Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 192 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2127 Week
» 17129 Month
» 361308 Year
» 872410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 28/10/1951 51396 27A   On Wigan shed Tony Gillett  
Wed 31/10/1951 51410 24B   On Accrington shed David Taylor  
Sun 30/04/1961 51497 Wdn   Seen dumped at Agecroft depot Tony Gillett  
Sun 30/04/1961 51413 26B   In steam at Agecroft depot Tony Gillett  
Sun 26/11/1961 51412,
51446
99C,
99C
  Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
SLS 1/1962  
Sat 09/12/1961 51419 Wdn   Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - being cut up. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 18/03/1962 51408 Wdn   On Agecroft shed.    
Sun 08/04/1962 51412 99C   Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter. SLS 5/1962