Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Princess Royal" Class 4-6-2


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
6200 46200 27/06/1933 17/11/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.42 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 10/1964 31.32
6201 46201 03/11/1933 20/10/1962 Carlisle Upperby 28.92 Prs Preserved
6202 46202 29/06/1935 Camden 22/05/1954 Crewe North 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 22/05/1954 18.91
6203 46203 01/07/1935 Camden 20/10/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.25 Prs Preserved
6204 46204 19/07/1935 Camden 07/10/1961 Edge Hill 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1962 26.84
6205 46205 24/07/1935 Camden 25/11/1961 Willesden 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1962 26.83
6206 46206 01/08/1935 Crewe North 03/11/1962 Camden 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1962 27.22
6207 46207 09/08/1935 Crewe North 25/11/1961 Willesden 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1962 26.78
6208 46208 16/08/1935 Crewe North 20/10/1962 Edge Hill 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1962 27.27
6209 46209 23/08/1935 Crewe North 29/09/1962 Camden 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1962 27.25
6210 46210 06/09/1935 Camden 07/10/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1962 26.71
6211 46211 18/09/1935 Camden 07/10/1961 Crewe North 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 04/1962 26.59
6212 46212 21/10/1935 Camden 07/10/1961 Crewe North 26 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 04/1962 26.50