Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 422 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 23403 Month
» 386648 Year
» 463235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Princess Royal" Class 4-6-2


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Princess Royal 6200 27/06/1933 THE PRINCESS ROYAL 07/1933   17/11/1962
Princess Royal 6201 03/11/1933 PRINCESS ELIZABETH 03/11/1933   20/10/1962
Princess Royal 46202 29/06/1935 PRINCESS ANNE 15/08/1952   22/05/1954
Princess Royal 6203 01/07/1935 PRINCESS MARGARET ROSE 01/07/1935   20/10/1962
Princess Royal 6204 19/07/1935 PRINCESS LOUISE 19/07/1935   07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6205 24/07/1935 PRINCESS VICTORIA 24/07/1935   25/11/1961
Princess Royal 6206 01/08/1935 PRINCESS MARIE LOUISE 01/08/1935   03/11/1962
Princess Royal 6207 09/08/1935 PRINCESS ARTHUR OF CONNAUGHT 09/08/1935   25/11/1961
Princess Royal 6208 16/08/1935 PRINCESS HELENA VICTORIA 16/08/1935   20/10/1962
Princess Royal 6209 23/08/1935 PRINCESS BEATRICE 23/08/1935   29/09/1962
Princess Royal 6210 06/09/1935 LADY PATRICIA 06/09/1935   07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6211 18/09/1935 QUEEN MAUD 18/09/1935   07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6212 21/10/1935 DUCHESS OF KENT 21/10/1935   07/10/1961