Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 193 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2128 Week
» 17130 Month
» 361309 Year
» 872411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST


Class LYR LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
LYR23 534 11307 51307 03/1877 23A
27B
27A
26A
W
Bank Hall
Aintree
Bank Hall
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
19/04/1952
23/02/1957
11/1957
11/1957
LYR23 538 11313 51313 07/1877 6C
8A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
27/10/1956
27/10/1956
LYR23 531 11316 51316 03/1877 10E
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1959
01/1959
LYR23 535 11318 51318 04/1877 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
LYR23 561 11319 51319 09/1877 10E
9G
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
11/1959
11/1959
LYR23 566 11320 51320 11/1877 25D
W
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/04/1948
10/04/1948
LYR23 537 11321 51321 07/1877 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1958
02/1958
LYR23 564 11323 51323 10/1877 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1956
05/1956
LYR23 559 11325 51325 08/1877 23A
W
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
LYR23 551 11336 51336 07/1877 24D
26A
24F
W
Lower Darwen
Newton Heath
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
22/02/1958
05/11/1960
05/11/1960
LYR23 562 11338 51338 10/1877 26D
26A
28B
26A
17B
26A
W
Bury
Newton Heath
Fleetwood
Newton Heath
Burton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
11/08/1951
06/10/1951
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
07/1957
07/1957
LYR23 249 11342 51342 10/1893 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/09/1948
18/09/1948
LYR23 544 11343 51343 02/1878 23B
26A
W
Aintree
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1957
01/1960
01/1960
LYR23 236 11345 51345 12/1893 24C
W
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1956
10/1956
LYR23 165 11348 51348 10/1878 26C
25E
W
Bolton
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
09/1953
09/1953
LYR23 122 11353 51353 10/1878 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1957
07/1957
LYR23 549 11358 51358 02/1878 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1959
10/1959
LYR23 547 11361 51361 02/1878 24A
W
Accrington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
27/10/1956
LYR23 164 11371 51371 10/1878 23A
26A
27A
24A
26A
W
Bank Hall
Newton Heath
Bank Hall
Accrington
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1957
23/03/1957
10/08/1957
28/12/1957
03/1961
03/1961
LYR23 137 11375 51375 01/1880 23A
W
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1954
09/1954
LYR23 181 11376 51376 09/1880 24F
26D
26C
W
Fleetwood
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
29/01/1955
04/1955
04/1955
LYR23 136 11379 51379 12/1879 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1955
04/1955
LYR23 138 11381 51381 01/1880 25E
26A
W
Sowerby Bridge
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
11/1957
11/1957
LYR23 783 11390 51390 03/1895 25A
24A
26A
W
Wakefield
Accrington
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
05/11/1955
07/1956
07/1956
LYR23 762 11396 51396 05/1895 23A
W
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1956
02/1956
LYR23 574 11397 51397 09/1895 8C
27B
6E
10D
W
Speke Junction
Aintree
Wrexham Rhosddu
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
26/01/1957
23/02/1957
03/1959
03/1959
LYR23 799 11404 51404 07/1895 26A
56D
W
Newton Heath
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/10/1958
03/1959
03/1959
LYR23 197 11405 51405 09/1880 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
11/12/1948
LYR23 140 11408 51408 02/1880 25B
26C
26B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Bolton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
18/11/1961
17/02/1962
17/02/1962
LYR23 144 11410 51410 09/1895 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1954
04/1954
LYR23 598 11412 51412 09/1895 99C
W
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
LYR23 747 11413 51413 09/1895 23B
26B
W
Aintree
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1957
08/1961
08/1961
LYR23 284 11415 51415 09/1895 25A
26A
W
Wakefield
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1957
10/1958
10/1958
LYR23 166 11419 51419 05/1880 26D
24D
24F
W
Bury
Lower Darwen
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
26/02/1955
09/1961
09/1961
LYR23 583 11423 51423 10/1895 24C
28B
24C
W
Lostock Hall
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/02/1951
12/1958
12/1958
LYR23 584 11424 51424 10/1895 26A
25D
W
Newton Heath
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
10/1958
10/1958
LYR23 175 11425 51425 11/1895 26A
27C
27A
W
Newton Heath
Southport
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
23/04/1955
07/1956
07/1956
LYR23 571 11427 51427 11/1895 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1948
20/11/1948
LYR23 778 11429 51429 11/1895 25E
25F
99H
26C
99H
W
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Horwich Works
Bolton
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
23/02/1952
18/05/1957
05/10/1957
05/1961
05/1961
LYR23 597 11432 51432 12/1895 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1957
08/1957
LYR23 767 11436 51436 12/1895 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1955
03/1955
LYR23 196 11438 51438 09/1880 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
LYR23 793 11439 51439 01/1896 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1956
06/1956
LYR23 798 11441 51441 01/1896 6C
10E
8A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
02/07/1960
03/1961
03/1961
LYR23 773 11443 51443 02/1896 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
LYR23 322 11444 51444 02/1896 8C
99C
W
Speke Junction
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
09/1961
09/1961
LYR23 588 11445 51445 02/1896 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1960
06/1960
LYR23 596 11446 51446 03/1896 99C
W
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/03/1962
10/03/1962
LYR23 748 11447 51447 03/1896 25B
25D
26A
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Mirfield
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
24/01/1953
01/1957
01/1957
LYR23 801 11453 51453 05/1896 25D
W
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1958
09/1958
LYR23 782 11457 51457 02/1896 25A
24C
26A
W
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
04/10/1958
03/1959
03/1959
LYR23 292 11458 51458 04/1896 25C
26A
W
Goole
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
05/1959
05/1959
LYR23 589 11460 51460 05/1896 23B
W
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1954
10/1954
LYR23 580 11462 51462 05/1896 23B
W
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
27/10/1956
LYR23 763 11464 51464 06/1896 26B
24A
W
Agecroft
Accrington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
10/1956
10/1956
LYR23 774 11467 51467 04/1896 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
13/11/1948
LYR23 756 11468 51468 04/1896 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
LYR23 765 11469 51469 07/1896 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
LYR23 592 11470 51470 05/1896 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
08/10/1955
LYR23 576 11471 51471 07/1896 10E
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1954
10/1954
LYR23 587 11472 51472 05/1896 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1955
04/1955
LYR23 194 11474 51474 09/1880 26B
24A
27D
24A
W
Agecroft
Accrington
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Accrington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
14/08/1954
23/02/1957
06/1957
06/1957
LYR23 803 11475 51475 08/1896 23B
W
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
LYR23 847 11477 51477 03/1885 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1955
08/1955
LYR23 855 11479 51479 04/1885 25E
25C
W
Sowerby Bridge
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
10/1956
10/1956
LYR23 254 11481 51481 04/1898 26D
28B
27A
26A
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Bank Hall
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
24/03/1956
23/03/1957
10/1957
10/1957
LYR23 843 11482 51482 03/1885 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
LYR23 788 11484 51484 03/1898 25A
39A
W
Wakefield
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
06/1959
06/1959
LYR23 585 11486 51486 05/1898 26D
26C
W
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
09/1960
09/1960
LYR23 797 11487 51487 12/1898 26D
W
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/10/1948
23/10/1948
LYR23 845 11488 51488 03/1885 26A
26A
W
Newton Heath
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
03/1956
03/1956
LYR23 663 11489 51489 07/1898 26D
W
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1954
02/1954
LYR23 812 11490 51490 07/1898 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1953
08/1953
LYR23 852 11491 51491 04/1885 10E
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1957
03/1957
LYR23 772 11492 51492 07/1898 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
07/1949
LYR23 760 11495 51495 09/1881 10E
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
LYR23 846 11496 51496 03/1885 26A
99H
26A
26B
W
Newton Heath
Horwich Works
Newton Heath
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
18/04/1953
18/05/1957
03/1961
03/1961
LYR23 586 11497 51497 04/1881 24B
24A
26A
W
Rose Grove
Accrington
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
28/12/1957
05/1959
05/1959
LYR23 851 11498 51498 04/1885 24F
24D
26C
W
Fleetwood
Lower Darwen
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1955
18/05/1957
26/11/1960
26/11/1960
LYR23 764 11499 51499 10/1881 24D
26B
W
Lower Darwen
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
06/1957
06/1957
LYR23 579 11500 51500 10/1880 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1957
02/1957
LYR23 787 11503 51503 03/1882 25A
25C
W
Wakefield
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
11/04/1957
11/04/1957
LYR23 859 11504 51504 05/1885 26D
26F
39A
W
Bury
Belle Vue
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
21/04/1956
08/1956
08/1956
LYR23 848 11506 51506 04/1885 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1957
05/1957
LYR23 810 11510 51510 04/1883 26A
26G
W
Newton Heath
Belle Vue
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
10/1955
10/1955
LYR23 305 11511 51511 09/1881 26C
W
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1955
01/10/1955
LYR23 781 11512 51512 02/1882 26B
39A
W
Agecroft
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1956
07/1958
07/1958
LYR23 751 11513 51513 05/1881 26C
W
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1956
05/1956
LYR23 809 11514 51514 04/1883 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1953
11/1953
LYR23 860 11516 51516 05/1885 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1956
20/10/1956
LYR23 844 11519 51519 03/1885 26C
W
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1954
09/1954
LYR23 568 11521 51521 08/1880 25C
W
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1956
20/10/1956
LYR23 802 11524 51524 02/1883 25B
24F
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
09/1960
09/1960
LYR23 761 11526 51526 09/1881 24C
W
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1957
09/1957
LYR23 595 11530 51530 03/1881 23B
W
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1955
11/1955