Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Ivatt "2MT" Class 2-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 11/02/1961 46407,
46460
50D,
61C
  Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.
   
Sat 11/11/1961 46450,
46480
41C,
50A
  Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 26/11/1961 46506 82B   Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 46450,
46460,
46467,
46476,
46494
41D,
63C,
67B,
Wdn,
31A
  Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 08/04/1962 46520 89D   Oswestry Works visit: Around the works SLS 5/1962  
Sat 29/04/1967 46432,
46515
8F,
8F
  A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt