LMS Stanier "8F" Class 2-8-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 25/02/1961 | 48081, 48105, 48108, 48108, 48367, 48367, 48478, 48533, 48609, 48609, 48763, 48763 |
17C, 16B, 16A, MRM18, 14A, MRM15, 5B, 41E, 15B, MRM12, 16A, MRM18 |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside new paint shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 48130, 48215, 48252, 48399, 48408, 48445, 48476, 48476, 48500, 48500, 48528, 48532, 48551, 48605, 48638, 48638, 48649, 48649, 48700, 48700, 48703, 48736, 48762, 48762 |
55D, 16B, 5B, 55A, 1E, 2E, 6C, W18, 5D, W15S, 16B, 55D, 1A, 8E, 16A, MRM18, 2A, W8, 21A, MRM3, 55B, 2E, 5C, W14 |
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 09/12/1961 | 48136, 48164, 48201, 48201, 48333, 48333, 48338, 48423, 48423, 48522, 48522, 48536, 48558, 48558, 48634, 48717, 48741, 48770, 48770 |
SD, 41E, 18A, MRM17, 18A, MRM17, 9F, 6C, W18, 8C, W35, 55A, 9D, W16B, 9F, 8E, 9E, 14A, MRM15 |
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Casual repair shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Casual repair shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Casual repair shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Casual repair shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 15/12/1961 | 48005, 48005, 48050, 48050, 48061, 48061, 48079, 48079, 48334, 48378, 48378, 48392, 48495, 48495, 48552 |
15B, MRM12, 15B, MRM12, 15A, MRM13, 15B, MRM12, 16B, 14A, MRM15, 16B, 15A, MRM13, 16B |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 16/03/1962 | 48099, 48099, 48182, 48182, 48211, 48211, 48442, 48490, 48490, 48533 |
16A, MRM18, 17B, MRM2, 16A, MRM18, 16B, 16A, MRM18, 41E |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. |
|||
Fri 06/04/1962 | 48094, 48094, 48099, 48099, 48272, 48282, 48413, 48442, 48669, 48669, 48687 |
8B, W23, 16A, MRM18, 16B, 16B, 16B, 16B, 21A, MRM3, 15D |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 08/04/1962 | 48452, 48504, 48600, 48732 |
87F, 2B, 1A, 87F |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Crewe South shed |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 15/04/1962 | 48123, 48138, 48161, 48257, 48257, 48295, 48321, 48403, 48631, 48670, 48684, 48684, 48715, 48715 |
55D, 56D, 9F, 6C, W18, 27F, 55A, 9F, 8E, 55D, 6C, W18, 8B, W23 |
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Outside erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Outside erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Outside erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Bolton shed Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | 48069, 48069, 48097, 48119, 48183, 48183, 48381, 48381, 48387, 48387, 48517, 48517 |
15B, MRM12, 16B, 16B, 21A, MRM3, 15A, MRM13, 15A, MRM13, 14A, MRM15 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Shop road. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Shop road. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Sun 08/11/1964 | 48205 | 9K | A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed | John Thickitt | ||
Sat 14/11/1964 | 48661 | 16A | A visit to Canklow shed: On shed | John Thickitt | ||
Sun 21/03/1965 | 48006, 48096, 48119, 48185, 48215, 48272, 48395, 48442, 48528, 48612, 48614, 48643, 48673, 48678 |
Wdn, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E, 9D, 16E, 16E, 16E, 16E |
A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed |
John Thickitt - depot visit | ||
Sun 21/08/1966 | 48115, 48143, 48149, 48163, 48163, 48168, 48178, 48178, 48191, 48205, 48208, 48272, 48329, 48546, 48612, 48695, 48731, 48763 |
9F, 16G, 16G, 8C, W35, 9F, 8A, W26, 9F, 9F, 9F, 16G, 9F, 9F, 9F, 9F, 9F, 16G |
A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 48082, 48114, 48117, 48165, 48193, 48221, 48261, 48275, 48363, 48379, 48410, 48494, 48636, 48678, 48715, 48724 |
Wdn, Wdn, 8F, Wdn, 8G, Wdn, 8F, 8F, 8L, Wdn, 8F, Wdn, 9H, 8F, 8F, 8F |
A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 48752, 48764 |
8F, 8F |
Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sun 17/09/1967 | 48055, 48067, 48070, 48076, 48084, 48093, 48113, 48169, 48222, 48276, 48352, 48439, 48473, 48537, 48540, 48622, 48664, 48703, 48710 |
55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, 55D, Wdn |
A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Thu 01/02/1968 | 48642 | Wdn | Gowhole-Buxton freight | Railway World Dec 1969 |