Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 692 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 4527 Week
» 22998 Month
» 158663 Year
» 669765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Drummond "Jumbo" Class 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 57247 66B   Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. - Outside the Works. RO 9/1954  
Sat 10/03/1962 57257,
57349,
57429
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
   
Wed 18/04/1962 57411 Wdn   Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up. SLS 5/1962  
Sat 02/06/1962 57349,
57411
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
SLS 7/1962  
Sun 03/06/1962 57245,
57285,
57314,
57338,
57366,
57470
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962