LYR/LMS Aspinall "27" Class 0-6-0
LYR | LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 12256 | 52256 | 10/1894 | 21/02/1948 | 53.33 | ||||||
211 | 12337 | 52337 | 10/1896 | 20/03/1948 | 51.42 | ||||||
681 | 12401 | 52401 | 02/1900 | 24/01/1948 | 47.92 | ||||||
442 | 12417 | 52417 | 10/1900 | 14/02/1948 | 47.33 | ||||||
274 | 12422 | 52422 | 03/1901 | 06/03/1948 | 47 | ||||||
115 | 12437 | 52437 | 05/1906 | 05/05/1956 | 50 | ||||||
898 | 12515 | 52515 | 11/1906 | 12/12/1962 | 56.08 | 56.53 | |||||
85 | 12517 | 52517 | 04/1909 | 05/1958 | 49.08 | 50.20 | |||||
89 | 12518 | 52518 | 04/1909 | 02/1949 | 39.83 | 40.03 | |||||
109 | 12521 | 52521 | 05/1909 | 24/05/1957 | 48 | 48.28 | |||||
634 | 12522 | 52522 | 06/1909 | 12/03/1955 | 45.75 | 45.86 | |||||
636 | 12523 | 52523 | 07/1909 | 22/09/1962 | 53.17 | 53.87 | |||||
642 | 12524 | 52524 | 07/1909 | 14/08/1954 | 45.08 | ||||||
815 | 12525 | 52525 | 07/1909 | 18/04/1953 | 43.75 | ||||||
826 | 12526 | 52526 | 07/1909 | 25/03/1961 | 51.67 | 51.95 | |||||
61 | 12527 | 52527 | 08/1909 | 22/08/1959 | 50 | 50.20 | |||||
633 | 12529 | 52529 | 09/1909 | 02/03/1957 | 47.5 | 48.20 |