Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3628 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17034 Week
» 70050 Month
» 189577 Year
» 3216430 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "PRIN" Class 4-6-2 - 'Lizzies'
LMS |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
6200
|
46200
|
27/06/1933 |
|
17/11/1962 |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
29.42 |
1,524,631 |
Cut |
Connels (Coatbridge) |
10/1964 |
31.32 |
6201
|
46201
|
03/11/1933 |
|
20/10/1962 |
Carlisle Upperby |
28.92 |
1,526,807 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
6203
|
46203
|
01/07/1935 |
Camden |
20/10/1962 |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27.25 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
6204
|
46204
|
19/07/1935 |
Camden |
07/10/1961 |
Edge Hill |
26.25 |
1,373,945 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1962 |
26.84 |
6205
|
46205
|
24/07/1935 |
Camden |
25/11/1961 |
Willesden |
26.33 |
1,446,588 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1962 |
26.83 |
6206
|
46206
|
01/08/1935 |
Crewe North |
03/11/1962 |
Camden |
27.25 |
1,552,133 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
10/1962 |
27.22 |
6207
|
46207
|
09/08/1935 |
Crewe North |
25/11/1961 |
Willesden |
26.25 |
1,502,695 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1962 |
26.78 |
6208
|
46208
|
16/08/1935 |
Crewe North |
20/10/1962 |
Edge Hill |
27.17 |
1,447,681 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1962 |
27.27 |
6209
|
46209
|
23/08/1935 |
Crewe North |
29/09/1962 |
Camden |
27.08 |
1,577,995 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1962 |
27.25 |
6210
|
46210
|
06/09/1935 |
Camden |
07/10/1961 |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
26.08 |
1,515,244 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1962 |
26.71 |
6211
|
46211
|
18/09/1935 |
Camden |
07/10/1961 |
Crewe North |
26.08 |
1,537,517 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
04/1962 |
26.59 |
6212
|
46212
|
21/10/1935 |
Camden |
07/10/1961 |
Crewe North |
26 |
1,486,229 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
04/1962 |
26.50 |