55 Co-Co
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 9000 | 28/02/1961 | ROYAL SCOTS GREY | 18/06/1962 | 02/01/1982 | ||
55 | 9001 | 23/02/1961 | ST. PADDY | 07/07/1961 | 05/01/1980 | ||
55 | 9002 | 19/03/1961 | THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY | 04/04/1963 | 02/01/1982 | ||
55 | 9003 | 27/03/1961 | MELD | 07/07/1961 | 31/12/1980 | ||
55 | 9004 | 10/05/1961 | QUEEN'S OWN HIGHLANDER | 23/05/1964 | 28/10/1981 | ||
55 | 9005 | 25/05/1961 | THE PRINCE OF WALES'S OWN REGIMENT OF YORKSHIRE | 08/10/1963 | 08/02/1981 | ||
55 | 9006 | 29/06/1961 | THE FIFE & FORFAR YEOMANRY | 08/12/1964 | 08/02/1981 | ||
55 | 9007 | 22/06/1961 | PINZA | 22/06/1961 | 31/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9008 | 07/07/1961 | THE GREEN HOWARDS | 30/09/1963 | 31/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9009 | 21/07/1961 | ALYCIDON | 21/07/1961 | 02/01/1982 | ||
55 | 9010 | 21/07/1961 | THE KING'S OWN SCOTTISH BORDERER | 08/05/1965 | 24/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9011 | 24/08/1961 | THE ROYAL NORTHUMBERLAND FUSILIERS | 20/05/1963 | 08/11/1981 | ||
55 | 9012 | 04/09/1961 | CREPELLO | 04/09/1961 | 18/05/1981 | ||
55 | 9013 | 14/09/1961 | THE BLACK WATCH | 16/01/1963 | 20/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9014 | 29/09/1961 | THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT | 20/10/1963 | 22/11/1981 | ||
55 | 9015 | 13/10/1961 | TULYAR | 13/10/1961 | 02/01/1982 | ||
55 | 9016 | 27/10/1961 | GORDON HIGHLANDER | 28/07/1964 | 30/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9017 | 09/11/1961 | THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY | 29/10/1963 | 31/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9018 | 24/11/1961 | BALLYMOSS | 24/11/1961 | 13/10/1981 | ||
55 | 9019 | 11/12/1961 | ROYAL HIGHLAND FUSILIER | 11/09/1965 | 31/12/1981 | ||
55 | 9020 | 12/02/1962 | NIMBUS | 12/02/1962 | 06/01/1980 | ||
55 | 9021 | 16/03/1962 | ARGYLL & SUTHERLAND HIGHLANDER | 29/11/1963 | 31/12/1981 |