Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 233 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 23428 Month
» 320442 Year
» 397029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "6P5F" Class 2-6-0


Class LMS (1st) LMS (1934) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Lobster 13245 2945 42945 21/10/1933 12B
12D
12B
12D
12B
12D
5B
8A
6B
7B
7A
6B
24K
2B
9G
9F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Mold Junction
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Preston
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
21/10/1933
15/06/1935
13/07/1935
03/07/1937
22/01/1938
16/09/1939
23/11/1940
24/01/1942
07/11/1942
26/12/1942
20/05/1944
08/07/1944
09/09/1944
23/04/1960
09/09/1961
11/1964
05/1965
26/03/1966
26/03/1966
Lobster 13246 2946 42946 09/11/1933 12D
12B
12D
12B
12D
5B
8C
8A
8C
3D
5A
5B
6C
2B
2K
2B
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Aston
Crewe North
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Bushbury
Oxley
Withdrawn
09/11/1933
13/07/1935
03/07/1937
02/10/1937
16/09/1939
23/11/1940
24/01/1942
17/11/1945
22/06/1946
20/07/1946
27/08/1949
20/09/1958
18/04/1959
10/09/1960
16/06/1962
11/1964
04/1965
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
Lobster 13247 2947 42947 02/11/1933 12B
9B
8A
5B
2D
5B
6B
5B
7B
3D
3D
2B
5B
1F
9G
9F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Stockport Edgeley
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Bangor
Aston
Aston
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Rugby
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
02/11/1933
15/06/1935
22/01/1938
12/02/1938
10/02/1940
29/03/1941
15/08/1942
21/08/1943
15/06/1946
28/05/1949
25/06/1949
16/07/1949
23/06/1962
29/06/1963
11/1963
12/1964
05/1965
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
Lobster 13248 2948 42948 10/11/1933 12B
8A
12A
8C
4A
8A
7B
3D
5B
3D
1A
5B
5D
8F
9F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Edge Hill
Carlisle Kingmoor
Speke Junction
Shrewsbury
Edge Hill
Bangor
Aston
Crewe South
Aston
Willesden
Crewe South
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
10/11/1933
13/07/1935
26/10/1935
28/12/1935
22/01/1938
04/06/1938
13/08/1938
17/08/1940
25/06/1949
26/09/1953
31/10/1953
05/12/1953
08/12/1956
24/11/1962
14/12/1963
05/1965
23/10/1965
23/10/1965
Lobster 13249 2949 42949 29/11/1933 12B
12D
5B
2B
8C
8E
5B
5D
W
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Crewe South
Bletchley
Speke Junction
Brunswick
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
29/11/1933
13/07/1935
23/11/1940
24/01/1942
20/12/1947
06/03/1948
08/07/1950
14/03/1959
24/11/1962
09/11/1963
09/11/1963
Lobster 13250 2950 42950 05/12/1933 12B
12D
5B
6B
5B
2A
6B
6A
6C
2B
6B
8H
5E
9G
9F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Rugby
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
05/12/1933
13/07/1935
23/11/1940
21/02/1942
12/09/1953
21/11/1953
16/01/1960
04/02/1961
10/06/1961
14/10/1961
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
05/10/1963
26/10/1963
12/1964
05/1965
23/10/1965
23/10/1965
Lobster 13251 2951 42951 17/11/1933 10A
8B
8A
BHD
7A
7B
9A
BHD
7B
3D
2B
3D
6C
3D
2A
2B
6B
8H
5E
9G
9F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Longsight
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Aston
Nuneaton
Aston
Birkenhead Mollington Street (on loan)
Aston
Rugby
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
17/11/1933
13/07/1935
05/10/1935
20/06/1936
25/09/1937
20/04/1940
26/10/1940
11/10/1941
29/08/1942
03/10/1942
25/06/1949
09/05/1953
06/06/1953
01/06/1957
29/06/1957
16/01/1960
21/01/1961
22/06/1963
05/10/1963
26/10/1963
11/1964
05/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
Lobster 13252 2952 42952 21/12/1933 10A
8B
7A
7B
5B
5D
6C
6B
9J
8L
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Warrington Dallam
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Crewe South
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Agecroft
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
21/12/1933
13/07/1935
05/10/1935
17/08/1940
26/10/1940
11/01/1941
24/11/1962
22/06/1963
07/09/1963
09/11/1963
23/11/1963
07/1964
12/09/1964
12/09/1964
Lobster 13253 2953 42953 13/12/1933 12B
12A
8C
8B
5B
6B
BHD
5B
5A
5B
3A
5B
2A
2B
5D
27B
12A
8F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Crewe North
Crewe South
Bescot (on loan)
Crewe South
Rugby
Nuneaton
Stoke
Aintree
Carlisle Kingmoor
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
13/12/1933
13/07/1935
01/06/1936
22/01/1938
29/04/1939
21/02/1942
24/07/1943
28/06/1947
20/09/1952
17/04/1954
08/01/1955
03/08/1957
17/08/1957
16/01/1960
21/01/1961
24/11/1962
16/01/1963
09/11/1963
07/1964
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
Lobster 13254 2954 42954 06/12/1933 12A
12B
BHD
7A
7B
6B
7B
7A
5B
3D
5A
2B
5B
5E
8F
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Mold Junction
Bangor (on loan)
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Aston
Crewe North
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
06/12/1933
01/06/1935
13/07/1935
28/12/1935
20/04/1940
26/10/1940
12/06/1943
02/02/1946
28/06/1947
01/10/1949
12/11/1949
20/09/1958
16/09/1961
22/06/1963
02/1964
08/1964
11/02/1967
11/02/1967
Lobster 13255 2955 42955 28/12/1933 8B
12B
8C
8A
5B
8C
8A
5B
5A
5B
2A
2B
9G
9F
W
Warrington Dallam
Carlisle Upperby
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Crewe North
Crewe South
Rugby
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
28/12/1933
13/10/1934
21/09/1935
05/03/1937
22/01/1938
29/04/1939
10/02/1940
17/11/1945
22/06/1946
26/04/1947
08/01/1955
18/04/1959
31/12/1960
21/01/1961
11/1964
05/1965
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
Lobster 13256 2956 42956 19/12/1933 2B
12B
2D
BHD
5B
21D
2B
5D
8L
8F
W
Bletchley
Carlisle Upperby
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Aston
Nuneaton
Stoke
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
19/12/1933
13/10/1934
23/02/1935
20/04/1935
25/09/1937
13/11/1937
19/09/1942
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
22/12/1962
09/11/1963
07/1964
19/09/1964
19/09/1964
Lobster 13257 2957 42957 23/12/1933 5B
2B
3D
21B
2K
2B
9F
W
Crewe South
Bletchley
Aston
Bescot
Bushbury
Oxley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
23/12/1933
13/10/1934
26/04/1947
13/12/1947
06/03/1948
23/06/1962
07/1964
04/1965
12/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
Lobster 13258 2958 42958 11/01/1934 5B

8A
5B
8A
8C
8A
5B
2D
3D
5A
6C
2B
5B
1F
9G
9F
W
Crewe South

Edge Hill
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Speke Junction (on loan)
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Aston
Crewe North
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Rugby
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
11/01/1934
13/10/1934
15/12/1934
20/06/1936
05/07/1941
28/08/1943
09/03/1946
11/05/1946
26/04/1947
06/12/1947
17/07/1948
20/09/1958
10/06/1961
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
09/11/1963
12/1964
05/1965
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
Lobster 13259 2959 42959 04/01/1934 5B
8A
2D
6B
5B
5D
8F
W
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
04/01/1934
13/10/1934
15/07/1935
02/05/1942
12/02/1949
09/02/1957
24/11/1962
21/12/1963
25/12/1965
25/12/1965
Lobster 13260 2960 42960 23/12/1933 5B

8A
1A
5B
8A
5B
8C
8A
12B
2D
BHD
2D
5B
3D
9A
6B
24K
2B
6B
9J
8L
8F
9F
W
Crewe South

Edge Hill
Willesden
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Carlisle Upperby
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Aston
Longsight
Mold Junction
Preston
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Agecroft
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
23/12/1933
13/10/1934
24/11/1934
09/03/1935
03/08/1935
26/10/1935
06/02/1936
07/03/1936
17/10/1936
09/01/1937
27/02/1937
25/09/1937
13/11/1937
12/06/1942
19/09/1942
17/07/1948
20/01/1951
31/08/1957
23/04/1960
09/09/1961
22/06/1963
09/11/1963
23/11/1963
07/1964
05/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
Lobster 13261 2961 42961 10/01/1934 5B

8A
3D
3A
3B
3D
10A
4A
5B
5D
5B
BHD
5A
5B
5D
9K
8L
8F
9F
W
Crewe South

Edge Hill
Aston
Bescot
Bushbury
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe North
Crewe South
Stoke
Bolton
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
10/01/1934
13/10/1934
24/11/1934
09/03/1935
07/03/1936
21/11/1936
27/03/1937
03/07/1937
02/07/1938
29/10/1938
26/11/1938
08/07/1939
30/09/1939
17/09/1949
24/04/1954
18/04/1959
24/11/1962
09/11/1963
23/11/1963
07/1964
05/1965
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
Lobster 13262 2962 42962 03/01/1934 5B
10B
12B
8B
5B
7B
5B
8C
5B
2B
W
Crewe South
Preston
Carlisle Upperby
Warrington Dallam
Crewe South
Bangor
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
03/01/1934
13/10/1934
09/03/1935
20/04/1935
09/05/1936
21/02/1942
18/11/1944
16/12/1944
11/12/1948
09/02/1952
30/06/1962
15/02/1964
15/02/1964
Lobster 13263 2963 42963 18/12/1933 3A
3B
4D
4A
5B
3A
3D
5A
26A
5A
5B
5D
8F
W
Bescot
Bushbury
Abergavenny
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Bescot
Aston
Crewe North
Newton Heath (on loan)
Crewe North
Crewe South
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
18/12/1933
13/10/1934
26/09/1936
27/03/1937
24/09/1938
08/10/1938
26/11/1938
17/07/1943
02/10/1943
18/09/1954
27/06/1959
19/09/1959
16/09/1961
24/11/1962
05/1964
16/07/1966
16/07/1966
Lobster 13264 2964 42964 08/01/1934 8B
5B
BHD
8A
2D
8C
6C
5B
6C
2B
8C
5A
6B
5B
21D
5A
2B
6B
8H
5E
9G
9F
W
Warrington Dallam
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Nuneaton
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Speke Junction
Crewe North
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Aston
Crewe North
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street (on loan)
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
08/01/1934
13/10/1934
08/05/1936
27/03/1937
05/06/1937
03/07/1937
02/05/1942
15/01/1949
09/02/1952
22/03/1952
19/09/1953
30/10/1954
08/01/1955
14/01/1956
09/06/1956
09/02/1957
26/11/1960
01/07/1961
16/09/1961
22/06/1963
05/10/1963
26/10/1963
11/1964
05/1965
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
Lobster 13265 2965 42965 08/01/1934 3A
BHD
8A
6B
7A
8C
6C
8C
5B
6B
24K
2B
5D
21C
W
Bescot
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Preston
Nuneaton
Stoke
Bushbury
Withdrawn
08/01/1934
13/10/1934
26/09/1936
27/03/1937
03/07/1937
26/12/1942
05/06/1948
17/07/1948
20/10/1951
12/01/1952
26/01/1952
14/02/1953
23/04/1960
09/09/1961
22/12/1962
09/03/1963
08/08/1964
08/08/1964
Lobster 13266 2966 42966 10/01/1934 2D
5B
5D
5B
3A
3D
1A
5B
5A
21D
21B
21C
W
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe South
Bescot
Aston
Willesden
Crewe South
Crewe North
Aston
Bescot
Bushbury
Withdrawn
10/01/1934
13/10/1934
25/09/1937
04/02/1939
08/07/1939
30/09/1939
17/07/1943
02/10/1943
05/12/1953
08/12/1956
03/05/1958
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
11/08/1962
25/07/1964
25/07/1964
Lobster 13267 2967 42967 08/01/1934 8A
8B
3A
BHD
6B
6A
2B
9G
9F
W
Edge Hill
Warrington Dallam
Bescot
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
08/01/1934
20/04/1935
07/03/1936
26/09/1936
27/03/1937
10/08/1957
10/08/1961
16/06/1962
12/1964
05/1965
30/04/1966
30/04/1966
Lobster 13268 2968 42968 24/01/1934 8A
5B
3D
3A
BHD
8A
1A
2D
5B
5A
6C
2B
6B
8F
9F
8F
W
Edge Hill
Crewe South
Aston
Bescot
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Willesden
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Crewe North
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
24/01/1934
20/04/1935
13/07/1935
14/12/1935
21/11/1936
12/06/1937
26/11/1938
10/05/1941
22/11/1941
21/02/1942
03/05/1958
10/06/1961
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
05/1964
05/1965
12/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
Lobster 13269 2969 42969 12/01/1934 5B
3D
1A
3B
BHD
2B
5B
1F
5B
W
Crewe South
Aston
Willesden
Bushbury
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Rugby
Crewe South
Withdrawn
12/01/1934
20/10/1934
20/04/1935
30/11/1935
14/11/1936
27/03/1937
17/02/1940
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
09/11/1963
11/1964
14/11/1964
14/11/1964
Lobster 13270 2970 42970 11/01/1934 5B
BHD
12B
BHD
11B
9B
3B
BHD
26A
6C
2B
6B
8H
5E
W
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Carlisle Upperby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Barrow in Furness
Stockport Edgeley
Bushbury
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Newton Heath (on loan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
11/01/1934
27/01/1934
20/10/1934
15/06/1935
09/05/1936
09/10/1936
19/06/1937
03/07/1937
25/09/1937
02/10/1937
17/02/1940
04/07/1959
12/09/1959
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
05/10/1963
26/10/1963
24/10/1964
24/10/1964
Lobster 13271 2971 42971 10/01/1934 28C

5B
8B
6A
BHD
7A
8C
6B
6A
6C
2B
5B
5E
W
Carstairs

Crewe South
Warrington Dallam
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
10/01/1934
27/01/1934
08/04/1934
1935
01/06/1935
03/10/1936
25/09/1937
25/11/1939
12/10/1946
01/10/1949
09/02/1952
10/06/1961
14/10/1961
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
09/11/1963
19/12/1964
19/12/1964
Lobster 13272 2972 42972 15/01/1934 28C
28A
10B
3D
8B
5B
8A
8C
8A
8C
5B
5D
21B
9G
W
Carstairs
Motherwell (on loan)
Preston
Aston
Warrington Dallam
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Stoke
Bescot
Gorton
Withdrawn
15/01/1934
08/04/1934
27/04/1935
06/07/1935
16/11/1935
21/11/1936
21/02/1942
28/08/1943
27/10/1945
22/06/1946
20/07/1946
24/04/1948
24/11/1962
09/03/1963
12/1964
17/04/1965
17/04/1965
Lobster 13273 2973 42973 20/01/1934 28A
27A
10B
3D
3E
3D
3E
3A
3D
2D
8C
3D
6C
6B
6C
2B
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Preston
Aston
Monument Lane
Aston
Monument Lane
Bescot
Aston
Nuneaton
Speke Junction
Aston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
20/01/1934
08/04/1934
09/07/1934
15/06/1935
16/11/1935
21/11/1936
20/03/1937
12/06/1937
25/09/1937
28/01/1939
29/04/1939
15/01/1949
27/08/1949
30/09/1950
20/06/1953
06/02/1960
16/06/1962
09/11/1963
09/11/1963
Lobster 13274 2974 42974 16/01/1934 28A
27A
10B
8B
10A
BHD
2D
5B
8C
5B
2D
3D
21B
9G
9F
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Aston
Bescot
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
16/01/1934
08/04/1934
09/07/1934
13/07/1935
16/11/1935
13/11/1937
05/03/1938
10/05/1941
21/02/1942
17/11/1945
24/04/1948
19/06/1948
17/07/1948
23/06/1962
12/1964
05/1965
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
Lobster 13275 2975 42975 25/01/1934 5B

BHD
6A
BHD
8A
1A
6B
1A
3D
9B
5B
2A
2B
21B
9G
9F
W
Crewe South

Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Willesden
Mold Junction
Willesden
Aston
Stockport Edgeley
Crewe South
Rugby
Nuneaton
Bescot
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
25/01/1934
12/1934
01/06/1935
11/07/1936
03/07/1937
26/11/1938
03/05/1941
08/11/1941
10/05/1958
20/06/1958
17/09/1960
22/10/1960
31/12/1960
21/01/1961
18/05/1963
12/1964
05/1965
26/03/1966
26/03/1966
Lobster 13276 2976 42976 24/01/1934 5B
26A
7C
BHD
8A
BHD
6A
BHD
6A
6B
6A
7A
8C
6B
3A
6B
24K
2B
W
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Holyhead
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Bescot (on loan)
Mold Junction
Preston
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
24/01/1934
31/12/1934
25/05/1935
01/06/1935
03/07/1937
25/09/1937
12/10/1940
22/02/1941
05/04/1941
30/01/1943
28/08/1943
14/07/1945
13/09/1947
25/10/1947
03/08/1957
17/08/1957
23/04/1960
09/09/1961
20/07/1963
20/07/1963
Lobster 13277 2977 42977 23/01/1934 5B
26A
7C
BHD
12B
2D
5B
8C
6C
2A
2B
5B
21C
5D
8F
9F
W
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Holyhead
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Carlisle Upperby
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rugby
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Bushbury
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
23/01/1934
31/12/1934
25/05/1935
01/06/1935
01/04/1936
25/09/1937
05/07/1947
27/11/1948
20/10/1951
03/12/1960
21/01/1961
04/03/1961
18/08/1962
15/12/1962
14/12/1963
05/1965
18/06/1966
18/06/1966
Lobster 13278 2978 42978 25/01/1934 5B

24B
7C
BHD
8A
1A
6A
6B
8A
8C
9A
3D
5B
6C
2A
2B
6B
8H
5E
9G
9F
W
Crewe South

Rose Grove
Holyhead
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Longsight
Aston
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rugby
Nuneaton
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
25/01/1934
19/05/1934
03/11/1934
25/05/1935
01/06/1935
26/11/1938
03/05/1941
17/01/1942
02/05/1942
14/11/1942
27/10/1945
19/11/1949
21/07/1951
03/11/1951
05/07/1952
03/12/1960
21/01/1961
22/06/1963
05/10/1963
26/10/1963
12/1964
05/1965
30/04/1966
30/04/1966
Lobster 13279 2979 42979 02/02/1934 5B

24B
5B
8B
10A
BHD
6A
6B
8C
9A
3D
5B
3D
6C
9B
5B
21D
21B
W
Crewe South

Rose Grove
Crewe South
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Longsight
Aston
Crewe South
Aston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stockport Edgeley
Crewe South
Aston
Bescot
Withdrawn
02/02/1934
19/05/1934
03/11/1934
25/05/1935
09/11/1935
13/11/1937
05/03/1938
12/10/1940
08/11/1941
04/12/1948
19/11/1949
13/06/1953
26/09/1953
31/10/1953
18/05/1957
17/09/1960
22/10/1960
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
05/12/1964
05/12/1964
Lobster 13280 2980 42980 07/02/1934 26A
5B

3A
3E
3D
3E
3A
7B
3D
7B
5B
6C
5B
5D
21B
2B
5D
9G
9F
W
Newton Heath
Crewe South

Bescot
Monument Lane
Aston
Monument Lane
Bescot
Bangor
Aston (on loan)
Bangor
Crewe South
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Stoke
Bescot
Nuneaton
Stoke
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
07/02/1934
12/05/1934
19/01/1935
07/03/1936
25/04/1936
20/03/1937
12/06/1937
25/09/1937
17/02/1940
09/03/1940
20/07/1940
11/01/1941
18/05/1957
03/08/1957
24/11/1962
09/03/1963
25/05/1963
22/06/1963
11/1964
05/1965
08/01/1966
08/01/1966
Lobster 13281 2981 42981 12/02/1934 26A
5B
3D
1A
3B
3D
3A
10A
8A
2D
BHD
6B
6C
2B
5B
1F
9G
9F
W
Newton Heath
Crewe South
Aston
Willesden
Bushbury
Aston
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Crewe South
Rugby
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
12/02/1934
12/05/1934
06/06/1936
14/11/1936
27/03/1937
02/07/1937
25/09/1937
02/07/1938
05/11/1938
29/03/1941
05/03/1949
22/11/1958
18/06/1960
16/06/1962
22/06/1963
09/11/1963
12/1964
05/1965
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
Lobster 13282 2982 42982 08/02/1934 26A
5B

8A
3A
3E
3C
BHD
8A
8B
5B
8C
6B
21D
6B
6A
2B
5E
9G
9F
W
Newton Heath
Crewe South

Edge Hill
Bescot
Monument Lane
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Warrington Dallam
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Mold Junction
Aston
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Nuneaton
Alsager
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
08/02/1934
12/05/1934
19/01/1935
20/04/1935
07/03/1936
25/04/1936
11/07/1936
02/01/1937
03/07/1937
04/12/1937
05/07/1941
04/12/1948
02/02/1952
18/06/1960
04/02/1961
10/06/1961
16/06/1962
1963
12/1964
05/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
Lobster 13283 2983 42983 09/03/1934 26A
5B
3D
1A
3A
3D
4D
4A
5B
9A
5B
2K
2B
9F
W
Newton Heath
Crewe South
Aston
Willesden
Bescot
Aston
Abergavenny
Shrewsbury
Crewe South
Longsight
Crewe South
Bushbury
Oxley
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
09/03/1934
12/05/1934
06/06/1936
17/11/1936
09/01/1937
03/07/1937
24/09/1938
08/10/1938
26/11/1938
04/10/1941
29/08/1942
07/1964
04/1965
12/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
Lobster 13284 2984 42984 07/03/1934 26A
5B

8A
1A
5B
3D
3C
3A
3D
3A
10A
2A
7A
7B
7A
5B
W
Newton Heath
Crewe South

Edge Hill
Willesden
Crewe South
Aston
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Aston
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Rugby
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Withdrawn
07/03/1934
12/05/1934
19/01/1935
20/04/1935
03/08/1935
26/10/1935
06/06/1936
11/07/1936
02/01/1937
03/07/1937
25/09/1937
02/07/1938
03/12/1938
08/04/1939
20/04/1940
25/06/1949
01/10/1949
28/09/1963
28/09/1963