47 Co-Co
Pre-TOPS | TOPS | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|
D1611 | 47032 47662 47817 57311 47032 47662 47817 57311 47032 47662 47817 57311 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/07/2003 | |
D1618 | 47037 47563 47831 57310 47037 47563 47831 57310 47037 47563 47831 57310 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 30/08/2003 | |
D1639 | 47055 47652 47807 57304 47055 47652 47807 57304 47055 47652 47807 57304 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 30/08/2002 | |
D1644 | 47060 57008 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 26/11/1999 | |
D1653 | 47069 47638 47845 57301 47069 47638 47845 57301 47069 47638 47845 57301 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/05/2002 | |
D1664 | 47079 57009 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 22/12/1999 | |
D1677 | 47091 47647 47846 57308 47091 47647 47846 57308 47091 47647 47846 57308 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 08/05/2003 | |
D1702 | 47114 | Rebuilt from 48 to 47 | 23/12/1969 | |
D1703 | 47115 | Rebuilt from 48 to 47 | 06/11/1970 | |
D1704 | 47116 | Rebuilt from 48 to 47 | 05/06/1971 | |
D1705 | 47117 | Rebuilt from 48 to 47 | 03/04/1971 | |
D1706 | 47118 | Rebuilt from 48 to 47 | 28/11/1970 | |
D1758 | 47164 47571 47822 57305 47164 47571 47822 57305 47164 47571 47822 57305 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 19/12/2002 | |
D1759 | 47165 47590 47825 57601 47165 47590 47825 57601 47165 47590 47825 57601 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 12/04/2001 | |
D1798 | 47317 57003 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 07/01/1999 | |
D1803 | 47322 57002 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 23/11/1998 | |
D1810 | 47329 57011 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 20/02/2000 | |
D1811 | 47330 57312 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/10/2003 | |
D1813 | 47332 57007 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 28/10/1999 | |
D1818 | 47337 57602 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 30/11/2003 | |
D1828 | 47347 57004 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 25/02/1999 | |
D1830 | 47349 57603 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/12/2003 | |
D1831 | 47350 57005 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 01/04/1999 | |
D1837 | 47187 57006 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 04/05/1999 | |
D1854 | 47204 57012 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 20/03/2000 | |
D1856 | 47206 57605 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 30/09/2004 | |
D1859 | 47209 57604 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 28/02/2004 | |
D1875 | 47356 57001 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 17/07/1998 | |
D1890 | 47371 57313 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 04/10/2004 | |
D1891 | 47372 57314 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 25/10/2004 | |
D1901 | 47225 57307 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/08/2003 | |
D1907 | 47231 57010 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 24/01/2000 | |
D1911 | 47234 57315 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 23/11/2004 | |
D1919 | 47242 47659 47814 57306 47242 47659 47814 57306 47242 47659 47814 57306 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/03/2003 | |
D1928 | 47251 47589 47827 57302 47251 47589 47827 57302 47251 47589 47827 57302 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 31/07/2002 | |
D1931 | 47254 47651 47806 57309 47254 47651 47806 57309 47254 47651 47806 57309 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 30/06/2003 | |
D1957 | 47261 47554 47705 57303 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 27/02/2003 | |
D1992 | 47290 57316 |
Rebuilt from 47 to 57 | 20/12/2004 |