02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
8009 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
8010 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
8003 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
8004 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
8005 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
8076 |
|
NEW |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
8078 |
|
NEW |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
8079 |
|
NEW |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
8080 |
|
NEW |
18A |
Toton |
|
01/1937 |
To Service |
8081 |
|
NEW |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/1937 |
To Service |
8083 |
|
NEW |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
03/1939 |
To Service |
8114 |
|
NEW |
2C |
Northampton |
|
04/1939 |
To Service |
8115 |
|
NEW |
2E |
Warwick |
|
04/1939 |
To Service |
8116 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/1942 |
To Service |
8156 |
|
NEW |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
02/1945 |
To Service |
8545 |
|
NEW |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
21/07/1945 |
To Service |
8479 |
|
NEW |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
8494 |
|
NEW |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
8495 |
|
NEW |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
03/08/1945 |
To Service |
8538 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
22/08/1945 |
To Service |
8559 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
26/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
8434 |
|
|
LA |
Laira |
|
26/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
8440 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8067 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8069 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8078 |
18A |
Toton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8079 |
18A |
Toton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8080 |
18A |
Toton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8085 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8088 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8093 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8124 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8128 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8158 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8159 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8164 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8165 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8177 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8336 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8337 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
8645 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8427 |
|
|
LA |
Laira |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8428 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8451 |
|
|
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8464 |
|
|
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8466 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8467 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
|
|
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
8478 |
|
|
OXY |
Oxley |
|
13/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
8706 |
|
|
91E |
Aintree |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8000 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8001 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8002 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8003 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8004 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8005 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8006 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8007 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8008 |
|
|
17C |
Coalville |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8009 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8010 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8011 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8017 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8024 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8026 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8027 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8029 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8033 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8035 |
|
|
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8036 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8037 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8050 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8053 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8054 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8055 |
|
|
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8056 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8057 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8060 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8062 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8063 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8064 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8065 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8067 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8069 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8070 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8073 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8074 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8075 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8076 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8078 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8079 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8080 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8081 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
20F |
Skipton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8082 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8083 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8084 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8085 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8088 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8089 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8090 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8092 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8093 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8095 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8096 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8097 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8098 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8099 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8100 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8101 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8102 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8103 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8104 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8105 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8106 |
|
|
17C |
Coalville |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8107 |
|
|
17C |
Coalville |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8108 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8109 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8110 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8111 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8112 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8113 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8114 |
2C |
Northampton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8115 |
2E |
Warwick |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8116 |
5B |
Crewe South |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8117 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8118 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8119 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8120 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8121 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8122 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8123 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8124 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8125 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8126 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8127 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8128 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8129 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8130 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8131 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8132 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8133 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8134 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8135 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8136 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8137 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8138 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8139 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8140 |
|
|
20B |
Stourton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8141 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8142 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8143 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8144 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8145 |
|
|
20G |
Hellifield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8146 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8147 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8148 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8149 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8150 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8151 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8152 |
|
|
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8153 |
|
|
31E |
Dawsholm |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8154 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8155 |
|
|
31E |
Dawsholm |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8156 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8157 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8158 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8159 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8160 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8161 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8162 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8163 |
|
|
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8164 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8165 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8166 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8167 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8168 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8169 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8170 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8171 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8172 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8173 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8174 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8175 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8176 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8177 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15D |
Bedford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8178 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8179 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8180 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8181 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8182 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8183 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8184 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8185 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8186 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8187 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8188 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8189 |
|
|
20G |
Hellifield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8190 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8191 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8192 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8193 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8194 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8195 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8196 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8197 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8198 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8199 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8200 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8201 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8202 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8203 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8204 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8205 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8206 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8207 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8208 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8209 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8210 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8211 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8212 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8213 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8214 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8215 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8216 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8217 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8218 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8219 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8220 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8221 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8222 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8223 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8224 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8225 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8264 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8265 |
|
|
17C |
Coalville |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8266 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8267 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8268 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8269 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8270 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8271 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8272 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8273 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8274 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8275 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8276 |
|
|
20B |
Stourton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8277 |
|
|
20B |
Stourton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8278 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8279 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8280 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8281 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8282 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8283 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8284 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8285 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8293 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8301 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8303 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8304 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8305 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8306 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8307 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8308 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8309 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8311 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8312 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8313 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8314 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8315 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8316 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8317 |
|
|
20F |
Skipton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8318 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8319 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8320 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8321 |
|
|
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8322 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8323 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8324 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8325 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8326 |
|
|
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8327 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8328 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8329 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8330 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8331 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8332 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8333 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8334 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8335 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8336 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8337 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8338 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8339 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8340 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8341 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8342 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8343 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8344 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8345 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8346 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8347 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8348 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8349 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8350 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8351 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8352 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8353 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
|
|
20B |
Stourton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8355 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8356 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8357 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8358 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8359 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8360 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8361 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8362 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8363 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8364 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8365 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8366 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8367 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8368 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8369 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8370 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8371 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8372 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8373 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8374 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8375 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8376 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8377 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8378 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8379 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8380 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8381 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8382 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8383 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8384 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8385 |
|
|
23B |
Aintree |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8386 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8387 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8388 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8389 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8390 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8391 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8392 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8393 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8394 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8395 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8396 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8397 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8398 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8399 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8400 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8401 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8402 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8403 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8404 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8405 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8406 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8407 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8408 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8409 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8410 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8411 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8412 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8413 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8414 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8415 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8416 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8417 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8418 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8419 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8420 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8421 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8422 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8423 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8424 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8425 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8426 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8427 |
LA |
Laira |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8428 |
CHR |
Chester West |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8429 |
|
|
25C |
Goole |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8430 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8431 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8432 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8433 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8434 |
LA |
Laira |
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8435 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8436 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8437 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8438 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8439 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8440 |
TN |
Taunton |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8441 |
|
|
25C |
Goole |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8442 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8443 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8444 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8445 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8446 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8447 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8449 |
|
|
25C |
Goole |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8450 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8451 |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8452 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8453 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8454 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8455 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8456 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8457 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8458 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8459 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8460 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8461 |
|
|
23B |
Aintree |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8462 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8463 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8464 |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8465 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8466 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8467 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8468 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8469 |
|
|
23B |
Aintree |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8470 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8471 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8472 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8473 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8474 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8475 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8476 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8478 |
OXY |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8479 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8490 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8491 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8492 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8493 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8494 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8495 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8500 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8501 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8502 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8503 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8504 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8505 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8506 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8507 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8508 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8509 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8510 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8511 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8512 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8513 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8514 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8515 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8516 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8517 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8518 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8519 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8520 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8521 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8522 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8523 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8524 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8525 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8526 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8527 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8528 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8529 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8530 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8531 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8532 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8533 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8534 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8535 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8536 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8537 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8538 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8539 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8540 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8541 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8542 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8543 |
|
|
17C |
Coalville |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8544 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8545 |
STM |
St Margarets |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8546 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8547 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8548 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8549 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8550 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8551 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8552 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8553 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8554 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8555 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8556 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8557 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8558 |
|
|
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8559 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8600 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8601 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8602 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8603 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8604 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8605 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8606 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8607 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8608 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8609 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8610 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8611 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8612 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8613 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8614 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8615 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8616 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8617 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8618 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8619 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8620 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8621 |
|
|
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8622 |
|
|
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8623 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8624 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8625 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8626 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8627 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8628 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8629 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8630 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8631 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8632 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8633 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8634 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8635 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8636 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8637 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8638 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8639 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8640 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8641 |
|
|
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8642 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8643 |
|
|
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8644 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8645 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8646 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8647 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8648 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8649 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8650 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8651 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8652 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8653 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8654 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8655 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8656 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8657 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8658 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8659 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8660 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8661 |
|
|
18B |
Westhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8662 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8663 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8664 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8665 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8666 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8667 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8668 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8669 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8670 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8671 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8672 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8673 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8674 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8675 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8676 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8677 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8678 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8679 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8680 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8681 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8682 |
|
|
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8683 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8684 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8685 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8686 |
|
|
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8687 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8688 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8689 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8690 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8691 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8692 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8693 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8694 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8695 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8696 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8697 |
|
|
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8698 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8699 |
|
|
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8700 |
|
|
20C |
Royston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8701 |
|
|
16D |
Mansfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8702 |
|
|
20D |
Normanton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8703 |
|
|
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8704 |
|
|
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8705 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8707 |
|
|
23B |
Aintree |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8708 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8709 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8710 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8711 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8712 |
|
|
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8713 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8714 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8715 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8716 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8717 |
|
|
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8718 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8719 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8720 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8721 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8722 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8723 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8724 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8725 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8726 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8727 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8728 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8729 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8730 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8731 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8732 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8733 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8734 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8735 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8736 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8737 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8738 |
|
|
25D |
Mirfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8739 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8740 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8741 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8742 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8743 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8744 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8745 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8746 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8747 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8748 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8749 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8750 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8751 |
|
|
25D |
Mirfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8752 |
|
|
25D |
Mirfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8753 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8754 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8755 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8756 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8757 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8758 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8759 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8760 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8761 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8762 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8763 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8764 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8765 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8766 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8767 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8768 |
|
|
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8769 |
|
|
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8770 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8771 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8772 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8140 |
20B |
Stourton |
19C |
Canklow |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8105 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8189 |
20G |
Hellifield |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8731 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8734 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8740 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8741 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8742 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8755 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8005 |
20G |
Hellifield |
20F |
Skipton |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8073 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8081 |
20F |
Skipton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8104 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8145 |
20G |
Hellifield |
20F |
Skipton |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8311 |
18A |
Toton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8317 |
20F |
Skipton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
20B |
Stourton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8537 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8608 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8616 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8622 |
16D |
Mansfield |
20B |
Stourton |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8652 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
20B |
Stourton |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8745 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8746 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8749 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8761 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25C |
Goole |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8001 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20D |
Normanton |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8067 |
15B |
Kettering |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8070 |
18A |
Toton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8110 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8143 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
15B |
Kettering |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8159 |
20D |
Normanton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8176 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8306 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8399 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8703 |
18A |
Toton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8109 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8318 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8555 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8708 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8744 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8750 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8771 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8772 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8121 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8127 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8134 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8137 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8138 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8157 |
17A |
Derby |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8158 |
16A |
Nottingham |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8179 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8275 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8283 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8320 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8437 |
26C |
Bolton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8641 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8717 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8764 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8765 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8129 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8156 |
28A |
Motherwell |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8183 |
28A |
Motherwell |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8187 |
28A |
Motherwell |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8273 |
5B |
Crewe South |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8631 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8760 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
8762 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8631 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8733 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8463 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8768 |
26D |
Bury |
25C |
Goole |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8769 |
26D |
Bury |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8106 |
17C |
Coalville |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8129 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8173 |
1A |
Willesden |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8191 |
5B |
Crewe South |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8318 |
8D |
Widnes |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8320 |
8D |
Widnes |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8372 |
1A |
Willesden |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8454 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8460 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8462 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8475 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
17C |
Coalville |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
5B |
Crewe South |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8491 |
15B |
Kettering |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8518 |
25A |
Wakefield |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8519 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8D |
Widnes |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8520 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8521 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8522 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8559 |
5B |
Crewe South |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8673 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8686 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
03/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8079 |
20C |
Royston |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8466 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8705 |
24A |
Accrington |
23B |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8388 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8400 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8630 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8007 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8074 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8080 |
20C |
Royston |
20B |
Stourton |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8142 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8313 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8376 |
20C |
Royston |
20B |
Stourton |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8378 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8380 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15B |
Kettering |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8381 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15B |
Kettering |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8387 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8418 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8547 |
20C |
Royston |
20B |
Stourton |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8553 |
5B |
Crewe South |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8718 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8027 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8110 |
18A |
Toton |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
8531 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8036 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
26D |
Bury |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8120 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26D |
Bury |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8147 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8155 |
31E |
Dawsholm |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8163 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
28A |
Motherwell |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8191 |
25A |
Wakefield |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8321 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
20C |
Royston |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8342 |
18B |
Westhouses |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8389 |
21A |
Saltley |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8398 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8408 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8441 |
25C |
Goole |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8462 |
1A |
Willesden |
8D |
Widnes |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8517 |
25A |
Wakefield |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8554 |
1A |
Willesden |
8D |
Widnes |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8684 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8011 |
18B |
Westhouses |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8054 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
20C |
Royston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8122 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8127 |
16A |
Nottingham |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8166 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8207 |
16A |
Nottingham |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8268 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8321 |
20C |
Royston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8322 |
17A |
Derby |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8421 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8441 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8493 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8534 |
18B |
Westhouses |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8535 |
18B |
Westhouses |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8536 |
18B |
Westhouses |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8549 |
18B |
Westhouses |
2C |
Northampton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
8682 |
19C |
Canklow |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8127 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8166 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8134 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8166 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8179 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8519 |
8D |
Widnes |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
48004 |
18A |
Toton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
48123 |
20D |
Normanton |
20D |
Normanton |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
18A |
Toton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8622 |
20B |
Stourton |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8652 |
20B |
Stourton |
18A |
Toton |
|
31/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
8001 |
20D |
Normanton |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
16D |
Mansfield |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
8689 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
28/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
8557 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
8027 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
25/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
48004 |
20B |
Stourton |
18A |
Toton |
|
25/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
20B |
Stourton |
18A |
Toton |
|
25/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
8622 |
18A |
Toton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
25/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
8652 |
18A |
Toton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
8074 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
8323 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
8447 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
8544 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
8738 |
25D |
Mirfield |
25C |
Goole |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
8007 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
8142 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
48385 |
23B |
Aintree |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
8386 |
25A |
Wakefield |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
28A |
Motherwell |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
8185 |
28A |
Motherwell |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
8186 |
28A |
Motherwell |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
48078 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8466 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8D |
Widnes |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8539 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8558 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8D |
Widnes |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
48612 |
1A |
Willesden |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8741 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8743 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8466 |
8D |
Widnes |
8D |
Widnes |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8558 |
8D |
Widnes |
8D |
Widnes |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8684 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
8743 |
21A |
Saltley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
48119 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
8461 |
23B |
Aintree |
24A |
Accrington |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
8469 |
23B |
Aintree |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
23B |
Aintree |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
8707 |
23B |
Aintree |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
48769 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
8710 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
26C |
Bolton |
|
26/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
8711 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
26C |
Bolton |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8148 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8149 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8150 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8151 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8152 |
31D |
Grangemouth |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8301 |
28C |
Carstairs |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8302 |
28C |
Carstairs |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8303 |
28C |
Carstairs |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8331 |
28C |
Carstairs |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8533 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
21A |
Saltley |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
20C |
Royston |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48119 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8425 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48435 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8456 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8458 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8459 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
24A |
Accrington |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8713 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8714 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8715 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48769 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8523 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
23B |
Aintree |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8524 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
23B |
Aintree |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8525 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
23B |
Aintree |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8526 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8528 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
02/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
25A |
Wakefield |
20D |
Normanton |
|
02/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48508 |
25A |
Wakefield |
20D |
Normanton |
|
02/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48721 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
02/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8759 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
15B |
Kettering |
|
02/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8763 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8416 |
24A |
Accrington |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8479 |
24A |
Accrington |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
09/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8491 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8010 |
21A |
Saltley |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8152 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8719 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
8720 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48161 |
20C |
Royston |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
8430 |
19C |
Canklow |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
24A |
Accrington |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
8491 |
24A |
Accrington |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
8533 |
21A |
Saltley |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
20C |
Royston |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
48546 |
20C |
Royston |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
11/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8436 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
48472 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
48502 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8504 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8506 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8511 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8514 |
25A |
Wakefield |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8526 |
24A |
Accrington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
24A |
Accrington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8528 |
24A |
Accrington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8529 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
02/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24A |
Accrington |
|
02/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8491 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24A |
Accrington |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
25A |
Wakefield |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8142 |
25A |
Wakefield |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8147 |
25A |
Wakefield |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48207 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
25A |
Wakefield |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8142 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8147 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48207 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
21A |
Saltley |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8339 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
21A |
Saltley |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8461 |
24A |
Accrington |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8463 |
24A |
Accrington |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8471 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26C |
Bolton |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8707 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
24A |
Accrington |
25C |
Goole |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48321 |
5B |
Crewe South |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8416 |
25A |
Wakefield |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8464 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8469 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48472 |
5B |
Crewe South |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8479 |
25A |
Wakefield |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
25A |
Wakefield |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48501 |
25A |
Wakefield |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48503 |
25A |
Wakefield |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
2C |
Northampton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48612 |
21A |
Saltley |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2C |
Northampton |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
20F |
Skipton |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8102 |
18B |
Westhouses |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8157 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20C |
Royston |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48403 |
21A |
Saltley |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48405 |
21A |
Saltley |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48703 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8354 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48682 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8389 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9A |
Longsight |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9A |
Longsight |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48429 |
25C |
Goole |
9A |
Longsight |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48457 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
25A |
Wakefield |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
25A |
Wakefield |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8510 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48512 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48513 |
25A |
Wakefield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8516 |
25A |
Wakefield |
9A |
Longsight |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25C |
Goole |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
15/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8732 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48630 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
8528 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
25F |
Low Moor |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
25F |
Low Moor |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
21A |
Saltley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
2A |
Rugby |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48093 |
21A |
Saltley |
20C |
Royston |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8157 |
20C |
Royston |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48337 |
21A |
Saltley |
20C |
Royston |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8342 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48435 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8444 |
26B |
Agecroft |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48449 |
25C |
Goole |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8456 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8458 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
8459 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48703 |
20C |
Royston |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48747 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
48747 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48259 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48289 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
19C |
Canklow |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8106 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
26B |
Agecroft |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8448 |
24A |
Accrington |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8455 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48491 |
24A |
Accrington |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48611 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48673 |
25A |
Wakefield |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8036 |
26D |
Bury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
19C |
Canklow |
19C |
Canklow |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8173 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48246 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48251 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48255 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48320 |
25A |
Wakefield |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8398 |
25A |
Wakefield |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48437 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48559 |
25A |
Wakefield |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48611 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48747 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
|
|
13D |
Shoeburyness |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
|
|
13D |
Shoeburyness |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48286 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48291 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48555 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48682 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
48717 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8036 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8173 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48320 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8398 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48437 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48559 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48641 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20B |
Stourton |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48703 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20B |
Stourton |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48753 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Warwick |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Warwick |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48027 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8318 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8340 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48555 |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48641 |
20B |
Stourton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48682 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48703 |
20B |
Stourton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
24A |
Accrington |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48717 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48753 |
8D |
Widnes |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8756 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8120 |
26D |
Bury |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8318 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8340 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8471 |
20G |
Hellifield |
15B |
Kettering |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15B |
Kettering |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15B |
Kettering |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
25D |
Mirfield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48246 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
8477 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48135 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
13D |
Northwich |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
15B |
Kettering |
17A |
Derby |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48343 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
1A |
Willesden |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48619 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48735 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48551 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48665 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48691 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48427 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
15/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48717 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
13D |
Northwich |
|
22/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
22/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
22/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48473 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48175 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
06/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48175 |
3A |
Bescot |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
3A |
Bescot |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
3A |
Bescot |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
3A |
Bescot |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
03/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
9G |
Northwich |
|
03/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
8120 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48375 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
48686 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48004 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
17A |
Derby |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
17A |
Derby |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48466 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48684 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48120 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
22/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
22/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
48686 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
05/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
3A |
Bescot |
|
05/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48674 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
3A |
Bescot |
|
12/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
9G |
Northwich |
|
13/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
19/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48207 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
19/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
1A |
Willesden |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48207 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
|
|
9G |
Northwich |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
25C |
Goole |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
25C |
Goole |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48761 |
25C |
Goole |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
16/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
16/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48688 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48054 |
2C |
Northampton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48126 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
20D |
Normanton |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48152 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48195 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
2C |
Northampton |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48549 |
2C |
Northampton |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
2C |
Northampton |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
25D |
Mirfield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
25C |
Goole |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
25D |
Mirfield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
25D |
Mirfield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
25C |
Goole |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48003 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48054 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48126 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48152 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48195 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48549 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48688 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9G |
Northwich |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48557 |
1A |
Willesden |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48633 |
1A |
Willesden |
9A |
Longsight |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
17C |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
1A |
Willesden |
9G |
Northwich |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
20B |
Stourton |
20C |
Royston |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
17C |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
1A |
Willesden |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
1A |
Willesden |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
1A |
Willesden |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
8278 |
1A |
Willesden |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48309 |
2A |
Rugby |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48330 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
1A |
Willesden |
9G |
Northwich |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48354 |
1A |
Willesden |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15B |
Kettering |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48438 |
1A |
Willesden |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
17C |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48508 |
20D |
Normanton |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48525 |
23B |
Aintree |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
17C |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48557 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48605 |
1A |
Willesden |
9G |
Northwich |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48633 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48660 |
1A |
Willesden |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
NTH |
Northwich |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
NTH |
Northwich |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48721 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
26B |
Agecroft |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48732 |
26B |
Agecroft |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48737 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
26B |
Agecroft |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
NTH |
Northwich |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48761 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
2B |
Bletchley |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
8265 |
17C |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
8278 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48508 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
19C |
Canklow |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48721 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48126 |
16D |
Mansfield |
20B |
Stourton |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20B |
Stourton |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48277 |
20B |
Stourton |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
20B |
Stourton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
21A |
Saltley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48468 |
26C |
Bolton |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48524 |
23B |
Aintree |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48686 |
3A |
Bescot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48719 |
25D |
Mirfield |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48732 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48735 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
26B |
Agecroft |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
18A |
Toton |
20D |
Normanton |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
18A |
Toton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48358 |
18B |
Westhouses |
20B |
Stourton |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
20D |
Normanton |
20D |
Normanton |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48358 |
20B |
Stourton |
20B |
Stourton |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
18B |
Westhouses |
20D |
Normanton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48159 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48249 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
21A |
Saltley |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
17B |
Burton |
17B |
Burton |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
17B |
Burton |
17B |
Burton |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
20D |
Normanton |
20D |
Normanton |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48249 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48719 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
03/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
20C |
Royston |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
|
|
9G |
Northwich |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48332 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
48677 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
15B |
Kettering |
21A |
Saltley |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
12/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
17B |
Burton |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
17B |
Burton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
18A |
Toton |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Kettering |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48677 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
48083 |
18B |
Westhouses |
19C |
Canklow |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20C |
Royston |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
1A |
Willesden |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
8D |
Widnes |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
21A |
Saltley |
19C |
Canklow |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
21A |
Saltley |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
20B |
Stourton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
20F |
Skipton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
8D |
Widnes |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
4A |
Bletchley |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
1A |
Willesden |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48083 |
19C |
Canklow |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48159 |
18A |
Toton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
18A |
Toton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8D |
Widnes |
8D |
Widnes |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
19C |
Canklow |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48477 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
8602 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
14/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48710 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
14/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
8310 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48477 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
8602 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48710 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
04/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
04/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
04/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
26C |
Bolton |
24A |
Accrington |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
NTH |
Northwich |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48260 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48466 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48473 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
23B |
Aintree |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48710 |
24A |
Accrington |
20C |
Royston |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
24A |
Accrington |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48733 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
24A |
Accrington |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48769 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
3A |
Bescot |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48135 |
13D |
Northwich |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
3A |
Bescot |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
16A |
Nottingham |
19C |
Canklow |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48653 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9G |
Northwich |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48135 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48137 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
26C |
Bolton |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
19C |
Canklow |
19C |
Canklow |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48653 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48466 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48473 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48710 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48733 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
8D |
Widnes |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48769 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48331 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48405 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
10/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48653 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
24A |
Accrington |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
24A |
Accrington |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
24A |
Accrington |
3A |
Bescot |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48001 |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
20F |
Skipton |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
9G |
Northwich |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
15B |
Kettering |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48260 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
17A |
Derby |
20F |
Skipton |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48653 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48677 |
17A |
Derby |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
17A |
Derby |
9G |
Northwich |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8D |
Widnes |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
48731 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48001 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
20F |
Skipton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48271 |
20D |
Normanton |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
4A |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
20F |
Skipton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48429 |
9A |
Longsight |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48459 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
20C |
Royston |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
20D |
Normanton |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48640 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48677 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9G |
Northwich |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48731 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9A |
Longsight |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48001 |
17A |
Derby |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
17A |
Derby |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48136 |
18B |
Westhouses |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48148 |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48161 |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
5B |
Crewe South |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48272 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48286 |
5B |
Crewe South |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
2A |
Rugby |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
9G |
Northwich |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
48677 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
20D |
Normanton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2E |
Northampton |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48459 |
20C |
Royston |
20C |
Royston |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
20D |
Normanton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18B |
Westhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
21A |
Saltley |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
18B |
Westhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
21A |
Saltley |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
9G |
Northwich |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48108 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48514 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48743 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20B |
Stourton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48320 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9G |
Northwich |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
48134 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17B |
Burton |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17B |
Burton |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
17B |
Burton |
17B |
Burton |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48134 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
17B |
Burton |
17B |
Burton |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
17B |
Burton |
17B |
Burton |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48608 |
20G |
Hellifield |
20C |
Royston |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48420 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
48674 |
3A |
Bescot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
48259 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3A |
Bescot |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
48674 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
20D |
Normanton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48290 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48314 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48377 |
20C |
Royston |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
20C |
Royston |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48419 |
20C |
Royston |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48420 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
20D |
Normanton |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48520 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48521 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48528 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48144 |
18A |
Toton |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
18A |
Toton |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48259 |
3A |
Bescot |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48314 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20B |
Stourton |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48619 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
48721 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20B |
Stourton |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
48741 |
21A |
Saltley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48108 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48343 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48377 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
21A |
Saltley |
19C |
Canklow |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
48741 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19C |
Canklow |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48155 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
9G |
Northwich |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20D |
Normanton |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48426 |
2C |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
2C |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48521 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9G |
Northwich |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48534 |
2C |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8D |
Widnes |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48426 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
2C |
Northampton |
9G |
Northwich |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
19C |
Canklow |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48534 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
48772 |
8D |
Widnes |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
48426 |
2E |
Northampton |
9G |
Northwich |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
9G |
Northwich |
2E |
Northampton |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
20B |
Stourton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
2A |
Rugby |
6F |
Bidston |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
|
|
6F |
Bidston |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48772 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48001 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48083 |
19C |
Canklow |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
19C |
Canklow |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48146 |
20D |
Normanton |
20C |
Royston |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
20D |
Normanton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48491 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48634 |
1A |
Willesden |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48670 |
20D |
Normanton |
20C |
Royston |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
48673 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
48658 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
48174 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
21A |
Saltley |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
48331 |
21A |
Saltley |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
15B |
Kettering |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
21A |
Saltley |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
17A |
Derby |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48634 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
48654 |
17A |
Derby |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48070 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20C |
Royston |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48199 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48420 |
21A |
Saltley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48640 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20C |
Royston |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
19C |
Canklow |
20D |
Normanton |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
18A |
Toton |
20D |
Normanton |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
48763 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
48634 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
20D |
Normanton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48147 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48395 |
20D |
Normanton |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48396 |
20D |
Normanton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48742 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9G |
Northwich |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
48749 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
20C |
Royston |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48065 |
19C |
Canklow |
18C |
Hasland |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48095 |
20C |
Royston |
18C |
Hasland |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
20C |
Royston |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
17A |
Derby |
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
21A |
Saltley |
19C |
Canklow |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
3A |
Bescot |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
48371 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18C |
Hasland |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48334 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48418 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48533 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
48660 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
48075 |
18A |
Toton |
19C |
Canklow |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
48144 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19C |
Canklow |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
|
|
9G |
Northwich |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
48501 |
9A |
Longsight |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48050 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48150 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48151 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
6F |
Bidston |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48396 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
19C |
Canklow |
84C |
Banbury |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
18A |
Toton |
84C |
Banbury |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48419 |
18A |
Toton |
84C |
Banbury |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
2E |
Northampton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
15B |
Kettering |
84C |
Banbury |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48181 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
19C |
Canklow |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
84C |
Banbury |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48410 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48434 |
19C |
Canklow |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
19C |
Canklow |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
6F |
Bidston |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48222 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20C |
Royston |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20C |
Royston |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48281 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
20C |
Royston |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48309 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48431 |
20C |
Royston |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
20C |
Royston |
85A |
Worcester |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48459 |
20C |
Royston |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48660 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
20B |
Stourton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48275 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48431 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
85A |
Worcester |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48537 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20B |
Stourton |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48630 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9G |
Northwich |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
48731 |
9A |
Longsight |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
48533 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
3A |
Bescot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48273 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48630 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
4A |
Bletchley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48103 |
20C |
Royston |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48144 |
19C |
Canklow |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48273 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48443 |
20C |
Royston |
20B |
Stourton |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9G |
Northwich |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
48314 |
20B |
Stourton |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
1A |
Willesden |
9G |
Northwich |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
48530 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48112 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48152 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48398 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48456 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48533 |
16C |
Mansfield |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
3A |
Bescot |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
48686 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
48112 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
15B |
Kettering |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48135 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
18B |
Westhouses |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48433 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48456 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
48461 |
18A |
Toton |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48112 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
18A |
Toton |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
18A |
Toton |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
48673 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
21A |
Saltley |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18C |
Hasland |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48152 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
21A |
Saltley |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
18B |
Westhouses |
19C |
Canklow |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
18B |
Westhouses |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
21A |
Saltley |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48418 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
21A |
Saltley |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
18B |
Westhouses |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
17A |
Derby |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
21/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
38B |
Annesley |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48102 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
3A |
Bescot |
9G |
Northwich |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
9G |
Northwich |
3A |
Bescot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48191 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48198 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48395 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48403 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
48734 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
48263 |
|
|
5C |
Stafford |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
21A |
Saltley |
17B |
Burton |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
48734 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
15B |
Kettering |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48191 |
15B |
Kettering |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48198 |
15B |
Kettering |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48288 |
|
|
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
3A |
Bescot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2B |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48541 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
17B |
Burton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18C |
Hasland |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
38B |
Annesley |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
48056 |
18B |
Westhouses |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
48280 |
18B |
Westhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
48623 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
5C |
Stafford |
3A |
Bescot |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
18B |
Westhouses |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
48120 |
3A |
Bescot |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
48263 |
5C |
Stafford |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48135 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
9G |
Northwich |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48191 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
17E |
Heaton Mersey |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48198 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
17E |
Heaton Mersey |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
9G |
Northwich |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48305 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48360 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
18A |
Toton |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
16A |
Nottingham |
85C |
Hereford |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
85C |
Hereford |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48463 |
18A |
Toton |
85C |
Hereford |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
21A |
Saltley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
2A |
Rugby |
9G |
Northwich |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48152 |
21A |
Saltley |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
21A |
Saltley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48280 |
21A |
Saltley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48359 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18C |
Hasland |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
3A |
Bescot |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48084 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48123 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48160 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48274 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48352 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48357 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48394 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
20D |
Normanton |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
16A |
Nottingham |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18A |
Toton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48205 |
18A |
Toton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48264 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48623 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
3A |
Bescot |
|
09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
|
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48774 |
|
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
|
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
18A |
Toton |
9G |
Northwich |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
9G |
Northwich |
18A |
Toton |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48084 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48123 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55D |
Royston |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55D |
Royston |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
17B |
Burton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48116 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
18C |
Hasland |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48363 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18C |
Hasland |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
17B |
Burton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48719 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
3D |
Aston |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
15B |
Kettering |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
18B |
Westhouses |
3A |
Bescot |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
18A |
Toton |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
9G |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48290 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48610 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48638 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
18A |
Toton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
16A |
Nottingham |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48136 |
16A |
Nottingham |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48548 |
19C |
Canklow |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48646 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8D |
Widnes |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
48308 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
48524 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
8D |
Widnes |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48089 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
18C |
Hasland |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48308 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
85C |
Hereford |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48419 |
84C |
Banbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
85C |
Hereford |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48461 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48463 |
85C |
Hereford |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48524 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48275 |
9A |
Longsight |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48295 |
|
|
8E |
Brunswick |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48306 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48728 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
48745 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8D |
Widnes |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
9A |
Longsight |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48516 |
9A |
Longsight |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
3A |
Bescot |
9G |
Gorton |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48175 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
8D |
Widnes |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
9G |
Northwich |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48395 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48633 |
9A |
Longsight |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48673 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
9G |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9G |
Gorton |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
20C |
Royston |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48160 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48162 |
20C |
Royston |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48174 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
20C |
Royston |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48274 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48275 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48308 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48352 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48357 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48394 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
84C |
Banbury |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48418 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
84C |
Banbury |
6E |
Chester West |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48502 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48548 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48633 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
20G |
Hellifield |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48286 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
3D |
Aston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48528 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48616 |
20G |
Hellifield |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
48746 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48099 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
18A |
Toton |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
18A |
Toton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48640 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
18A |
Toton |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48200 |
18A |
Toton |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
16/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48618 |
18A |
Toton |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
16/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
48772 |
18A |
Toton |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
9G |
Gorton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48259 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48273 |
18A |
Toton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48698 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
18A |
Toton |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
9G |
Gorton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48115 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48118 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
16D |
Annesley |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48286 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
16D |
Annesley |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
18C |
Hasland |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48620 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48160 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48162 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55B |
Stourton |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48352 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48115 |
18A |
Toton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48148 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48491 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48553 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
9A |
Longsight |
8D |
Widnes |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48749 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
2E |
Warwick |
2E |
Northampton |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
8D |
Widnes |
8E |
Northwich |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
2E |
Warwick |
2E |
Northampton |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8D |
Widnes |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48308 |
6E |
Chester West |
8D |
Widnes |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48326 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8D |
Widnes |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48462 |
8D |
Widnes |
8E |
Northwich |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
8E |
Northwich |
8D |
Widnes |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15D |
Coalville |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15D |
Coalville |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
9G |
Northwich |
8D |
Widnes |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
8D |
Widnes |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48745 |
9A |
Longsight |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48249 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48260 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
3A |
Bescot |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48524 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
06/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
18B |
Westhouses |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
48638 |
18B |
Westhouses |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
48259 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
18C |
Hasland |
21B |
Bournville |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
15D |
Bedford |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
16D |
Annesley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
16D |
Annesley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
24/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
55D |
Royston |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
24/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48443 |
20B |
Stourton |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48494 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18C |
Hasland |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48495 |
18B |
Westhouses |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48101 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
48619 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15D |
Coalville |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48118 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55D |
Royston |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48162 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48182 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48270 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48537 |
20B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
21/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
48118 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
6E |
Chester West |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
6E |
Chester West |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48418 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
6E |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48251 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48438 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
25/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
48120 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2A |
Rugby |
|
09/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48695 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48056 |
17D |
Rowsley |
18C |
Hasland |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
17D |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48081 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48109 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
17B |
Burton |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
17B |
Burton |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48304 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48306 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
17C |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48324 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
18C |
Hasland |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48367 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48378 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
17B |
Burton |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48414 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
17D |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48495 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48616 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48638 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48662 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48694 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
17B |
Burton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48728 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
13/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
9G |
Northwich |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
41D |
Canklow |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48198 |
17E |
Heaton Mersey |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
8E |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48093 |
20C |
Royston |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
48169 |
20C |
Royston |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
18A |
Toton |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
17D |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48175 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48749 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48753 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
48771 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
6F |
Bidston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48263 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48289 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48291 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15D |
Coalville |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48644 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15D |
Coalville |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
6F |
Bidston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
3D |
Aston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48075 |
19C |
Canklow |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
29/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
19C |
Canklow |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48309 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48330 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48419 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48438 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48461 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48463 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48524 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48525 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48732 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48735 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48737 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48761 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48075 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48328 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48737 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48054 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48093 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55D |
Royston |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48124 |
15B |
Kettering |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
15B |
Kettering |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
15B |
Kettering |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48169 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55D |
Royston |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
16A |
Nottingham |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48511 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
4A |
Bletchley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8E |
Northwich |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
17C |
Rowsley |
18A |
Toton |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48187 |
18A |
Toton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
18A |
Toton |
18C |
Hasland |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
17C |
Rowsley |
18A |
Toton |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8D |
Widnes |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
9A |
Longsight |
8E |
Northwich |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
19/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
26/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
1A |
Willesden |
8E |
Northwich |
|
26/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
19C |
Canklow |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
41D |
Canklow |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18C |
Hasland |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48661 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
55B |
Stourton |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48075 |
56B |
Ardsley |
55B |
Stourton |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
55B |
Stourton |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55B |
Stourton |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48215 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18C |
Hasland |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48274 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55B |
Stourton |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48276 |
20B |
Stourton |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48358 |
20B |
Stourton |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48394 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55B |
Stourton |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
18C |
Hasland |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48608 |
20C |
Royston |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55B |
Stourton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48057 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48410 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48431 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48211 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
8E |
Northwich |
9A |
Longsight |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
13/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
20/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
8E |
Northwich |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
05/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
05/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48215 |
18C |
Hasland |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48027 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48001 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48119 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48156 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
16C |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
3A |
Bescot |
8E |
Northwich |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48272 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48277 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16C |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48405 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48541 |
16C |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48621 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48643 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48701 |
16D |
Mansfield |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
9A |
Longsight |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48437 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48558 |
8D |
Widnes |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
3A |
Bescot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
8E |
Northwich |
21B |
Bescot |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Northwich |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48742 |
9G |
Northwich |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
8D |
Widnes |
8E |
Northwich |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
8E |
Northwich |
8D |
Widnes |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
8E |
Northwich |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
9G |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48407 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48511 |
3A |
Bescot |
8E |
Northwich |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
41D |
Canklow |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48772 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
41D |
Canklow |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48502 |
8D |
Widnes |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
9A |
Longsight |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48054 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48264 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8E |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48625 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48627 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48753 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
3A |
Bescot |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
16A |
Nottingham |
18A |
Toton |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
8E |
Northwich |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48476 |
1A |
Willesden |
6F |
Bidston |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48627 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
18B |
Westhouses |
18A |
Toton |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48310 |
3A |
Bescot |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48437 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48646 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48631 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8D |
Widnes |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48434 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48437 |
8D |
Widnes |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/10/1960 |
Condemned |
48616 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
18A |
Toton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48255 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5C |
Stafford |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
8E |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48255 |
8E |
Northwich |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2E |
Northampton |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15D |
Coalville |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48687 |
21A |
Saltley |
15D |
Coalville |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48138 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48275 |
9A |
Longsight |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48389 |
9A |
Longsight |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
9A |
Longsight |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
9A |
Longsight |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
9A |
Longsight |
2E |
Northampton |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
9A |
Longsight |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
3A |
Bescot |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
2A |
Rugby |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
15B |
Kettering |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
48418 |
84E |
Tyseley |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48099 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
21A |
Saltley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
5B |
Crewe South |
81E |
Didcot |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
21A |
Saltley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48490 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48607 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48638 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48640 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48693 |
5B |
Crewe South |
81E |
Didcot |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48734 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21B |
Bescot |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48174 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5C |
Stafford |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
18A |
Toton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
5C |
Stafford |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
NTH |
Northwich |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
21B |
Bescot |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48330 |
87F |
Llanelli |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48360 |
2E |
Northampton |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
84E |
Tyseley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48695 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
18A |
Toton |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
1A |
Willesden |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
17A |
Derby |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
17A |
Derby |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48390 |
17A |
Derby |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48403 |
17A |
Derby |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
21A |
Saltley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
18A |
Toton |
21B |
Bescot |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
18A |
Toton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48144 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48189 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
18A |
Toton |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48695 |
18A |
Toton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
21B |
Bescot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
18A |
Toton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
18A |
Toton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48360 |
18A |
Toton |
2E |
Northampton |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48613 |
18A |
Toton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
48642 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
1A |
Willesden |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
1A |
Willesden |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
81E |
Didcot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48179 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48657 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
41D |
Canklow |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
8E |
Northwich |
8D |
Widnes |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48256 |
|
|
21B |
Bescot |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48262 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48294 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48427 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48476 |
6F |
Bidston |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48656 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48711 |
9G |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48520 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
21A |
Saltley |
18A |
Toton |
|
24/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
24/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
17C |
Rowsley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48246 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48276 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
21A |
Saltley |
15D |
Coalville |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48534 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48667 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48771 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
3D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
48181 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48330 |
21A |
Saltley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
15B |
Kettering |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48067 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55D |
Royston |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48159 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55D |
Royston |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48276 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48443 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55D |
Royston |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48330 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48459 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48542 |
20C |
Royston |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
20C |
Royston |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
20C |
Royston |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15B |
Kettering |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8D |
Widnes |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
48648 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48109 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48307 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
48737 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
8D |
Widnes |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
1E |
Bletchley |
21B |
Bescot |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
21A |
Saltley |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48555 |
NTH |
Northwich |
21B |
Bescot |
|
20/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15B |
Kettering |
|
20/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
2E |
Northampton |
21B |
Bescot |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
18A |
Toton |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48468 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
15B |
Kettering |
18A |
Toton |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
18A |
Toton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
17/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48404 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
48660 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
48118 |
18A |
Toton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
48194 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
48455 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
48625 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
21A |
Saltley |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
8D |
Widnes |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48188 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48303 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48332 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48512 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48746 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48530 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48636 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
2E |
Northampton |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
16A |
Nottingham |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8D |
Widnes |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48326 |
8D |
Widnes |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
5D |
Stoke |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48360 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48474 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48057 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
21A |
Saltley |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48195 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48196 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
8D |
Widnes |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48326 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48370 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
8D |
Widnes |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48522 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48615 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48620 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48625 |
21A |
Saltley |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
5C |
Stafford |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48747 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
5C |
Stafford |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
5C |
Stafford |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48089 |
18C |
Hasland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48658 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2E |
Northampton |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2E |
Northampton |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
16A |
Nottingham |
18A |
Toton |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
21A |
Saltley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48555 |
21B |
Bescot |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48435 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48065 |
18C |
Hasland |
17B |
Burton |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48089 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
25/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
56D |
Mirfield |
55D |
Royston |
|
01/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48078 |
20C |
Royston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
20C |
Royston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
20C |
Royston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48652 |
20B |
Stourton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
55B |
Stourton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48216 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48478 |
5B |
Crewe South |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48642 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
15B |
Kettering |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48056 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48057 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48064 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
15B |
Kettering |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48095 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48099 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
15B |
Kettering |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
21A |
Saltley |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
15B |
Kettering |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48304 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48312 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48324 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48378 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48494 |
18C |
Hasland |
18A |
Toton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48615 |
18B |
Westhouses |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
21A |
Saltley |
16D |
Annesley |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48740 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8E |
Northwich |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48326 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48512 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
48736 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48388 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48474 |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
21A |
Saltley |
16D |
Annesley |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
21A |
Saltley |
15B |
Kettering |
|
03/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48410 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18C |
Hasland |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48305 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48306 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
18A |
Toton |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
2C |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
2E |
Northampton |
21B |
Bescot |
|
17/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
84D |
Leamington |
|
17/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48420 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
17/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48463 |
87F |
Llanelli |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
2E |
Northampton |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48290 |
2E |
Northampton |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48422 |
2C |
Northampton |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
16D |
Annesley |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48103 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48150 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48181 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48213 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48346 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
19C |
Canklow |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48508 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48546 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48663 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
18A |
Toton |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
87F |
Llanelli |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
16D |
Annesley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48431 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
22/12/1962 |
Condemned |
48009 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48115 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48148 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48151 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48491 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
05/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48745 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48090 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
18A |
Toton |
16D |
Annesley |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48204 |
18A |
Toton |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
18A |
Toton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48140 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
16D |
Annesley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48179 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48385 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48386 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48699 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15D |
Coalville |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
5B |
Crewe South |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48774 |
98W |
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
98W |
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
02/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
17A |
Derby |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48387 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
18A |
Toton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
16D |
Annesley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
16D |
Annesley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
21A |
Saltley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Kettering |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48530 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Kettering |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
18C |
Hasland |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8D |
Widnes |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8E |
Northwich |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
84D |
Leamington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
23/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48474 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
23/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
23/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8D |
Widnes |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48095 |
18A |
Toton |
21A |
Saltley |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48133 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48271 |
18A |
Toton |
17B |
Burton |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48435 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
26F |
Patricroft |
8E |
Northwich |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
17C |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
27/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48557 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
8D |
Widnes |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
26F |
Patricroft |
16D |
Annesley |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48103 |
26F |
Patricroft |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
8E |
Northwich |
16D |
Annesley |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
16D |
Annesley |
8E |
Northwich |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48346 |
26F |
Patricroft |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48396 |
19C |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48615 |
16D |
Annesley |
8E |
Northwich |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48618 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48636 |
17A |
Derby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
8E |
Northwich |
16D |
Annesley |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48770 |
16D |
Annesley |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
48772 |
41D |
Canklow |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
01/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48136 |
SD |
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
8D |
Widnes |
|
15/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
87F |
Llanelli |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
21A |
Saltley |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48103 |
17A |
Derby |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
15B |
Kettering |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48367 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48611 |
15B |
Kettering |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48008 |
15B |
Kettering |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
5B |
Crewe South |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18A |
Toton |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48426 |
9G |
Northwich |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
17C |
Rowsley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48075 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48081 |
17C |
Rowsley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
17C |
Rowsley |
18A |
Toton |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48352 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48027 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
17C |
Rowsley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48094 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48654 |
17D |
Rowsley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/07/1963 |
Condemned |
48029 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
16D |
Annesley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
03/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
16D |
Annesley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
03/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48495 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
18C |
Hasland |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
5C |
Stafford |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
98W |
|
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48519 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48712 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
2B |
Bletchley |
1H |
Northampton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48080 |
55D |
Royston |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16A |
Toton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16A |
Toton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48248 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16A |
Toton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48449 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
1H |
Northampton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
5C |
Stafford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48472 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48516 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48548 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48555 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48602 |
3A |
Bescot |
5C |
Stafford |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48648 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
21/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
21B |
Bescot |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
2B |
Bletchley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
21B |
Bescot |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48420 |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
48600 |
1A |
Willesden |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48646 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48551 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48629 |
1A |
Willesden |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1F |
Rugby |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
8E |
Northwich |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
48652 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9M |
Bury |
|
16/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48103 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16C |
Derby |
|
16/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48099 |
16D |
Annesley |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48211 |
16A |
Nottingham |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48224 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
16A |
Nottingham |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48377 |
16A |
Nottingham |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48413 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48639 |
16A |
Nottingham |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2E |
Saltley |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48430 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48629 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2E |
Saltley |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48646 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2E |
Saltley |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
98W |
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48774 |
98W |
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
98W |
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
12/1963 |
Condemned |
48407 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48539 |
21A |
Saltley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48553 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48492 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Kettering |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Kettering |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Kettering |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15C |
Kettering |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48050 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
55D |
Royston |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48285 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48388 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48607 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48144 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48150 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48179 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48216 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48396 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48508 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1964 |
Condemned |
48772 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48224 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9M |
Bury |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48286 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48431 |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48551 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8E |
Northwich |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
01/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48110 |
84E |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48069 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48355 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48490 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Derby |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48384 |
18A |
Toton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48492 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48600 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48618 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
29/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
55D |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48251 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48291 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48398 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
18B |
Westhouses |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48101 |
21A |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48108 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
8D |
Widnes |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48218 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
9G |
Northwich |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
18B |
Westhouses |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48366 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
1A |
Willesden |
1F |
Rugby |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
1A |
Willesden |
1F |
Rugby |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48640 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8E |
Northwich |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48182 |
17B |
Burton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
5B |
Crewe South |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
17B |
Burton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
16A |
Nottingham |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48420 |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
COND |
|
04/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
08/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48524 |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48050 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48069 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48490 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
13/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48463 |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
16A |
Toton |
16C |
Derby |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48308 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48627 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48709 |
8D |
Widnes |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48140 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48209 |
19C |
Canklow |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48210 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48341 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1964 |
Condemned |
48642 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
COND |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48151 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48189 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48199 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48200 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48331 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48391 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48533 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48606 |
18A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48672 |
18A |
Toton |
15E |
Coalville |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16D |
Annesley |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
02/05/1964 |
Condemned |
48008 |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48064 |
16D |
Annesley |
16C |
Derby |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
18A |
Toton |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16F |
Burton |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48386 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48627 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16C |
Derby |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16F |
Burton |
|
04/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48172 |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
06/05/1964 |
Condemned |
48431 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16D |
Annesley |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48370 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48421 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48451 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48558 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/05/1964 |
Condemned |
48172 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
16/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16C |
Derby |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48116 |
18C |
Hasland |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48187 |
18C |
Hasland |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48359 |
18C |
Hasland |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
48774 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48274 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48131 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48246 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48371 |
18C |
Hasland |
9K |
Bolton |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48452 |
84E |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48468 |
98W |
|
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48495 |
18C |
Hasland |
9K |
Bolton |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48547 |
18C |
Hasland |
9K |
Bolton |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
1F |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48639 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
8E |
Northwich |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
2A |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48307 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48438 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
25/06/1964 |
Condemned |
48463 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48221 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Kettering |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48321 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48350 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Kettering |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48359 |
16A |
Toton |
16C |
Derby |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48372 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48612 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48637 |
18A |
Toton |
15C |
Kettering |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48672 |
15E |
Coalville |
16F |
Burton |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48758 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
04/07/1964 |
Condemned |
48306 |
18A |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16C |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48355 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48756 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48136 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48426 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48464 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48444 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
2A |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48148 |
26F |
Patricroft |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48295 |
8E |
Brunswick |
9K |
Bolton |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
16D |
Annesley |
16F |
Burton |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
16D |
Annesley |
16F |
Burton |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
8E |
Northwich |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48511 |
8E |
Northwich |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48653 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48666 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48702 |
8E |
Northwich |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48740 |
8E |
Northwich |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48309 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48409 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48461 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48525 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48732 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
24/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
48761 |
98S |
|
87F |
Llanelli |
|
09/1964 |
Condemned |
48657 |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48307 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48328 |
87F |
Llanelli |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
87F |
Llanelli |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48419 |
87F |
Llanelli |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48434 |
87F |
Llanelli |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48438 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48707 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48614 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48675 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48735 |
87F |
Llanelli |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48007 |
1A |
Willesden |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48020 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
15B |
Kettering |
16C |
Derby |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16F |
Burton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
15B |
Kettering |
16C |
Derby |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48350 |
15C |
Kettering |
16C |
Derby |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48354 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48369 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48380 |
15B |
Kettering |
15E |
Coalville |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16F |
Burton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
15B |
Kettering |
15E |
Coalville |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48478 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48521 |
9G |
Northwich |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48606 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16F |
Burton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16F |
Burton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48704 |
15B |
Kettering |
16C |
Derby |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
1H |
Northampton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48145 |
18A |
Toton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
18A |
Toton |
16C |
Derby |
|
26/09/1964 |
Condemned |
48654 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
48682 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
03/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48199 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
03/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48634 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
03/10/1964 |
Condemned |
48734 |
21B |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9M |
Bury |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48218 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48297 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48521 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9M |
Bury |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48682 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
17/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
17/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48397 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
17/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
16F |
Burton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48494 |
18A |
Toton |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48509 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48651 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
16F |
Burton |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48250 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
07/11/1964 |
Condemned |
48069 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48137 |
26C |
Bolton |
15E |
Coalville |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
16G |
Westhouses |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
9M |
Bury |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48205 |
18C |
Hasland |
9K |
Bolton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48221 |
15C |
Kettering |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48224 |
9M |
Bury |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48355 |
16G |
Westhouses |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15D |
Coalville |
15C |
Kettering |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48388 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15E |
Coalville |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
16D |
Nottingham |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48475 |
84E |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48490 |
16D |
Nottingham |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48607 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15E |
Coalville |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48611 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48623 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48648 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48701 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48704 |
16C |
Derby |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
3D |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48719 |
3D |
Aston |
2F |
Bescot |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
16C |
Derby |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
3D |
Aston |
2F |
Bescot |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48771 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48732 |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9G |
Gorton |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9G |
Gorton |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48318 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48542 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48689 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55B |
Stourton |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
17B |
Burton |
16C |
Derby |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15E |
Coalville |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15E |
Coalville |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48552 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15E |
Coalville |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
2A |
Rugby |
6E |
Oswestry |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48134 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
2A |
Rugby |
6E |
Oswestry |
|
28/11/1964 |
Condemned |
48455 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48539 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48665 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
9K |
Bolton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48114 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48125 |
18A |
Toton |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48187 |
16D |
Nottingham |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48379 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48494 |
16D |
Nottingham |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/12/1964 |
Condemned |
48611 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48675 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15E |
Coalville |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48073 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16C |
Derby |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48291 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48363 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Annesley |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48661 |
18A |
Toton |
16B |
Annesley |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
19/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48464 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
18A |
Toton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48361 |
18A |
Toton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
02/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48039 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
02/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48278 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48001 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48007 |
2F |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
1H |
Northampton |
2B |
Oxley |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
1H |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48120 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Oxley |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48147 |
2E |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48171 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48173 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48261 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48275 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48322 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
1H |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48354 |
1H |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48369 |
1H |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48416 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48658 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
1H |
Northampton |
2B |
Oxley |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
1F |
Rugby |
2B |
Oxley |
|
15/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48461 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48761 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15B |
Kettering |
15E |
Coalville |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
6E |
Oswestry |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
6E |
Oswestry |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48387 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48617 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15E |
Coalville |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48696 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15E |
Coalville |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
1H |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
30/01/1965 |
Condemned |
48006 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48171 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
48217 |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
48649 |
2A |
Rugby |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
8E |
Northwich |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/02/1965 |
Condemned |
48312 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
9G |
Northwich |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48518 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
1A |
Willesden |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48605 |
9G |
Northwich |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
8E |
Northwich |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/02/1965 |
Condemned |
48095 |
21A |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48134 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
1H |
Northampton |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48147 |
5D |
Stoke |
1H |
Northampton |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48658 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
2B |
Oxley |
2E |
Saltley |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
84E |
Tyseley |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48115 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48129 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
9G |
Gorton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48189 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48303 |
17B |
Burton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48457 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48476 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48546 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48127 |
15B |
Kettering |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48303 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48530 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48637 |
15C |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16F |
Burton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48694 |
17B |
Burton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48759 |
15B |
Kettering |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
20/03/1965 |
Condemned |
48027 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48464 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9G |
Gorton |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9G |
Gorton |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48557 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9G |
Gorton |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48735 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
8E |
Northwich |
|
26/03/1965 |
Condemned |
48409 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16D |
Nottingham |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48065 |
17B |
Burton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48093 |
55D |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48146 |
20C |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48221 |
9G |
Gorton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48274 |
55D |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48361 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48473 |
20C |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48528 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48637 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
48704 |
9G |
Gorton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48050 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48108 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48139 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48421 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48451 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48500 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48558 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48625 |
18B |
Westhouses |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
15D |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48106 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
16D |
Nottingham |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48184 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48333 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48469 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48523 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48638 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48652 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48763 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48116 |
16A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48221 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8E |
Northwich |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
16A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48290 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48326 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48414 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48422 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48479 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48605 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48623 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48647 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48648 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48685 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48698 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48704 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8L |
Aintree |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
24/04/1965 |
Condemned |
48430 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
48718 |
2E |
Saltley |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
01/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Annesley |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
15E |
Coalville |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
15E |
Coalville |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48116 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16A |
Toton |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48134 |
1H |
Northampton |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48147 |
1H |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16B |
Annesley |
|
08/05/1965 |
Condemned |
48419 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48658 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48671 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
15/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15E |
Coalville |
|
15/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48385 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1H |
Northampton |
|
15/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
1H |
Northampton |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48262 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48323 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48448 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48691 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48716 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48771 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
29/05/1965 |
Condemned |
48145 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
2A |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
1F |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48446 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
48559 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
29/05/1965 |
Condemned |
48733 |
3A |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48176 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
9G |
Gorton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48260 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48322 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48348 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48355 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48401 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48435 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48490 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48515 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48543 |
9G |
Gorton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48557 |
9G |
Gorton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48684 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48701 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48706 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
13/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48737 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48016 |
2B |
Oxley |
2E |
Saltley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48029 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48081 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48116 |
16A |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48120 |
2B |
Oxley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48163 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48211 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48218 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48221 |
8E |
Northwich |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48257 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48262 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48296 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48415 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48474 |
84E |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48506 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48601 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48618 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
5D |
Stoke |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48755 |
2B |
Oxley |
2E |
Saltley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48762 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
8E |
Northwich |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48183 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48259 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48285 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48290 |
8L |
Aintree |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48333 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48374 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48416 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48422 |
8L |
Aintree |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48451 |
8L |
Aintree |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
48478 |
2F |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48492 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48530 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48558 |
8L |
Aintree |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48607 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
8L |
Aintree |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
48759 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48037 |
16D |
Annesley |
16A |
Toton |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
16D |
Annesley |
16A |
Toton |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
16D |
Annesley |
16A |
Toton |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48148 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
16D |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
16D |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
16D |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48304 |
16D |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48324 |
16D |
Annesley |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48360 |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48363 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48661 |
16B |
Annesley |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
05/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48689 |
55B |
Stourton |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
1E |
Bletchley |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48207 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48301 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8L |
Aintree |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48374 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8E |
Northwich |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48427 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48534 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48549 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1H |
Northampton |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48610 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48656 |
1E |
Bletchley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48688 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1H |
Northampton |
|
11/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48660 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48184 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48658 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48002 |
1A |
Willesden |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
1A |
Willesden |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
1A |
Willesden |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48024 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48039 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48053 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48057 |
16D |
Annesley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
16A |
Toton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48081 |
1A |
Willesden |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
1A |
Willesden |
9K |
Bolton |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48097 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48099 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
16A |
Toton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48174 |
5C |
Stafford |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48189 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48251 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48297 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48305 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48324 |
16G |
Westhouses |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48363 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8L |
Aintree |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48398 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48446 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48502 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48518 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48602 |
5C |
Stafford |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48624 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48688 |
1H |
Northampton |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48743 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48774 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48088 |
9K |
Bolton |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48166 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48173 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48183 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
15E |
Coalville |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48403 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
48495 |
9K |
Bolton |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
48630 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48020 |
1H |
Northampton |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48056 |
18A |
Toton |
16F |
Burton |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
16C |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48073 |
16C |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48124 |
17A |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
16C |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
1H |
Northampton |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48310 |
9A |
Longsight |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48314 |
18A |
Toton |
16F |
Burton |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48353 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48378 |
16D |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48427 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48559 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48610 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48656 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48681 |
18A |
Toton |
16F |
Burton |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48738 |
2B |
Oxley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48769 |
3A |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
08/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48760 |
87F |
Llanelli |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48273 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48290 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48634 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48102 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48154 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48171 |
5D |
Stoke |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
1H |
Northampton |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48369 |
5D |
Stoke |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48371 |
9K |
Bolton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48386 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48389 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48549 |
1A |
Willesden |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48626 |
1A |
Willesden |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48716 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48719 |
2F |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
1H |
Northampton |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48743 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48078 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48122 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
16D |
Annesley |
16A |
Toton |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48147 |
5D |
Stoke |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48156 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48251 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48607 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
48653 |
16C |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48355 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48401 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48406 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48135 |
9G |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48429 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48490 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48704 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
9K |
Bolton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48057 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48198 |
17A |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48285 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48305 |
8E |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48365 |
10A |
Carnforth |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48374 |
8E |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48398 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48408 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48447 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48661 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48743 |
9K |
Bolton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
48748 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48094 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48295 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
48682 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48525 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
1A |
Willesden |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
1A |
Willesden |
2F |
Bescot |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48328 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48330 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
1A |
Willesden |
2F |
Bescot |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48349 |
2E |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48385 |
1H |
Northampton |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48440 |
1H |
Northampton |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48449 |
1H |
Northampton |
2F |
Bescot |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
1A |
Willesden |
2F |
Bescot |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
1A |
Willesden |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48527 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
1A |
Willesden |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
1H |
Northampton |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48603 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48628 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
1A |
Willesden |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
09/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48537 |
55D |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48558 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48670 |
20C |
Royston |
55B |
Stourton |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48064 |
16C |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48270 |
17A |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48284 |
16C |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
16C |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48627 |
16C |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
16C |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48124 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48138 |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
COND |
|
26/10/1965 |
Condemned |
48732 |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
15E |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
15E |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48388 |
15E |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48619 |
15D |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48644 |
15D |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
48699 |
15D |
Coalville |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/1965 |
Condemned |
48096 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
11/1965 |
Condemned |
48366 |
2F |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
11/1965 |
Condemned |
48413 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
COND |
|
06/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48004 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48137 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48171 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48380 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48552 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48617 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48687 |
15D |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48696 |
15E |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
13/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48112 |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48211 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48302 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48679 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
20/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48190 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48260 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48262 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
27/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48016 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
27/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
48668 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
27/11/1965 |
Condemned |
48759 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48255 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
04/12/1965 |
Condemned |
48314 |
16F |
Burton |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
15D |
Coalville |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48255 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48464 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48554 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
11/12/1965 |
Condemned |
48771 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
18B |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48270 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16C |
Derby |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48380 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Condemned |
48391 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48414 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Condemned |
48500 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
18B |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
18B |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Condemned |
48037 |
16A |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48137 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
16A |
Toton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
16A |
Toton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
16A |
Toton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48342 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48361 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48384 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48388 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
17A |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48535 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48552 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48614 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48617 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16F |
Burton |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48687 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48696 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48698 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
48699 |
16G |
Westhouses |
40E |
Colwick |
|
01/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48248 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
01/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48434 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48101 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48375 |
3A |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48522 |
21B |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
3A |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
08/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48134 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48369 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
08/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48515 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48539 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48120 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Colwick |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48207 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48246 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48302 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48383 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Colwick |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48685 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Colwick |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48713 |
3A |
Bescot |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48739 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48745 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48747 |
21B |
Bescot |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48766 |
3A |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
3A |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48109 |
21A |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48638 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48644 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48652 |
9K |
Bolton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48205 |
9K |
Bolton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48322 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48324 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48390 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
29/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48447 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48452 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1966 |
Condemned |
48555 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48652 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9K |
Bolton |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48615 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48662 |
17B |
Burton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
12/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48065 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48272 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48477 |
3A |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
12/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48479 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
12/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48543 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
13/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48608 |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
COND |
|
14/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48444 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48005 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48035 |
2B |
Oxley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2B |
Oxley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48089 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48141 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48175 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48181 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48199 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48310 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48343 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48377 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48423 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48441 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48477 |
2B |
Oxley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48523 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48684 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48691 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
26/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48331 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48357 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48358 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48691 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
26/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
26/02/1966 |
Condemned |
48762 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48003 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
16G |
Westhouses |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
05/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48627 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48633 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48713 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48151 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Northwich |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48203 |
2F |
Bescot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8L |
Aintree |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48256 |
21B |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48309 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48425 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9K |
Bolton |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48449 |
2F |
Bescot |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48514 |
3A |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48612 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
8L |
Aintree |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48694 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48706 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48760 |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48005 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48050 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48129 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48530 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48667 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48691 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48422 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
21B |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
3A |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Condemned |
48619 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48659 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48674 |
3A |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48680 |
21B |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
21B |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48726 |
21B |
Bescot |
2H |
Monument Lane |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48100 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48215 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48334 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48398 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48643 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48698 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48195 |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48250 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48277 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48428 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48010 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48077 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48090 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48203 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
8L |
Aintree |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48211 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48215 |
8E |
Northwich |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48322 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48458 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48647 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48718 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48749 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
48754 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
30/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48092 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
30/04/1966 |
Condemned |
48748 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48280 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48521 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
14/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48108 |
8L |
Aintree |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
14/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48188 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48064 |
16F |
Burton |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48472 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1966 |
Condemned |
48659 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48269 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48504 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9K |
Bolton |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48534 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9K |
Bolton |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48666 |
16C |
Derby |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48671 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48749 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
48753 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48054 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48263 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48264 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48289 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48320 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48445 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48456 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48686 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48751 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
11/06/1966 |
Condemned |
48118 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48254 |
16F |
Burton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48332 |
17B |
Burton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/06/1966 |
Condemned |
48426 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48492 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48606 |
16F |
Burton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
16F |
Burton |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
17B |
Burton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48194 |
17B |
Burton |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
18/06/1966 |
Condemned |
48541 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1966 |
Condemned |
48625 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
COND |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48082 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48165 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Condemned |
48511 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48528 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48545 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
8E |
Northwich |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
48637 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
02/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48291 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48215 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48079 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48137 |
40E |
Colwick |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48142 |
40E |
Colwick |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48264 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
40E |
Colwick |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
16/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48326 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
16/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48346 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48361 |
40E |
Colwick |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48432 |
40E |
Colwick |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48526 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48121 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
23/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48405 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48410 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
8L |
Aintree |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48424 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48459 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48468 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48550 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
48757 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
30/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48147 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48284 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48303 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1966 |
Condemned |
48621 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48178 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48371 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48536 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/08/1966 |
Condemned |
48554 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1966 |
Condemned |
48605 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48742 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
13/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48200 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
48415 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
48736 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48412 |
8L |
Aintree |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
48648 |
8L |
Aintree |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48101 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48254 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48263 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48342 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48367 |
17B |
Burton |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48404 |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48418 |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48428 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48457 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48520 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48526 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48606 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48629 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
48755 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48000 |
40E |
Colwick |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48056 |
16F |
Burton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
40E |
Colwick |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
16F |
Burton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48267 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48271 |
17B |
Burton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
03/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48286 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48382 |
40E |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48552 |
40E |
Colwick |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48614 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
16F |
Burton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
03/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48747 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48274 |
55B |
Stourton |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48311 |
20B |
Stourton |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48357 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48358 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48213 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48353 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48477 |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
40E |
Colwick |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
16F |
Burton |
16B |
Colwick |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48153 |
31E |
Dawsholm |
2E |
Saltley |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48155 |
9G |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48186 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48194 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48225 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48258 |
40E |
Colwick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48272 |
16G |
Westhouses |
8E |
Northwich |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48296 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48339 |
21A |
Saltley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
16F |
Burton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48385 |
2E |
Saltley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48635 |
16F |
Burton |
16B |
Colwick |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48651 |
16F |
Burton |
16B |
Colwick |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48672 |
16F |
Burton |
16B |
Colwick |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48726 |
2H |
Monument Lane |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48002 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48083 |
17A |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48149 |
16G |
Westhouses |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48219 |
16G |
Westhouses |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48350 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48370 |
16C |
Derby |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
40E |
Colwick |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48512 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48628 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
48680 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48681 |
16F |
Burton |
8E |
Northwich |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48699 |
40E |
Colwick |
8E |
Northwich |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
48728 |
17B |
Burton |
16B |
Colwick |
|
10/1966 |
Condemned |
48251 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
10/1966 |
Condemned |
48318 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
10/1966 |
Condemned |
48670 |
55B |
Stourton |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48270 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
01/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48359 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48103 |
16C |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48127 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48137 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48160 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48186 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48196 |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48339 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48361 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48394 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48397 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48414 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48432 |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48537 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48623 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48635 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48721 |
20B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48349 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48388 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48011 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48073 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48083 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48111 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48143 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48164 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
18B |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48223 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48224 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48266 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48289 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48332 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48370 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48381 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48411 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48417 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48600 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48620 |
18B |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48662 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48666 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48671 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48679 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48700 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48708 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48714 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48743 |
9J |
Agecroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48745 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48763 |
16G |
Westhouses |
16B |
Colwick |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48225 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48289 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48475 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48514 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
48527 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
11/1966 |
Condemned |
48080 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
COND |
|
11/1966 |
Condemned |
48443 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48146 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
05/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48473 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48045 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48083 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48119 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48124 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48143 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
40E |
Colwick |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48178 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48214 |
16B |
Colwick |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48223 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48282 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48304 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48380 |
40E |
Colwick |
9K |
Bolton |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48384 |
40E |
Colwick |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
40E |
Colwick |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48600 |
16B |
Colwick |
8L |
Aintree |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48620 |
16B |
Colwick |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48662 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48672 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
16B |
Colwick |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
48763 |
16B |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
15/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48641 |
20B |
Stourton |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48139 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48354 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48462 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48686 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48142 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48370 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48502 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48600 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
48651 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48076 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55D |
Royston |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48133 |
21A |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48255 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48375 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48385 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48522 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48663 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48664 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55D |
Royston |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48060 |
40E |
Colwick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48073 |
16B |
Colwick |
2E |
Saltley |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
16B |
Colwick |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
2E |
Saltley |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48249 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
40E |
Colwick |
8L |
Aintree |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48332 |
16B |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48350 |
16B |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48510 |
40E |
Colwick |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48604 |
16B |
Colwick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
40E |
Colwick |
2E |
Saltley |
|
17/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48088 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48270 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
40E |
Colwick |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
17/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48372 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
48612 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48219 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48516 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48079 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48412 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48668 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
48738 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48146 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
07/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48187 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
07/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48313 |
40E |
Colwick |
9K |
Bolton |
|
07/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48359 |
16B |
Colwick |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
07/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48609 |
16B |
Colwick |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
07/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48711 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
07/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48756 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48149 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48185 |
16B |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
14/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48376 |
16B |
Colwick |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
14/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48617 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
14/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48673 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48536 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
48739 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48084 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48093 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48126 |
20B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48130 |
55B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48202 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48265 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48276 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48622 |
20B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48687 |
40E |
Colwick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
48703 |
20B |
Stourton |
55D |
Royston |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48105 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
40E |
Colwick |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48153 |
2E |
Saltley |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48177 |
16B |
Colwick |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48180 |
40E |
Colwick |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
40E |
Colwick |
8L |
Aintree |
|
04/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48221 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48517 |
2E |
Saltley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48538 |
16B |
Colwick |
2E |
Saltley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48646 |
2E |
Saltley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48674 |
2B |
Oxley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48685 |
16B |
Colwick |
8E |
Northwich |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48690 |
16B |
Colwick |
2E |
Saltley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48696 |
40E |
Colwick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48705 |
2B |
Oxley |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48728 |
16B |
Colwick |
2E |
Saltley |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
2B |
Oxley |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48130 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48185 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
40E |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
11/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48098 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48122 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48199 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8L |
Aintree |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48343 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48395 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48440 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48442 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
48492 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48545 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48288 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48751 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
48766 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
2E |
Saltley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48665 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48701 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48705 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48035 |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
2B |
Oxley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48073 |
2E |
Saltley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48098 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48105 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48128 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48136 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48177 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48180 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48220 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48301 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48351 |
21A |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
2B |
Oxley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48453 |
5D |
Stoke |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48460 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48474 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48531 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48538 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48548 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48603 |
2E |
Saltley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48645 |
2E |
Saltley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48655 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48690 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48724 |
2B |
Oxley |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48725 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48728 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48753 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48767 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48123 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48000 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48036 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48053 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48165 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48320 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48379 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48513 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48547 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
2E |
Saltley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48632 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8E |
Northwich |
|
25/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48090 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
25/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48152 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
25/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
48551 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
25/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48743 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1967 |
Condemned |
48159 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48114 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
48347 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8E |
Northwich |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48459 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48494 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48717 |
13D |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48073 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48316 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48458 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48770 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48082 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48548 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48707 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48708 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48121 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48685 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48693 |
81E |
Didcot |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48075 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48126 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48174 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
8L |
Aintree |
8E |
Northwich |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48256 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48417 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
48421 |
8L |
Aintree |
8E |
Northwich |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48552 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
48604 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48141 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48247 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48435 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48466 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
09/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48157 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48057 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48363 |
8L |
Aintree |
8E |
Northwich |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48451 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48509 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48640 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48650 |
8L |
Aintree |
8E |
Northwich |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48712 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48449 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48617 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8E |
Northwich |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8E |
Northwich |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8E |
Northwich |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
48750 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8E |
Northwich |
|
27/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48011 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48128 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48131 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48645 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Condemned |
48754 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
03/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48012 |
5D |
Stoke |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48085 |
5D |
Stoke |
8E |
Northwich |
|
08/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48265 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48018 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48287 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48603 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48643 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48712 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48017 |
8L |
Aintree |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48163 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48266 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48268 |
8L |
Aintree |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
8L |
Aintree |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48315 |
8L |
Aintree |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48324 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
8L |
Aintree |
8E |
Northwich |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48393 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48666 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
8L |
Aintree |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48730 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48106 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48153 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48162 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48202 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48275 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48279 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48394 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48468 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
48542 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48544 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48556 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48614 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
48676 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48110 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
01/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48287 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
05/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48454 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48269 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48411 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48557 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48602 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
48055 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55D |
Royston |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
48276 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55D |
Royston |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
48454 |
98W |
|
55D |
Royston |
|
15/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48501 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48709 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48104 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48154 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48376 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48648 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48681 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48347 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48613 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1967 |
Condemned |
48160 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48176 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48315 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48528 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48671 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48085 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48271 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48364 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48368 |
5D |
Stoke |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48505 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48522 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48535 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48559 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9K |
Bolton |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48655 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48669 |
5D |
Stoke |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48695 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48697 |
5D |
Stoke |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48768 |
5D |
Stoke |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48061 |
5D |
Stoke |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48074 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48194 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48204 |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48252 |
5B |
Crewe South |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48261 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48375 |
5D |
Stoke |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48384 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
48450 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48522 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48556 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48650 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48768 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48258 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48386 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48464 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
48731 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48108 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48208 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48220 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48322 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48456 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48636 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48725 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48742 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48281 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48054 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48158 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48161 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48283 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48337 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48395 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48399 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48721 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48313 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48350 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48359 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48364 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48375 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48460 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48474 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48531 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48637 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48675 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48699 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48767 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48710 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48061 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48171 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48374 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
23/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48400 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
23/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48451 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48618 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48703 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48100 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48218 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48450 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48506 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
48550 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48113 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48294 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48373 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48519 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
14/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48062 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48166 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48279 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48371 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48735 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
18/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48067 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48018 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48164 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48377 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48495 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48505 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48534 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48676 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48125 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48268 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48332 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48382 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48724 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48741 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1967 |
Condemned |
48537 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48017 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48055 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48070 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48076 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48084 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48093 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48169 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48201 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48222 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48224 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48276 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48292 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48352 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48425 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48439 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48473 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48540 |
20C |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48622 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48664 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48669 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48673 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48714 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48024 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48307 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48369 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48408 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48470 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48211 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48336 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48351 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48363 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48402 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48436 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9K |
Bolton |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48438 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
48729 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48074 |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48214 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48381 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
48470 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48119 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48517 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48033 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48117 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48132 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48153 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48167 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48193 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48206 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48278 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48325 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48336 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48338 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48362 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48410 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48614 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48678 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
48764 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48469 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48757 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48764 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48190 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48205 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48362 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48402 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48436 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48674 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48697 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48729 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48758 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48310 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
48696 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48046 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48107 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48192 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48193 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48200 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48253 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48278 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48335 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48345 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48476 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
48507 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48559 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48046 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48151 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48200 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48305 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48609 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48677 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48010 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48351 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48510 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48626 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48750 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
48334 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48026 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48063 |
8E |
Northwich |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48090 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48212 |
8E |
Northwich |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48421 |
8E |
Northwich |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Northwich |
|
03/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48639 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
03/02/1968 |
Reallocation |
48683 |
8E |
Northwich |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48421 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48492 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48683 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48424 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1968 |
Condemned |
48631 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48272 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48304 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48307 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48345 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48442 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48468 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48503 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48544 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48617 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48632 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48036 |
8E |
Northwich |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48063 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48077 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48201 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48317 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48327 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
8E |
Northwich |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48344 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48465 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48471 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
8E |
Northwich |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48507 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48532 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48700 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48722 |
8E |
Northwich |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48727 |
8E |
Northwich |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48740 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48744 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48763 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48111 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48153 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48224 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48317 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48465 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48532 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48553 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48744 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
23/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48081 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
23/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48117 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48012 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48192 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48197 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48335 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9K |
Bolton |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48344 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
48392 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9K |
Bolton |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48437 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1968 |
Condemned |
48749 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
06/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48090 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
06/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48107 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
06/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48433 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48441 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48308 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48453 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48763 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48060 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48197 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48292 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48471 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48614 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1968 |
Condemned |
48684 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48045 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48056 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48124 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48182 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48206 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48252 |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48322 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48325 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48329 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48365 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48445 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48451 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48551 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48702 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48745 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48115 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48168 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48170 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48191 |
17E |
Heaton Mersey |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48267 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48278 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48293 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48294 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48319 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48356 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48374 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48390 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48467 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48493 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48529 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48546 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48549 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48665 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48687 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48692 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48715 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48720 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48722 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48723 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48746 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48752 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
48765 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
18/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48533 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48267 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48380 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48384 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48549 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48646 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48687 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1968 |
Condemned |
48746 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48282 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48327 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48338 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48374 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48467 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48026 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48132 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48212 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48293 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48321 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48373 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48392 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48504 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48033 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48168 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48170 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48319 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48323 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48356 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48368 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48369 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48491 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48529 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48612 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48620 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48652 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48678 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48692 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
48720 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
06/07/1968 |
Condemned |
48115 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
48340 |
9K |
Bolton |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/07/1968 |
Condemned |
48546 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
48665 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
48773 |
9K |
Bolton |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
48775 |
9H |
Patricroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
48257 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1968 |
Condemned |
48448 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48062 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48167 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48191 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48247 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48253 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48278 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48294 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48340 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48348 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48393 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48400 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48410 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48423 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48493 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48519 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48665 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48666 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48715 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48723 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48727 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48730 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48752 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48765 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48775 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48476 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
48773 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|