Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 167 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3629 Week
» 23362 Month
» 320376 Year
» 396963 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "A2" Class 4-6-2


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1922 To Service 2400   NEW GHD Gateshead  
30/12/1922 To Service 2401   NEW GHD Gateshead  
11/03/1924 To Service 2402   NEW GHD Gateshead  
24/03/1924 To Service 2403   NEW GHD Gateshead  
25/03/1924 To Service 2404   NEW GHD Gateshead  
09/02/1934 Reallocation 2401 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
26/04/1934 Reallocation 2403 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
07/05/1934 Reallocation 2400 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
13/08/1934 Reallocation 2402 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
07/11/1934 Reallocation 2404 GHD Gateshead YK York (North)  
03/07/1936 Condemned 2401 YK York (North)   COND  
25/07/1936 Condemned 2402 YK York (North)   COND  
06/02/1937 Condemned 2404 YK York (North)   COND  
13/04/1937 Condemned 2400 YK York (North)   COND  
21/05/1937 Condemned 2403 YK York (North)   COND