Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 556 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5478 Week
» 28459 Month
» 391704 Year
» 468291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "6P5F" Class 2-6-0


LMS (1st) LMS (1934) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
13245 2945 42945 21/10/1933 26/03/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 32.67
13246 2946 42946 09/11/1933 20/11/1965 Oxley 32 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 32.29
13247 2947 42947 02/11/1933 04/12/1965 Heaton Mersey 32.08 32.31
13248 2948 42948 10/11/1933 23/10/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.92 32.20
13249 2949 42949 29/11/1933 09/11/1963 Stoke 30 30.06
13250 2950 42950 05/12/1933 23/10/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.83 32.13
13251 2951 42951 17/11/1933 12/03/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.33 32.60
13252 2952 42952 21/12/1933 12/09/1964 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30.75 31.59
13253 2953 42953 13/12/1933 15/01/1966 Springs Branch (Wigan) 32.08 32.53
13254 2954 42954 06/12/1933 11/02/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 33.17 33.71
13255 2955 42955 28/12/1933 16/04/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.33 32.57
13256 2956 42956 19/12/1933 19/09/1964 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30.75 31.01
13257 2957 42957 23/12/1933 15/01/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.08 32.33
13258 2958 42958 11/01/1934 20/11/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 32.45
13259 2959 42959 04/01/1934 25/12/1965 Springs Branch (Wigan) 31.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 32.47
13260 2960 42960 23/12/1933 15/01/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.08 32.33
13261 2961 42961 10/01/1934 21/08/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.58 31.87
13262 2962 42962 03/01/1934 15/02/1964 Oxley 30.08 30.30
13263 2963 42963 18/12/1933 16/07/1966 Springs Branch (Wigan) 32.58 33.10
13264 2964 42964 08/01/1934 20/11/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 32.04
13265 2965 42965 08/01/1934 08/08/1964 Bushbury 30.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 30.87
13266 2966 42966 10/01/1934 25/07/1964 Bushbury 30.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 30.87
13267 2967 42967 08/01/1934 30/04/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.25 32.71
13268 2968 42968 24/01/1934 31/12/1966 Springs Branch (Wigan) 32.92 Prs Preserved
13269 2969 42969 12/01/1934 14/11/1964 Crewe South 30.83 31.19
13270 2970 42970 11/01/1934 24/10/1964 Nuneaton 30.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 31.12
13271 2971 42971 10/01/1934 19/12/1964 Nuneaton 30.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 31.20
13272 2972 42972 15/01/1934 17/04/1965 Gorton 31.25 31.60
13273 2973 42973 20/01/1934 09/11/1963 Oxley 29.83 29.92
13274 2974 42974 16/01/1934 25/09/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.67 31.93
13275 2975 42975 25/01/1934 Crewe South 26/03/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 32.41
13276 2976 42976 24/01/1934 Crewe South 20/07/1963 Nuneaton 29.5 29.66
13277 2977 42977 23/01/1934 Crewe South 18/06/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.42 32.67
13278 2978 42978 25/01/1934 Crewe South 30/04/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.25 32.58
13279 2979 42979 02/02/1934 Crewe South 05/12/1964 Bescot 30.83 31.30
13280 2980 42980 07/02/1934 Newton Heath 08/01/1966 Heaton Mersey 31.92 32.21
13281 2981 42981 12/02/1934 Newton Heath 21/05/1966 Heaton Mersey 32.25 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 08/1966 32.53
13282 2982 42982 08/02/1934 Newton Heath 13/11/1965 Heaton Mersey 31.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 32.04
13283 2983 42983 09/03/1934 Newton Heath 15/01/1966 Heaton Mersey 31.83 32.12
13284 2984 42984 07/03/1934 Newton Heath 28/09/1963 Crewe South 29.5 29.79