Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "A4" Class 4-6-2
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LNER |
4466 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
605 |
1946 1st |
on |
26/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
4483 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
585 |
1946 1st |
|
30/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4486 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
588 |
1946 1st |
|
31/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4485 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
587 |
1946 1st |
|
18/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4484 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
25 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
585 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
24 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
588 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
27 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4489 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
10 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4467 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
21 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4493 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
29 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
587 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
26 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
605 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4497 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
31 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
2509 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
14 |
1946 2nd |
|
14/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4901 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4464 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
19 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4492 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
13 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4462 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
4 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4494 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2510 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
15 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4463 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
18 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4465 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
20 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2512 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
17 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4468 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
22 |
1946 2nd |
|
29/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4499 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4902 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
33 |
1946 2nd |
|
31/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4903 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
34 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4500 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2511 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
16 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4487 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
28 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4482 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
23 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4490 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
11 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4495 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
30 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4496 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
32 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4488 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
4491 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
12 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
4498 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
4 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E4 |
BR Tmp |
|
20/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
21 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E21 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
22 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E22 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
27 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E27 |
BR Tmp |
|
11/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
34 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60034 |
|
|
24/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
7 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60007 |
|
|
24/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
23 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60023 |
|
|
25/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
33 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60033 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60009 |
|
|
05/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60002 |
|
|
14/05/1948 |
|
BR |
E4 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60004 |
|
|
25/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
12 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60012 |
|
|
26/05/1948 |
|
BR |
E27 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60027 |
|
|
02/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
31 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60031 |
|
|
04/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
28 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60028 |
|
|
07/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
16 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60016 |
|
|
11/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
24 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60024 |
|
|
18/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
5 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60005 |
|
|
09/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
1 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60001 |
|
|
14/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
29 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60029 |
|
|
16/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
30 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60030 |
|
|
30/07/1948 |
|
BR |
E21 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60021 |
|
|
21/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
20 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60020 |
|
|
01/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
19 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60019 |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
18 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60018 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
10 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60010 |
|
|
27/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60008 |
|
|
29/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
6 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60006 |
|
|
02/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
15 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60015 |
|
|
17/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
3 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60003 |
|
|
04/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
11 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60011 |
|
|
17/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
17 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60017 |
|
|
27/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
13 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60013 |
|
|
20/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
32 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60032 |
|
|
10/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
14 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60014 |
|
|
22/06/1949 |
|
BR |
E22 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60022 |
|
|
16/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
26 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60026 |
|
|
23/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
25 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60025 |
|
|
27/01/1950 |
|