06/10/1957
04/09/1963
04/09/1963
B1   1075   61075   16/09/1946 GOR
NWE
34A
34E
34A
41F
W
Gorton
New England
Kings Cross
New England
Kings Cross
Mexborough
Withdrawn
16/09/1946
09/05/1947
13/06/1954
09/10/1960
03/06/1962
16/06/1963
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1076   61076   17/09/1946 HAY
64A
W
Haymarket
St Margarets
Withdrawn
17/09/1946
23/09/1962
10/09/1965
10/09/1965
B1   1077   61077   18/09/1946 GOR
NEA
15E
9G
W
Gorton
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Withdrawn
18/09/1946
18/05/1947
13/11/1961
21/03/1962
14/05/1962
14/05/1962
B1   1078   61078   23/09/1946 GOR
WFD
CLK
38C
38E
38C
38E
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
23/09/1946
02/03/1947
19/06/1949
27/01/1952
11/05/1952
06/07/1952
14/09/1952
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
B1   1079   61079   24/09/1946 GOR
IMM
W
Gorton
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/09/1946
17/05/1947
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
B1   1080   61080   26/09/1946 HLB
HLD
53B
53A
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
26/09/1946
16/05/1948
15/12/1957
14/06/1959
30/03/1964
30/03/1964
B1   1081   61081   03/10/1946 HAY
64C
64A
62B
W
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
03/10/1946
09/09/1963
18/11/1963
15/06/1964
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B1   1082   61082   04/10/1946 GOR
IMM
W
Gorton
Immingham
Withdrawn
04/10/1946
17/05/1947
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1083   61083   07/10/1946 GOR
NEA
35C
41A
41F
41D
W
Gorton
Neasden
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
07/10/1946
16/06/1947
20/01/1957
14/12/1958
24/05/1959
31/12/1961
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1084   61084   09/10/1946 HLB
YK
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
York (North)
Withdrawn
09/10/1946
16/05/1948
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B1   1085   61085   11/10/1946 GOR
WFD
NEA
GOR
ARD
COP
37A
35A
40A
15E
2F
15E
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Gorton
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
New England
Lincoln
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
11/10/1946
02/03/1947
09/03/1947
04/02/1949
17/07/1949
07/08/1949
04/06/1950
20/09/1953
26/06/1955
01/06/1958
07/11/1959
06/10/1960
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
B1   1086   61086   14/10/1946 GOR
LEI
DON
50B
50A
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Doncaster
Neville Hill
York (North)
Withdrawn
14/10/1946
01/06/1947
06/02/1949
27/01/1952
25/01/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
B1   1087   61087   16/10/1946 SHF
WFD
LEI
DON
W
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
16/10/1946
27/04/1947
14/11/1948
06/02/1949
05/12/1965
05/12/1965
B1   1088   61088   18/10/1946 SHF
WFD
LEI
WFD
CLK
38C
38A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
18/10/1946
27/04/1947
13/03/1949
03/04/1949
19/06/1949
12/03/1950
18/11/1956
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1089   61089   22/10/1946 SHF
GOR
STR
40B
30A
30E
30A
40A
40B
40E
W
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Stratford
Immingham
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
22/10/1946
26/12/1948
28/08/1949
27/05/1951
24/06/1951
06/01/1957
29/09/1957
27/11/1960
22/09/1963
11/07/1965
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
B1   1090   61090   24/10/1946 SHF
41F
41A
41F
W
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Withdrawn
24/10/1946
14/06/1959
15/05/1960
09/09/1962
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1091   61091   28/10/1946 SHF
34E
W
Sheffield Darnall
New England
Withdrawn
28/10/1946
07/08/1960
10/09/1962
10/09/1962
B1   1092   61092   30/10/1946 SHF
CLK
38C
38A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
30/10/1946
22/11/1948
12/03/1950
19/12/1954
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
B1   1093   61093   04/11/1946 DON
41F
41D
36A
41J
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Canklow
Doncaster
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
04/11/1946
14/06/1959
31/12/1961
28/03/1965
11/07/1965
25/07/1965
25/07/1965
B1   1094 1094 61094   06/11/1946 DON
HLB
41A
41D
40E
W
Doncaster
Hull Botanic Gardens
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Colwick
Withdrawn
06/11/1946
05/02/1948
16/08/1959
16/06/1963
13/06/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
B1   1095   61095   11/11/1946 DON
35A
35C
31B
32A
31B
40A
W
Doncaster
New England
Spital Bridge
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Lincoln
Withdrawn
11/11/1946
17/05/1953
03/03/1957
31/01/1960
03/12/1961
04/02/1962
20/01/1963
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1096   61096   12/11/1946 HIT
MAR
GOR
ARD
COP
37A
39B
31A
30A
31A
31F
31B
W
Hither Green
March
Gorton
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
Cambridge
Stratford
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
12/11/1946
17/06/1948
31/10/1948
17/07/1949
07/08/1949
04/06/1950
23/12/1951
29/09/1957
14/09/1958
21/09/1958
14/12/1958
31/01/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1097   61097   15/11/1946 HIT
34E
40E
34E
W
Hither Green
New England
Colwick
New England
Withdrawn
15/11/1946
07/08/1960
22/09/1963
24/11/1963
03/01/1965
03/01/1965
B1   1098   61098   19/11/1946 HIT
MAR
GOR
STR
40B
W
Hither Green
March
Gorton
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
19/11/1946
17/06/1948
31/10/1948
31/07/1949
21/10/1951
11/07/1965
11/07/1965
B1   1099   61099   21/11/1946 HIT
34A
64A
64F
62A
W
Hither Green
Kings Cross
St Margarets
Bathgate
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
21/11/1946
11/01/1953
13/09/1953
09/01/1966
24/04/1966
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
B1   1100 1100 61100   26/11/1946 GHD
52C
52A
56C
W
Gateshead
Blaydon
Gateshead
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
26/11/1946
10/02/1957
01/11/1959
13/08/1961
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
B1   1101   61101   28/11/1946 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
28/11/1946
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1   1102   61102   02/12/1946 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
02/12/1946
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1   1103   61103   04/12/1946 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
04/12/1946
14/07/1966
14/07/1966
B1   1104   61104   06/12/1946 STR
PKS
STR
31A
41A
41F
41A
41F
41D
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Cambridge
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
06/12/1946
07/09/1947
01/02/1948
08/02/1959
03/05/1959
29/11/1959
10/01/1960
09/09/1962
09/12/1962
18/04/1964
18/04/1964
B1   1105   61105 27 09/12/1946 HIT
34A
41A
41D
34E
W
Hither Green
Kings Cross
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
New England
Withdrawn
09/12/1946
11/01/1953
13/07/1958
16/06/1963
10/11/1963
26/12/1964
26/12/1964
B1   1106   61106   11/12/1946 HIT
GOR
LEI
38A
38C
38A
38C
2F
W
Hither Green
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
11/12/1946
23/01/1949
15/05/1949
12/10/1952
15/02/1953
28/02/1954
08/12/1957
04/11/1959
02/11/1962
02/11/1962
B1   1107   61107   13/12/1946 HIT
LEI
DON
RET
36A
40B
36A
40A
36E
36A
W
Hither Green
Leicester (G.C.)
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/12/1946
14/11/1948
27/02/1949
13/03/1949
07/05/1950
30/09/1951
11/11/1951
29/04/1962
05/01/1964
13/06/1965
15/08/1965
15/08/1965
B1   1108   61108   16/12/1946 SHF
WFD
LEI
64A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
St Margarets
Withdrawn
16/12/1946
08/05/1947
13/03/1949
13/09/1953
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1109   61109   18/12/1946 SHF
NEA
GOR
91M
GOR
STR
91S
30A
41A
41D
34E
W
Sheffield Darnall
Neasden
Gorton
To London Midland Region
Gorton
Stratford
To Southern Region
Stratford
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
New England
Withdrawn
18/12/1946
15/05/1947
13/03/1949
03/07/1949
17/07/1949
28/08/1949
18/05/1953
23/05/1953
27/11/1960
16/06/1963
10/11/1963
12/07/1964
12/07/1964
B1   1110   61110   20/12/1946 SHF
LEI
CLK
38E
38A
32A
37A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Withdrawn
20/12/1946
01/06/1947
22/01/1950
30/09/1951
25/11/1951
09/12/1951
27/01/1952
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1   1111   61111   24/12/1946 SHF
LEI
CLK
38E
38A
38C
38A
38E
38A
34A
34E
34A
30A
30F
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Kings Cross
Neasden
Kings Cross
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
24/12/1946
01/06/1947
21/11/1948
07/09/1952
14/09/1952
07/12/1952
28/01/1953
09/01/1955
06/02/1955
07/10/1956
02/12/1956
27/01/1957
10/02/1957
08/02/1959
24/05/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1112   61112   27/12/1946 KX
MAR
LIN
32A
40A
36B
41A
41D
41F
W
Kings Cross
March
Lincoln
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Mexborough
Withdrawn
27/12/1946
12/06/1949
20/10/1949
28/10/1951
27/01/1952
04/10/1953
24/05/1959
02/12/1962
09/12/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1113   61113   31/12/1946 KX
35A
32A
35A
40A
W
Kings Cross
New England
Norwich Thorpe
New England
Lincoln
Withdrawn
31/12/1946
28/12/1952
05/09/1954
05/12/1954
20/11/1960
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1114   61114   08/01/1947 KX
KX
GOR
30A
36A
40B
W
Kings Cross
Kings Cross
Gorton
Stratford
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
08/01/1947
19/02/1948
23/01/1949
05/10/1952
28/02/1954
13/12/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1115   61115   10/01/1947 YK
56C
56F
56D
56F
56A
W
York (North)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
10/01/1947
08/06/1958
08/09/1963
05/01/1964
12/04/1964
13/11/1966
08/05/1967
08/05/1967
B1   1116   61116   13/01/1947 EFD
34E
15E
14D
15E
14D
2F
65A
66E
W
Eastfield
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Eastfield
Carstairs
Withdrawn
13/01/1947
18/05/1952
03/10/1959
07/11/1959
17/09/1960
24/09/1960
15/03/1962
10/03/1963
26/06/1966
17/07/1966
17/07/1966
B1   1117   61117   15/01/1947 EFD
65C
64A
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
St Margarets
Withdrawn
15/01/1947
07/11/1955
13/08/1962
06/02/1964
06/02/1964
B1   1118   61118   17/01/1947 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
17/01/1947
23/07/1964
23/07/1964
B1   1119   61119   20/01/1947 STR
30F
30A
31B
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
20/01/1947
24/05/1959
14/06/1959
16/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1120   61120   22/01/1947 DON
36E
W
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
22/01/1947
22/11/1959
31/01/1965
31/01/1965
B1   1121   61121   24/01/1947 KX
MAR
LIN
CAM
36A
41A
36A
W
Kings Cross
March
Lincoln
Cambridge
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Withdrawn
24/01/1947
12/06/1949
20/10/1949
20/11/1949
28/10/1956
25/01/1959
08/02/1959
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1   1122   61122   28/01/1947 SHF
LEI
CLK
37A
35A
41A
36A
34E
W
Sheffield Darnall
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Ardsley
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
New England
Withdrawn
28/01/1947
04/06/1947
08/01/1950
30/09/1951
20/09/1953
26/06/1955
23/10/1955
16/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1123   61123   30/01/1947 SHF
LEI
CLK
37A
56C
56A
50A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/01/1947
04/06/1947
01/01/1950
30/09/1951
17/06/1962
05/01/1964
22/01/1967
11/05/1967
11/05/1967
B1   1124   61124   04/02/1947 DON
W
Doncaster
Withdrawn
04/02/1947
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1125   61125   06/02/1947 DON
36E
36A
W
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/02/1947
08/06/1950
16/07/1950
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1126   61126   07/02/1947 DON
36E
W
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
07/02/1947
03/12/1950
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1127   61127   12/02/1947 DON
36E
36A
36C
W
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
12/02/1947
16/09/1962
13/06/1965
11/07/1965
15/08/1965
15/08/1965
B1   1128   61128   14/02/1947 SHF
LEI
DON
W
Sheffield Darnall
Leicester (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
14/02/1947
04/05/1947
13/02/1949
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1129   61129   18/02/1947 KX
37A
37B
56A
W
Kings Cross
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Wakefield
Withdrawn
18/02/1947
11/11/1951
29/06/1952
05/01/1964
13/09/1965
13/09/1965
B1   1130   61130   24/02/1947 GOR
LEI
GOR
STR
31B
30A
40B
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Stratford
March
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/02/1947
01/06/1947
06/02/1949
21/08/1949
08/10/1950
15/10/1950
21/10/1951
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1131   61131   25/02/1947 GOR
WFD
CLK
30A
37A
56G
56F
56A
56B
56A
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Stratford
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Wakefield
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
25/02/1947
04/06/1947
19/06/1949
14/09/1952
19/10/1952
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
01/03/1959
25/11/1962
31/03/1963
06/12/1966
06/12/1966
B1   1132   61132   26/02/1947 KIT
61B
62B
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
26/02/1947
16/05/1949
14/01/1951
11/01/1960
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
B1   1133   61133   28/02/1947 KIT
61B
61A
65A
91S
65A
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
Eastfield
To Southern Region
Eastfield
Withdrawn
28/02/1947
16/05/1949
19/08/1951
01/02/1953
20/05/1953
21/06/1953
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
B1   1134   61134   04/03/1947 KIT
61B
61A
65A
62A
65A
67A
67C
64C
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Dalry Road
Withdrawn
04/03/1947
16/05/1949
09/10/1949
22/02/1953
21/01/1956
18/04/1960
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
31/07/1964
05/10/1965
05/10/1965
B1   1135   61135   10/03/1947 STR
PKS
30A
30F
36A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/03/1947
31/05/1947
02/03/1958
08/02/1959
25/10/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1136   61136   18/03/1947 GOR
KX
34E
15E
14D
2F
W
Gorton
Kings Cross
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
18/03/1947
16/06/1947
18/05/1952
28/09/1959
16/11/1959
15/03/1962
22/10/1962
22/10/1962
B1   1137   61137   19/03/1947 GOR
KX
36A
15E
9G
W
Gorton
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Withdrawn
19/03/1947
16/06/1947
21/12/1952
14/12/1958
18/03/1962
28/05/1962
28/05/1962
B1   1138   61138 26 31/03/1947 GOR
SHF
KX
35A
41A
41D
41A
41F
34E
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Kings Cross
New England
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
New England
Withdrawn
31/03/1947
06/04/1947
16/06/1947
28/12/1952
26/06/1955
31/01/1960
23/04/1961
09/09/1962
26/01/1964
03/01/1965
03/01/1965
B1   1139   61139   01/04/1947 SHF
KX
35A
34A
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Kings Cross
New England
Kings Cross
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
01/04/1947
16/06/1947
14/12/1952
08/03/1953
14/06/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1140   61140   11/04/1947 GOR
SHF
NEA
65A
66B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Neasden
Eastfield
Motherwell
Withdrawn
11/04/1947
23/04/1947
16/06/1947
18/05/1952
10/11/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1   1141   61141   11/04/1947 GOR
SHF
WFD
LEI
38A
38C
38A
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
11/04/1947
23/04/1947
16/06/1947
14/11/1948
05/02/1950
12/03/1950
11/11/1956
25/07/1965
25/07/1965
B1   1142   61142   15/04/1947 GOR
SHF
IMM
40E
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
15/04/1947
27/04/1947
16/06/1947
06/12/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1143   61143   15/04/1947 GOR
SHF
NWE
35B
35A
40A
40B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
New England
Grantham
New England
Lincoln
Immingham
Withdrawn
15/04/1947
23/04/1947
16/06/1947
06/03/1951
09/09/1951
26/06/1955
17/11/1957
24/02/1964
24/02/1964
B1   1144   61144   17/04/1947 GOR
SHF
NWE
GRA
STR
40B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
New England
Grantham
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
17/04/1947
08/05/1947
16/06/1947
04/01/1948
18/11/1949
21/10/1951
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1145   61145   17/04/1947 GOR
SHF
37A
37C
36A
40B
41D
40E
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Immingham
Canklow
Colwick
Withdrawn
17/04/1947
15/05/1947
30/09/1951
18/11/1951
06/12/1953
30/12/1962
10/01/1965
28/03/1965
02/01/1966
02/01/1966
B1   1146   61146   22/04/1947 KIT
THJ
64C
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Thornton Junction
Dalry Road
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
22/04/1947
03/07/1949
05/09/1960
02/11/1960
12/03/1964
12/03/1964
B1   1147   61147   22/04/1947 KIT
DEE
62A
62B
W
Kittybrewster
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
22/04/1947
03/07/1949
14/10/1951
04/04/1965
16/12/1965
16/12/1965
B1   1148   61148   25/04/1947 KIT
EFD
THJ
91S
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
To Southern Region
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
25/04/1947
11/09/1949
29/01/1950
20/05/1953
21/06/1953
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
B1   1149   61149   25/04/1947 STR
PKS
30A
31B
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
25/04/1947
31/05/1947
01/01/1961
16/09/1962
23/09/1962
23/09/1962
B1   1150   61150   29/04/1947 GOR
SHF
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
29/04/1947
01/06/1947
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1151   61151   29/04/1947 GOR
SHF
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
29/04/1947
01/06/1947
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1152   61152   02/05/1947 GOR
SHF
36A
41A
41A
40B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Immingham
Withdrawn
02/05/1947
04/06/1947
29/09/1957
17/11/1957
23/04/1961
03/03/1963
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1153   61153   02/05/1947 GOR
SHF
41J
41A
41D
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Langwith Junction
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Withdrawn
02/05/1947
04/06/1947
23/10/1960
10/09/1961
16/06/1963
17/01/1965
17/01/1965
B1   1154   61154   06/05/1947 GOR
SHF
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
06/05/1947
04/06/1947
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1155   61155   06/05/1947 GOR
37B
36A
41A
41D
41F
W
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Mexborough
Withdrawn
06/05/1947
13/06/1954
28/11/1954
12/06/1960
02/12/1962
09/12/1962
01/03/1964
01/03/1964
B1   1156   61156   09/05/1947 GOR
39B
35C
31B
30A
31B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Spital Bridge
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
09/05/1947
13/06/1954
29/09/1957
31/01/1960
19/02/1961
16/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1157   61157   09/05/1947 GOR
30A
36A
W
Gorton
Stratford
Doncaster
Withdrawn
09/05/1947
05/10/1952
19/10/1952
01/08/1965
01/08/1965
B1   1158   61158   14/05/1947 GOR
36A
W
Gorton
Doncaster
Withdrawn
14/05/1947
18/10/1953
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1   1159   61159   14/05/1947 GOR
40B
W
Gorton
Immingham
Withdrawn
14/05/1947
13/06/1954
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1160   61160   16/05/1947 GOR
31A
38A
32B
32C
40A
40E
40A
40E
W
Gorton
Cambridge
Colwick
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Lincoln
Colwick
Lincoln
Colwick
Withdrawn
16/05/1947
20/06/1954
28/10/1956
06/10/1957
19/07/1959
13/03/1960
20/03/1960
27/03/1960
01/07/1962
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1161   61161   16/05/1947 GOR
15E
9G
56D
56F
56A
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
16/05/1947
30/05/1959
25/07/1959
17/07/1960
20/08/1961
10/09/1961
06/12/1966
06/12/1966
B1   1162   61162   21/05/1947 GOR
37B
36A
41A
41H
40A
34E
W
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Staveley (G.C.)
Lincoln
New England
Withdrawn
21/05/1947
13/06/1954
24/10/1954
08/02/1959
03/06/1962
27/01/1963
24/11/1963
08/12/1964
08/12/1964
B1   1163   61163   23/05/1947 GOR
NEA
38C
38A
W
Gorton
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
23/05/1947
23/06/1947
04/07/1954
19/12/1954
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1164   61164   23/05/1947 GOR
NEA
30A
41A
W
Gorton
Neasden
Stratford
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
23/05/1947
23/06/1947
17/02/1957
03/05/1959
10/09/1962
10/09/1962
B1   1165   61165   28/05/1947 GOR
MEX
41D
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
28/05/1947
14/06/1947
11/03/1962
01/11/1964
01/11/1964
B1   1166   61166   30/05/1947 GOR
MEX
41A
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
30/05/1947
16/06/1947
10/09/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1167   61167   30/05/1947 GOR
MEX
40B
36B
41D
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Immingham
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
30/05/1947
16/06/1947
21/06/1953
04/10/1953
01/03/1964
06/12/1964
06/12/1964
B1   1168   61168   04/06/1947 GOR
MEX
40B
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Immingham
Withdrawn
04/06/1947
16/06/1947
21/06/1953
03/10/1965
03/10/1965
B1   1169   61169   06/06/1947 GOR
NEA
GOR
SHF
41D
41F
W
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Mexborough
Withdrawn
06/06/1947
23/06/1947
06/03/1949
19/06/1949
02/12/1962
09/12/1962
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1170   61170   06/06/1947 GOR
DON
W
Gorton
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/06/1947
20/07/1947
09/07/1962
09/07/1962
B1   1171   61171   11/06/1947 GOR
GRA
STR
40A
36A
30A
31A
31B
W
Gorton
Grantham
Stratford
Lincoln
Doncaster
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
11/06/1947
04/07/1947
11/12/1949
21/10/1951
19/12/1954
16/06/1957
12/04/1959
20/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1172   61172   09/06/1947 GOR
EFD
62B
W
Gorton
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
09/06/1947
13/06/1947
27/01/1956
16/12/1965
16/12/1965
B1   1173   61173   09/06/1947 GOR
DAR
51E
51L
56B
56A
50A
W
Gorton
Darlington
Stockton
Thornaby
Ardsley
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
09/06/1947
13/06/1947
04/11/1951
14/06/1959
25/11/1962
05/01/1964
13/11/1966
23/01/1967
23/01/1967
B1   1174   61174   18/06/1947 GOR
DON
MEX
39B
34A
34E
W
Gorton
Doncaster
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Kings Cross
New England
Withdrawn
18/06/1947
20/07/1947
05/11/1947
24/02/1952
19/10/1958
09/10/1960
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1175   61175   18/06/1947 GOR
GRA
STR
40B
40E
W
Gorton
Grantham
Stratford
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
18/06/1947
20/07/1947
07/12/1949
21/10/1951
16/10/1960
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1176   61176   17/06/1947 DAR
STM
DAR
50A
51A
51C
50B
50A
W
Darlington
St Margarets
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
West Hartlepool
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
17/06/1947
29/08/1948
31/10/1948
19/07/1953
25/09/1955
16/06/1963
15/12/1963
06/09/1964
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1177   61177   25/06/1947 GOR
GRA
STR
40A
31A
38A
W
Gorton
Grantham
Stratford
Lincoln
Cambridge
Colwick
Withdrawn
25/06/1947
20/07/1947
29/09/1949
21/10/1951
23/10/1955
28/10/1956
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1178   61178   23/06/1947 HAY
64C
64A
W
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
23/06/1947
09/09/1963
18/11/1963
13/02/1964
13/02/1964
B1   1179   61179   27/06/1947 GOR
SHF
34A
36A
40B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
27/06/1947
10/08/1947
19/10/1958
16/06/1963
14/06/1964
10/01/1965
10/01/1965
B1   1180   61180   30/06/1947 EFD
62B
62C
62B
61B
62B
W
Eastfield
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
30/06/1947
20/06/1955
28/08/1966
06/11/1966
27/11/1966
12/03/1967
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
B1   1181   61181 18 02/07/1947 GOR
SHF
31B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
March
Withdrawn
02/07/1947
24/08/1947
20/01/1963
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1182   61182   04/07/1947 GOR
32A
39A
40B
30A
31A
31B
W
Gorton
Norwich Thorpe
Gorton
Immingham
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
04/07/1947
28/10/1951
27/01/1952
13/06/1954
17/02/1957
10/08/1958
20/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1183   61183   09/07/1947 GOR
SHF
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
09/07/1947
10/08/1947
09/07/1962
09/07/1962
B1   1184   61184   09/07/1947 GOR
64A
W
Gorton
St Margarets
Withdrawn
09/07/1947
13/09/1953
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1185   61185   09/07/1947 GOR
LEI
38A
40B
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Immingham
Withdrawn
09/07/1947
02/11/1947
11/11/1956
06/12/1959
11/10/1964
11/10/1964
B1   1186   61186   16/07/1947 GOR
LEI
38A
38E
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
16/07/1947
02/11/1947
15/02/1953
01/09/1957
05/11/1962
05/11/1962
B1   1187   61187   29/07/1947 GOR
LEI
34E
2F
14D
15E
2F
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
29/07/1947
02/11/1947
26/12/1954
03/10/1959
09/01/1960
13/11/1961
17/03/1962
03/09/1962
03/09/1962
B1   1188   61188   29/07/1947 GOR
LEI
38A
91S
38A
15E
40E
W
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
To Southern Region
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
29/07/1947
02/11/1947
07/12/1952
19/05/1953
27/05/1953
01/06/1958
07/09/1958
14/11/1965
14/11/1965
B1   1189   61189   08/08/1947 SKN
56B
56C
56F
56D
56F
56A
50A
W
Stockton
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
York (North)
Withdrawn
08/08/1947
23/09/1956
22/02/1959
20/08/1961
08/09/1963
12/04/1964
13/11/1966
15/01/1967
11/05/1967
11/05/1967
B1   1190   61190   08/05/1947 DON
40B
41D
40E
W
Doncaster
Immingham
Canklow
Colwick
Withdrawn
08/05/1947
18/06/1950
10/01/1965
13/06/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
B1   1191   61191   13/05/1947 DON
40B
30A
64A
W
Doncaster
Immingham
Stratford
St Margarets
Withdrawn
13/05/1947
18/06/1950
21/10/1951
13/09/1953
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
B1   1192   61192   16/05/1947 DON
LEI
GOR
STR
30F
30A
38A
91S
38A
38E
15E
2F
W
Doncaster
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Colwick
To Southern Region
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
16/05/1947
06/06/1947
06/02/1949
21/08/1949
08/10/1950
10/12/1950
29/06/1952
19/05/1953
27/05/1953
27/06/1954
24/09/1960
12/03/1962
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
B1   1193   61193   19/05/1947 DON
W
Doncaster
Withdrawn
19/05/1947
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1194   61194 28 21/05/1947 DON
MEX
DON
MEX
41D
34E
40E
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Canklow
New England
Colwick
Withdrawn
21/05/1947
06/03/1949
11/09/1949
20/11/1949
09/12/1962
10/11/1963
03/01/1965
29/08/1965
29/08/1965
B1   1195   61195   24/05/1947 IMM
36C
W
Immingham
Frodingham
Withdrawn
24/05/1947
09/05/1965
14/11/1965
14/11/1965
B1   1196   61196   27/05/1947 DON

36A
W
Doncaster

Doncaster (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
27/05/1947
04/07/1964
21/07/1964
26/09/1965
26/09/1965
B1   1197   61197   29/05/1947 EFD
67A
67C
W
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Withdrawn
29/05/1947
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B1   1198   61198   02/06/1947 TWD
BOR
DAR
56F
50A
W
Tweedmouth
Borough Gardens
Darlington
Low Moor
York (North)
Withdrawn
02/06/1947
26/12/1948
06/02/1949
14/06/1959
30/08/1959
05/04/1965
05/04/1965
B1   1199   61199   04/06/1947 TWD
52A
52D
52C
52H
50A
W
Tweedmouth
Gateshead
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/06/1947
01/07/1951
25/09/1955
12/06/1960
16/06/1963
03/10/1965
05/01/1967
05/01/1967
B1   1200   61200   06/06/1947 KX
34E
34A
W
Kings Cross
New England
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
06/06/1947
19/04/1959
27/03/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1201   61201   10/06/1947 DON
32B
38A
38C
38A
15E
26B
W
Doncaster
Ipswich
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Agecroft
Withdrawn
10/06/1947
30/04/1950
20/09/1953
19/12/1954
20/02/1956
26/10/1958
29/08/1959
01/01/1962
01/01/1962
B1   1202   61202   12/06/1947 IMM
40A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
12/06/1947
29/03/1953
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1203   61203   17/06/1947 KX
31A
31B
W
Kings Cross
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
17/06/1947
20/10/1957
11/09/1960
23/07/1962
23/07/1962
B1   1204   61204 19 19/06/1947 IMM
35A
35C
31B
W
Immingham
New England
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
19/06/1947
20/09/1953
16/06/1957
31/01/1960
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1205   61205 20 24/06/1947 GRA
STR
35A
35C
31B
32A
31B
W
Grantham
Stratford
New England
Spital Bridge
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
24/06/1947
18/12/1949
20/09/1953
16/06/1957
31/01/1960
03/12/1961
04/02/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1206   61206   03/07/1947 NWE
31A
32B
35A
34A
34E
15E
2F
W
New England
Cambridge
Ipswich
New England
Kings Cross
Neasden
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
03/07/1947
05/02/1950
26/03/1950
07/05/1950
28/12/1952
05/07/1953
13/11/1961
17/03/1962
03/09/1962
03/09/1962
B1   1207   61207   27/06/1947 NWE
W
New England
Withdrawn
27/06/1947
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1   1208   61208   08/07/1947 RET
36A
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
08/07/1947
13/06/1965
26/09/1965
26/09/1965
B1   1209   61209   01/07/1947 NWE
CLK
ANN
38A
W
New England
Colwick
Annesley
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/07/1947
12/02/1948
21/03/1948
14/10/1956
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1210   61210   03/07/1947 NWE
31B
35A
34A
35A
40E
36A
W
New England
March
New England
Kings Cross
New England
Colwick
Doncaster
Withdrawn
03/07/1947
27/04/1952
08/06/1952
14/12/1952
08/03/1953
22/09/1963
28/11/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1   1211   61211   14/07/1947 RET
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
14/07/1947
05/11/1962
05/11/1962
B1   1212   61212   08/07/1947 RET
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
08/07/1947
01/11/1964
01/11/1964
B1   1213   61213   10/07/1947 RET
36A
36E
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
10/07/1947
09/11/1958
22/11/1959
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1214   61214   16/07/1947 SKN
56C
56D
56F
W
Stockton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
16/07/1947
23/09/1956
08/09/1963
12/04/1964
03/05/1965
03/05/1965
B1   1215   61215   19/07/1947 HLB
53A
56B
W
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Ardsley
Withdrawn
19/07/1947
14/06/1959
25/11/1962
08/03/1965
08/03/1965
B1   1216   61216   15/07/1947 YK
NEV
52C
52B
50A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Blaydon
Heaton
York (North)
Withdrawn
15/07/1947
23/05/1948
15/01/1961
09/09/1962
03/10/1965
23/01/1967
23/01/1967
B1   1217   61217   11/08/1947 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
11/08/1947
21/03/1962
21/03/1962
B1   1218   61218   01/08/1947 NEV
51L
56B
W
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/08/1947
05/02/1961
25/11/1962
03/07/1965
03/07/1965
B1   1219   61219   09/08/1947 CAR
91S
68E
64B
64A
W
Carlisle Canal
To Southern Region
Carlisle Canal
Haymarket
St Margarets
Withdrawn
09/08/1947
20/05/1953
21/06/1953
09/12/1957
23/09/1962
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B1   1220   61220   06/08/1947 SKN
51L
51C
W
Stockton
Thornaby
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
06/08/1947
14/06/1959
24/03/1963
04/10/1965
04/10/1965
B1   1221   61221   16/08/1947 CAR
HAY
64C
64A
62A
62B
W
Carlisle Canal
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
16/08/1947
10/10/1947
09/09/1963
18/11/1963
20/01/1964
10/01/1965
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
B1   1222   61222   11/08/1947 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
11/08/1947
18/01/1962
18/01/1962
B1   1223   61223   24/08/1947 LEI
GOR
26A
39A
31A
32A
32D
32A
32C
40A
40B
40A
40B
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Newton Heath
Gorton
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/08/1947
02/11/1947
02/07/1950
11/08/1950
20/06/1954
24/06/1957
08/12/1957
14/09/1958
03/05/1959
28/02/1960
20/03/1960
27/03/1960
22/09/1963
02/01/1966
02/01/1966
B1   1224   61224   15/08/1947 HTN
DAR
50A
51A
55H
56A
W
Heaton
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Neville Hill
Wakefield
Withdrawn
15/08/1947
07/11/1948
19/07/1953
25/09/1955
16/06/1963
07/06/1964
31/07/1966
31/07/1966
B1   1225   61225   28/08/1947 LEI
GOR
91M
GOR
39B
36A
36E
36A
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
To London Midland Region
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
28/08/1947
02/11/1947
29/05/1949
05/06/1949
29/06/1952
23/10/1955
17/01/1960
10/01/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
B1   1226   61226   21/08/1947 STR
PKS
31B
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
March
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/08/1947
18/01/1948
08/10/1950
10/12/1950
01/01/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1227   61227   21/08/1947 LEI
GOR
30A
31A
30A
30F
40E
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colwick
Withdrawn
21/08/1947
02/11/1947
30/04/1950
04/03/1951
06/05/1951
28/10/1956
27/11/1960
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1228   61228   28/08/1947 LEI
GOR
MAR
GOR
32B
32A
41A
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
March
Gorton
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
28/08/1947
02/11/1947
17/06/1948
31/10/1948
13/06/1954
04/10/1959
17/01/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1229   61229   02/09/1947 ARD
BFD
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
02/09/1947
21/09/1947
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
B1   1230   61230   04/09/1947 ARD
BFD
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
04/09/1947
21/09/1947
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
B1   1231   61231   09/09/1947 DON
RET
W
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
09/09/1947
02/11/1947
30/07/1962
30/07/1962
B1   1232   61232   10/09/1947 STR
PKS
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Withdrawn
10/09/1947
08/02/1948
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
B1   1233   61233 21 10/09/1947 STR
30F
30A
31B

31B
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March

March (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
10/09/1947
24/05/1959
14/06/1959
24/09/1961
16/09/1962
29/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1234   61234   16/09/1947 STR
41A
W
Stratford
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
16/09/1947
03/05/1959
13/08/1962
13/08/1962
B1   1235   61235   18/09/1947 STR
32A
40B
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/09/1947
12/10/1958
03/01/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1236   61236   26/09/1947 STR
31A
31B
W
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
26/09/1947
12/04/1959
20/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1237   61237   24/09/1947 NEV
52A
52G
52C
52H
56A
W
Neville Hill
Gateshead
Sunderland
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Wakefield
Withdrawn
24/09/1947
15/01/1961
30/04/1961
17/06/1962
16/06/1963
31/10/1965
06/12/1966
06/12/1966
B1   1238   61238   26/09/1947 GHD
52C
52A
52H
56B
50A
W
Gateshead
Blaydon
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Ardsley
York (North)
Withdrawn
26/09/1947
10/02/1957
14/06/1959
10/09/1961
07/06/1964
31/10/1965
17/02/1967
17/02/1967
B1   1239   61239   02/10/1947 YK
NEV
YK
68E
9G
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
York (North)
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Withdrawn
02/10/1947
16/05/1948
23/05/1948
20/09/1953
17/06/1962
27/08/1962
27/08/1962
B1   1240   61240   06/10/1947 YK
NEV
51L
50A
56B
56A
W
York (North)
Neville Hill
Thornaby
York (North)
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/10/1947
16/05/1948
01/11/1959
11/09/1960
25/11/1962
31/10/1965
06/12/1966
06/12/1966
B1   1241   61241   08/10/1947 HTN
DAR
52D
52C
52B
W
Heaton
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Heaton
Withdrawn
08/10/1947
07/11/1948
12/03/1950
12/06/1960
09/09/1962
02/12/1962
02/12/1962
B1   1242   61242   10/10/1947 KIT
64A
64C
61C
61A
12C
64A
64C
W
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Keith
Kittybrewster
Carlisle Canal
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Withdrawn
10/10/1947
16/11/1949
15/04/1951
29/09/1951
28/01/1957
17/06/1961
17/09/1961
14/06/1964
23/07/1964
23/07/1964
B1   1243   61243   14/10/1947 EFD
67A
67C
W
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Withdrawn
14/10/1947
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
04/05/1964
04/05/1964
B1   1244   61244   20/10/1947 HAY
64C
64A
W
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
20/10/1947
30/06/1960
01/10/1961
29/10/1965
29/10/1965
B1   1245   61245   20/10/1947 HAY
64C
64A
64C
W
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Withdrawn
20/10/1947
09/09/1963
02/12/1963
12/10/1964
05/07/1965
05/07/1965
B1   1246   61246   22/10/1947 DON
64A
64C
64A
W
Doncaster
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
22/10/1947
13/09/1953
30/01/1956
17/02/1958
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1247   61247   24/10/1947 DON
40E
W
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
24/10/1947
12/06/1960
12/06/1962
12/06/1962
B1   1248   61248   27/10/1947 DON
40A
40B
40A
40B
40E
W
Doncaster
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
27/10/1947
19/12/1954
08/05/1955
19/02/1956
22/11/1959
10/01/1965
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1249   61249   31/10/1947 DON
30A
30F
41A
41D
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Withdrawn
31/10/1947
28/02/1954
08/02/1959
24/05/1959
16/06/1963
04/06/1964
04/06/1964
B1   1250   61250   31/10/1947 DON
34E
34F
36A
40B
36A
W
Doncaster
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
31/10/1947
16/09/1962
16/06/1963
08/09/1963
22/09/1965
30/01/1966
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1   1251   61251   04/11/1947 IPS
KX
34F
36A
40B
W
Ipswich
Kings Cross
Grantham
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
04/11/1947
20/11/1947
14/06/1959
08/09/1963
22/09/1963
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
B1   1252   61252 22 06/11/1947 IPS
31B
31A
32A
30A
31B
W
Ipswich
March
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
06/11/1947
01/11/1959
10/01/1960
20/11/1960
10/09/1961
24/09/1961
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1   1253   61253   10/11/1947 STR
IPS
31B
31A
32A
30A
W
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Withdrawn
10/11/1947
16/11/1947
01/11/1959
10/01/1960
20/11/1960
10/09/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1254   61254   12/11/1947 STR
NOR
IPS
31B
31A
32A
31B
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
12/11/1947
10/12/1947
25/01/1948
01/11/1959
10/01/1960
20/11/1960
04/02/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1255   61255   14/11/1947 HTN
DAR
51G
51L
50B
W
Heaton
Darlington
Haverton Hill
Thornaby
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
14/11/1947
07/11/1948
15/02/1959
14/06/1959
04/03/1962
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
B1   1256   61256   17/11/1947 NEV
52A
53A
50A
W
Neville Hill
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
17/11/1947
15/09/1957
14/09/1958
06/09/1964
07/11/1965
07/11/1965
B1   1257   61257   19/11/1947 NEV
51L
51C
W
Neville Hill
Thornaby
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
19/11/1947
01/11/1959
09/12/1962
04/10/1965
04/10/1965
B1   1258   61258   21/11/1947 NEV
36A
40A
W
Neville Hill
Doncaster
Lincoln
Withdrawn
21/11/1947
27/01/1952
29/06/1952
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
B1   1259   61259   24/11/1947 NEV
51L
56B
W
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
24/11/1947
05/02/1961
25/11/1962
26/08/1965
26/08/1965
B1   1260   61260   26/11/1947 EFD
64B
64C
64A
W
Eastfield
Haymarket
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
26/11/1947
21/03/1957
18/04/1960
01/10/1961
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1   1261   61261   28/11/1947 EFD
64B
65A
67A
67C
62A
W
Eastfield
Haymarket
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
28/11/1947
21/03/1957
26/01/1959
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
31/07/1964
23/09/1966
23/09/1966
B1   1262   61262   01/12/1947 THJ
62B
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/12/1947
18/04/1960
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1   1263   61263   03/12/1947 DEE
PTH
62B
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Perth (LNER)
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
03/12/1947
19/02/1950
13/03/1950
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1   1264   61264 29 05/12/1947 STR
PKS
40E
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colwick
Withdrawn
05/12/1947
18/12/1947
27/11/1960
21/11/1965
21/11/1965
B1   1265   61265   08/12/1947 DON
39A
15E
9G
15E
W
Doncaster
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
08/12/1947
27/06/1954
30/05/1959
20/07/1959
31/07/1961
19/02/1962
19/02/1962
B1   1266   61266   10/12/1947 KX
36A
41A
W
Kings Cross
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
10/12/1947
21/12/1952
12/06/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1267   61267   12/12/1947 ARD
BFD
56A
56C
51C
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Wakefield
Copley Hill (Leeds)
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
12/12/1947
10/04/1949
16/06/1957
15/09/1957
14/09/1958
10/12/1962
10/12/1962
B1   1268   61268   16/12/1947 ARD
BFD
56A
56B
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Wakefield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
16/12/1947
10/04/1949
16/06/1957
25/11/1962
28/12/1964
28/12/1964
B1   1269   61269   24/12/1947 LIN
38A
40A
38A
38C
26B
2F
9G
W
Lincoln
Colwick
Lincoln
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Agecroft
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Withdrawn
24/12/1947
06/04/1952
20/04/1952
27/09/1953
11/11/1956
03/10/1959
21/07/1962
19/11/1962
21/12/1963
21/12/1963
B1   1270   61270   25/12/1947 NOR
32B
32A
36A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Doncaster
Withdrawn
25/12/1947
07/08/1955
23/10/1955
18/10/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1271   61271   26/12/1947 NOR
38A
38E
W
Norwich Thorpe
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
26/12/1947
20/09/1953
16/06/1957
30/07/1962
30/07/1962
B1   1272   61272 25 29/12/1947 NOR
38A
38C
38A
38B
41A
34A
34E
W
Norwich Thorpe
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Annesley
Sheffield Darnall
Kings Cross
New England
Withdrawn
29/12/1947
20/09/1953
19/12/1954
20/02/1955
17/02/1957
26/01/1958
19/10/1958
19/04/1959
03/01/1965
03/01/1965
B1   1273   61273   30/12/1947 DAR
91S
51A
50A
W
Darlington
To Southern Region
Darlington
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/12/1947
17/05/1953
21/06/1953
14/06/1959
07/05/1963
07/05/1963
B1   1274   61274   02/01/1948 DAR
91S
51A
50A
51A
56F
56A
W
Darlington
To Southern Region
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
02/01/1948
17/05/1953
21/06/1953
26/06/1955
25/09/1955
14/06/1959
23/12/1962
23/11/1964
23/11/1964
B1   1275   61275   12/01/1948 DAR
51E
51C
50A
W
Darlington
Stockton
West Hartlepool
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/01/1948
04/11/1951
07/11/1954
12/05/1963
28/10/1965
28/10/1965
B1   1276   61276   14/01/1948 DAR
50A
W
Darlington
York (North)
Withdrawn
14/01/1948
14/06/1959
28/06/1965
28/06/1965
B1   1277   61277   16/01/1948 KIT
KEI
64A
65C
65A
62A
62B
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
St Margarets
Parkhead
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
16/01/1948
11/09/1949
01/12/1949
04/03/1951
18/03/1951
04/05/1957
18/04/1960
02/06/1964
02/06/1964
B1   1278   61278   19/01/1948 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
19/01/1948
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1   1279   61279   21/01/1948 LIN
32A
40A
30A
32A
36A
W
Lincoln
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Doncaster
Withdrawn
21/01/1948
12/09/1954
21/11/1954
17/02/1957
10/08/1958
04/10/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1   1280   61280   23/01/1948 LIN
38A
40A
30A
30F
31A
32A
31B
W
Lincoln
Colwick
Lincoln
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
23/01/1948
06/04/1952
20/04/1952
14/09/1952
08/02/1959
12/04/1959
20/11/1960
04/02/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1281   61281   27/01/1948 LIN
40B
38A
W
Lincoln
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
27/01/1948
19/02/1956
01/06/1958
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
B1   1282   61282   28/01/1948 CLK
LEI
GOR
STR
35A
W
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Stratford
New England
Withdrawn
28/01/1948
21/11/1948
15/05/1949
21/08/1949
27/09/1953
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1283   61283   02/02/1948 CLK
LEI
CLK
38C
38A
38E
38A
38C
38A
34A
31A
32A
30A
W
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Kings Cross
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Withdrawn
02/02/1948
06/11/1949
18/12/1949
05/02/1950
12/03/1950
07/11/1954
20/02/1955
15/11/1956
09/12/1956
05/05/1957
20/10/1957
20/11/1960
10/09/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1284   61284   06/02/1948 IMM
40A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
06/02/1948
22/11/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1285   61285   09/02/1948 CAM
36A
40E
W
Cambridge
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
09/02/1948
28/10/1956
12/06/1960
19/12/1965
19/12/1965
B1   1286   61286   11/02/1948 CAM
30A
31B
W
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
11/02/1948
16/09/1956
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1   1287   61287   13/02/1948 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
13/02/1948
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1     1288 61288   16/02/1948 DAR
YK
W
Darlington
York (North)
Withdrawn
16/02/1948
26/09/1948
06/01/1964
06/01/1964
B1     1289 61289   18/02/1948 DAR
53B
53A
W
Darlington
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
18/02/1948
13/01/1957
14/06/1959
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
B1     1290 61290   20/02/1948 DAR
SKN
68E
W
Darlington
Stockton
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
20/02/1948
14/11/1948
20/09/1953
21/03/1962
21/03/1962
B1     1291 61291   24/02/1948 DAR
BOR
DAR
50A
51A
50A
56B
W
Darlington
Borough Gardens
Darlington
York (North)
Darlington
York (North)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
24/02/1948
25/07/1948
06/02/1949
26/06/1955
25/09/1955
14/06/1959
25/11/1962
20/05/1965
20/05/1965
B1     1292 61292   25/02/1948 THJ
HAY
DEE
W
Thornton Junction
Haymarket
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
25/02/1948
28/03/1948
25/07/1948
10/09/1965
10/09/1965
B1     1293 61293   27/02/1948 DEE
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
27/02/1948
17/08/1966
17/08/1966
B1     1294 61294   01/03/1948 BFD
65A
61A
64A
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Eastfield
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/03/1948
13/09/1953
09/06/1954
30/05/1960
13/11/1964
13/11/1964
B1     1295 61295   03/03/1948 ARD
COP
37A
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
03/03/1948
26/09/1948
11/10/1953
25/11/1962
25/11/1962
B1     1296 61296   06/03/1948 ARD
37C
56A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/03/1948
04/06/1950
16/06/1957
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
B1     1297 61297   10/03/1948 ARD
COP
ARD
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
10/03/1948
10/04/1949
02/10/1949
25/11/1962
25/11/1962
B1     1298 61298   11/03/1948 LEI
26B
9G
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Agecroft
Gorton
Withdrawn
11/03/1948
03/10/1959
05/05/1962
14/06/1962
14/06/1962
B1     1299 61299   12/03/1948 LEI
38A
W
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Withdrawn
12/03/1948
17/11/1957
25/07/1965
25/07/1965
B1     1300 61300 23 15/03/1948 MAR
CAM
30E
30A
31B
31A
31B
W
March
Cambridge
Colchester
Stratford
March
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
15/03/1948
21/03/1949
14/12/1958
06/12/1959
13/12/1959
10/01/1960
17/06/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1     1301 61301   17/03/1948 CAM
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/03/1948
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1     1302 61302   22/03/1948 CAM
35A
40E
W
Cambridge
New England
Colwick
Withdrawn
22/03/1948
07/10/1956
03/01/1965
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
B1     1303 61303   26/03/1948 DAR
SKN
51L
50B
50A
W
Darlington
Stockton
Thornaby
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Withdrawn
26/03/1948
14/11/1948
14/06/1959
04/03/1962
06/09/1964
21/11/1966
21/11/1966
B1       61304   31/03/1948 HLD
HLB
50E
51A
56B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Scarborough
Darlington
Ardsley
Withdrawn
31/03/1948
16/05/1948
14/06/1959
27/03/1960
07/06/1964
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1       61305   01/04/1948 HLD
HLB
50E
50B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Scarborough
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/04/1948
16/05/1948
14/06/1959
20/03/1960
21/10/1963
21/10/1963
B1       61306   05/04/1948 HLD
HLB
53A
56F
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Hull Dairycoates
Low Moor
Withdrawn
05/04/1948
16/05/1948
14/06/1959
25/06/1967
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
B1       61307   07/04/1948 KIT
61C
61A
64A
64C
64A
64F
62A
64A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Bathgate
Thornton Junction
St Margarets
Withdrawn
07/04/1948
07/07/1954
18/02/1957
31/07/1957
14/06/1964
04/10/1965
09/01/1966
24/04/1966
28/08/1966
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
B1       61308   09/04/1948 KIT
KEI
61A
64A
61A
64A
64C
64A
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
09/04/1948
08/01/1950
18/02/1957
19/08/1957
21/05/1960
19/06/1961
12/10/1964
04/10/1965
03/04/1966
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
B1       61309   15/04/1948 ARD
37B
56F
56D
56F
56A
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
15/04/1948
29/07/1951
08/09/1963
05/01/1964
12/04/1964
13/11/1966
23/01/1967
23/01/1967
B1       61310   19/04/1948 ARD
37B
37A
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
19/04/1948
18/02/1951
06/01/1952
05/04/1965
05/04/1965
B1       61311   21/04/1948 SHF
40A
34A
30A
30F
30E
30F
30A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Lincoln
Kings Cross
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/04/1948
26/09/1954
07/10/1956
10/02/1957
10/08/1958
14/12/1958
01/11/1959
01/01/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61312   23/04/1948 SHF
32A
32D
32A
41A
41H
41D
41A
41H
34A
41F
W
Sheffield Darnall
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Staveley (G.C.)
Canklow
Sheffield Darnall
Staveley (G.C.)
Kings Cross
Mexborough
Withdrawn
23/04/1948
03/10/1954
29/01/1956
01/04/1956
03/05/1959
20/09/1959
03/01/1960
10/09/1961
23/09/1962
10/03/1963
16/06/1963
01/03/1964
01/03/1964
B1       61313   27/04/1948 GOR
SHF
41D
41J
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
27/04/1948
03/10/1948
16/06/1963
13/06/1965
14/11/1965
14/11/1965
B1       61314   29/04/1948 GOR
SHF
31A
36A
34E
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Cambridge
Doncaster
New England
Withdrawn
29/04/1948
03/10/1948
29/09/1957
11/10/1959
16/09/1962
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1       61315 32 30/04/1948 GOR
SHF
41D
41J
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
30/04/1948
03/10/1948
16/06/1963
13/06/1965
10/02/1966
10/02/1966
B1       61316   04/05/1948 GOR
SHF
41F
41D
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Canklow
Withdrawn
04/05/1948
13/10/1948
15/05/1960
11/03/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1       61317   06/05/1948 GOR
SHF
32A
40A
40B
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Norwich Thorpe
Lincoln
Immingham
Withdrawn
06/05/1948
19/06/1949
12/09/1954
14/02/1960
20/03/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61318   11/05/1948 IMM
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
11/05/1948
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61319   14/05/1948 BOR
56A
51A
50A
W
Borough Gardens
Wakefield
Darlington
York (North)
Withdrawn
14/05/1948
08/06/1958
14/09/1958
14/06/1959
16/12/1966
16/12/1966
B1       61320   18/05/1948 BOR
25A
56G
56C
56A
W
Borough Gardens
Wakefield
Bradford Hammerton Street
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Wakefield
Withdrawn
18/05/1948
16/06/1956
23/09/1956
15/09/1957
05/01/1964
19/08/1965
19/08/1965
B1       61321   20/05/1948 BOR
56A
51A
56B
W
Borough Gardens
Wakefield
Darlington
Ardsley
Withdrawn
20/05/1948
08/06/1958
14/09/1958
07/06/1964
10/08/1964
10/08/1964
B1       61322   25/05/1948 BOR
STM
DAR
52D
52C
52B
52A
50B
W
Borough Gardens
St Margarets
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Blaydon
Heaton
Gateshead
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
25/05/1948
29/08/1948
31/10/1948
12/03/1950
12/06/1960
09/09/1962
16/06/1963
31/10/1965
20/02/1966
20/02/1966
B1       61323 24 27/05/1948 KIT
35C
31B
W
Kittybrewster
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
27/05/1948
25/02/1957
31/01/1960
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1       61324   01/06/1948 KIT
12C
64C
64A
W
Kittybrewster
Carlisle Canal
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/06/1948
17/06/1961
23/08/1961
05/11/1962
12/10/1965
12/10/1965
B1       61325   03/06/1948 IMM
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
03/06/1948
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61326   08/06/1948 GOR
26A
39A
36A
W
Gorton
Newton Heath
Gorton
Doncaster
Withdrawn
08/06/1948
11/08/1950
24/09/1950
27/06/1954
20/03/1966
20/03/1966
B1       61327   11/06/1948 GOR
SHF
41D
W
Gorton
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Withdrawn
11/06/1948
19/06/1949
02/12/1962
14/02/1965
14/02/1965
B1       61328   16/06/1948 IMM
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
16/06/1948
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61329   18/06/1948 NWE
MAR
LIN
30A
91S
30A
31B
36A
W
New England
March
Lincoln
Stratford
To Southern Region
Stratford
March
Doncaster
Withdrawn
18/06/1948
12/06/1949
20/10/1949
21/10/1951
19/05/1953
23/05/1953
16/09/1962
28/10/1962
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1       61330   23/06/1948 NWE
64A
64D
64A
62A
W
New England
St Margarets
Carstairs
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
23/06/1948
13/09/1953
06/12/1954
27/02/1956
02/05/1957
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
B1       61331   25/06/1948 NWE
34A
34E
W
New England
Kings Cross
New England
Withdrawn
25/06/1948
28/12/1952
27/03/1960
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61332   30/06/1948 CAM
NOR
64A
62A
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
30/06/1948
11/07/1948
13/09/1953
12/11/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1       61333   02/07/1948 CAM
NOR
CAM
HAY
CAM
64A
64F
65A
61A
64A
64B
65A
65C
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Haymarket
Cambridge
St Margarets
Bathgate
Eastfield
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Haymarket
Eastfield
Parkhead
Withdrawn
02/07/1948
11/07/1948
15/08/1948
29/08/1948
15/11/1948
13/09/1953
31/01/1954
19/04/1954
09/06/1954
17/07/1957
21/10/1957
26/01/1959
12/03/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1       61334   07/07/1948 NOR
CAM
41A
41D
41A
41D
9G
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Gorton
Withdrawn
07/07/1948
15/08/1948
28/10/1956
03/01/1960
29/04/1961
02/12/1962
01/12/1963
01/12/1963
01/12/1963
B1       61335   15/07/1948 STR
HAY
STR
32A
30A
W
Stratford
Haymarket
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/07/1948
29/08/1948
08/11/1948
18/06/1961
10/09/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61336   05/08/1948 STR
STM
STR
30E
30A
30F
40E
W
Stratford
St Margarets
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colwick
Withdrawn
05/08/1948
29/08/1948
07/11/1948
30/10/1956
06/12/1959
13/12/1959
27/11/1960
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61337   12/08/1948 NEV
STM
YK
56F
W
Neville Hill
St Margarets
York (North)
Low Moor
Withdrawn
12/08/1948
29/08/1948
31/10/1948
25/06/1967
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
B1       61338   20/08/1948 NEV
52B
50B
50A
91S
50A
51A
55H
56A
W
Neville Hill
Heaton
Neville Hill
York (North)
To Southern Region
York (North)
Darlington
Neville Hill
Wakefield
Withdrawn
20/08/1948
19/11/1950
01/01/1951
02/09/1951
19/05/1953
21/06/1953
25/09/1955
16/06/1963
07/06/1964
11/01/1965
11/01/1965
B1       61339   08/09/1948 NEV
50A
56C
W
Neville Hill
York (North)
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
08/09/1948
02/09/1951
08/06/1958
25/11/1962
25/11/1962
B1       61340   27/11/1948 EFD
65F
62A
62B
62B
W
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
27/11/1948
30/01/1961
16/10/1961
12/11/1961
13/11/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1       61341   18/12/1948 EFD
PKD
64A
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
St Margarets
Withdrawn
18/12/1948
16/01/1949
20/11/1949
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1       61342   03/01/1949 EFD
66B
W
Eastfield
Motherwell
Withdrawn
03/01/1949
10/11/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1       61343   04/02/1949 61B
61A
62A
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
04/02/1949
16/05/1949
24/03/1959
03/03/1966
03/03/1966
B1       61344   05/03/1949 EFD
65C
64A
62A
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
05/03/1949
28/10/1957
13/08/1962
24/04/1966
23/09/1966
23/09/1966
B1       61345   08/04/1949 61B
61A
64A
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Withdrawn
08/04/1949
16/05/1949
19/06/1961
14/07/1966
14/07/1966
B1       61346   30/04/1949 61A
KEI
61A
61B
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
30/04/1949
09/01/1950
21/12/1950
19/06/1961
26/12/1962
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B1       61347   21/05/1949 61A
KEI
61A
61B
64C
64A
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
21/05/1949
09/01/1950
21/12/1950
19/06/1961
09/08/1964
04/10/1965
24/04/1966
04/04/1967
04/04/1967
B1       61348   09/06/1949 61A
35C
31B
40A
36E
36A
36C
40E
W
Kittybrewster
Spital Bridge
March
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Frodingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
09/06/1949
25/02/1957
31/01/1960
03/04/1960
05/01/1964
13/06/1965
11/07/1965
14/11/1965
26/12/1965
26/12/1965
B1       61349   02/07/1949 61A
64A
62A
W
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
02/07/1949
22/08/1957
24/04/1966
17/08/1966
17/08/1966
B1       61350   28/07/1949 61A
61B
64A
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Withdrawn
28/07/1949
19/06/1961
16/05/1962
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
B1       61351   16/08/1949 61A
64A
64C
W
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Withdrawn
16/08/1949
19/08/1957
14/06/1964
13/07/1964
13/07/1964
B1       61352   25/08/1949 61A
63b
9G
W
Kittybrewster
Mallaig
Gorton
Withdrawn
25/08/1949
19/06/1961
12/08/1962
22/10/1962
22/10/1962
B1       61353   06/09/1949 61A
KEI
RTS
61C
51A
55H
56A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
RugbyTesting Station
Keith
Darlington
Neville Hill
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/09/1949
12/12/1949
04/10/1950
28/08/1951
02/09/1951
16/06/1963
07/06/1964
16/08/1965
16/08/1965
B1       61354   14/09/1949 64A
64C
64A
91S
64A
62A
62B
W
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
To Southern Region
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
14/09/1949
11/03/1951
29/09/1951
20/05/1953
25/06/1953
24/04/1966
13/11/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1       61355   21/09/1949 64A
64B
65A
67A
67C
W
St Margarets
Haymarket
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Withdrawn
21/09/1949
27/09/1954
24/01/1959
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B1       61356   28/09/1949 64A
64C
64A
W
St Margarets
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
28/09/1949
15/04/1951
29/09/1951
23/07/1964
23/07/1964
B1       61357   10/10/1949 64A
64D
64A
W
St Margarets
Carstairs
St Margarets
Withdrawn
10/10/1949
03/02/1955
28/03/1955
08/06/1965
08/06/1965
B1       61358   18/10/1949 64A
62A
W
St Margarets
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
18/10/1949
02/05/1957
25/12/1963
25/12/1963
B1       61359   26/10/1949 64A
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
26/10/1949
28/12/1963
28/12/1963
B1       61360   22/03/1950 30A
30E
31A
36A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Cambridge
Doncaster
Withdrawn
22/03/1950
06/01/1957
12/04/1959
01/11/1959
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1       61361   24/03/1950 30A
30E
30F
40E
W
Stratford
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Colwick
Withdrawn
24/03/1950
06/01/1957
06/12/1959
27/11/1960
26/12/1965
26/12/1965
B1       61362   31/03/1950 30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/03/1950
08/02/1959
01/01/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61363   05/04/1950 30A
30E
30A
31B
31A
30A
31B
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
March
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
05/04/1950
06/01/1957
06/12/1959
13/12/1959
10/01/1960
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
23/09/1962
23/09/1962
B1       61364   19/04/1950 40A
35A
34A
34E
W
Lincoln
New England
Kings Cross
New England
Withdrawn
19/04/1950
20/09/1953
13/02/1955
03/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61365   21/04/1950 40B
36A
40B
W
Immingham
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
21/04/1950
01/11/1953
30/12/1962
11/07/1965
11/07/1965
B1       61366   24/04/1950 40B
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/04/1950
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
B1       61367   28/04/1950 38A
38E
38A
38C
38A
34A
35A
34F
36A
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Kings Cross
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
28/04/1950
27/05/1951
30/12/1951
27/01/1952
27/04/1952
05/05/1957
20/10/1957
14/06/1959
08/09/1963
22/08/1965
22/08/1965
B1       61368   30/04/1950 38A
38E
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
05/05/1950
20/05/1951
29/01/1962
29/01/1962
B1       61369   16/05/1950 38A
38C
26B
2F
9G
W
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Agecroft
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Withdrawn
16/05/1950
12/10/1952
03/10/1959
21/07/1962
17/11/1962
21/12/1963
21/12/1963
B1       61370   10/10/1950 40A
35A
31B
40A
30A
30E
41A
41D
40B
36C
W
Lincoln
New England
March
Lincoln
Stratford
Colchester
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Immingham
Frodingham
Withdrawn
10/10/1950
04/03/1951
08/04/1951
17/06/1951
21/10/1951
06/01/1957
14/06/1959
03/04/1960
28/03/1965
09/05/1965
04/07/1965
04/07/1965
B1       61371   24/10/1950 40A
31A
31B
W
Lincoln
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
24/10/1950
23/10/1955
17/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61372   08/12/1950 40B
30A
30F
41A
41D
41J
W
Immingham
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
08/12/1950
21/10/1951
08/02/1959
27/11/1960
16/06/1963
13/06/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
B1       61373   26/12/1950 40B
35A
31B
40B
30A
30E
30F
41A
W
Immingham
New England
March
Immingham
Stratford
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
26/12/1950
04/03/1951
08/04/1951
17/06/1951
21/10/1951
06/01/1957
25/10/1959
27/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61374   12/02/1951 40B
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
12/02/1951
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61375 24 23/02/1951 40B
30A
31B
W
Immingham
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
23/02/1951
21/10/1951
16/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1       61376   12/04/1951 38A
38E
38A
38C
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
12/04/1951
30/09/1951
30/12/1951
10/12/1956
05/02/1962
05/02/1962
B1       61377   01/05/1951 38A
32A
37A
37B
37A
36A
41A
41J
W
Colwick
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Doncaster
Sheffield Darnall
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
01/05/1951
09/12/1951
27/01/1952
29/06/1952
07/03/1954
18/12/1955
12/06/1960
24/09/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61378   25/05/1951 38A
30A
30F
30A
31B
W
Colwick
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
25/05/1951
19/10/1952
08/02/1959
01/01/1961
16/09/1962
25/11/1963
25/11/1963
B1       61379   14/06/1951 38A
40B
W
Colwick
Immingham
Withdrawn
14/06/1951
08/07/1951
06/08/1962
06/08/1962
B1       61380   22/08/1951 38A
38C
2F
W
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
22/08/1951
25/01/1953
17/03/1962
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
B1       61381   07/09/1951 38A
38E
38C
38E
38C
9G
15E
9G
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Woodford Halse
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Leicester (G.C.)
Gorton
Withdrawn
07/09/1951
25/11/1951
28/02/1954
07/11/1954
20/02/1955
11/05/1962
17/05/1962
19/07/1962
01/11/1962
01/11/1962
B1       61382   18/09/1951 37A
56G
56F
51A
56C
56B
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Darlington
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
18/09/1951
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
14/09/1958
16/06/1963
06/09/1964
07/12/1964
07/12/1964
B1       61383   03/10/1951 37A
56G
56F
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
03/10/1951
15/09/1957
12/01/1958
21/01/1963
21/01/1963
B1       61384   17/10/1951 37A
37C
30A
30F
40A
40B
36E
36A
40B
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Lincoln
Immingham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
17/10/1951
20/07/1952
19/10/1952
16/09/1956
10/04/1960
22/09/1963
07/03/1965
13/06/1965
03/10/1965
09/01/1966
09/01/1966
B1       61385   25/10/1951 37A
38C
37A
56A
56C
56B
W
Ardsley
Leicester (G.C.)
Ardsley
Wakefield
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
25/10/1951
27/07/1952
10/08/1952
22/02/1959
25/11/1962
06/09/1964
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1       61386   30/10/1951 37A
37B
56F
56D
56F
52F
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Blyth (North)
Withdrawn
30/10/1951
06/01/1952
20/08/1961
08/09/1963
12/04/1964
21/08/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
B1       61387   02/11/1951 37A
37B
51A
56F
56A
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Darlington
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
02/11/1951
06/01/1952
14/09/1958
14/06/1959
23/12/1962
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
B1       61388   09/11/1951 37A
37B
50A
56B
56F
56A
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
York (North)
Ardsley
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
09/11/1951
02/11/1952
30/08/1959
25/11/1962
31/10/1965
13/11/1966
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
B1       61389   30/11/1951 35A
35B
36A
40B
36C
W
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Immingham
Frodingham
Withdrawn
30/11/1951
06/10/1957
08/09/1963
14/06/1964
09/05/1965
14/11/1965
14/11/1965
B1       61390   12/12/1951 35A
38A
40B
36A
40E
W
New England
Colwick
Immingham
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
12/12/1951
29/06/1952
24/10/1954
13/12/1959
12/06/1960
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
B1       61391   18/12/1951 35A
W
New England
Withdrawn
18/12/1951
10/09/1962
10/09/1962
B1       61392   27/12/1951 35A
30A
31A
35A
35B
36A
40B
41D
40E
W
New England
Stratford
Cambridge
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Immingham
Canklow
Colwick
Withdrawn
27/12/1951
24/03/1956
25/03/1956
07/10/1956
06/10/1957
08/09/1963
14/06/1964
10/01/1965
13/06/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
B1       61393   11/01/1952 36A
34A
34A
34E
34A
41F
W
Doncaster
Kings Cross
Kings Cross
New England
Kings Cross
Mexborough
Withdrawn
11/01/1952
21/12/1952
13/06/1954
08/11/1959
24/01/1960
16/06/1963
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61394   23/01/1952 36A
34A
34A
34E
34A
41F
41D
41J
W
Doncaster
Kings Cross
Kings Cross
Neasden
Kings Cross
Mexborough
Canklow
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
23/01/1952
21/12/1952
13/06/1954
17/03/1957
19/05/1957
16/06/1963
01/03/1964
13/06/1965
14/11/1965
14/11/1965
B1       61395   01/02/1952 68E
9G
W
Carlisle Canal
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/02/1952
17/06/1962
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
B1       61396   20/02/1952 65A
67A
67C
64A
W
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
St Margarets
Withdrawn
20/02/1952
31/12/1962
11/03/1963
31/07/1964
10/09/1965
10/09/1965
B1       61397   13/03/1952 64A
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
13/03/1952
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
B1       61398   28/03/1952 64A
64D
64A
62B
W
St Margarets
Carstairs
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
28/03/1952
11/11/1954
17/02/1956
20/07/1964
05/11/1964
05/11/1964
B1       61399   22/04/1952 36A
30A
32A
41A
41D
W
Doncaster
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Canklow
Withdrawn
22/04/1952
19/10/1952
08/02/1959
31/01/1960
02/12/1962
22/09/1963
22/09/1963
B1       61400   30/03/1950 61A
61B
64C
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dalry Road
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
30/03/1950
19/06/1961
09/08/1964
05/10/1964
17/12/1964
17/12/1964
B1       61401   12/04/1950 61A
62A
65A
65F
62A
W
Kittybrewster
Thornton Junction
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
12/04/1950
15/10/1956
13/04/1960
03/01/1961
16/10/1961
17/04/1964
17/04/1964
B1       61402   27/04/1950 61A
62B
W
Kittybrewster
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
27/04/1950
02/07/1950
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
B1       61403   27/04/1950 61A
62B
62A
65A
65F
62B
W
Kittybrewster
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
27/04/1950
02/07/1950
07/03/1955
09/04/1960
03/01/1961
11/11/1963
14/07/1966
14/07/1966
B1       61404   04/05/1950 61A
64B
65B
65C
64A
W
Kittybrewster
Haymarket
St Rollox (Balornock)
Parkhead
St Margarets
Withdrawn
04/05/1950
12/11/1950
19/01/1959
24/03/1959
13/08/1962
09/11/1965
09/11/1965
B1       61405   10/05/1950 40A
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
10/05/1950
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
B1       61406   20/05/1950 40A
40B
36A
W
Lincoln
Immingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
20/05/1950
21/05/1950
06/02/1966
17/04/1966
17/04/1966
B1       61407   10/06/1950 40B
64A
64C
62A
W
Immingham
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
10/06/1950
13/09/1953
30/01/1956
14/08/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
B1       61408   13/06/1950 40B
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
13/06/1950
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
B1       61409   15/06/1950 40B
40A
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
15/06/1950
29/11/1959
22/09/1963
22/09/1963