Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Princess Royal" Class 4-6-2


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
06/01/1934 Reallocation 6201 W1   27A Polmadie  
29/06/1935 To Service 6202   NEW 1B Camden  
01/07/1935 To Service 6203   NEW 1B Camden  
19/07/1935 To Service 6204   NEW 1B Camden  
24/07/1935 To Service 6205   NEW 1B Camden  
01/08/1935 To Service 6206   NEW 5A Crewe North  
03/08/1935 Reallocation 6205 1B Camden 27A Polmadie  
09/08/1935 To Service 6207   NEW 5A Crewe North  
16/08/1935 To Service 6208   NEW 5A Crewe North  
23/08/1935 To Service 6209   NEW 5A Crewe North  
24/08/1935 Reallocation 6203 1B Camden 27A Polmadie  
24/08/1935 Reallocation 6206 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
31/08/1935 Reallocation 6207 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
31/08/1935 Reallocation 6208 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
06/09/1935 To Service 6210   NEW 1B Camden  
07/09/1935 Reallocation 6209 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
18/09/1935 To Service 6211   NEW 1B Camden  
28/09/1935 Reallocation 6205 27A Polmadie 1B Camden  
21/10/1935 To Service 6212   NEW 1B Camden  
24/12/1935 Reallocation 6204 1B Camden 27A Polmadie  
22/02/1936 Reallocation 6202 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
29/02/1936 Reallocation 6203 27A Polmadie 1B Camden  
29/02/1936 Reallocation 6204 27A Polmadie 1B Camden  
19/04/1936 Reallocation 6202 8A Edge Hill 1B Camden  
22/01/1938 Reallocation 6211 1B Camden 1B Crewe North  
12/02/1938 Reallocation 6209 1B Camden 1B Crewe North  
19/02/1938 Reallocation 6209 1B Camden 1B Camden  
26/02/1938 Reallocation 6211 1B Camden 1B Camden  
16/07/1938 Reallocation 6208 1B Camden 1B Crewe North  
04/08/1938 Reallocation 6207 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
06/08/1938 Reallocation 6208 1B Camden 1B Camden  
27/08/1938 Reallocation 6207 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
24/06/1939 Reallocation 6201 27A Polmadie 1B Camden  
15/07/1939 Reallocation 6201 1B Camden 9A Longsight  
15/07/1939 Reallocation 6206 1B Camden 9A Longsight  
06/09/1939 Reallocation 6209 1B Camden 9A Longsight  
16/09/1939 Reallocation 6201 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
16/09/1939 Reallocation 6202 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
16/09/1939 Reallocation 6204 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
16/09/1939 Reallocation 6207 1B Camden 2A Rugby  
16/10/1939 Reallocation 6212 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6201 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6203 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6205 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6207 2A Rugby 9A Longsight  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6208 1B Camden 9A Longsight  
21/10/1939 Reallocation 6212 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
02/12/1939 Reallocation 6206 9A Longsight 8A Edge Hill  
02/12/1939 Reallocation 6207 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
02/12/1939 Reallocation 6208 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
02/12/1939 Reallocation 6209 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
09/12/1939 Reallocation 6205 8A Edge Hill 8A Polmadie  
30/01/1940 Reallocation 6205 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
06/04/1940 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 7C Holyhead  
06/04/1940 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 7C Holyhead  
06/04/1940 Reallocation 6206 8A Edge Hill 1B Camden  
16/04/1940 Reallocation 6205 8A Edge Hill 7C Holyhead  
01/06/1940 Reallocation 6207 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
08/06/1940 Reallocation 6208 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
10/08/1940 Reallocation 6207 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
10/08/1940 Reallocation 6208 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
28/09/1940 Reallocation 6203 7C Holyhead 5A Crewe North  
05/10/1940 Reallocation 6201 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
02/11/1940 Reallocation 6203 5A Crewe North 7C Holyhead  
02/11/1940 Reallocation 6205 7C Holyhead 5A Crewe North  
09/11/1940 Reallocation 6203 7C Holyhead 8A Edge Hill  
09/11/1940 Reallocation 6204 7C Holyhead 8A Edge Hill  
09/08/1941 Reallocation 6202 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
21/03/1942 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 8A Camden  
06/04/1942 Reallocation 6200 W1   8A Edge Hill  
21/04/1942 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Camden  
02/05/1942 Reallocation 6209 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
16/05/1942 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
16/05/1942 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
02/06/1942 Reallocation 6206 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
17/10/1942 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Camden  
17/10/1942 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 8A Camden  
26/12/1942 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 1B Camden  
03/04/1943 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
03/04/1943 Reallocation 6203 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
22/05/1943 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
22/05/1943 Reallocation 6206 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
22/05/1943 Reallocation 6210 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
22/05/1943 Reallocation 6211 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
22/05/1943 Reallocation 6212 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
27/05/1943 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
09/10/1943 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 8A Crewe North  
16/10/1943 Reallocation 6206 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
27/11/1943 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
20/01/1944 Reallocation 6205 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/05/1944 Reallocation 6200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/05/1944 Reallocation 6201 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/05/1944 Reallocation 6203 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/05/1944 Reallocation 6204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
24/03/1945 Reallocation 6201 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
24/05/1945 Reallocation 6204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
12/07/1947 Reallocation 6205 8A Edge Hill 8A Carlisle Upperby  
18/10/1947 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Crewe North  
18/10/1947 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 8A Crewe North  
18/10/1947 Reallocation 6205 8A Edge Hill 12B Crewe North  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
14/02/1948 Reallocation 6203 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 6205 12B Carlisle Upperby 8A Edge Hill  
13/03/1948 Reallocation 6200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 46201 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 46204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
21/12/1948 Reallocation 46205 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
28/05/1949 Reallocation 46204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
01/10/1949 Reallocation 46204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
01/10/1949 Reallocation 46205 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
10/06/1950 Reallocation 46204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 46204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 46206 5A Crewe North 5A Camden  
07/07/1951 Reallocation 46205 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 46206 5A Crewe North 5A Crewe North  
15/09/1951 Reallocation 46205 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 8A Polmadie  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 46203 8A Edge Hill 66A Polmadie  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 46207 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 46208 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
10/11/1951 Reallocation 46205 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 46205 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 46203 66A Polmadie 8A Edge Hill  
23/05/1953 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
23/05/1953 Reallocation 46203 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 46201 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
27/06/1953 Reallocation 46202 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
11/09/1953 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
22/05/1954 Condemned 46202 5A Crewe North   COND  
12/06/1954 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 12A Carlisle Upperby  
26/06/1954 Reallocation 46200 12A Carlisle Upperby 5A Crewe North  
18/09/1954 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 46206 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 46206 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
25/06/1955 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
01/10/1955 Reallocation 46211 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 46212 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
04/02/1956 Reallocation 46207 8A Edge Hill 8A To Western Region / GWR  
04/02/1956 Reallocation 46210 5A Crewe North 5A To Western Region / GWR  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 46210 5A Crewe North 5A Crewe North  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 46207 8A Edge Hill 8A Edge Hill  
10/03/1956 Reallocation 46212 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 46211 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 46211 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
07/07/1956 Reallocation 46211 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 46210 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
22/06/1957 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
22/06/1957 Reallocation 46204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
22/06/1957 Reallocation 46205 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
21/09/1957 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
21/09/1957 Reallocation 46204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 46204 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
05/07/1958 Reallocation 46201 5A Crewe North 66A Polmadie  
05/07/1958 Reallocation 46204 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
06/07/1958 Reallocation 46210 8A Edge Hill 91X To Scottish Region  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 46209 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/09/1958 Reallocation 46203 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 46211 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 46200 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 46209 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 46207 8A Edge Hill 1B Camden  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 46211 8A Edge Hill 5A Crewe North  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 46211 5A Crewe North 8A Edge Hill  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 46209 5A Crewe North 12B Carlisle Upperby  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 46203 8A Edge Hill 1B Camden  
03/09/1960 Reallocation 46209 12B Carlisle Upperby 5A Crewe North  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 46203 1B Camden 8A Edge Hill  
04/03/1961 Reallocation 46210 91X To Scottish Region 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46201 66A Polmadie 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46203 8A Edge Hill 24L Carnforth  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46205 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46206 5A Crewe North 2A Rugby  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46207 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 46211 8A Edge Hill 24L Carnforth  
07/1961 Reallocation 46211 24L Carnforth 5A Crewe North  
08/07/1961 Reallocation 46206 2A Rugby 5A Crewe North  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 46205 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 46207 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
18/07/1961 Reallocation 46203 24L Carnforth 5A Crewe North  
02/09/1961 Reallocation 46200 5A Crewe North 24L Carnforth  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 46203 5A Crewe North 24L Carnforth  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 46205 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 46206 5A Crewe North 2A Rugby  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 46207 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
07/10/1961 Condemned 46204 8A Edge Hill   COND  
07/10/1961 Condemned 46210 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
07/10/1961 Condemned 46211 5A Crewe North   COND  
07/10/1961 Condemned 46212 5A Crewe North   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 46205 1A Willesden   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 46207 1A Willesden   COND  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 46200 24L Carnforth 12B Carlisle Upperby  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 46201 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 12B Carlisle Upperby  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 46203 24L Carnforth 12B Carlisle Upperby  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 46206 2A Rugby 1B Camden  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 46209 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
07/04/1962 Reallocation 46200 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
07/04/1962 Reallocation 46203 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
29/09/1962 Condemned 46209 1B Camden   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 46201 12B Carlisle Upperby   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 46203 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 46208 8A Edge Hill   COND  
03/11/1962 Condemned 46206 1B Camden   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 46200 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND