Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6079 Week
» 12213 Month
» 240097 Year
» 1461662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "8F" Class 2-8-0


Class LMS WD LNER (1924) LNER (1946) LNER (1947) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
8F 8000         48000 06/1935 16C
18A
21A
16A
21A
16A
21A
17B
16C
40E
9B
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Saltley
Nottingham
Saltley
Nottingham
Saltley
Burton
Derby
Colwick
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1958
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
12/03/1960
17/09/1960
06/04/1963
22/06/1963
21/11/1964
25/12/1965
03/09/1966
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8001         48001 06/1935 20A
17A
20A
16D
16B
W
Holbeck (MR)
Derby
Holbeck (MR)
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
22/03/1952
30/01/1954
09/04/1960
09/01/1965
09/01/1965
8F 8002         48002 07/1935 18A
18A
17B
18C
21B
21A
17A
15B
16A
16D
2F
1A
10D
W
Toton
Toton
Burton
Hasland
Bournville
Saltley
Derby
Kettering
Nottingham
Annesley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
03/01/1953
05/10/1957
10/01/1959
07/03/1959
11/04/1959
04/03/1961
16/09/1961
22/09/1962
16/02/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
24/09/1966
24/09/1966
8F 8003         48003 06/1935 16A
16C
W
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
05/03/1966
05/03/1966
8F 8004         48004 06/1935 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1965
06/11/1965
8F 8005         48005 06/1935 20G
17A
20A
20B
16A
17A
15B
16D
17C
2F
1A
10C
9F
W
Hellifield
Derby
Holbeck (MR)
Stourton
Nottingham
Derby
Kettering
Annesley
Rowsley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Fleetwood
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
22/03/1952
04/10/1952
08/10/1955
06/10/1956
04/03/1961
22/09/1962
08/12/1962
13/07/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
19/02/1966
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8006         48006 09/1935 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1965
30/01/1965
8F 8007         48007 09/1935 16C
15C
15A
15B
14A
18A
21A
16D
2F
1A
2F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Kettering
Cricklewood East
Toton
Saltley
Annesley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
26/03/1960
24/09/1960
17/12/1960
16/09/1961
09/12/1961
13/10/1962
16/02/1963
25/04/1964
19/09/1964
09/01/1965
09/01/1965
8F 8008         48008 10/1935 17C
15A
16A
16B
17C
15B
18B
W
Coalville
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rowsley
Kettering
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
26/03/1955
25/02/1956
23/05/1959
01/07/1961
29/06/1963
02/05/1964
02/05/1964
8F 8009         48009 10/1935 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1962
22/12/1962
8F 8010         48010 10/1935 21A
15C
15A
21A
2F
1A
8C
9D
W
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Saltley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Speke Junction
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1956
26/03/1960
09/02/1963
16/02/1963
19/06/1965
12/03/1966
23/04/1966
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
8F 8011         48011 10/1935 18B
9G
17A
19C
16B
16D
2F
1A
9L
9K
9J
9H
W
Westhouses
Northwich
Derby
Canklow
Kirkby in Ashfield
Annesley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Agecroft
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
26/01/1952
01/01/1955
09/01/1960
22/09/1962
03/08/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
31/07/1965
18/09/1965
22/10/1966
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
8F   70577       48012 12/1936 5B
2E
2E
2A
5B
5D
8A
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Warwick
Northampton
Rugby
Crewe South
Stoke
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
14/01/1950
15/11/1958
21/02/1959
09/01/1965
30/01/1965
03/06/1967
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F   70591       48016 01/1937 2A
2B
1H
2B
2E
W
Rugby
Bletchley
Northampton
Oxley
Saltley
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
17/06/1950
14/09/1963
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
27/11/1965
27/11/1965
8F 8017         48017 01/1937 19A
6B
8D
8E
8H
8L
8A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Mold Junction
Widnes
Northwich
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
31/10/1953
15/11/1958
13/02/1965
17/04/1965
17/06/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F   70582       48018 02/1937 5B
2E
2E
2A
1H
5D
5B
6A
5B
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Warwick
Northampton
Rugby
Northampton
Stoke
Crewe South
Chester (MR)
Crewe South
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
14/01/1950
15/11/1958
07/03/1959
01/08/1964
09/01/1965
11/03/1967
15/04/1967
10/06/1967
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F   70579       48020 02/1937 5B
2D
2B
6C
6D
1H
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Nuneaton
Bletchley
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Northampton
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
17/06/1950
28/09/1963
05/10/1963
19/09/1964
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8024         48024 03/1937 15A
15B
16D
16A
16D
16D
15A
16B
16E
10F
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Mansfield
Nottingham
Annesley
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
19/06/1954
20/06/1959
22/09/1962
09/05/1964
27/03/1965
08/05/1965
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
11/11/1967
11/11/1967
8F 8026         48026 04/1937 19C
41E
8A
8C
9J
9D
9K
W
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Agecroft
Newton Heath
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
25/04/1964
19/09/1964
10/10/1964
04/06/1966
03/02/1968
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8027         48027 07/1936 16C
15C
15A
2F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
26/03/1960
20/07/1963
20/03/1965
20/03/1965
8F 8029         48029 08/1936 16C
41D
41E
8A
W
24J
8C
8A
8C
Kirkby in Ashfield
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
Lancaster Green Ayre
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
02/04/1960
20/07/1963
27/07/1963
07/09/1963
24/10/1964
06/03/1965
19/06/1965
27/07/1963
8F 8033         48033 08/1936 18A
18A
17B
18A
18D
18A
14A
18A
15B
18A
18B
8H
8F
9H
W
Toton
Toton
Burton
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Kettering
Toton
Westhouses
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
24/02/1951
19/05/1951
11/07/1953
28/12/1957
14/06/1958
23/05/1959
23/01/1960
19/03/1960
18/06/1960
14/03/1964
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8035         48035 08/1936 16D
15B
15A
21A
2A
5B
1G
2F
2B
2A
W
Mansfield
Kettering
Wellingborough
Saltley
Rugby
Crewe South
Woodford Halse
Bescot
Oxley
Tyseley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
21/04/1956
16/06/1956
16/06/1957
09/01/1965
01/05/1965
19/06/1965
03/01/1966
19/02/1966
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8036         48036 08/1936 16C
2A
2B
26A
1A
5B
1A
5B
8E
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rugby
Bletchley
Newton Heath
Willesden
Crewe South
Willesden
Crewe South
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
17/06/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
09/01/1965
20/02/1965
08/05/1965
18/03/1967
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8037         48037 09/1936 18A
18B
18A
15A
18A
18B
18D
18B
18D
41B
41E
26F
16D
16A
W
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Westhouses
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Annesley
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
28/11/1953
25/02/1956
24/03/1956
21/04/1956
16/06/1956
06/10/1956
29/12/1956
20/06/1959
11/07/1959
08/12/1962
25/05/1963
03/07/1965
25/12/1965
25/12/1965
8F   70588       48039 09/1936 2A
8C
8D
8E
9L
10D
W
Rugby
Speke Junction
Widnes
Northwich
Buxton (LNWR)
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
29/11/1952
30/01/1960
28/05/1960
22/08/1964
02/01/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F   70573       48045 09/1936 NTH
18A
8E
8D
6B
8C
8D
8B
16D
16G
16E
8A
W
Northwich
Toton
Northwich
Widnes
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Nottingham
Westhouses
Kirkby in Ashfield
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
11/02/1961
29/04/1961
10/06/1961
05/05/1962
07/07/1962
16/03/1963
11/01/1964
14/03/1964
10/04/1965
23/10/1965
12/11/1966
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F   70599       48046 09/1936 NTH
8A
9G
6C
6G
6B
8C
16D
16G
9D
9K
W
Northwich
Edge Hill
Northwich
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Nottingham
Westhouses
Newton Heath
Bolton
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
11/08/1951
06/10/1951
20/06/1959
07/11/1959
08/07/1961
07/07/1962
28/03/1964
10/04/1965
05/03/1966
06/01/1968
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8050         48050 10/1936 15A
15B
15B
8B
8L
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Wellingborough
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
18/01/1964
11/04/1964
03/04/1965
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8053         48053 10/1936 18D
18A
17B
15A
20C
15A
16A
15D
15A
8G
16B
16E
10F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Burton
Wellingborough
Royston
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
24/02/1951
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
06/11/1954
26/03/1955
22/11/1958
10/04/1965
17/04/1965
08/05/1965
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8054         48054 10/1936 18D
8C
6B
2B
9E
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Nuneaton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
07/11/1959
18/06/1960
04/06/1966
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8055         48055 10/1936 20H
19C
20D
56A
55B
56D
56A
55D
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Canklow
Normanton
Wakefield
Stourton
Mirfield
Wakefield
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/08/1954
20/07/1957
21/09/1957
23/01/1960
28/01/1967
15/07/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8056         48056 10/1936 18B
17D
18C
18A
16F
8A
W
Westhouses
Rowsley
Hasland
Toton
Burton
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
23/05/1959
22/09/1962
07/08/1965
03/09/1966
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8057         48057 10/1936 18B
18A
17A
16D
10F
8E
W
Westhouses
Toton
Derby
Annesley
Rose Grove
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1960
23/06/1962
22/09/1962
24/07/1965
18/09/1965
13/05/1967
13/05/1967
8F 8060         48060 10/1936 18B
18A
17A
15B
16C
16G
40E
8C
W
Westhouses
Toton
Derby
Kettering
Derby
Westhouses
Colwick
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1959
20/01/1962
09/03/1963
19/09/1964
07/08/1965
18/12/1965
10/12/1966
20/04/1968
20/04/1968
8F   70614       48061 11/1936 6C
2D
15B
18A
15C
15A
2F
2F
2B
2A
2B
5D
10F
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Kettering
Toton
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Bescot
Oxley
Tyseley
Oxley
Stoke
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
31/10/1953
30/01/1954
19/06/1954
26/03/1960
20/07/1963
19/06/1965
03/01/1966
19/02/1966
12/11/1966
11/03/1967
19/08/1967
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
8F 8062         48062 11/1936 20C
14A
15A
14A
18A
2A
9D
10D
8H
10H
10F
10D
10F
W
Royston
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Toton
Rugby
Buxton (LNWR)
Lostock Hall
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lower Darwen
Rose Grove
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
03/12/1955
31/12/1955
23/05/1959
29/10/1960
17/12/1960
09/01/1965
06/02/1965
22/05/1965
27/11/1965
16/07/1966
14/10/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8063         48063 11/1936 18B
17D
16B
15E
16E
8E
9F
W
Westhouses
Rowsley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1957
23/05/1959
12/12/1964
08/05/1965
18/02/1967
03/02/1968
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8064         48064 11/1936 16A
16D
16C
16F
W
Nottingham
Annesley
Derby
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
02/05/1964
16/10/1965
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
8F 8065         48065 11/1936 19C
18C
17B
15A
W
Canklow
Hasland
Burton
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
18/08/1962
27/03/1965
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
8F 8067         48067 11/1936 15B
15B
55D
W
Kettering
Kettering
Royston
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
18/10/1967
18/10/1967
8F 8069         48069 11/1936 12A
15B
15B
16E
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Kettering
Wellingborough
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
15/02/1964
11/04/1964
07/11/1964
07/11/1964
8F 8070         48070 11/1936 18A
20C
W
Toton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8073         48073 12/1936 20A
16C
16G
16B
2E
6A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Derby
Westhouses
Colwick
Saltley
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1964
07/08/1965
22/10/1966
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
08/04/1967
08/04/1967
8F 8074         48074 12/1936 16C
12B
1A
1E
8C
6B
2B
2A
2B
9E

W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Carlisle Canal
Willesden
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Nuneaton
Rugby
Nuneaton
Trafford Park (LMS)

Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
16/06/1951
20/06/1959
22/08/1959
07/11/1959
18/06/1960
07/07/1962
16/03/1963
04/06/1966
19/08/1967
25/11/1967
25/11/1967
8F 8075         48075 12/1936 18A
19C
56A
56B
55B
55D
W
Toton
Canklow
Wakefield
Ardsley
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1955
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
23/01/1960
13/07/1963
24/04/1967
24/04/1967
8F 8076         48076 12/1936 18A
18B
20D
56A
55B
56D
55D
55C
55D
W
Toton
Westhouses
Normanton
Wakefield
Stourton
Mirfield
Royston
Farnley Junction
Royston
Withdrawn
12/1936
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
20/07/1957
21/09/1957
23/01/1960
25/08/1962
18/01/1964
03/12/1966
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F   70611       48077 12/1936 5B
2D
1A
1E
10J
10D
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Nuneaton
Willesden
Bletchley
Lancaster Green Ayre
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
04/08/1962
19/01/1963
10/07/1965
23/04/1966
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8078         48078 12/1936 18A
12A
20C
20C
8A
W
Toton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Royston
Royston
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
12/1936
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
01/09/1962
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
8F 8079         48079 12/1936 18A
12A
20C
15B
16D
16A
10D
10J
10D
10F
W
Toton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Royston
Kettering
Annesley
Toton
Lostock Hall
Lancaster Green Ayre
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
12/1936
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
04/03/1961
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
13/11/1965
23/04/1966
16/07/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
8F 8080         48080 12/1936 18A
12A
20C
20C
56F
55B
55D
55C
W
Toton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Royston
Royston
Low Moor
Stourton
Royston
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
12/1936
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
14/06/1958
23/01/1960
13/07/1963
14/09/1963
11/1966
11/1966
8F 8081         48081 01/1937 18D
20F
17C
2F
1A
10F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Skipton
Rowsley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/1937
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
13/07/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
23/03/1968
23/03/1968
8F 8082         48082 01/1937 15A
18A
18B
18C
18A
15C
15B
16E
15B
15A
8F
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Hasland
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Kirkby in Ashfield
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
13/08/1955
16/06/1956
22/09/1962
11/01/1964
15/02/1964
11/04/1964
18/04/1964
26/06/1965
25/06/1966
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
8F 8083         48083 01/1937 18B
18B
19C
17A
16G
16B
W
Westhouses
Westhouses
Canklow
Derby
Westhouses
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/1937
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
30/01/1954
24/09/1966
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8084         48084 01/1937 20D
56A
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
21/09/1957
28/01/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8085         48085 01/1937 12A
20C
2A
5B
1A
1E
8H
2E
5D
8E
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Royston
Rugby
Crewe South
Willesden
Bletchley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Saltley
Stoke
Northwich
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
17/09/1960
23/06/1962
15/12/1962
05/10/1963
30/11/1963
03/12/1966
03/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
8F 8088         48088 01/1937 12A
16D
16B
17C
2F
1A
9K
9L
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rowsley
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Bolton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
27/04/1963
20/07/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
31/07/1965
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
8F 8089         48089 01/1937 19D
18C
15A
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Hasland
Wellingborough
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/02/1958
07/07/1962
18/08/1962
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
8F 8090         48090 01/1937 20A
6B
6A
9D
9K
W
Holbeck (MR)
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Newton Heath
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/01/1963
23/04/1966
25/03/1967
03/02/1968
06/04/1968
06/04/1968
8F 8092         48092 02/1937 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/04/1966
30/04/1966
8F 8093         48093 02/1937 12A
21A
56D
55D
55B
55D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Saltley
Mirfield
Royston
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
27/06/1959
07/11/1959
27/03/1965
28/01/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F   70606       48094 02/1937 5B
8C
8B
6C
6B
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
31/10/1953
25/02/1956
29/09/1962
20/07/1963
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
8F 8095         48095 02/1937 20C
18C
18A
21A
W
Royston
Hasland
Toton
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
22/09/1962
06/04/1963
20/02/1965
20/02/1965
8F 8096         48096 12/1938 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1965
11/1965
8F 8097         48097 12/1938 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8098         48098 01/1939 16C
8C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8099         48099 01/1939 19D
18A
16A
16D
10C
W
Heaton Mersey
Toton
Nottingham
Annesley
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1958
07/01/1961
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8100         48100 01/1939 16C
8E
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/04/1966
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
8F 8101         48101 01/1939 16C
21A
2F
2E
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Saltley
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1959
14/03/1964
03/01/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8102         48102 01/1939 18B
16B
W
Westhouses
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
8F 8103         48103 02/1939 20C
18D
26F
17A
16B
16C
W
Royston
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
08/12/1962
25/05/1963
22/06/1963
16/11/1963
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8104         48104 02/1939 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1967
17/07/1967
8F 8105         48105 02/1939 19A
18A
21A
16B
15E
16E
2B
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Toton
Saltley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
07/02/1959
07/01/1961
21/11/1964
08/05/1965
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8106         48106 02/1939 17C
6B
6C
9D
6C
8B
1A
8B
9D
9M
9K
W
Coalville
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Buxton (LNWR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Newton Heath
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
04/12/1954
25/02/1956
19/05/1956
17/05/1958
18/02/1961
06/05/1961
30/11/1963
10/10/1964
10/04/1965
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8107         48107 02/1939 17C
15A
18A
15C
15A
14A
15B
15E
15A
40E
9B
9F
W
Coalville
Wellingborough
Toton
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
27/03/1954
19/06/1954
26/03/1960
16/07/1960
28/10/1961
23/01/1965
22/05/1965
18/12/1965
17/09/1966
06/01/1968
06/04/1968
06/04/1968
8F 8108         48108 02/1939 16C
16D
16A
8B
8L
9L
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
08/08/1953
14/03/1964
03/04/1965
14/05/1966
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8109         48109 02/1939 16C
18A
21A
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
09/12/1961
22/01/1966
22/01/1966
8F 8110         48110 02/1939 20A
1A
26A
84G
82E
82E
84E
5D
W
Holbeck (MR)
Willesden
Newton Heath
Shrewsbury
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Tyseley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
15/12/1962
12/01/1963
22/06/1963
08/02/1964
01/07/1967
01/07/1967
8F 8111         48111 03/1939 18D
15A
16A
5B
2B
9J
9K
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Agecroft
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
02/01/1954
10/08/1957
15/08/1959
04/06/1966
22/10/1966
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8112         48112 03/1939 18A
15A
18A
18B
W
Toton
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1956
24/03/1956
19/05/1956
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
8F 8113         48113 03/1939 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1967
02/10/1967
8F 8114         48114 03/1939 2C
16C
8F
W
Northampton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
03/1939
01/01/1948
05/12/1964
01/04/1967
01/04/1967
8F 8115         48115 04/1939 2E
18B
18A
26A
26F
9F
10F
W
Warwick
Westhouses
Toton
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
04/1939
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
25/10/1958
05/01/1963
06/03/1965
11/05/1968
06/07/1968
06/07/1968
8F 8116         48116 04/1939 5B
19A
18C
16A
15A
16A
W
Crewe South
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Hasland
Toton
Leicester Midland
Toton
Withdrawn
04/1939
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
30/05/1964
17/04/1965
08/05/1965
19/06/1965
19/06/1965
8F 8117         48117 04/1939 18A
16A
15A
14A
16D
16F
16B
8F
9F
W
Toton
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Burton
Colwick
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1955
25/06/1960
09/07/1960
22/09/1962
15/08/1964
17/09/1966
10/12/1966
09/12/1967
23/03/1968
23/03/1968
8F 8118         48118 04/1939 18B
18A
15C
18A
8E
W
Westhouses
Toton
Leicester Midland
Toton
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
07/03/1959
21/03/1959
07/04/1962
11/06/1966
11/06/1966
8F 8119         48119 05/1939 18A
16B
8A
W
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
12/11/1966
02/12/1967
02/12/1967
8F 8120         48120 05/1939 18D
3A
6C
2A
2B
6B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Bescot
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rugby
Oxley
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
23/02/1957
25/04/1959
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
8F 8121         48121 05/1939 20A
18A
17A
2F
1A
2C
8G
W
Holbeck (MR)
Toton
Derby
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Stourbridge Junction
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
24/03/1951
02/02/1963
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
23/07/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
8F 8122         48122 05/1939 18D
2E
2A
6E
6D
6B
6C
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Northampton
Rugby
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1960
27/01/1962
28/11/1964
23/01/1965
07/08/1965
28/08/1965
18/02/1967
18/02/1967
8F 8123         48123 06/1939 20D
56A
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
21/09/1957
12/03/1967
12/03/1967
8F 8124         48124 06/1939 15A
15B
17A
16G
16E
8A
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Derby
Westhouses
Kirkby in Ashfield
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
07/08/1965
23/10/1965
12/11/1966
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8125         48125 06/1939 18B
15A
18A
18B
18A
18C
15A
18A
8F
W
Westhouses
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Hasland
Wellingborough
Toton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
16/07/1955
13/08/1955
26/01/1957
10/08/1957
10/11/1962
06/07/1963
05/12/1964
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8126         48126 01/1941 20A
16D
20B
55D
W
Holbeck (MR)
Mansfield
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/12/1950
28/01/1967
24/04/1967
24/04/1967
8F 8127         48127 01/1941 20A
19D
18B
18A
21A
15B
16G
W
Holbeck (MR)
Heaton Mersey
Westhouses
Toton
Saltley
Kettering
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
22/02/1958
03/10/1959
09/12/1961
06/10/1962
13/03/1965
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8128         48128 01/1941 15A
15A
15B
18A
18B
18A
17C
18A
17B
16E
2E
5D
W
Wellingborough
Wellingborough
Kettering
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Rowsley
Toton
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Saltley
Stoke
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
21/02/1953
11/07/1953
28/11/1953
11/07/1959
21/11/1959
05/05/1962
18/06/1966
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
8F 8129         48129 01/1941 20A
1A
8B
8D
8C
8A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Widnes
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
06/05/1961
19/05/1962
18/04/1964
06/03/1965
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8130         48130 02/1941 20D
56A
55D
55A
55D
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Royston
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
21/09/1957
24/01/1959
07/03/1959
07/03/1964
28/01/1967
05/02/1967
05/02/1967
8F 8131         48131 03/1941 20D
18A
15A
15B
2A
2E
6C
6B
5B
5D
W
Normanton
Toton
Wellingborough
Kettering
Rugby
Northampton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/12/1950
09/08/1952
30/11/1957
19/11/1960
01/12/1962
20/07/1963
25/01/1964
20/06/1964
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
8F 8132         48132 03/1941 15C
14A
18A
15B
15B
15E
15A
40E
8F
9D
W
Leicester Midland
Cricklewood East
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
23/05/1959
23/06/1962
18/01/1964
15/05/1965
22/05/1965
25/12/1965
04/02/1967
09/12/1967
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8133         48133 04/1941 18A
15A
15C
15A
14A
21A
16A
21A
W
Toton
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Saltley
Nottingham
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
01/12/1956
26/03/1960
15/07/1961
13/01/1962
12/05/1962
06/04/1963
03/12/1966
03/12/1966
8F 8134         48134 04/1941 18D
1A
6C
1H
6C
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Willesden
Croes Newydd
Northampton
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
28/11/1964
20/02/1965
08/05/1965
08/01/1966
08/01/1966
8F 8135         48135 05/1941 19D
9F
6D
9G
W
Heaton Mersey
Heaton Mersey
Chester Northgate
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
21/04/1956
23/03/1957
11/09/1965
11/09/1965
8F 8136         48136 08/1941 18B
16A
2A

12A
9D
W
Westhouses
Nottingham
Rugby

Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
28/12/1957
13/06/1960
01/06/1963
18/07/1964
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8137         48137 09/1941 20A
15E
15A
40E
16G
W
Holbeck (MR)
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1964
06/11/1965
25/12/1965
16/07/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8138         48138 09/1941 20A
21A
19C
56A
56B
56A
56D
W
Holbeck (MR)
Saltley
Canklow
Wakefield
Ardsley
Wakefield
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
01/01/1955
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
18/06/1960
26/11/1960
25/10/1965
25/10/1965
8F 8139         48139 12/1941 16C
18A
20D
16C
18B
3A
9G
8E
8D
6B
8D
8B
8L
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Normanton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Westhouses
Bescot
Gorton
Northwich
Widnes
Mold Junction
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
14/08/1954
09/10/1954
13/08/1955
30/11/1957
17/05/1958
06/09/1958
28/05/1960
05/05/1962
19/05/1962
14/03/1964
03/04/1965
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
8F 8140         48140 01/1942 20B
41E
W
Stourton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
8F 8141         48141 01/1942 15B
15A
14A
16D
16A
10D
10F
W
Kettering
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Toton
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
08/07/1961
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
19/02/1966
06/05/1967
06/05/1967
8F 8142         48142 02/1942 18A
6B
8B
18A
15B
14A
16D
16A
40E
16E
W
Toton
Mold Junction
Warrington Dallam
Toton
Kettering
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Toton
Colwick
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
26/01/1952
19/05/1956
06/10/1956
23/05/1959
22/09/1962
28/08/1965
25/12/1965
16/07/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
8F 8143         48143 03/1942 20A
15A
14A
15B
18A
16B
16D
16G
16B
W
Holbeck (MR)
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Westhouses
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
08/07/1961
20/01/1962
27/01/1962
03/03/1962
30/05/1964
10/04/1965
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8144         48144 04/1942 18A
19A
19C
19A
41E
W
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
23/04/1955
31/12/1955
08/04/1961
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8145         48145 04/1942 20G
20A
18D
18A
17C
18A
16G
W
Hellifield
Holbeck (MR)
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Rowsley
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
30/01/1954
24/04/1954
15/12/1962
13/07/1963
26/09/1964
29/05/1965
29/05/1965
8F 8146         48146 07/1942 20D
20C
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Royston
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
27/03/1965
05/11/1966
06/01/1967
06/01/1967
8F 8147         48147 07/1942 31D
1A
2E
5D
1H
5D
6C
W
Grangemouth
Willesden
Northampton
Stoke
Northampton
Stoke
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
09/10/1954
09/01/1965
20/02/1965
08/05/1965
28/08/1965
30/07/1966
30/07/1966
8F 8148         48148 07/1942 31D
9F
26A
26F
10J
W
Grangemouth
Heaton Mersey
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
25/10/1958
05/01/1963
08/08/1964
03/07/1965
03/07/1965
8F 8149         48149 08/1942 31D
20B
15C
15A
18A
16C
16G
8G
W
Grangemouth
Stourton
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Toton
Derby
Westhouses
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
02/01/1954
26/03/1960
08/07/1961
22/02/1964
07/08/1965
24/09/1966
14/01/1967
14/01/1967
8F 8150         48150 08/1942 31D
19C
41E
W
Grangemouth
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
08/12/1962
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8151         48151 09/1942 31D
19C
41E
8A
8E
W
Grangemouth
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
05/01/1963
25/04/1964
12/03/1966
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8152         48152 09/1942 31D
18A
15A
21A
6C
W
Grangemouth
Toton
Wellingborough
Saltley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
25/02/1956
16/06/1956
18/05/1957
25/03/1967
25/03/1967
8F 8153         48153 09/1942 31E
2E
8G
8F
8C
W
Dawsholm
Saltley
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/09/1966
04/02/1967
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8154         48154 10/1942 19D
8B
9F
6C
2B
1A
2B
1E
6C
2B
10F
W
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Heaton Mersey
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Willesden
Nuneaton
Bletchley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
11/07/1953
08/08/1953
31/10/1953
24/04/1954
09/10/1954
04/08/1962
08/12/1962
09/03/1963
21/08/1965
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
8F 8155         48155 10/1942 31E
9G
W
Dawsholm
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
17/09/1966
17/09/1966
8F 8156         48156 11/1942 28A
16B
W
Motherwell
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
8F 8157         48157 12/1942 17A
W
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1967
09/05/1967
8F 8158         48158 01/1943 12A
16A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Nottingham
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8159         48159 01/1943 12A
20D
18A
20A
55D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Normanton
Toton
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
16/06/1951
16/09/1961
27/03/1967
27/03/1967
8F 8160         48160 02/1943 20D
56A
56D
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
08/10/1966
31/07/1967
31/07/1967
8F 8161         48161 02/1943 20C
9F
W
Royston
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8162         48162 02/1943 20C
56F
55B
55D
W
Royston
Low Moor
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
07/03/1959
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8163         48163 03/1943 28B
18A
15B
15B
16G
9G
8B
8A
8C
W
Dalry Road
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Westhouses
Gorton
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
23/06/1962
15/02/1964
11/07/1964
07/11/1964
06/03/1965
03/04/1965
19/06/1965
17/06/1967
17/06/1967
8F 8164         48164 03/1943 12A
20D
18B
18D
26F
9M
9J
10D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Normanton
Westhouses
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Bury
Agecroft
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
19/06/1954
08/12/1962
19/10/1963
07/11/1964
22/10/1966
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8165         48165 03/1943 12A
4A
2A
1A
2A
6F
9D
9A
9D
16D
15A
8F
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Shrewsbury
Rugby
Willesden
Rugby
Bidston
Buxton (LNWR)
Longsight
Buxton (LNWR)
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
21/02/1953
21/03/1953
02/01/1954
16/07/1955
14/06/1958
30/04/1960
14/03/1964
10/04/1965
25/06/1966
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8166         48166 04/1943 16C
8D
6B
8E
6B
2B
8C
8E
16D
16E
9L
9K
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Widnes
Mold Junction
Northwich
Mold Junction
Nuneaton
Speke Junction
Northwich
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
25/07/1959
09/04/1960
28/05/1960
18/06/1960
15/04/1961
06/05/1961
25/05/1963
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
31/07/1965
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
8F 8167         48167 04/1943 15A
15B
18D
18A
17B
18A
16D
21A
16A
40E
8G
8F
10F
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Burton
Toton
Annesley
Saltley
Toton
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
26/01/1952
28/12/1957
07/03/1959
23/05/1959
12/01/1963
26/01/1963
12/10/1963
25/12/1965
12/11/1966
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8168         48168 04/1943 18A
15A
17A
15B
16D
16E
9H
9F
9K
W
Toton
Wellingborough
Derby
Kettering
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1956
16/06/1956
04/03/1961
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
05/02/1966
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8169         48169 04/1943 20C
56D
55D
W
Royston
Mirfield
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1959
07/11/1959
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8170         48170 05/1943 16A
15A
16A
16A
16C
40E
9B
9H
W
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Toton
Derby
Colwick
Stockport Edgeley
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
31/12/1955
14/09/1963
18/04/1964
25/12/1965
12/11/1966
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8171         48171 05/1943 1A
5B
5D
9D
9L
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Stoke
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1965
30/01/1965
21/08/1965
06/11/1965
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
8F 8172         48172 06/1943 1A
84G
87G
87F
85C
85C
82F
W
Willesden
Shrewsbury
Carmarthen
Llanelly
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
16/07/1960
13/08/1960
15/12/1962
12/01/1963
04/05/1964
14/05/1964
14/05/1964
8F 8173         48173 06/1943 1A
2A
6B
W
Willesden
Rugby
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
09/01/1965
31/07/1965
31/07/1965
8F 8174         48174 07/1943 1A
6B
5B
5C
9D
W
Willesden
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Stafford
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
14/06/1958
21/01/1961
24/07/1965
29/04/1967
29/04/1967
8F 8175         48175 08/1943 4B
91M
8D
6B
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
To London Midland Region
Widnes
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/05/1950
17/05/1958
25/07/1959
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
8F 8176         48176 03/1942 20A
18B
19C
41E
8A
10J
10C
9G
9F
W
Holbeck (MR)
Westhouses
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Lancaster Green Ayre
Fleetwood
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1956
16/06/1956
04/06/1960
25/04/1964
25/07/1964
10/10/1964
14/11/1964
12/06/1965
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
8F 8177         48177 03/1942 15A
15D
16B
16A
16B
21A
18B
16B
2B
W
Wellingborough
Bedford
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Saltley
Westhouses
Colwick
Oxley
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
07/02/1959
25/07/1959
09/12/1961
23/06/1962
22/10/1966
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8178         48178 03/1942 18A
18D
18A
19A
41D
41B
41D
41E
26F
9G
9E
8A
W
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1956
11/08/1956
30/11/1957
15/11/1958
20/06/1959
07/01/1961
08/09/1962
08/12/1962
14/11/1964
12/06/1965
06/08/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8179         48179 03/1942 19D
41D
41E
W
Heaton Mersey
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/05/1961
26/01/1963
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8180         48180 03/1942 15A
14A
15B
15B
15A
40E
2B
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
23/05/1959
13/03/1965
26/06/1965
18/12/1965
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8181         48181 04/1942 15A
19C
41E
26F
W
Wellingborough
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
05/08/1961
08/12/1962
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
8F 8182         48182 04/1942 18A
17B
9B
W
Toton
Burton
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
28/03/1964
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8183         48183 04/1942 28A
15C
15A
18A
21A
15B
15B
15A
W
Motherwell
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Toton
Saltley
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
02/01/1954
18/06/1960
13/10/1962
29/02/1964
26/06/1965
31/07/1965
31/07/1965
8F 8184         48184 04/1942 28A
18A
18B
18A
16A
15B
16D
16G
W
Motherwell
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
18/06/1960
10/09/1960
23/06/1962
15/02/1964
11/04/1964
10/04/1965
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
8F 8185         48185 04/1942 28A
18A
16A
16E
15A
16B
8G
W
Motherwell
Toton
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
23/06/1962
12/09/1964
27/03/1965
15/01/1966
14/01/1967
11/02/1967
11/02/1967
8F 8186         48186 04/1942 28A
18A
15A
18A
16D
16E
5B
W
Motherwell
Toton
Wellingborough
Toton
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
03/12/1955
31/12/1955
02/05/1964
12/09/1964
17/09/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8187         48187 04/1942 28A
18C
16D
8F
W
Motherwell
Hasland
Nottingham
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
30/05/1964
05/12/1964
07/01/1967
07/01/1967
8F 8188         48188 04/1942 28A
1A
26G
8B
8D
8B
2B
8B
8A
W
Motherwell
Willesden
Belle Vue
Warrington Dallam
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Nuneaton
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
02/12/1950
26/01/1952
19/04/1958
17/05/1958
05/03/1960
21/05/1960
05/05/1962
14/05/1966
14/05/1966
8F 8189         48189 05/1942 20G
41E
8A
8C
W
Hellifield
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/04/1961
25/04/1964
06/03/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8190         48190 05/1942 19D
9L
W
Heaton Mersey
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1965
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8191         48191 05/1942 5B
15B
15A
17E
10F
W
Crewe South
Kettering
Wellingborough
Heaton Mersey
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
01/12/1956
23/03/1957
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8192         48192 05/1942 15A
14A
17D
16B
40E
8G
8F
9B
9F
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Rowsley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
01/12/1956
11/07/1959
25/12/1965
11/02/1967
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
06/01/1968
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F 8193         48193 05/1942 16C
16A
16A
40E
8G
8F
9F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Toton
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
14/09/1963
25/12/1965
10/12/1966
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
06/01/1968
06/01/1968
8F 8194         48194 06/1942 18A
17B
16E
5B
W
Toton
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1962
18/06/1966
17/09/1966
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8195         48195 06/1942 18D
18A
18B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
23/06/1962
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
8F 8196         48196 06/1942 18A
18B
W
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8197         48197 06/1942 18A
18B
18A
18B
40E
9D
9F
W
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Westhouses
Colwick
Newton Heath
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
10/09/1960
23/06/1962
18/12/1965
03/09/1966
30/03/1968
20/04/1968
20/04/1968
8F 8198         48198 06/1942 15A
15B
15A
17E
17A
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Wellingborough
Heaton Mersey
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
01/12/1956
23/03/1957
20/06/1959
18/09/1965
18/09/1965
8F 8199         48199 06/1942 18A
18D
8A
10C
9F
W
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Fleetwood
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
25/04/1964
03/10/1964
19/02/1966
18/02/1967
18/02/1967
8F 8200         48200 06/1942 18A
41E
8A
9D
9K
W
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/08/1958
25/04/1964
13/08/1966
06/01/1968
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8201         48201 06/1942 18A
15A
18A
16E
9B
9F
W
Toton
Wellingborough
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
24/02/1951
26/12/1964
12/11/1966
04/11/1967
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8202         48202 07/1942 18A
20D
56A
56D
56B
56A
56D
56A
W
Toton
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Ardsley
Wakefield
Mirfield
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
13/02/1960
18/06/1960
26/11/1960
28/01/1967
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8203         48203 07/1942 18A
20A
18A
20A
18A
9G
8C
2A
1E
1A
2F
8C
W
Toton
Holbeck (MR)
Toton
Holbeck (MR)
Toton
Northwich
Speke Junction
Rugby
Bletchley
Willesden
Bescot
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
24/02/1951
16/06/1951
18/04/1953
07/09/1957
30/11/1957
22/02/1958
10/06/1961
08/05/1965
02/10/1965
12/03/1966
23/04/1966
23/04/1966
8F 8204         48204 07/1942 18A
18D
18A
18B
18A
18B
W
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
24/03/1951
04/10/1958
30/01/1960
12/01/1963
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8205         48205 07/1942 18A
18C
9K
9F
W
Toton
Hasland
Bolton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
07/11/1964
29/01/1966
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8206         48206 07/1942 16A
8C
6C
8D
2B
8L
8G
8F
8C
W
Nottingham
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Widnes
Nuneaton
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
20/06/1959
12/12/1959
23/06/1962
12/03/1966
23/04/1966
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8207         48207 07/1942 16A
4A
4A
5D
W
Nottingham
Shrewsbury
Bletchley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
09/09/1950
10/07/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
8F 8208         48208 08/1942 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8209         48209 08/1942 19C
W
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
8F 8210         48210 08/1942 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
8F 8211         48211 08/1942 15C
16A
10C
10D
10J
10F
W
Leicester Midland
Nottingham
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Lancaster Green Ayre
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
23/11/1963
19/06/1965
13/11/1965
23/04/1966
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
8F 8212         48212 08/1942 18B
18C
18A
15A
40E
8L
8E
9H
W
Westhouses
Hasland
Toton
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Aintree
Northwich
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1956
15/09/1962
17/04/1965
18/12/1965
04/02/1967
29/04/1967
03/02/1968
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8213         48213 08/1942 18D
26F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
8F 8214         48214 08/1942 16C
18A
16B
16C
16D
16G
16B
9H
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Nottingham
Westhouses
Colwick
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/02/1961
24/06/1961
16/11/1963
11/07/1964
10/04/1965
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
25/11/1967
25/11/1967
8F 8215         48215 08/1942 16C
18C
16B
8E
8G
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Hasland
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
12/03/1960
02/04/1966
23/04/1966
09/07/1966
09/07/1966
8F 8216         48216 08/1942 19A
21A
18A
19A
19C
41E
41B
41D
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Saltley
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
24/01/1953
16/05/1953
05/09/1953
20/02/1960
05/03/1960
13/05/1961
08/09/1962
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8217         48217 09/1942 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1965
06/02/1965
8F 8218         48218 09/1942 16A
8C
10J
10F
W
Nottingham
Speke Junction
Lancaster Green Ayre
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1964
10/10/1964
19/06/1965
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
8F 8219         48219 09/1942 19A
18A
14A
18A
17B
18A
16C
16B
15E
16G
9B
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Burton
Toton
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Coalville
Westhouses
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
04/10/1952
01/12/1956
07/03/1959
23/05/1959
11/07/1959
09/04/1960
21/11/1964
30/10/1965
24/09/1966
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
8F 8220         48220 09/1942 19D
16D
21A
16D
21A
2B
2E
5B
W
Heaton Mersey
Annesley
Saltley
Annesley
Saltley
Oxley
Saltley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
10/01/1959
22/09/1962
15/12/1962
07/11/1964
27/02/1965
11/03/1967
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8221         48221 09/1942 18A
15C
9G
8B
8E
8F
W
Toton
Kettering
Gorton
Warrington Dallam
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1964
07/11/1964
27/03/1965
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
04/02/1967
04/02/1967
8F 8222         48222 09/1942 15A
20C
W
Wellingborough
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1955
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8223         48223 09/1942 16C
10C
10F
10C
10F
9J
9K
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Fleetwood
Rose Grove
Fleetwood
Rose Grove
Agecroft
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1963
19/06/1965
18/09/1965
19/02/1966
23/04/1966
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8224         48224 09/1942 16C
10C
9M
9J
9H
9F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Fleetwood
Bury
Agecroft
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1963
25/01/1964
07/11/1964
22/10/1966
04/11/1967
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8225         48225 09/1942 16C
5B
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/09/1966
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
8F   70300       48246 05/1940 5B
6G
5D
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Llandudno Junction
Stoke
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
08/07/1961
20/06/1964
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
8F   70301       48247 06/1940 6B
8B
8C
1A
1H
5E
10A
10F
W
Mold Junction
Warrington Dallam
Speke Junction
Willesden
Northampton
Nuneaton
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
19/06/1954
22/08/1959
28/01/1961
25/01/1964
07/08/1965
04/06/1966
06/05/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F   70311       48248 07/1940 2A
5B
8E
5B
5D
W
Rugby
Crewe South
Northwich
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
27/01/1951
19/06/1954
05/11/1960
12/11/1960
14/09/1963
01/01/1966
01/01/1966
8F   70314       48249 07/1940 6C
8A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
24/02/1951
29/11/1958
10/12/1966
10/12/1966
8F   70318       48250 08/1940 3A
8E
21B
18A
21B
8C
9J
W
Bescot
Northwich
Bescot
Toton
Bescot
Speke Junction
Agecroft
Withdrawn
16/06/1951
09/04/1960
14/05/1960
11/02/1961
25/03/1961
22/04/1961
31/10/1964
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
8F   70332       48251 09/1940 5B
2B
5B
8C
8G
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
18/04/1959
07/03/1964
24/07/1965
28/08/1965
10/1966
10/1966
8F   70363       48252 12/1941 5B
1A
5B
2A
5B
1A
5B
6C
5B

W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Willesden
Crewe South
Rugby
Crewe South
Willesden
Crewe South
Croes Newydd
Crewe South

Withdrawn
03/12/1949
01/12/1956
29/12/1956
20/06/1959
17/09/1960
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
28/08/1965
10/06/1967
19/08/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F   70376       48253 07/1941 6F
6G
6B
6A
6C
8C
10D
W
Bidston
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Speke Junction
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
02/01/1954
15/08/1959
09/09/1961
23/04/1966
12/11/1966
04/03/1967
06/01/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F   70378       48254 07/1941 5B
9G
16D
16E
16F
16G
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Northwich
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
04/11/1950
14/03/1964
12/09/1964
12/12/1964
11/06/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F   70384       48255 08/1941 5B
8E
5B
6C
5B
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Northwich
Crewe South
Croes Newydd
Crewe South
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
05/11/1960
12/11/1960
04/12/1965
11/12/1965
03/12/1966
03/12/1966
8F   70394       48256 09/1941 21B
5D
W
Bescot
Stoke
Withdrawn
10/06/1961
12/03/1966
29/04/1967
29/04/1967
8F   70395       48257 08/1941 6C
5B
6C
5B
6C
10F
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
07/01/1961
19/06/1965
20/07/1968
20/07/1968
8F   70398       48258 10/1941 9G
5B
2B
1A
6C
16G
40E
8A
W
Northwich
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Westhouses
Colwick
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
09/09/1950
31/12/1950
06/10/1956
04/08/1962
22/09/1962
28/03/1964
18/12/1965
17/09/1966
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
8F   70504       48259 10/1941 5B
3A
6B
1A
6B
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Bescot
Mold Junction
Willesden
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
21/03/1953
16/05/1953
06/09/1958
27/12/1958
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
8F   70518       48260 11/1941 8A
6C
10F
W
Edge Hill
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
11/08/1951
29/11/1958
12/06/1965
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
8F   70544       48261 02/1942 5B
11E
21A
16A
6B
9L
8F
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Saltley
Nottingham
Mold Junction
Buxton (LNWR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
22/03/1952
12/07/1958
04/10/1958
07/11/1959
14/03/1964
09/01/1965
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F   70576       48262 06/1941 6C
10H
10F
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lower Darwen
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
10/06/1961
22/05/1965
19/06/1965
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
8F   70584       48263 10/1941 5C
5B
2B
9J
W
Stafford
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
03/11/1956
23/02/1957
15/08/1959
04/06/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8264         48264 05/1942 15A
8C
2B
9J
W
Wellingborough
Speke Junction
Nuneaton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
18/06/1960
04/06/1966
16/07/1966
16/07/1966
8F 8265         48265 05/1942 17C
15A
20C
56F
56D
56F
56D
56A
W
Coalville
Wellingborough
Royston
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Mirfield
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
10/09/1955
14/06/1958
15/11/1958
08/07/1961
16/09/1961
28/01/1967
08/06/1967
08/06/1967
8F 8266         48266 05/1942 20D
15A
20A
16A
15C
15A
16F
9J
10D
W
Normanton
Wellingborough
Holbeck (MR)
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Burton
Agecroft
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
16/05/1953
30/01/1954
27/02/1954
26/03/1960
19/09/1964
03/09/1966
22/10/1966
17/06/1967
17/06/1967
8F 8267         48267 05/1942 16C
9B
9H
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Stockport Edgeley
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1966
11/05/1968
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8268         48268 05/1942 16C
8C
8E
9B
8B
1A
8B
8L
8A
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Speke Junction
Northwich
Stockport Edgeley
Warrington Dallam
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1959
18/06/1960
02/07/1960
15/10/1960
28/01/1961
18/02/1961
03/04/1965
17/06/1967
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8269         48269 05/1942 15A
18A
21A
2E
21B
6C
6D
6B
6G
9E
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Saltley
Northampton
Bescot
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
18/05/1957
20/01/1962
28/09/1963
05/10/1963
20/06/1964
23/04/1966
28/05/1966
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
8F 8270         48270 06/1942 16C
17A
16E
16C
16B
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
16/10/1965
18/12/1965
01/10/1966
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
8F 8271         48271 06/1942 20D
18A
17B
8E
W
Normanton
Toton
Burton
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
06/04/1963
03/09/1966
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
8F 8272         48272 06/1942 16C
16D
16B
16G
8E
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Westhouses
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
09/04/1960
12/02/1966
17/09/1966
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8273         48273 06/1942 5B
15A
18A
9E
W
Crewe South
Wellingborough
Toton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
31/12/1955
06/09/1958
14/08/1965
14/08/1965
8F 8274         48274 06/1942 20D
56A
56D
55B
55D
55B
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Stourton
Royston
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
23/01/1960
13/06/1964
27/03/1965
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
8F 8275         48275 06/1942 19D
9A
9D
9A
9D
8F
W
Heaton Mersey
Longsight
Buxton (LNWR)
Longsight
Buxton (LNWR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
22/03/1958
14/06/1958
26/11/1960
09/01/1965
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8276         48276 07/1942 20B
56D
56F
56D
56A
55D
W
Stourton
Mirfield
Low Moor
Mirfield
Wakefield
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
08/07/1961
16/09/1961
28/01/1967
15/07/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8277         48277 07/1942 20B
16D
16B
W
Stourton
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
09/04/1960
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
8F 8278         48278 07/1942 1A
9D
8F
9H
9F
10F
W
Willesden
Buxton (LNWR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
02/01/1965
09/12/1967
06/01/1968
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8279         48279 08/1942 16A
16A
15A
40E
16E
8L
8G
8F
W
Nottingham
Toton
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Kirkby in Ashfield
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1963
17/04/1965
25/12/1965
17/12/1966
18/02/1967
17/06/1967
24/06/1967
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
8F 8280         48280 08/1942 18B
21A
8A
W
Westhouses
Saltley
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
18/05/1957
07/05/1966
07/05/1966
8F 8281         48281 08/1942 15A
20C
W
Wellingborough
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1955
06/09/1967
06/09/1967
8F 8282         48282 08/1942 16A
16A
16C
16B
40E
16E
9H
W
Nottingham
Nottingham
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Colwick
Kirkby in Ashfield
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
28/12/1957
09/04/1960
25/12/1965
16/07/1966
12/11/1966
08/06/1968
08/06/1968
8F 8283         48283 08/1942 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8284         48284 08/1942 19A
21A
18A
18C
18A
15B
16C
16E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Saltley
Toton
Hasland
Toton
Kettering
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
24/01/1953
21/11/1959
22/09/1962
09/03/1963
19/09/1964
16/10/1965
30/07/1966
30/07/1966
8F 8285         48285 09/1942 15B
15B
15A
W
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/01/1964
26/06/1965
18/09/1965
18/09/1965
8F   70401       48286 07/1940 5B
11E
21A
16A
16G
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Saltley
Nottingham
Westhouses
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
22/03/1952
12/07/1958
04/10/1958
25/01/1964
03/09/1966
03/09/1966
8F   70402       48287 07/1940 1A
5B
2B
2A
6B
6C
6B
6C
6A
5B
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Rugby
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Chester (MR)
Crewe South
Withdrawn
21/02/1953
21/03/1953
15/08/1959
07/07/1962
09/01/1965
11/12/1965
26/02/1966
26/03/1966
15/04/1967
10/06/1967
01/07/1967
01/07/1967
8F   70403       48288 08/1940 9E
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/12/1956
25/02/1967
25/02/1967
8F   70413       48289 10/1940 5B
2B
9J
9K
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Nuneaton
Agecroft
Bolton
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
15/08/1959
04/06/1966
22/10/1966
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
8F   70438       48290 06/1941 1A
2E
6C
8L
8G
W
Willesden
Northampton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
18/04/1953
30/11/1957
01/12/1962
17/04/1965
26/06/1965
14/08/1965
14/08/1965
8F   70440       48291 07/1941 5B
2B
5B
5D
W
Crewe South (Re-instd)
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
15/08/1959
07/03/1964
12/12/1964
02/07/1966
02/07/1966
8F   70442       48292 08/1941 9G
5B
6C
5B
8C
9H
9F
W
Northwich
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
23/04/1955
21/05/1955
10/06/1961
01/07/1961
24/07/1965
12/03/1966
04/11/1967
20/04/1968
20/04/1968
8F 8293         48293 10/1940 16A
17A
15B
16D
16E
8A
10D
W
Nottingham
Derby
Kettering
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Edge Hill
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
04/03/1961
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
11/05/1968
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F   70443       48294 11/1941 8C
8A
10D
W
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
10/06/1961
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F   70446       48295 12/1941 8E
9K
W
Brunswick
Bolton
Withdrawn
22/03/1958
08/08/1964
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
8F   70447       48296 12/1941 9G
5B
6D
9G
8B
8D
8C
8A
8C
W
Northwich
Crewe South
Chester Northgate
Northwich
Warrington Dallam
Widnes
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
03/12/1955
23/03/1957
17/05/1958
08/10/1960
18/04/1964
06/03/1965
19/06/1965
17/09/1966
17/09/1966
8F   70449       48297 01/1942 3A
3D
5B
8E
5B
81E
8C
8B
8C
10J
W
Bescot
Aston
Crewe South
Northwich
Crewe South
Didcot
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Speke Junction
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
29/11/1952
14/06/1958
12/07/1958
31/01/1959
20/06/1959
07/01/1961
06/05/1961
22/02/1964
19/09/1964
10/10/1964
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8301         48301 09/1943 28C
14A
9B
15A
15C
15B
8B
15B
15A
8L
W
Carstairs
Cricklewood East
Stockport Edgeley
Wellingborough
Kettering
Wellingborough
Warrington Dallam
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
26/11/1960
15/09/1962
11/01/1964
18/01/1964
28/03/1964
04/04/1964
26/06/1965
10/07/1965
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8302         48302 10/1943 28C
9F
18A
9F
9B
10J
10D
W
Carstairs
Heaton Mersey
Toton
Heaton Mersey
Stockport Edgeley
Lancaster Green Ayre
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/03/1961
11/04/1961
29/04/1961
26/09/1964
14/08/1965
13/11/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
8F 8303         48303 10/1943 28C
17B
8A
16E
W
Carstairs
Burton
Edge Hill
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1962
06/03/1965
13/03/1965
30/07/1966
30/07/1966
8F 8304         48304 10/1943 18A
14A
16D
16E
8E
W
Toton
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
12/11/1966
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8305         48305 11/1943 15A
2E
5B
8E
8C
W
Wellingborough
Northampton
Crewe South
Northwich
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
10/11/1962
24/07/1965
18/09/1965
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8306         48306 11/1943 20A
18A
14A
18A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
23/05/1959
10/11/1962
04/07/1964
04/07/1964
8F 8307         48307 11/1943 4A
87F
82F
10D
9H
W
Shrewsbury
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Lostock Hall
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1961
22/06/1964
12/09/1964
11/11/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8308         48308 11/1943 4A
86G
86G
6E
8D
8C
W
Shrewsbury
Pontypool Road
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Widnes
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/01/1958
22/02/1958
14/06/1958
15/11/1958
18/04/1964
13/04/1968
13/04/1968
8F 8309         48309 11/1943 2A
84G
87K
87F
82F
W
Rugby
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
10/09/1955
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
8F 8310         48310 12/1943 5B
2D
3A
9A
10C
10F
W
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Bescot
Longsight
Fleetwood
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
17/07/1951
17/09/1960
07/08/1965
19/02/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
8F 8311         48311 12/1943 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
8F 8312         48312 12/1943 24B
1A
2B
1A
6C
W
Rose Grove
Willesden
Nuneaton
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
04/12/1954
04/08/1962
22/09/1962
13/02/1965
13/02/1965
8F 8313         48313 12/1943 18A
20D
15C
18A
15B
14A
16C
40E
9K
W
Toton
Normanton
Leicester Midland
Toton
Kettering
Cricklewood East
Derby
Colwick
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
27/02/1954
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
23/05/1959
27/06/1964
25/12/1965
07/01/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8314         48314 12/1943 19A
15A
20B
18A
16F
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Wellingborough
Stourton
Toton
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
16/05/1953
28/01/1956
07/08/1965
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
8F 8315         48315 12/1943 19D
16D
21A
15D
15A
40E
8L
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Annesley
Saltley
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Aintree
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
10/01/1959
08/07/1961
04/12/1965
25/12/1965
10/12/1966
17/06/1967
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
8F 8316         48316 12/1943 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/04/1967
08/04/1967
8F 8317         48317 01/1944 20F
17F
9F
17C
16B
9E
9F
W
Skipton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Rowsley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
10/01/1959
11/04/1959
23/05/1959
18/02/1967
09/03/1968
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8318         48318 01/1944 5B
26A
3A
8A
12A
9D
9J
9D
W
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Bescot
Edge Hill
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
17/06/1950
29/11/1958
29/06/1963
27/06/1964
17/10/1964
14/11/1964
10/1966
10/1966
8F 8319         48319 01/1944 24B
18D
15A
21A
18A
16A
10C
8F
9H
9F
9K
W
Rose Grove
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Wellingborough
Saltley
Toton
Nottingham
Fleetwood
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
19/06/1954
17/07/1954
14/08/1954
09/02/1963
23/11/1963
19/02/1966
09/12/1967
06/01/1968
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8320         48320 02/1944 5B
2A
2B
10D
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Nuneaton
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
04/10/1952
04/06/1966
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8321         48321 02/1944 28B
9D
W
Dalry Road
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1964
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8322         48322 02/1944 17A
9G
9F
9H
9B
9F
W
Derby
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Patricroft
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1965
12/06/1965
29/01/1966
23/04/1966
02/09/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8323         48323 02/1944 18A
12B
8D
8C
8D
8C
6B
8A
8H
10F
W
Toton
Carlisle Canal
Widnes
Speke Junction
Widnes
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Edge Hill
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
16/06/1951
09/08/1952
19/04/1958
17/05/1958
07/11/1959
14/05/1960
13/02/1965
22/05/1965
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8324         48324 02/1944 18A
14A
16D
16G
9H
9F
W
Toton
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Westhouses
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
22/09/1962
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
29/01/1966
17/06/1967
17/06/1967
8F 8325         48325 03/1944 4B
91M
1A
6C
8F
9H
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
To London Midland Region
Willesden
Croes Newydd
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/05/1950
31/12/1950
28/11/1964
11/03/1967
09/12/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8326         48326 03/1944 9D
8D
2B
8B
6C
8G
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Widnes
Nuneaton
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
19/05/1962
23/06/1962
29/09/1962
17/04/1965
16/07/1966
16/07/1966
8F 8327         48327 03/1944 4A
1A
6C
9F
6C
9F
9L
9H
W
Shrewsbury
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Heaton Mersey
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Heaton Mersey
Buxton (LNWR)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
04/11/1950
03/10/1953
30/01/1954
17/07/1954
20/11/1965
09/03/1968
08/06/1968
08/06/1968
8F 8328         48328 04/1944 4A
87F
10D
W
Shrewsbury
Llanelly
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1959
12/09/1964
02/10/1965
02/10/1965
8F 8329         48329 04/1944 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8330         48330 05/1944 19E
87K
87F
21A
82B
84F
W
Belle Vue
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Saltley
St Philips Marsh
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
05/09/1959
11/02/1961
09/09/1961
07/10/1961
02/10/1965
02/10/1965
8F 8331         48331 09/1943 28C
18D
9D
W
Carstairs
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
25/04/1964
26/02/1966
26/02/1966
8F 8332         48332 10/1943 18D
18A
17B
16G
16B
9E
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Burton
Westhouses
Colwick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
05/05/1962
11/06/1966
22/10/1966
10/12/1966
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8333         48333 11/1943 18B
18A
9F
16D
8E
9M
9K
W
Westhouses
Toton
Heaton Mersey
Annesley
Northwich
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1959
03/02/1962
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
19/10/1963
10/04/1965
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
8F 8334         48334 11/1943 15A
16C
8E
W
Wellingborough
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
02/04/1966
27/01/1968
27/01/1968
8F 8335         48335 11/1943 4B
91M
8C
9B
9D
10D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Stockport Edgeley
Newton Heath
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/05/1950
12/03/1966
23/04/1966
07/10/1967
06/01/1968
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F 8336         48336 12/1943 12A
21A
15B
2F
1A
2F
2E
5B
9L
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Saltley
Kettering
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Bescot
Saltley
Crewe South
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
13/10/1962
22/06/1963
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
26/03/1966
11/03/1967
18/11/1967
09/12/1967
09/12/1967
8F 8337         48337 12/1943 12A
21A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Saltley
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8338         48338 01/1944 15A
18A
21A
18A
15B
14A
17A
9F
9B
9F
9B
10C
8F
9H
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Saltley
Toton
Kettering
Cricklewood East
Derby
Heaton Mersey
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Stockport Edgeley
Fleetwood
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
22/03/1958
12/11/1960
17/12/1960
14/01/1961
04/03/1961
09/05/1964
13/06/1964
26/09/1964
07/08/1965
19/02/1966
09/12/1967
08/06/1968
08/06/1968
8F 8339         48339 01/1944 24B
6C
W
Rose Grove
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/09/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8340         48340 01/1944 5B
1A
9G
8H
8L
8E
10F
9K
10F
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Northwich
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Northwich
Rose Grove
Bolton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
02/12/1950
13/02/1965
17/04/1965
17/06/1967
09/03/1968
30/03/1968
06/07/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8341         48341 02/1944 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
8F 8342         48342 02/1944 18B
9E
9D
11E
21A
16B
40E
W
Westhouses
Trafford Park (LMS)
Buxton (LNWR)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Saltley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
11/07/1953
02/01/1954
12/07/1958
07/01/1961
25/12/1965
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8343         48343 02/1944 4B
2B
5D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
19/02/1966
18/02/1967
18/02/1967
8F 8344         48344 03/1944 4B
84G
86G
6E
9E
9F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
02/11/1957
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
09/03/1968
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F 8345         48345 03/1944 5B
2A
6E
6D
6B
6G
9B
9D
9E
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Stockport Edgeley
Newton Heath
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
28/11/1964
23/01/1965
07/08/1965
23/04/1966
28/05/1966
07/10/1967
06/01/1968
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8346         48346 03/1944 18D
26F
16B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
25/05/1963
16/07/1966
16/07/1966
8F 8347         48347 03/1944 4A
87K
84G
82F
1H
5B
1A
5B
8E
W
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Northampton
Crewe South
Willesden
Crewe South
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1959
11/07/1959
30/12/1961
19/09/1964
09/01/1965
20/02/1965
08/05/1965
01/04/1967
29/07/1967
29/07/1967
8F 8348         48348 04/1944 19E
8B
6C
6B
6C
10F
W
Belle Vue
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
20/06/1959
16/09/1961
16/02/1963
12/06/1965
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8349         48349 04/1944 19E
8B
6C
8B
6C
8A
2E
5D
W
Belle Vue
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Northampton
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
17/05/1958
12/11/1960
19/11/1960
02/10/1965
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
8F 8350         48350 04/1944 18A
15C
16C
16B
9E
W
Toton
Kettering
Derby
Colwick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1964
19/09/1964
24/09/1966
10/12/1966
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8351         48351 05/1944 21A
5B
9E
W
Saltley
Crewe South
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1967
18/11/1967
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
8F 8352         48352 05/1944 20D
56A
56D
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
13/07/1963
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8353         48353 06/1944 18B
18A
18B
5B
6C
2C
5D
W
Westhouses
Toton
Westhouses
Crewe South
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1960
02/07/1960
14/03/1964
12/12/1964
30/01/1965
07/08/1965
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
8F 8354         48354 06/1944 20B
84G
1H
5D
W
Stourton
Shrewsbury
Northampton
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
19/09/1964
09/01/1965
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
8F 8355         48355 06/1944 15B
15B
16G
9G
9F
W
Kettering
Wellingborough
Westhouses
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/02/1964
11/07/1964
07/11/1964
12/06/1965
04/09/1965
04/09/1965
8F 8356         48356 06/1944 15B
15B
16B
16E
9E
9F
9D
W
Kettering
Wellingborough
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/02/1964
08/05/1965
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
09/03/1968
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8357         48357 06/1944 20D
56A
56D
56A
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
26/02/1966
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
8F 8358         48358 07/1944 18B
20B
56D
56A
W
Westhouses
Stourton
Mirfield
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
23/01/1960
26/02/1966
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
8F 8359         48359 07/1944 15A
18C
16A
16C
16B
9H
W
Wellingborough
Hasland
Toton
Derby
Colwick
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1957
30/05/1964
27/06/1964
01/10/1966
07/01/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8360         48360 07/1944 15A
2E
18A
2E
1E
W
Wellingborough
Northampton
Toton
Northampton
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
11/02/1961
29/04/1961
16/06/1962
03/07/1965
03/07/1965
8F 8361         48361 08/1944 18A
16E
15A
40E
16G
W
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/12/1964
27/03/1965
25/12/1965
16/07/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8362         48362 08/1944 18A
16A
18A
15B
16C
16E
8G
8F
8A
W
Toton
Nottingham
Toton
Wellingborough
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
14/07/1962
25/04/1964
16/05/1964
16/10/1965
24/09/1966
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8363         48363 08/1944 15A
18A
16B
16E
8L
8E
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Annesley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Aintree
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
12/12/1964
03/07/1965
24/07/1965
13/05/1967
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
8F 8364         48364 08/1944 15A
14A
15A
18C
17C
16B
5D
5B
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Hasland
Rowsley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/02/1951
05/10/1957
23/05/1959
20/04/1963
17/09/1966
12/08/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8365         48365 09/1944 15A
2A
2B
2A
1H
10A
9F
W
Wellingborough
Rugby
Nuneaton
Rugby
Northampton
Carnforth
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
12/05/1962
07/07/1962
29/05/1965
21/08/1965
18/09/1965
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8366         48366 09/1944 4B
3A
1A
3A
5C
1E
2F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Bescot
Willesden
Bescot
Stafford
Bletchley
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
01/12/1956
29/12/1956
17/09/1960
17/08/1963
14/03/1964
11/1965
11/1965
8F 8367         48367 09/1944 18A
14A
17B
W
Toton
Cricklewood East
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
22/06/1963
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8368         48368 09/1944 1A
9G
8C
1A
1E
6B
5B
16G
16F
5D
9D
W
Willesden
Northwich
Speke Junction
Willesden
Bletchley
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Westhouses
Burton
Stoke
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
28/05/1960
28/01/1961
17/08/1963
12/10/1963
25/01/1964
28/03/1964
02/05/1964
17/09/1966
12/08/1967
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8369         48369 10/1944 4A
1H
5D
9D
9L
9D
W
Shrewsbury
Northampton
Stoke
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/09/1964
09/01/1965
21/08/1965
08/01/1966
11/11/1967
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8370         48370 10/1944 18A
16A
16C
16G
16B
W
Toton
Nottingham
Derby
Westhouses
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
09/05/1964
24/09/1966
22/10/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
8F 8371         48371 10/1944 15A
18C
9K
9E
8A
W
Wellingborough
Hasland
Bolton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1955
20/06/1964
21/08/1965
06/08/1966
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
8F 8372         48372 10/1944 1A
2A
2B
6C
26A
12A
9D
W
Willesden
Rugby
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Newton Heath
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
08/08/1953
22/03/1958
25/10/1958
29/06/1963
27/06/1964
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
8F 8373         48373 11/1944 4A
4A
8C
8B
6C
10F
9B
9D
W
Shrewsbury
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Stockport Edgeley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
23/02/1952
14/06/1958
29/09/1962
22/05/1965
18/09/1965
07/10/1967
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8374         48374 11/1944 15A
15A
8E
8C
8A
9H
W
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Northwich
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/06/1965
10/07/1965
18/09/1965
23/09/1967
11/05/1968
15/06/1968
15/06/1968
8F 8375         48375 11/1944 4A
3A
2E
5D
10F
W
Shrewsbury
Bescot
Saltley
Stoke
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
03/01/1966
03/12/1966
19/08/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8376         48376 11/1944 20C
15A
16B
14A
15B
15B
15A
15E
16G
16B
9L
W
Royston
Wellingborough
Kirkby in Ashfield
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Coalville
Westhouses
Colwick
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
12/07/1958
07/02/1959
23/05/1959
15/02/1964
26/06/1965
31/07/1965
30/10/1965
22/10/1966
14/01/1967
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
8F 8377         48377 12/1944 20C
18A
16A
10C
9F
W
Royston
Toton
Nottingham
Fleetwood
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
08/08/1953
23/11/1963
19/02/1966
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8378         48378 12/1944 16C
14A
16D
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
22/09/1962
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8379         48379 12/1944 16C
8F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1964
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8380         48380 12/1944 16A
15E
15A
40E
9K
W
Nottingham
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/09/1964
06/11/1965
18/12/1965
12/11/1966
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8381         48381 12/1944 16A
14A
15A
15C
15B
16F
15B
15A
9J
9H
W
Nottingham
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Kettering
Wellingborough
Burton
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Agecroft
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
23/05/1959
11/01/1964
18/01/1964
19/09/1964
24/10/1964
26/06/1965
28/05/1966
22/10/1966
25/11/1967
25/11/1967
8F 8382         48382 01/1945 16C
18A
18B
15D
15A
15D
15C
15B
15A
40E
9E
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Westhouses
Coalville
Wellingborough
Coalville
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1958
04/10/1958
22/11/1958
15/08/1959
19/11/1960
07/11/1964
13/03/1965
26/06/1965
25/12/1965
03/09/1966
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8383         48383 01/1945 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
8F 8384         48384 01/1945 18A
16G
40E
10A
10F
W
Toton
Westhouses
Colwick
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/02/1964
25/12/1965
12/11/1966
19/08/1967
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8385         48385 02/1945 23B
2F
1H
2E
6C
W
Aintree
Woodford Halse
Northampton
Saltley
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
15/05/1965
02/10/1965
17/09/1966
03/12/1966
03/12/1966
8F 8386         48386 02/1945 25A
2F
5E
10F
W
Wakefield
Woodford Halse
Nuneaton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
02/05/1964
21/08/1965
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
8F 8387         48387 03/1945 18A
2F
W
Toton
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/02/1963
23/01/1965
23/01/1965
8F 8388         48388 03/1945 18A
15B
15B
15E
16G
40E
W
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Coalville
Westhouses
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1962
18/01/1964
07/11/1964
30/10/1965
25/12/1965
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
8F 8389         48389 03/1945 21A
9D
W
Saltley
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1960
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
8F 8390         48390 03/1945 17A
9F
9H
W
Derby
Heaton Mersey
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/03/1961
29/01/1966
11/05/1968
11/05/1968
8F 8391         48391 04/1945 18B
15B
21A
19C
41E
9D
W
Westhouses
Kettering
Saltley
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
25/05/1963
25/04/1964
18/12/1965
18/12/1965
8F 8392         48392 04/1945 16C
14A
17B
9B
9E
10D
9K
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Cricklewood East
Burton
Stockport Edgeley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Lostock Hall
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/01/1963
22/06/1963
28/03/1964
28/10/1967
09/03/1968
30/03/1968
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8393         48393 04/1945 16C
17A
16A
16G
40E
10D
10F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Nottingham
Westhouses
Colwick
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
28/11/1959
10/04/1965
18/12/1965
12/11/1966
17/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8394         48394 05/1945 20D
56A
56F
55B
55D
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Low Moor
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
23/01/1960
08/10/1966
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8395         48395 05/1945 20D
16C
18A
16B
8A
W
Normanton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
06/10/1956
17/05/1958
18/02/1967
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8396         48396 05/1945 20D
20A
19C
41E
W
Normanton
Holbeck (MR)
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
16/07/1955
25/05/1963
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8397         48397 06/1945 15C
19C
26F
9F
12A
9D
9J
W
Leicester Midland
Canklow
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
08/12/1962
06/04/1963
22/02/1964
27/06/1964
17/10/1964
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8398         48398 06/1945 15C
2A
2B
5B
8C
8E
W
Leicester Midland
Rugby
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
25/02/1956
07/03/1964
24/07/1965
18/09/1965
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
8F 8399         48399 06/1945 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8400         48400 31/05/1943 21A
87K
87F
10D
10F
10A
10F
W
Saltley
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
05/09/1959
12/09/1964
19/02/1966
06/05/1967
23/09/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8401         48401 03/07/1943 21A
14A
21A
20A
17B
18A
16A
16E
16D
9G
9F
W
Saltley
Cricklewood East
Saltley
Holbeck (MR)
Burton
Toton
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/02/1951
16/06/1951
03/01/1953
23/05/1959
07/01/1961
28/12/1963
02/05/1964
07/11/1964
12/06/1965
04/09/1965
04/09/1965
8F 8402         48402 02/07/1943 21A
19C
84C
82B
84G
6E
84E
84F
2B
5D
5B
9F
W
Saltley
Canklow
Banbury
St Philips Marsh
Shrewsbury
Chester West
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Oxley
Stoke
Crewe South
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
16/07/1955
13/08/1955
10/09/1955
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
25/03/1961
03/01/1966
11/03/1967
12/08/1967
18/11/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8403         48403 12/07/1943 21A
17A
9F
W
Saltley
Derby
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
04/03/1961
31/07/1965
31/07/1965
8F 8404         48404 23/07/1943 17A
20F
20A
18B
82B
87F
82B
89A
W
Derby
Skipton
Holbeck (MR)
Westhouses
St Philips Marsh
Llanelly
St Philips Marsh
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
23/02/1952
27/02/1954
16/06/1956
17/06/1961
09/09/1961
24/02/1962
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8405         48405 08/08/1943 21A
16B
W
Saltley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
23/07/1966
23/07/1966
8F 8406         48406 14/08/1943 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/09/1965
04/09/1965
8F 8407         48407 23/08/1943 19C
41E
W
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1960
12/1963
12/1963
8F 8408         48408 02/09/1943 24B
82B
86G
6E
8C
6C
8B
3A
9B
5A
1E
8C
8E
W
Rose Grove
St Philips Marsh
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Bescot
Stockport Edgeley
Crewe North
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
22/03/1958
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
20/06/1959
19/09/1959
07/11/1959
25/06/1960
07/01/1961
16/09/1961
10/07/1965
18/09/1965
11/11/1967
11/11/1967
8F 8409         48409 08/09/1943 16C
16A
85C
87K
87F
82F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Hereford
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
20/04/1957
22/02/1958
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
12/04/1965
12/04/1965
8F 8410         48410 22/09/1943 14A
82B
81A
84F
8F
10F
W
Cricklewood East
St Philips Marsh
Old Oak Common
Stourbridge Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
30/01/1960
03/11/1962
23/07/1966
09/12/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8411         48411 28/09/1943 19G
5B
2A
6B
6C
6B
6G
9J
9F
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Crewe South
Rugby
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Agecroft
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
20/06/1959
09/01/1965
13/11/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
28/05/1966
22/10/1966
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
8F 8412         48412 05/10/1943 20C
18A
84C
6E
84E
82B
81A
84D
84E
2C
8L
8C
W
Royston
Toton
Banbury
Chester West
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
Old Oak Common
Leamington
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Aintree
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
16/07/1955
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
13/06/1959
30/01/1960
17/11/1962
23/03/1963
27/02/1965
23/07/1966
20/08/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
8F 8413         48413 12/10/1943 16C
10C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1963
11/1965
11/1965
8F 8414         48414 15/10/1943 14A
18A
15A
40E
W
Cricklewood East
Toton
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
17/04/1965
18/12/1965
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8415         48415 22/10/1943 14A
86G
6E
84E
21A
84F
2A
2B
W
Cricklewood East
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
Saltley
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/07/1956
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
11/02/1961
18/03/1961
14/09/1963
19/06/1965
13/08/1966
13/08/1966
8F 8416         48416 01/11/1943 24A
5B
W
Accrington
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1965
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
8F 8417         48417 06/11/1943 21A
86G
6E
84E
84F
9J
9K
W
Saltley
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Agecroft
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
25/03/1961
23/07/1966
22/10/1966
29/04/1967
29/04/1967
8F 8418         48418 10/11/1943 18A
15C
86G
6E
84E
89A
W
Toton
Leicester Midland
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
16/06/1956
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
31/12/1960
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8419         48419 17/11/1943 20C
18A
84C
87K
87F
10D
W
Royston
Toton
Banbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
16/07/1955
22/02/1958
05/09/1959
12/09/1964
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
8F 8420         48420 26/11/1943 21A
21B
21A
82B
85C
87F
W
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
St Philips Marsh
Gloucester Barnwood
Llanelly
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
18/04/1953
17/07/1954
17/11/1962
28/09/1963
13/04/1964
13/04/1964
8F 8421         48421 06/12/1943 16C
8B
8L
8E
9F
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Northwich
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1964
03/04/1965
29/04/1967
03/02/1968
10/02/1968
10/02/1968
8F 8422         48422 10/12/1943 2C
6C
8L
8G
W
Northampton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1962
17/04/1965
26/06/1965
26/03/1966
26/03/1966
8F 8423         48423 18/12/1943 2C
1A
2E
2A
5B
6C
10H
10F
W
Northampton
Willesden
Northampton
Rugby
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lower Darwen
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
09/10/1954
04/10/1958
17/09/1960
07/01/1961
19/06/1965
19/02/1966
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8424         48424 22/12/1943 21A
86G
6E
84E
84F
2A
2C
9L
W
Saltley
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
25/03/1961
14/09/1963
27/02/1965
23/07/1966
24/02/1968
24/02/1968
8F 8425         48425 31/12/1943 26B
8D
8A
8C
8A
8C
9K
W
Agecroft
Widnes
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/11/1958
23/06/1962
07/09/1963
11/01/1964
06/03/1965
12/03/1966
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8426         48426 31/12/1943 2C
1E
2E
9G
12A
9D
W
Northampton
Bletchley
Northampton
Northwich
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
28/11/1953
06/07/1963
18/07/1964
11/06/1966
11/06/1966
8F 8427         48427 13/01/1944 4B
1E
6B
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Bletchley
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/06/1961
10/07/1965
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8428         48428 17/01/1944 5B
6B
9A
9B
9D
9F
9B
W
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Heaton Mersey
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
17/05/1958
26/11/1960
14/01/1961
11/12/1965
16/04/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8429         48429 27/01/1944 25C
9F
W
Goole
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
11/09/1965
11/09/1965
8F 8430         48430 07/03/1944 19C
82B
86G
6E
84E
84F
2E
W
Canklow
St Philips Marsh
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
22/03/1958
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
25/03/1961
30/11/1963
24/04/1965
24/04/1965
8F 8431         48431 11/03/1944 20C
83A
82B
81A
82E
82F
W
Royston
Newton Abbot
St Philips Marsh
Old Oak Common
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1955
08/10/1955
30/01/1960
15/12/1962
25/01/1964
06/05/1964
06/05/1964
8F 8432         48432 17/03/1944 17A
17D
16B
18A
16B
16G
40E
16G
W
Derby
Rowsley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Westhouses
Colwick
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
23/05/1959
27/01/1962
24/02/1962
14/09/1963
25/12/1965
16/07/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8433         48433 24/03/1944 1A
8A
W
Willesden
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
06/04/1968
06/04/1968
8F 8434         48434 31/03/1944 LA
19C
82B
87F
10D
W
Laira
Canklow
St Philips Marsh
Llanelly
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
26/03/1946
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
08/10/1960
12/09/1964
01/01/1966
01/01/1966
8F 8435         48435 17/04/1944 24B
1A
6C
10F
W
Rose Grove
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1962
06/04/1963
12/06/1965
06/05/1967
06/05/1967
8F 8436         48436 28/04/1944 24D
20C
85A
82B
82F
89A
5B
9K
W
Lower Darwen
Royston
Worcester
St Philips Marsh
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
10/09/1955
08/10/1955
07/10/1961
30/12/1961
11/02/1967
18/11/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8437         48437 03/05/1944 26C
2A
8C
8D
9B
W
Bolton
Rugby
Speke Junction
Widnes
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
30/04/1960
17/09/1960
08/10/1960
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F 8438         48438 08/05/1944 1A
84G
87K
87F
82F
10D
W
Willesden
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
18/04/1959
05/09/1959
22/06/1964
12/09/1964
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
8F 8439         48439 17/05/1944 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8440         48440 05/06/1944 TN
19G
1A
2E
1A
1H
6C
W
Taunton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Northampton
Willesden
Northampton
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
26/03/1946
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
30/01/1960
10/11/1962
01/02/1964
02/10/1965
18/02/1967
18/02/1967
8F 8441         48441 06/06/1944 25C
1E
2E
8B
6C
10H
10F
W
Goole
Bletchley
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lower Darwen
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
16/07/1955
20/06/1959
12/06/1965
19/02/1966
06/04/1968
06/04/1968
8F 8442         48442 13/06/1944 16C
16D
16B
18A
16B
9L
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
09/04/1960
11/02/1961
24/06/1961
18/02/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8443         48443 15/06/1944 20C
20B
55A
55D
W
Royston
Stourton
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
24/01/1959
16/09/1961
11/1966
11/1966
8F 8444         48444 20/06/1944 26B
18B
86G
84G
86G
86G
6E
84E
82B
87F
82F
W
Agecroft
Westhouses
Pontypool Road
Shrewsbury
Pontypool Road
Pontypool Road
Chester West
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
16/06/1956
02/11/1957
25/01/1958
22/02/1958
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
13/08/1960
24/02/1962
20/07/1964
14/02/1966
14/02/1966
8F 8445         48445 01/07/1944 2C
9G
2E
1A
1F
5E
10D
W
Northampton
Northwich
Northampton
Willesden
Rugby
Nuneaton
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
28/11/1953
12/05/1962
14/03/1964
29/05/1965
04/06/1966
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8446         48446 01/07/1944 26B
2E
1E
6C
10F
W
Agecroft
Northampton
Bletchley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
23/04/1955
08/12/1962
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8447         48447 14/07/1944 25B
19A
16D
16B
18C
16B
8H
10F
9B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Hasland
Kirkby in Ashfield
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
19/06/1954
11/04/1959
09/01/1960
23/01/1960
13/02/1965
19/06/1965
18/09/1965
29/01/1966
29/01/1966
8F 8448         48448 20/07/1944 24A
10F
W
Accrington
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1965
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
8F 8449         48449 01/08/1944 25C
1H
2F
5B
W
Goole
Northampton
Bescot
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1963
02/10/1965
12/03/1966
20/05/1967
20/05/1967
8F 8450         48450 28/08/1944 19C
82B
86C
82B
84F
2B
5B
8A
W
Canklow
St Philips Marsh
Cardiff Canton
St Philips Marsh
Stourbridge Junction
Oxley
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
30/01/1960
27/02/1960
07/10/1961
16/07/1966
11/03/1967
19/08/1967
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
8F 8451         48451 05/09/1944 9D
8B
8L
10F
10A
10F
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Rose Grove
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1964
03/04/1965
26/06/1965
13/05/1967
23/09/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8452         48452 09/09/1944 25B
19A
15A
19A
85C
87K
87F
84E
5D
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Wellingborough
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Hereford
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Tyseley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
03/12/1955
28/01/1956
20/04/1957
22/02/1958
05/09/1959
22/06/1963
20/06/1964
29/01/1966
29/01/1966
8F 8453         48453 19/09/1944 26C
24A
5C
5D
9H
W
Bolton
Accrington
Stafford
Stoke
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
17/09/1960
14/09/1963
11/03/1967
13/04/1968
13/04/1968
8F 8454         48454 29/09/1944 4A
W
55D
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
Royston
01/01/1948
05/07/1967
15/07/1967
05/07/1967
8F 8455         48455 14/10/1944 25B
6B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1962
28/11/1964
28/11/1964
8F 8456         48456 20/10/1944 24B
9B
2B
9L
W
Rose Grove
Stockport Edgeley
Nuneaton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1956
21/04/1956
04/06/1966
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8457         48457 23/10/1944 5B
8C
W
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/03/1965
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8458         48458 04/11/1944 24B
6A
W
Rose Grove
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1966
08/04/1967
08/04/1967
8F 8459         48459 18/11/1944 24B
20C
82B
84F
9H
W
Rose Grove
Royston
St Philips Marsh
Stourbridge Junction
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
10/09/1955
07/10/1961
23/07/1966
01/04/1967
01/04/1967
8F 8460         48460 13/12/1944 26A
86G
84G
86C
84E
84F
2B
5B
W
Newton Heath
Pontypool Road
Shrewsbury
Cardiff Canton
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Oxley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
29/11/1958
03/10/1959
27/02/1960
25/03/1961
16/07/1966
11/03/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8461         48461 16/12/1944 23B
82B
87K
87F
87F
W
Aintree
St Philips Marsh
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
22/02/1958
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
04/01/1965
04/01/1965
8F 8462         48462 22/12/1944 26A
8E
W
Newton Heath
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
8F 8463         48463 02/01/1945 24B
85C
87K
87F
85C
82F
W
Rose Grove
Hereford
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Gloucester Barnwood
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
22/02/1958
05/09/1959
17/11/1962
13/04/1964
29/06/1964
29/06/1964
8F 8464         48464 13/01/1945 9D
9D
9B
9L
9F
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Newton Heath
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1964
19/12/1964
20/03/1965
11/12/1965
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
8F 8465         48465 15/02/1945 5B
9A
8E
9A
9B
9D
9K
W
Crewe South
Longsight
Northwich
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
12/12/1959
06/02/1960
26/11/1960
07/01/1961
09/03/1968
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8466         48466 24/02/1945 5B
8D
20C
W
Crewe South
Widnes
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
08/09/1951
08/05/1967
08/05/1967
8F 8467         48467 05/03/1945 5B
20D
15A
15B
15E
15A
8A
9H
W
Crewe South
Normanton
Wellingborough
Kettering
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Edge Hill
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
19/04/1952
29/11/1952
19/09/1964
06/11/1965
25/06/1966
11/05/1968
15/06/1968
15/06/1968
8F 8468         48468 16/03/1945 26C
84G
82F

2C
10D
10F
W
Bolton
Shrewsbury
Bath Green Park (S&D)

Stourbridge Junction (Re-instd)
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
27/01/1962
06/05/1964
20/06/1964
23/07/1966
24/06/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8469         48469 24/03/1945 23B
20C
8A
8C
9M
9K
W
Aintree
Royston
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
01/09/1962
07/09/1963
19/10/1963
10/04/1965
16/12/1967
16/12/1967
8F 8470         48470 24/04/1945 24B
19C
17A
86G
87K
87F
82F
10D
9H
W
Rose Grove
Canklow
Derby
Pontypool Road
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Lostock Hall
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
30/01/1954
16/06/1956
29/11/1958
05/09/1959
22/06/1964
12/09/1964
11/11/1967
25/11/1967
25/11/1967
8F 8471         48471 28/04/1945 24B
84C
6E
84E
82B
82F
89A
9D
9L
9F
W
Rose Grove
Banbury
Chester West
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Shrewsbury
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
14/06/1958
11/04/1959
13/08/1960
07/10/1961
30/12/1961
28/05/1966
11/11/1967
09/03/1968
27/04/1968
27/04/1968
8F 8472         48472 07/05/1945 24D
9L
W
Lower Darwen
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/09/1963
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
8F 8473         48473 18/05/1945 4B
20C
55B
55D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Royston
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
27/03/1965
05/11/1966
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8474         48474 30/05/1945 4A
82E
84F
84E
2B
5B
W
Shrewsbury
Bristol Barrow Road
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Oxley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1962
06/10/1962
23/03/1963
19/06/1965
11/03/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8475         48475 08/06/1945 24B
15A
86A
82B
84E
82B
84F
84E
2B
W
Rose Grove
Wellingborough
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
St Philips Marsh
Tyseley
St Philips Marsh
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
19/06/1954
17/07/1954
13/06/1959
13/08/1960
24/03/1962
23/03/1963
07/11/1964
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
8F 8476         48476 15/06/1945 1A
6F
6C
8C
10D
W
Willesden
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Speke Junction
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/07/1960
10/06/1961
06/03/1965
06/01/1968
10/08/1968
10/08/1968
8F 8477         48477 23/06/1945 5B
6C
3A
2B
2A
W
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bescot
Oxley
Tyseley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
17/07/1951
12/02/1966
19/02/1966
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
8F 8478         48478 30/06/1945 5B
84F
2F
W
Crewe South
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
19/09/1964
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
8F 8479         48479 21/07/1945 24A
2B
6C
9D
8A
8C
8E
8C
18A
8C
1A
6C
8H
8G
W
Accrington
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Buxton (LNWR)
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Northwich
Speke Junction
Toton
Speke Junction
Willesden
Croes Newydd
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
16/05/1953
19/05/1956
14/06/1958
30/01/1960
28/05/1960
18/06/1960
11/02/1961
25/03/1961
23/06/1962
28/11/1964
26/12/1964
17/04/1965
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
8F 8490         48490 06/1945 18A
16A
15B
16D
9G
9F
W
Toton
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/01/1961
15/02/1964
11/04/1964
07/11/1964
12/06/1965
11/09/1965
11/09/1965
8F 8491         48491 07/1945 15B
8B
26A
26F
W
Kettering
Warrington Dallam
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
25/10/1958
05/01/1963
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8492         48492 07/1945 15A
15C
15B
15A
16E
10D
W
Wellingborough
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Kirkby in Ashfield
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1963
29/02/1964
26/06/1965
11/06/1966
18/02/1967
10/02/1968
10/02/1968
8F 8493         48493 08/1945 18D
1A
1E
8C
8E
8C
10F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Willesden
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Northwich
Speke Junction
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
17/08/1963
10/07/1965
03/02/1968
09/03/1968
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8494         48494 08/1945 18B
18C
18A
16D
8F
W
Westhouses
Hasland
Toton
Nottingham
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/02/1959
22/09/1962
24/10/1964
05/12/1964
01/04/1967
01/04/1967
8F 8495         48495 08/1945 18B
14A
15A
18C
9K
9L
W
Westhouses
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Hasland
Bolton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/02/1959
23/05/1959
10/08/1963
20/06/1964
31/07/1965
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8500         48500 02/1944 25A
5D
6B
8C
8B
8L
W
Wakefield
Stoke
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1960
19/05/1962
21/07/1962
14/03/1964
03/04/1965
18/12/1965
18/12/1965
8F 8501         48501 06/1944 25A
9F
W
Wakefield
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
15/07/1967
15/07/1967
8F 8502         48502 08/1944 25A
8D
5B
9H
W
Wakefield
Widnes
Crewe South
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
11/06/1960
24/07/1965
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
8F 8503         48503 09/1944 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8504         48504 09/1944 25A
8A
1A
8A
3D
2B
9K
W
Wakefield
Edge Hill
Willesden
Edge Hill
Aston
Nuneaton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
06/09/1958
27/12/1958
20/06/1959
22/08/1959
28/05/1966
22/06/1968
22/06/1968
8F 8505         48505 09/1944 25A
11E
5B
9D
9B
8B
9B
8C
5B
9F
W
Wakefield
Lancaster Green Ayre
Crewe South
Buxton (LNWR)
Stockport Edgeley
Warrington Dallam
Stockport Edgeley
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
03/11/1956
19/04/1958
30/07/1960
08/10/1960
15/10/1960
07/01/1961
16/09/1961
12/08/1967
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8506         48506 10/1944 25A
9G
8D
8C
1A
1H
1G
10F
W
Wakefield
Northwich
Widnes
Speke Junction
Willesden
Northampton
Woodford Halse
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
22/11/1958
15/08/1959
23/06/1962
05/10/1963
15/05/1965
19/06/1965
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
8F 8507         48507 10/1944 25A
18A
15C
18A
18B
40E
9B
9F
W
Wakefield
Toton
Leicester Midland
Toton
Westhouses
Colwick
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
26/03/1955
22/03/1958
23/06/1962
18/12/1965
24/09/1966
06/01/1968
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8508         48508 10/1944 25A
19C
41E
W
Wakefield
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
08/12/1962
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F 8509         48509 11/1944 25A
8A
8B
8A
24J
8C
W
Wakefield
Edge Hill
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Lancaster Green Ayre
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
05/05/1962
22/09/1962
07/09/1963
24/10/1964
13/05/1967
13/05/1967
8F 8510         48510 06/1943 25A
8C
6C
6B
17A
40E
10D
W
Wakefield
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Derby
Colwick
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
31/10/1953
25/12/1965
10/12/1966
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
8F 8511         48511 03/1944 25A
3A
8E
9K
W
Wakefield
Bescot
Northwich
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
04/06/1960
22/08/1964
25/06/1966
25/06/1966
8F 8512         48512 04/1944 25A
8B
8A
W
Wakefield
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1962
29/09/1962
24/09/1966
24/09/1966
8F 8513         48513 04/1944 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8514         48514 05/1944 25A
3A
5D
W
Wakefield
Bescot
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
12/03/1966
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
8F 8515         48515 06/1944 25A
25G
18D
41D
41E
26A
8B
9G
9F
W
Wakefield
Farnley Junction
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Warrington Dallam
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
08/09/1951
04/06/1960
15/09/1962
25/05/1963
07/12/1963
20/03/1965
12/06/1965
08/01/1966
08/01/1966
8F 8516         48516 07/1944 25A
5B
5D
W
Wakefield
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
14/09/1963
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
8F 8517         48517 07/1944 25A
18A
14A
2F
1A
2F
2E
10D
W
Wakefield
Toton
Cricklewood East
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Bescot
Saltley
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
23/05/1959
10/08/1963
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
26/03/1966
04/02/1967
02/12/1967
02/12/1967
8F 8518         48518 08/1944 25A
91M
26A
1A
6C
1A
W
Wakefield
To London Midland Region
Newton Heath
Willesden
Croes Newydd
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/05/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
28/11/1964
13/02/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8519         48519 09/1944 25A
24L
10F
W
Wakefield
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1963
07/10/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8520         48520 10/1944 25A
8B
8C
W
Wakefield
Warrington Dallam
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
17/06/1961
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8521         48521 10/1944 25A
9F
9G
9H
9J
W
Wakefield
Heaton Mersey
Northwich
Patricroft
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
03/10/1953
19/09/1964
10/10/1964
07/05/1966
07/05/1966
8F 8522         48522 11/1944 25A
21B
2E
5D
5B
W
Wakefield
Bescot
Saltley
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
03/01/1966
03/12/1966
12/08/1967
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8523         48523 11/1944 24B
18D
21A
18A
21A
9F
26F
9D
9M
9K
W
Rose Grove
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Saltley
Toton
Saltley
Heaton Mersey
Patricroft
Newton Heath
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
07/03/1959
11/02/1961
09/12/1961
14/07/1962
06/04/1963
30/11/1963
10/10/1964
10/04/1965
19/02/1966
19/02/1966
8F 8524         48524 12/1944 24B
87K
86G
86G
87K
87F
W
Rose Grove
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Pontypool Road
Pontypool Road
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
25/01/1958
22/02/1958
29/11/1958
05/09/1959
13/04/1964
13/04/1964
8F 8525         48525 12/1944 24B
87K
87F
82F
W
Rose Grove
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
01/10/1965
01/10/1965
8F 8526         48526 12/1944 24C
1A
2B
2A
2B
2A
1A
2C
5D
W
Lostock Hall
Willesden
Nuneaton
Rugby
Nuneaton
Rugby
Willesden
Stourbridge Junction
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
29/12/1956
04/10/1958
23/06/1962
07/07/1962
29/05/1965
02/10/1965
16/07/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8527         48527 12/1944 24C
19D
18C
14A
2F
1A
5D
W
Lostock Hall
Heaton Mersey
Hasland
Cricklewood East
Woodford Halse
Willesden
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
04/10/1958
16/03/1963
03/08/1963
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
8F 8528         48528 02/1945 24C
9F
16B
15A
8A
W
Lostock Hall
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester Midland
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
12/07/1958
27/03/1965
25/06/1966
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
8F 8529         48529 04/1945 24C
5B
2E
1E
8D
1E
21B
2E
8A
9D
W
Lostock Hall
Crewe South
Northampton
Bletchley
Widnes
Bletchley
Bescot
Saltley
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
20/06/1959
17/06/1961
11/11/1961
06/01/1962
06/01/1962
26/03/1966
04/03/1967
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8530         48530 04/1945 16C
18A
17A
15B
15B
15A
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Derby
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
12/05/1962
09/03/1963
13/03/1965
26/06/1965
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8531         48531 04/1945 15C
8B
8C
1A
2C
2B
5B
W
Leicester Midland
Warrington Dallam
Speke Junction
Willesden
Stourbridge Junction
Oxley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
07/11/1959
28/01/1961
02/10/1965
16/07/1966
11/03/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8532         48532 04/1945 20C
8A
24J
9H
9D
9L
9K
W
Royston
Edge Hill
Lancaster Green Ayre
Patricroft
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/09/1962
07/09/1963
20/06/1964
08/08/1964
30/10/1965
09/03/1968
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8533         48533 05/1945 14A
15C
16C
18D
9D
W
Cricklewood East
Leicester Midland
Mansfield
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
05/11/1955
25/02/1956
25/04/1964
18/05/1968
18/05/1968
8F 8534         48534 05/1945 18B
1E
2E
1E
5E
9K
W
Westhouses
Bletchley
Northampton
Bletchley
Nuneaton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
08/07/1961
10/07/1965
28/05/1966
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8535         48535 06/1945 18B
4A
1A
1E
8C
9J
9E
W
Westhouses
Bletchley
Willesden
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Agecroft
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
22/08/1959
31/10/1964
25/12/1965
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
8F 8536         48536 06/1945 18B
8D
8B
9F
8C
9J
9D
8A
W
Westhouses
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Heaton Mersey
Speke Junction
Agecroft
Newton Heath
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/06/1963
11/01/1964
18/07/1964
26/09/1964
10/10/1964
02/04/1966
06/08/1966
21/01/1967
21/01/1967
8F 8537         48537 07/1945 18D
20B
55D
55B
55D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Stourton
Royston
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
07/03/1959
09/10/1965
08/10/1966
30/10/1967
30/10/1967
8F 8538         48538 08/1945 18D
18A
14A
18A
18B
15A
16G
16B
2E
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Westhouses
Wellingborough
Westhouses
Colwick
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
23/05/1959
12/12/1959
23/06/1962
10/11/1962
11/07/1964
22/10/1966
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8539         48539 08/1945 18D
21A
9D
9J
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Saltley
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
07/12/1963
28/11/1964
08/01/1966
08/01/1966
8F 8540         48540 12/1944 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8541         48541 12/1944 14A
16C
16B
W
Cricklewood East
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
09/04/1960
18/06/1966
18/06/1966
8F 8542         48542 12/1944 20C
55C
55A
W
Royston
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/10/1961
14/11/1964
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
8F 8543         48543 01/1945 17C
15A
18A
18B
9F
8B
9G
9D
W
Coalville
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Gorton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
29/11/1952
04/10/1958
06/12/1958
22/02/1964
20/03/1965
12/06/1965
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
8F 8544         48544 01/1945 18D
12B
4A
1A
5B
10F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Carlisle Canal
Bletchley
Willesden
Crewe South
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
16/06/1951
08/05/1965
07/08/1965
24/06/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8545         48545 02/1945 20C
18A
14A
18A
15B
15B
15A
8E
W
Royston
Toton
Cricklewood East
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1958
07/01/1961
21/01/1961
24/11/1962
13/03/1965
26/06/1965
25/06/1966
18/02/1967
18/02/1967
8F 8546         48546 02/1945 20C
26F
9F
10D
W
Royston
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
06/03/1965
11/05/1968
06/07/1968
06/07/1968
8F 8547         48547 03/1945 20C
20A
17B
18C
9K
W
Royston
Holbeck (MR)
Burton
Hasland
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
03/01/1953
05/10/1957
20/06/1964
18/03/1967
18/03/1967
8F 8548         48548 03/1945 19C
2A
5B
5D
5B
W
Canklow
Rugby
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
14/06/1958
14/09/1963
11/03/1967
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
8F 8549         48549 03/1945 18B
4A
1A
9B
9H
W
Westhouses
Bletchley
Willesden
Stockport Edgeley
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
10/07/1965
21/08/1965
11/05/1968
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8550         48550 04/1945 2C
4A
1H
2C
10F
W
Northampton
Bletchley
Northampton
Stourbridge Junction
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
10/07/1965
02/10/1965
23/07/1966
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
8F 8551         48551 04/1945 4B
6B
5B
9F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/10/1963
25/01/1964
25/03/1967
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8552         48552 05/1945 16C
15E
15A
40E
9L
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1964
06/11/1965
25/12/1965
03/09/1966
29/04/1967
29/04/1967
8F 8553         48553 05/1945 5B
26A
9H
W
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
07/12/1963
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8554         48554 06/1945 1A
8B
6C
1E
1A
5B
6C
5B
W
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bletchley
Willesden
Crewe South
Croes Newydd
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1962
22/09/1962
17/08/1963
08/05/1965
02/10/1965
04/12/1965
11/12/1965
06/08/1966
06/08/1966
8F 8555         48555 06/1945 5B
NTH
21B
5B
5D
W
Crewe South
Northwich
Bescot
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
13/01/1962
14/07/1962
14/09/1963
29/01/1966
29/01/1966
8F 8556         48556 07/1945 4A
9G
3A
2E
10D
10F
W
Shrewsbury
Northwich
Bescot
Saltley
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
08/09/1956
26/03/1966
18/03/1967
24/06/1967
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8557         48557 07/1945 2C
9F
8B
9G
9D
W
Northampton
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Gorton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
11/05/1963
20/03/1965
12/06/1965
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
8F 8558         48558 08/1945 9D
8D
9D
8B
8L
10F
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Widnes
Buxton (LNWR)
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
30/04/1960
09/05/1964
03/04/1965
26/06/1965
09/10/1965
09/10/1965
8F 8559         48559 08/1945 5B
2A
1A
5B
9K
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Willesden
Crewe South
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
29/05/1965
07/08/1965
12/08/1967
06/01/1968
06/01/1968
8F 8600         48600 02/1943 1A
1G
16G
16B
8L
W
Willesden
Woodford Halse
Westhouses
Colwick
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/09/1963
29/02/1964
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
8F 8601         48601 02/1943 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1965
19/06/1965
8F 8602         48602 04/1943 1A
3A
5C
9D
W
Willesden
Bescot
Stafford
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
14/09/1963
24/07/1965
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
8F 8603         48603 05/1943 1A
2E
6A
W
Willesden
Saltley
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1965
11/03/1967
10/06/1967
10/06/1967
8F 8604         48604 06/1943 18D
18A
15B
14A
16A
16C
16B
8A
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Kettering
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Derby
Colwick
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1958
12/11/1960
17/12/1960
14/01/1961
22/08/1964
24/09/1966
10/12/1966
29/04/1967
29/04/1967
8F 8605         48605 07/1943 1A
8H
8L
W
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/02/1965
17/04/1965
06/08/1966
06/08/1966
8F 8606         48606 09/1943 18A
15B
16F
16G
W
Toton
Wellingborough
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
19/09/1964
11/06/1966
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8607         48607 09/1943 18A
15B
15B
15E
15A
W
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/01/1961
18/01/1964
07/11/1964
26/06/1965
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
8F 8608         48608 10/1943 16C
20C
56D
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Royston
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
23/01/1960
13/02/1966
13/02/1966
8F 8609         48609 10/1943 18D
20A
15B
15B
15A
16B
9H
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Holbeck (MR)
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
12/07/1952
18/01/1964
26/06/1965
15/01/1966
07/01/1967
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8610         48610 04/1943 1A
1E
5E
W
Willesden
Bletchley
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
10/07/1965
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8611         48611 05/1943 18A
15B
2F
8H
W
Toton
Kettering
Woodford Halse
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
22/06/1963
07/11/1964
05/12/1964
05/12/1964
8F 8612         48612 07/1943 1A
21A
9D
9F
9D
W
Willesden
Saltley
Newton Heath
Heaton Mersey
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
27/06/1964
12/03/1966
17/12/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8613         48613 07/1943 4A
18A
9F
9F
18A
9F
W
Shrewsbury
Toton
Heaton Mersey
Heaton Mersey
Toton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1957
09/08/1958
04/10/1958
11/02/1961
29/04/1961
29/07/1967
29/07/1967
8F 8614         48614 08/1943 16A
16E
40E
8G
8F
8A
W
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/09/1964
25/12/1965
03/09/1966
24/06/1967
09/12/1967
27/04/1968
27/04/1968
8F 8615         48615 09/1943 18A
18B
16D
8E
W
Toton
Westhouses
Annesley
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
05/02/1966
05/02/1966
8F 8616         48616 10/1943 16C
18A
14A
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
23/05/1959
22/10/1960
22/10/1960
8F 8617         48617 11/1943 15A
15E
15A
40E
8G
8E
W
Wellingborough
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1965
06/11/1965
25/12/1965
14/01/1967
20/05/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8618         48618 09/1943 18A
41E
26A
10C
10D
W
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/08/1958
25/05/1963
29/02/1964
19/06/1965
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
8F 8619         48619 10/1943 15C
15C
15D
16G
W
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Coalville
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
21/02/1959
30/10/1965
26/03/1966
26/03/1966
8F 8620         48620 11/1943 18B
18A
18B
16B
9D
W
Westhouses
Toton
Westhouses
Colwick
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
23/06/1962
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8621         48621 11/1943 16D
16B
W
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
30/07/1966
30/07/1966
8F 8622         48622 11/1943 16D
55D
W
Mansfield
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8623         48623 12/1943 18B
15C
2B
8H
8G
W
Westhouses
Leicester Midland
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
10/08/1957
07/11/1964
17/04/1965
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8624         48624 12/1943 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8625         48625 04/1943 15A
14A
21A
18B
15A
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Saltley
Westhouses
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
28/04/1962
23/06/1962
03/04/1965
18/06/1966
18/06/1966
8F 8626         48626 05/1943 1A
5B
6D
5B
1E
1A
9B
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Chester Northgate
Crewe South
Bletchley
Willesden
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
03/12/1955
06/10/1956
23/06/1962
10/07/1965
21/08/1965
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
8F 8627         48627 05/1943 15A
14A
15A
16E
16C
16E
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
16/07/1960
18/04/1964
02/05/1964
16/10/1965
05/03/1966
05/03/1966
8F 8628         48628 05/1943 1A
2B
W
Willesden
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1965
24/09/1966
24/09/1966
8F 8629         48629 06/1943 1A
8H
2E
W
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/10/1963
30/11/1963
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8630         48630 06/1943 1A
9G
5B
W
Willesden
Northwich
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
03/12/1955
31/07/1965
31/07/1965
8F 8631         48631 06/1943 4A
8E
W
Shrewsbury
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1960
24/02/1968
24/02/1968
8F 8632         48632 06/1943 1A
8E
2B
1A
1F
6B
6C
6B
6A
6C
8E
W
Willesden
Northwich
Nuneaton
Willesden
Rugby
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/12/1959
27/02/1960
21/05/1960
14/03/1964
20/06/1964
11/12/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
12/11/1966
18/03/1967
02/03/1968
02/03/1968
8F 8633         48633 07/1943 1A
9A
6B
5B
W
Willesden
Longsight
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
17/05/1958
14/06/1958
05/03/1966
05/03/1966
8F 8634         48634 08/1943 1A
9F
8B
9F
9J
W
Willesden
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Heaton Mersey
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
19/06/1954
11/09/1954
03/10/1964
14/08/1965
14/08/1965
8F 8635         48635 08/1943 16A
21A
18A
16C
16E
16F
16B
W
Nottingham
Saltley
Toton
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Burton
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1961
17/06/1961
26/09/1964
16/10/1965
25/12/1965
17/09/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
8F 8636         48636 08/1943 18A
17A
26F
W
Toton
Derby
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1962
25/05/1963
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8637         48637 09/1943 18A
15C
15B
15A
10D
W
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/06/1964
13/03/1965
27/03/1965
25/06/1966
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8638         48638 09/1943 18A
18B
14A
18A
16A
16G
W
Toton
Westhouses
Cricklewood East
Toton
Nottingham
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
20/12/1958
23/05/1959
07/01/1961
10/04/1965
22/01/1966
22/01/1966
8F 8639         48639 09/1943 16A
10C
8E
W
Nottingham
Fleetwood
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1963
20/06/1964
03/02/1968
03/02/1968
8F 8640         48640 10/1943 17A
18A
18D
18A
16A
8E
W
Derby
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Nottingham
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
17/07/1954
09/08/1958
07/01/1961
14/03/1964
13/05/1967
13/05/1967
8F 8641         48641 10/1943 16C
20B
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
15/11/1966
15/11/1966
8F 8642         48642 10/1943 19A
41D
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/04/1961
15/09/1962
19/04/1964
19/04/1964
8F 8643         48643 11/1943 16D
16B
8E
W
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
02/04/1966
10/06/1967
10/06/1967
8F 8644         48644 11/1943 15A
15D
16G
W
Wellingborough
Coalville
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/08/1959
30/10/1965
22/01/1966
22/01/1966
8F 8645         48645 11/1943 15B
15B
18A
15B
15B
15A
40E
2E
6A
W
Kettering
Kettering
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Saltley
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
27/01/1962
10/03/1962
13/03/1965
27/03/1965
18/12/1965
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
8F 8646         48646 11/1943 15A
2A
1E
8H
2E
10D
W
Wellingborough
Rugby
Bletchley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Saltley
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
17/09/1960
05/10/1963
30/11/1963
04/02/1967
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8647         48647 12/1943 17A
18A
16A
5B
8H
8G
W
Derby
Toton
Nottingham
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/02/1961
09/02/1963
28/03/1964
07/11/1964
17/04/1965
23/04/1966
23/04/1966
8F 8648         48648 12/1943 1A
6C
6G
8H
8L
8C
W
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aintree
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/11/1961
14/09/1963
07/11/1964
17/04/1965
20/08/1966
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
8F 8649         48649 12/1943 2A
W
Rugby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1965
06/02/1965
8F 8650         48650 10/1943 18B
18A
16A
18A
2F
5E
8L
8E
W
Westhouses
Toton
Nottingham
Toton
Woodford Halse
Nuneaton
Aintree
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/01/1960
18/06/1960
25/06/1960
19/01/1963
25/04/1964
12/03/1966
13/05/1967
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8651         48651 11/1943 15A
16F
16B
W
Wellingborough
Burton
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1964
17/09/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
8F 8652         48652 11/1943 18D
8A
9M
9K
9F
9K
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Edge Hill
Bury
Bolton
Heaton Mersey
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/09/1962
19/10/1963
10/04/1965
22/01/1966
29/01/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8653         48653 11/1943 16A
15A
16A
16C
W
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
26/01/1952
22/08/1964
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
8F 8654         48654 11/1943 17A
17D
2F
W
Derby
Rowsley
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
20/07/1963
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
8F 8655         48655 11/1943 18A
8B
6C
5B
6G
6B
6A
9D
W
Toton
Warrington Dallam
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
22/03/1958
14/06/1958
10/06/1961
15/09/1962
23/04/1966
11/03/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
8F 8656         48656 11/1943 1A
1E
6B
W
Willesden
Bletchley
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/06/1961
10/07/1965
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8657         48657 11/1943 1A
1E
W
Willesden
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/05/1961
09/1964
09/1964
8F 8658         48658 11/1943 1A
2B
2E
5B
1A
5B
W
Willesden
Nuneaton
Northampton
Crewe South
Willesden
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
07/07/1962
09/01/1965
20/02/1965
08/05/1965
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
8F 8659         48659 11/1943 2A
2E
5B
89B
5B
2F
2E
W
Rugby
Northampton
Crewe South
Croes Newydd
Crewe South
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
29/06/1963
20/07/1963
19/09/1964
26/03/1966
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
8F 8660         48660 11/1943 1A
84G
87K
84G
82F
W
Willesden
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
26/03/1955
10/09/1955
24/02/1962
11/07/1965
11/07/1965
8F 8661         48661 07/1944 18B
18A
16B
16G
W
Westhouses
Toton
Annesley
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/01/1960
12/12/1964
03/07/1965
18/09/1965
18/09/1965
8F 8662         48662 07/1944 18A
17B
16G
16B
W
Toton
Burton
Westhouses
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
05/02/1966
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8663         48663 02/1944 18D
26F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
03/12/1966
03/12/1966
8F 8664         48664 02/1944 4B
20C
55C
55D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Royston
Farnley Junction
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
14/10/1961
03/12/1966
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8665         48665 03/1944 4B
6C
8A
9D
10F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Croes Newydd
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1964
04/03/1967
11/05/1968
06/07/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8666         48666 04/1944 16A
16C
9J
10D
10F
W
Nottingham
Derby
Agecroft
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/08/1964
28/05/1966
22/10/1966
17/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8667         48667 04/1944 19D
9G
6F
6G
6B
W
Heaton Mersey
Northwich
Bidston
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
13/08/1955
15/08/1959
08/07/1961
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8668         48668 05/1944 15C
18A
21A
2A
1E
8H
10F
10C
10F
W
Leicester Midland
Toton
Saltley
Rugby
Bletchley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rose Grove
Fleetwood
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
10/08/1957
10/06/1961
07/11/1964
22/05/1965
06/11/1965
27/11/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
8F 8669         48669 05/1944 21A
21B
21A
2A
6C
5D
9F
W
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Tyseley
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
18/04/1953
07/05/1966
12/11/1966
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8670         48670 07/1944 20D
20C
55B
W
Normanton
Royston
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
09/10/1965
10/1966
10/1966
8F 8671         48671 12/1943 15A
15A
9J
9H
W
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Agecroft
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/05/1965
28/05/1966
22/10/1966
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
8F 8672         48672 01/1944 18A
15E
16F
16B
W
Toton
Coalville
Burton
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
27/06/1964
17/09/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
8F 8673         48673 05/1944 4B
8B
18A
16B
9B
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Warrington Dallam
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
19/05/1956
17/05/1958
14/01/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8674         48674 03/1944 4A
1A
3A
2B
8C
W
Shrewsbury
Willesden
Bescot
Oxley
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
21/03/1953
26/03/1966
04/02/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8675         48675 03/1944 16A
16E
8F
W
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/09/1964
05/12/1964
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8676         48676 04/1944 19D
8B
8D
8B
8L
8G
8F
W
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/01/1963
23/03/1963
11/05/1963
03/04/1965
17/06/1967
24/06/1967
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
8F 8677         48677 05/1944 17A
18A
17A
11E
9F
W
Derby
Toton
Derby
Lancaster Green Ayre
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
26/01/1952
22/03/1952
13/01/1968
13/01/1968
8F 8678         48678 06/1944 15A
38B
15A
14A
16D
16G
16F
16E
16G
16B
8F
9D
W
Wellingborough
Annesley
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Westhouses
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Westhouses
Colwick
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1956
29/12/1956
23/05/1959
13/04/1963
25/04/1964
02/05/1964
13/03/1965
12/02/1966
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
09/12/1967
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8679         48679 12/1943 1A
2B
3A
9D
9K
9J
10J
10D
W
Willesden
Nuneaton
Bescot
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Agecroft
Lancaster Green Ayre
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
01/01/1955
25/02/1956
19/09/1964
28/11/1964
12/12/1964
13/11/1965
22/10/1966
22/10/1966
8F 8680         48680 12/1943 19G
9G
9A
9A
2E
21B
2B
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Northwich
Longsight
Longsight
Northampton
Bescot
Oxley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
14/06/1952
08/09/1956
26/11/1960
10/11/1962
26/03/1966
24/09/1966
24/09/1966
8F 8681         48681 01/1944 18A
16F
8E
W
Toton
Burton
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1965
24/09/1966
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
8F 8682         48682 01/1944 19C
19D
8C
9J
W
Canklow
Heaton Mersey
Speke Junction
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
26/09/1964
10/10/1964
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
8F 8683         48683 01/1944 19D
9F
8B
8A
8E
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Northwich
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
06/10/1956
07/11/1959
21/05/1960
03/02/1968
17/02/1968
17/02/1968
8F 8684         48684 01/1944 1A
10H
9F
W
Willesden
Lower Darwen
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1965
19/02/1966
27/04/1968
27/04/1968
8F 8685         48685 02/1944 18A
15A
16B
8E
W
Toton
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1965
15/01/1966
04/02/1967
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
8F 8686         48686 02/1944 18D
3A
2A
2B
9B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Bescot
Rugby
Nuneaton
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
31/12/1950
25/02/1956
04/06/1966
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
8F 8687         48687 02/1944 21A
15D
15A
40E
8A
9D
W
Saltley
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1960
06/11/1965
25/12/1965
28/01/1967
11/05/1968
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8688         48688 02/1944 4A
4A
1H
W
Shrewsbury
Bletchley
Northampton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
10/07/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F 8689         48689 02/1944 4A
8B
20C
55C
55B
W
Shrewsbury
Warrington Dallam
Royston
Farnley Junction
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
08/09/1951
14/10/1961
14/11/1964
05/07/1965
05/07/1965
8F 8690         48690 03/1944 18A
15B
15B
16F
16G
16B
2E
W
Toton
Kettering
Wellingborough
Burton
Westhouses
Colwick
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
29/02/1964
19/09/1964
11/06/1966
22/10/1966
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8691         48691 03/1944 4B
10H
9F
9D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Lower Darwen
Heaton Mersey
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1965
19/02/1966
26/02/1966
19/03/1966
19/03/1966
8F 8692         48692 03/1944 15A
18A
21A
2E
5B
8C
8A
9K
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Saltley
Northampton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
20/04/1957
14/06/1958
10/06/1961
23/09/1967
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8693         48693 03/1944 2C
4A
9F
8B
2A
9G
5B
81E
W
Northampton
Bletchley
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Rugby
Northwich
Crewe South
Didcot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
03/12/1955
06/10/1956
23/03/1957
20/04/1957
17/05/1958
07/01/1961
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
8F 8694         48694 04/1944 15A
17B
16E
W
Wellingborough
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
13/03/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
8F 8695         48695 04/1944 15A
9F
18A
9F
W
Wellingborough
Heaton Mersey
Toton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1959
11/02/1961
11/04/1961
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
8F 8696         48696 04/1944 16A
15E
15A
40E
8A
W
Nottingham
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1965
06/11/1965
25/12/1965
04/02/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
8F 8697         48697 04/1944 19D
8D
6B
6G
6B
5C
6B
6C
5D
6B
6C
6B
6A
6C
5D
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Widnes
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Stafford
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Mold Junction
Croes Newydd
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
25/07/1959
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
05/11/1960
28/01/1961
23/09/1961
20/06/1964
19/06/1965
13/11/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
12/11/1966
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8698         48698 05/1944 19G
18A
15A
40E
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Toton
Leicester Midland
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
17/04/1965
25/12/1965
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
8F 8699         48699 05/1944 15A
15D
16G
40E
8E
W
Wellingborough
Coalville
Westhouses
Colwick
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
30/10/1965
25/12/1965
24/09/1966
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8700         48700 05/1944 20C
17B
21A
16D
16F
9J
9H
W
Royston
Burton
Saltley
Annesley
Burton
Agecroft
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
01/12/1956
22/09/1962
15/08/1964
03/09/1966
22/10/1966
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8701         48701 05/1944 16D
16B
9G
9F
W
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
07/11/1964
12/06/1965
04/03/1967
04/03/1967
8F 8702         48702 05/1944 20D
56A
56D
56F
55B
8A
8C
9F
8E
9K
W
Normanton
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Stourton
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Heaton Mersey
Northwich
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
15/11/1958
23/01/1960
01/09/1962
07/09/1963
14/12/1963
25/01/1964
22/08/1964
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8703         48703 06/1944 18A
20B
55D
W
Toton
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
28/01/1967
25/09/1967
25/09/1967
8F 8704         48704 06/1944 15B
16C
9G
8B
8L
W
Kettering
Derby
Gorton
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/09/1964
07/11/1964
27/03/1965
17/04/1965
11/09/1965
11/09/1965
8F 8705   7651 3100 3500 48705 06/1944 24A
3A
5C
21B
2B
8F
W
Accrington
Bescot
Stafford
Bescot
Oxley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
17/09/1960
23/06/1962
26/03/1966
04/02/1967
04/03/1967
04/03/1967
8F 8706   7652 3101 3501 48706 06/1944 23B
NTH
26A
87K
87F
87F
82F
W
Aintree
Northwich
Newton Heath
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
13/06/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
8F 8707   7653 3102 3502 48707 06/1944 23B
84G
87K
84G
86C
87F
82F
10D
W
Aintree
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Cardiff Canton
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1951
28/02/1951
31/12/1951
05/09/1959
26/12/1959
20/07/1964
12/09/1964
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
8F 8708   7654 3103 3503 48708 06/1944 5B
12B
68A
9D
9J
9F
W
Crewe South
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
17/05/1952
27/06/1964
17/10/1964
22/10/1966
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
8F 8709   7655 3104 3504 48709 06/1944 15C
16A
9D
5B
9G
8E
8D
8C
W
Leicester Midland
Nottingham
Buxton (LNWR)
Crewe South
Gorton
Northwich
Widnes
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
30/11/1957
19/04/1958
17/05/1958
06/09/1958
15/11/1958
18/04/1964
15/07/1967
15/07/1967
8F 8710   7656 3105 3505 48710 07/1944 24B
24A
20C
W
Rose Grove
Accrington
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
08/09/1951
17/09/1967
17/09/1967
8F 8711   7657 3106 3506 48711 07/1944 24B
24A
17A
9G
8C
W
Rose Grove
Accrington
Derby
Northwich
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
08/09/1951
26/01/1952
10/06/1961
07/01/1967
07/01/1967
8F 8712   7658 3107 3507 48712 07/1944 9D
24L
10F
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1963
13/05/1967
10/06/1967
10/06/1967
8F 8713   7659 3108 3508 48713 07/1944 24B
26A
3A
5E
W
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Bescot
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
08/09/1951
15/01/1966
05/03/1966
05/03/1966
8F 8714   7660 3109 3509 48714 07/1944 24B
26G
8B
8C
8D
26F
9J
9H
W
Rose Grove
Belle Vue
Warrington Dallam
Speke Junction
Widnes
Patricroft
Agecroft
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
26/01/1952
22/08/1959
16/03/1963
11/05/1963
15/01/1966
22/10/1966
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
8F 8715   7661 3110 3510 48715 07/1944 24B
26G
8B
8L
8F
8A
10F
W
Rose Grove
Belle Vue
Warrington Dallam
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
26/01/1952
03/04/1965
26/06/1965
09/12/1967
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8716   7662 3111 3511 48716 07/1944 5B
26A
26F
8E
8H
10D
W
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Northwich
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
05/01/1963
06/04/1963
13/02/1965
22/05/1965
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
8F 8717   7663 3112 3512 48717 07/1944 4B
19D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
01/04/1967
01/04/1967
8F 8718   7664 3113 3513 48718 08/1944 24B
26A
6C
3D
2E
5E
W
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aston
Saltley
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
27/01/1951
05/10/1957
07/11/1964
24/04/1965
23/04/1966
23/04/1966
8F 8719   7665 3114 3514 48719 08/1944 24C
6C
3D
2F
W
Lostock Hall
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aston
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
05/10/1957
07/11/1964
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
8F 8720   7666 3115 3515 48720 08/1944 24C
26A
6C
8D
8B
26A
26F
9F
9K
W
Lostock Hall
Newton Heath
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Widnes
Warrington Dallam
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Heaton Mersey
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
27/01/1951
26/01/1952
17/05/1958
25/10/1958
05/01/1963
29/01/1966
11/05/1968
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
8F 8721   7667 3116 3516 48721 08/1944 24D
15A
20B
55D
W
Lower Darwen
Wellingborough
Stourton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
16/05/1953
08/10/1966
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
8F 8722   7668 3117 3517 48722 08/1944 24A
26A
3A
8C
8G
8E
8A
W
Accrington
Newton Heath
Bescot
Speke Junction
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Northwich
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
08/09/1951
30/04/1960
21/05/1966
20/05/1967
09/03/1968
11/05/1968
11/05/1968
8F 8723   7669 3118 3518 48723 08/1944 5B
2A
6B
6A
9F
10D
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Heaton Mersey
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1963
20/06/1964
23/04/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8724   7670 3119 3519 48724 09/1944 25A
87K
84G
84F
2E
2F
2B
8F
W
Wakefield
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Saltley
Bescot
Oxley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
10/09/1955
08/09/1962
30/11/1963
14/03/1964
26/03/1966
11/03/1967
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8725   7671 3120 3520 48725 09/1944 25A
26A
3A
2E
5B
W
Wakefield
Newton Heath
Bescot
Saltley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
08/09/1951
03/01/1966
11/03/1967
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8726   7672 3121 3521 48726 09/1944 25A
6C
3D
21B
2H
W
Wakefield
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Aston
Bescot
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
05/10/1957
15/07/1961
26/03/1966
17/09/1966
17/09/1966
8F 8727   7673 3122 3522 48727 09/1944 25A
26A
3A
5C
3A
9D
8B
8E
16D
2F
16E
5B
8H
8G
8E
10F
W
Wakefield
Newton Heath
Bescot
Stafford
Bescot
Buxton (LNWR)
Warrington Dallam
Northwich
Annesley
Woodford Halse
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Northwich
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
08/09/1951
01/12/1956
26/01/1957
10/12/1960
12/01/1963
16/03/1963
25/05/1963
27/07/1963
29/02/1964
28/03/1964
07/11/1964
17/04/1965
20/05/1967
09/03/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8728   7674 3123 3523 48728 09/1944 15C
18A
17B
16B
2E
W
Leicester Midland
Toton
Burton
Colwick
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
23/05/1959
24/09/1966
04/02/1967
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8729   7675 3124 3524 48729 09/1944 5B
2A
8C
1A
12A
5B
1E
6B
5B
2F
2E
5D
5B
9E
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Speke Junction
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Crewe South
Bletchley
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Bescot
Saltley
Stoke
Crewe South
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
30/01/1954
11/08/1956
15/08/1959
18/06/1960
23/06/1962
12/10/1963
25/01/1964
19/09/1964
03/01/1966
11/03/1967
12/08/1967
18/11/1967
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8730     3125 3525 48730 09/1945 25A
84G
87K
87F
82F
10D
10F
W
Wakefield
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
31/12/1950
05/09/1959
20/07/1964
12/09/1964
17/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8731     3126 3526 48731 09/1945 5B
9F
9A
9F
W
Crewe South
Heaton Mersey
Longsight
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
23/02/1952
08/10/1955
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
8F 8732     3127 3527 48732 10/1945 25A
84G
87K
87F
87A
87F
W
Wakefield
Shrewsbury
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
31/12/1950
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
08/11/1964
07/11/1965
26/10/1965
8F 8733     3128 3528 48733 10/1945 25B
3A
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
29/05/1965
29/05/1965
8F 8734     3129 3529 48734 10/1945 5B
9D
5B
21B
W
Crewe South
Buxton (LNWR)
Crewe South
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
03/11/1956
07/01/1961
03/10/1964
03/10/1964
8F 8735     3130 3530 48735 11/1945 25G
87K
87F
10D
8E
W
Farnley Junction
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Lostock Hall
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
05/09/1959
12/09/1964
20/03/1965
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
8F 8736     3131 3531 48736 11/1945 4A
5B
8C
5B
9G
5B
2E
2B
2A
5B
W
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Northwich
Crewe South
Northampton
Nuneaton
Rugby
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
23/02/1952
09/08/1952
29/11/1952
24/01/1953
20/06/1959
12/05/1962
07/07/1962
29/09/1962
13/08/1966
13/08/1966
8F 8737     3132 3532 48737 11/1945 25B
87K
86C
84G
82F
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Cardiff Canton
Shrewsbury
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
05/09/1959
31/10/1959
30/12/1961
13/06/1965
13/06/1965
8F 8738     3133 3533 48738 12/1945 25D
26B
87K
84G
84G
1H
2B
5D
W
Mirfield
Agecroft
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Shrewsbury
Northampton
Oxley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
30/11/1950
29/11/1952
27/12/1952
19/09/1964
09/01/1965
07/08/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
8F 8739     3134 3534 48739 12/1945 25G
87K
84G
1H
10A
10D
W
Farnley Junction
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Shrewsbury
Northampton
Carnforth
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
31/12/1951
19/09/1964
21/08/1965
15/01/1966
21/01/1967
21/01/1967
8F 8740     3135 3535 48740 01/1946 5B
8E
9K
W
Crewe South
Northwich
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
22/08/1964
09/03/1968
09/03/1968
8F 8741     3136 3536 48741 02/1946 5B
21A
9F
9E
W
Crewe South
Saltley
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
11/07/1953
08/08/1953
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
8F 8742     3137 3537 48742 03/1946 5B
9G
8A
9D
W
Crewe South
Northwich
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
21/05/1960
06/08/1966
02/09/1967
02/09/1967
8F 8743     3138 3538 48743 03/1946 4A
21A
5B
9E
9K
9J
8A
W
Shrewsbury
Saltley
Crewe South
Trafford Park (LMS)
Bolton
Agecroft
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
09/08/1952
24/07/1965
21/08/1965
18/09/1965
22/10/1966
25/03/1967
25/03/1967
8F 8744     3139 3539 48744 05/1946 5B
9A
9B
9D
9L
9K
W
Crewe South
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
26/11/1960
19/06/1965
08/01/1966
09/03/1968
16/03/1968
16/03/1968
8F 8745     3140 3540 48745 04/1946 5B
9A
26A
26F
9J
9B
W
Crewe South
Longsight
Newton Heath
Patricroft
Agecroft
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
22/11/1958
05/01/1963
15/01/1966
22/10/1966
04/05/1968
04/05/1968
8F 8746     3141 3541 48746 05/1946 5B
8B
8A
9D
W
Crewe South
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
05/05/1962
11/05/1968
25/05/1968
25/05/1968
8F 8747     3142 3542 48747 05/1946 5B
8C
21B
6C
W
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Bescot
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
23/06/1962
15/01/1966
03/09/1966
03/09/1966
8F 8748     3143 3543 48748 06/1946 5B
21A
16A
16C
9G
9F
9L
W
Crewe South
Saltley
Nottingham
Derby
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
31/10/1953
22/08/1964
07/11/1964
12/06/1965
18/09/1965
30/04/1966
30/04/1966
8F 8749     3144 3544 48749 08/1946 5B
6B
8D
6B
6G
9H
W
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Widnes
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
08/11/1958
25/07/1959
23/04/1966
28/05/1966
30/03/1968
30/03/1968
8F 8750     3145 3545 48750 08/1946 5B
20A
20C
14A
15B
18A
18B
40E
8G
8E
W
Crewe South
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Toton
Westhouses
Colwick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
17/07/1954
06/11/1954
23/05/1959
20/06/1959
18/02/1961
18/12/1965
03/09/1966
20/05/1967
20/01/1968
20/01/1968
8F 8751     3146 3546 48751 09/1946 25D
26A
5B
9F
2B
9B
W
Mirfield
Newton Heath
Crewe South
Heaton Mersey
Nuneaton
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/12/1950
27/01/1951
03/10/1953
04/06/1966
25/02/1967
25/02/1967
8F 8752     3147 3547 48752 10/1946 25D
3A
3D
2F
2B
8F
8A
10F
W
Mirfield
Bescot
Aston
Bescot
Oxley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
08/11/1958
07/11/1964
26/03/1966
04/02/1967
09/12/1967
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8753     3148 3548 48753 10/1945 5B
8D
6B
2B
9L
W
Crewe South
Widnes
Mold Junction
Nuneaton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
25/07/1959
18/06/1960
28/05/1966
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
8F 8754     3149 3549 48754 10/1945 25G
5B
4A
6B
2B
2E
2A
1H
1A
6B
6A
W
Farnley Junction
Crewe South
Bletchley
Mold Junction
Nuneaton
Northampton
Rugby
Northampton
Willesden
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
27/01/1951
07/11/1959
06/02/1960
07/07/1962
15/12/1962
20/06/1964
23/01/1965
02/10/1965
23/04/1966
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
8F 8755     3150 3550 48755 10/1945 25G
26A
3A
5C
1E
1F
2B
2E
W
Farnley Junction
Newton Heath
Bescot
Stafford
Bletchley
Rugby
Oxley
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/09/1951
14/05/1960
23/06/1962
12/10/1963
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
09/1966
09/1966
8F 8756     3151 3551 48756 11/1945 26A
NTH
26A
5B
4A
12B
68A
9D
W
Newton Heath
Northwich
Newton Heath
Crewe South
Bletchley
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
27/01/1951
16/06/1951
17/05/1952
11/07/1964
07/01/1967
07/01/1967
8F 8757     3152 3552 48757 11/1945 5B
2A
2E
5B
89A
5B
1G
1E
1A
2C
10F
W
Crewe South
Rugby
Northampton
Crewe South
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Woodford Halse
Bletchley
Willesden
Stourbridge Junction
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
19/11/1960
15/09/1962
26/01/1963
16/03/1963
23/01/1965
27/02/1965
08/05/1965
02/10/1965
23/07/1966
16/12/1967
16/12/1967
8F 8758     3153 3553 48758 12/1945 5B
1A
12B
68A
9D
W
Crewe South
Willesden
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
16/06/1951
09/08/1952
27/06/1964
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
8F 8759     3154 3554 48759 12/1945 26A
15B
15A
W
Newton Heath
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/03/1965
26/06/1965
27/11/1965
27/11/1965
8F 8760     3155 3555 48760 12/1945 26A
84G
86G
86G
87K
87F
87A
87F
82F
W
Newton Heath
Shrewsbury
Pontypool Road
Pontypool Road
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
25/01/1958
22/02/1958
29/11/1958
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
08/11/1964
08/08/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
8F 8761     3156 3556 48761 01/1946 26A
26A
87K
87F
87F
W
Newton Heath
Newton Heath
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Llanelly
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
30/11/1950
05/09/1959
24/08/1964
04/01/1965
04/01/1965
8F 8762     3157 3557 48762 01/1946 26A
24A
5C
21B
6C
6B
5B
2C
2E
W
Newton Heath
Accrington
Stafford
Bescot
Croes Newydd
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Stourbridge Junction
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
14/05/1960
23/06/1962
21/09/1963
05/10/1963
25/01/1964
14/11/1964
19/06/1965
26/02/1966
26/02/1966
8F 8763     3158 3558 48763 02/1946 26A
16A
16G
16B
9E
10D
W
Newton Heath
Nottingham
Westhouses
Colwick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
10/04/1965
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
09/03/1968
13/04/1968
13/04/1968
8F 8764     3159 3559 48764 02/1946 5B
5B
8D
5B
1A
1E
8E
8F
9K
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Widnes
Crewe South
Willesden
Bletchley
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
28/12/1957
25/01/1958
09/08/1958
20/06/1959
07/11/1959
19/06/1965
09/12/1967
16/12/1967
16/12/1967
8F 8765     3160 3560 48765 03/1946 26A
24A
19A
41D
41E
9D
9B
9F
10D
W
Newton Heath
Accrington
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Newton Heath
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
08/09/1951
13/05/1961
08/12/1962
25/04/1964
06/11/1965
02/09/1967
11/05/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
8F 8766     3161 3561 48766 03/1946 26B
26A
3A
1A
3A
5D
W
Agecroft
Newton Heath
Bescot
Willesden
Bescot
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
08/09/1951
05/11/1955
03/12/1955
15/01/1966
25/02/1967
25/02/1967
8F 8767     3162 3562 48767 03/1946 26C
24A
6C
3A
5D
5B
W
Bolton
Accrington
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bescot
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
15/01/1966
11/03/1967
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
8F 8768     3163 3563 48768 03/1946 26D
26A
87K
86C
84G
5D
9F
W
Bury
Newton Heath
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Cardiff Canton
Shrewsbury
Stoke
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
30/11/1950
05/09/1959
31/10/1959
20/06/1964
12/08/1967
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
8F 8769     3164 3564 48769 04/1946 26D
3A
W
Bury
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
8F 8770     3165 3565 48770 05/1946 5B
6B
20A
16C
17C
18A
14A
16A
14A
16D
26F
W
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Rowsley
Toton
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Cricklewood East
Annesley
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
23/02/1952
30/01/1954
23/05/1959
21/11/1959
21/01/1961
17/02/1962
12/05/1962
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
08/04/1967
08/04/1967
8F 8771     3166 3566 48771 05/1946 5B
6B
6G
8H
10D
W
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/07/1959
08/07/1961
07/11/1964
22/05/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
8F 8772     3167 3567 48772 06/1946 5B
15A
18A
41E
41D
41E
W
Crewe South
Wellingborough
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
02/01/1954
16/08/1958
04/06/1960
25/05/1963
19/01/1964
19/01/1964
8F   70500       48773 06/1940 66A
66A

12A
9B
9L
9K
10F
W
Polmadie
Polmadie (Re-instd)

Carlisle Kingmoor (Re-instd)
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Bolton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
09/1957
02/1963
20/06/1963
30/11/1963
25/01/1964
20/06/1964
19/09/1964
06/07/1968
10/08/1968
10/08/1968
8F   70501       48774 08/1940 66A

66A

12A
8C
W
Polmadie

Polmadie (Re-instd)

Carlisle Kingmoor (Re-instd)
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
09/1957
29/12/1962
02/1963
20/06/1963
30/11/1963
30/05/1964
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
8F   70512       48775 04/1937 66A

66A

12A
9D
9J
9H
10D
W
Polmadie

Polmadie (Re-instd)

Carlisle Kingmoor (Re-instd)
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Patricroft
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
09/1957
29/12/1962
02/1963
20/06/1963
30/11/1963
27/06/1964
04/06/1966
22/10/1966
06/07/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968