Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 127 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6103 Week
» 12237 Month
» 240121 Year
» 1461686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1142" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
08/09/1925 Condemned 2952       COND  
16/06/1926 Condemned 2980       COND  
16/06/1926 Condemned 3019       COND  
11/08/1927 Condemned 2942       COND  
08/09/1927 Condemned 2938       COND  
03/11/1927 Condemned 2906       COND  
31/12/1927 Condemned 3015       COND  
19/05/1928 Condemned 2956       COND  
19/05/1928 Condemned 2960       COND  
14/07/1928 Condemned 2910       COND  
30/11/1928 Condemned 2936       COND  
21/04/1929 Condemned 2903       COND  
08/09/1929 Condemned 3017       COND  
25/02/1930 Condemned 2917       COND  
24/03/1930 Condemned 2948       COND  
19/05/1930 Condemned 2905       COND  
08/09/1930 Condemned 2966       COND  
25/02/1931 Condemned 2914       COND  
19/05/1931 Condemned 2949       COND  
24/03/1932 Condemned 2962       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2909       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2923       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2925       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2937       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2964       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2973       COND  
30/11/1933 Condemned 2991       COND  
31/12/1933 Condemned 2908       COND  
14/07/1934 Condemned 2957       COND  
08/09/1934 Condemned 2986       COND  
06/10/1934 Condemned 22939       COND  
03/11/1934 Condemned 2972       COND  
14/07/1935 Condemned 3004       COND  
11/08/1935 Condemned 22919       COND  
06/10/1935 Condemned 22981       COND  
03/11/1935 Condemned 22961       COND  
11/08/1936 Condemned 2985       COND  
14/07/1940 Condemned 22922       COND  
16/06/1946 Condemned 22979       COND  
14/07/1946 Condemned 22928       COND  
06/10/1946 Condemned 22927       COND  
06/10/1946 Condemned 22941       COND  
31/12/1946 Condemned 22916       COND  
31/12/1946 Condemned 22930       COND  
31/12/1946 Condemned 22943       COND  
24/03/1948 Condemned 23016       COND  
08/09/1948 Condemned 22953       COND  
08/09/1948 Condemned 22969       COND  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 58122     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 22978     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 2998     18A Toton  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 58131     14B Kentish Town  
25/02/1950 Condemned 22940       COND  
24/03/1950 Condemned 22976       COND  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 58133     16A Nottingham  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 22944     16A Nottingham  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 58122 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 58154     20C Royston  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 58183     3B Bushbury  
21/04/1951 Condemned 22970       COND  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 58185     3E Monument Lane  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 58116     11B Barrow in Furness  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 58177     11B Barrow in Furness  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 58129     33A Plaistow  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 58117     3D Aston  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 58122 3A Bescot 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 58164     15A Wellingborough  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 58137     16A Nottingham  
08/09/1952 Condemned 58149       COND  
31/12/1952 Condemned 22965       COND  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 58164 15A Wellingborough 15B Kettering  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 58117 3D Aston 3E Monument Lane  
25/02/1953 Condemned 58161       COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58125     3A Bescot  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58139     11B Barrow in Furness  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58156     11B Barrow in Furness  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58164 15B Kettering 15B Kettering  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58169     3A Bescot  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 58174     3A Bescot  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 58125 3A Bescot 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
08/09/1953 Condemned 58145       COND  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 58153     18C Hasland  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 58176     18C Hasland  
03/11/1953 Condemned 58180       COND  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 58162     84G Shrewsbury  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 58135 16A Nottingham 20C Royston  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 58158     17A Derby  
19/05/1954 Condemned 58172       COND  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 58135 20C Royston 2A Rugby  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 58164 15B Kettering 15C Leicester Midland  
25/02/1955 Condemned 58129 33A Plaistow   COND  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 58174 3A Bescot 10C Patricroft  
21/04/1955 Condemned 58164 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 58169 3A Bescot 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
06/10/1955 Condemned 58162 84G Shrewsbury   COND  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 58135 2A Rugby 2F Market Harborough  
30/11/1955 Condemned 58125 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)   COND  
30/11/1955 Condemned 58127       COND  
30/11/1955 Condemned 58152       COND  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 58135 2F Market Harborough 3A Bescot  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 58148     17B Burton  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 58168     21A Saltley  
31/12/1955 Condemned 58133 16A Nottingham   COND  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 58175     16A Nottingham  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 58174 10C Patricroft 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
24/03/1956 Condemned 58117 3E Monument Lane   COND  
24/03/1956 Condemned 58159       COND  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 58174 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 58128     26A Newton Heath  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 58165     18A Toton  
21/04/1956 Condemned 58179       COND  
16/06/1956 Condemned 58126       COND  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 58153 18C Hasland 18A Toton  
16/06/1956 Condemned 58154 20C Royston   COND  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 58176 18C Hasland 18A Toton  
14/07/1956 Condemned 58176 18A Toton   COND  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 58166     18A Toton  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 58167     21B Bournville  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 58123     11B Barrow in Furness  
30/11/1956 Condemned 58139 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
30/11/1956 Condemned 58184       COND  
28/01/1957 Condemned 58142       COND  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 58157 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 2A Rugby  
24/03/1957 Condemned 58156 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 58128 26A Newton Heath 17B Burton  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 58171 18A Toton 11B Barrow in Furness  
19/05/1957 Condemned 58121       COND  
14/07/1957 Condemned 58114       COND  
14/07/1957 Condemned 58140       COND  
14/07/1957 Condemned 58187       COND  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 58135 3A Bescot 5B Crewe South  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 58165 18A Toton 22B Gloucester Barnwood  
06/10/1957 Condemned 58136       COND  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 58124     3D Aston  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 58137 16A Nottingham 17D Rowsley  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 58171 11B Barrow in Furness 6K Rhyl  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 58181     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 58146     41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 58171 6K Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 58122 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 58169 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 58174 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 58181 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
03/11/1958 Condemned 58157 2A Rugby   COND  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 58165 22B Gloucester Barnwood 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 58165 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 17B Burton  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 58124 3D Aston 3B Bushbury  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 58118     3B Bushbury  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 58165 17B Burton 17B Burton  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 58135 5B Crewe South 3E Monument Lane  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 58171 6A Chester (MR) 2A Rugby  
19/05/1959 Condemned 58119       COND  
19/05/1959 Condemned 58130       COND  
19/05/1959 Condemned 58132       COND  
19/05/1959 Condemned 58178       COND  
11/08/1959 Condemned 58167 21B Bournville   COND  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 58182     8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 58177 11B Barrow in Furness 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
08/09/1959 Condemned 58171 2A Rugby   COND  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 58120     8E Northwich  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 58123 11B Barrow in Furness 8E Northwich  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 58120 8E Northwich 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 58123 8E Northwich 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
28/01/1960 Condemned 58116 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
28/01/1960 Condemned 58118 3B Bushbury   COND  
28/01/1960 Condemned 58146 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)   COND  
28/01/1960 Condemned 58183 3B Bushbury   COND  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 58128 17B Burton 3B Bushbury  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 58160     11A Barrow in Furness  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 58138     21A Saltley  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 58143     21A Saltley  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 58168 21A Saltley 3B Bushbury  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 58175 16A Nottingham 18A Toton  
19/05/1960 Condemned 58144       COND  
19/05/1960 Condemned 58158 17A Derby   COND  
13/06/1960 Reallocation 58148 17B Burton 3B Bushbury  
16/06/1960 Condemned 58173       COND  
14/07/1960 Condemned 58168 3B Bushbury   COND  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 58137 17D Rowsley 15D Coalville  
11/08/1960 Condemned 58153 18A Toton   COND  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 58120 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 8E Northwich  
27/08/1960 Reallocation 58177 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 24K Preston  
27/08/1960 Reallocation 58182 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 24K Preston  
08/09/1960 Condemned 58165 17B Burton   COND  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 58120 8E Northwich 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 58177 24K Preston 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 58182 24K Preston 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
06/10/1960 Condemned 58170       COND  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 58177 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 12E Barrow in Furness  
29/10/1960 Reallocation 58123 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 21E Monument Lane  
04/02/1961 Reallocation 58181 3A Bescot 12E Barrow in Furness  
25/02/1961 Condemned 58131 14B Kentish Town   COND  
25/02/1961 Condemned 58169 3A Bescot   COND  
25/02/1961 Condemned 58186       COND  
24/03/1961 Condemned 58115       COND  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 58120 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 2A Rugby  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 58123 21E Monument Lane 21B Bescot  
08/04/1961 Reallocation 58182 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 2A Rugby  
14/07/1961 Condemned 58181 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 58120 2A Rugby 12E Barrow in Furness  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 58182 2A Rugby 12E Barrow in Furness  
08/09/1961 Condemned 58122 3A Bescot   COND  
06/10/1961 Condemned 58135 3E Monument Lane   COND  
06/10/1961 Condemned 58137 15D Coalville   COND  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 58166 18A Toton 15D Coalville  
03/11/1961 Condemned 58163       COND  
18/11/1961 Reallocation 58138 21A Saltley 18A Toton  
18/11/1961 Reallocation 58143 21A Saltley 18A Toton  
09/12/1961 Condemned 58174 3A Bescot   COND  
16/12/1961 Condemned 58175 18A Toton   COND  
30/12/1961 Reallocation 58185 3E Monument Lane 21B Bescot  
13/01/1962 Reallocation 58138 18A Toton 15D Coalville  
10/03/1962 Reallocation 58143 18A Toton 15D Coalville  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 58124 3B Bushbury 21B Bescot  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 58128 3B Bushbury 18A Toton  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 58148 3B Bushbury 15D Coalville  
24/03/1962 Condemned 58166 15D Coalville   COND  
07/07/1962 Condemned 58123 21B Bescot   COND  
07/07/1962 Condemned 58124 21B Bescot   COND  
07/07/1962 Condemned 58185 21B Bescot   COND  
08/09/1962 Condemned 58160 11A Barrow in Furness   COND  
29/09/1962 Condemned 58177 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
13/10/1962 Condemned 58128 18A Toton   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 58120 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
22/12/1962 Condemned 58138 15D Coalville   COND  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 58182 12E Barrow in Furness 15D Coalville  
30/11/1963 Condemned 58143 15D Coalville   COND  
31/12/1963 Condemned 58148 15D Coalville   COND  
28/01/1964 Condemned 58182 15D Coalville   COND