Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Drummond "Jumbo" Class 0-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
57230 01/01/1883 07/1956 Polmadie 73.5 73.67
57231 01/01/1883 04/1949 Motherwell 66.25
57232 01/01/1883 05/1961 Fort William 78.33 79.42
57233 01/01/1883 10/1961 Fort William 78.75 79.18
57234 01/01/1883 03/1957 Ayr 74.17
57235 01/01/1883 28/10/1955 Ayr 72.75
57236 12/1883 09/1961 Hurlford 77.75 78.30
57237 11/1883 08/10/1962 Motherwell 78.92 80.05
57238 12/1883 09/1961 Stranraer 77.75 78.30
57239 12/1883 27/11/1961 Polmadie 77.92 78.55
57240 12/1883 08/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 78.83 79.47
57241 12/1883 05/1959 Corkerhill 75.42 75.55
57242 12/1883 16/07/1962 Hamilton (West) 78.58 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1962 78.97
57243 12/1883 06/1959 Stirling 75.5 75.63
57244 12/1883 09/1961 Polmadie 77.75 78.22
57245 12/1883 10/1961 Dawsholm 77.83 79.14
57246 11/1883 10/1961 Fort William 77.92 78.30
57247 12/1883 07/1959 Motherwell 75.58 75.72
57249 11/1883 16/07/1962 Hurlford 78.67 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1964 80.55
57250 01/1884 09/1961 Polmadie 77.67 78.30
57251 01/1884 08/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 78.75 79.72
57252 03/1884 22/11/1962 Fort William 78.67 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 10/1963 79.64
57253 03/1884 08/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 78.58 79.13
57254 03/1884 30/07/1962 Ardrossan 78.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1962 78.72
57255 03/1884 03/1952 Corkerhill 68
57256 04/1884 10/1961 Motherwell 77.5 77.89
57257 04/1884 10/1961 Fort William 77.5 77.80
57258 04/1884 08/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 78.5 80.81
57259 04/1884 08/10/1962 Dawsholm 78.5 79.05
57260 04/1884 07/10/1955 Hamilton (West) 71.5
57261 04/1884 11/1963 Fort William 79.58 80.22
57262 04/1884 10/1961 Ayr 77.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1963 79.13
57263 04/1884 10/1961 Ardrossan 77.5 79.13
57264 04/1884 10/1961 Fort William 77.5 77.55
57265 04/1884 16/07/1962 Grangemouth 78.25 78.64
57266 04/1884 13/12/1962 Stranraer 78.67 79.47
57267 05/1884 02/04/1962 Motherwell 77.92 78.97
57268 05/1884 10/1961 Polmadie 77.42 78.39
57269 03/1884 08/1963 Grangemouth 79.42 79.72
57270 03/1884 11/1963 Ardrossan 79.67 79.97
57271 04/1884 10/1961 Polmadie 77.5 78.64
57272 05/1885 10/1951 Motherwell 66.42
57273 12/1885 02/1960 Dawsholm 74.17 74.30
57274 12/1885 30/04/1962 Ardrossan 76.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1962 76.97
57275 12/1885 02/04/1962 Polmadie 76.33 76.97
57276 12/1885 11/1959 Stirling 73.92 74.05
57277 12/1886 04/1951 Hurlford 64.33
57278 12/1886 06/1963 Motherwell 76.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 03/1964 77.30
57279 12/1886 10/1959 Ayr 72.83 72.96
57280 12/1886 09/1952 Hamilton (West) 65.75
57281 12/1886 11/1947 60.92
57282 12/1886 11/1955 Ardrossan 68.92
57283 09/1886 02/1951 Perth South 64.42
57284 09/1886 08/10/1962 Hurlford 76.08 77.38
57285 09/1886 27/11/1961 Grangemouth 75.17 76.55
57286 09/1886 02/1949 Polmadie 62.42
57287 09/1886 27/11/1961 Grangemouth 75.17 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 10/1962 76.13
57288 07/1886 27/11/1961 Polmadie 75.33 76.13
57289 07/1886 10/1951 Motherwell 65.25
57290 09/1886 19/06/1948 61.75 61.87
57291 09/1886 08/1963 Motherwell 76.92 77.55
57292 09/1886 27/11/1961 Polmadie 75.17 75.96
57293 09/1886 11/1947 61.17
57294 01/1886 11/1949 63.83
57295 06/1887 11/06/1962 Ardrossan 75 76.47
57296 06/1887 11/1963 Dumfries 76.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1964 76.97
57298 07/1887 04/1950 Carstairs 62.75
57299 07/1887 22/10/1962 Motherwell 75.25 76.39
57300 08/1887 11/06/1962 Hurlford 74.83 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1962 75.30
57301 08/1887 22/05/1948 60.75 60.96
57302 08/1887 10/1963 Dumfries 76.17 76.55
57303 08/1887 10/1961 Motherwell 74.17 75.30
57304 02/1887 05/06/1948 61.33 61.45
57305 02/1887 02/1949 62
57306 02/1887 06/1951 Dawsholm 64.33
57307 02/1887 08/1959 Hamilton (West) 72.5 72.63
57308 03/1887 22/05/1948 61.17 61.38
57309 05/1887 11/1963 Ardrossan 76.5 76.81
57310 05/1887 12/1949 Polmadie 62.58
57311 06/1887 17/09/1962 Grangemouth 75.25 75.47
57312 02/1889 08/1951 Ayr 62.5
57313 11/1889 12/1948 59.08 58.29
57314 11/1889 12/03/1962 Dawsholm 72.33 73.13
57315 11/1889 12/1955 Ayr 66.08 66.21
57316 11/1889 10/1949 Polmadie 59.92
57317 11/1889 27/11/1961 Polmadie 72 72.79
57318 11/1889 10/1951 St Rollox (Balornock) 61.92
57319 01/1890 05/12/1961 Polmadie 71.92 72.88
57320 01/1890 03/1956 Polmadie 66.17
57321 01/1890 20/11/1961 Hamilton (West) 71.83 72.63
57322 02/1890 02/1953 Dawsholm 63
57323 02/1890 05/1951 Carstairs 61.25 61.37
57324 02/1890 05/1961 Fort William 71.25 71.29
57325 11/1891 04/12/1961 Motherwell 70.08 71.05
57326 11/1891 22/04/1963 Motherwell 71.42 72.13
57327 12/1891 17/04/1948 56.33
57328 12/1891 08/04/1963 Motherwell 71.33 72.05
57329 12/1891 08/10/1962 Motherwell 70.83 71.96
57330 12/1891 12/06/1948 56.5 56.62
57331 12/1891 24/09/1962 Hurlford 70.75 70.96
57332 02/1892 11/1952 Motherwell 60.75 60.96
57333 02/1892 20/03/1948 56.08
57334 03/1892 03/1951 Grangemouth 59
57335 03/1892 10/1961 Hamilton (West) 69.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 11/1962 70.72
57336 07/1892 09/1963 Ardrossan 71.17 71.38
57337 07/1892 12/1952 Dumfries 60.42
57338 07/1892 26/03/1962 Stranraer 69.67 70.55
57339 07/1892 06/1959 Stirling 66.92 67.04
57340 08/1892 29/11/1962 Stranraer 70.25 71.13
57341 08/1892 16/07/1962 Hurlford 69.92 70.30
57342 04/1892 06/1950 Motherwell 58.17
57343 04/1892 17/04/1948 56
57344 04/1892 12/1951 Dumfries 59.67
57345 04/1892 12/03/1962 Perth South 69.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1962 70.63
57346 05/1892 08/1957 Dawsholm 65.25
57347 05/1892 26/03/1962 Polmadie 69.83 70.55
57348 11/1891 01/03/1963 Ardrossan 71.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1963 72.05
57349 08/1892 07/1961 Dumfries 68.92 69.46
57350 07/1892 20/11/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 69.33 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1962 70.38
57351 08/1892 09/1949 57.08
57352 12/1892 10/1951 St Rollox (Balornock) 58.83
57353 10/1894 20/11/1961 Hurlford 67.08 68.71
57354 10/1894 12/1959 Ayr 65.17 65.54
57355 11/1894 11/1963 Stranraer 69 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1964 69.63
57356 11/1894 06/1961 Ardrossan 66.58 67.04
57357 08/1892 26/03/1962 Ardrossan 69.58 70.88
57358 12/1892 06/1949 Motherwell 56.5 56.62
57359 12/1892 26/03/1962 Hurlford 69.25 70.54
57360 12/1892 14/03/1963 Motherwell 70.25 71.04
57361 12/1892 12/1959 Polmadie 67 70.46
57362 01/1893 11/06/1962 Dumfries 69.42 69.79
57363 01/1893 04/12/1961 Motherwell 68.92 69.88
57364 01/1893 04/12/1961 Ayr 68.92 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1963 70.37
57365 01/1893 21/05/1962 Polmadie 69.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 11/1962 69.88
57366 01/1893 27/11/1961 Grangemouth 68.83 70.04
57367 06/1893 11/12/1961 Polmadie 68.5 69.21
57368 06/1893 12/1961 Perth South 68.5
57369 06/1893 08/10/1962 Polmadie 69.33 69.38
57370 07/1893 26/03/1962 Motherwell 68.67 69.55
57371 07/1893 24/07/1948 55
57372 07/1893 01/1952 Dawsholm 58.5
57373 02/1894 07/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 67.42 67.79
57374 02/1894 22/05/1948 54.25
57375 02/1894 11/1963 Stranraer 69.75 70.38
57376 02/1894
57377 05/1894 10/1961 Motherwell 67.42 68.21
57378 05/1894 24/09/1962 Dumfries 68.33 68.55
57379 06/1894 02/1951 Motherwell 56.67
57380 07/1894 24/04/1948 53.75
57381 07/1894 09/1949 Polmadie 55.17
57382 08/1894 07/1962 Hurlford 67.92
57383 11/1894 30/07/1962 Hurlford 67.67 67.96
57384 11/1894 21/01/1963 Motherwell 68.17 69.04
57385 09/1894 11/06/1962 Carstairs 67.75 68.13
57386 10/1894 21/05/1962 Carstairs 67.58 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 01/1963 68.30
57387 06/1895 11/1952 Polmadie 57.42 57.62
57388 06/1895 02/1953 Polmadie 57.67 57.79
57389 06/1895 27/11/1961 Polmadie 66.42 67.46
57390 07/1895 05/1950 Ayr 54.83
57391 07/1895 10/1950 Dumfries 55.25
57392 07/1895 04/12/1961 Ayr 66.42 67.88
57393 06/1895 04/1949 Hamilton (West) 53.83
57394 06/1895 11/1951 Dawsholm 56.42
57395 06/1895 03/1953 Dumfries 57.75
57396 07/1895 05/1958 Stirling 62.83 62.96
57397 07/1896 02/1953 Dumfries 56.58 56.70
57398 07/1896 21/05/1962 Motherwell 65.83 66.21
57399 08/1896 09/1949 Carstairs 53.08
57400 08/1896 06/1949 Aberdeen Ferryhill 52.83
57401 08/1896 02/1950 Hamilton (West) 53.5
57402 08/1896 08/1949 53
57403 09/1896 10/1949 Motherwell 53.08
57404 09/1896 10/1961 Motherwell 65.08 65.38
57405 09/1896 09/1958 Dumfries 62
57406 09/1896 12/1948 52.25
57407 09/1896 05/1959 Hamilton (West) 62.67 62.95
57408 10/1896 07/02/1948 51.33
57409 10/1896 01/1950 53.25
57410 10/1896 02/1953 Hamilton (West) 56.33 56.87
57411 10/1896 09/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 64.92 65.54
57412 10/1896 03/1956 Polmadie 59.42 59.62
57413 11/1896 10/1958 Hamilton (West) 61.92
57414 11/1896 04/1959 Motherwell 62.42 62.53
57415 11/1896 11/1949 Motherwell 53 53.12
57416 11/1896 07/1961 Greenock Ladyburn 64.67 64.79
57417 02/1897 08/10/1962 Polmadie 65.67 65.87
57418 03/1897 10/1961 Polmadie 64.58 65.71
57419 03/1897 05/1959 Polmadie 62.17 62.37
57420 03/1897 10/1949 Hamilton (West) 52.58
57421 03/1897 02/10/1948 51.58
57422 03/1897 05/06/1948 51.25
57423 03/1897 03/1953 Stirling 56 56.12
57424 04/1897 12/1959 Perth South 62.67 62.88
57425 04/1897 11/1950 Stirling 53.58
57426 04/1897 09/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 64.42 64.88
57427 04/1897 08/1949 Dawsholm 52.33
57429 09/1897 09/1961 Grangemouth 64 64.46
57430 09/1897 09/1957 Hamilton (West) 60
57431 10/1897 06/1961 Motherwell 63.67 63.87
57432 10/1897 10/1961 Polmadie 64 64.21
57433 05/1896 05/1952 Polmadie 56
57434 05/1896 05/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 65 65.38
57435 05/1896 02/1960 Motherwell 63.75 63.87
57436 06/1896 10/1961 Motherwell 65.33 66.29
57437 06/1896 08/1958 Motherwell 62.17
57438 06/1896 05/1953 Carstairs 56.92 56.95
57439 06/1896 02/1953 Polmadie 56.67 56.95
57440 06/1896 05/1950 Stranraer 53.92 54.03
57441 06/1896 29/11/1961 Oban 65.42 66.46
57442 06/1896 24/07/1948 52.08
57443 07/1896 08/1958 Polmadie 62.08
57444 07/1896 11/1959 Polmadie 63.33 63.46
57445 11/1896 06/08/1962 Stranraer 65.75 65.96
57446 12/1896 10/1961 Motherwell 64.83 65.13
57447 12/1896 08/10/1962 Motherwell 65.83 67.04
57448 12/1896 02/1960 Polmadie 63.17 63.21
57449 12/1896 11/1949 52.92
57450 12/1896 02/1953 Stirling 56.17 56.53
57451 12/1896 10/1961 Carstairs 64.83 66.62
57452 08/1897 07/1949 Dawsholm 51.92
57453 08/1897 10/1950 St Rollox (Balornock) 53.17
57454 09/1897 03/1953 St Rollox (Balornock) 55.5 55.62
57455 09/1897 06/1951 St Rollox (Balornock) 53.75
57456 09/1897 01/1956 Dawsholm 58.33
57457 10/1897 02/1956 St Rollox (Balornock) 58.33
57458 10/1897 11/1952 Stranraer 55.08
57459 11/1897 12/1956 Polmadie 59.08
57460 11/1897 01/1957 Stirling 59.17
57461 11/1897 10/1961 Motherwell 63.92 65.04
57462 11/1897 06/1959 Motherwell 61.58 61.70
57463 11/1897 11/12/1961 Polmadie 64.08 65.04
57464 04/1897 02/1953 Polmadie 55.83 56.12
57465 05/1897 04/1959 Polmadie 61.92 62.21
57466 05/1897 04/1949 51.92 52.20
57467 05/1897 02/1950 Polmadie 52.75 52.87
57468 08/1897 02/1952 Stirling 54.5
57469 02/1897 20/11/1948 51.75 52.03
57470 02/1897 10/1961 Dawsholm 64.67 66.12
57471 02/1897 11/09/1948 51.58
57472 02/1897 09/1961 Dawsholm 64.58 65.12
57473 02/1897 06/1961 Perth South 64.33 64.54