LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T
LYR | WR | LMS (1923) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1157 | 10648 | 50648 | 04/1892 | 19/11/1955 | 63.58 | ||||||||
1158 | 10649 | 05/1892 | 11/1938 | 46.5 | |||||||||
1159 | 10650 | 50650 | 05/1892 | 06/10/1956 | 64.42 | ||||||||
1160 | 10651 | 50651 | 05/1892 | 17/12/1955 | 63.58 | ||||||||
1161 | 10652 | 50652 | 05/1892 | 13/10/1956 | 64.42 | ||||||||
1162 | 10653 | 50653 | 05/1892 | 04/02/1956 | 63.75 | ||||||||
1163 | 10654 | 50654 | 06/1892 | 28/04/1951 | 58.83 | ||||||||
1164 | 10655 | 50655 | 06/1892 | 11/08/1956 | 64.17 | ||||||||
1065 | 10656 | 50656 | 06/1892 | 12/03/1955 | 62.75 | ||||||||
1066 | 10657 | 06/1892 | 08/1940 | 48.17 | |||||||||
10 | 10658 | 06/1892 | 03/1930 | 37.75 | |||||||||
1167 | 10659 | 06/1892 | 11/1938 | 46.42 | |||||||||
1168 | 10660 | 50660 | 07/1892 | 29/03/1958 | 65.67 | ||||||||
1169 | 10661 | 07/1892 | 03/1946 | 53.67 | |||||||||
287 | 10662 | 07/1892 | 12/1930 | 38.42 | |||||||||
289 | 10663 | 07/1892 | 02/1937 | 44.58 | |||||||||
321 | 10664 | 07/1892 | 02/1947 | 54.58 | |||||||||
323 | 10665 | 50665 | 07/1892 | 08/1949 | 57.08 | ||||||||
334 | 10666 | 07/1892 | 01/1944 | 51.5 | |||||||||
337 | 10667 | 07/1892 | 20/03/1948 | 55.67 | |||||||||
1170 | 10668 | 08/1892 | 12/1937 | 45.33 | |||||||||
1171 | 10669 | 08/1892 | 01/1947 | 54.42 | |||||||||
1172 | 10670 | 50670 | 08/1892 | 04/1949 | 56.67 | ||||||||
1173 | 10671 | 50671 | 08/1892 | 15/03/1952 | 59.58 | ||||||||
1174 | 10672 | 09/1892 | 12/1930 | 38.25 | |||||||||
1175 | 10673 | 09/1892 | 11/1934 | 42.17 | |||||||||
1176 | 10674 | 09/1892 | 05/1947 | 54.67 | |||||||||
1177 | 10675 | 50675 | 09/1892 | 31/12/1949 | 57.25 | ||||||||
1178 | 10676 | 50676 | 09/1892 | 03/1950 | 57.5 | ||||||||
1179 | 10677 | 09/1892 | 04/1945 | 52.58 | |||||||||
16 | 10678 | 50678 | 09/1892 | 26/12/1953 | 61.25 | ||||||||
26 | 10928 | 09/1892 | 10/1928 | 04/1915 to 6 Rbld |
36.08 | ||||||||
37 | 10679 | 10/1892 | 12/1930 | 38.17 | |||||||||
301 | 10680 | 10/1892 | 04/1934 | 41.5 | |||||||||
340 | 10681 | 50681 | 10/1892 | 05/07/1952 | 59.75 | ||||||||
345 | 10682 | 10/1892 | 10/1939 | 47 | |||||||||
349 | 10683 | 10/1892 | 06/1939 | 46.67 | |||||||||
638 | 10684 | 10/1892 | 09/1930 | 37.92 | |||||||||
651 | 10685 | 11/1892 | 11/1934 | 42 | |||||||||
680 | 10686 | 50686 | 11/1892 | 20/08/1955 | 62.75 | ||||||||
45 | 10929 | 08/1893 | 05/1928 | 04/1915 to 6 Rbld |
34.75 | ||||||||
46 | 10687 | 50687 | 09/1893 | 05/1953 | 59.67 | ||||||||
54 | 10658 | 10/1893 | 01/1940 | 46.25 | |||||||||
58 | 10933 | 10/1893 | 09/1927 | 01/1916 to 6 Rbld |
33.92 | ||||||||
119 | 10689 | 50689 | 10/1893 | 09/08/1952 | 58.83 | ||||||||
147 | 10690 | 10/1893 | 12/1930 | 37.17 | |||||||||
189 | 10691 | 10/1893 | 12/1937 | 44.17 | |||||||||
206 | 10692 | 50692 | 11/1893 | 10/1949 | 55.92 | ||||||||
208 | 10693 | 11/1893 | 03/1946 | 52.33 | |||||||||
299 | 10694 | 11/1893 | 04/1938 | 44.42 | |||||||||
1210 | 10695 | 50695 | 11/1893 | 19/07/1952 | 58.67 | ||||||||
1211 | 10696 | 50696 | 11/1893 | 02/1949 | 55.25 | ||||||||
1212 | 10697 | 50697 | 11/1893 | 17/05/1952 | 58.5 | ||||||||
1213 | 10698 | 12/1893 | 12/1930 | 37 | |||||||||
1214 | 10699 | 12/1893 | 11/1935 | 41.92 | |||||||||
1215 | 10700 | 12/1893 | 11/1936 | 42.92 | |||||||||
1216 | 10701 | 12/1893 | 11/1938 | 44.92 | |||||||||
1217 | 10702 | 12/1893 | 08/1930 | 36.67 | |||||||||
1218 | 10703 | 50703 | 12/1893 | 21/03/1953 | 59.25 | ||||||||
1219 | 10704 | 12/1893 | 02/1946 | 52.17 |