Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "A4" Class 4-6-2
Class |
LNER (1943) |
LNER (1946 1st) |
LNER (1946 2nd) |
BR |
BR (BR Tmp) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
A4 |
2509
|
(580)
|
14
|
60014
|
|
07/09/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
12/04/1961 |
A4 |
2510
|
(581)
|
15
|
60015
|
|
21/09/1935 |
25/04/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
13/01/1961 |
A4 |
2511
|
(582)
|
16
|
60016
|
|
05/11/1935 |
19/03/1965 |
Speedometer fitted |
08/07/1960 |
A4 |
2512
|
(583)
|
17
|
60017
|
|
18/12/1935 |
20/10/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
26/10/1960 |
A4 |
4482
|
(584)
|
23
|
60023
|
|
22/12/1936 |
30/10/1964 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
23/03/1959 |
A4 |
4483
|
585
|
24
|
60024
|
|
26/12/1936 |
05/09/1966 |
Speedometer fitted |
15/06/1961 |
A4 |
4484
|
(586)
|
25
|
60025
|
|
23/01/1937 |
20/10/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
16/06/1960 |
A4 |
4485
|
587
|
26
|
60026
|
|
20/02/1937 |
21/12/1965 |
Speedometer fitted |
21/10/1960 |
A4 |
4486
|
588
|
27
|
60027
|
27
|
13/03/1937 |
03/09/1965 |
Double Chimney fitted |
12/02/1958 |
A4 |
4487
|
(589)
|
28
|
60028
|
|
20/03/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
18/04/1961 |
A4 |
4488
|
(590)
|
9
|
60009
|
|
29/06/1937 |
01/06/1966 |
Double Chimney fitted |
18/11/1958 |
A4 |
4489
|
(591)
|
10
|
60010
|
|
04/05/1937 |
29/05/1965 |
Speedometer fitted |
15/10/1960 |
A4 |
4490
|
(592)
|
11
|
60011
|
|
25/06/1937 |
11/05/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
28/10/1960 |
A4 |
4491
|
(593)
|
12
|
60012
|
|
22/06/1937 |
20/08/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
27/10/1961 |
A4 |
4492
|
(594)
|
13
|
60013
|
|
27/06/1937 |
18/04/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
29/06/1961 |
A4 |
4493
|
(595)
|
29
|
60029
|
|
26/07/1937 |
20/10/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
08/04/1960 |
A4 |
4494
|
(596)
|
3
|
60003
|
|
12/08/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
02/02/1961 |
A4 |
4495
|
(597)
|
30
|
60030
|
|
30/08/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
28/07/1961 |
A4 |
4496
|
(598)
|
8
|
60008
|
|
04/09/1937 |
20/07/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
30/06/1960 |
A4 |
4497
|
(599)
|
31
|
60031
|
|
02/10/1937 |
29/10/1965 |
Speedometer fitted |
03/1961 |
A4 |
4498
|
(600)
|
7
|
60007
|
|
30/10/1937 |
01/02/1966 |
Speedometer fitted |
16/04/1959 |
A4 |
4462
|
(601)
|
4
|
60004
|
4
|
10/12/1937 |
17/07/1966 |
Speedometer fitted |
25/01/1961 |
A4 |
4463
|
(602)
|
18
|
60018
|
|
27/11/1937 |
19/06/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
17/02/1961 |
A4 |
4464
|
(603)
|
19
|
60019
|
|
18/12/1937 |
05/09/1966 |
Speedometer fitted |
16/03/1960 |
A4 |
4465
|
(604)
|
20
|
60020
|
|
08/01/1938 |
20/03/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
19/05/1961 |
A4 |
4466
|
605
|
6
|
60006
|
|
26/01/1938 |
03/09/1965 |
Speedometer fitted |
29/12/1960 |
A4 |
4467
|
(606)
|
21
|
60021
|
21
|
19/02/1938 |
20/10/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
17/11/1961 |
A4 |
4468
|
(607)
|
22
|
60022
|
22
|
03/03/1938 |
25/04/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
09/03/1960 |
A4 |
4469
|
|
|
|
|
30/03/1938 |
06/06/1942 |
Side skirting removed |
25/10/1941 |
A4 |
4499
|
(608)
|
2
|
60002
|
|
12/04/1938 |
04/05/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
26/01/1961 |
A4 |
4500
|
(609)
|
1
|
60001
|
|
26/04/1938 |
12/10/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
05/10/1961 |
A4 |
4900
|
(610)
|
32
|
60032
|
|
17/05/1938 |
20/10/1963 |
Speedometer fitted |
29/04/1960 |
A4 |
4901
|
(611)
|
5
|
60005
|
|
08/06/1938 |
12/03/1964 |
Speedometer fitted |
14/07/1960 |
A4 |
4902
|
(612)
|
33
|
60033
|
|
28/06/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
08/06/1961 |
A4 |
4903
|
(613)
|
34
|
60034
|
|
01/07/1938 |
24/08/1966 |
Speedometer fitted |
02/11/1960 |