HR/LMS Drummond "K" Class 0-6-0
Class | HR | HR (Renum) | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
K | 134 | 17693 | 57693 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1949 | 11/06/1949 | |
K | 135 | 17694 | 57694 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1950 | 04/02/1950 | |
K | 136 | 17695 | 57695 | 02/1900 | 30A 67B W |
Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 01/1952 |
25/01/1952 | |
K | 137 | 17696 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | ||
K | 138 | 17697 | 57697 | 02/1900 | 30D 30D W |
Ayr Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 02/1951 |
17/02/1951 | |
K | 139 | 17698 | 57698 | 02/1900 | 30A 67B W |
Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 12/1951 |
06/12/1951 | |
K | 18 | 17699 | 57699 | 08/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1949 | 12/02/1949 | |
K | 19 | 17700 | 08/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 12/1946 | ||
K | 20 | 17701 | 08/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | ||
K | 21 | 17702 | 57702 | 08/1902 | 30C W |
Ardrossan Withdrawn |
23/10/1948 11/1949 |
22/10/1949 | |
K | 36 | 17703 | 07/1907 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1947 | 21/07/1947 | ||
K | 55 | 37 | 17704 | 07/1907 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 12/1946 |