LMS Ivatt "2MT" Class 2-6-0 - 'Mickey Mouse'
LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6400 | 46400 | 12/1946 | 06/05/1967 | 20.42 | 20.76 | |||||
6401 | 46401 | 12/1946 | 07/05/1966 | 19.42 | 19.68 | |||||
6402 | 46402 | 12/1946 | 06/1967 | 20.5 | 21.10 | |||||
6403 | 46403 | 12/1946 | 29/06/1964 | 17.5 | 17.93 | |||||
6404 | 46404 | 12/1946 | 08/05/1965 | 18.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1965 | 18.85 | ||
6405 | 46405 | 12/1946 | 12/1966 | 20 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1967 | 20.35 | ||
6406 | 46406 | 12/1946 | 21/01/1967 | 20.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 20.76 | ||
6407 | 46407 | 12/1946 | 18/12/1961 | 15 | 15.18 | |||||
6408 | 46408 | 12/1946 | 26/10/1962 | 15.83 | 17.10 | |||||
6409 | 46409 | 12/1946 | 13/07/1964 | 17.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1964 | 17.93 | ||
6410 | 46410 | 01/1947 | 19/03/1966 | 19.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1966 | 19.43 | ||
6411 | 46411 | 01/1947 | 14/01/1967 | 20 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 21.18 | ||
6412 | 46412 | 01/1947 | 06/08/1966 | 19.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1966 | 19.85 | ||
6413 | 46413 | 02/1947 | 18/10/1965 | 18.67 | 19.01 | |||||
6414 | 46414 | 02/1947 | 11/06/1966 | 19.33 | 19.84 | |||||
6415 | 46415 | 02/1947 | 31/10/1962 | 15.67 | 17.01 | |||||
6416 | 46416 | 02/1947 | 23/04/1966 | 19.17 | 19.42 | |||||
6417 | 46417 | 03/1947 | 18/02/1967 | 19.92 | 20.27 | |||||
6418 | 46418 | 03/1947 | 21/01/1967 | 19.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 20.52 | ||
6419 | 46419 | 03/1947 | 09/1966 | 19.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1966 | 19.77 | ||
46420 | 06/11/1948 | 16/01/1965 | 16.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1965 | 16.36 | |||
46421 | 06/11/1948 | 08/10/1966 | 17.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1967 | 18.29 | |||
46422 | 13/11/1948 | Widnes | 24/12/1966 | 18.08 | 18.51 | |||||
46423 | 27/11/1948 | Widnes | 16/01/1965 | 16.17 | 16.47 | |||||
46424 | 27/11/1948 | Widnes | 10/12/1966 | 18.08 | 18.47 | |||||
46425 | 04/12/1948 | Bescot | 11/09/1965 | 16.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 17.13 | ||
46426 | 04/12/1948 | Bescot | 24/09/1966 | 17.75 | 18.54 | |||||
46427 | 04/12/1948 | Bescot | 08/10/1966 | 17.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1967 | 18.21 | ||
46428 | 04/12/1948 | Preston | 12/1966 | 18 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
46429 | 04/12/1948 | Preston | 02/07/1966 | 17.58 | 17.87 | |||||
46430 | 11/12/1948 | Preston | 09/10/1965 | 16.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 17.02 | ||
46431 | 18/12/1948 | 25/03/1967 | 18.25 | 19.00 | ||||||
46432 | 25/12/1948 | 06/05/1967 | 18.42 | 18.90 | ||||||
46433 | 31/12/1948 | 06/05/1967 | 18.42 | 18.72 | ||||||
46434 | 31/12/1948 | 24/09/1966 | 17.75 | 18.05 | ||||||
46435 | 14/01/1950 | Blackpool Central | 13/07/1964 | 14.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1964 | 14.85 | ||
46436 | 14/01/1950 | Fleetwood | 06/05/1967 | 17.33 | 17.76 | |||||
46437 | 01/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17.33 | 17.76 | ||||||
46438 | 01/1950 | 08/02/1963 | 13.08 | 14.01 | ||||||
46439 | 01/1950 | 18/03/1967 | 17.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1967 | 17.68 | |||
46440 | 02/1950 | 25/03/1967 | 17.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1967 | 17.59 | |||
46441 | 02/1950 | 15/04/1967 | 17.17 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
46442 | 02/1950 | 08/10/1966 | 16.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1967 | 16.93 | |||
46443 | 02/1950 | 25/03/1967 | 17.08 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
46444 | 02/1950 | 10/07/1965 | 15.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1965 | 15.67 | |||
46445 | 02/1950 | 02/07/1966 | 16.42 | 16.67 | ||||||
46446 | 03/1950 | 17/12/1966 | 16.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 17.52 | |||
46447 | 03/1950 | 31/12/1966 | 16.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
46448 | 03/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17.17 | 17.60 | ||||||
46449 | 03/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17.17 | 17.60 | ||||||
46450 | 04/1950 | 17/01/1966 | 15.75 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 04/1968 | 18.01 | |||
46451 | 04/1950 | 12/1966 | 16.67 | 17.09 | ||||||
46452 | 04/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17.08 | 17.60 | ||||||
46453 | 04/1950 | 16/04/1962 | 12 | 12.43 | ||||||
46454 | 04/1950 | 08/10/1966 | 16.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1967 | 16.93 | |||
46455 | 04/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17.08 | 17.51 | ||||||
46456 | 05/1950 | 25/09/1965 | 15.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1965 | 15.52 | |||
46457 | 05/1950 | 06/05/1967 | 17 | 17.43 | ||||||
46458 | 05/1950 | 17/12/1966 | 16.58 | 17.01 | ||||||
46459 | 05/1950 | 09/1965 | 15.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 15.60 | |||
46460 | 05/1950 | St Margarets | 24/08/1966 | 16.25 | 16.60 | |||||
46461 | 06/1950 | St Margarets | 30/07/1964 | 14.08 | 14.51 | |||||
46462 | 06/1950 | St Margarets | 22/08/1966 | 16.17 | 16.43 | |||||
46463 | 06/1950 | 07/02/1966 | 15.67 | 16.01 | ||||||
46464 | 06/1950 | 09/1966 | 16.25 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
46465 | 06/1951 | Cambridge | 04/03/1967 | 15.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 16.26 | ||
46466 | 06/1951 | Cambridge | 09/1962 | 11.25 | 11.26 | |||||
46467 | 06/1951 | Cambridge | 23/07/1964 | 13.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1964 | 13.43 | ||
46468 | 07/1951 | Colchester | 18/10/1965 | 14.25 | 14.56 | |||||
46469 | 07/1951 | Colchester | 09/1962 | 11.17 | 11.18 | |||||
46470 | 07/1951 | West Auckland | 06/05/1967 | 15.83 | 16.26 | |||||
46471 | 07/1951 | Kirkby Stephen | 18/10/1962 | 11.25 | 11.35 | |||||
46472 | 07/1951 | Darlington | 16/01/1965 | 13.5 | 13.76 | |||||
46473 | 08/1951 | West Auckland | 16/12/1963 | 12.33 | 12.51 | |||||
46474 | 08/1951 | Kirkby Stephen | 23/07/1964 | 12.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1964 | 13.26 | ||
46475 | 08/1951 | Darlington | 30/07/1964 | 12.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 10/1964 | 13.18 | ||
46476 | 09/1951 | Kirkby Stephen | 29/01/1962 | 10.33 | 10.59 | |||||
46477 | 09/1951 | Darlington | 17/12/1962 | 11.25 | 12.34 | |||||
46478 | 09/1951 | Kirkby Stephen | 30/04/1962 | 10.58 | 10.76 | |||||
46479 | 09/1951 | West Auckland | 26/07/1965 | 13.83 | 14.18 | |||||
46480 | 09/1951 | Darlington | 06/05/1967 | 15.67 | 16.26 | |||||
46481 | 10/1951 | Kirkby Stephen | 14/12/1962 | 11.17 | 11.59 | |||||
46482 | 10/1951 | West Auckland | 28/08/1965 | 13.83 | 14.08 | |||||
46483 | 10/1951 | 18/11/1963 | 12.08 | 12.35 | ||||||
46484 | 10/1951 | 06/1967 | 15.67 | 16.35 | ||||||
46485 | 11/1951 | 06/1967 | 15.58 | 16.50 | ||||||
46486 | 11/1951 | 06/05/1967 | 15.5 | 15.84 | ||||||
46487 | 11/1951 | 06/05/1967 | 15.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 16.01 | |||
46488 | 11/1951 | 12/06/1965 | 13.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Dinsdale) | 10/1965 | 13.93 | |||
46489 | 11/1951 | 16/11/1963 | 12 | 11.99 | ||||||
46490 | 11/1951 | 06/05/1967 | 15.5 | 15.93 | ||||||
46491 | 12/1951 | Workington | 06/05/1967 | 15.42 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 11/1967 | 15.93 | ||
46492 | 12/1951 | Aston | 06/1967 | 15.5 | 16.18 | |||||
46493 | 12/1951 | Burton | 18/10/1962 | 10.83 | 11.01 | |||||
46494 | 27/12/1951 | Burton | 12/09/1962 | 10.75 | 10.81 | |||||
46495 | 30/01/1952 | Kettering | 08/10/1966 | 14.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1967 | 15.05 | ||
46496 | 05/02/1952 | Kettering | 02/04/1966 | 14.17 | 14.45 | |||||
46497 | 02/1952 | Holbeck (MR) | 24/04/1965 | 13.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1965 | 13.59 | ||
46498 | 27/02/1952 | Holbeck (MR) | 20/09/1965 | 13.58 | 13.81 | |||||
46499 | 03/1952 | Toton | 06/05/1967 | 15.17 | 15.51 | |||||
46500 | 03/1952 | Toton | 07/01/1967 | 14.83 | Cut | Cohens (Ickles) | 06/1967 | 15.26 | ||
46501 | 24/04/1952 | Nottingham | 06/05/1967 | 15.08 | 15.57 | |||||
46502 | 03/1952 | Nottingham | 25/02/1967 | 14.92 | 15.26 | |||||
46503 | 05/11/1952 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 15.04 | ||
46504 | 19/11/1952 | Oswestry | 15/10/1966 | 13.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 14.25 | ||
46505 | 21/11/1952 | Oswestry | 06/1967 | 14.58 | 14.99 | |||||
46506 | 27/11/1952 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.5 | 14.98 | |||||
46507 | 28/11/1952 | Oswestry | 26/06/1965 | 12.58 | 12.89 | |||||
46508 | 02/12/1952 | Oswestry | 17/12/1966 | 14 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1967 | 15.04 | ||
46509 | 05/12/1952 | Oswestry | 08/10/1966 | 13.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1967 | 14.12 | ||
46510 | 09/12/1952 | Oswestry | 09/1965 | 12.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 13.27 | ||
46511 | 12/12/1952 | Oswestry | 09/1965 | 12.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 13.10 | ||
46512 | 16/12/1952 | Oswestry | 12/1966 | 14 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
46513 | 19/12/1952 | Oswestry | 16/07/1966 | 13.58 | 14.08 | |||||
46514 | 23/12/1952 | Oswestry | 25/06/1966 | 13.5 | 13.82 | |||||
46515 | 06/01/1953 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.33 | 14.95 | |||||
46516 | 13/01/1953 | Oswestry | 05/1967 | 14.33 | 14.85 | |||||
46517 | 22/01/1953 | Oswestry | 12/1966 | 13.92 | 14.24 | |||||
46518 | 27/01/1953 | Oswestry | 19/03/1966 | 13.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1966 | 13.39 | ||
46519 | 03/02/1953 | Oswestry | 08/10/1966 | 13.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1967 | 14.04 | ||
46520 | 09/02/1953 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 14.77 | ||
46521 | 19/02/1953 | Oswestry | 29/10/1966 | 13.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
46522 | 03/03/1953 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1968 | 14.96 | ||
46523 | 05/03/1953 | Oswestry | 06/05/1967 | 14.17 | 14.71 | |||||
46524 | 11/03/1953 | Oswestry | 20/02/1965 | 11.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1965 | 12.19 | ||
46525 | 07/03/1953 | St Philips Marsh | 12/12/1964 | 11.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1965 | 12.20 | ||
46526 | 25/03/1953 | St Philips Marsh | 16/07/1966 | 13.33 | 13.73 | |||||
46527 | 01/04/1953 | St Philips Marsh | 09/10/1965 | 12.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1966 | 13.13 |