LMS Ivatt "2MT" Class 2-6-0 - 'Mickey Mouse'
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6400 | 15B | Kettering | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6401 | 15B | Kettering | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6402 | 15B | Kettering | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6403 | 15B | Kettering | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6404 | 15B | Kettering | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6405 | 25G | Farnley Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6406 | 25G | Farnley Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6407 | 25C | Goole | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6408 | 25C | Goole | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6409 | 25A | Wakefield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6410 | 24E | Blackpool Central | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6411 | 24E | Blackpool Central | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6412 | 24E | Blackpool Central | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6413 | 24E | Blackpool Central | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6414 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6415 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6416 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6417 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6418 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6419 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
13/11/1948 | To Service | 46422 | NEW | 8D | Widnes | ||
27/11/1948 | To Service | 46423 | NEW | 8D | Widnes | ||
27/11/1948 | To Service | 46424 | NEW | 8D | Widnes | ||
04/12/1948 | To Service | 46425 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
04/12/1948 | To Service | 46426 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
04/12/1948 | To Service | 46427 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
04/12/1948 | To Service | 46428 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
04/12/1948 | To Service | 46429 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
11/12/1948 | To Service | 46430 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46413 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 46405 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 23A | Bank Hall | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 46406 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 23A | Bank Hall | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 46405 | 23A | Bank Hall | 23A | Bank Hall | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 46406 | 23A | Bank Hall | 23A | Bank Hall | |
14/01/1950 | To Service | 46435 | NEW | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
14/01/1950 | To Service | 46436 | NEW | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 46405 | 23A | Bank Hall | 25C | Goole | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 6409 | 25A | Wakefield | 25C | Goole | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 46438 | 25A | Wakefield | |||
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 46439 | 25A | Wakefield | |||
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 46437 | 25C | Goole | |||
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 46446 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
05/1950 | To Service | 46460 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | ||
27/05/1950 | Reallocation | 46447 | 12D | Workington | |||
27/05/1950 | Reallocation | 46448 | 12D | Workington | |||
27/05/1950 | Reallocation | 46449 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |||
06/1950 | To Service | 46461 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | ||
06/1950 | To Service | 46462 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | ||
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |||
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46447 | 12D | Workington | 12D | Workington | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46448 | 12D | Workington | 12D | Workington | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46449 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
01/07/1950 | Reallocation | 46456 | 12D | Workington | |||
29/07/1950 | Reallocation | 46436 | 24F | Fleetwood | 27E | Walton on the Hill | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46413 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 28A | Blackpool Central | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46459 | 2A | Rugby | |||
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46434 | 8D | Widnes | |||
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46427 | 3A | Bescot | 3E | Monument Lane | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46457 | 12D | Workington | |||
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46427 | 3E | Monument Lane | 3E | Monument Lane | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10B | Preston | 10B | Preston | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46434 | 8D | Widnes | 8D | Widnes | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46437 | 25C | Goole | 27E | Walton on the Hill | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46457 | 12D | Workington | 12D | Workington | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46459 | 2A | Rugby | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46458 | 12D | Workington | |||
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46459 | 5A | Crewe North | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46458 | 12D | Workington | 12D | Workington | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46459 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46464 | 64A | St Margarets | |||
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46436 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 25C | Goole | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46437 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 25C | Goole | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46445 | 2D | Coventry | |||
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46446 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2D | Coventry | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46464 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 46464 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
17/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46464 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
17/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46427 | 3E | Monument Lane | 3D | Aston | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46427 | 3D | Aston | 3D | Aston | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10B | Preston | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10B | Preston | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
06/1951 | To Service | 46465 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | ||
06/1951 | To Service | 46466 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | ||
06/1951 | To Service | 46467 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | ||
09/06/1951 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10F | Lower Ince | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10F | Lower Ince | 10F | Lower Ince | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 27C | Southport | |
07/1951 | To Service | 46468 | NEW | 30E | Colchester | ||
07/1951 | To Service | 46469 | NEW | 30E | Colchester | ||
07/1951 | To Service | 46470 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
07/1951 | To Service | 46471 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
07/1951 | To Service | 46472 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | ||
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 7D | Rhyl | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 7D | Rhyl | 7D | Rhyl | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27C | Southport | 27C | Southport | |
08/1951 | To Service | 46473 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
08/1951 | To Service | 46474 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
08/1951 | To Service | 46475 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | ||
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27C | Southport | 27E | Walton on the Hill | |
09/1951 | To Service | 46476 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
09/1951 | To Service | 46477 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | ||
09/1951 | To Service | 46478 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
09/1951 | To Service | 46479 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
09/1951 | To Service | 46480 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | ||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 27E | Walton on the Hill | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 28A | Blackpool Central | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 27A | Bank Hall | |
10/1951 | To Service | 46481 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
10/1951 | To Service | 46482 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 7D | Rhyl | 7B | Bangor | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27A | Bank Hall | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 7B | Bangor | 7D | Rhyl | |
27/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 7D | Rhyl | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
27/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46444 | 15C | Leicester Midland | |||
12/1951 | To Service | 46491 | NEW | 12D | Workington | ||
12/1951 | To Service | 46492 | NEW | 3D | Aston | ||
12/1951 | To Service | 46493 | NEW | 17B | Burton | ||
27/12/1951 | To Service | 46494 | NEW | 17B | Burton | ||
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10B | Preston | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 46444 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 15B | Kettering | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 46460 | 64A | St Margarets | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 46486 | 28A | Blackpool Central | |||
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 46487 | 28A | Blackpool Central | |||
30/01/1952 | To Service | 46495 | NEW | 15B | Kettering | ||
02/1952 | To Service | 46497 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
05/02/1952 | To Service | 46496 | NEW | 15B | Kettering | ||
27/02/1952 | To Service | 46498 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
03/1952 | To Service | 46499 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
03/1952 | To Service | 46500 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
03/1952 | To Service | 46502 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 46483 | 27A | Bank Hall | |||
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10F | Lower Ince | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46500 | 18A | Toton | 18B | Westhouses | |
24/04/1952 | To Service | 46501 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 46500 | 18B | Westhouses | 18A | Toton | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 46500 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46420 | 6K | Rhyl | |||
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10B | Preston | 6K | Rhyl | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46432 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46493 | 17B | Burton | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46420 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46430 | 6K | Rhyl | 10B | Preston | |
05/11/1952 | To Service | 46503 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
19/11/1952 | To Service | 46504 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
21/11/1952 | To Service | 46505 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
27/11/1952 | To Service | 46506 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
28/11/1952 | To Service | 46507 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10B | Preston | 10B | Preston | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46489 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46503 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46504 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46505 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46506 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46507 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
02/12/1952 | To Service | 46508 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
05/12/1952 | To Service | 46509 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
09/12/1952 | To Service | 46510 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
12/12/1952 | To Service | 46511 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
16/12/1952 | To Service | 46512 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
19/12/1952 | To Service | 46513 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
23/12/1952 | To Service | 46514 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46508 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46509 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46510 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46511 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46512 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46513 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46514 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
06/01/1953 | To Service | 46515 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
13/01/1953 | To Service | 46516 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
22/01/1953 | To Service | 46517 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
27/01/1953 | To Service | 46518 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
03/02/1953 | To Service | 46519 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
09/02/1953 | To Service | 46520 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
19/02/1953 | To Service | 46521 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
03/03/1953 | To Service | 46522 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
05/03/1953 | To Service | 46523 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
07/03/1953 | To Service | 46525 | NEW | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
11/03/1953 | To Service | 46524 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 46424 | 8D | Widnes | 1A | Willesden | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 46480 | 51A | Darlington | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 46521 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
25/03/1953 | To Service | 46526 | NEW | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
01/04/1953 | To Service | 46527 | NEW | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46477 | 51A | Darlington | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46522 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46523 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46524 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 46499 | 18A | Toton | 18C | Hasland | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 46500 | 18A | Toton | 18C | Hasland | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 46518 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46423 | 8D | Widnes | 8D | Widnes | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46425 | 3A | Bescot | 6K | Rhyl | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46434 | 8D | Widnes | 6K | Rhyl | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 46400 | 15B | Kettering | 21B | Bournville | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 46424 | 1A | Willesden | 6K | Rhyl | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 46425 | 6K | Rhyl | 3A | Bescot | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 46516 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 46517 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46400 | 21B | Bournville | 15B | Kettering | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46415 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46424 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46452 | 20F | Skipton | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46487 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46415 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 25A | Wakefield | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46434 | 6K | Rhyl | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46487 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 25C | Goole | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46410 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 26A | Newton Heath | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46411 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 26A | Newton Heath | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46412 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 26B | Agecroft | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46485 | 26B | Agecroft | |||
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46501 | 16A | Nottingham | 16D | Mansfield | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12D | Workington | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 46489 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12D | Workington | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 46491 | 12D | Workington | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46400 | 15B | Kettering | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46422 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46440 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46448 | 12D | Workington | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12D | Workington | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46459 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12D | Workington | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46486 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 26B | Agecroft | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46494 | 17B | Burton | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 46422 | 5A | Crewe North | 8D | Widnes | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 46440 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 17A | Derby | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 46453 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46422 | 8D | Widnes | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46448 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 46421 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |||
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10B | Preston | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
11/09/1954 | Reallocation | 46421 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 8D | Widnes | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46412 | 26B | Agecroft | 27B | Aintree | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46413 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 27A | Bank Hall | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46422 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46428 | 6K | Rhyl | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46430 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 10B | Preston | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46439 | 25A | Wakefield | 27B | Aintree | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46472 | 51A | Darlington | 51F | West Auckland | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46479 | 51F | West Auckland | 51A | Darlington | |
27/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46461 | 64A | St Margarets | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46429 | 10B | Preston | 5D | Stoke | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46430 | 10B | Preston | 5D | Stoke | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46487 | 25C | Goole | 26A | Newton Heath | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46507 | 89A | Oswestry | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46508 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Brecon | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46523 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46461 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46470 | 51F | West Auckland | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51F | West Auckland | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46472 | 51F | West Auckland | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46480 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51F | West Auckland | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46403 | 15B | Kettering | 15B | Kettering | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46406 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26D | Bury | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46413 | 27A | Bank Hall | 25A | Wakefield | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46414 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 26D | Bury | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46416 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26D | Bury | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46417 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26D | Bury | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46435 | 27A | Bank Hall | 25A | Wakefield | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46483 | 27A | Bank Hall | 25A | Wakefield | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46527 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46449 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12D | Workington | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46476 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51F | West Auckland | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46481 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51F | West Auckland | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46491 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 12D | Workington | |
14/05/1955 | Reallocation | 46464 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51F | West Auckland | 51A | Darlington | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46473 | 51F | West Auckland | 51A | Darlington | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46474 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51A | Darlington | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46476 | 51F | West Auckland | 51A | Darlington | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46477 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51A | Darlington | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 46478 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51A | Darlington | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46458 | 12D | Workington | 1A | Willesden | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51A | Darlington | 51F | West Auckland | |
24/12/1955 | Reallocation | 46464 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 46436 | 25C | Goole | 26D | Bury | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 46437 | 25C | Goole | 26A | Newton Heath | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 46497 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 16A | Nottingham | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46420 | 8D | Widnes | 2D | Coventry | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46421 | 8D | Widnes | 3A | Bescot | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46422 | 8D | Widnes | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46423 | 8D | Widnes | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46424 | 8D | Widnes | 1A | Willesden | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46426 | 3A | Bescot | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46432 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46433 | 6K | Rhyl | |||
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46445 | 2D | Coventry | 6K | Rhyl | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46459 | 12D | Workington | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46400 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46405 | 25C | Goole | 27B | Aintree | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46459 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46494 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46507 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 89A | Oswestry | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46401 | 15B | Kettering | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46459 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46426 | 6K | Rhyl | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46459 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 3A | Bescot | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46440 | 17A | Derby | 18A | Toton | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46402 | 15B | Kettering | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46497 | 16A | Nottingham | 18C | Hasland | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46506 | 89A | Oswestry | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46526 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 89A | Oswestry | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 46432 | 6K | Rhyl | 12C | Workington | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 46440 | 18A | Toton | 17A | Derby | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 46440 | 17A | Derby | 18A | Toton | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 46440 | 18A | Toton | 17A | Derby | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 46478 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 46527 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 46454 | 17B | Burton | |||
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 46517 | 89B | Brecon | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46410 | 26A | Newton Heath | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46440 | 17A | Derby | 17B | Burton | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46497 | 18C | Hasland | 16A | Nottingham | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46464 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46433 | 6K | Rhyl | 5D | Stoke | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46497 | 16A | Nottingham | 18C | Hasland | |
23/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46464 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46433 | 5D | Stoke | 6K | Rhyl | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46445 | 6K | Rhyl | 5D | Stoke | |
28/12/1957 | Reallocation | 46445 | 5D | Stoke | 6K | Rhyl | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 46527 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 89A | Oswestry | |
08/02/1958 | Reallocation | 46476 | 51A | Darlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 46483 | 25A | Wakefield | 56F | Low Moor | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 46423 | 6K | Rhyl | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
12/04/1958 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 46457 | 12D | Workington | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46409 | 25C | Goole | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46433 | 6K | Rhyl | 12C | Carlisle Canal | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 46454 | 17B | Burton | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
16/08/1958 | Reallocation | 46480 | 51F | West Auckland | 50A | York (North) | |
16/08/1958 | Reallocation | 46481 | 51F | West Auckland | 50A | York (North) | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 46433 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | 11B | Workington | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46409 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 53E | Goole | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46420 | 2D | Coventry | 2A | Rugby | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46446 | 2D | Coventry | 2B | Nuneaton | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46431 | 1C | Watford | |||
06/12/1958 | Reallocation | 46423 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 2B | Nuneaton | |
20/12/1958 | Reallocation | 46472 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 2A | Rugby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46402 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46440 | 17B | Burton | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46497 | 18C | Hasland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46499 | 18C | Hasland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46500 | 18C | Hasland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46502 | 16A | Nottingham | 17A | Derby | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46415 | 25A | Wakefield | 53E | Goole | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46423 | 2B | Nuneaton | 3D | Aston | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46446 | 2B | Nuneaton | 2A | Rugby | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 46524 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46445 | 6K | Rhyl | 2A | Rugby | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46478 | 51E | Stockton | 51L | Thornaby | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46488 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |||
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46489 | 12D | Workington | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 46483 | 56F | Low Moor | 56A | Wakefield | |
17/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46482 | 51F | West Auckland | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46506 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46516 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46518 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46519 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46520 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46521 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 46522 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46468 | 30E | Colchester | 30F | Parkeston Quay | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46469 | 30E | Colchester | 30F | Parkeston Quay | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46413 | 25A | Wakefield | 56F | Low Moor | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46435 | 25A | Wakefield | 56F | Low Moor | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46438 | 25A | Wakefield | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46483 | 56A | Wakefield | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46401 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 89A | Oswestry | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46508 | 89B | Brecon | 89A | Oswestry | |
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46447 | 12D | Workington | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46472 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46448 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5F | Uttoxeter | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46461 | 64A | St Margarets | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46461 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 61C | Keith | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12D | Workington | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
12/03/1960 | Reallocation | 46448 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
12/03/1960 | Reallocation | 46478 | 51L | Thornaby | 50D | Goole | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46422 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51J | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46501 | 16D | Mansfield | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46449 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46458 | 1A | Willesden | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46472 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
07/05/1960 | Reallocation | 46434 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
07/05/1960 | Reallocation | 46442 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | |||
07/05/1960 | Reallocation | 46460 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 61C | Keith | |
07/05/1960 | Reallocation | 46461 | 61C | Keith | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46420 | 2A | Rugby | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46447 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46488 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12F | Workington | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46501 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | 24G | Skipton | |
09/07/1960 | Reallocation | 46442 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | 12F | Workington | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 46506 | 89A | Oswestry | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46420 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46447 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6H | Bangor | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46449 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | 24K | Preston | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46470 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46471 | 51F | West Auckland | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46473 | 51A | Darlington | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46474 | 51A | Darlington | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46479 | 51A | Darlington | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
24/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46454 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46413 | 56F | Low Moor | 56A | Wakefield | |
10/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46420 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 2B | Nuneaton | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46468 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | 30A | Stratford | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46469 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | 30A | Stratford | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46468 | 30A | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46469 | 30A | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46473 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46474 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 46495 | 15B | Kettering | 17A | Derby | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 46468 | 31A | Cambridge | 63C | Oban | |
01/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46450 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |||
01/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46494 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 31A | Cambridge | |
08/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46473 | 52B | Heaton | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
15/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46451 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |||
29/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46471 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46473 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46479 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
03/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46468 | 63C | Oban | 63A | Perth South | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46422 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46460 | 61C | Keith | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46468 | 63A | Perth South | 63C | Oban | |
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 46460 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 63C | Oban | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46447 | 6H | Bangor | 2B | Nuneaton | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46449 | 24K | Preston | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46456 | 12D | Workington | 21B | Bescot | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46400 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 31A | Cambridge | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46451 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 91X | To Scottish Region | |
14/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46467 | 31A | Cambridge | 91X | To Scottish Region | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46451 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 67B | Hurlford | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46467 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 67B | Hurlford | |
11/11/1961 | Reallocation | 46458 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 46443 | 21A | Saltley | |||
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 46454 | 17A | Derby | 21A | Saltley | |
18/12/1961 | Condemned | 46407 | 25C | Goole | COND | ||
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46442 | 12F | Workington | 21B | Bescot | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46450 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
13/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46457 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 21B | Bescot | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46409 | 53E | Goole | 50E | Scarborough | |
29/01/1962 | Condemned | 46476 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46422 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46428 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21B | Bescot | |
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46448 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21B | Bescot | |
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46470 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21D | Aston | |
17/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46471 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
17/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46473 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
17/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46474 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
17/02/1962 | Reallocation | 46479 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46408 | 25C | Goole | 50F | Malton | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46413 | 56A | Wakefield | 50F | Malton | |
17/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46438 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | 56A | Wakefield | |
17/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46483 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | 56A | Wakefield | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46428 | 21B | Bescot | 21C | Bushbury | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46448 | 21B | Bescot | 21C | Bushbury | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46526 | 89A | Oswestry | 84C | Banbury | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46527 | 89A | Oswestry | 84C | Banbury | |
16/04/1962 | Condemned | 46453 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 46450 | 41D | Canklow | 41D | Canklow | |
28/04/1962 | Reallocation | 46429 | 5D | Stoke | 21B | Bescot | |
28/04/1962 | Reallocation | 46430 | 5D | Stoke | 21B | Bescot | |
30/04/1962 | Condemned | 46478 | 50D | Goole | COND | ||
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46450 | 41D | Canklow | 68B | Dumfries | |
09/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46484 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |||
09/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46485 | 26B | Agecroft | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
09/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46486 | 26B | Agecroft | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46400 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46465 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46466 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46469 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46470 | 21D | Aston | 1C | Watford | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46494 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46421 | 3A | Bescot | 21C | Bushbury | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 46468 | 63C | Oban | 63A | Perth South | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46481 | 50A | York (North) | 50F | Malton | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46421 | 21C | Bushbury | 21B | Bescot | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46473 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 50F | Malton | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46400 | 31B | March | 12E | Barrow in Furness | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46465 | 31B | March | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46480 | 50A | York (North) | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
25/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46430 | 21B | Bescot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
09/1962 | Condemned | 46466 | 31B | March | COND | ||
09/1962 | Condemned | 46469 | 31B | March | COND | ||
12/09/1962 | Condemned | 46494 | 31B | March | COND | ||
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46405 | 27B | Aintree | 26D | Bury | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46412 | 27B | Aintree | 26D | Bury | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46419 | 26A | Newton Heath | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46423 | 3D | Aston | 1C | Watford | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46439 | 27B | Aintree | 26D | Bury | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46452 | 20F | Skipton | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46501 | 24G | Skipton | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 46525 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 89D | Oswestry | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 46526 | 84C | Banbury | 89D | Oswestry | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 46527 | 84C | Banbury | 89D | Oswestry | |
18/10/1962 | Condemned | 46471 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
18/10/1962 | Condemned | 46493 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
26/10/1962 | Condemned | 46408 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
31/10/1962 | Condemned | 46415 | 53E | Goole | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 46506 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 46517 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
10/11/1962 | Reallocation | 46430 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 21B | Bescot | |
01/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46442 | 21B | Bescot | 2A | Rugby | |
01/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46475 | 51A | Darlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
01/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46482 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 51A | Darlington | |
14/12/1962 | Condemned | 46481 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46506 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46517 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/12/1962 | Condemned | 46477 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46526 | 89D | Oswestry | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46527 | 89D | Oswestry | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
08/02/1963 | Condemned | 46438 | 56A | Wakefield | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46507 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46508 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46509 | 89A | Oswestry | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46522 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46523 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/02/1963 | Reallocation | 46467 | 67B | Hurlford | 67F | Stranraer | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46442 | 2A | Rugby | 6H | Bangor | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46470 | 1C | Watford | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46519 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46520 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46521 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46524 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46525 | 89D | Oswestry | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46498 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 66B | Motherwell | |
23/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46403 | 15B | Kettering | 66A | Polmadie | |
23/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46444 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
23/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46496 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46401 | 89A | Oswestry | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46404 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46503 | 89A | Oswestry | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46504 | 89A | Oswestry | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46505 | 89A | Oswestry | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46506 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46517 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 1A | Willesden | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46526 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 1C | Watford | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46527 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 21B | Bescot | |
13/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46498 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46413 | 50F | Malton | 50D | Goole | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46473 | 50F | Malton | 50A | York (North) | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46410 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 12F | Workington | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46433 | 11B | Workington | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46460 | 63C | Oban | 63A | Perth South | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46463 | 66B | Motherwell | |||
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46430 | 21B | Bescot | 2A | Rugby | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46459 | 3A | Bescot | 2A | Rugby | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46401 | 1A | Willesden | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46423 | 1C | Watford | 8D | Widnes | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46424 | 1A | Willesden | 8D | Widnes | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46431 | 1C | Watford | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46445 | 2A | Rugby | 21B | Bescot | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46446 | 2A | Rugby | 89C | Machynlleth | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46447 | 2B | Nuneaton | 17A | Derby | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46472 | 1A | Willesden | 8E | Northwich | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46495 | 17A | Derby | 2B | Nuneaton | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46503 | 1A | Willesden | 8E | Northwich | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46504 | 1A | Willesden | 12E | Barrow in Furness | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46505 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46506 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46517 | 1A | Willesden | 8E | Northwich | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 46522 | 89C | Machynlleth | 21B | Bescot | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46518 | 89A | Oswestry | 89D | Oswestry | |
13/07/1963 | Reallocation | 46403 | 66A | Polmadie | 15B | Kettering | |
03/08/1963 | Reallocation | 46403 | 15B | Kettering | 66B | Motherwell | |
17/08/1963 | Reallocation | 46523 | 89C | Machynlleth | 26A | Newton Heath | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46449 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46487 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46403 | 66B | Motherwell | 65J | Stirling | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46475 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 67E | Dumfries | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46482 | 51A | Darlington | 67D | Ardrossan | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46498 | 66A | Polmadie | 67D | Ardrossan | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46473 | 50A | York (North) | 50D | Goole | |
16/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46410 | 12F | Workington | 8D | Widnes | |
16/11/1963 | Condemned | 46489 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
18/11/1963 | Condemned | 46483 | 56A | Wakefield | COND | ||
23/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46497 | 17A | Derby | 16D | Nottingham | |
23/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46499 | 17A | Derby | 16D | Nottingham | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46409 | 50E | Scarborough | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46413 | 50D | Goole | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46435 | 56F | Low Moor | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46460 | 63A | Perth South | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46468 | 63A | Perth South | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46474 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 67E | Dumfries | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 46479 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 67F | Stranraer | |
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 46448 | 21C | Bushbury | 2E | Saltley | |
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 46505 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 2E | Saltley | |
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 46506 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 16D | Nottingham | |
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 46526 | 1C | Watford | 2E | Saltley | |
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 46473 | 50D | Goole | COND | ||
11/01/1964 | Reallocation | 46426 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
11/01/1964 | Reallocation | 46452 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | |
11/01/1964 | Reallocation | 46501 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 9M | Bury | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 46461 | 64A | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
01/02/1964 | Reallocation | 46442 | 6H | Bangor | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 46467 | 67F | Stranraer | 67E | Dumfries | |
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 46479 | 67F | Stranraer | 67E | Dumfries | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46410 | 8D | Widnes | 8C | Speke Junction | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46419 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46423 | 8D | Widnes | 8C | Speke Junction | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46424 | 8D | Widnes | 8C | Speke Junction | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46449 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | 9D | Newton Heath | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46452 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | 9D | Newton Heath | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46484 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46485 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 9D | Newton Heath | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46486 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46487 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46402 | 17A | Derby | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46404 | 16A | Nottingham | 8L | Aintree | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46440 | 17A | Derby | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46444 | 16A | Nottingham | 8K | Bank Hall | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46447 | 17A | Derby | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46496 | 16A | Nottingham | 8K | Bank Hall | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46497 | 16D | Nottingham | 8K | Bank Hall | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46499 | 16D | Nottingham | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46500 | 17A | Derby | 8L | Aintree | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46502 | 17A | Derby | 8L | Aintree | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 46506 | 16D | Nottingham | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 46499 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 46506 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
29/06/1964 | Condemned | 46403 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 46409 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 46435 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
18/07/1964 | Reallocation | 46457 | 21B | Bescot | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
23/07/1964 | Condemned | 46467 | 67E | Dumfries | COND | ||
23/07/1964 | Condemned | 46474 | 67E | Dumfries | COND | ||
30/07/1964 | Condemned | 46461 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
30/07/1964 | Condemned | 46475 | 67E | Dumfries | COND | ||
08/08/1964 | Reallocation | 46472 | 8E | Northwich | 9D | Newton Heath | |
08/08/1964 | Reallocation | 46503 | 8E | Northwich | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
08/08/1964 | Reallocation | 46517 | 8E | Northwich | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46504 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 9M | Bury | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46506 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | 9M | Bury | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46428 | 21C | Bushbury | 2L | Leamington | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46442 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 2L | Leamington | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46457 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 2L | Leamington | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46470 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 2L | Leamington | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46505 | 2E | Saltley | 2L | Leamington | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46413 | 67B | Hurlford | 67D | Ardrossan | |
07/11/1964 | Reallocation | 46440 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8C | Speke Junction | |
07/11/1964 | Reallocation | 46503 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8C | Speke Junction | |
05/12/1964 | Reallocation | 46430 | 2A | Rugby | 5E | Nuneaton | |
05/12/1964 | Reallocation | 46459 | 2A | Rugby | 5E | Nuneaton | |
12/12/1964 | Condemned | 46525 | 89A | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
16/01/1965 | Condemned | 46420 | 2B | Nuneaton | COND | ||
16/01/1965 | Condemned | 46423 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
16/01/1965 | Condemned | 46472 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46510 | 89A | Oswestry | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46511 | 89A | Oswestry | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46512 | 89A | Oswestry | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46513 | 89A | Oswestry | 9D | Newton Heath | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46514 | 89A | Oswestry | 9D | Newton Heath | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46515 | 89A | Oswestry | 8C | Speke Junction | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46516 | 89A | Oswestry | 8C | Speke Junction | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46518 | 89D | Oswestry | 8C | Speke Junction | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46520 | 89C | Machynlleth | 5E | Nuneaton | |
06/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46507 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 1A | Willesden | |
06/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46508 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 1A | Willesden | |
06/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46509 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 1A | Willesden | |
06/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46512 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 1A | Willesden | |
20/02/1965 | Condemned | 46524 | 89A | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46413 | 67D | Ardrossan | 67C | Ayr | |
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46482 | 67D | Ardrossan | 67C | Ayr | |
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46498 | 67D | Ardrossan | 67C | Ayr | |
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 46519 | 89C | Machynlleth | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46405 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46406 | 26D | Bury | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46412 | 26D | Bury | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46414 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46416 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46417 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46436 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46439 | 26D | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46501 | 9M | Bury | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46504 | 9M | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
10/04/1965 | Reallocation | 46506 | 9M | Bury | 9K | Bolton | |
24/04/1965 | Condemned | 46497 | 8K | Bank Hall | COND | ||
08/05/1965 | Condemned | 46404 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
15/05/1965 | Reallocation | 46414 | 9K | Bolton | 8K | Bank Hall | |
22/05/1965 | Reallocation | 46405 | 9K | Bolton | 8K | Bank Hall | |
12/06/1965 | Condemned | 46488 | 12F | Workington | COND | ||
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46428 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46439 | 9K | Bolton | 8L | Aintree | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46442 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46457 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46470 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46505 | 2L | Leamington | 2E | Saltley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46513 | 9D | Newton Heath | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46523 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8L | Aintree | |
26/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46507 | 1A | Willesden | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
26/06/1965 | Condemned | 46507 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
26/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46512 | 1A | Willesden | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
26/06/1965 | Reallocation | 46514 | 9D | Newton Heath | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
03/07/1965 | Reallocation | 46402 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8K | Bank Hall | |
03/07/1965 | Reallocation | 46484 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8K | Bank Hall | |
10/07/1965 | Reallocation | 46424 | 8C | Speke Junction | 12D | Workington | |
10/07/1965 | Condemned | 46444 | 8K | Bank Hall | COND | ||
10/07/1965 | Reallocation | 46485 | 9D | Newton Heath | 12D | Workington | |
26/07/1965 | Condemned | 46479 | 67E | Dumfries | COND | ||
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 46508 | 1A | Willesden | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
14/08/1965 | Reallocation | 46486 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | |
28/08/1965 | Condemned | 46482 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
09/1965 | Condemned | 46459 | 5E | Nuneaton | COND | ||
09/1965 | Condemned | 46510 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
09/1965 | Condemned | 46511 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
04/09/1965 | Reallocation | 46452 | 9D | Newton Heath | 12D | Workington | |
11/09/1965 | Condemned | 46425 | 3A | Bescot | COND | ||
18/09/1965 | Reallocation | 46400 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 10A | Carnforth | |
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 46498 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
25/09/1965 | Condemned | 46456 | 21B | Bescot | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46499 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | 10A | Carnforth | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46509 | 1A | Willesden | 2F | Bescot | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46512 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46519 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 5E | Nuneaton | |
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 46430 | 5E | Nuneaton | COND | ||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 46527 | 21B | Bescot | COND | ||
16/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46427 | 3D | Aston | 2F | Bescot | |
16/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46492 | 3D | Aston | 2E | Saltley | |
18/10/1965 | Condemned | 46413 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
18/10/1965 | Condemned | 46468 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 46460 | 65F | Grangemouth | 67C | Ayr | |
13/11/1965 | Reallocation | 46402 | 8K | Bank Hall | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | |
13/11/1965 | Reallocation | 46484 | 8K | Bank Hall | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | |
03/01/1966 | Reallocation | 46509 | 2F | Bescot | 2A | Tyseley | |
17/01/1966 | Condemned | 46450 | 68B | Dumfries | COND | ||
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 46419 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8L | Aintree | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 46462 | 64A | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
07/02/1966 | Condemned | 46463 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 46487 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8E | Northwich | |
05/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46405 | 8K | Bank Hall | 8E | Northwich | |
05/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46414 | 8K | Bank Hall | 8E | Northwich | |
05/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46522 | 21B | Bescot | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/03/1966 | Condemned | 46410 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
19/03/1966 | Condemned | 46518 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46421 | 21B | Bescot | 2E | Saltley | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46427 | 2F | Bescot | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46429 | 21B | Bescot | 2E | Saltley | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46445 | 21B | Bescot | 2E | Saltley | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46490 | 2E | Saltley | |||
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 46522 | 2A | Tyseley | 2D | Banbury | |
02/04/1966 | Condemned | 46496 | 8K | Bank Hall | COND | ||
02/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46522 | 2D | Banbury | 2A | Tyseley | |
23/04/1966 | Condemned | 46416 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46422 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 10A | Carnforth | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46431 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 10A | Carnforth | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46433 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 10A | Carnforth | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46441 | 10A | Carnforth | |||
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46486 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 10A | Carnforth | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46514 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 10A | Carnforth | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 46432 | 12C | Workington | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
07/05/1966 | Condemned | 46401 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 46515 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46495 | 2B | Nuneaton | 5B | Crewe South | |
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46512 | 5E | Nuneaton | 5B | Crewe South | |
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46519 | 5E | Nuneaton | 5D | Stoke | |
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46520 | 5E | Nuneaton | 5D | Stoke | |
11/06/1966 | Condemned | 46414 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46440 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8E | Northwich | |
25/06/1966 | Reallocation | 46485 | 12D | Workington | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | |
25/06/1966 | Condemned | 46514 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
02/07/1966 | Condemned | 46429 | 2E | Saltley | COND | ||
02/07/1966 | Condemned | 46445 | 2E | Saltley | COND | ||
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 46427 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | 2A | Tyseley | |
16/07/1966 | Condemned | 46513 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 46522 | 2A | Tyseley | 2D | Banbury | |
16/07/1966 | Condemned | 46526 | 2E | Saltley | COND | ||
06/08/1966 | Condemned | 46412 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46490 | 2E | Saltley | 9D | Newton Heath | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46505 | 2E | Saltley | 9D | Newton Heath | |
06/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46508 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 6F | Machynlleth | |
13/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46504 | 9K | Bolton | 9D | Newton Heath | |
13/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46506 | 9K | Bolton | 9D | Newton Heath | |
20/08/1966 | Reallocation | 46436 | 9K | Bolton | 9D | Newton Heath | |
22/08/1966 | Condemned | 46462 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
24/08/1966 | Condemned | 46460 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
09/1966 | Condemned | 46419 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
09/1966 | Condemned | 46464 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
03/09/1966 | Reallocation | 46417 | 9K | Bolton | 9D | Newton Heath | |
24/09/1966 | Condemned | 46426 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
24/09/1966 | Condemned | 46434 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46421 | 2E | Saltley | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46427 | 2A | Tyseley | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46428 | 2A | Tyseley | 5B | Crewe South | |
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46442 | 2A | Tyseley | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46454 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46495 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46509 | 2A | Tyseley | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 46519 | 5D | Stoke | COND | ||
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46443 | 21A | Saltley | 9D | Newton Heath | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46448 | 2E | Saltley | 9D | Newton Heath | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46457 | 2A | Tyseley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46470 | 2A | Tyseley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46492 | 2E | Saltley | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | |
15/10/1966 | Condemned | 46504 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46520 | 5D | Stoke | 8E | Northwich | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 46522 | 2D | Banbury | 10A | Carnforth | |
29/10/1966 | Condemned | 46521 | 89C | Machynlleth | COND | ||
19/11/1966 | Reallocation | 46503 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8E | Northwich | |
19/11/1966 | Reallocation | 46516 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8E | Northwich | |
12/1966 | Condemned | 46405 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
12/1966 | Condemned | 46428 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
12/1966 | Condemned | 46451 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
12/1966 | Condemned | 46512 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
12/1966 | Condemned | 46517 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 46424 | 12D | Workington | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 46446 | 89C | Machynlleth | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 46508 | 6F | Machynlleth | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
17/12/1966 | Condemned | 46446 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
17/12/1966 | Reallocation | 46455 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
17/12/1966 | Reallocation | 46457 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
17/12/1966 | Condemned | 46458 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
17/12/1966 | Reallocation | 46470 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
17/12/1966 | Condemned | 46508 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
24/12/1966 | Condemned | 46422 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 46447 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
07/01/1967 | Condemned | 46500 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
14/01/1967 | Condemned | 46411 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
21/01/1967 | Condemned | 46406 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
21/01/1967 | Condemned | 46418 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
18/02/1967 | Condemned | 46417 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
25/02/1967 | Condemned | 46502 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
04/03/1967 | Condemned | 46465 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
18/03/1967 | Condemned | 46439 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
25/03/1967 | Condemned | 46431 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
25/03/1967 | Condemned | 46440 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
25/03/1967 | Condemned | 46443 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
15/04/1967 | Condemned | 46441 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
05/1967 | Condemned | 46516 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46400 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46432 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46433 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46436 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46437 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46448 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46449 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46452 | 12D | Workington | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46455 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46457 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46470 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46480 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46486 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46487 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46490 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46491 | 12D | Workington | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46499 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46501 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46503 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Reallocation | 46505 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | |
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46506 | 9D | Newton Heath | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46515 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46520 | 8E | Northwich | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46522 | 10A | Carnforth | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 46523 | 8L | Aintree | COND | ||
06/1967 | Condemned | 46402 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
06/1967 | Condemned | 46484 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
06/1967 | Condemned | 46485 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
06/1967 | Condemned | 46492 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
06/1967 | Condemned | 46505 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | COND |