Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 416 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8153 Week
» 19858 Month
» 351347 Year
» 427934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Black Five" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Black Five 5154 06/1935 LANARKSHIRE YEOMANRY 06/1935   30/11/1966 11/1966
Black Five 5156 07/1935 AYRSHIRE YEOMANRY 07/1935   31/08/1968 08/1968
Black Five 5157 07/1935 THE GLASGOW HIGHLANDER 07/1935   31/12/1962 29/12/1962
Black Five 5158 07/1935 GLASGOW YEOMANRY 07/1935   31/07/1964 07/1964