LYR/LMS Aspinall "27" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 12521 | 24F | Fleetwood | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 12524 | 26C | Bolton | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 12417 | 16A | Nottingham | |||
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 12417 | 16A | Nottingham | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 12437 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52256 | 23C | Southport | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52337 | 23B | Aintree | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52401 | 23B | Aintree | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52417 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52422 | 25F | Low Moor | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12437 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 26A | Newton Heath | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12515 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12517 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 52518 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12521 | 24F | Fleetwood | 25D | Mirfield | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12522 | 24C | Lostock Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12523 | 23C | Southport | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12524 | 26C | Bolton | 24A | Accrington | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12525 | 4A | Shrewsbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12526 | 24D | Lower Darwen | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12527 | 23B | Aintree | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12529 | 24B | Rose Grove | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 12515 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 25D | Mirfield | |
24/01/1948 | Condemned | 52401 | 23B | Aintree | COND | ||
14/02/1948 | Condemned | 52417 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
21/02/1948 | Condemned | 52256 | 23C | Southport | COND | ||
06/03/1948 | Condemned | 52422 | 25F | Low Moor | COND | ||
20/03/1948 | Condemned | 52337 | 23B | Aintree | COND | ||
31/07/1948 | Reallocation | 12524 | 24A | Accrington | 24D | Lower Darwen | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 12437 | 26A | Newton Heath | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 12437 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 12523 | 23C | Southport | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
02/1949 | Condemned | 52518 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
02/07/1949 | Reallocation | 12437 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 24E | Blackpool Central | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 12437 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 24E | Blackpool Central | |
15/10/1949 | Reallocation | 12521 | 25D | Mirfield | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12521 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 25A | Wakefield | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 52523 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12524 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12521 | 25A | Wakefield | 25A | Wakefield | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 52523 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24D | Lower Darwen | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12524 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 52523 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
01/04/1950 | Reallocation | 52527 | 23B | Aintree | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
29/04/1950 | Reallocation | 52529 | 24B | Rose Grove | 24D | Lower Darwen | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 52527 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24B | Rose Grove | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 52527 | 24B | Rose Grove | 24B | Rose Grove | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 52515 | 25D | Mirfield | 25F | Low Moor | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 52515 | 25F | Low Moor | 25F | Low Moor | |
27/10/1951 | Reallocation | 52521 | 25A | Wakefield | 25F | Low Moor | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 52522 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24D | Lower Darwen | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 52525 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 52517 | 26A | Newton Heath | 99C | Crewe Works | |
18/04/1953 | Condemned | 52525 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | COND | ||
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 52529 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 24B | Rose Grove | |
14/08/1954 | Condemned | 52524 | 24C | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 52527 | 24B | Rose Grove | 24E | Blackpool Central | |
12/03/1955 | Condemned | 52522 | 24D | Lower Darwen | COND | ||
05/05/1956 | Condemned | 52437 | 24E | Blackpool Central | COND | ||
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 52523 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24E | Blackpool Central | |
02/03/1957 | Condemned | 52529 | 24B | Rose Grove | COND | ||
23/03/1957 | Reallocation | 52526 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 24B | Rose Grove | |
24/05/1957 | Condemned | 52521 | 25F | Low Moor | COND | ||
05/1958 | Condemned | 52517 | 99C | Crewe Works | COND | ||
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 52527 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 26D | Bury | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 52523 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 26C | Bolton | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 52515 | 25F | Low Moor | 56D | Mirfield | |
22/08/1959 | Condemned | 52527 | 26D | Bury | COND | ||
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 52526 | 24B | Rose Grove | 26D | Bury | |
25/03/1961 | Condemned | 52526 | 26D | Bury | COND | ||
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 52515 | 56D | Mirfield | 56F | Low Moor | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 52515 | 56F | Low Moor | 56D | Mirfield | |
17/03/1962 | Reallocation | 52515 | 56D | Mirfield | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | |
22/09/1962 | Condemned | 52523 | 26C | Bolton | COND | ||
12/12/1962 | Condemned | 52515 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | COND |