Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 120 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6096 Week
» 12230 Month
» 240114 Year
» 1461679 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1142" Class 0-6-0


Class MR MR (1907) LMS (Dup.) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
1142 1142 2900 22900 58114 02/1875 W Withdrawn 14/07/1957 14/07/1957
1142 1143 2901 22901 58115 03/1875 W Withdrawn 24/03/1961 24/03/1961
1142 1144 2902 22902 58116 03/1875 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
23/02/1952
28/01/1960
28/01/1960
1142 1145 2903     03/1875 W Withdrawn 21/04/1929 21/04/1929
1142 1146 2904 22904 58117 03/1875 3D
3E
W
Aston
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
14/06/1952
21/02/1953
24/03/1956
24/03/1956
1142 1147 2905     03/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1930 19/05/1930
1142 1148 2906     04/1875 W Withdrawn 03/11/1927 03/11/1927
1142 1149 2907 22907 58118 04/1875 3B
W
Bushbury
Withdrawn
31/01/1959
28/01/1960
28/01/1960
1142 1150 2908     04/1875 W Withdrawn 31/12/1933 31/12/1933
1142 1151 2909     04/1875 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 1152 2910     06/1875 W Withdrawn 14/07/1928 14/07/1928
1142 1153 2911 22911 58119 06/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1959 19/05/1959
1142 1154 2912 22912 58120 06/1875 8E
8F
8E
8F
2A
12E
W
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rugby
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
14/11/1959
21/11/1959
13/08/1960
10/09/1960
01/04/1961
29/07/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
1142 1155 2913 22913 58121 06/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1957 19/05/1957
1142 1156 2914     07/1875 W Withdrawn 25/02/1931 25/02/1931
1142 1157 2915 22915 58122 08/1875 3C
3A
3C
3A
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
11/12/1948
07/10/1950
12/07/1952
14/06/1958
08/09/1961
08/09/1961
1142 1158 2916 22916   08/1875 W Withdrawn 31/12/1946 31/12/1946
1142 1159 2917     08/1875 W Withdrawn 25/02/1930 25/02/1930
1142 1160 2918 22918 58123 09/1875 11B
8E
8F
21E
21B
W
Barrow in Furness
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Monument Lane
Bescot
Withdrawn
06/10/1956
14/11/1959
21/11/1959
29/10/1960
01/04/1961
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
1142 1161 2919 22919   09/1875 W Withdrawn 11/08/1935 11/08/1935
1142 381 2920 22920 58124 12/1875 3D
3B
21B
W
Aston
Bushbury
Bescot
Withdrawn
30/11/1957
24/01/1959
24/03/1962
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
1142 382 2921 22921 58125 01/1876 3A
3C
W
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
11/07/1953
30/11/1955
30/11/1955
1142 383 2922 22922   01/1876 W Withdrawn 14/07/1940 14/07/1940
1142 384 2923     01/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 385 2924 22924 58126 01/1876 W Withdrawn 16/06/1956 16/06/1956
1142 400 2925     02/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 401 2926 22926 58127 02/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1955 30/11/1955
1142 402 2927 22927   02/1876 W Withdrawn 06/10/1946 06/10/1946
1142 403 2928 22928   02/1876 W Withdrawn 14/07/1946 14/07/1946
1142 404 2929 22929 58128 02/1876 26A
17B
3B
18A
W
Newton Heath
Burton
Bushbury
Toton
Withdrawn
21/04/1956
20/04/1957
06/02/1960
24/03/1962
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
1142 1162 2930 22930   04/1875 W Withdrawn 31/12/1946 31/12/1946
1142 1163 2931 22931 58129 04/1875 33A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
19/04/1952
25/02/1955
25/02/1955
1142 1164 2932 22932 58130 04/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1959 19/05/1959
1142 1165 2933 22933 58131 04/1875 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
25/02/1961
25/02/1961
1142 1166 2934 22934 58132 04/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1959 19/05/1959
1142 1167 2935 22935 58133 04/1875 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
31/12/1955
31/12/1955
1142 1168 2936     05/1875 W Withdrawn 30/11/1928 30/11/1928
1142 1169 2937     05/1875 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 1170 2938     05/1875 W Withdrawn 08/09/1927 08/09/1927
1142 1171 2939 22939   05/1875 W Withdrawn 06/10/1934 06/10/1934
1142 1172 2940 22940 58134 05/1875 W Withdrawn 25/02/1950 25/02/1950
1142 1173 2941 22941   05/1875 W Withdrawn 06/10/1946 06/10/1946
1142 1174 2942     05/1875 W Withdrawn 11/08/1927 11/08/1927
1142 1175 2943 22943   05/1875 W Withdrawn 31/12/1946 31/12/1946
1142 1176 2944 22944 58135 05/1875 16A
20C
2A
2F
3A
5B
3E
W
Nottingham
Royston
Rugby
Market Harborough
Bescot
Crewe South
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
27/02/1954
06/11/1954
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
10/08/1957
09/05/1959
06/10/1961
06/10/1961
1142 1177 2945 22945 58136 05/1875 W Withdrawn 06/10/1957 06/10/1957
1142 1178 2946 22946 58137 06/1875 16A
17D
15D
W
Nottingham
Rowsley
Coalville
Withdrawn
06/09/1952
30/11/1957
30/07/1960
06/10/1961
06/10/1961
1142 1179 2947 22947 58138 06/1875 21A
18A
15D
W
Saltley
Toton
Coalville
Withdrawn
20/02/1960
18/11/1961
13/01/1962
22/12/1962
22/12/1962
1142 1180 2948     06/1875 W Withdrawn 24/03/1930 24/03/1930
1142 1181 2949     06/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1931 19/05/1931
1142 1182 2950 22950 58139 06/1875 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
30/11/1956
30/11/1956
1142 1183 2951 22951 58140 06/1875 W Withdrawn 14/07/1957 14/07/1957
1142 1184 2952     06/1875 W Withdrawn 08/09/1925 08/09/1925
1142 1185 2953 22953 58141 06/1875 W Withdrawn 08/09/1948 08/09/1948
1142 1186 2954 22954 58142 06/1875 W Withdrawn 28/01/1957 28/01/1957
1142 1187 2955 22955 58143 06/1875 21A
18A
15D
W
Saltley
Toton
Coalville
Withdrawn
20/02/1960
18/11/1961
10/03/1962
30/11/1963
30/11/1963
1142 1188 2956     07/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1928 19/05/1928
1142 1189 2957     07/1875 W Withdrawn 14/07/1934 14/07/1934
1142 1190 2958 22958 58144 07/1875 W Withdrawn 19/05/1960 19/05/1960
1142 1191 2959 22959 58145 07/1875 W Withdrawn 08/09/1953 08/09/1953
1142 1192 2960     02/1876 W Withdrawn 19/05/1928 19/05/1928
1142 1193 2961 22961   02/1876 W Withdrawn 03/11/1935 03/11/1935
1142 1194 2962     02/1876 W Withdrawn 24/03/1932 24/03/1932
1142 1195 2963 22963 58146 03/1876 41E
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
08/03/1958
28/01/1960
28/01/1960
1142 1196 2964     03/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 1197 2965 22965 58147 03/1876 W Withdrawn 31/12/1952 31/12/1952
1142 1198 2966     03/1876 W Withdrawn 08/09/1930 08/09/1930
1142 1199 2967 22967 58148 03/1876 17B
3B
15D
W
Burton
Bushbury
Coalville
Withdrawn
03/12/1955
13/06/1960
24/03/1962
31/12/1963
31/12/1963
1142 1200 2968 22968 58149 03/1876 W Withdrawn 08/09/1952 08/09/1952
1142 1201 2969 22969 58150 03/1876 W Withdrawn 08/09/1948 08/09/1948
1142 1202 2970 22970 58151 03/1876 W Withdrawn 21/04/1951 21/04/1951
1142 1203 2971 22971 58152 04/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1955 30/11/1955
1142 1204 2972     04/1876 W Withdrawn 03/11/1934 03/11/1934
1142 1205 2973     04/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 1206 2974 22974 58153 04/1876 18C
18A
W
Hasland
Toton
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/06/1956
11/08/1960
11/08/1960
1142 1207 2975 22975 58154 04/1876 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
02/12/1950
16/06/1956
16/06/1956
1142 1208 2976 22976 58155 04/1876 W Withdrawn 24/03/1950 24/03/1950
1142 1209 2977 22977 58156 04/1876 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
24/03/1957
24/03/1957
1142 1210 2978 22978 58157 04/1876 3C
2A
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Rugby
Withdrawn
11/12/1948
23/02/1957
03/11/1958
03/11/1958
1142 1211 2979 22979   04/1876 W Withdrawn 16/06/1946 16/06/1946
1142 1212 2980     12/1876 W Withdrawn 16/06/1926 16/06/1926
1142 1213 2981 22981   12/1876 W Withdrawn 06/10/1935 06/10/1935
1142 1214 2982 22982 58158 12/1876 17A
W
Derby
Withdrawn
27/03/1954
19/05/1960
19/05/1960
1142 1215 2983 22983 58159 12/1876 W Withdrawn 24/03/1956 24/03/1956
1142 1216 2984 22984 58160 12/1876 11A
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
06/02/1960
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
1142 1217 2985     12/1876 W Withdrawn 11/08/1936 11/08/1936
1142 1218 2986     12/1876 W Withdrawn 08/09/1934 08/09/1934
1142 1219 2987   58161 12/1876 W Withdrawn 25/02/1953 25/02/1953
1142 1220 2988   58162 12/1876 84G
W
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
30/01/1954
06/10/1955
06/10/1955
1142 1221 2989   58163 12/1876 W Withdrawn 03/11/1961 03/11/1961
1142 1222 2990   58164 05/1876 15A
15B
15B
15C
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Kettering
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
09/08/1952
24/01/1953
21/03/1953
04/12/1954
21/04/1955
21/04/1955
1142 1223 2991     05/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1933 30/11/1933
1142 1224 2992   58165 05/1876 18A
22B
41B
17B
17B
W
Toton
Gloucester Barnwood
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Burton
Burton
Withdrawn
21/04/1956
10/08/1957
20/12/1958
17/01/1959
07/02/1959
08/09/1960
08/09/1960
1142 1225 2993   58166 06/1876 18A
15D
W
Toton
Coalville
Withdrawn
11/08/1956
07/10/1961
24/03/1962
24/03/1962
1142 1226 2994   58167 06/1876 21B
W
Bournville
Withdrawn
11/08/1956
11/08/1959
11/08/1959
1142 1227 2995   58168 06/1876 21A
3B
W
Saltley
Bushbury
Withdrawn
03/12/1955
20/02/1960
14/07/1960
14/07/1960
1142 1228 2996   58169 06/1876 3A
3C
3A
W
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
23/04/1955
14/06/1958
25/02/1961
25/02/1961
1142 1229 2997   58170 06/1876 W Withdrawn 06/10/1960 06/10/1960
1142 1230 2998   58171 06/1876 18A
11B
6K
6A
2A
W
Toton
Barrow in Furness
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Rugby
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
18/05/1957
28/12/1957
17/05/1958
09/05/1959
08/09/1959
08/09/1959
1142 1231 2999   58172 06/1876 W Withdrawn 19/05/1954 19/05/1954
1142 1232 3000 23000 58173 07/1876 W Withdrawn 16/06/1960 16/06/1960
1142 1233 3001 23001 58174 07/1876 3A
10C
10D
3C
3A
W
Bescot
Patricroft
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
26/02/1955
25/02/1956
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
09/12/1961
09/12/1961
1142 1234 3002 23002 58175 07/1876 16A
18A
W
Nottingham
Toton
Withdrawn
31/12/1955
05/03/1960
16/12/1961
16/12/1961
1142 1235 3003 23003 58176 07/1876 18C
18A
W
Hasland
Toton
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/06/1956
14/07/1956
14/07/1956
1142 1236 3004     10/1876 W Withdrawn 14/07/1935 14/07/1935
1142 1237 3005 23005 58177 10/1876 11B
8G
24K
8G
12E
W
Barrow in Furness
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Preston
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
29/08/1959
27/08/1960
10/09/1960
22/10/1960
29/09/1962
29/09/1962
1142 1238 3006 23006 58178 10/1876 W Withdrawn 19/05/1959 19/05/1959
1142 1239 3007 23007 58179 10/1876 W Withdrawn 21/04/1956 21/04/1956
1142 1240 3008 23008 58180 10/1876 W Withdrawn 03/11/1953 03/11/1953
1142 1241 3009 23009 58181 11/1876 3C
3A
12E
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
22/02/1958
14/06/1958
04/02/1961
14/07/1961
14/07/1961
1142 1242 3010 23010 58182 11/1876 8G
24K
8G
2A
12E
15D
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Preston
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Rugby
Barrow in Furness
Coalville
Withdrawn
15/08/1959
27/08/1960
10/09/1960
08/04/1961
29/07/1961
19/01/1963
28/01/1964
28/01/1964
1142 1243 3011 23011 58183 11/1876 3B
W
Bushbury
Withdrawn
31/12/1950
28/01/1960
28/01/1960
1142 1244 3012 23012 58184 12/1876 W Withdrawn 30/11/1956 30/11/1956
1142 1245 3013 23013 58185 12/1876 3E
21B
W
Monument Lane
Bescot
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
30/12/1961
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
1142 1246 3014 23014 58186 12/1876 W Withdrawn 25/02/1961 25/02/1961
1142 1247 3015     12/1876 W Withdrawn 31/12/1927 31/12/1927
1142 1248 3016 23016   12/1876 W Withdrawn 24/03/1948 24/03/1948
1142 1249 3017     12/1876 W Withdrawn 08/09/1929 08/09/1929
1142 1250 3018 23018 58187 12/1876 W Withdrawn 14/07/1957 14/07/1957
1142 1251 3019     12/1876 W Withdrawn 16/06/1926 16/06/1926