Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 233 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 23428 Month
» 320442 Year
» 397029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "6P5F" Class 2-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 09/12/1961 42953,
42982,
42983
2B,
6A,
5B
  Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 42959,
42979
5B,
21D
  Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Outside erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 29/11/1964 42975 2F   Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965  
Sun 29/11/1964 42945 9G   Swindon Works visit: Yard RO 1/1965  
Sun 21/08/1966 42977 Wdn   A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed - In a siding near the road entrance - this engine already possessed that forlorn aura associated with disuse. John Thickitt  
Sat 29/04/1967 42954 Wdn   A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt