Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 337 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4511 Week
» 16680 Month
» 243441 Year
» 754543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Drummond "Jumbo" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
11/1947 Condemned 17281       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 17293       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17230     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57231     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17232     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17233     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17234     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17235     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17236     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17237     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17238     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17239     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17240     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17241     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17242     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17243     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17244     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17245     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17246     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17247     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17249     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17250     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17251     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17252     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17253     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17254     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17255     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17256     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17257     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17258     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17259     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17260     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17261     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17262     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17263     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17264     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17265     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17266     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17267     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17268     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17269     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17270     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17271     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17272     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17273     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17274     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17275     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17276     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17277     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17278     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17279     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17280     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17282     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17284     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17285     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57286     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17287     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17288     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17289     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57290     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17291     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17292     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17294     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17295     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17296     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17298     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17299     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17300     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57301     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17302     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17303     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57304     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57305     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17306     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17307     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57308     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17309     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17310     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17311     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17312     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57313     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17314     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17315     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17316     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17317     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17318     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17319     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17320     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17321     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17322     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17323     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17324     29D Forfar  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17325     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17326     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57327     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17328     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17329     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57330     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17331     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17332     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57333     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17334     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17335     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17336     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17337     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17338     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17340     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17341     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57342     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57343     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17344     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17346     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17347     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17348     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17349     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17350     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17351     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17352     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17353     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17354     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17355     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17356     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17357     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17358     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17359     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17360     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17361     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17362     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17363     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17364     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17365     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17366     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17367     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17368     29D Forfar  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17369     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17370     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57371     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17372     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17373     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57374     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17375     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17377     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17378     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17379     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57380     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57381     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57382     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17383     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17384     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17385     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17386     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17387     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17388     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17389     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17390     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17391     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17392     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57393     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17394     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17395     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17396     31C Oban  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17397     29A Perth South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17398     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57399     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57401     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57402     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57403     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17404     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17405     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57406     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17407     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57408     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17409     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17410     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17411     31C Oban  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17412     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17413     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17414     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57415     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17416     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17417     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17418     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17419     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57420     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57421     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57422     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17423     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17424     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17425     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17426     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57427     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17429     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17430     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17431     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17432     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17433     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17434     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17435     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17436     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17437     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17438     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17439     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57440     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17441     29D Forfar  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57442     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17443     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17444     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17445     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17446     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17447     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17448     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57449     29A Perth South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17450     29C Dundee West  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17451     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57452     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17453     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17454     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17455     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57456     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17457     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17458     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17459     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17460     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17461     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17462     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17463     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17464     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17465     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57466     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17467     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17468     31B Stirling  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57469     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17470     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 57471     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17472     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17473     29A Perth South  
07/02/1948 Condemned 57408 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
20/03/1948 Condemned 57333 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
17/04/1948 Condemned 57327 28A Motherwell   COND  
17/04/1948 Condemned 57343 12G Dumfries   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 57380 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 57301 28A Motherwell   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 57308 28A Motherwell   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 57374 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
05/06/1948 Condemned 57304 30C Ardrossan   COND  
05/06/1948 Condemned 57422 31B Stirling   COND  
12/06/1948 Condemned 57330 27A Polmadie   COND  
19/06/1948 Condemned 57290 28A Motherwell   COND  
24/07/1948 Condemned 57371 31E Dawsholm   COND  
24/07/1948 Condemned 57442 31D Grangemouth   COND  
11/09/1948 Condemned 57471 31E Dawsholm   COND  
02/10/1948 Condemned 57421 12H Stranraer   COND  
20/11/1948 Condemned 57469 31E Dawsholm   COND  
12/1948 Condemned 57313 28A Motherwell   COND  
12/1948 Condemned 57406 28A Motherwell   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 57286 12G Dumfries   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 57305 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
04/1949 Condemned 57231 28A Motherwell   COND  
04/1949 Condemned 57393 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
04/1949 Condemned 57466 31B Stirling   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 57358 28A Motherwell   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 57400       COND  
07/1949 Condemned 57452 31E Dawsholm   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 57402 31B Stirling   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 57427 31E Dawsholm   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 57351 30D Ayr   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 57381 27A Polmadie   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 57399 28C Carstairs   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 57316 27A Polmadie   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 57403 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 57420 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 57294 31D Grangemouth   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 57415 28A Motherwell   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 57449 29A Perth South   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 57310 27A Polmadie   COND  
01/1950 Condemned 57409 12G Dumfries   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 57401 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 57467 27A Polmadie   COND  
04/1950 Condemned 57298 28C Carstairs   COND  
05/1950 Condemned 57390 30D Ayr   COND  
05/1950 Condemned 57440 12H Stranraer   COND  
06/1950 Condemned 57342 28A Motherwell   COND  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 57397 29A Perth South 68B Dumfries  
10/1950 Condemned 57391 12G Dumfries   COND  
10/1950 Condemned 57453 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
11/1950 Condemned 57425 31B Stirling   COND  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 57340 28C Carstairs 68C Stranraer  
02/1951 Condemned 57283       COND  
02/1951 Condemned 57379 28A Motherwell   COND  
03/1951 Condemned 57334 31D Grangemouth   COND  
04/1951 Condemned 57277 30B Hurlford   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 57323 28C Carstairs   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 57306 31E Dawsholm   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 57455 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 57312 30D Ayr   COND  
09/09/1951 Reallocation 57339     63B Stirling  
10/1951 Condemned 57272 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1951 Condemned 57289 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1951 Condemned 57318 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
10/1951 Condemned 57352 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
11/1951 Condemned 57394 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
12/1951 Condemned 57344 28A Motherwell   COND  
01/1952 Condemned 57372 31E Dawsholm   COND  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 57359 30A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
02/1952 Condemned 57468 31B Stirling   COND  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 57357 30C Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 57450 29C Dundee West 63B Stirling  
03/1952 Condemned 57255 30A Corkerhill   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 57433 27A Polmadie   COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 57373 31D Grangemouth 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 57426 31E Dawsholm 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 57359 67B Hurlford 67A Corkerhill  
09/1952 Condemned 57280 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 57395 27C Hamilton (West) 68B Dumfries  
11/1952 Condemned 57332 28A Motherwell   COND  
11/1952 Condemned 57387 27A Polmadie   COND  
11/1952 Condemned 57458 12H Stranraer   COND  
12/1952 Condemned 57337 12G Dumfries   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57322 31E Dawsholm   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57388 27A Polmadie   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57397 68B Dumfries   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57410 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57439 27A Polmadie   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57450 63B Stirling   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 57464 27A Polmadie   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 57395 68B Dumfries   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 57423 31B Stirling   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 57454 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 57324 29D Forfar 63B Stirling  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 57357 67B Hurlford 67D Ardrossan  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 57396 31C Oban 63B Stirling  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 57424 31B Stirling 63E Oban  
05/1953 Condemned 57438 28C Carstairs   COND  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 57369 27B Greenock Ladyburn 66A Polmadie  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 57258 31E Dawsholm 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 57335 27A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 57441 29D Forfar 63B Stirling  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 57238 12G Dumfries 68C Stranraer  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 57315 30D Ayr 68C Stranraer  
16/04/1955 Reallocation 57315 68C Stranraer 67C Ayr  
06/08/1955 Reallocation 57254 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 67D Ardrossan  
06/08/1955 Reallocation 57276 30C Ardrossan 63D Oban  
01/10/1955 Reallocation 57368 29D Forfar 63D Oban  
01/10/1955 Reallocation 57424 63E Oban 63C Forfar  
07/10/1955 Condemned 57260 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
28/10/1955 Condemned 57235 30D Ayr   COND  
11/1955 Condemned 57282 30C Ardrossan   COND  
12/1955 Condemned 57315 67C Ayr   COND  
01/1956 Condemned 57456 31E Dawsholm   COND  
02/1956 Condemned 57457 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 57266 30A Corkerhill 67D Ardrossan  
03/1956 Condemned 57320 27A Polmadie   COND  
03/1956 Condemned 57412 27A Polmadie   COND  
07/1956 Condemned 57230 12G Dumfries   COND  
04/08/1956 Reallocation 57237 27C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
12/1956 Condemned 57459 27A Polmadie   COND  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 57309 30A Corkerhill 67D Ardrossan  
22/12/1956 Reallocation 57368 63D Oban 63C Forfar  
01/1957 Condemned 57460 31B Stirling   COND  
03/1957 Condemned 57234 30D Ayr   COND  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 57368 63C Forfar 63A Perth South  
08/1957 Condemned 57346 31E Dawsholm   COND  
09/1957 Condemned 57430 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
23/11/1957 Reallocation 57416 28A Motherwell 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
23/11/1957 Reallocation 57417 28A Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
23/11/1957 Reallocation 57418 28A Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
23/11/1957 Reallocation 57419 28A Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
05/1958 Condemned 57396 63B Stirling   COND  
05/07/1958 Reallocation 57441 63B Stirling 63C Forfar  
08/1958 Condemned 57437 28A Motherwell   COND  
08/1958 Condemned 57443 27A Polmadie   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 57405 12G Dumfries   COND  
27/09/1958 Reallocation 57370 27A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
27/09/1958 Reallocation 57446 27A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
27/09/1958 Reallocation 57447 27A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
10/1958 Condemned 57413 28A Motherwell   COND  
25/10/1958 Reallocation 57284 30D Ayr 67B Hurlford  
25/10/1958 Reallocation 57295 30D Ayr 67B Hurlford  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 57276 63D Oban 63B Stirling  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 57321 27A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 57424 63C Forfar 63A Perth South  
04/1959 Condemned 57414 28A Motherwell   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 57465 27A Polmadie   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 57241 30A Corkerhill   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 57407 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 57419 66A Polmadie   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 57243 31B Stirling   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 57339 63B Stirling   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 57462 28A Motherwell   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 57247 28A Motherwell   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 57307 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57244 27C Hamilton (West) 66A Polmadie  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57250 27C Hamilton (West) 66A Polmadie  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57370 66C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57384 27C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57398 27C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57431 27C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 57446 66C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
10/1959 Condemned 57279 30D Ayr   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 57276 63B Stirling   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 57444 27A Polmadie   COND  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 57336 31E Dawsholm 66C Hamilton (West)  
12/1959 Condemned 57354 30D Ayr   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 57361 27A Polmadie   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 57424 63A Perth South   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 57273 28A Motherwell   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 57435 28A Motherwell   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 57448 27A Polmadie   COND  
24/09/1960 Reallocation 57429 31E Dawsholm 65F Grangemouth  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 57268 27A Polmadie 66A Polmadie  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 57259 31E Dawsholm 65D Dawsholm  
05/1961 Condemned 57232 31B Stirling   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 57324 63B Stirling   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 57434 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 57356 30C Ardrossan   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 57431 66B Motherwell   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 57473 29A Perth South   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 57349 12G Dumfries   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 57373 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 57416 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 57249 30A Corkerhill 67D Ardrossan  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 57249 67D Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 57359 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
09/1961 Condemned 57236 30B Hurlford   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57238 68C Stranraer   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57244 66A Polmadie   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57250 66A Polmadie   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57411 31C Oban   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57426 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57429 65F Grangemouth   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 57472 31E Dawsholm   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57233 31B Stirling   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57245 31E Dawsholm   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57246 31B Stirling   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57256 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57257 31B Stirling   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57262 30D Ayr   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57263 30D Ayr   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57264 31B Stirling   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57268 66A Polmadie   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57271 30D Ayr   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57303 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57335 66C Hamilton (West)   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57377 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57404 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57418 66A Polmadie   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57432 27A Polmadie   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57436 27A Polmadie   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57446 66B Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57451 28C Carstairs   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57461 28A Motherwell   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 57470 31E Dawsholm   COND  
18/11/1961 Reallocation 57300 30A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
20/11/1961 Condemned 57321 66C Hamilton (West)   COND  
20/11/1961 Condemned 57350 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
20/11/1961 Condemned 57353 30B Hurlford   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57239 27A Polmadie   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57285 31D Grangemouth   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57287 31D Grangemouth   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57288 12G Dumfries   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57292 27A Polmadie   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57317 27A Polmadie   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57366 31E Dawsholm   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 57389 27A Polmadie   COND  
29/11/1961 Condemned 57441 63C Forfar   COND  
12/1961 Condemned 57368 63A Perth South   COND  
04/12/1961 Condemned 57325 28A Motherwell   COND  
04/12/1961 Condemned 57363 28A Motherwell   COND  
04/12/1961 Condemned 57364 30D Ayr   COND  
04/12/1961 Condemned 57392 30D Ayr   COND  
05/12/1961 Condemned 57319 27A Polmadie   COND  
11/12/1961 Condemned 57367 27A Polmadie   COND  
11/12/1961 Condemned 57463 27B Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
12/03/1962 Condemned 57314 31E Dawsholm   COND  
12/03/1962 Condemned 57345       COND  
26/03/1962 Condemned 57338 31D Grangemouth   COND  
26/03/1962 Condemned 57347 27A Polmadie   COND  
26/03/1962 Condemned 57357 67D Ardrossan   COND  
26/03/1962 Condemned 57359 67B Hurlford   COND  
26/03/1962 Condemned 57370 66B Motherwell   COND  
02/04/1962 Condemned 57267 28A Motherwell   COND  
02/04/1962 Condemned 57275 27A Polmadie   COND  
30/04/1962 Condemned 57274 30C Ardrossan   COND  
21/05/1962 Condemned 57365 27A Polmadie   COND  
21/05/1962 Condemned 57386 28C Carstairs   COND  
21/05/1962 Condemned 57398 66B Motherwell   COND  
11/06/1962 Condemned 57295 67B Hurlford   COND  
11/06/1962 Condemned 57300 67B Hurlford   COND  
11/06/1962 Condemned 57362 12G Dumfries   COND  
11/06/1962 Condemned 57385 28C Carstairs   COND  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 57296 31E Dawsholm 68B Dumfries  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 57336 66C Hamilton (West) 67B Hurlford  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 57341 31E Dawsholm 67B Hurlford  
07/1962 Condemned 57382 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 57311 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 65F Grangemouth  
16/07/1962 Condemned 57242 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 57249 67B Hurlford   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 57265 31D Grangemouth   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 57341 67B Hurlford   COND  
30/07/1962 Condemned 57254 67D Ardrossan   COND  
30/07/1962 Condemned 57383 30B Hurlford   COND  
06/08/1962 Condemned 57445 12H Stranraer   COND  
11/08/1962 Reallocation 57360 27A Polmadie 66B Motherwell  
17/09/1962 Condemned 57311 65F Grangemouth   COND  
24/09/1962 Condemned 57331 30B Hurlford   COND  
24/09/1962 Condemned 57378 12G Dumfries   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57237 66B Motherwell   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57240 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57251 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57253 31A St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57258 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57259 65D Dawsholm   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57284 67B Hurlford   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57329 12G Dumfries   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57369 66A Polmadie   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57417 66A Polmadie   COND  
08/10/1962 Condemned 57447 66C Hamilton (West)   COND  
22/10/1962 Condemned 57299 28A Motherwell   COND  
22/11/1962 Condemned 57252 31B Stirling   COND  
24/11/1962 Reallocation 57269 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 65F Grangemouth  
29/11/1962 Condemned 57340 68C Stranraer   COND  
13/12/1962 Condemned 57266 67D Ardrossan   COND  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 57261 30D Ayr 65J Stirling  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 57266 98W   67F Stranraer  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 57336 67B Hurlford 67D Ardrossan  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 57355 30C Ardrossan 67F Stranraer  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 57291 28A Motherwell 66F Beattock  
21/01/1963 Condemned 57384 66B Motherwell   COND  
01/03/1963 Condemned 57348 30C Ardrossan   COND  
14/03/1963 Condemned 57360 66B Motherwell   COND  
16/03/1963 Reallocation 57291 66F Beattock 66B Motherwell  
08/04/1963 Condemned 57328 28A Motherwell   COND  
22/04/1963 Condemned 57326 28A Motherwell   COND  
06/1963 Condemned 57278 28A Motherwell   COND  
08/1963 Condemned 57269 65F Grangemouth   COND  
08/1963 Condemned 57291 66B Motherwell   COND  
09/1963 Condemned 57336 67D Ardrossan   COND  
07/09/1963 Reallocation 57270 28A Motherwell 67D Ardrossan  
10/1963 Condemned 57302 12G Dumfries   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57261 65J Stirling   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57270 67D Ardrossan   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57296 68B Dumfries   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57309 67D Ardrossan   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57355 67F Stranraer   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 57375 12H Stranraer   COND