55 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D9000 | 55022 | 28/02/1961 | 64B 34G 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Finsbury Park Haymarket Withdrawn |
28/02/1961 02/12/1967 29/06/1968 02/01/1982 |
02/01/1982 |
D9001 | 55001 | 23/02/1961 | 34G 64B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
23/02/1961 02/12/1967 22/06/1968 05/01/1980 |
05/01/1980 |
D9002 | 55002 | 19/03/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
19/03/1961 02/01/1982 |
02/01/1982 |
D9003 | 55003 | 27/03/1961 | 34G 64B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
27/03/1961 02/12/1967 22/06/1968 31/12/1980 |
31/12/1980 |
D9004 | 55004 | 10/05/1961 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
10/05/1961 28/10/1981 |
28/10/1981 |
D9005 | 55005 | 25/05/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
25/05/1961 08/02/1981 |
08/02/1981 |
D9006 | 55006 | 29/06/1961 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
29/06/1961 08/02/1981 |
08/02/1981 |
D9007 | 55007 | 22/06/1961 | 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Withdrawn |
22/06/1961 31/12/1981 |
31/12/1981 |
D9008 | 55008 | 07/07/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
07/07/1961 31/12/1981 |
31/12/1981 |
D9009 | 55009 | 21/07/1961 | 34G 64B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
21/07/1961 02/12/1967 22/06/1968 02/01/1982 |
02/01/1982 |
D9010 | 55010 | 21/07/1961 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
21/07/1961 24/12/1981 |
24/12/1981 |
D9011 | 55011 | 24/08/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
24/08/1961 08/11/1981 |
08/11/1981 |
D9012 | 55012 | 04/09/1961 | 34G 64B 64B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket (on loan) Haymarket (loan made permanent) Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
04/09/1961 04/02/1968 25/02/1968 22/06/1968 18/05/1981 |
18/05/1981 |
D9013 | 55013 | 14/09/1961 | 64B 34G 34G 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Finsbury Park (on loan) Finsbury Park (loan made permanent) Haymarket Withdrawn |
14/09/1961 04/02/1968 25/02/1968 29/06/1968 20/12/1981 |
20/12/1981 |
D9014 | 55014 | 29/09/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
29/09/1961 22/11/1981 |
22/11/1981 |
D9015 | 55015 | 13/10/1961 | 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Withdrawn |
13/10/1961 02/01/1982 |
02/01/1982 |
D9016 | 55016 | 27/10/1961 | 64B 34G 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Finsbury Park Haymarket Withdrawn |
27/10/1961 02/12/1967 29/06/1968 30/12/1981 |
30/12/1981 |
D9017 | 55017 | 09/11/1961 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
09/11/1961 31/12/1981 |
31/12/1981 |
D9018 | 55018 | 24/11/1961 | 34G | Finsbury Park (New) | 24/11/1961 | 13/10/1981 |
D9019 | 55019 | 11/12/1961 | 64B 34G 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Finsbury Park Haymarket Withdrawn |
11/12/1961 02/12/1967 29/06/1968 31/12/1981 |
31/12/1981 |
D9020 | 55020 | 12/02/1962 | 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Withdrawn |
12/02/1962 06/01/1980 |
06/01/1980 |
D9021 | 55021 | 16/03/1962 | 64B 34G 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Finsbury Park Haymarket Withdrawn |
16/03/1962 12/12/1964 19/06/1965 31/12/1981 |
31/12/1981 |