Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 591 Today
» 1155 Yesterday
» 3998 Week
» 28800 Month
» 257764 Year
» 334351 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "A2" Class 4-6-2


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
A2 2400 12/1922 CITY OF NEWCASTLE 04/1924   13/04/1937
A2 2401 30/12/1922 CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL 04/1924   03/07/1936
A2 2402 11/03/1924 CITY OF YORK 04/1924   25/07/1936
A2 2403 24/03/1924 CITY OF DURHAM 04/1924   21/05/1937
A2 2404 25/03/1924 CITY OF RIPON 04/1924   06/02/1937