Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 349 Today
» 835 Yesterday
» 2050 Week
» 26712 Month
» 285571 Year
» 796673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11307     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11313     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11316     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51318     8A Edge Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11319     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51320     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11321     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11323     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51325     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11336     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11338     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51342     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11343     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11345     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11348     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11353     8A Edge Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11358     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11361     24A Accrington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11371     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11375     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11376     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11379     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11381     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11390     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11396     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11397     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11404     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51405     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11408     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11410     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11412     99C Crewe Works  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11413     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11415     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11419     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11423     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11424     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11425     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51427     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11429     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11432     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11436     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51438     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11439     8A Edge Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11441     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51443     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11444     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11445     8A Edge Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11446     99C Crewe Works  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11447     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11453     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11457     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11458     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11460     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11462     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11464     26B Agecroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51467     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51468     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51469     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11470     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11471     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11472     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11474     26B Agecroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51475     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11477     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11479     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11481     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51482     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11484     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11486     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51487     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11488     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11489     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11490     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11491     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51492     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 51495     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11496     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11497     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11498     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11499     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11500     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11503     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11504     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11506     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11510     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11511     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11512     26B Agecroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11513     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11514     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11516     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11519     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11521     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11524     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11526     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 11530     23B Aintree  
10/04/1948 Condemned 51320 25D Mirfield   COND  
18/09/1948 Condemned 51342 8C Speke Junction   COND  
23/10/1948 Condemned 51487 26D Bury   COND  
13/11/1948 Condemned 51467 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
20/11/1948 Condemned 51427 8C Speke Junction   COND  
11/12/1948 Condemned 51405 8C Speke Junction   COND  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 11444 8C Speke Junction 99C Crewe Works  
01/1949 Condemned 51468 25A Wakefield   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 51318 8A Edge Hill   COND  
03/1949 Condemned 51325 23A Bank Hall   COND  
04/1949 Condemned 51438 26A Newton Heath   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 51443 25C Goole   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 51469 8C Speke Junction   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 51495 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
07/1949 Condemned 51492 24B Rose Grove   COND  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 51429 25E Sowerby Bridge 25F Low Moor  
10/1949 Condemned 51482 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 51475 23B Aintree   COND  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 51348 26C Bolton 25E Sowerby Bridge  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 11338 26D Bury 26A Newton Heath  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 11458 25C Goole 26A Newton Heath  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 51376 24F Fleetwood 26D Bury  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 51481 26D Bury 28B Fleetwood  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 51390 25A Wakefield 24A Accrington  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 51423 24C Lostock Hall 28B Fleetwood  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 51423 28B Fleetwood 24C Lostock Hall  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 51338 26A Newton Heath 28B Fleetwood  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 51510 26A Newton Heath 26G Belle Vue  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 51338 28B Fleetwood 26A Newton Heath  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 51447 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25D Mirfield  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 51429 25F Low Moor 99H Horwich Works  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 51307 23A Bank Hall 27B Aintree  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 51307 27B Aintree 27A Bank Hall  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 51313 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 8A Edge Hill  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 51441 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 51424 26A Newton Heath 25D Mirfield  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 51447 25D Mirfield 26A Newton Heath  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 51496 26A Newton Heath 99H Horwich Works  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 51496 99H Horwich Works 26A Newton Heath  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 51479 25E Sowerby Bridge 25C Goole  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 51503 25A Wakefield 25C Goole  
08/1953 Condemned 51490 23C Southport   COND  
09/1953 Condemned 51348 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 51425 26A Newton Heath 27C Southport  
11/1953 Condemned 51514 24F Fleetwood   COND  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 51464 26B Agecroft 24A Accrington  
02/1954 Condemned 51489 26D Bury   COND  
04/1954 Condemned 51410 24B Rose Grove   COND  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 51474 26B Agecroft 24A Accrington  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 51474 24A Accrington 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
09/1954 Condemned 51375 23A Bank Hall   COND  
09/1954 Condemned 51519 26C Bolton   COND  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 51336 24D Lower Darwen 26A Newton Heath  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 51497 24B Rose Grove 24A Accrington  
10/1954 Condemned 51460 23B Aintree   COND  
10/1954 Condemned 51471 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 51376 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 51419 26D Bury 24D Lower Darwen  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 51486 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 51419 24D Lower Darwen 24F Fleetwood  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 51498 24F Fleetwood 24D Lower Darwen  
03/1955 Condemned 51436 26A Newton Heath   COND  
04/1955 Condemned 51376 26C Bolton   COND  
04/1955 Condemned 51379 26A Newton Heath   COND  
04/1955 Condemned 51472 26A Newton Heath   COND  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 51425 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
08/1955 Condemned 51477 24F Fleetwood   COND  
10/1955 Condemned 51510 26G Belle Vue   COND  
01/10/1955 Condemned 51511 26C Bolton   COND  
08/10/1955 Condemned 51470 26A Newton Heath   COND  
11/1955 Condemned 51530 23B Aintree   COND  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 51390 24A Accrington 26A Newton Heath  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 51381 25E Sowerby Bridge 26A Newton Heath  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 51408 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 26C Bolton  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 51488 26A Newton Heath 26A Newton Heath  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 51504 26D Bury 26F Belle Vue  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 51524 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 24F Fleetwood  
02/1956 Condemned 51396 23A Bank Hall   COND  
03/1956 Condemned 51488 26A Newton Heath   COND  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 51481 28B Fleetwood 27A Bank Hall  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 51484 25A Wakefield 39A Gorton  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 51504 26F Belle Vue 39A Gorton  
05/1956 Condemned 51323 25C Goole   COND  
05/1956 Condemned 51513 26C Bolton   COND  
06/1956 Condemned 51439 8A Edge Hill   COND  
07/1956 Condemned 51390 26A Newton Heath   COND  
07/1956 Condemned 51425 27A Bank Hall   COND  
08/1956 Condemned 51504 39A Gorton   COND  
10/1956 Condemned 51345 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
10/1956 Condemned 51464 24A Accrington   COND  
10/1956 Condemned 51479 25C Goole   COND  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 51499 24D Lower Darwen 26B Agecroft  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 51512 26B Agecroft 39A Gorton  
20/10/1956 Condemned 51516 25C Goole   COND  
20/10/1956 Condemned 51521 25C Goole   COND  
27/10/1956 Condemned 51313 8A Edge Hill   COND  
27/10/1956 Condemned 51361 24A Accrington   COND  
27/10/1956 Condemned 51462 23B Aintree   COND  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 51397 8C Speke Junction 27B Aintree  
29/12/1956 Reallocation 51338 26A Newton Heath 17B Burton  
01/1957 Condemned 51447 26A Newton Heath   COND  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 51397 27B Aintree 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
02/1957 Condemned 51500 25A Wakefield   COND  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51307 27A Bank Hall 26A Newton Heath  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51338 17B Burton 26A Newton Heath  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51343 23B Aintree 26A Newton Heath  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51371 23A Bank Hall 26A Newton Heath  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51397 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 51474 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24A Accrington  
03/1957 Condemned 51491 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 51371 26A Newton Heath 27A Bank Hall  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 51481 27A Bank Hall 26A Newton Heath  
11/04/1957 Condemned 51503 25C Goole   COND  
05/1957 Condemned 51506 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 51415 25A Wakefield 26A Newton Heath  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 51429 99H Horwich Works 26C Bolton  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 51496 26A Newton Heath 26B Agecroft  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 51498 24D Lower Darwen 26C Bolton  
06/1957 Condemned 51474 24A Accrington   COND  
06/1957 Condemned 51499 26B Agecroft   COND  
16/06/1957 Reallocation 51413 23B Aintree 26B Agecroft  
07/1957 Condemned 51338 26A Newton Heath   COND  
07/1957 Condemned 51353 8A Edge Hill   COND  
08/1957 Condemned 51432 25C Goole   COND  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 51371 27A Bank Hall 24A Accrington  
09/1957 Condemned 51526 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
10/1957 Condemned 51481 26A Newton Heath   COND  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 51429 26C Bolton 99H Horwich Works  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 51457 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
11/1957 Condemned 51307 26A Newton Heath   COND  
11/1957 Condemned 51381 26A Newton Heath   COND  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 51371 24A Accrington 26A Newton Heath  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 51497 24A Accrington 26A Newton Heath  
02/1958 Condemned 51321 24F Fleetwood   COND  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 51336 26A Newton Heath 24F Fleetwood  
07/1958 Condemned 51512 39A Gorton   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 51453 25D Mirfield   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 51415 26A Newton Heath   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 51424 25D Mirfield   COND  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 51319 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 9G Gorton  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 51457 24C Lostock Hall 26A Newton Heath  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 51404 26A Newton Heath 56D Mirfield  
12/1958 Condemned 51423 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
01/1959 Condemned 51316 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 51397 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 51404 56D Mirfield   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 51457 26A Newton Heath   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 51458 26A Newton Heath   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 51497 26A Newton Heath   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 51484 39A Gorton   COND  
10/1959 Condemned 51358 25A Wakefield   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 51319 9G Gorton   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 51343 26A Newton Heath   COND  
06/1960 Condemned 51445 8A Edge Hill   COND  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 51441 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 8A Edge Hill  
09/1960 Condemned 51486 26C Bolton   COND  
09/1960 Condemned 51524 24F Fleetwood   COND  
05/11/1960 Condemned 51336 24F Fleetwood   COND  
26/11/1960 Condemned 51498 26C Bolton   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 51371 26A Newton Heath   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 51441 8A Edge Hill   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 51496 26B Agecroft   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 51429 99H Horwich Works   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 51413 26B Agecroft   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 51419 24F Fleetwood   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 51444 99C Crewe Works   COND  
18/11/1961 Reallocation 51408 26C Bolton 26B Agecroft  
17/02/1962 Condemned 51408 26B Agecroft   COND  
10/03/1962 Condemned 51446 99C Crewe Works   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 51412 99C Crewe Works   COND