09/11/1933 |
To Service |
13246 |
|
NEW |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/11/1933 |
To Service |
13248 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/11/1933 |
To Service |
13251 |
|
NEW |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/11/1933 |
To Service |
13249 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
05/12/1933 |
To Service |
13250 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
06/12/1933 |
To Service |
13254 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
13/12/1933 |
To Service |
13253 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
18/12/1933 |
To Service |
13263 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
19/12/1933 |
To Service |
13256 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
21/12/1933 |
To Service |
13252 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
23/12/1933 |
To Service |
13257 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
23/12/1933 |
To Service |
13260 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
28/12/1933 |
To Service |
13255 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
03/01/1934 |
To Service |
13262 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
04/01/1934 |
To Service |
13259 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
08/01/1934 |
To Service |
13264 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/01/1934 |
To Service |
13265 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/01/1934 |
To Service |
13267 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/01/1934 |
To Service |
13261 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
10/01/1934 |
To Service |
13266 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
10/01/1934 |
To Service |
13271 |
|
NEW |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/01/1934 |
To Service |
13258 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
11/01/1934 |
To Service |
13270 |
|
NEW |
3D |
Aston |
|
12/01/1934 |
To Service |
13269 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
15/01/1934 |
To Service |
13272 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/01/1934 |
To Service |
13274 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/01/1934 |
To Service |
13273 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/01/1934 |
To Service |
13277 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/01/1934 |
To Service |
13268 |
|
NEW |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/01/1934 |
To Service |
13276 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1934 |
To Service |
13275 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/01/1934 |
To Service |
13278 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/01/1934 |
Reallocation |
13270 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/01/1934 |
Reallocation |
13271 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
02/02/1934 |
To Service |
13279 |
|
NEW |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/02/1934 |
To Service |
13280 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/02/1934 |
To Service |
13282 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
12/02/1934 |
To Service |
13281 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/03/1934 |
To Service |
13284 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/03/1934 |
To Service |
13283 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
13271 |
1A |
Willesden |
28C |
Grangemouth |
|
08/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
13272 |
1A |
Willesden |
28C |
Grangemouth |
|
08/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
13273 |
1A |
Willesden |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
08/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
13274 |
1A |
Willesden |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
12/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13280 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13281 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13282 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13283 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13284 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13278 |
5B |
Crewe South |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
19/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
13279 |
5B |
Crewe South |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
09/07/1934 |
Reallocation |
13273 |
28A |
Motherwell |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
09/07/1934 |
Reallocation |
13274 |
28A |
Motherwell |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13255 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13256 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13257 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13258 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13259 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13260 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13261 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13262 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13263 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13264 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13266 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
20/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13269 |
1A |
Willesden |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
20/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
13270 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
13278 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
03/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
13279 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
24/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
13260 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/1934 |
Reallocation |
13275 |
5B |
Crewe South |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
15/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
13258 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
31/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
5B |
Crewe South |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
31/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
13277 |
5B |
Crewe South |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
1935 |
Reallocation |
13271 |
28C |
Grangemouth |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
19/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
13280 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
13282 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
13284 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/02/1935 |
Reallocation |
2956 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
09/03/1935 |
Reallocation |
13260 |
9A |
Longsight |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/03/1935 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
9A |
Longsight |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/03/1935 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10B |
Preston |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
2956 |
2B |
Bletchley |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
10B |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
13267 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
13268 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
13269 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
13284 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/04/1935 |
Reallocation |
13272 |
28C |
Grangemouth |
28C |
Motherwell |
|
25/05/1935 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
25/05/1935 |
Reallocation |
13277 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
25/05/1935 |
Reallocation |
13278 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
25/05/1935 |
Reallocation |
13279 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13254 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13271 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13275 |
7C |
Holyhead |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
7C |
Holyhead |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13277 |
7C |
Holyhead |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13278 |
7C |
Holyhead |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12A.1 |
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
15/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13247 |
12A.1 |
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
15/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
13273 |
27A |
Polmadie |
10B |
Preston |
|
06/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13272 |
28C |
Grangemouth |
10B |
Preston |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13248 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13249 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13250 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13252 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13254 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13268 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
13274 |
27A |
Polmadie |
10B |
Preston |
|
15/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2959 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/09/1935 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
13252 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
13274 |
10B |
Preston |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
13272 |
10B |
Preston |
3D |
Aston |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
13273 |
10B |
Preston |
3D |
Aston |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
13274 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
30/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
30/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
30/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
28/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
28/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
13254 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
06/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2977 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
25/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
3A |
Bescot |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
25/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
3A |
Bescot |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
08/05/1936 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/05/1936 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/05/1936 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
5B |
Crewe South |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
06/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
11/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
3D |
Aston |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
26/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
26/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
26/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2967 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
3A |
Bescot |
|
03/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
21/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
21/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
3D |
Aston |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
02/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
02/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
09/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
1A |
Willesden |
3A |
Bescot |
|
27/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
20/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
3A |
Bescot |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
3A |
Bescot |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
3A |
Bescot |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2967 |
3A |
Bescot |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
1A |
Willesden |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
27/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
1A |
Willesden |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
05/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
5B |
Crewe South |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
3A |
Bescot |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
12/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
19/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
02/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12D |
Workington |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12D |
Workington |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2956 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2977 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
25/09/1937 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
02/10/1937 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
02/10/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
13/11/1937 |
Reallocation |
2956 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/11/1937 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/11/1937 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/11/1937 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/12/1937 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
22/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
22/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
22/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/03/1938 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/03/1938 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
04/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
3D |
Aston |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
3A |
Bescot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
3A |
Bescot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
3B |
Bushbury |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
24/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
3D |
Aston |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
08/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
08/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
29/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
05/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/12/1938 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/01/1939 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
04/02/1939 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/04/1939 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
2A |
Rugby |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
29/04/1939 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
29/04/1939 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/04/1939 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
3D |
Aston |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
08/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
08/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12D |
Workington |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
16/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12D |
Workington |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
30/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2961 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/11/1939 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
3B |
Bushbury |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
17/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
3B |
Bushbury |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
17/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
3A |
Bescot |
7B |
Bangor |
|
09/03/1940 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Aston |
|
20/04/1940 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
20/04/1940 |
Reallocation |
2954 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
20/04/1940 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
20/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Bangor |
|
17/08/1940 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7B |
Bangor |
|
17/08/1940 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
12/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
12/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
26/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
26/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
26/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2954 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
23/11/1940 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
23/11/1940 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
23/11/1940 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
23/11/1940 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12D |
Workington |
|
11/01/1941 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
7B |
Bangor |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/01/1941 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
7B |
Bangor |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/02/1941 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
29/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
05/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
03/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
05/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
04/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
7B |
Bangor |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
1A |
Willesden |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
17/01/1942 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/01/1942 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
12D |
Workington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/01/1942 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
12D |
Workington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/01/1942 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
12D |
Workington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
12D |
Workington |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/02/1942 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
2959 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
02/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
02/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/06/1942 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
15/08/1942 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/08/1942 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
9A |
Longsight |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/08/1942 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
9A |
Longsight |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1942 |
Reallocation |
2956 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1942 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/10/1942 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
7B |
Bangor |
|
07/11/1942 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/11/1942 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/12/1942 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
26/12/1942 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
30/01/1943 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
2954 |
7B |
Bangor |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3A |
Bescot |
|
24/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
21/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
28/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
02/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/05/1944 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
08/07/1944 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
7B |
Bangor |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
09/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
18/11/1944 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
5B |
Crewe South |
7B |
Bangor |
|
16/12/1944 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
7B |
Bangor |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
27/10/1945 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/10/1945 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/11/1945 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/11/1945 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/11/1945 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
02/02/1946 |
Reallocation |
2954 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Bangor |
|
09/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Speke Junction |
|
11/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
20/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
26/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
2955 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
2957 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2954 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
2977 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
25/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
06/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
2958 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
13/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
2957 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
20/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
2B |
Bletchley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2957 |
2B |
Bletchley |
3D |
Aston |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2960 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42962 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42962 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
2959 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
5B |
Crewe South |
7B |
Bangor |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
7B |
Bangor |
3D |
Aston |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
7B |
Bangor |
3D |
Aston |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
7B |
Bangor |
3D |
Aston |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
42984 |
7B |
Bangor |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42984 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9A |
Longsight |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
42949 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
3D |
Aston |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
3D |
Aston |
9A |
Longsight |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
21/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
9A |
Longsight |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
3D |
Aston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42962 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
09/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42962 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
3D |
Aston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
06/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
3D |
Aston |
|
13/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
9A |
Longsight |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
3D |
Aston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
3D |
Aston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
21/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
08/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
08/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
42959 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
3D |
Aston |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Bescot |
|
03/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42976 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Bescot |
|
03/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42967 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42976 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
31/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
9A |
Longsight |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
03/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
1A |
Willesden |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
42949 |
8E |
Brunswick |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Newton Heath |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
BHD |
Newton Heath |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
3D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42945 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
24K |
Preston |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
24K |
Preston |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
24K |
Preston |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42976 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
24K |
Preston |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
21D |
Aston |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
3D |
Aston |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
42956 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21D |
Aston |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21D |
Aston |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21D |
Aston |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2A |
Rugby |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
21/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
21D |
Aston |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
21D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
42967 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42945 |
24K |
Preston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
24K |
Preston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
24K |
Preston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42976 |
24K |
Preston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
5A |
Crewe North |
21D |
Aston |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42967 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42969 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42973 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
3D |
Aston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42956 |
21D |
Aston |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42957 |
3D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
21D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42974 |
3D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42979 |
21D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42962 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42966 |
21B |
Bescot |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42949 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42959 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42972 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
21C |
Bushbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42956 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
1963 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5E |
Alsager |
|
16/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
5D |
Stoke |
27B |
Aintree |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
42965 |
5D |
Stoke |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
42972 |
5D |
Stoke |
21B |
Bescot |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
5D |
Stoke |
21B |
Bescot |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
21B |
Bescot |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
21B |
Bescot |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
5D |
Stoke |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42969 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/07/1963 |
Condemned |
42976 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
28/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42984 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6B |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42949 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42956 |
5D |
Stoke |
8L |
Aintree |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
5D |
Stoke |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42969 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42971 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42973 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
9J |
Agecroft |
8L |
Aintree |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
9J |
Agecroft |
8L |
Aintree |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
9K |
Bolton |
8L |
Aintree |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42959 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Condemned |
42962 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Reallocation |
42963 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/1964 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42952 |
8L |
Aintree |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42953 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42956 |
8L |
Aintree |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42957 |
21B |
Bescot |
2K |
Bushbury |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
8L |
Aintree |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
8L |
Aintree |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42983 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2K |
Bushbury |
|
25/07/1964 |
Condemned |
42966 |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
COND |
|
08/1964 |
Reallocation |
42954 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
08/08/1964 |
Condemned |
42965 |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42952 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42956 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42970 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42945 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
2K |
Bushbury |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42969 |
1F |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
5D |
Stoke |
9G |
Gorton |
|
14/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42969 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
1F |
Rugby |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
1F |
Rugby |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42967 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42972 |
21B |
Bescot |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42974 |
21B |
Bescot |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
21B |
Bescot |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
1F |
Rugby |
9G |
Gorton |
|
12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
5E |
Alsager |
9G |
Gorton |
|
05/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42979 |
21B |
Bescot |
|
COND |
|
19/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42971 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42946 |
2K |
Bushbury |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42957 |
2K |
Bushbury |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42983 |
2K |
Bushbury |
2B |
Oxley |
|
17/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42972 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42945 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42947 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42948 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42950 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42951 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42955 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42958 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42960 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42961 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42964 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42967 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42974 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42975 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42977 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42978 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42980 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42981 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42982 |
9G |
Gorton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42961 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
42974 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1965 |
Condemned |
42948 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1965 |
Condemned |
42950 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1965 |
Condemned |
42982 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
42946 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
42958 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
42964 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
12/1965 |
Reallocation |
42957 |
2B |
Oxley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/1965 |
Reallocation |
42968 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/1965 |
Reallocation |
42983 |
2B |
Oxley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
04/12/1965 |
Condemned |
42947 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1965 |
Condemned |
42959 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42980 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42953 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42957 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42960 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42983 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
42951 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Condemned |
42945 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Condemned |
42975 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Condemned |
42955 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
30/04/1966 |
Condemned |
42967 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
30/04/1966 |
Condemned |
42978 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1966 |
Condemned |
42981 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1966 |
Condemned |
42977 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
16/07/1966 |
Condemned |
42963 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
42968 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Condemned |
42954 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|