Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 175 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7182 Week
» 13316 Month
» 241200 Year
» 1462765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "8F" Class 2-8-0


LMS WD LNER (1924) LNER (1946) LNER (1947) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
8000 48000 06/1935 18/03/1967 Stockport Edgeley 31.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 32.27
8001 48001 06/1935 09/01/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 29.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 30.36
8002 48002 07/1935 24/09/1966 Lostock Hall 31.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 31.61
8003 48003 06/1935 05/03/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 30.75 31.02
8004 48004 06/1935 06/11/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 30.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 30.61
8005 48005 06/1935 19/03/1966 Heaton Mersey 30.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 31.02
8006 48006 09/1935 30/01/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 29.33 29.68
8007 48007 09/1935 09/01/1965 Bescot 29.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 29.68
8008 48008 10/1935 02/05/1964 Westhouses 28.58 28.77
8009 48009 10/1935 22/12/1962 27.17 27.68
8010 48010 10/1935 20/01/1968 Newton Heath 32.25 32.61
8011 48011 10/1935 27/05/1967 Patricroft 31.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 32.11
70577 48012 12/1936 30/03/1968 Edge Hill 31.25 31.60
70591 48016 01/1937 27/11/1965 Saltley 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 29.10
8017 48017 01/1937 04/11/1967 Edge Hill 30.83 31.52
70582 48018 02/1937 21/10/1967 Crewe South 30.67 31.02
70579 48020 02/1937 07/08/1965 Northampton 28.5 29.02
8024 48024 03/1937 11/11/1967 Speke Junction 30.67 31.02
8026 48026 04/1937 22/06/1968 Bolton 31.17 31.44
8027 48027 07/1936 20/03/1965 Woodford Halse 28.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 29.27
8029 48029 08/1936 27/07/1963 Speke Junction 26.92 31.02
8033 48033 08/1936 29/06/1968 Patricroft 31.83 32.36
8035 48035 08/1936 11/03/1967 Tyseley 30.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 31.10
8036 48036 08/1936 09/03/1968 Northwich 31.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1968 31.94
8037 48037 09/1936 25/12/1965 Toton 29.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 29.60
70588 48039 09/1936 24/07/1965 Lostock Hall 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 29.27
70573 48045 09/1936 04/05/1968 Edge Hill 31.67 31.94
70599 48046 09/1936 13/01/1968 Bolton 31.33 31.60
8050 48050 10/1936 19/03/1966 Aintree 29.42 29.77
8053 48053 10/1936 18/03/1967 Rose Grove 30.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1968 31.44
8054 48054 10/1936 09/09/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 30.92 31.44
8055 48055 10/1936 04/11/1967 Royston 31.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 31.52
8056 48056 10/1936 04/05/1968 Edge Hill 31.58 31.85
8057 48057 10/1936 13/05/1967 Northwich 30.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 31.10
8060 48060 10/1936 20/04/1968 Speke Junction 31.5 31.85
70614 48061 11/1936 23/09/1967 Rose Grove 30.83 31.94
8062 48062 11/1936 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 31.75 32.10
8063 48063 11/1936 09/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 31.33 31.68
8064 48064 11/1936 21/05/1966 Burton 29.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1966 29.77
8065 48065 11/1936 12/02/1966 Leicester Midland 29.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 29.52
8067 48067 11/1936 18/10/1967 Royston 30.92 31.27
8069 48069 11/1936 07/11/1964 Kirkby in Ashfield 28 28.02
8070 48070 11/1936 04/11/1967 Royston 31 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 31.44
8073 48073 12/1936 08/04/1967 Chester (MR) 30.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 30.77
8074 48074 12/1936 25/11/1967 Heaton Mersey 30.92 31.35
8075 48075 12/1936 24/04/1967 Royston 30.33 30.77
8076 48076 12/1936 Toton 04/11/1967 Royston 30.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 31.35
70611 48077 12/1936 09/03/1968 Lostock Hall 31.25 31.52
8078 48078 12/1936 Toton 28/08/1965 Edge Hill 28.67 29.02
8079 48079 12/1936 Toton 31/12/1966 Rose Grove 30 30.52
8080 48080 12/1936 Toton 11/1966 Farnley Junction 29.92 30.10
8081 48081 01/1937 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 23/03/1968 Rose Grove 31.17 31.44
8082 48082 01/1937 15/04/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30.25 30.85
8083 48083 01/1937 Westhouses 12/11/1966 Colwick 29.83 30.35
8084 48084 01/1937 04/11/1967 Royston 30.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 31.27
8085 48085 01/1937 12/08/1967 Northwich 30.58 30.85
8088 48088 01/1937 17/12/1966 Buxton (LNWR) 29.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 30.27
8089 48089 01/1937 19/02/1966 Heaton Mersey 29.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 29.43
8090 48090 01/1937 06/04/1968 Bolton 31.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 31.52
8092 48092 02/1937 30/04/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 29.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 29.85
8093 48093 02/1937 04/11/1967 Royston 30.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 31.18
70606 48094 02/1937 25/09/1965 Mold Junction 28.58 28.85
8095 48095 02/1937 20/02/1965 Saltley 28 28.43
8096 48096 12/1938 11/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 26.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 27.10
8097 48097 12/1938 24/07/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 26.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 26.94
8098 48098 01/1939 11/03/1967 Speke Junction 28.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 28.68
8099 48099 01/1939 24/07/1965 Fleetwood 26.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 26.93
8100 48100 01/1939 30/09/1967 Northwich 28.67 29.52
8101 48101 01/1939 09/1966 Saltley 27.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 27.77
8102 48102 01/1939 21/08/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 26.58 27.10
8103 48103 02/1939 08/10/1966 Derby 27.67 28.02
8104 48104 02/1939 17/07/1967 Holbeck (MR) 28.42 28.77
8105 48105 02/1939 11/03/1967 Oxley 28.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1967 28.43
8106 48106 02/1939 24/06/1967 Bolton 28.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 28.77
8107 48107 02/1939 06/04/1968 Heaton Mersey 29.17 29.43
8108 48108 02/1939 02/09/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 28.58 29.02
8109 48109 02/1939 22/01/1966 Saltley 26.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 27.35
8110 48110 02/1939 01/07/1967 Stoke 28.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 28.68
8111 48111 03/1939 16/03/1968 Bolton 29 29.36
8112 48112 03/1939 13/11/1965 Westhouses 26.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 27.27
8113 48113 03/1939 02/10/1967 Royston 28.58 28.94
8114 48114 03/1939 Northampton 01/04/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 28.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 28.52
8115 48115 04/1939 Warwick 06/07/1968 Rose Grove 29.25 29.52
8116 48116 04/1939 Crewe South 19/06/1965 Toton 26.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 26.69
8117 48117 04/1939 23/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 28.92 29.36
8118 48118 04/1939 11/06/1966 Northwich 27.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 27.44
8119 48119 05/1939 02/12/1967 Edge Hill 28.58 28.94
8120 48120 05/1939 15/01/1966 Mold Junction 26.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 27.36
8121 48121 05/1939 22/04/1967 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 27.92 28.61
8122 48122 05/1939 18/02/1967 Croes Newydd 27.75 28.27
8123 48123 06/1939 12/03/1967 Royston 27.75 28.19
8124 48124 06/1939 04/05/1968 Edge Hill 28.92 29.36
8125 48125 06/1939 28/10/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 28.33 29.19
8126 48126 01/1941 24/04/1967 Royston 26.25 26.68
8127 48127 01/1941 08/10/1966 Westhouses 25.75 26.02
8128 48128 01/1941 27/05/1967 Stoke 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 26.76
8129 48129 01/1941 19/03/1966 Edge Hill 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 25.43
8130 48130 02/1941 05/02/1967 Royston 26 26.35
8131 48131 03/1941 27/05/1967 Stoke 26.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 26.60
8132 48132 03/1941 22/06/1968 Newton Heath 27.25 27.69
8133 48133 04/1941 03/12/1966 Saltley 25.67 26.27
8134 48134 04/1941 08/01/1966 Croes Newydd 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 25.02
8135 48135 05/1941 11/09/1965 Northwich 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 24.60
8136 48136 08/1941 11/03/1967 Newton Heath 25.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1967 25.93
8137 48137 09/1941 08/10/1966 Westhouses 25.08 25.35
8138 48138 09/1941 25/10/1965 Mirfield 24.08 24.51
8139 48139 12/1941 19/11/1966 Aintree 24.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 25.35
8140 48140 01/1942 19/04/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 22.25 22.35
8141 48141 01/1942 06/05/1967 Rose Grove 25.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 25.68
8142 48142 02/1942 26/11/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 24.75 25.26
8143 48143 03/1942 12/11/1966 Colwick 24.67 25.18
8144 48144 04/1942 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.75 22.10
8145 48145 04/1942 29/05/1965 Westhouses 23.08 23.44
8146 48146 07/1942 06/01/1967 Royston 24.5 24.93
8147 48147 07/1942 30/07/1966 Croes Newydd 24 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 24.35
8148 48148 07/1942 03/07/1965 Lancaster Green Ayre 23 23.35
8149 48149 08/1942 14/01/1967 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 24.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 25.44
8150 48150 08/1942 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.42 22.27
8151 48151 09/1942 13/01/1968 Northwich 25.33 Prs Preserved
8152 48152 09/1942 25/03/1967 Saltley 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 25.02
8153 48153 09/1942 16/03/1968 Speke Junction 25.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1968 26.02
8154 48154 10/1942 22/07/1967 Rose Grove 24.75 25.18
8155 48155 10/1942 17/09/1966 Northwich 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 24.35
8156 48156 11/1942 28/08/1965 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.75 23.27
8157 48157 12/1942 09/05/1967 Holbeck (MR) 24.42 24.93
8158 48158 01/1943 09/09/1967 Holbeck (MR) 24.67 25.18
8159 48159 01/1943 27/03/1967 Royston 24.17 24.68
8160 48160 02/1943 31/07/1967 Royston 24.42 25.02
8161 48161 02/1943 09/09/1967 Heaton Mersey 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1968 25.10
8162 48162 02/1943 24/06/1967 Royston 24.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 24.76
8163 48163 03/1943 17/06/1967 Speke Junction 24.25 24.69
8164 48164 03/1943 21/10/1967 Lostock Hall 24.58 24.94
8165 48165 03/1943 18/03/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 24.52
8166 48166 04/1943 14/10/1967 Bolton 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1968 25.02
8167 48167 04/1943 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 25.33 25.69
8168 48168 04/1943 29/06/1968 Bolton 25.17 25.44
8169 48169 04/1943 04/11/1967 Royston 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 25.10
8170 48170 05/1943 29/06/1968 Patricroft 25.08 25.61
8171 48171 05/1943 23/09/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 24.33 25.10
8172 48172 06/1943 14/05/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 20.92 21.18
8173 48173 06/1943 31/07/1965 Mold Junction 22.08 Prs Preserved
8174 48174 07/1943 29/04/1967 Newton Heath 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 24.35
8175 48175 08/1943 19/02/1966 Mold Junction 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 22.85
8176 48176 03/1942 05/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 25.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 25.69
8177 48177 03/1942 11/03/1967 Oxley 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1967 25.35
8178 48178 03/1942 12/11/1966 Edge Hill 24.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 25.27
8179 48179 03/1942 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.83 22.69
8180 48180 03/1942 11/03/1967 Oxley 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1967 25.35
8181 48181 04/1942 19/02/1966 Patricroft 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 24.18
8182 48182 04/1942 04/05/1968 Stockport Edgeley 26.08 26.52
8183 48183 04/1942 31/07/1965 Leicester Midland 23.25 23.60
8184 48184 04/1942 17/07/1965 Westhouses 23.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 23.60
8185 48185 04/1942 11/02/1967 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 24.83 25.35
8186 48186 04/1942 08/10/1966 Crewe South 24.5 24.77
8187 48187 04/1942 07/01/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1967 25.10
8188 48188 04/1942 14/05/1966 Edge Hill 24.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 24.35
8189 48189 05/1942 24/07/1965 Speke Junction 23.17 23.85
8190 48190 05/1942 23/12/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 25.58 25.85
8191 48191 05/1942 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 26.25 26.61
8192 48192 05/1942 30/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 25.83 26.27
8193 48193 05/1942 06/01/1968 Heaton Mersey 25.67 26.02
8194 48194 06/1942 19/08/1967 Crewe South 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1967 25.52
8195 48195 06/1942 16/04/1966 Westhouses 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 24.10
8196 48196 06/1942 08/10/1966 Westhouses 24.33 24.69
8197 48197 06/1942 20/04/1968 Heaton Mersey 25.83 26.19
8198 48198 06/1942 18/09/1965 Derby 23.25 23.52
8199 48199 06/1942 18/02/1967 Heaton Mersey 24.67 25.10
8200 48200 06/1942 13/01/1968 Bolton 25.58 25.85
8201 48201 06/1942 09/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 25.75 26.10
8202 48202 07/1942 24/06/1967 Wakefield 24.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 25.35
8203 48203 07/1942 23/04/1966 Speke Junction 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 24.02
8204 48204 07/1942 19/08/1967 Westhouses 25.08 25.94
8205 48205 07/1942 23/12/1967 Heaton Mersey 25.42 25.68
8206 48206 07/1942 04/05/1968 Speke Junction 25.83 26.10
8207 48207 07/1942 15/01/1966 Stoke 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 23.77
8208 48208 08/1942 02/09/1967 Heaton Mersey 25.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 25.44
8209 48209 08/1942 19/04/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.67 21.76
8210 48210 08/1942 19/04/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.67 21.76
8211 48211 08/1942 18/11/1967 Rose Grove 25.25 25.60
8212 48212 08/1942 22/06/1968 Patricroft 25.83 26.19
8213 48213 08/1942 10/09/1966 Patricroft 24.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 24.52
8214 48214 08/1942 25/11/1967 Patricroft 25.25 25.60
8215 48215 08/1942 09/07/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 23.92 24.27
8216 48216 08/1942 19/01/1964 Canklow 21.42 21.76
8217 48217 09/1942 06/02/1965 Nottingham 22.42 23.44
8218 48218 09/1942 30/09/1967 Rose Grove 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1968 25.44
8219 48219 09/1942 24/12/1966 Stockport Edgeley 24.25 24.76
8220 48220 09/1942 02/09/1967 Crewe South 25 25.44
8221 48221 09/1942 04/02/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.42 24.93
8222 48222 09/1942 04/11/1967 Royston 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 25.60
8223 48223 09/1942 12/11/1966 Bolton 24.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 24.76
8224 48224 09/1942 16/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 25.5 26.02
8225 48225 09/1942 29/10/1966 Crewe South 24.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 24.44
70300 48246 05/1940 15/01/1966 Stoke 25.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 25.93
70301 48247 06/1940 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 28.17 28.52
70311 48248 07/1940 01/01/1966 Stoke 25.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 25.77
70314 48249 07/1940 10/12/1966 Edge Hill 26.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1968 28.27
70318 48250 08/1940 16/04/1966 Agecroft 25.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 25.93
70332 48251 09/1940 10/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 26.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 26.44
70363 48252 12/1941 04/05/1968 Heaton Mersey 26.42 26.77
70376 48253 07/1941 03/08/1968 Lostock Hall 27.08 27.52
70378 48254 07/1941 09/1966 Westhouses 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 25.35
70384 48255 08/1941 03/12/1966 Crewe South 25.33 26.02
70394 48256 09/1941 29/04/1967 Stoke 25.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 26.18
70395 48257 08/1941 20/07/1968 Rose Grove 26.92 27.19
70398 48258 10/1941 26/08/1967 Edge Hill 25.83 26.27
70504 48259 10/1941 26/06/1965 Mold Junction 23.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 24.02
70518 48260 11/1941 20/11/1965 Rose Grove 24 24.43
70544 48261 02/1942 19/08/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 25.5 25.85
70576 48262 06/1941 20/11/1965 Rose Grove 24.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 24.69
70584 48263 10/1941 09/1966 Agecroft 24.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 25.35
8264 48264 05/1942 16/07/1966 Agecroft 24.17 24.52
8265 48265 05/1942 08/06/1967 Wakefield 25.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 25.52
8266 48266 05/1942 17/06/1967 Lostock Hall 25.08 25.52
8267 48267 05/1942 25/05/1968 Patricroft 26 26.78
8268 48268 05/1942 28/10/1967 Edge Hill 25.42 26.10
8269 48269 05/1942 08/07/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 25.60
8270 48270 06/1942 17/12/1966 Colwick 24.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1967 25.02
8271 48271 06/1942 12/08/1967 Northwich 25.17 25.93
8272 48272 06/1942 02/03/1968 Northwich 25.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1968 26.10
8273 48273 06/1942 14/08/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 23.17 23.44
8274 48274 06/1942 04/09/1966 Stourton 24.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 24.76
8275 48275 06/1942 24/06/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 25.52
8276 48276 07/1942 04/11/1967 Royston 25.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 25.77
8277 48277 07/1942 16/04/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 24.02
8278 48278 07/1942 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 26.08 26.52
8279 48279 08/1942 14/10/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1968 25.60
8280 48280 08/1942 07/05/1966 Edge Hill 23.75 24.10
8281 48281 08/1942 06/09/1967 Royston 25.08 25.44
8282 48282 08/1942 08/06/1968 Patricroft 25.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1969 26.44
8283 48283 08/1942 09/09/1967 Holbeck (MR) 25.08 25.68
8284 48284 08/1942 30/07/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 24.18
8285 48285 09/1942 18/09/1965 Leicester Midland 23 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 23.51
70401 48286 07/1940 03/09/1966 Westhouses 26.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 26.85
70402 48287 07/1940 01/07/1967 Crewe South 27 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 27.85
70403 48288 08/1940 25/02/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 26.5 26.93
70413 48289 10/1940 29/10/1966 Bolton 26 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 26.35
70438 48290 06/1941 14/08/1965 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 24.17 24.69
70440 48291 07/1941 02/07/1966 Stoke 25 25.27
70442 48292 08/1941 20/04/1968 Heaton Mersey 26.67 27.02
8293 48293 10/1940 22/06/1968 Lostock Hall 27.67 28.27
70443 48294 11/1941 03/08/1968 Lostock Hall 26.75 27.27
70446 48295 12/1941 25/09/1965 Bolton 23.75 24.02
70447 48296 12/1941 17/09/1966 Speke Junction 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 25.35
70449 48297 01/1942 24/07/1965 Lancaster Green Ayre 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 23.93
8301 48301 09/1943 11/03/1967 Aintree 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 24.02
8302 48302 10/1943 15/01/1966 Lostock Hall 22.25 22.52
8303 48303 10/1943 30/07/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 23.02
8304 48304 10/1943 02/03/1968 Northwich 24.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1968 24.77
8305 48305 11/1943 13/01/1968 Speke Junction 24.17 Prs Preserved
8306 48306 11/1943 04/07/1964 Toton 20.67 20.93
8307 48307 11/1943 02/03/1968 Patricroft 24.33 24.52
8308 48308 11/1943 13/04/1968 Speke Junction 24.42 24.77
8309 48309 11/1943 12/03/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 22.33 22.68
8310 48310 12/1943 30/12/1967 Rose Grove 24 24.43
8311 48311 12/1943 04/09/1966 Stourton 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.19
8312 48312 12/1943 13/02/1965 Birkenhead Mollington Street 21.17 21.43
8313 48313 12/1943 16/09/1967 Bolton 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1968 24.68
8314 48314 12/1943 04/12/1965 Burton 22 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 22.19
8315 48315 12/1943 05/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 24.02
8316 48316 12/1943 08/04/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 23.93
8317 48317 01/1944 16/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.17 24.60
8318 48318 01/1944 10/1966 Newton Heath 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.10
8319 48319 01/1944 29/06/1968 Bolton 24.42 24.77
8320 48320 02/1944 18/03/1967 Lostock Hall 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 23.68
8321 48321 02/1944 22/06/1968 Newton Heath 24.33 24.77
8322 48322 02/1944 04/05/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.25 24.60
8323 48323 02/1944 29/06/1968 Rose Grove 24.33 24.85
8324 48324 02/1944 17/06/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 23.76
8325 48325 03/1944 04/05/1968 Patricroft 24.17 24.60
8326 48326 03/1944 16/07/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 22.33 22.68
8327 48327 03/1944 08/06/1968 Patricroft 24.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1969 24.85
8328 48328 04/1944 02/10/1965 Lostock Hall 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 21.77
8329 48329 04/1944 04/05/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.08 24.44
8330 48330 05/1944 02/10/1965 Stourbridge Junction 21.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 21.77
8331 48331 09/1943 26/02/1966 Newton Heath 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 23.02
8332 48332 10/1943 28/10/1967 Heaton Mersey 24 24.60
8333 48333 11/1943 26/06/1965 Bolton 21.58 22.10
8334 48334 11/1943 27/01/1968 Northwich 24.17 24.52
8335 48335 11/1943 30/03/1968 Lostock Hall 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 24.68
8336 48336 12/1943 09/12/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 24 24.43
8337 48337 12/1943 09/09/1967 Royston 23.75 24.19
8338 48338 01/1944 08/06/1968 Patricroft 24.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1968 24.85
8339 48339 01/1944 08/10/1966 Croes Newydd 22.75 23.02
8340 48340 01/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.58 24.93
8341 48341 02/1944 19/04/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.17 20.60
8342 48342 02/1944 09/1966 Colwick 22.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 22.85
8343 48343 02/1944 18/02/1967 Stoke 23 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 23.26
8344 48344 03/1944 30/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 24 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 24.35
8345 48345 03/1944 02/03/1968 Trafford Park (LMS) 24 24.35
8346 48346 03/1944 16/07/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.33 22.68
8347 48347 03/1944 29/07/1967 Northwich 23.33 24.02
8348 48348 04/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.33 24.77
8349 48349 04/1944 15/10/1966 Stoke 22.5 22.85
8350 48350 04/1944 16/09/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 23.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1968 24.35
8351 48351 05/1944 20/01/1968 Trafford Park (LMS) 23.67 24.10
8352 48352 05/1944 04/11/1967 Royston 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 23.93
8353 48353 06/1944 10/09/1966 Stoke 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 22.60
8354 48354 06/1944 19/11/1966 Stoke 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 22.93
8355 48355 06/1944 04/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 21.25 21.52
8356 48356 06/1944 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 24 24.52
8357 48357 06/1944 04/09/1966 Wakefield 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 22.52
8358 48358 07/1944 04/09/1966 Wakefield 22.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 22.43
8359 48359 07/1944 16/09/1967 Patricroft 23.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1968 23.60
8360 48360 07/1944 03/07/1965 Bletchley 21 21.52
8361 48361 08/1944 08/10/1966 Westhouses 22.17 22.59
8362 48362 08/1944 23/12/1967 Edge Hill 23.33 23.60
8363 48363 08/1944 18/11/1967 Northwich 23.25 23.93
8364 48364 08/1944 16/09/1967 Crewe South 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 23.43
8365 48365 09/1944 04/05/1968 Heaton Mersey 23.67
8366 48366 09/1944 11/1965 Bescot 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 21.35
8367 48367 09/1944 09/1966 Burton 22 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 22.18
8368 48368 09/1944 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 23.75 24.27
8369 48369 10/1944 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 23.67 24.27
8370 48370 10/1944 26/11/1966 Colwick 22.08 22.59
8371 48371 10/1944 14/10/1967 Edge Hill 23 23.68
8372 48372 10/1944 17/12/1966 Newton Heath 22.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 22.51
8373 48373 11/1944 22/06/1968 Newton Heath 23.58 24.10
8374 48374 11/1944 15/06/1968 Patricroft 23.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1969 24.18
8375 48375 11/1944 16/09/1967 Rose Grove 22.83 23.43
8376 48376 11/1944 22/07/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 22.67 23.10
8377 48377 12/1944 21/10/1967 Heaton Mersey 22.83 23.10
8378 48378 12/1944 07/08/1965 Annesley 20.67 21.18
8379 48379 12/1944 18/03/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 22.76
8380 48380 12/1944 25/05/1968 Bolton 23.42 23.77
8381 48381 12/1944 25/11/1967 Patricroft 22.92 23.26
8382 48382 01/1945 28/10/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 22.75 23.10
8383 48383 01/1945 15/01/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 21 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 23.26
8384 48384 01/1945 25/05/1968 Rose Grove 23.33 23.93
8385 48385 02/1945 03/12/1966 Croes Newydd 21.83 22.34
8386 48386 02/1945 26/08/1967 Rose Grove 22.5 23.76
8387 48387 03/1945 23/01/1965 Woodford Halse 19.83 20.35
8388 48388 03/1945 15/10/1966 Colwick 21.58 22.18
8389 48389 03/1945 21/08/1965 Buxton (LNWR) 20.42 20.85
8390 48390 03/1945 11/05/1968 Patricroft 23.17 23.44
8391 48391 04/1945 18/12/1965 Newton Heath 20.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 20.93
8392 48392 04/1945 22/06/1968 Bolton 23.17 23.44
8393 48393 04/1945 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 23.33 23.68
8394 48394 05/1945 24/06/1967 Royston 22.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 22.52
8395 48395 05/1945 09/09/1967 Edge Hill 22.33 22.85
8396 48396 05/1945 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 18.67 19.01
8397 48397 06/1945 08/10/1966 Agecroft 21.33 21.68
8398 48398 06/1945 02/04/1966 Northwich 20.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 21.10
8399 48399 06/1945 09/09/1967 Holbeck (MR) 22.25 22.76
8400 48400 31/05/1943 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 25.25 25.56
8401 48401 03/07/1943 04/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 22.17 22.55
8402 48402 02/07/1943 23/12/1967 Heaton Mersey 24.42 24.72
8403 48403 12/07/1943 31/07/1965 Heaton Mersey 22 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 22.28
8404 48404 23/07/1943 09/1966 Shrewsbury 23.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.58
8405 48405 08/08/1943 23/07/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 23.20
8406 48406 14/08/1943 04/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 22.08 22.35
8407 48407 23/08/1943 12/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.33 21.25
8408 48408 02/09/1943 11/11/1967 Speke Junction 24.17 24.80
8409 48409 08/09/1943 12/04/1965 Bath Green Park (S&D) 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1965 21.87
8410 48410 22/09/1943 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.92 25.33
8411 48411 28/09/1943 08/07/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 24.15
8412 48412 05/10/1943 31/12/1966 Speke Junction 23.17 23.71
8413 48413 12/10/1943 11/1965 Fleetwood 22.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 22.28
8414 48414 15/10/1943 08/10/1966 Colwick 23 23.35
8415 48415 22/10/1943 13/08/1966 Oxley 22.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 23.16
8416 48416 01/11/1943 26/06/1965 Crewe South 21.58 22.14
8417 48417 06/11/1943 29/04/1967 Bolton 23.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 24.04
8418 48418 10/11/1943 09/1966 Shrewsbury 22.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.28
8419 48419 17/11/1943 08/05/1965 Lostock Hall 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 22.01
8420 48420 26/11/1943 13/04/1964 Llanelly 20.42 20.73
8421 48421 06/12/1943 10/02/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 24.62
8422 48422 10/12/1943 26/03/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 22.53
8423 48423 18/12/1943 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.67 25.01
8424 48424 22/12/1943 24/02/1968 Buxton (LNWR) 24.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1968 24.50
8425 48425 31/12/1943 04/11/1967 Bolton 23.92 24.64
8426 48426 31/12/1943 11/06/1966 Newton Heath 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 22.72
8427 48427 13/01/1944 07/08/1965 Mold Junction 21.58 21.85
8428 48428 17/01/1944 09/1966 Stockport Edgeley 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 23.17
8429 48429 27/01/1944 11/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 21.67 21.90
8430 48430 07/03/1944 24/04/1965 Saltley 21.08 21.45
8431 48431 11/03/1944 06/05/1964 Bath Green Park (S&D) 20.17 Prs Preserved
8432 48432 17/03/1944 08/10/1966 Westhouses 22.58 22.93
8433 48433 24/03/1944 06/04/1968 Edge Hill 24.08 24.41
8434 48434 31/03/1944 01/01/1966 Lostock Hall 21.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 22.05
8435 48435 17/04/1944 06/05/1967 Rose Grove 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 23.43
8436 48436 28/04/1944 23/12/1967 Bolton 23.67 23.90
8437 48437 03/05/1944 30/03/1968 Stockport Edgeley 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 24.22
8438 48438 08/05/1944 18/11/1967 Lostock Hall 23.5 24.12
8439 48439 17/05/1944 04/11/1967 Royston 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 23.93
8440 48440 05/06/1944 18/02/1967 Croes Newydd 22.67 23.21
8441 48441 06/06/1944 06/04/1968 Rose Grove 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 24.12
8442 48442 13/06/1944 02/03/1968 Buxton (LNWR) 23.75 23.94
8443 48443 15/06/1944 11/1966 Royston 22.42 22.76
8444 48444 20/06/1944 14/02/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 21.83
8445 48445 01/07/1944 04/05/1968 Lostock Hall 23.83 24.22
8446 48446 01/07/1944 24/07/1965 Rose Grove 21 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 21.39
8447 48447 14/07/1944 29/01/1966 Stockport Edgeley 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 21.85
8448 48448 20/07/1944 27/07/1968 Rose Grove 24 24.25
8449 48449 01/08/1944 20/05/1967 Crewe South 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 23.14
8450 48450 28/08/1944 30/09/1967 Edge Hill 23.08 24.07
8451 48451 05/09/1944 04/05/1968 Rose Grove 23.67 24.04
8452 48452 09/09/1944 29/01/1966 Stoke 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 21.61
8453 48453 19/09/1944 13/04/1968 Patricroft 23.58 23.84
8454 48454 29/09/1944 05/07/1967 Royston 22.83 23.39
8455 48455 14/10/1944 28/11/1964 Mold Junction 20.08 20.18
8456 48456 20/10/1944 02/09/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 22.92 23.34
8457 48457 23/10/1944 09/1966 Speke Junction 21.92 22.33
8458 48458 04/11/1944 08/04/1967 Chester (MR) 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 22.96
8459 48459 18/11/1944 01/04/1967 Patricroft 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 22.92
8460 48460 13/12/1944 16/09/1967 Crewe South 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1968 23.19
8461 48461 16/12/1944 04/01/1965 Llanelly 20.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1965 20.42
8462 48462 22/12/1944 19/11/1966 Northwich 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 22.33
8463 48463 02/01/1945 29/06/1964 Bath Green Park (S&D) 19.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 19.96
8464 48464 13/01/1945 26/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 22.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 23.52
8465 48465 15/02/1945 16/03/1968 Bolton 23.08 23.43
8466 48466 24/02/1945 08/05/1967 Royston 22.25 22.74
8467 48467 05/03/1945 15/06/1968 Patricroft 23.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1969 23.88
8468 48468 16/03/1945 02/03/1968 Rose Grove 23 23.27
8469 48469 24/03/1945 16/12/1967 Bolton 22.75 22.99
8470 48470 24/04/1945 25/11/1967 Patricroft 22.58 22.91
8471 48471 28/04/1945 27/04/1968 Heaton Mersey 23 23.40
8472 48472 07/05/1945 21/05/1966 Buxton (LNWR) 21 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 21.29
8473 48473 18/05/1945 04/11/1967 Royston 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 23.01
8474 48474 30/05/1945 16/09/1967 Crewe South 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 22.64
8475 48475 08/06/1945 29/10/1966 Oxley 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 21.87
8476 48476 15/06/1945 10/08/1968 Lostock Hall 23.17 23.52
8477 48477 23/06/1945 10/09/1966 Tyseley 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 21.58
8478 48478 30/06/1945 26/06/1965 Bescot 20 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 20.31
8479 48479 21/07/1945 12/02/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 20.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 20.83
8490 48490 06/1945 11/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 20.25 20.52
8491 48491 07/1945 29/06/1968 Patricroft 22.92 23.44
8492 48492 07/1945 10/02/1968 Lostock Hall 22.58 22.85
8493 48493 08/1945 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 23 23.68
8494 48494 08/1945 01/04/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 22.10
8495 48495 08/1945 21/10/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 22.17 22.68
8500 48500 02/1944 18/12/1965 Aintree 21.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 22.09
8501 48501 06/1944 15/07/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 23.43
8502 48502 08/1944 26/11/1966 Patricroft 22.25 23.01
8503 48503 09/1944 02/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 23.5 23.85
8504 48504 09/1944 22/06/1968 Bolton 23.75 24.10
8505 48505 09/1944 21/10/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.08 23.68
8506 48506 10/1944 30/09/1967 Rose Grove 22.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1968 23.35
8507 48507 10/1944 09/03/1968 Heaton Mersey 23.42 23.76
8508 48508 10/1944 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 19.25 19.59
8509 48509 11/1944 13/05/1967 Speke Junction 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 23.35
8510 48510 06/1943 20/01/1968 Lostock Hall 24.58 25.35
8511 48511 03/1944 25/06/1966 Bolton 22.25 22.60
8512 48512 04/1944 24/09/1966 Edge Hill 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 22.85
8513 48513 04/1944 18/03/1967 Edge Hill 22.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 23.43
8514 48514 05/1944 29/10/1966 Stoke 22.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1967 23.01
8515 48515 06/1944 08/01/1966 Heaton Mersey 21.58 21.85
8516 48516 07/1944 24/12/1966 Stoke 22.42 23.10
8517 48517 07/1944 02/12/1967 Lostock Hall 23.42 23.60
8518 48518 08/1944 24/07/1965 Willesden 20.92 Prs Preserved
8519 48519 09/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 23.92 24.35
8520 48520 10/1944 09/1966 Speke Junction 21.92 22.35
8521 48521 10/1944 07/05/1966 Agecroft 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 21.85
8522 48522 11/1944 19/08/1967 Crewe South 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1968 23.27
8523 48523 11/1944 19/02/1966 Bolton 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 21.59
8524 48524 12/1944 13/04/1964 Llanelly 19.33 19.68
8525 48525 12/1944 01/10/1965 Bath Green Park (S&D) 20.83 21.35
8526 48526 12/1944 09/1966 Stoke 21.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 22.01
8527 48527 12/1944 29/10/1966 Stoke 21.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1967 22.43
8528 48528 02/1945 05/08/1967 Edge Hill 22.5 22.84
8529 48529 04/1945 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 23.17 23.60
8530 48530 04/1945 19/03/1966 Leicester Midland 20.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 21.18
8531 48531 04/1945 16/09/1967 Crewe South 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 22.77
8532 48532 04/1945 16/03/1968 Bolton 22.92 23.27
8533 48533 05/1945 18/05/1968 Newton Heath 23 23.27
8534 48534 05/1945 21/10/1967 Bolton 22.42 22.93
8535 48535 06/1945 12/08/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 22.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 22.52
8536 48536 06/1945 21/01/1967 Edge Hill 21.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1967 22.01
8537 48537 07/1945 30/10/1967 Royston 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 22.85
8538 48538 08/1945 11/03/1967 Saltley 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 22.01
8539 48539 08/1945 08/01/1966 Agecroft 20.42 20.85
8540 48540 12/1944 04/11/1967 Royston 22.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 23.43
8541 48541 12/1944 18/06/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 21.76
8542 48542 12/1944 24/06/1967 Holbeck (MR) 22.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1968 23.18
8543 48543 01/1945 12/02/1966 Newton Heath 21.08 21.34
8544 48544 01/1945 02/03/1968 Rose Grove 23.17 23.35
8545 48545 02/1945 18/02/1967 Northwich 22 22.51
8546 48546 02/1945 06/07/1968 Lostock Hall 23.42 23.76
8547 48547 03/1945 18/03/1967 Bolton 22 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 22.52
8548 48548 03/1945 15/04/1967 Crewe South 22.08 22.77
8549 48549 03/1945 25/05/1968 Patricroft 23.17 23.94
8550 48550 04/1945 30/09/1967 Rose Grove 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1968 22.85
8551 48551 04/1945 04/05/1968 Heaton Mersey 23.08 23.44
8552 48552 05/1945 29/04/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 22.52
8553 48553 05/1945 16/03/1968 Patricroft 22.83 23.18
8554 48554 06/1945 06/08/1966 Crewe South 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 21.43
8555 48555 06/1945 29/01/1966 Stoke 20.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 20.85
8556 48556 07/1945 19/08/1967 Rose Grove 22.08 23.35
8557 48557 07/1945 08/07/1967 Newton Heath 22 22.35
8558 48558 08/1945 09/10/1965 Rose Grove 20.17 20.59
8559 48559 08/1945 06/01/1968 Bolton 22.42 22.68
8600 48600 02/1943 26/11/1966 Aintree 23.75 24.26
8601 48601 02/1943 19/06/1965 Willesden 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 22.68
8602 48602 04/1943 08/07/1967 Newton Heath 24.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 24.68
8603 48603 05/1943 10/06/1967 Chester (MR) 24.08 24.60
8604 48604 06/1943 29/04/1967 Edge Hill 23.83 24.44
8605 48605 07/1943 06/08/1966 Aintree 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 23.35
8606 48606 09/1943 09/1966 Westhouses 23 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 23.18
8607 48607 09/1943 28/08/1965 Leicester Midland 21.92 22.18
8608 48608 10/1943 13/02/1966 Mirfield 22.33 22.60
8609 48609 10/1943 13/01/1968 Patricroft 24.25 24.52
8610 48610 04/1943 07/08/1965 Nuneaton 22.33 22.44
8611 48611 05/1943 05/12/1964 Birkenhead Mollington Street 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 22.44
8612 48612 07/1943 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 24.92 25.36
8613 48613 07/1943 29/07/1967 Heaton Mersey 24 24.44
8614 48614 08/1943 27/04/1968 Edge Hill 24.67 25.02
8615 48615 09/1943 05/02/1966 Northwich 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 23.35
8616 48616 10/1943 22/10/1960 Cricklewood East 17 17.01
8617 48617 11/1943 02/03/1968 Northwich 24.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1968 24.68
8618 48618 09/1943 23/09/1967 Lostock Hall 24 24.52
8619 48619 10/1943 26/03/1966 Westhouses 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 22.68
8620 48620 11/1943 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 24.58 25.02
8621 48621 11/1943 30/07/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 22.93
8622 48622 11/1943 04/11/1967 Royston 24 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 24.43
8623 48623 12/1943 08/10/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 22.83 23.26
8624 48624 12/1943 24/07/1965 Willesden 21.58 Prs Preserved
8625 48625 04/1943 18/06/1966 Leicester Midland 23.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 23.35
8626 48626 05/1943 20/01/1968 Stockport Edgeley 24.67 25.19
8627 48627 05/1943 05/03/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 22.83 23.10
8628 48628 05/1943 24/09/1966 Oxley 23.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.77
8629 48629 06/1943 09/1966 Saltley 23.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 23.52
8630 48630 06/1943 31/07/1965 Crewe South 22.08 22.44
8631 48631 06/1943 24/02/1968 Northwich 24.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1968 25.02
8632 48632 06/1943 02/03/1968 Northwich 24.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1968 25.10
8633 48633 07/1943 05/03/1966 Crewe South 22.67 23.35
8634 48634 08/1943 14/08/1965 Agecroft 22 22.27
8635 48635 08/1943 08/10/1966 Colwick 23.17 23.52
8636 48636 08/1943 02/09/1967 Patricroft 24.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1968 24.60
8637 48637 09/1943 16/09/1967 Lostock Hall 24 24.93
8638 48638 09/1943 22/01/1966 Westhouses 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 22.60
8639 48639 09/1943 03/02/1968 Northwich 24.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 24.85
8640 48640 10/1943 13/05/1967 Northwich 23.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 24.10
8641 48641 10/1943 15/11/1966 Stourton 23.08 23.35
8642 48642 10/1943 19/04/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.5 20.60
8643 48643 11/1943 10/06/1967 Northwich 23.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 24.10
8644 48644 11/1943 22/01/1966 Westhouses 22.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 22.43
8645 48645 11/1943 27/05/1967 Chester (MR) 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 23.93
8646 48646 11/1943 25/05/1968 Lostock Hall 24.5 25.10
8647 48647 12/1943 23/04/1966 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 22.60
8648 48648 12/1943 22/07/1967 Speke Junction 23.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 23.93
8649 48649 12/1943 06/02/1965 Willesden 21.17 21.43
8650 48650 10/1943 19/08/1967 Northwich 23.83 24.18
8651 48651 11/1943 26/11/1966 Colwick 23 23.60
8652 48652 11/1943 29/06/1968 Bolton 24.58 24.93
8653 48653 11/1943 28/08/1965 Derby 21.75 22.02
8654 48654 11/1943 26/09/1964 Woodford Halse 20.83 20.93
8655 48655 11/1943 12/08/1967 Newton Heath 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 24.10
8656 48656 11/1943 07/08/1965 Mold Junction 21.75 22.02
8657 48657 11/1943 09/1964 Bletchley 20.83 20.93
8658 48658 11/1943 17/07/1965 Crewe South 21.67 22.10
8659 48659 11/1943 21/05/1966 Saltley 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 22.93
8660 48660 11/1943 11/07/1965 Bath Green Park (S&D) 21.67 21.93
8661 48661 07/1944 18/09/1965 Westhouses 21.17 21.43
8662 48662 07/1944 12/11/1966 Colwick 22.33 22.85
8663 48663 02/1944 03/12/1966 Patricroft 22.83 23.35
8664 48664 02/1944 04/11/1967 Royston 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 24.26
8665 48665 03/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.42 24.77
8666 48666 04/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.33 24.68
8667 48667 04/1944 19/03/1966 Mold Junction 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 22.18
8668 48668 05/1944 31/12/1966 Rose Grove 22.58 23.10
8669 48669 05/1944 04/11/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.5 23.93
8670 48670 07/1944 10/1966 Stourton 22.25 22.43
8671 48671 12/1943 05/08/1967 Patricroft 23.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 24.02
8672 48672 01/1944 12/11/1966 Colwick 22.83 23.35
8673 48673 05/1944 04/11/1967 Stockport Edgeley 23.5 23.85
8674 48674 03/1944 23/12/1967 Speke Junction 23.75 24.10
8675 48675 03/1944 16/09/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 23.5 24.35
8676 48676 04/1944 21/10/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 23.5 24.35
8677 48677 05/1944 13/01/1968 Heaton Mersey 23.67 24.02
8678 48678 06/1944 29/06/1968 Newton Heath 24 24.44
8679 48679 12/1943 22/10/1966 Lostock Hall 22.83 23.26
8680 48680 12/1943 24/09/1966 Oxley 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 23.19
8681 48681 01/1944 22/07/1967 Northwich 23.5 24.18
8682 48682 01/1944 25/09/1965 Agecroft 21.67 21.93
8683 48683 01/1944 17/02/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1968 24.60
8684 48684 01/1944 27/04/1968 Heaton Mersey 24.25 24.68
8685 48685 02/1944 22/04/1967 Northwich 23.17 23.76
8686 48686 02/1944 19/11/1966 Stockport Edgeley 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 23.35
8687 48687 02/1944 25/05/1968 Newton Heath 24.25 24.60
8688 48688 02/1944 24/07/1965 Northampton 21.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 21.68
8689 48689 02/1944 05/07/1965 Stourton 21.42 21.60
8690 48690 03/1944 11/03/1967 Saltley 23 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 23.43
8691 48691 03/1944 19/03/1966 Newton Heath 22 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 22.27
8692 48692 03/1944 29/06/1968 Bolton 24.25 24.60
8693 48693 03/1944 22/04/1967 Northwich 23.08 23.52
8694 48694 04/1944 12/03/1966 Kirkby in Ashfield 21.92 22.26
8695 48695 04/1944 12/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 23.68
8696 48696 04/1944 30/12/1967 Edge Hill 23.67 23.93
8697 48697 04/1944 23/12/1967 Heaton Mersey 23.67 23.93
8698 48698 05/1944 02/04/1966 Colwick 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 22.18
8699 48699 05/1944 16/09/1967 Northwich 23.33 23.77
8700 48700 05/1944 09/03/1968 Patricroft 23.83 24.02
8701 48701 05/1944 04/03/1967 Heaton Mersey 22.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 23.35
8702 48702 05/1944 04/05/1968 Bolton 24 24.27
8703 48703 06/1944 25/09/1967 Royston 23.25 23.60
8704 48704 06/1944 11/09/1965 Aintree 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 21.52
8705 7651 3100 3500 48705 06/1944 04/03/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 23.18
8706 7652 3101 3501 48706 06/1944 12/03/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 21.75 21.93
8707 7653 3102 3502 48707 06/1944 15/04/1967 Lostock Hall 22.83 23.27
8708 7654 3103 3503 48708 06/1944 15/04/1967 Heaton Mersey 22.83 23.27
8709 7655 3104 3504 48709 06/1944 15/07/1967 Speke Junction 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 23.60
8710 7656 3105 3505 48710 07/1944 17/09/1967 Royston 23.17 23.60
8711 7657 3106 3506 48711 07/1944 07/01/1967 Speke Junction 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 22.93
8712 7658 3107 3507 48712 07/1944 10/06/1967 Rose Grove 22.92 23.35
8713 7659 3108 3508 48713 07/1944 05/03/1966 Nuneaton 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 22.01
8714 7660 3109 3509 48714 07/1944 04/11/1967 Patricroft 23.33 23.85
8715 7661 3110 3510 48715 07/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 24.08 24.44
8716 7662 3111 3511 48716 07/1944 21/08/1965 Lostock Hall 21.08 21.52
8717 7663 3112 3512 48717 07/1944 01/04/1967 Northwich 22.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 23.18
8718 7664 3113 3513 48718 08/1944 23/04/1966 Nuneaton 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 22.52
8719 7665 3114 3514 48719 08/1944 21/08/1965 Bescot 21 21.52
8720 7666 3115 3515 48720 08/1944 29/06/1968 Bolton 23.83 24.18
8721 7667 3116 3516 48721 08/1944 09/09/1967 Royston 23.08 23.43
8722 7668 3117 3517 48722 08/1944 11/05/1968 Edge Hill 23.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1969 24.44
8723 7669 3118 3518 48723 08/1944 03/08/1968 Lostock Hall 24 24.35
8724 7670 3119 3519 48724 09/1944 28/10/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 23.08 23.93
8725 7671 3120 3520 48725 09/1944 02/09/1967 Crewe South 23 23.43
8726 7672 3121 3521 48726 09/1944 17/09/1966 Oxley 22 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 22.35
8727 7673 3122 3522 48727 09/1944 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 23.92 24.35
8728 7674 3123 3523 48728 09/1944 11/03/1967 Saltley 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 22.93
8729 7675 3124 3524 48729 09/1944 23/12/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 23.25 23.76
8730 3125 3525 48730 09/1945 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 22.92 23.35
8731 3126 3526 48731 09/1945 26/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 22.85
8732 3127 3527 48732 10/1945 26/10/1965 Llanelly 20 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 20.35
8733 3128 3528 48733 10/1945 29/05/1965 Bescot 19.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 19.85
8734 3129 3529 48734 10/1945 03/10/1964 Bescot 19 19.01
8735 3130 3530 48735 11/1945 14/10/1967 Northwich 21.92 22.76
8736 3131 3531 48736 11/1945 13/08/1966 Crewe South 20.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 21.01
8737 3132 3532 48737 11/1945 13/06/1965 Bath Green Park (S&D) 19.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 19.76
8738 3133 3533 48738 12/1945 31/12/1966 Stoke 21 21.68
8739 3134 3534 48739 12/1945 21/01/1967 Lostock Hall 21.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1967 21.59
8740 3135 3535 48740 01/1946 09/03/1968 Bolton 22.17 22.35
8741 3136 3536 48741 02/1946 28/10/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 21.67 22.01
8742 3137 3537 48742 03/1946 02/09/1967 Newton Heath 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 21.85
8743 3138 3538 48743 03/1946 25/03/1967 Edge Hill 21 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 21.52
8744 3139 3539 48744 05/1946 16/03/1968 Bolton 21.83 22.18
8745 3140 3540 48745 04/1946 04/05/1968 Stockport Edgeley 22.08 22.44
8746 3141 3541 48746 05/1946 25/05/1968 Warrington Dallam 22 22.35
8747 3142 3542 48747 05/1946 03/09/1966 Croes Newydd 20.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 20.68
8748 3143 3543 48748 06/1946 30/04/1966 Buxton (LNWR) 19.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 20.18
8749 3144 3544 48749 08/1946 30/03/1968 Patricroft 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 21.93
8750 3145 3545 48750 08/1946 20/01/1968 Northwich 21.42 21.85
8751 3146 3546 48751 09/1946 25/02/1967 Stockport Edgeley 20.42 20.84
8752 3147 3547 48752 10/1946 03/08/1968 Rose Grove 21.83 22.35
8753 3148 3548 48753 10/1945 11/03/1967 Buxton (LNWR) 21.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 21.85
8754 3149 3549 48754 10/1945 27/05/1967 Chester (MR) 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 21.93
8755 3150 3550 48755 10/1945 09/1966 Saltley 20.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1967 21.68
8756 3151 3551 48756 11/1945 07/01/1967 Newton Heath 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1967 21.51
8757 3152 3552 48757 11/1945 16/12/1967 Rose Grove 22.08 22.43
8758 3153 3553 48758 12/1945 23/12/1967 Newton Heath 22 22.26
8759 3154 3554 48759 12/1945 27/11/1965 Leicester Midland 19.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 20.26
8760 3155 3555 48760 12/1945 12/03/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 20.25 20.59
8761 3156 3556 48761 01/1946 04/01/1965 Llanelly 19 19.26
8762 3157 3557 48762 01/1946 26/02/1966 Saltley 20.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 20.43
8763 3158 3558 48763 02/1946 13/04/1968 Lostock Hall 22.17 22.93
8764 3159 3559 48764 02/1946 16/12/1967 Bolton 21.83 22.18
8765 3160 3560 48765 03/1946 03/08/1968 Lostock Hall 22.42 22.77
8766 3161 3561 48766 03/1946 25/02/1967 Stoke 20.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 21.18
8767 3162 3562 48767 03/1946 16/09/1967 Crewe South 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 21.85
8768 3163 3563 48768 03/1946 19/08/1967 Heaton Mersey 21.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 22.35
8769 3164 3564 48769 04/1946 07/08/1965 Bescot 19.33 19.77
8770 3165 3565 48770 05/1946 08/04/1967 Patricroft 20.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 21.43
8771 3166 3566 48771 05/1946 11/12/1965 Lostock Hall 19.58 19.93
8772 3167 3567 48772 06/1946 19/01/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 17.58 17.93
70500 48773 06/1940 10/08/1968 Rose Grove 28.17 Prs Preserved
70501 48774 08/1940 24/07/1965 Speke Junction 24.92 25.68
70512 48775 04/1937 03/08/1968 Lostock Hall 31.33 31.69