176
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
59484 | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 28/11/1959 | |
59485 | 02/01/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 02/01/1960 | |
59486 | 06/02/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 06/02/1960 | |
59487 | 20/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 20/02/1960 | |
59488 | 27/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 27/02/1960 | |
59489 | 05/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 05/03/1960 | |
59490 | 19/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 19/03/1960 | |
59491 | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 26/03/1960 | |
59492 | 02/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/04/1960 | |
59493 | 09/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 09/04/1960 | |
59494 | 16/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 16/04/1960 | |
59495 | 23/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 23/04/1960 | |
59496 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
59497 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
59498 | 07/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 07/05/1960 | |
59499 | 14/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 14/05/1960 | |
59500 | 21/05/1960 | 81C CF CF |
Southall (New) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton |
21/05/1960 07/1981 04/10/1987 |
|
59501 | 28/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 28/05/1960 | |
59502 | 04/06/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
59503 | 04/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
59504 | 11/06/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
11/06/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
59505 | 18/06/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
18/06/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
59506 | 18/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 18/06/1960 | |
59507 | 25/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 25/06/1960 | |
59508 | 02/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/07/1960 | |
59509 | 02/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/07/1960 | |
59510 | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 16/07/1960 | |
59511 | 23/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 23/07/1960 | |
59512 | 23/07/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
23/07/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
59513 | 30/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
59514 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
59515 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
59516 | 27/08/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
27/08/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
59517 | 27/08/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 27/08/1960 | |
59518 | 03/09/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 03/09/1960 | |
59519 | 10/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 10/09/1960 | |
59520 | 17/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 17/09/1960 | |
59521 | 01/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 01/10/1960 | |
59522 | 22/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 22/10/1960 |