Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

47 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (1973) BR (ETH) BR (56 TB) BR (Push/Pull) BR (58 TB) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D1782 47301 14/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2003 38.17 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 01/02/2003 38.24
D1783 47302 14/11/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/08/2007 42.82
D1784 47303 07/11/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/12/2007 43.18
D1785 47304 09/12/1964 BH Tinsley 16/06/2000 35.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 25/05/2000 35.48
D1786 47305 26/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2003 38.17 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 01/03/2003 38.28
D1787 47306 26/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/05/2006 41.5 Prs Preserved 53.93
D1788 47307 09/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/05/2008 43.50
D1789 47308 27/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2004 39.17 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 18/03/2004 39.33
D1790 47309 10/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/02/2009 44.18
D1791 47310 10/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2004 39.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/04/2004 39.41
D1792 47311 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 22/11/1991 26.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/05/1993 28.37
D1793 47312 11/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2003 38.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 29/03/2003 38.32
D1794 47313 11/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 15/11/2007 42.96
D1795 47314 08/01/1965 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/04/2008 43.34
D1796 47315 08/01/1965 BH Tinsley Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/05/2000 35.33
D1797 47316 06/01/1965 BH Tinsley 31/12/2007 42.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/04/2008 43.34
D1798 47317 29/01/1965 BH Tinsley 53.75
D1799 47318 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 30/07/1993 28.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/07/2004 39.55
D1800 47319 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 14/07/2000 35.5 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/05/2000 35.32
D1801 47320 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 10/08/1993 28.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 04/12/1996 31.91
D1802 47321 22/01/1965 BH Tinsley 22/09/1995 30.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/07/1998 33.47
D1803 47322 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 53.78
D1804 47323 16/02/1965 BH Tinsley 30/06/2003 38.33 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 31/07/2003 38.48
D1805 47324 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 17/07/1992 27.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/01/1994 28.98
D1806 47325 26/01/1965 BH Tinsley 07/03/1996 31.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/05/1998 33.34
D1807 47326 25/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/08/2006 41.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/10/2006 41.71
D1808 47327 30/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 19/02/1993 28.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/11/1993 28.80
D1809 47328 27/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/06/2005 40.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/09/2005 40.67
D1810 47329 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.72
D1811 47330 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.72
D1812 47331 02/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/07/2005 40.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 08/09/2005 40.62
D1813 47332 22/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.69
D1814 47333 25/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 21/01/2000 34.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1998 33.28
D1815 47334 18/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/09/2004 39.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/01/2005 39.90
D1816 47335 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/02/2007 42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/06/2007 42.41
D1817 47336 01/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/06/1993 28.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 26/11/1993 28.76
D1818 47337 18/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.70
D1819 47338 12/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/04/2007 42.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/07/2006 41.49
D1820 47339 17/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 21/01/2000 34.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/02/2005 40.01
D1821 47340 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 01/06/1998 33.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 31/03/1998 33.08
D1822 47341 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/02/2003 37.94
D1823 47342 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 25/11/1988 23.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/03/1992 27.05
D1824 47343 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 29/06/1992 27.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/11/1992 27.69
D1825 47344 22/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 01/07/1999 34.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/02/2002 36.89
D1826 47345 11/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/06/2006 41.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 28/02/2007 42.00
D1827 47346 18/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/01/1998 32.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 24/02/1998 32.96
D1828 47347 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.64
D1829 47348 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/11/2006 41.67 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/12/2006 41.85
D1830 47349 18/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.62
D1831 47350 27/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.51
D1832 47351 07/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/02/2001 35.85
D1833 47352 27/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 14/07/2000 35.25 Cut Raxstar (at Frodingham MPD) 24/05/2000 35.10
D1834 47353 31/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/09/2004 39.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/02/2005 39.92
D1835 47354 30/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/03/2003 37.92 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 10/04/2003 37.97
D1836 47355 07/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 53.57
D1875 47356 02/07/1965 BH Immingham 01/01/2000
to 57
53.33
D1876 47357 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley 11/05/2001 35.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/04/2001 35.89
D1877 47358 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 41.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2009 43.75
D1878 47359 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 28/01/1998 32.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/03/1998 32.77
D1879 47360 07/07/1965 BH Immingham 28/02/2007 41.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/12/2007 42.51
D1880 47361 10/02/1966 BH Tinsley 31/08/2004 38.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/09/2004 38.66
D1881 47362 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/12/2000 35.48
D1882 47363 02/07/1965 BH Immingham 31/10/2007 42.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 53.33
D1883 47364 09/07/1965 BH Immingham 01/12/1998 33.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/06/2000 34.92
D1884 47365 06/07/1965 BH Immingham Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/10/2007 42.35
D1885 47366 09/07/1965 BH Immingham 28/01/1999 33.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/04/1999 33.83
D1886 47367 26/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/12/2002 37.33 Prs Preserved 37.37
D1887 47368 17/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/10/2007 42.17 53.21
D1888 47369 30/07/1965 BH Tinsley Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1998 32.78
D1889 47370 23/07/1965 BH Tinsley 01/01/2003 37.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/08/2009 44.05
D1890 47371 23/07/1965 BH Tinsley 53.27
D1891 47372 06/08/1965 BH Tinsley 53.24
D1892 47373 06/08/1965 BH Tinsley 05/06/1992 26.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 30/11/1994 29.34
D1893 47374 13/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/07/1992 26.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/09/1994 29.09
D1894 47375 03/12/1965 BH Immingham 52.91
D1895 47376 01/09/1965 BH Tinsley 31/12/2002 37.25 Prs Preserved 37.36
D1896 47377 07/09/1965 BH Tinsley 31/07/2003 37.83 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 09/09/2003 38.03
D1897 47378 02/09/1965 BH Tinsley 25/08/1998 32.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/1998 33.02
D1898 47379 24/08/1965 BH Immingham 14/01/2000 34.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 31/12/1999 34.38
D1899 47380 26/08/1965 BH Immingham 30/07/1992 26.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/10/1994 29.16
D1900 47381 02/09/1965 BH Immingham 05/06/1992 26.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/11/1994 29.23