Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 555 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5477 Week
» 28458 Month
» 391703 Year
» 468290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "A2" Class 4-6-2


Class NER LNER (1924) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
A2 2400   12/1922 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1922
07/05/1934
13/04/1937
13/04/1937
A2 2401   30/12/1922 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
30/12/1922
09/02/1934
03/07/1936
03/07/1936
A2   2402 11/03/1924 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
11/03/1924
13/08/1934
25/07/1936
25/07/1936
A2   2403 24/03/1924 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
24/03/1924
26/04/1934
21/05/1937
21/05/1937
A2   2404 25/03/1924 GHD
YK
W
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
25/03/1924
07/11/1934
06/02/1937
06/02/1937