Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 691 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 4526 Week
» 22997 Month
» 158662 Year
» 669764 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Drummond "Jumbo" Class 0-6-0


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Standard Goods 57230 01/01/1883 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1956
07/1956
Standard Goods 57231 01/01/1883 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
Standard Goods 57232 01/01/1883 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1961
05/1961
Standard Goods 57233 01/01/1883 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57234 01/01/1883 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1957
03/1957
Standard Goods 57235 01/01/1883 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/10/1955
28/10/1955
Standard Goods 57236 12/1883 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57237 11/1883 27C
66B
W
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1956
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57238 12/1883 12G
68C
W
Dumfries
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/01/1955
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57239 12/1883 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57240 12/1883 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57241 12/1883 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1959
05/1959
Standard Goods 57242 12/1883 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
Standard Goods 57243 12/1883 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1959
06/1959
Standard Goods 57244 12/1883 27C
66A
W
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57245 12/1883 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57246 11/1883 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57247 12/1883 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1959
07/1959
Standard Goods 57249 11/1883 30A
67D
67B
W
Corkerhill
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/08/1961
26/08/1961
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
Standard Goods 57250 01/1884 27C
66A
W
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57251 01/1884 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57252 03/1884 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1962
22/11/1962
Standard Goods 57253 03/1884 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57254 03/1884 31A
67D
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1955
30/07/1962
30/07/1962
Standard Goods 57255 03/1884 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1952
03/1952
Standard Goods 57256 04/1884 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57257 04/1884 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57258 04/1884 31E
65B
W
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1953
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57259 04/1884 31E
65D
W
Dawsholm
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1961
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57260 04/1884 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1955
07/10/1955
Standard Goods 57261 04/1884 30D
65J
W
Ayr
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1962
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57262 04/1884 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57263 04/1884 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57264 04/1884 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57265 04/1884 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
Standard Goods 57266 04/1884 30A
67D
W
67F
Corkerhill
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
Stranraer
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
13/12/1962
22/12/1962
13/12/1962
Standard Goods 57267 05/1884 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/04/1962
02/04/1962
Standard Goods 57268 05/1884 27A
66A
W
Polmadie
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1960
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57269 03/1884 31A
65F
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1962
08/1963
08/1963
Standard Goods 57270 03/1884 28A
67D
W
Motherwell
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1963
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57271 04/1884 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57272 05/1885 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1951
10/1951
Standard Goods 57273 12/1885 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1960
02/1960
Standard Goods 57274 12/1885 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
Standard Goods 57275 12/1885 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/04/1962
02/04/1962
Standard Goods 57276 12/1885 30C
63D
63B
W
Ardrossan
Oban
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1955
22/11/1958
11/1959
11/1959
Standard Goods 57277 12/1886 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1951
04/1951
Standard Goods 57278 12/1886 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1963
06/1963
Standard Goods 57279 12/1886 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1959
10/1959
Standard Goods 57280 12/1886 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1952
09/1952
Standard Goods 57281 12/1886 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
Standard Goods 57282 12/1886 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1955
11/1955
Standard Goods 57283 09/1886 W Withdrawn 02/1951 02/1951
Standard Goods 57284 09/1886 30D
67B
W
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57285 09/1886 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57286 09/1886 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
Standard Goods 57287 09/1886 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57288 07/1886 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57289 07/1886 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1951
10/1951
Standard Goods 57290 09/1886 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1948
19/06/1948
Standard Goods 57291 09/1886 28A
66F
66B
W
Motherwell
Beattock
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
16/03/1963
08/1963
08/1963
Standard Goods 57292 09/1886 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57293 09/1886 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
Standard Goods 57294 01/1886 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
Standard Goods 57295 06/1887 30D
67B
W
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
Standard Goods 57296 06/1887 31E
68B
W
Dawsholm
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1962
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57298 07/1887 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1950
04/1950
Standard Goods 57299 07/1887 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1962
22/10/1962
Standard Goods 57300 08/1887 30A
67B
W
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
Standard Goods 57301 08/1887 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
Standard Goods 57302 08/1887 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
Standard Goods 57303 08/1887 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57304 02/1887 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/06/1948
05/06/1948
Standard Goods 57305 02/1887 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
Standard Goods 57306 02/1887 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1951
06/1951
Standard Goods 57307 02/1887 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1959
08/1959
Standard Goods 57308 03/1887 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
Standard Goods 57309 05/1887 30A
67D
W
Corkerhill
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57310 05/1887 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1949
12/1949
Standard Goods 57311 06/1887 31A
65F
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/07/1962
17/09/1962
17/09/1962
Standard Goods 57312 02/1889 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1951
08/1951
Standard Goods 57313 11/1889 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1948
12/1948
Standard Goods 57314 11/1889 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1962
12/03/1962
Standard Goods 57315 11/1889 30D
68C
67C
W
Ayr
Stranraer
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/01/1955
16/04/1955
12/1955
12/1955
Standard Goods 57316 11/1889 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
Standard Goods 57317 11/1889 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57318 11/1889 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1951
10/1951
Standard Goods 57319 01/1890 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1961
05/12/1961
Standard Goods 57320 01/1890 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1956
03/1956
Standard Goods 57321 01/1890 27A
66C
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
20/11/1961
20/11/1961
Standard Goods 57322 02/1890 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57323 02/1890 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1951
05/1951
Standard Goods 57324 02/1890 29D
63B
W
Forfar
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
05/1961
05/1961
Standard Goods 57325 11/1891 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1961
04/12/1961
Standard Goods 57326 11/1891 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/04/1963
22/04/1963
Standard Goods 57327 12/1891 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1948
17/04/1948
Standard Goods 57328 12/1891 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/04/1963
08/04/1963
Standard Goods 57329 12/1891 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57330 12/1891 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1948
12/06/1948
Standard Goods 57331 12/1891 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1962
24/09/1962
Standard Goods 57332 02/1892 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1952
11/1952
Standard Goods 57333 02/1892 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1948
20/03/1948
Standard Goods 57334 03/1892 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1951
03/1951
Standard Goods 57335 03/1892 27A
66C
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57336 07/1892 31E
66C
67B
67D
W
Dawsholm
Hamilton (West)
Hurlford
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
16/06/1962
22/12/1962
09/1963
09/1963
Standard Goods 57337 07/1892 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1952
12/1952
Standard Goods 57338 07/1892 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
Standard Goods 57339 07/1892 63B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
09/09/1951
06/1959
06/1959
Standard Goods 57340 08/1892 28C
68C
W
Carstairs
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
29/11/1962
29/11/1962
Standard Goods 57341 08/1892 31E
67B
W
Dawsholm
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1962
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
Standard Goods 57342 04/1892 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1950
06/1950
Standard Goods 57343 04/1892 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1948
17/04/1948
Standard Goods 57344 04/1892 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1951
12/1951
Standard Goods 57345 04/1892 W Withdrawn 12/03/1962 12/03/1962
Standard Goods 57346 05/1892 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1957
08/1957
Standard Goods 57347 05/1892 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
Standard Goods 57348 11/1891 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/03/1963
01/03/1963
Standard Goods 57349 08/1892 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1961
07/1961
Standard Goods 57350 07/1892 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1961
20/11/1961
Standard Goods 57351 08/1892 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1949
09/1949
Standard Goods 57352 12/1892 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1951
10/1951
Standard Goods 57353 10/1894 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1961
20/11/1961
Standard Goods 57354 10/1894 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
Standard Goods 57355 11/1894 30C
67F
W
Ardrossan
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1962
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57356 11/1894 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1961
06/1961
Standard Goods 57357 08/1892 30C
67B
67D
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
21/03/1953
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
Standard Goods 57358 12/1892 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
Standard Goods 57359 12/1892 30A
67B
67A
67B
W
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
09/08/1952
26/08/1961
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
Standard Goods 57360 12/1892 27A
66B
W
Polmadie
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1962
14/03/1963
14/03/1963
Standard Goods 57361 12/1892 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
Standard Goods 57362 01/1893 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
Standard Goods 57363 01/1893 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1961
04/12/1961
Standard Goods 57364 01/1893 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1961
04/12/1961
Standard Goods 57365 01/1893 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
Standard Goods 57366 01/1893 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57367 06/1893 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1961
11/12/1961
Standard Goods 57368 06/1893 29D
63D
63C
63A
W
Forfar
Oban
Forfar
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1955
22/12/1956
11/05/1957
12/1961
12/1961
Standard Goods 57369 06/1893 27B
66A
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57370 07/1893 27A
66C
66B
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1958
26/09/1959
26/03/1962
26/03/1962
Standard Goods 57371 07/1893 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1948
24/07/1948
Standard Goods 57372 07/1893 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1952
01/1952
Standard Goods 57373 02/1894 31D
65B
W
Grangemouth
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
07/1961
07/1961
Standard Goods 57374 02/1894 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
Standard Goods 57375 02/1894 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1963
11/1963
Standard Goods 57376 02/1894
Standard Goods 57377 05/1894 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57378 05/1894 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1962
24/09/1962
Standard Goods 57379 06/1894 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1951
02/1951
Standard Goods 57380 07/1894 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
Standard Goods 57381 07/1894 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1949
09/1949
Standard Goods 57382 08/1894 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1962
07/1962
Standard Goods 57383 11/1894 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/07/1962
30/07/1962
Standard Goods 57384 11/1894 27C
66B
W
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
21/01/1963
21/01/1963
Standard Goods 57385 09/1894 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
Standard Goods 57386 10/1894 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
Standard Goods 57387 06/1895 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1952
11/1952
Standard Goods 57388 06/1895 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57389 06/1895 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
Standard Goods 57390 07/1895 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1950
05/1950
Standard Goods 57391 07/1895 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1950
10/1950
Standard Goods 57392 07/1895 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1961
04/12/1961
Standard Goods 57393 06/1895 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
Standard Goods 57394 06/1895 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1951
11/1951
Standard Goods 57395 06/1895 27C
68B
W
Hamilton (West)
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
03/1953
03/1953
Standard Goods 57396 07/1895 31C
63B
W
Oban
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
05/1958
05/1958
Standard Goods 57397 07/1896 29A
68B
W
Perth South
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57398 07/1896 27C
66B
W
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
Standard Goods 57399 08/1896 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1949
09/1949
Standard Goods 57400 08/1896 W Withdrawn 06/1949 06/1949
Standard Goods 57401 08/1896 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
Standard Goods 57402 08/1896 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
Standard Goods 57403 09/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
Standard Goods 57404 09/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57405 09/1896 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1958
09/1958
Standard Goods 57406 09/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1948
12/1948
Standard Goods 57407 09/1896 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1959
05/1959
Standard Goods 57408 10/1896 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/02/1948
07/02/1948
Standard Goods 57409 10/1896 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1950
01/1950
Standard Goods 57410 10/1896 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57411 10/1896 31C
W
Oban
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57412 10/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1956
03/1956
Standard Goods 57413 11/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1958
10/1958
Standard Goods 57414 11/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1959
04/1959
Standard Goods 57415 11/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
Standard Goods 57416 11/1896 28A
66D
W
Motherwell
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1957
07/1961
07/1961
Standard Goods 57417 02/1897 28A
66A
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1957
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57418 03/1897 28A
66A
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1957
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57419 03/1897 28A
66A
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1957
05/1959
05/1959
Standard Goods 57420 03/1897 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
Standard Goods 57421 03/1897 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1948
02/10/1948
Standard Goods 57422 03/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/06/1948
05/06/1948
Standard Goods 57423 03/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1953
03/1953
Standard Goods 57424 04/1897 31B
63E
63C
63A
W
Stirling
Oban
Forfar
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
01/10/1955
22/11/1958
12/1959
12/1959
Standard Goods 57425 04/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1950
11/1950
Standard Goods 57426 04/1897 31E
65B
W
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57427 04/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
Standard Goods 57429 09/1897 31E
65F
W
Dawsholm
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1960
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57430 09/1897 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1957
09/1957
Standard Goods 57431 10/1897 27C
66B
W
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1959
06/1961
06/1961
Standard Goods 57432 10/1897 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57433 05/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1952
05/1952
Standard Goods 57434 05/1896 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1961
05/1961
Standard Goods 57435 05/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1960
02/1960
Standard Goods 57436 06/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57437 06/1896 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1958
08/1958
Standard Goods 57438 06/1896 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1953
05/1953
Standard Goods 57439 06/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57440 06/1896 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1950
05/1950
Standard Goods 57441 06/1896 29D
63B
63C
W
Forfar
Stirling
Forfar
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
05/07/1958
29/11/1961
29/11/1961
Standard Goods 57442 06/1896 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1948
24/07/1948
Standard Goods 57443 07/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1958
08/1958
Standard Goods 57444 07/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
Standard Goods 57445 11/1896 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1962
06/08/1962
Standard Goods 57446 12/1896 27A
66C
66B
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1958
26/09/1959
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57447 12/1896 27A
66C
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1958
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
Standard Goods 57448 12/1896 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1960
02/1960
Standard Goods 57449 12/1896 29A
W
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
Standard Goods 57450 12/1896 29C
63B
W
Dundee West
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57451 12/1896 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57452 08/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
07/1949
Standard Goods 57453 08/1897 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1950
10/1950
Standard Goods 57454 09/1897 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1953
03/1953
Standard Goods 57455 09/1897 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1951
06/1951
Standard Goods 57456 09/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1956
01/1956
Standard Goods 57457 10/1897 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1956
02/1956
Standard Goods 57458 10/1897 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1952
11/1952
Standard Goods 57459 11/1897 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1956
12/1956
Standard Goods 57460 11/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1957
01/1957
Standard Goods 57461 11/1897 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57462 11/1897 28A
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1959
06/1959
Standard Goods 57463 11/1897 27B
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1961
11/12/1961
Standard Goods 57464 04/1897 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1953
02/1953
Standard Goods 57465 05/1897 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1959
04/1959
Standard Goods 57466 05/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
Standard Goods 57467 05/1897 27A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
Standard Goods 57468 08/1897 31B
W
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1952
02/1952
Standard Goods 57469 02/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1948
20/11/1948
Standard Goods 57470 02/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
Standard Goods 57471 02/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1948
11/09/1948
Standard Goods 57472 02/1897 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
Standard Goods 57473 02/1897 29A
W
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1961
06/1961