Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2321 Week
» 19637 Month
» 278496 Year
» 789598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Ivatt "2MT" Class 2-6-0


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
2MT 6400 46400 12/1946 15B
21B
15B
22A
19B
31A
31B
12E
10A
W
Kettering
Bournville
Kettering
Bristol Barrow Road
Sheffield Millhouses
Cambridge
March
Barrow in Furness
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
03/10/1953
27/02/1954
16/06/1956
07/10/1961
23/06/1962
18/08/1962
18/09/1965
05/1967
05/1967
2MT 6401 46401 12/1946 15B
22B
89A
1A
9D
W
Kettering
Gloucester Barnwood
Oswestry
Willesden
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
28/11/1959
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
05/1966
05/1966
2MT 6402 46402 12/1946 15B
15C
17A
8F
8K
9L
W
Kettering
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bank Hall
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
10/01/1959
23/05/1964
03/07/1965
13/11/1965
06/1967
06/1967
2MT 6403 46403 12/1946 15B
15B
66A
15B
66B
65J
W
Kettering
Kettering
Polmadie
Kettering
Motherwell
Stirling
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
23/03/1963
13/07/1963
03/08/1963
02/11/1963
06/1964
06/1964
2MT 6404 46404 12/1946 15B
16A
8L
W
Kettering
Nottingham
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/03/1963
23/05/1964
05/1965
05/1965
2MT 6405 46405 12/1946 25G
23A
27B
26D
9K
8K
8E
W
Farnley Junction
Bank Hall
Aintree
Bury
Bolton
Bank Hall
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
16/06/1956
15/09/1962
10/04/1965
22/05/1965
05/03/1966
12/1966
12/1966
2MT 6406 46406 12/1946 25G
23A
26D
9D
W
Farnley Junction
Bank Hall
Bury
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
29/01/1955
10/04/1965
01/1967
01/1967
2MT 6407 46407 12/1946 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/12/1961
18/12/1961
2MT 6408 46408 12/1946 25C
50F
W
Goole
Malton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/03/1962
26/10/1962
26/10/1962
2MT 6409 46409 12/1946 25A
53C
53E
50E
67B
W
Wakefield
Hull Springhead
Goole
Scarborough
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
27/01/1962
30/11/1963
07/1964
07/1964
2MT 6410 46410 01/1947 24E
26A
24J
12F
8D
8C
W
Blackpool Central
Newton Heath
Lancaster Green Ayre
Workington
Widnes
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
10/08/1957
11/05/1963
16/11/1963
18/04/1964
03/1966
03/1966
2MT 6411 46411 01/1947 24E
26A
W
Blackpool Central
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
01/1967
01/1967
2MT 6412 46412 01/1947 24E
26B
27B
26D
9D
W
Blackpool Central
Agecroft
Aintree
Bury
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
09/10/1954
15/09/1962
10/04/1965
08/1966
08/1966
2MT 6413 46413 02/1947 24E
91W
28A
27A
25A
56F
56A
50F
50D
67B
67D
67C
W
Blackpool Central
To Western Region / GWR
Blackpool Central
Bank Hall
Wakefield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Malton
Goole
Hurlford
Ardrossan
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
09/09/1950
09/10/1954
29/01/1955
14/11/1959
03/12/1960
03/03/1962
20/04/1963
30/11/1963
31/10/1964
27/02/1965
10/1965
10/1965
2MT 6414 46414 02/1947 4B
26D
9K
8K
8E
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Bury
Bolton
Bank Hall
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
10/04/1965
15/05/1965
05/03/1966
06/1966
06/1966
2MT 6415 46415 02/1947 4B
25B
25A
53E
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Wakefield
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
31/01/1959
31/10/1962
31/10/1962
2MT 6416 46416 02/1947 23A
26D
9K
W
Bank Hall
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
10/04/1965
04/1966
04/1966
2MT 6417 46417 03/1947 23A
26D
9K
9D
W
Bank Hall
Bury
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
10/04/1965
03/09/1966
02/1967
02/1967
2MT 6418 46418 03/1947 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1967
01/1967
2MT 6419 46419 03/1947 26A
26E
8F
8L
W
Newton Heath
Lees (Oldham)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/09/1962
18/04/1964
22/01/1966
09/1966
09/1966
2MT   46420 06/11/1948 6K
8D
2D
2A
6G
6A
2B
W
Rhyl
Widnes
Coventry
Rugby
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
19/05/1956
15/11/1958
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
10/12/1960
01/1965
01/1965
2MT   46421 06/11/1948 6G
8D
3A
21C
21B
2E
W
Llandudno Junction
Widnes
Bescot
Bushbury
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
17/07/1954
11/09/1954
19/05/1956
30/06/1962
11/08/1962
26/03/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46422 13/11/1948 5A
8D
6K
8D
10A
12D
8F
24J
10A
W
Crewe North
Widnes
Rhyl
Widnes
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Kirkby Stephen
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
27/02/1954
27/03/1954
19/06/1954
09/10/1954
19/05/1956
09/04/1960
17/06/1961
10/02/1962
23/04/1966
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46423 27/11/1948 8D
8D
6K
8F
2B
3D
1C
8D
8C
W
Widnes
Widnes
Rhyl
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Nuneaton
Aston
Watford
Widnes
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
27/11/1948
11/07/1953
19/05/1956
22/03/1958
06/12/1958
31/01/1959
15/09/1962
25/05/1963
18/04/1964
01/1965
01/1965
2MT   46424 27/11/1948 8D
1A
6K
8D
1A
8D
8C
12D
W
Widnes
Willesden
Rhyl
Widnes
Willesden
Widnes
Speke Junction
Workington
Withdrawn
27/11/1948
21/03/1953
08/08/1953
03/10/1953
19/05/1956
25/05/1963
18/04/1964
10/07/1965
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46425 04/12/1948 3A
6K
3A
W
Bescot
Rhyl
Bescot
Withdrawn
04/12/1948
11/07/1953
08/08/1953
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46426 04/12/1948 3A
6K
11E
12B
W
Bescot
Rhyl
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
04/12/1948
19/05/1956
06/10/1956
11/01/1964
09/1966
09/1966
2MT   46427 04/12/1948 3A
3E
3D
2F
2C
2A
W
Bescot
Monument Lane
Aston
Bescot
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
04/12/1948
07/10/1950
24/03/1951
16/10/1965
26/03/1966
16/07/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46428 04/12/1948 10B
10B
10A
10F
10A
6K
10A
21B
21C
2L
2A
5B
W
Preston
Preston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Lower Ince
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rhyl
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bescot
Bushbury
Leamington
Tyseley
Crewe South
Withdrawn
04/12/1948
07/10/1950
24/03/1951
16/06/1951
19/04/1952
19/06/1954
09/10/1954
10/02/1962
24/03/1962
24/10/1964
19/06/1965
08/10/1966
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46429 04/12/1948 10B
5D
21B
2E
W
Preston
Stoke
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
04/12/1948
04/12/1954
28/04/1962
26/03/1966
07/1966
07/1966
2MT   46430 11/12/1948 10B
10A
7D
7B
10B
6K
10B
6G
10B
5D
21B
9D
21B
2A
5E
W
Preston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rhyl
Bangor
Preston
Rhyl
Preston
Llandudno Junction
Preston
Stoke
Bescot
Buxton (LNWR)
Bescot
Rugby
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
11/12/1948
24/03/1951
17/07/1951
06/10/1951
29/12/1951
12/07/1952
29/11/1952
17/07/1954
09/10/1954
04/12/1954
28/04/1962
25/08/1962
10/11/1962
18/05/1963
05/12/1964
10/1965
10/1965
2MT   46431 18/12/1948 1C
24J
10A
W
Watford
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
29/11/1958
25/05/1963
23/04/1966
03/1967
03/1967
2MT   46432 25/12/1948 10A
6K
12C
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rhyl
Workington
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
12/07/1952
19/05/1956
26/01/1957
30/04/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46433 31/12/1948 6K
5D
6K
12C
11B
24J
10A
W
Rhyl
Stoke
Rhyl
Carlisle Canal
Workington
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
19/05/1956
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
06/09/1958
11/05/1963
23/04/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46434 31/12/1948 8D
6K
10A
12B
W
Widnes
Rhyl
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
07/10/1950
11/07/1953
31/10/1953
07/05/1960
09/1966
09/1966
2MT   46435 14/01/1950 24E
27C
27E
27A
25A
56F
67B
W
Blackpool Central
Southport
Walton on the Hill
Bank Hall
Wakefield
Low Moor
Hurlford
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
17/07/1951
08/09/1951
06/10/1951
29/01/1955
14/11/1959
30/11/1963
07/1964
07/1964
2MT   46436 14/01/1950 24F
25C
26D
9K
9D
W
Fleetwood
Goole
Bury
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
14/01/1950
31/12/1950
24/03/1956
10/04/1965
20/08/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46437 01/1950 27E
25C
26A
W
Walton on the Hill
Goole
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
07/10/1950
31/12/1950
24/03/1956
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46438 01/1950 56E
56A
W
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Withdrawn
14/11/1959
17/03/1962
08/02/1963
08/02/1963
2MT   46439 01/1950 27B
26D
9K
8L
W
Aintree
Bury
Bolton
Aintree
Withdrawn
09/10/1954
15/09/1962
10/04/1965
19/06/1965
03/1967
03/1967
2MT   46440 02/1950 20A
17A
18A
17A
18A
17A
17B
17A
8F
8C
8E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Derby
Toton
Derby
Toton
Derby
Burton
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Speke Junction
Northwich
Withdrawn
27/02/1954
24/04/1954
03/11/1956
26/01/1957
23/02/1957
20/04/1957
10/08/1957
10/01/1959
23/05/1964
07/11/1964
18/06/1966
03/1967
03/1967
2MT   46441 02/1950 10A
W
Carnforth
Withdrawn
23/04/1966
04/1967
04/1967
2MT   46442 02/1950 12D
12F
21B
2A
6H
6C
2L
2A
W
Kirkby Stephen
Workington
Bescot
Rugby
Bangor
Croes Newydd
Leamington
Tyseley
Withdrawn
07/05/1960
09/07/1960
06/01/1962
01/12/1962
09/03/1963
01/02/1964
24/10/1964
19/06/1965
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46443 02/1950 21A
9D
W
Saltley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
18/11/1961
15/10/1966
03/1967
03/1967
2MT   46444 02/1950 15B
16A
8K
W
Kettering
Nottingham
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
23/03/1963
23/05/1964
07/1965
07/1965
2MT   46445 02/1950 6K
5D
6K
2A
21B
2E
W
Rhyl
Stoke
Rhyl
Rugby
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
19/05/1956
30/11/1957
28/12/1957
20/06/1959
25/05/1963
26/03/1966
07/1966
07/1966
2MT   46446 03/1950 2B
2A
89C
W
6D
Nuneaton
Rugby
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
Shrewsbury
15/11/1958
31/01/1959
25/05/1963
12/1966
10/12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46447 03/1950 12D
8F
6G
6H
2B
17A
8F
W
Workington
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Nuneaton
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
12/12/1959
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
16/09/1961
25/05/1963
23/05/1964
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46448 03/1950 12D
10A
10A
5F
8F
21B
21C
2E
9D
W
Workington
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Uttoxeter
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bescot
Bushbury
Saltley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
27/02/1954
19/06/1954
16/01/1960
12/03/1960
10/02/1962
24/03/1962
07/12/1963
15/10/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46449 03/1950 12C
12A
12D
24K
24C
9P
9D
W
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Carlisle Upperby
Kirkby Stephen
Preston
Lostock Hall
Lees (Oldham)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
23/04/1955
30/04/1960
17/09/1960
16/09/1961
14/09/1963
18/04/1964
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46450 04/1950 41C
41D
41D
68B
W
Sheffield Millhouses
Canklow
Canklow
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/04/1961
06/01/1962
21/04/1962
19/05/1962
01/1966
01/1966
2MT   46451 04/1950 41C
91X
67B
W
Sheffield Millhouses
To Scottish Region
Hurlford
Withdrawn
15/04/1961
07/10/1961
21/10/1961
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46452 04/1950 20F
24C
9P
9D
12D
W
Skipton
Lostock Hall
Lees (Oldham)
Newton Heath
Workington
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
15/09/1962
11/01/1964
18/04/1964
04/09/1965
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46453 04/1950 20A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
24/04/1954
16/04/1962
16/04/1962
2MT   46454 04/1950 17B
15C
17A
21A
W
Burton
Leicester Midland
Derby
Saltley
Withdrawn
16/06/1957
12/07/1958
24/09/1960
18/11/1961
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46455 04/1950 12C
12D
12C
12D
12B
12A
W
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Workington
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
17/06/1950
30/01/1954
27/02/1954
23/04/1955
30/01/1960
17/12/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46456 05/1950 21B
W
Bescot
Withdrawn
23/09/1961
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46457 05/1950 12D
12B
21B
6A
2L
2A
12B
12A
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Bescot
Chester (MR)
Leamington
Tyseley
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
07/10/1950
19/04/1958
13/01/1962
18/07/1964
24/10/1964
19/06/1965
15/10/1966
17/12/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46458 05/1950 12D
1A
12D
12B
W
Workington
Willesden
Kirkby Stephen
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
02/12/1950
08/10/1955
30/04/1960
11/11/1961
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46459 05/1950 2A
5A
12C
12D
6A
10A
6A
3A
2A
5E
W
Rugby
Crewe North
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Workington
Chester (MR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Chester (MR)
Bescot
Rugby
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
09/09/1950
07/10/1950
02/12/1950
27/02/1954
19/05/1956
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
18/05/1963
05/12/1964
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46460 05/1950 64A
61A
61C
61B
63C
63A
65F
67C
W
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Oban
Perth South
Grangemouth
Ayr
Withdrawn
05/1950
26/01/1952
07/05/1960
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
11/05/1963
30/11/1963
30/10/1965
08/1966
08/1966
2MT   46461 06/1950 64A
61A
64A
61A
61C
64A
64F
W
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Kittybrewster
Keith
St Margarets
Bathgate
Withdrawn
06/1950
27/11/1954
22/01/1955
16/01/1960
16/01/1960
07/05/1960
25/01/1964
07/1964
07/1964
2MT   46462 06/1950 64A
64F
W
St Margarets
Bathgate
Withdrawn
06/1950
29/01/1966
08/1966
08/1966
2MT   46463 06/1950 66B
W
Motherwell
Withdrawn
11/05/1963
02/1966
02/1966
2MT   46464 06/1950 64A
62B
61A
62B
61A
62B
W
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kittybrewster
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kittybrewster
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
23/12/1950
17/02/1951
14/05/1955
24/12/1955
31/08/1957
23/11/1957
09/1966
09/1966
2MT   46465 06/1951 31A
31B
9D
W
Cambridge
March
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
06/1951
23/06/1962
18/08/1962
03/1967
03/1967
2MT   46466 06/1951 31A
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
06/1951
23/06/1962
09/1962
09/1962
2MT   46467 06/1951 31A
91X
67B
67F
67E
W
Cambridge
To Scottish Region
Hurlford
Stranraer
Dumfries
Withdrawn
06/1951
14/10/1961
21/10/1961
16/02/1963
29/02/1964
07/1964
07/1964
2MT   46468 07/1951 30E
30F
30A
31A
63C
63A
63C
63A
65F
W
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Cambridge
Oban
Perth South
Oban
Perth South
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
07/1951
07/11/1959
07/01/1961
14/01/1961
25/03/1961
03/06/1961
01/07/1961
14/07/1962
30/11/1963
10/1965
10/1965
2MT   46469 07/1951 30E
30F
30A
31A
31B
W
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
07/1951
07/11/1959
07/01/1961
14/01/1961
23/06/1962
09/1962
09/1962
2MT   46470 07/1951 51F
51H
8F
21D
1C
6A
2L
2A
12B
12A
W
West Auckland
Kirkby Stephen
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Aston
Watford
Chester (MR)
Leamington
Tyseley
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
07/1951
22/01/1955
17/09/1960
10/02/1962
23/06/1962
09/03/1963
24/10/1964
19/06/1965
15/10/1966
17/12/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46471 07/1951 51H
51F
51A
51F
51J
51F
52F
52A
52D
W
Kirkby Stephen
West Auckland
Darlington
West Auckland
Northallerton
West Auckland
Blyth (North)
Gateshead
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
07/1951
22/01/1955
18/06/1955
12/11/1955
12/04/1958
09/04/1960
17/09/1960
29/04/1961
17/02/1962
18/10/1962
18/10/1962
2MT   46472 07/1951 51A
51F
51H
2A
6A
1A
8E
9D
W
Darlington
West Auckland
Kirkby Stephen
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Willesden
Northwich
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
07/1951
13/11/1954
22/01/1955
20/12/1958
09/01/1960
30/04/1960
25/05/1963
08/08/1964
01/1965
01/1965
2MT   46473 08/1951 51F
51A
52F
52B
52F
52A
52D
50F
50A
50D
W
West Auckland
Darlington
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Blyth (North)
Gateshead
Tweedmouth
Malton
York (North)
Goole
Withdrawn
08/1951
18/06/1955
17/09/1960
21/01/1961
08/04/1961
29/04/1961
17/02/1962
11/08/1962
20/04/1963
09/11/1963
12/1963
12/1963
2MT   46474 08/1951 51H
51A
52F
52B
52D
67E
W
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Tweedmouth
Dumfries
Withdrawn
08/1951
18/06/1955
17/09/1960
21/01/1961
17/02/1962
30/11/1963
07/1964
07/1964
2MT   46475 08/1951 51A
52D
67E
W
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Dumfries
Withdrawn
08/1951
01/12/1962
02/11/1963
07/1964
07/1964
2MT   46476 09/1951 51H
51F
51A
52D
W
Kirkby Stephen
West Auckland
Darlington
Tweedmouth
Withdrawn
09/1951
23/04/1955
18/06/1955
08/02/1958
29/01/1962
29/01/1962
2MT   46477 09/1951 51A
51H
51A
W
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Withdrawn
09/1951
18/04/1953
18/06/1955
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
2MT   46478 09/1951 51H
51A
51E
51L
50D
W
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Stockton
Thornaby
Goole
Withdrawn
09/1951
18/06/1955
20/04/1957
20/06/1959
12/03/1960
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
2MT   46479 09/1951 51F
51A
52F
52B
52D
67F
67E
W
West Auckland
Darlington
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Tweedmouth
Stranraer
Dumfries
Withdrawn
09/1951
13/11/1954
17/09/1960
29/04/1961
17/02/1962
30/11/1963
29/02/1964
07/1965
07/1965
2MT   46480 09/1951 51A
51H
51F
50A
9D
W
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
West Auckland
York (North)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
09/1951
21/03/1953
22/01/1955
16/08/1958
18/08/1962
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46481 10/1951 51H
51F
50A
50F
W
Kirkby Stephen
West Auckland
York (North)
Malton
Withdrawn
10/1951
23/04/1955
16/08/1958
04/08/1962
14/12/1962
14/12/1962
2MT   46482 10/1951 51F
52D
51A
67D
67C
W
West Auckland
Tweedmouth
Darlington
Ardrossan
Ayr
Withdrawn
10/1951
17/10/1959
01/12/1962
02/11/1963
27/02/1965
08/1965
08/1965
2MT   46483 10/1951 27A
25A
56F
56A
56E
56A
W
Bank Hall
Wakefield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
29/01/1955
08/03/1958
11/07/1959
14/11/1959
17/03/1962
11/1963
11/1963
2MT   46484 10/1951 26E
8F
8K
9L
W
Lees (Oldham)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bank Hall
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
09/06/1962
18/04/1964
03/07/1965
13/11/1965
06/1967
06/1967
2MT   46485 11/1951 26B
26E
9D
12D
9L
W
Agecroft
Lees (Oldham)
Newton Heath
Workington
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
09/06/1962
18/04/1964
10/07/1965
25/06/1966
06/1967
06/1967
2MT   46486 11/1951 28A
26B
26E
8F
10J
10A
W
Blackpool Central
Agecroft
Lees (Oldham)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
27/02/1954
09/06/1962
18/04/1964
14/08/1965
23/04/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46487 11/1951 28A
25B
25C
26A
9P
8F
8E
W
Blackpool Central
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Goole
Newton Heath
Lees (Oldham)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Northwich
Withdrawn
26/01/1952
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
04/12/1954
14/09/1963
18/04/1964
19/02/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46488 11/1951 12B
12F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Withdrawn
20/06/1959
18/06/1960
06/1965
06/1965
2MT   46489 11/1951 10A
12D
12B
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
29/11/1952
30/01/1954
20/06/1959
11/1963
11/1963
2MT   46490 11/1951 2E
9D
W
Saltley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
26/03/1966
06/08/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46491 12/1951 12D
12C
12D
W
Workington
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Workington
Withdrawn
12/1951
30/01/1954
23/04/1955
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46492 12/1951 3D
2E
9L
W
Aston
Saltley
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
12/1951
16/10/1965
15/10/1966
06/1967
06/1967
2MT   46493 12/1951 17B
20A
W
Burton
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
12/1951
12/07/1952
18/10/1962
18/10/1962
2MT   46494 12/1951 17B
22A
19B
31A
31B
W
Burton
Bristol Barrow Road
Sheffield Millhouses
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
12/1951
27/02/1954
16/06/1956
01/04/1961
23/06/1962
12/09/1962
12/09/1962
2MT   46495 01/1952 15B
17A
2B
5B
W
Kettering
Derby
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/1952
25/02/1961
25/05/1963
04/06/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46496 02/1952 15B
16A
8K
W
Kettering
Nottingham
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
02/1952
23/03/1963
23/05/1964
04/1966
04/1966
2MT   46497 02/1952 20A
16A
18C
16A
18C
17A
16D
8K
W
Holbeck (MR)
Nottingham
Hasland
Nottingham
Hasland
Derby
Nottingham
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
02/1952
24/03/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
10/01/1959
23/11/1963
23/05/1964
04/1965
04/1965
2MT   46498 02/1952 20A
66B
66A
67D
67C
W
Holbeck (MR)
Motherwell
Polmadie
Ardrossan
Ayr
Withdrawn
02/1952
16/03/1963
13/04/1963
02/11/1963
27/02/1965
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46499 03/1952 18A
18C
17A
16D
8F
12C
10A
W
Toton
Hasland
Derby
Nottingham
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Barrow in Furness
Carnforth
Withdrawn
03/1952
16/05/1953
10/01/1959
23/11/1963
23/05/1964
27/06/1964
02/10/1965
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46500 03/1952 18A
18B
18A
18C
17A
8L
W
Toton
Westhouses
Toton
Hasland
Derby
Aintree
Withdrawn
03/1952
19/04/1952
14/06/1952
16/05/1953
10/01/1959
23/05/1964
01/1967
01/1967
2MT   46501 03/1952 16A
16D
16B
24G
24C
9M
9D
W
Nottingham
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Skipton
Lostock Hall
Bury
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
03/1952
28/11/1953
09/04/1960
18/06/1960
15/09/1962
11/01/1964
10/04/1965
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46502 03/1952 16A
17A
8L
W
Nottingham
Derby
Aintree
Withdrawn
03/1952
10/01/1959
23/05/1964
02/1967
02/1967
2MT   46503 05/11/1952 89A
1A
8E
8F
8C
8E
W
Oswestry
Willesden
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Speke Junction
Northwich
Withdrawn
05/11/1952
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
08/08/1964
07/11/1964
19/11/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46504 19/11/1952 89A
1A
12E
9M
9K
9D
W
Oswestry
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Bury
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
19/11/1952
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
10/10/1964
10/04/1965
13/08/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46505 21/11/1952 89A
1A
6A
2E
2L
2E
9D
9L
W
Oswestry
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Saltley
Leamington
Saltley
Newton Heath
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
21/11/1952
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
07/12/1963
24/10/1964
19/06/1965
06/08/1966
06/05/1967
06/1967
06/1967
2MT   46506 27/11/1952 89A
82B
89A
82B
82E
84F
1A
6A
16D
8F
12C
9M
9K
9D
W
Oswestry
St Philips Marsh
Oswestry
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Stourbridge Junction
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Nottingham
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Barrow in Furness
Bury
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
27/11/1952
29/12/1956
31/10/1959
13/08/1960
03/11/1962
15/12/1962
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
07/12/1963
23/05/1964
27/06/1964
10/10/1964
10/04/1965
13/08/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46507 28/11/1952 89A
82A
89A
89B
1A
W
6C
Oswestry
Bristol Bath Road
Oswestry
Croes Newydd
Willesden
Withdrawn
Croes Newydd
28/11/1952
01/01/1955
16/06/1956
09/02/1963
06/02/1965
06/1965
26/06/1965
06/1965
2MT   46508 02/12/1952 89A
89B
89A
89B
1A
6C
6F
W
6D
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Croes Newydd
Willesden
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
Shrewsbury
02/12/1952
01/01/1955
28/11/1959
09/02/1963
06/02/1965
07/08/1965
06/08/1966
12/1966
10/12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46509 05/12/1952 89A
89B
1A
2F
2A
W
Oswestry
Croes Newydd
Willesden
Bescot
Tyseley
Withdrawn
05/12/1952
09/02/1963
06/02/1965
02/10/1965
03/01/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46510 09/12/1952 89A
6D
W
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
09/12/1952
23/01/1965
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46511 12/12/1952 89A
6D
W
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
12/12/1952
23/01/1965
09/1965
09/1965
2MT   46512 16/12/1952 89A
6D
1A
6D
5E
5B
W
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Willesden
Shrewsbury
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Withdrawn
16/12/1952
23/01/1965
06/02/1965
26/06/1965
02/10/1965
04/06/1966
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46513 19/12/1952 89A
9D
12B
W
Oswestry
Newton Heath
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
19/12/1952
23/01/1965
19/06/1965
07/1966
07/1966
2MT   46514 23/12/1952 89A
9D
10J
10A
W
Oswestry
Newton Heath
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
23/12/1952
23/01/1965
26/06/1965
23/04/1966
06/1966
06/1966
2MT   46515 06/01/1953 89A
8C
8F
W
Oswestry
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
06/01/1953
23/01/1965
28/05/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46516 13/01/1953 89A
89B
89A
8C
8E
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Speke Junction
Northwich
Withdrawn
13/01/1953
08/08/1953
31/10/1959
23/01/1965
19/11/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46517 22/01/1953 89A
89B
82B
82E
84F
1A
8E
8F
W
Oswestry
Brecon
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Barrow Road
Stourbridge Junction
Willesden
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
22/01/1953
08/08/1953
13/07/1957
03/11/1962
15/12/1962
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
08/08/1964
12/1966
12/1966
2MT   46518 27/01/1953 89A
89B
89A
89D
8C
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Oswestry
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
27/01/1953
16/05/1953
31/10/1959
29/06/1963
23/01/1965
03/1966
03/1966
2MT   46519 03/02/1953 89A
89A
89C
6D
5E
5D
W
Oswestry
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
03/02/1953
31/10/1959
09/03/1963
27/02/1965
02/10/1965
04/06/1966
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46520 09/02/1953 89A
89A
89C
5E
5D
8E
W
Oswestry
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Nuneaton
Stoke
Northwich
Withdrawn
09/02/1953
31/10/1959
09/03/1963
23/01/1965
04/06/1966
15/10/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46521 19/02/1953 89A
89B
89A
89C
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
19/02/1953
21/03/1953
31/10/1959
09/03/1963
10/1966
10/1966
2MT   46522 03/03/1953 89A
89B
89A
89C
21B
2A
2D
2A
2D
10A
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Bescot
Tyseley
Banbury
Tyseley
Banbury
Carnforth
Withdrawn
03/03/1953
18/04/1953
31/10/1959
09/02/1963
25/05/1963
05/03/1966
26/03/1966
02/04/1966
16/07/1966
15/10/1966
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46523 05/03/1953 89A
89B
89A
89C
26A
8L
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Newton Heath
Aintree
Withdrawn
05/03/1953
18/04/1953
01/01/1955
09/02/1963
17/08/1963
19/06/1965
05/1967
05/1967
2MT   46524 11/03/1953 89A
89B
89A
89A
W
Oswestry
Brecon
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
11/03/1953
18/04/1953
21/03/1959
09/03/1963
02/1965
02/1965
2MT   46525 07/03/1953 82B
89D
89A
W
St Philips Marsh
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
07/03/1953
06/10/1962
09/03/1963
12/1964
12/1964
2MT   46526 25/03/1953 82B
89A
84C
89D
84F
1C
2E
W
St Philips Marsh
Oswestry
Banbury
Oswestry
Stourbridge Junction
Watford
Saltley
Withdrawn
25/03/1953
29/12/1956
24/03/1962
06/10/1962
12/01/1963
30/03/1963
07/12/1963
07/1966
07/1966
2MT   46527 01/04/1953 82B
82A
82B
89A
84C
89D
84F
21B
W
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
St Philips Marsh
Oswestry
Banbury
Oswestry
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/04/1953
29/01/1955
20/04/1957
25/01/1958
24/03/1962
06/10/1962
12/01/1963
30/03/1963
10/1965
10/1965