Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 527 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7981 Week
» 10563 Month
» 275196 Year
» 1496761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "Coal Tank" Class 0-6-2T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
    Unknown 27773 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27833 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7711 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27553 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27787 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27840 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7730 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27580 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27794 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27627 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27740 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27591 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27803 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27669 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7751 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27603 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7821 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7692 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7757 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27769 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27830 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7710 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7782 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27836 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7721 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27562 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27791 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27625 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27737 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27586 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27802 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27654 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7746 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27602 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27816 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27681 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7756 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7765 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27829 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27703 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7780 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7720 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27561 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27789 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27621 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7733 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27585 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27799 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27635 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7741 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27596 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7833 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27808 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27674 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7752 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27619 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 27759 LMS Dup. Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7822 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
    Unknown 7699 LMS   Big Four y/e 0000
27561 LMS Big Four 58881 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27562 LMS Big Four 58882 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27585 LMS Big Four 58884 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27586 LMS Big Four 58885 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27591 LMS Big Four 58886 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27627 LMS Big Four 58893 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27635 LMS Big Four 58894 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27654 LMS Big Four 58895 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27669 LMS Big Four 58896 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27681 LMS Big Four 58898 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27703 LMS Big Four 58901 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27740 LMS Big Four 58909 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27769 LMS Big Four 58918 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27787 LMS Big Four 58922 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27789 LMS Big Four 58923 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27802 LMS Big Four 58927 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27808 LMS Big Four 58929 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27816 LMS Big Four 58930 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27830 LMS Big Four 58934 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27833 LMS Big Four 58935 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27836 LMS Big Four 58936 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27840 LMS Big Four 58937 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7721 LMS Big Four 58905 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7730 LMS Big Four 58906 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7733 LMS Big Four 58907 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7751 LMS Big Four 58912 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7752 LMS Big Four 58913 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7756 LMS Big Four 58914 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7765 LMS Big Four 58917 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7780 LMS Big Four 58920 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7821 LMS Big Four 58931 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7822 LMS Big Four 58932 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
7833 LMS Big Four 58935 BR   British Rail y/e 1948
27759 LMS Big Four 58916 BR   British Rail w/e 01/05/1948
27791 LMS Big Four 58924 BR   British Rail w/e 29/05/1948
27596 LMS Big Four 58887 BR   British Rail w/e 12/06/1948
27674 LMS Big Four 58897 BR   British Rail w/e 31/07/1948
7782 LMS Big Four 58921 BR   British Rail w/e 31/07/1948
27603 LMS Big Four 58889 BR   British Rail w/e 07/08/1948
7746 LMS Big Four 58911 BR   British Rail w/e 21/08/1948
27553 LMS Big Four 58880 BR   British Rail w/e 28/08/1948
27737 LMS Big Four 58908 BR   British Rail w/e 09/10/1948
7710 LMS Big Four 58902 BR   British Rail w/e 23/10/1948
27794 LMS Big Four 58925 BR   British Rail w/e 20/11/1948
7757 LMS Big Four 58915 BR   British Rail w/e 08/01/1949
27803 LMS Big Four 58928 BR   British Rail w/e 15/01/1949
27580 LMS Big Four 58883 BR   British Rail w/e 19/03/1949
27829 LMS Big Four 58933 BR   British Rail w/e 30/04/1949
27602 LMS Big Four 58888 BR   British Rail w/e 28/05/1949
7711 LMS Big Four 58903 BR   British Rail w/e 11/06/1949
27773 LMS Big Four 58919 BR   British Rail w/e 10/09/1949
7720 LMS Big Four 58904 BR   British Rail w/e 10/09/1949
27625 LMS Big Four 58892 BR   British Rail w/e 24/09/1949
27799 LMS Big Four 58926 BR   British Rail w/e 01/10/1949
27621 LMS Big Four 58891 BR   British Rail w/e 22/10/1949
7692 LMS Big Four 58899 BR   British Rail w/e 28/01/1950
7699 LMS Big Four 58900 BR   British Rail w/e 11/02/1950
7741 LMS Big Four 58910 BR   British Rail w/e 01/04/1950