Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

47 Co-Co


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
47 1660 13/02/1965 CITY OF TRURO 08/06/1965  
47 1661 13/02/1965 NORTH STAR 20/03/1965 After naming hauled 10.42 ‘North Star’ special to Bristol for naming of ‘Isambard Kingdom Brunel’. 01/05/2007
47 1662 20/02/1965 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL 20/03/1965 After 1965 naming worked special from Bristol to Paddington 01/06/1998
47 1663 20/02/1965 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 08/05/1965   01/05/1997
47 1664 27/02/1965 GEORGE JACKSON CHURCHWARD 08/05/1965  
47 1665 05/03/1965 TITAN 03/1966   01/08/1999
47 1666 05/03/1965 ODIN 12/03/1965   01/02/2004
47 1667 06/03/1965 ATLAS 06/1966   01/06/2004
47 1668 13/03/1965 ORION 10/1965   01/11/1990
47 1669 20/03/1965 PYTHON 31/03/1966   01/09/1990
47 1670 20/03/1965 MAMMOTH 08/1965   18/02/2000
47 1672 27/03/1965 COLOSSUS 08/1965   01/07/2003
47 1673 03/04/1965 CYCLOPS 06/1966   01/11/1998
47 1674 05/04/1965 SAMSON 09/1965   01/09/2003
47 1675 10/04/1965 AMAZON 11/1965   21/06/1987
47 1676 16/04/1965 VULCAN 10/1965  
47 1677 24/04/1965 THOR 29/08/1966  
47 47169 08/09/1964 GREAT EASTERN 07/03/1979 Name previously unofficially applied to 47460 from 02/03/78 until 23/04/78, made in wood. Name reapplied to 37216. 31/08/1990 01/11/2000