LMS Stanier "CORO" Class 4-6-2
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Coronation (Semi) | 6220 | 46220 | 01/06/1937 | 27A 5A 12B 5A 12B W |
Polmadie Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1958 02/04/1960 23/04/1960 11/02/1961 20/04/1963 |
20/04/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6221 | 46221 | 14/06/1937 | 27A 5A 1B 5A 12B 12A 12B W |
Polmadie Crewe North Camden Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1958 20/06/1959 01/10/1960 11/02/1961 11/04/1961 07/04/1962 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6222 | 46222 | 22/06/1937 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1963 |
24/10/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6223 | 46223 | 28/06/1937 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1963 |
04/10/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6224 | 46224 | 13/07/1937 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/10/1963 |
17/10/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6225 | 46225 | 11/05/1938 | 1B 5A 1B 5A 5A 12B W |
Camden Crewe North Camden Crewe North Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 21/05/1955 27/06/1959 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6226 | 46226 | 23/05/1938 | 12B 1B 12A 12A 8A 12A 8A 12A 5A 12A 12A W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 28/11/1953 02/01/1954 29/01/1955 26/03/1955 06/10/1956 03/11/1956 11/04/1961 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6227 | 46227 | 07/06/1938 | 5A 27A W |
Crewe North Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6228 | 46228 | 17/06/1938 | 12B 1B 1B 12A 12A 8A 12A 5A 12B 5A W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 05/10/1957 20/06/1959 27/06/1959 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6229 | 46229 | 07/09/1938 | 5A 5A 1B 5A 8A W |
Crewe North Crewe North Camden Crewe North Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 12/07/1952 01/10/1960 11/04/1961 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6230 | 46230 | 27/06/1938 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1963 |
06/11/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6231 | 46231 | 28/06/1938 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6232 | 46232 | 01/07/1938 | 27A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6233 | 46233 | 18/07/1938 | 5A 12B 5A 12B 5A 1B 8A W |
Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Camden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 02/04/1960 23/04/1960 30/04/1960 17/09/1960 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6234 | 46234 | 04/08/1938 | 5A 1B 1B 12B W |
Crewe North Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 21/11/1959 26/01/1963 |
26/01/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6235 | 46235 | 27/06/1939 | 5A W |
Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6236 | 46236 | 27/07/1939 | 5A 1B 5A 1B 12B 8A 12B W |
Crewe North Camden Crewe North Camden Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 10/07/1948 17/07/1951 14/06/1958 14/01/1961 04/03/1961 14/03/1964 |
14/03/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6237 | 46237 | 09/08/1939 | 1B 1B 12B 12A 12B W |
Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 14/06/1958 11/04/1961 07/04/1962 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6238 | 46238 | 14/09/1939 | 12B 1B 1B 12A 12A 1B 1B 12A 12A 12A W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 14/06/1952 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6239 | 46239 | 29/08/1939 | 1B 6J 1A 8A W |
Camden Holyhead Willesden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/08/1963 14/09/1963 29/08/1964 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6240 | 46240 | 27/03/1940 | 1B 1A 8A W |
Camden Willesden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/09/1963 29/08/1964 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6241 | 46241 | 03/04/1940 | 1B 5A 8A W |
Camden Crewe North Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 11/04/1961 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6242 | 46242 | 15/05/1940 | 27A 1B 5A 1B 66A W |
Polmadie Camden Crewe North Camden Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 11/07/1953 04/12/1954 11/04/1961 18/10/1963 |
18/10/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6243 | 46243 | 29/05/1940 | 1B 8A 5A 12B 5A 1B 8A W |
Camden Edge Hill Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Camden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/12/1948 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 11/06/1960 11/04/1961 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6244 | 46244 | 12/07/1940 | 1B 12B 12A W |
Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 11/04/1961 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6245 | 46245 | 26/06/1943 | 1B 1A 5A W |
Camden Willesden Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/09/1963 25/07/1964 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6246 | 46246 | 11/08/1943 | 1B 5A 1B W |
Camden Crewe North Camden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 11/06/1960 26/01/1963 |
26/01/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6247 | 46247 | 13/09/1943 | 1B 12A W |
Camden Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1961 06/1963 |
25/05/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6248 | 46248 | 02/10/1943 | 1B 5A 12A 5A 1B 12B 1B 5A W |
Camden Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 11/06/1960 13/08/1960 03/09/1960 24/09/1960 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6249 | 46249 | 19/04/1944 | 12B 1B 5A 66A W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Crewe North Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 04/12/1954 11/04/1961 05/11/1963 |
05/11/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6250 | 46250 | 20/05/1944 | 12B 1B 12A 1B 12B W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 08/09/1956 03/11/1956 14/06/1958 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6251 | 46251 | 30/06/1944 | 12B 1B 8A 5A 1B 12B 1B 1B 12A 12A 8A 12A 8A 1B 8A 12A 8A 12A 5A 12A 5A 1B 5A W |
Carlisle Upperby Camden Edge Hill Crewe North Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Camden Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Camden Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 02/10/1948 11/12/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 27/03/1954 24/04/1954 09/10/1954 23/04/1955 21/05/1955 21/05/1955 08/10/1955 16/06/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 09/03/1963 20/04/1963 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6252 | 46252 | 24/06/1944 | 5A 1B 1B 5A 5A 1B 1B 5A 1B 5A 1B 5A 12A 5A 12A 5A 12B 12A 1B W |
Crewe North Camden Camden Crewe North Crewe North Camden Camden Crewe North Camden Crewe North Camden Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Camden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 10/11/1951 26/01/1952 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 11/06/1960 11/04/1961 22/09/1962 01/06/1963 |
01/06/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6253 | 46253 | 14/09/1946 | 1B 1B 12B 1B 1B 12A 12A 5A 5A W |
Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 01/10/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 04/10/1952 05/10/1957 26/01/1963 |
26/01/1963 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6254 | 46254 | 17/09/1946 | 1B 12B 5A 5A 5A 12A 1B 8A 1B 5A 1B 5A W |
Camden Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe North Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Camden Edge Hill Camden Crewe North Camden Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 29/01/1955 26/02/1955 24/09/1960 09/03/1963 20/04/1963 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6255 | 46255 | 16/10/1946 | 1B 12B 1B 5A 12A 1B 12A 12A W |
Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Camden Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 11/07/1953 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 11/04/1961 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 6256 | 46256 | 13/12/1947 | 5A 1B 1B 12B 1B 5A W |
Crewe North Camden Camden Carlisle Upperby Camden Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 07/11/1959 21/11/1959 30/04/1960 24/09/1960 03/10/1964 |
03/10/1964 |
Coronation (Semi) | 46257 | 19/05/1948 | 12B 12A W |
Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
04/10/1958 11/04/1961 10/1964 |
12/09/1964 |