LNER Gresley "A4" Class 4-6-2
LNER (1943) | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946 2nd) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2509 | 580 | 14 | 60014 | 07/09/1935 | Kings Cross | 29/12/1962 | Kings Cross | 27.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 16/01/1963 | 27.38 | SILVER LINK | |
2510 | 581 | 15 | 60015 | 21/09/1935 | Kings Cross | 25/04/1963 | Kings Cross | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/05/1963 | 27.65 | QUICKSILVER | |
2511 | 582 | 16 | 60016 | 05/11/1935 | Kings Cross | 19/03/1965 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 29.33 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 05/1965 | 29.55 | SILVER KING | |
2512 | 583 | 17 | 60017 | 18/12/1935 | Kings Cross | 20/10/1963 | New England | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/12/1963 | 27.98 | SILVER FOX | |
4482 | 584 | 23 | 60023 | 22/12/1936 | Kings Cross | 30/10/1964 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 27.83 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 12/1964 | 28.00 | GOLDEN EAGLE | |
4483 | 585 | 24 | 60024 | 26/12/1936 | Haymarket | 05/09/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 29.75 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 10/1966 | 29.82 | KINGFISHER | |
4484 | 586 | 25 | 60025 | 23/01/1937 | Haymarket | 20/10/1963 | New England | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/01/1964 | 26.96 | FALCON | |
4485 | 587 | 26 | 60026 | 20/02/1937 | Haymarket | 21/12/1965 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28.83 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 09/1967 | 30.59 | KESTREL | |
4486 | 588 | 27 | E27 | 60027 | 13/03/1937 | Haymarket | 03/09/1965 | St Margarets | 28.5 | Cut | Campbells (Shieldhall) | 12/1965 | 28.78 | MERLIN |
4487 | 589 | 28 | 60028 | 20/03/1937 | Haymarket | 29/12/1962 | Kings Cross | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 18/01/1963 | 25.85 | SEA EAGLE | |
4488 | 590 | 9 | 60009 | 29/06/1937 | Haymarket | 01/06/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 29 | Prs | Preserved | OSPREY | |||
4489 | 591 | 10 | 60010 | 04/05/1937 | Kings Cross | 29/05/1965 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28 | Prs | Preserved | DOMINION OF CANADA | |||
4490 | 592 | 11 | 60011 | 25/06/1937 | Kings Cross | 11/05/1964 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 05/1964 | 26.91 | EMPIRE OF INDIA | |
4491 | 593 | 12 | 60012 | 22/06/1937 | Haymarket | 20/08/1964 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 27.17 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 27.75 | COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA | |
4492 | 594 | 13 | 60013 | 27/06/1937 | Kings Cross | 18/04/1963 | Kings Cross | 25.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 23/04/1963 | 25.84 | DOMINION OF NEW ZEALAND | |
4493 | 595 | 29 | 60029 | 26/07/1937 | Gateshead | 20/10/1963 | New England | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/01/1964 | 26.46 | WOODCOCK | |
4494 | 596 | 3 | 60003 | 12/08/1937 | Heaton | 29/12/1962 | Kings Cross | 25.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 15/01/1963 | 25.44 | ANDREW K McCOSH | |
4495 | 597 | 30 | 60030 | 30/08/1937 | Doncaster | 29/12/1962 | Kings Cross | 25.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 25/01/1963 | 25.42 | GOLDEN FLEECE | |
4496 | 598 | 8 | 60008 | 04/09/1937 | 20/07/1963 | New England | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | DWIGHT D EISENHOWER | ||||
4497 | 599 | 31 | 60031 | 02/10/1937 | 29/10/1965 | St Rollox (Balornock) | 28 | Cut | Campbells (Shieldhall) | 12/1965 | 28.22 | GOLDEN PLOVER | ||
4498 | 600 | 7 | 60007 | 30/10/1937 | 01/02/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28.33 | Prs | Preserved | SIR NIGEL GRESLEY | ||||
4462 | 601 | 4 | E4 | 60004 | 10/12/1937 | Kings Cross | 17/07/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 10/1966 | 28.87 | GREAT SNIPE |
4463 | 602 | 18 | 60018 | 27/11/1937 | 19/06/1963 | Gateshead | 25.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/07/1963 | 25.63 | SPARROWHAWK | ||
4464 | 603 | 19 | 60019 | 18/12/1937 | Heaton | 05/09/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28.75 | Prs | Preserved | BITTERN | |||
4465 | 604 | 20 | 60020 | 08/01/1938 | Gateshead | 20/03/1964 | Gateshead | 26.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 29/04/1964 | 26.32 | GUILLEMOT | |
4466 | 605 | 6 | 60006 | 26/01/1938 | Kings Cross | 03/09/1965 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 27.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 10/1966 | 28.74 | HERRING GULL | |
4467 | 606 | 21 | E21 | 60021 | 19/02/1938 | Kings Cross | 20/10/1963 | New England | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/01/1964 | 25.89 | WILD SWAN |
4468 | 607 | 22 | E22 | 60022 | 03/03/1938 | Doncaster | 25/04/1963 | Kings Cross | 25.08 | Prs | Preserved | MALLARD | ||
4469 | 30/03/1938 | Gateshead | 06/06/1942 | Gateshead | 4.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | GADWALL | ||||||
4499 | 608 | 2 | 60002 | 12/04/1938 | Gateshead | 04/05/1964 | Gateshead | 26.08 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 07/1964 | 26.28 | POCHARD | |
4500 | 609 | 1 | 60001 | 26/04/1938 | Gateshead | 12/10/1964 | Gateshead | 26.5 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 01/1965 | 26.74 | GARGANEY | |
4900 | 610 | 32 | 60032 | 17/05/1938 | Doncaster | 20/10/1963 | New England | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 06/12/1963 | 25.57 | GANNET | |
4901 | 611 | 5 | 60005 | 08/06/1938 | Gateshead | 12/03/1964 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 25.75 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 06/1964 | 26.04 | CAPERCAILLIE | |
4902 | 612 | 33 | 60033 | 28/06/1938 | Kings Cross | 29/12/1962 | Kings Cross | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 23/01/1963 | 24.59 | SEAGULL | |
4903 | 613 | 34 | 60034 | 01/07/1938 | Doncaster | 24/08/1966 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28.08 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 10/1965 | 27.31 | LORD FARINGDON |