Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Princess Royal" Class 4-6-2


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Princess Royal 6200 46200 27/06/1933 8A
1B
8A
1B
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
66A
8A
5A
8A
12A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
24L
12B
12A
W
Edge Hill
Camden (on loan)
Edge Hill
Camden (on loan)
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North (on loan)
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Polmadie (on loan)
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
27/06/1933
06/04/1942
21/04/1942
16/05/1942
17/10/1942
03/04/1943
22/05/1943
20/05/1944
18/10/1947
17/01/1948
13/03/1948
11/12/1948
22/09/1951
16/05/1953
23/05/1953
11/09/1953
12/06/1954
26/06/1954
18/09/1954
25/06/1955
15/09/1956
22/06/1957
21/09/1957
20/06/1959
02/09/1961
27/01/1962
07/04/1962
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
Princess Royal 6201 46201 03/11/1933 27A
1B
9A
1B
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
66A
12A
12B
W
Polmadie
Camden
Longsight
Camden
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Polmadie
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
03/11/1933
06/01/1934
24/06/1939
15/07/1939
16/09/1939
21/10/1939
05/10/1940
20/05/1944
24/03/1945
11/12/1948
13/06/1953
05/07/1958
11/03/1961
27/01/1962
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
Princess Anne 6202 46202 29/06/1935 1B
8A
1B
5A
1B
5A
W
Camden
Edge Hill
Camden
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North
Withdrawn
29/06/1935
22/02/1936
19/04/1936
16/09/1939
09/08/1941
27/06/1953
22/05/1954
22/05/1954
Princess Royal 6203 46203 01/07/1935 1B
27A
1B
8A
7C
5A
7C
8A
1B
8A
5A
5A
8A
5A
8A
66A
8A
5A
8A
1B
8A
24L
5A
24L
12B
12A
W
Camden
Polmadie
Camden
Edge Hill
Holyhead
Crewe North
Holyhead
Edge Hill
Camden
Edge Hill
Crewe North (on loan)
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North (on loan)
Edge Hill
Polmadie
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Camden
Edge Hill
Carnforth
Crewe North
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/07/1935
24/08/1935
29/02/1936
21/10/1939
06/04/1940
28/09/1940
02/11/1940
09/11/1940
26/12/1942
03/04/1943
09/10/1943
27/11/1943
20/05/1944
18/10/1947
14/02/1948
22/09/1951
16/05/1953
23/05/1953
20/09/1958
20/08/1960
10/09/1960
11/03/1961
18/07/1961
09/09/1961
27/01/1962
07/04/1962
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
Princess Royal 6204 46204 19/07/1935 1B
27A
1B
5A
8A
7C
8A
1B
8A
1B
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
W
Camden
Polmadie
Camden
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Holyhead
Edge Hill
Camden (on loan)
Edge Hill
Camden (on loan)
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
19/07/1935
24/12/1935
29/02/1936
16/09/1939
21/10/1939
06/04/1940
09/11/1940
21/03/1942
16/05/1942
17/10/1942
27/05/1943
20/05/1944
24/05/1945
11/12/1948
28/05/1949
01/10/1949
10/06/1950
30/09/1950
22/06/1957
21/09/1957
14/06/1958
05/07/1958
07/10/1961
07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6205 46205 24/07/1935 1B
27A
1B
8A
27A
8A
7C
5A
8A
12B
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
1A
1B
1A
W
Camden
Polmadie
Camden
Edge Hill
Polmadie (on loan)
Edge Hill
Holyhead
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Carlisle Upperby (on loan)
Crewe North (on loan)
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
24/07/1935
03/08/1935
28/09/1935
21/10/1939
09/12/1939
30/01/1940
16/04/1940
02/11/1940
20/01/1944
12/07/1947
18/10/1947
21/02/1948
21/12/1948
01/10/1949
07/07/1951
15/09/1951
10/11/1951
20/09/1952
22/06/1957
11/03/1961
15/07/1961
09/09/1961
25/11/1961
25/11/1961
Princess Royal 6206 46206 01/08/1935 5A
1B
9A
8A
1B
5A
1B
5A
1B
5A
8A
5A
2A
5A
2A
1B
W
Crewe North
Camden
Longsight
Edge Hill
Camden
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North
Camden (on loan)
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Rugby
Crewe North
Rugby
Camden
Withdrawn
01/08/1935
24/08/1935
15/07/1939
02/12/1939
06/04/1940
02/06/1942
22/05/1943
16/10/1943
23/06/1951
21/07/1951
25/09/1954
23/10/1954
11/03/1961
08/07/1961
09/09/1961
27/01/1962
03/11/1962
03/11/1962
Princess Royal 6207 46207 09/08/1935 5A
1B
5A
1B
2A
9A
1B
8A
5A
8A
91W
8A
1B
1A
1B
1A
W
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North
Camden
Rugby
Longsight
Camden
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
To Western Region / GWR (on loan)
Edge Hill
Camden
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
09/08/1935
31/08/1935
04/08/1938
27/08/1938
16/09/1939
21/10/1939
02/12/1939
01/06/1940
10/08/1940
22/09/1951
04/02/1956
25/02/1956
03/10/1959
11/03/1961
15/07/1961
09/09/1961
25/11/1961
25/11/1961
Princess Royal 6208 46208 16/08/1935 5A
1B
5A
1B
9A
1B
8A
5A
8A
W
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North (on loan)
Camden
Longsight
Camden
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
16/08/1935
31/08/1935
16/07/1938
06/08/1938
21/10/1939
02/12/1939
08/06/1940
10/08/1940
22/09/1951
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
Princess Royal 6209 46209 23/08/1935 5A
1B
5A
1B
9A
1B
5A
8A
5A
12B
5A
1B
W
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North (on loan)
Camden
Longsight
Camden
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe North
Camden
Withdrawn
23/08/1935
07/09/1935
12/02/1938
19/02/1938
06/09/1939
02/12/1939
02/05/1942
06/09/1958
20/06/1959
13/08/1960
03/09/1960
27/01/1962
29/09/1962
29/09/1962
Princess Royal 6210 46210 06/09/1935 1B
5A
91W
5A
8A
91X
12A
W
Camden
Crewe North
To Western Region / GWR (on loan)
Crewe North
Edge Hill
To Scottish Region
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
06/09/1935
22/05/1943
04/02/1956
18/02/1956
15/09/1956
06/07/1958
04/03/1961
07/10/1961
07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6211 46211 18/09/1935 1B
5A
1B
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
5A
8A
24L
5A
W
Camden
Crewe North (on loan)
Camden
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Carnforth
Crewe North
Withdrawn
18/09/1935
22/01/1938
26/02/1938
22/05/1943
01/10/1955
09/06/1956
16/06/1956
07/07/1956
29/11/1958
07/11/1959
21/11/1959
11/03/1961
07/1961
07/10/1961
07/10/1961
Princess Royal 6212 46212 21/10/1935 1B
5A
1B
5A
8A
5A
W
Camden
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North
Edge Hill
Crewe North
Withdrawn
21/10/1935
16/10/1939
21/10/1939
22/05/1943
28/01/1956
10/03/1956
07/10/1961
07/10/1961