BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (47/0) |
BR (47/3) |
BR (47/4) |
BR (47/6) |
BR (47/7) |
BR (47/7b) |
BR (47/8) |
BR (47/9) |
BR (57/0) |
BR (57/3) |
BR (57/6) |
BR (Dept 1) |
BR (Dept 2) |
Built |
|
Depot Name |
From |
Date Withdrawn |
D1100
|
47298
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/08/1966 |
50A 52A 55B 52A HO TI TE SF BS W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Thornaby Stratford Bescot Withdrawn |
01/08/1966 25/03/1967 24/10/1970 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 12/07/1975 11/10/1975 29/02/1976 10/1977 30/04/2007 |
30/04/2007 |
D1101
|
|
|
47518
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/08/1966 |
50A 52A 51L 52A HO GD CD ED W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Thornaby Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Crewe Diesel Eastfield Withdrawn |
12/08/1966 07/10/1967 20/07/1968 01/02/1969 11/10/1975 10/1977 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 14/11/1991 |
14/11/1991 |
D1102
|
|
|
47519
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1966 |
50A 52A 51L 52A YK GD HO GD BR W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Thornaby Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
09/09/1966 07/10/1967 20/07/1968 25/01/1969 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 11/10/1975 10/1977 15/05/1988 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1103
|
|
|
47520
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/10/1966 |
50A 55A 52A 51L 34G 52A YK GD YK HO GD W |
York (North) (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Thornaby Finsbury Park Gateshead York (North) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
02/10/1966 07/10/1967 04/11/1967 25/05/1968 12/10/1968 21/03/1970 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 02/05/1976 10/1977 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1104
|
|
|
47521
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/10/1966 |
50A 55A 52A 51L 34G 52A 34G 52A YK GD YK HO GD W |
York (North) (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Thornaby Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead York (North) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
19/10/1966 07/10/1967 04/11/1967 25/05/1968 12/10/1968 21/03/1970 08/01/1972 04/11/1972 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 02/05/1976 10/1977 21/04/1995 |
21/04/1995 |
D1105
|
|
|
47522
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/11/1966 |
50A 51L 34G 52A 55A 52A YK GD YK HO GD SF W |
York (North) (New) Thornaby Finsbury Park Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead York (North) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Stratford Withdrawn |
09/11/1966 22/06/1968 12/10/1968 21/03/1970 09/10/1971 04/11/1972 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 02/05/1976 10/1977 15/05/1988 12/12/1998 |
12/12/1998 |
D1106
|
|
|
47523
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/11/1966 |
50A 51L 34G 52A 40B 55B 52A 55A YK SF W |
York (North) (New) Thornaby Finsbury Park Gateshead Immingham York (North) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) York (North) Stratford Withdrawn |
25/11/1966 25/05/1968 12/10/1968 21/03/1970 11/07/1970 10/10/1970 24/10/1970 09/10/1971 08/03/1975 15/05/1988 01/06/1999 |
01/06/1999 |
D1107
|
|
|
47524
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/12/1966 |
50A 51L 34G 52A 40B 55B GD YK ED |
York (North) (New) Thornaby Finsbury Park Gateshead Immingham York (North) Gateshead York (North) Eastfield |
23/12/1966 25/05/1968 12/10/1968 21/03/1970 11/07/1970 10/10/1970 09/11/1974 08/03/1975 15/05/1988 |
|
D1108
|
|
|
47525
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
50A 51L 55B 52A 55B 55A 55B GD YK BR W |
York (North) (New) Thornaby York (North) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) York (North) Gateshead York (North) Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 25/05/1968 22/06/1968 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 08/05/1971 30/11/1974 08/03/1975 15/05/1988 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1109
|
|
|
47526
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
50A 52A 55B 55A YK LA W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) York (North) Laira Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 08/03/1975 15/05/1988 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1110
|
|
|
47527
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
50A 52A 55B 41A 55A YK ED W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead York (North) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) York (North) Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 29/03/1969 11/10/1969 22/11/1969 06/12/1969 08/03/1975 15/05/1988 27/11/1992 |
27/11/1992 |
D1111
|
|
|
47528
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
50A 52A 55B 41A 55A 55B GD YK W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead York (North) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) York (North) Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 29/03/1969 11/10/1969 08/11/1969 06/12/1969 08/05/1971 11/01/1975 08/03/1975 29/02/2008 |
29/02/2008 |
D1500
|
|
|
47401
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/09/1962 |
34G 82C 34G 82C 34G 41A 41A 34G 40B 34G IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Swindon (on loan) Finsbury Park Swindon (on loan) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Withdrawn |
28/09/1962 03/11/1962 08/12/1962 01/1963 02/03/1963 02/11/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 25/11/1967 23/01/1971 15/05/1988 05/06/1992 |
05/06/1992 |
D1501
|
|
|
47402
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/11/1962 |
34G 41A 34G 40B 34G IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Sheffield Darnall Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Withdrawn |
13/11/1962 02/11/1963 02/05/1964 25/11/1967 27/09/1969 15/05/1988 01/06/1992 |
01/06/1992 |
D1502
|
|
|
47403
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/11/1962 |
34G 40B 34G FP W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
30/11/1962 25/11/1967 01/11/1969 12/12/1976 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
D1503
|
|
|
47404
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1962 |
34G 40B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
31/12/1962 25/11/1967 23/08/1969 05/06/1987 |
05/06/1987 |
D1504
|
|
|
47405
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/01/1963 |
34G 40B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
03/01/1963 25/11/1967 16/08/1969 02/03/1986 |
02/03/1986 |
D1505
|
|
|
47406
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/01/1963 |
34G 40B 34G IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Withdrawn |
11/01/1963 25/11/1967 27/09/1969 15/05/1988 13/08/1990 |
13/08/1990 |
D1506
|
|
|
47407
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/01/1963 |
34G 40B 34G IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Withdrawn |
18/01/1963 25/11/1967 04/10/1969 15/05/1988 13/08/1990 |
13/08/1990 |
D1507
|
|
|
47408
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/01/1963 |
34G 40B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
18/01/1963 25/11/1967 23/08/1969 20/07/1986 |
20/07/1986 |
D1508
|
|
|
47409
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/01/1963 |
34G 40B 34G W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
23/01/1963 25/11/1967 11/10/1969 31/08/1986 |
31/08/1986 |
D1509
|
|
|
47410
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/02/1963 |
34G 40B 34G GD FP GD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
04/02/1963 25/11/1967 01/11/1969 05/1977 07/1977 29/01/1978 05/06/1987 |
05/06/1987 |
D1510
|
|
|
47411
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1963 |
34G 64B 34G 41A 34G 55B 34G GD FP GD FP GD IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
26/02/1963 06/04/1963 06/04/1963 25/11/1967 27/09/1969 11/10/1969 01/11/1969 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 05/1977 07/1977 10/1977 15/05/1988 30/06/1989 |
30/06/1989 |
D1511
|
|
|
47412
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/02/1963 |
34G 41A 55B 34G GD FP GD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
28/02/1963 25/11/1967 06/12/1969 13/12/1969 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 05/1977 12/05/1987 |
12/05/1987 |
D1512
|
|
|
47413
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/03/1963 |
34G 41A 55B 34G GD FP GD IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
08/03/1963 25/11/1967 08/11/1969 28/03/1970 06/10/1973 11/01/1975 05/1977 15/05/1988 09/08/1991 |
09/08/1991 |
D1513
|
|
|
47414
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/03/1963 |
34G 41A 55B 34G GD FP W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
15/03/1963 25/11/1967 22/11/1969 09/10/1971 06/10/1973 11/01/1975 07/03/1986 |
07/03/1986 |
D1514
|
|
|
47415
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/03/1963 |
34G 41A 55B 34G GD FP GD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
22/03/1963 25/11/1967 18/10/1969 09/10/1971 06/10/1973 11/01/1975 02/05/1976 30/04/1987 |
30/04/1987 |
D1515
|
|
|
47416
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/03/1963 |
34G 55H 34G 41A 55B 55A 34G GD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Neville Hill Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Holbeck (MR) Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
29/03/1963 13/04/1963 22/06/1963 25/11/1967 13/12/1969 08/05/1971 04/11/1972 06/10/1973 07/03/1986 |
07/03/1986 |
D1516
|
|
|
47417
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1963 |
34G 41A 55B 34G HO GD IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
10/04/1963 25/11/1967 01/11/1969 09/10/1971 19/05/1973 06/10/1973 15/05/1988 24/02/1992 |
24/02/1992 |
D1517
|
|
|
47418
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/04/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 55B 55A 34G HO GD IM W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park York (North) Holbeck (MR) Finsbury Park Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
19/04/1963 25/11/1967 13/09/1969 11/10/1969 08/05/1971 04/11/1972 19/05/1973 06/10/1973 15/05/1988 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 |
D1518
|
|
|
47419
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/05/1963 |
34G 5A 34G WL 34G 41A 55B 34G 52A W |
Finsbury Park (New) Crewe Diesel Finsbury Park Western Lines (LMR) Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
10/05/1963 29/01/1966 16/04/1966 18/03/1967 10/06/1967 25/11/1967 06/12/1969 12/08/1972 06/01/1973 11/02/1987 |
11/02/1987 |
D1519
|
|
|
47420
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/04/1963 |
34G 5A 34G WL 34G 41A 55B 34G 52A W |
Finsbury Park (New) Crewe Diesel Finsbury Park Western Lines (LMR) Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Finsbury Park Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/04/1963 29/01/1966 16/04/1966 18/03/1967 10/06/1967 25/11/1967 15/11/1969 07/10/1972 06/01/1973 05/06/1987 |
05/06/1987 |
D1520
|
|
|
47421
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 52A YK GD CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/06/1963 28/10/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 16/09/1972 06/09/1981 10/1981 15/05/1988 27/09/1991 |
27/09/1991 |
D1521
|
47001
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 30A GD CF LA BR HA W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford Gateshead Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Withdrawn |
07/06/1963 28/10/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 02/12/1972 06/10/1973 30/11/1974 10/05/1975 11/10/1975 09/1981 25/11/1986 |
25/11/1986 |
D1522
|
47002
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 30A 55B 30A GD CD BS CF HA TI W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford York (North) Stratford Gateshead Crewe Diesel Bescot Cardiff Canton Haymarket Tinsley Withdrawn |
14/06/1963 28/10/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 09/11/1974 30/11/1974 10/1976 09/1981 04/10/1987 24/06/1991 |
24/06/1991 |
D1523
|
47003
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 34G 41A 30A 55B 30A GD SF ED W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford York (North) Stratford Gateshead Stratford Eastfield Withdrawn |
12/06/1963 28/10/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 08/06/1968 12/10/1968 14/02/1970 09/10/1971 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 15/05/1988 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 |
D1524
|
47004
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 30A 55B 52A 40B 30A GD SF W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford York (North) Gateshead Immingham Stratford Gateshead Stratford Withdrawn |
14/06/1963 03/06/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 14/02/1970 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 03/06/1972 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 31/08/2006 |
31/08/2006 |
D1525
|
|
|
47422
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 41A 34G 41A 30A 52A CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford Gateshead Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/06/1963 09/10/1965 05/02/1966 03/06/1967 25/11/1967 11/05/1968 14/02/1970 30/12/1972 15/05/1988 01/08/1991 |
01/08/1991 |
D1526
|
47005
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
34G 30A 41A 30A GD SF TI W |
Finsbury Park (New) Stratford Tinsley Stratford Gateshead Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 29/10/1966 11/05/1968 14/02/1970 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 04/09/1988 04/11/1991 |
04/11/1991 |
D1527
|
|
|
47423
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/07/1963 |
34G 64B 34G 41A 34G 31B 40B 30A 52A CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Haymarket Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park March Immingham Stratford Gateshead Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
03/07/1963 03/08/1963 14/09/1963 09/10/1965 05/02/1966 29/10/1966 12/08/1967 25/11/1967 09/12/1972 15/05/1988 27/07/1992 |
27/07/1992 |
D1528
|
47006
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
34G 40B 30A GD SF W |
Finsbury Park (New) Immingham Stratford Gateshead Stratford Withdrawn |
05/07/1963 29/10/1966 25/11/1967 06/10/1973 30/11/1974 27/09/1991 |
27/09/1991 |
D1529
|
47007
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
34G 34G 31B 40B 34G 41A 52A 40B 30A W |
Finsbury Park (New)
Finsbury Park March Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Gateshead Immingham Stratford Withdrawn |
05/07/1963 31/07/1965 28/08/1965 29/10/1966 12/08/1967 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 09/11/1968 28/06/1969 24/06/1972 27/09/1991 |
27/09/1991 |
D1530
|
47008
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/07/1963 |
34G 41A 34G 30A BR W |
Finsbury Park (New) Sheffield Darnall Finsbury Park Stratford Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
15/07/1963 14/09/1963 02/11/1963 08/10/1966 07/12/1974 17/10/1989 |
17/10/1989 |
D1531
|
|
|
47424
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/07/1963 |
34G 41A 41A 32A 34G 41A 34G 40B 34G 41A D02 D05 BS ED CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Norwich Thorpe Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Birmingham Division Stoke Division Bescot Eastfield Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
15/07/1963 14/09/1963 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 09/10/1965 16/04/1966 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 13/01/1973 10/03/1973 06/10/1973 07/12/1974 15/05/1988 18/01/1991 |
18/01/1991 |
D1532
|
47009
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/07/1963 |
34G 41A 41A 32A 41A 34G 40B 34G 41A 30A TE SF HA W |
Finsbury Park (New) Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Norwich Thorpe Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Stratford Thornaby Stratford Haymarket Withdrawn |
26/07/1963 24/08/1963 26/04/1964 31/10/1964 14/11/1964 09/01/1965 26/11/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 16/12/1972 21/06/1981 26/07/1981 06/09/1981 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1533
|
|
|
47425
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/08/1963 |
34G 41A 41A 34G 40B 34G 41A 55B HO SF CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Holbeck (MR) Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
06/08/1963 24/08/1963 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 09/05/1970 11/05/1974 10/1977 15/05/1988 15/12/1992 |
15/12/1992 |
D1534
|
|
|
47426
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/08/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 40B 34G 41A 40B 52A HO SF W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Withdrawn |
16/08/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 11/07/1970 04/11/1972 05/1977 10/1977 15/12/1992 |
15/12/1992 |
D1535
|
|
|
47427
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/08/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 40B 34G 41A 40B 55A 30A D05 D16 ED W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Holbeck (MR) Stratford Stoke Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/08/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 11/07/1970 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 28/10/1972 10/02/1973 07/12/1974 05/02/1990 |
05/02/1990 |
D1536
|
|
|
47428
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/08/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 40B 41A 55B 52A 40B 52A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Tinsley York (North) Gateshead Immingham Gateshead Withdrawn |
22/08/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 29/03/1969 11/10/1969 02/09/1972 25/01/1989 |
25/01/1989 |
D1537
|
47010
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/08/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 40B 41A 55B 52A 40B 30A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Tinsley York (North) Gateshead Immingham Stratford Withdrawn |
31/08/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 08/10/1966 25/11/1967 12/10/1968 29/03/1969 26/07/1969 24/06/1972 11/12/1992 |
11/12/1992 |
D1538
|
47011
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/09/1963 |
41A 41A 30A 41A 34G 41A 40B 34G 40B SX W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Stratford Withdrawn |
07/09/1963 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 14/11/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 08/10/1966 18/03/1967 12/08/1967 07/07/1973 03/04/1987 |
03/04/1987 |
D1539
|
47012
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/09/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 34G 41A 52A 40B D05 D02 BS TI W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Gateshead Immingham Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bescot Tinsley Withdrawn |
07/09/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 18/02/1967 10/06/1967 09/11/1968 11/10/1969 15/04/1972 10/06/1972 10/1976 04/10/1987 15/12/1989 |
15/12/1989 |
D1540
|
47013
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/09/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 30A D05 D16 D02 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Stratford Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
14/09/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 16/07/1966 29/12/1968 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 25/02/1987 |
25/02/1987 |
D1541
|
|
|
47429
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/09/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 34G 41A 55B 41A 52A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Tinsley Gateshead Withdrawn |
27/09/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 18/02/1967 10/06/1967 11/07/1970 12/08/1972 18/11/1972 26/01/1987 |
26/01/1987 |
D1542
|
|
|
47430
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/09/1963 |
41A 41A 32A 32B 34G 41A 55B 52A YK GD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Norwich Thorpe Ipswich Finsbury Park Tinsley York (North) Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Withdrawn |
20/09/1963 26/04/1964 14/11/1964 21/11/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 09/05/1970 07/10/1972 29/02/1976 02/05/1976 21/02/1992 |
21/02/1992 |
D1543
|
47014
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/09/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 52A 34G 31B 34G 41A D05 41A 41A 55B 41A 30A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Gateshead Finsbury Park March Finsbury Park Tinsley Stoke Division Tinsley (on loan) Tinsley (loan made permanent) York (North) Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
27/09/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 22/05/1965 19/06/1965 18/06/1966 18/03/1967 12/10/1968 28/12/1968 03/08/1969 10/08/1969 11/07/1970 12/08/1972 30/12/1972 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 |
D1544
|
47015
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 31B 30A D05 D16 D02 LA W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley March Stratford Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Laira Withdrawn |
05/10/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 21/05/1966 20/08/1966 12/08/1967 29/12/1968 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 03/03/1979 11/05/1987 |
11/05/1987 |
D1545
|
|
|
47431
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1963 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 34G 31B 41A D16 D05 41A 55B 40B 52A YK GD SF CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park March Tinsley Nottingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley York (North) Immingham Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/10/1963 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 16/04/1966 11/06/1966 18/06/1966 11/05/1968 23/11/1968 10/05/1969 06/12/1969 11/07/1970 07/11/1970 07/10/1972 29/02/1976 02/05/1976 10/1977 04/10/1987 27/07/1992 |
27/07/1992 |
D1546
|
47016
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/10/1963 |
41A 34G 41A D16 D05 41A 40B SF TI W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Finsbury Park Tinsley Nottingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley Immingham Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
18/10/1963 02/11/1963 23/04/1966 23/11/1968 10/05/1969 06/12/1969 09/10/1971 11/01/1975 15/05/1988 12/12/1998 |
12/12/1998 |
D1547
|
|
|
47432
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/10/1963 |
34G 52A 34G 41A 40B D05 D16 D05 41A 30A D16 D05 BS YK CD W |
Finsbury Park (New) Gateshead Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley Stratford Nottingham Division Stoke Division Bescot York (North) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/10/1963 01/05/1965 22/05/1965 16/04/1966 10/09/1966 28/12/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 06/12/1969 09/10/1971 06/01/1973 10/02/1973 12/05/1973 12/10/1974 04/10/1987 14/04/1992 |
14/04/1992 |
D1548
|
|
|
47433
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/10/1963 |
41A 41A 40B D05 D16 D05 41A 40B 41A 30A D05 BS YK TO CD TI W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Stratford Stoke Division Bescot York (North) Toton Crewe Diesel Tinsley Withdrawn |
17/10/1963 26/04/1964 27/02/1965 28/12/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 11/10/1969 07/11/1970 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 18/11/1972 12/05/1973 12/10/1974 11/1981 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 03/05/1993 |
03/05/1993 |
D1549
|
|
|
47434
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/10/1963 |
41A 55H 41A 41A 34G 41A 40B 41A 30A D05 BS TO HO YK CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Neville Hill Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Stratford Stoke Division Bescot Toton Holbeck (MR) York (North) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
26/10/1963 09/11/1963 28/12/1963 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 27/02/1965 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 04/11/1972 12/05/1973 07/12/1974 08/03/1975 10/1977 04/10/1987 31/12/1992 |
31/12/1992 |
D1550
|
|
|
47435
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 40B 30A 52A HA CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Stratford Gateshead Haymarket Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/01/1964 26/04/1964 10/07/1965 05/03/1966 10/09/1966 29/05/1971 02/12/1972 12/10/1974 04/10/1987 15/03/1990 |
15/03/1990 |
D1551
|
|
|
47529
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/01/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 40B 41A 40B D16 40B D02 D05 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Immingham Nottingham Division Immingham Birmingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
31/01/1964 26/04/1964 10/07/1965 06/11/1965 08/05/1971 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 15/04/1972 24/02/1973 10/03/1973 02/02/1987 |
02/02/1987 |
D1552
|
|
|
47436
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1964 |
41A 41A 40B 41A 40B D16 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/01/1964 26/04/1964 19/03/1966 08/05/1971 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 04/10/1987 09/12/1991 |
09/12/1991 |
D1553
|
|
|
47437
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1964 |
41A 41A 40B 41A 40B D05 BS CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/01/1964 26/04/1964 20/08/1966 08/05/1971 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 08/12/1973 07/04/1987 |
07/04/1987 |
D1554
|
|
|
47438
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1964 |
41A 41A 31B 40B D05 BS CE BS CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley March Immingham Stoke Division Bescot Crewe Diesel Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/01/1964 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 11/08/1973 06/10/1973 10/01/1976 08/05/1992 |
08/05/1992 |
D1555
|
|
|
47439
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/02/1964 |
41A 41A 30A 31B 40B D05 D02 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Stratford March Immingham Stoke Division Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
27/02/1964 26/04/1964 14/11/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 09/10/1971 06/01/1973 08/12/1973 06/04/1993 |
06/04/1993 |
D1556
|
|
|
47440
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/02/1964 |
41A 41A 31B 40B D05 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley March Immingham Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
08/02/1964 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 10/03/1973 04/10/1987 23/07/1991 |
23/07/1991 |
D1557
|
|
|
47441
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/02/1964 |
41A 41A 31B 40B D05 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley March Immingham Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/02/1964 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 07/04/1973 04/10/1987 15/12/1992 |
15/12/1992 |
D1558
|
|
|
47442
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1964 |
41A 41A 31B 40B 31B 41A 40B D05 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley March Immingham March Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
26/02/1964 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 09/09/1967 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 09/12/1972 04/10/1987 12/03/1993 |
12/03/1993 |
D1559
|
|
|
47443
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/03/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 31B 40B 31B 41A 40B D05 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park March Immingham March Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Withdrawn |
14/03/1964 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 06/08/1966 09/09/1967 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 21/04/1973 01/10/1993 |
01/10/1993 |
D1560
|
|
|
47444
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/03/1964 |
41A 41A 31B 41A 40B BS CE W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley March Tinsley Immingham Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/03/1964 26/04/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 02/06/1973 07/07/1973 05/11/1990 |
05/11/1990 |
D1561
|
|
|
47445
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 31B 41A 40B 30A D02 D05 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park March Tinsley Immingham Stratford Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/03/1964 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 29/05/1971 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 04/10/1987 24/06/1991 |
24/06/1991 |
D1562
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/03/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 31B 32A 30A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park March Norwich Thorpe Stratford Withdrawn |
14/03/1964 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 11/10/1969 20/06/1971 |
20/06/1971 |
D1563
|
|
|
47446
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/04/1964 |
41A 41A 34G 31B 32A 30A D02 D05 GD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park March Norwich Thorpe Stratford Birmingham Division Stoke Division Gateshead Withdrawn |
04/04/1964 26/04/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 11/10/1969 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 04/10/1981 24/02/1992 |
24/02/1992 |
D1564
|
|
|
47447
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/03/1964 |
41A 40B 31B 32A 40B BS CE W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham March Norwich Thorpe Immingham Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/03/1964 02/05/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 11/10/1969 07/07/1973 11/08/1973 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1565
|
|
|
47448
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/03/1964 |
41A 40B 30A 31B 32A 40B D02 D05 CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham Stratford March Norwich Thorpe Immingham Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
23/03/1964 02/05/1964 24/10/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 14/06/1969 24/03/1973 07/04/1973 15/05/1988 17/05/1991 |
17/05/1991 |
D1566
|
|
|
47449
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/03/1964 |
41A 40B 34G 31B 32A 41A 40B D05 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham Finsbury Park March Norwich Thorpe Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Withdrawn |
23/03/1964 02/05/1964 23/05/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 14/06/1969 09/10/1971 27/01/1973 14/05/1993 |
14/05/1993 |
D1567
|
|
|
47450
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/03/1964 |
41A 40B 31B 32A 41A 40B CE CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham March Norwich Thorpe Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/03/1964 02/05/1964 09/01/1965 11/05/1968 07/06/1969 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 04/10/1987 03/05/1991 |
03/05/1991 |
D1568
|
|
|
47451
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/03/1964 |
41A 40B 34G 40B 31B 32A 41A 40B BS CE W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham March Norwich Thorpe Tinsley Immingham Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/03/1964 02/05/1964 20/06/1964 09/01/1965 10/04/1965 11/05/1968 22/02/1969 09/10/1971 28/07/1973 08/09/1973 24/06/1991 |
24/06/1991 |
D1569
|
|
|
47452
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/03/1964 |
41A 40B 34G 40B BS CE CD W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Bescot Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
31/03/1964 02/05/1964 23/05/1964 09/01/1965 09/06/1973 07/07/1973 15/05/1988 16/08/1991 |
16/08/1991 |
D1570
|
47017
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/03/1964 |
55A 52A 30A 52A 41A 52A 55B 41A 30A W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Gateshead Stratford Gateshead Tinsley Gateshead York (North) Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
31/03/1964 23/04/1966 25/05/1968 20/07/1968 03/08/1968 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 08/01/1972 10/02/1973 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1571
|
|
|
47453
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/04/1964 |
55A 41A 52A 30A 52A 41A 52A 55B 30A D05 W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Tinsley Gateshead Stratford Gateshead Tinsley Gateshead York (North) Stratford Stoke Division Withdrawn |
04/04/1964 12/02/1966 28/10/1967 25/05/1968 20/07/1968 12/10/1968 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 08/01/1972 02/12/1972 15/12/1992 |
15/12/1992 |
D1572
|
47018
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/04/1964 |
55A 41A 55A 41A 52A 55B 30A ED W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Gateshead York (North) Stratford Eastfield Withdrawn |
13/04/1964 12/02/1966 28/10/1967 12/10/1968 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 08/01/1972 15/05/1988 22/11/1991 |
22/11/1991 |
D1573
|
47019
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/04/1964 |
55A 52A 64B 40B 52A 55B 30A CD |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Gateshead Haymarket Immingham Gateshead York (North) Stratford Crewe Diesel |
11/04/1964 23/04/1966 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 10/01/1970 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 04/10/1987 |
|
D1574
|
|
|
47454
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/04/1964 |
52A 41A 55A 41A 52A 55B 30A D05 CD W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Gateshead York (North) Stratford Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/04/1964 13/02/1965 28/10/1967 12/10/1968 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 08/05/1971 10/02/1973 04/10/1987 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1575
|
|
|
47455
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/04/1964 |
52A 31B 34G 41A D05 W |
Gateshead (New) March Finsbury Park Tinsley Stoke Division Withdrawn |
20/04/1964 29/05/1965 07/05/1966 11/06/1966 23/12/1972 15/03/1990 |
15/03/1990 |
D1576
|
|
|
47456
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/04/1964 |
52A 34G 41A 40B 30A D02 D05 CD W |
Gateshead (New) Finsbury Park Tinsley Immingham Stratford Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/04/1964 10/07/1965 24/07/1965 30/06/1966 29/05/1971 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 04/10/1987 21/10/1991 |
21/10/1991 |
D1577
|
|
|
47457
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/04/1964 |
52A 64B 40B 52A HO SF CD W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Immingham Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/04/1964 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 03/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/1977 15/05/1988 21/02/1992 |
21/02/1992 |
D1578
|
|
|
47458
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/05/1964 |
52A 64B 40B 52A HO SF ED W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Immingham Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Eastfield Withdrawn |
02/05/1964 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 10/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/1977 15/05/1988 27/05/1993 |
27/05/1993 |
D1579
|
|
|
47459
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/05/1964 |
52A 51L 30A D02 D05 HO YK W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Stratford Birmingham Division Stoke Division Holbeck (MR) York (North) Withdrawn |
01/05/1964 01/02/1969 31/01/1970 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 10/1977 25/03/1992 |
25/03/1992 |
D1580
|
|
|
47460
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/05/1964 |
52A 64B 40B 30A 52A HO SF W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Immingham Stratford Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Withdrawn |
08/05/1964 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 29/05/1971 19/08/1972 06/10/1973 10/1977 07/02/1992 |
07/02/1992 |
D1581
|
|
|
47461
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/05/1964 |
52A 64B 40B 52A HO SF W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Immingham Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Withdrawn |
16/05/1964 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/1977 28/03/1991 |
28/03/1991 |
D1582
|
|
|
47462
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/05/1964 |
52A 51L 30A D02 D05 BS CD HO YK W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Stratford Birmingham Division Stoke Division Bescot Crewe Diesel Holbeck (MR) York (North) Withdrawn |
16/05/1964 25/01/1969 31/01/1970 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 08/09/1973 09/03/1974 08/03/1975 10/1977 31/01/1999 |
31/01/1999 |
D1583
|
47020
|
|
47556
|
|
|
|
47844
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/05/1964 |
86A 87E 86A 81A 86A 81A 86A 81A 86A D05 D02 CF LE CF LA BR LA BR LA CF LA BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
23/05/1964 15/11/1964 28/03/1965 15/01/1966 28/08/1966 25/01/1969 06/12/1969 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 17/03/1973 07/04/1973 24/08/1974 12/10/1974 09/11/1974 10/05/1975 08/11/1975 10/01/1976 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 09/10/1976 11/12/1976 04/10/1987 01/05/2002 |
01/05/2002 |
D1584
|
47021
|
|
47531
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/05/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 87E 82A 86A 87A BS BR BS W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Bescot Bristol Bath Road (on loan) Bescot (returned from loan) Withdrawn |
16/05/1964 28/03/1965 15/01/1966 28/08/1966 30/04/1967 31/08/1967 13/05/1972 06/10/1973 24/08/1974 05/10/1974 01/07/2001 |
01/07/2001 |
D1585
|
47022
|
|
47542
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/05/1964 |
87E 86A 82A 81A 86A 87A CF GD HO YK SF YK SF LA W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Gateshead Holbeck (MR) York (North) Stratford York (North) Stratford Laira Withdrawn |
16/05/1964 28/03/1965 15/01/1966 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 13/05/1972 24/11/1973 12/10/1974 11/01/1975 10/05/1975 27/11/1977 29/01/1978 02/1978 15/05/1988 03/04/1989 |
03/04/1989 |
D1586
|
|
|
47463
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/05/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87E 82A 86A BS BS TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bescot Bescot Tinsley Withdrawn |
25/05/1964 15/11/1964 07/11/1965 28/08/1966 14/05/1967 31/08/1967 11/05/1974 05/10/1974 15/05/1988 21/04/1995 |
21/04/1995 |
D1587
|
|
|
47464
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/05/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 86A 81A 82A LE BR LE BR ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Withdrawn |
27/05/1964 15/11/1964 15/01/1966 30/10/1966 25/01/1969 06/12/1969 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 10/05/1975 12/07/1975 10/04/1976 02/10/1986 |
02/10/1986 |
D1588
|
47023
|
|
47543
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/05/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87E 82A 86A 87A 86A LE HO YK SF YK SF CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Holbeck (MR) York (North) Stratford York (North) Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/05/1964 15/11/1964 07/11/1965 28/08/1966 14/05/1967 31/08/1967 13/05/1972 11/11/1972 21/12/1974 15/03/1975 10/05/1975 27/11/1977 29/01/1978 02/1978 04/10/1987 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1589
|
|
|
47465
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/05/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87E 82A 86A LE BR HA ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/05/1964 15/11/1964 07/11/1965 30/10/1966 14/05/1967 31/08/1967 25/08/1973 11/12/1976 10/1977 02/1978 22/11/1991 |
22/11/1991 |
D1590
|
|
|
47466
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/05/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87E 82A 86A 82A ED HA HA ED BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Haymarket Haymarket Eastfield Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
30/05/1964 15/11/1964 15/01/1966 30/10/1966 31/10/1967 18/03/1968 02/09/1972 11/05/1974 26/10/1974 12/12/1976 02/1978 04/10/1987 01/08/1991 |
01/08/1991 |
D1591
|
47024
|
|
47557
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 87A 82A LE LA BR LA CF LA TO GD BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Toton Gateshead Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
05/06/1964 15/11/1964 15/01/1966 30/10/1966 13/05/1972 11/11/1972 07/09/1974 10/05/1975 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 09/10/1976 11/12/1976 06/09/1981 01/11/1981 04/10/1987 01/04/2002 |
01/04/2002 |
D1592
|
47025
|
|
47544
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/06/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 87E 86A 87E 86A 87A CF GD GD HO YK ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Gateshead (on loan) Gateshead (loan made permanent) Holbeck (MR) York (North) Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/06/1964 15/11/1964 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 31/01/1967 04/04/1970 22/08/1970 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 16/11/1974 07/12/1974 11/01/1975 29/02/1976 15/05/1988 05/02/1990 |
05/02/1990 |
D1593
|
|
|
47467
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/06/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 87E 86A 87E 86A 82A ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Withdrawn |
09/06/1964 15/11/1964 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 31/01/1967 04/04/1970 22/08/1970 16/10/1971 11/05/1974 12/12/1998 |
12/12/1998 |
D1594
|
|
|
47468
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 87E 86A 81A 86A 87E 86A BS BS CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Bescot Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
16/06/1964 15/11/1964 01/05/1966 28/02/1967 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 06/12/1969 04/04/1970 22/08/1970 06/10/1973 05/10/1974 04/10/1987 01/08/1995 |
01/08/1995 |
D1595
|
|
|
47469
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 86A 82A HA ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
16/06/1964 15/11/1964 01/05/1966 31/03/1967 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 01/05/1976 19/03/1989 |
19/03/1989 |
D1596
|
|
|
47470
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/06/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 87E 86A 87E 81A 82A HA ED ED ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield Eastfield Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/06/1964 15/11/1964 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 31/01/1967 25/01/1969 15/03/1969 01/11/1969 11/05/1974 01/1977 31/10/1979 05/06/1988 11/11/1991 |
11/11/1991 |
D1597
|
47026
|
|
47597
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/06/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 87E 86A D05 D02 CF LA LE LA W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
22/06/1964 15/11/1964 11/07/1965 30/10/1966 04/04/1970 22/08/1970 17/02/1973 10/03/1973 21/09/1974 08/02/1975 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 01/01/2003 |
01/01/2003 |
D1598
|
|
|
47471
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 82A HA ED YK W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield York (North) Withdrawn |
29/06/1964 15/11/1964 11/07/1965 18/03/1968 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 29/06/1974 12/10/1974 31/12/2004 |
31/12/2004 |
D1599
|
47027
|
|
47558
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1964 |
87E 82A 86A 81A 86A LA BR W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
29/06/1964 11/07/1965 18/03/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 08/02/1975 04/10/1987 01/03/2002 |
01/03/2002 |
D1600
|
|
|
47472
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/06/1964 |
87E 86A 87E 81A 86A 87E BR ED CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
30/06/1964 07/03/1965 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 30/10/1966 31/08/1967 13/07/1974 08/05/1976 04/10/1987 19/04/1991 |
19/04/1991 |
D1601
|
|
|
47473
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1964 |
87E 86A 87E 81A 86A 87E 82A BS BS GD CD OC W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Bescot Bescot Gateshead Crewe Diesel Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
06/07/1964 07/03/1965 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 31/03/1967 31/08/1967 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 21/09/1974 04/10/1981 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 01/06/1998 |
01/06/1998 |
D1602
|
|
|
47474
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 86A 87E 82A BS BS CD TI W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Bescot Bescot Crewe Diesel Tinsley Withdrawn |
07/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 30/04/1967 31/08/1967 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 05/10/1974 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1603
|
|
|
47475
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/07/1964 |
87E 86A 82A 86A 87E 82A BS CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 09/11/1968 15/03/1969 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 04/10/1987 31/01/2003 |
31/01/2003 |
D1604
|
|
|
47476
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 86A 87E 82A BS BS W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
20/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 30/04/1967 31/08/1967 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 14/09/1974 28/02/2004 |
28/02/2004 |
D1605
|
47028
|
|
47559
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 86A 82A LA BR W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
29/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 30/09/1967 16/08/1969 08/02/1975 04/10/1987 01/01/2003 |
01/01/2003 |
D1606
|
47029
|
|
47635
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 82A 86A 87E D02 CF LA CF W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
29/07/1964 07/03/1965 12/1965 31/10/1967 09/11/1968 15/03/1969 31/03/1973 02/03/1974 08/02/1975 11/1978 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1607
|
|
|
47477
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 82A 87A BR LE LA W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
31/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 31/10/1967 27/01/1973 07/09/1974 01/11/1981 15/05/1988 28/10/1992 |
28/10/1992 |
D1608
|
|
|
47478
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/07/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 82A 87A BR LE BR W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
31/07/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 31/10/1967 25/11/1972 13/07/1974 15/03/1975 05/1977 31/12/2005 |
31/12/2005 |
D1609
|
47030
|
|
47618
|
|
|
|
47836
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/08/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 86A 81A 82A 86A 87E CF LA CF CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/08/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 31/10/1967 16/08/1969 01/11/1969 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 11/1978 15/05/1988 01/04/2003 |
01/04/2003 |
D1610
|
47031
|
|
47560
|
|
|
|
47832
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/08/1964 |
87E 86A 81A 86A 81A 82A 87E CF LA BR |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road |
13/08/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1966 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 31/10/1967 15/03/1969 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 15/05/1988 |
|
D1611
|
47032
|
|
47662
|
|
|
|
47817
|
|
|
57311
|
|
|
|
18/08/1964 |
87E 82A 87E CF BR LA BR |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road |
18/08/1964 21/02/1965 15/03/1969 11/05/1974 15/03/1975 09/08/1975 15/05/1988 |
|
D1612
|
|
|
47479
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/08/1964 |
87E 82A WL 87E BR CD W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Landore Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
21/08/1964 21/02/1965 13/05/1967 15/03/1969 12/10/1974 04/10/1987 11/12/1992 |
11/12/1992 |
D1613
|
47033
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87E LA CF CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
25/08/1964 15/11/1964 21/02/1965 15/03/1969 10/05/1975 11/1978 04/10/1987 31/12/2007 |
31/12/2007 |
D1614
|
47034
|
|
47561
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1964 |
86A 81A 86A 81A 87E 82A 87E D02 CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/08/1964 15/01/1966 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 28/08/1966 18/03/1968 15/03/1969 03/02/1973 04/10/1987 01/08/1996 |
01/08/1996 |
D1615
|
47035
|
|
47594
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/08/1964 |
86A 81A 86A 81A 87E WL 82A 86A 87E LA |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Landore Western Lines (LMR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Laira |
29/08/1964 15/01/1966 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 28/08/1966 13/05/1967 18/03/1968 15/03/1969 01/11/1969 10/05/1975 |
|
D1616
|
|
|
47480
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97480
|
47971
|
29/08/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL ML WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D05 D02 D05 D02 D05 D16 CD TO CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/08/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 22/10/1966 22/04/1967 29/04/1967 25/11/1967 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 18/12/1971 06/05/1972 10/06/1972 08/07/1972 09/12/1972 06/01/1973 10/02/1973 16/02/1974 31/10/1979 04/10/1987 01/03/1998 |
01/03/1998 |
D1617
|
47036
|
|
47562
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/09/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL ML WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D01 D05 30A 41A IM HA |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Stoke Division Stratford Tinsley Immingham Haymarket |
04/09/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 31/12/1966 22/04/1967 29/04/1967 25/11/1967 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 04/04/1970 03/04/1971 09/09/1972 02/12/1972 16/12/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 |
|
D1618
|
47037
|
|
47563
|
|
|
|
47831
|
|
|
57310
|
|
|
|
05/09/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL ML WL D05 D16 D05 55B 41A IM HA |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division York (North) Tinsley Immingham Haymarket |
05/09/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 21/01/1967 22/04/1967 29/04/1967 03/02/1968 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 24/06/1972 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 |
|
D1619
|
47038
|
|
47564
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/09/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D05 D16 D05 55B 41A IM ED BR W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division York (North) Tinsley Immingham Eastfield Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
12/09/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 11/02/1967 13/05/1967 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 24/06/1972 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 04/10/1987 01/11/2003 |
01/11/2003 |
D1620
|
47039
|
|
47565
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1964 |
16A D16 5A WL D16 D05 D16 D05 41A HO TE IM BR W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Immingham Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
17/09/1964 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 16/04/1966 18/02/1967 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 10/05/1969 14/10/1972 19/05/1973 11/01/1975 10/05/1975 04/10/1987 01/01/2000 |
01/01/2000 |
D1621
|
47040
|
|
47642
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/09/1964 |
16A D16 WL D05 D16 D05 D02 CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
19/09/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 07/06/1969 09/12/1972 10/11/1973 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1622
|
47041
|
|
47630
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/09/1964 |
16A D16 6A WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D02 D05 D16 40B TI IM SF HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Chester (MR) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Immingham Tinsley Immingham Stratford Haymarket Withdrawn |
26/09/1964 16/01/1965 11/09/1965 16/04/1966 17/06/1968 08/02/1969 07/06/1969 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 06/05/1972 24/06/1972 09/12/1972 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 21/06/1981 06/09/1981 01/03/2001 |
01/03/2001 |
D1623
|
47042
|
|
47586
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D02 D16 BS TI IM HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Bescot Tinsley Immingham Haymarket Withdrawn |
02/10/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 17/12/1966 06/05/1967 17/06/1968 11/01/1969 10/01/1970 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 24/06/1972 12/05/1973 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 06/09/1981 01/10/1994 |
01/10/1994 |
D1624
|
47043
|
|
47566
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D05 D05 D05 41A IM BR W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Stoke Division Stoke Division Tinsley Immingham Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
04/10/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 19/11/1966 06/05/1967 17/06/1968 07/12/1968 10/01/1970 09/09/1972 11/05/1974 15/05/1988 01/11/1996 |
01/11/1996 |
D1625
|
47044
|
|
47567
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 D05 D05 D05 D02 D05 40B TI IM BR W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Stoke Division Stoke Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Immingham Tinsley Immingham Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
03/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/06/1966 26/11/1966 17/06/1968 07/12/1968 10/01/1970 08/01/1972 06/05/1972 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 04/10/1987 01/02/2003 |
01/02/2003 |
D1626
|
47045
|
|
47568
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D16 ML D16 ML WL D05 D05 D05 D02 40B TI IM ED GD IS W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Stoke Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Immingham Tinsley Immingham Eastfield Gateshead Inverness Withdrawn |
10/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/06/1966 23/07/1966 27/08/1966 03/09/1966 08/10/1966 30/09/1967 18/11/1967 17/02/1968 17/06/1968 07/12/1968 10/01/1970 11/11/1972 10/03/1973 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 02/05/1976 21/12/1980 04/10/1987 01/10/2002 |
01/10/2002 |
D1627
|
|
|
47481
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D16 ML WL D05 D05 D05 D02 D16 D05 D02 D05 D02 CD CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Stoke Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
10/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/06/1966 02/07/1966 27/08/1966 03/09/1966 14/10/1967 17/02/1968 17/06/1968 07/12/1968 02/05/1970 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 07/10/1972 09/12/1972 06/01/1973 11/05/1974 04/10/1987 30/04/2003 |
30/04/2003 |
D1628
|
47046
|
|
|
47601
|
|
|
|
47901
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D16 ML D16 D05 D02 D16 40B TI IM TI CF CF W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
17/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/06/1966 23/07/1966 27/08/1966 03/09/1966 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 12/09/1970 06/02/1971 06/05/1972 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 12/10/1974 04/01/1976 30/11/1979 04/10/1987 01/02/1990 |
01/02/1990 |
D1629
|
47047
|
|
47569
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D16 ML D16 D05 D02 D16 40B TI HO IM IS ED |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Immingham Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Immingham Inverness Eastfield |
17/10/1964 16/01/1965 16/04/1966 16/07/1966 27/08/1966 03/09/1966 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 03/04/1971 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 24/06/1972 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 02/05/1976 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 |
|
D1630
|
47048
|
|
47570
|
|
|
|
47849
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/10/1964 |
16A D16 WL D16 WL D16 ML D16 D02 D16 BS CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Bescot Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
23/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/06/1966 16/07/1966 27/08/1966 03/09/1966 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 15/08/1970 06/05/1972 12/05/1973 10/11/1973 01/12/2001 |
01/12/2001 |
D1631
|
47049
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/10/1964 |
5A 41A WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D01 D16 D01 D05 D16 CE IM TI HO CD W |
Crewe North (New) Tinsley Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division London Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Immingham Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
31/10/1964 29/01/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 07/01/1970 02/05/1970 15/05/1971 24/07/1971 04/09/1971 09/09/1972 11/11/1972 12/05/1973 19/05/1973 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 28/02/1976 21/01/2000 |
21/01/2000 |
D1632
|
47050
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1964 |
5A 41A WL D05 41A HO TE GD CD CD W |
Crewe North (New) Tinsley Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Gateshead Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
07/11/1964 29/01/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/09/1972 12/01/1974 11/01/1975 10/05/1975 28/02/1976 04/10/1987 11/11/1994 |
11/11/1994 |
D1633
|
47051
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1964 |
5A WL D05 D01 D16 D02 D05 41A HO GD CD HA CD W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Crewe Diesel Haymarket Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/11/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 21/08/1971 04/09/1971 06/05/1972 08/07/1972 09/09/1972 12/01/1974 11/01/1975 28/02/1976 05/10/1981 04/10/1987 12/12/1998 |
12/12/1998 |
D1634
|
47052
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/11/1964 |
5A WL D05 D16 D01 D16 D02 D05 D02 CE BS CD HO GD TE GD TE W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Bescot Cricklewood East Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Thornaby Gateshead Thornaby Withdrawn |
10/11/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 04/04/1970 03/04/1971 25/09/1971 06/05/1972 08/07/1972 09/12/1972 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 10/11/1973 12/10/1974 11/01/1975 08/03/1975 10/05/1975 12/07/1975 30/04/2003 |
30/04/2003 |
D1635
|
47053
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/11/1964 |
5A WL D05 D16 D01 D05 D16 40B TI IS HA ED CD ED W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Immingham Tinsley Inverness Haymarket Eastfield Crewe Diesel Eastfield Withdrawn |
21/11/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 26/06/1971 25/09/1971 09/09/1972 09/12/1972 06/01/1973 06/10/1973 08/12/1973 29/12/1973 26/10/1974 18/10/1987 15/05/1988 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1636
|
|
|
47482
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 81A 81A BS LE IS ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bescot Landore Inverness Eastfield Withdrawn |
10/12/1964 07/02/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 15/03/1969 30/03/1974 05/01/1981 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 20/10/1993 |
20/10/1993 |
D1637
|
|
|
47483
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 81A 81A CD TI CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel Tinsley Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
07/12/1964 07/02/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 15/03/1969 01/05/1977 15/05/1988 04/09/1988 11/06/1993 |
11/06/1993 |
D1638
|
47054
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/12/1964 |
86A 87E 81A CF LE BR CF LE W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Withdrawn |
08/12/1964 07/02/1965 30/10/1966 11/05/1974 20/07/1974 11/10/1975 10/01/1976 05/1977 17/07/1992 |
17/07/1992 |
D1639
|
47055
|
|
47652
|
|
|
|
47807
|
|
|
57304
|
|
|
|
14/12/1964 |
86A 87E 81A D02 OC CF LE BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Birmingham Division Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road |
14/12/1964 07/02/1965 30/10/1966 23/12/1972 22/06/1974 10/01/1976 05/1977 15/05/1988 |
|
D1640
|
47056
|
|
47654
|
|
|
|
47809
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/12/1964 |
86A 87E 81A BR BS OC CF OC CF BR CF LE BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bescot Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/12/1964 07/02/1965 30/10/1966 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 21/09/1974 08/02/1975 11/10/1975 10/01/1976 19/06/1976 09/10/1976 05/1977 15/05/1988 01/06/2002 |
01/06/2002 |
D1641
|
47057
|
|
47532
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/12/1964 |
86A 87E 81A 82A 87A 81A 82A 87A 86A LE BS CD CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Bescot Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/12/1964 28/03/1965 28/02/1967 16/08/1969 13/05/1972 11/11/1972 10/02/1973 17/03/1973 24/03/1973 06/10/1973 06/04/1974 31/10/1979 04/10/1987 01/11/1996 |
01/11/1996 |
D1642
|
47058
|
|
47547
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/12/1964 |
86A 87E 81A CD YK OC W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel York (North) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
19/12/1964 07/02/1965 30/04/1967 29/06/1974 12/10/1974 15/05/1988 01/03/1996 |
01/03/1996 |
D1643
|
47059
|
|
47631
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A LE BS ED BR CF LE W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bescot Eastfield Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Withdrawn |
19/12/1964 28/03/1965 04/04/1970 13/07/1974 09/11/1974 08/03/1975 07/08/1976 09/10/1976 05/1977 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1644
|
47060
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57008
|
|
|
|
|
23/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87A 81A CF OC LE |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Landore |
23/12/1964 07/03/1965 04/04/1970 13/05/1972 11/11/1972 12/05/1973 07/12/1974 10/07/1976 |
|
D1645
|
47061
|
|
47649
|
|
|
|
47830
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 87A CF OC BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road |
24/12/1964 07/03/1965 04/04/1970 13/05/1972 08/09/1973 07/12/1974 10/07/1976 |
|
D1646
|
47062
|
|
47545
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1964 |
86A 87E 82A 86A LE CF BS CD |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Bescot Crewe Diesel |
31/12/1964 07/03/1965 04/04/1970 12/08/1972 12/05/1973 11/05/1974 28/09/1974 04/10/1987 |
|
D1647
|
47063
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/01/1965 |
86A 87E 81A 82A 86A OC BR BS LE BR CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bescot Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
02/01/1965 28/03/1965 14/11/1970 16/10/1971 12/08/1972 07/07/1973 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 05/10/1974 11/10/1975 04/10/1987 22/09/1995 |
22/09/1995 |
D1648
|
47064
|
|
47639
|
|
|
|
47851
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/01/1965 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 81A 82A 81A 81A BR OC SF BS |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Stratford Bescot |
22/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 18/03/1968 09/11/1968 15/03/1969 11/05/1974 10/08/1974 11/10/1975 10/1977 |
|
D1649
|
47065
|
|
47535
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/01/1965 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 81A CD BS BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel Bescot Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
02/01/1965 28/03/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 30/04/1967 23/02/1974 12/10/1974 04/10/1987 01/02/1999 |
01/02/1999 |
D1650
|
47066
|
|
47661
|
|
|
|
47816
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/01/1965 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 81A 81A 87E 81A BR LE BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road |
09/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 30/04/1967 25/01/1969 15/03/1969 04/04/1970 10/05/1975 05/1977 15/05/1988 |
|
D1651
|
47067
|
|
47533
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/01/1965 |
86A 87E 81A BS W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bescot Withdrawn |
09/01/1965 28/03/1965 14/11/1970 22/06/1974 01/06/1991 |
01/06/1991 |
D1652
|
47068
|
|
47632
|
|
|
|
47848
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/01/1965 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 82A 81A CF OC CF LE CF ED |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Eastfield |
16/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 14/05/1967 15/03/1969 12/05/1973 02/03/1974 09/10/1976 05/1977 11/1981 15/05/1988 |
|
D1653
|
47069
|
|
47638
|
|
|
|
47845
|
|
|
57301
|
|
|
|
16/01/1965 |
86A 87E 82A 86A 82A 82A 81A CF OC CF |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton |
16/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 19/06/1966 14/05/1967 31/08/1967 15/03/1969 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 10/05/1975 |
|
D1654
|
47070
|
|
47620
|
|
|
|
47835
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/01/1965 |
86A 87E 86A 87E 81A CF BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
23/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 31/08/1967 14/11/1970 10/05/1975 15/05/1988 |
|
D1655
|
47071
|
|
47536
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
86A 87E 86A 87E 81A BS GD CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Bescot Gateshead Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
30/01/1965 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 31/08/1967 14/11/1970 10/08/1974 04/10/1981 04/10/1987 01/11/1996 |
01/11/1996 |
D1656
|
47072
|
|
47609
|
|
|
|
47834
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/02/1965 |
87E 86A 87E 81A CF BR W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
01/02/1965 01/05/1966 31/08/1967 14/11/1970 10/05/1975 15/05/1988 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1657
|
47073
|
|
47537
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/02/1965 |
87E 81A CF OC BS BR |
Landore (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bescot Bristol Bath Road |
01/02/1965 14/11/1970 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 01/06/1974 04/10/1987 |
|
D1658
|
47074
|
|
47646
|
|
|
|
47852
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
87E 81A 5A BS LE CF BR BS CF BS BS W |
Landore (New) Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel Bescot Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bescot Cardiff Canton Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
12/02/1965 14/11/1970 28/04/1973 07/07/1973 06/04/1974 06/04/1974 09/08/1975 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 07/08/1976 01/1977 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1659
|
47075
|
|
47645
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/02/1965 |
87E 81A CF LE CF OC BR LE CF W |
Landore (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
06/02/1965 10/1970 12/05/1973 12/05/1973 11/05/1974 01/06/1974 10/05/1975 05/1977 11/1981 01/02/1990 |
01/02/1990 |
D1660
|
47076
|
|
47625
|
|
|
47749
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/02/1965 |
87E 81A CF BR |
Landore (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
13/02/1965 14/11/1970 09/10/1976 04/10/1987 |
|
D1661
|
47077
|
|
47613
|
|
|
|
47840
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/02/1965 |
87E
CF BR W |
Landore (New)
Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
13/02/1965 28/04/1973 09/10/1976 15/05/1988 01/05/2007 |
01/05/2007 |
D1662
|
|
|
47484
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1965 |
87E 86A 87E BR LE BR W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
20/02/1965 27/03/1966 28/08/1966 08/12/1973 11/05/1974 05/1977 01/06/1998 |
01/06/1998 |
D1663
|
47078
|
|
47628
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1965 |
87E 86A 87E CF W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
20/02/1965 27/03/1966 28/08/1966 09/10/1976 01/05/1997 |
01/05/1997 |
D1664
|
47079
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57009
|
|
|
|
|
27/02/1965 |
87E 86A 87E 81A CF CF |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton |
27/02/1965 27/03/1966 28/08/1966 16/12/1972 09/10/1976 04/10/1987 |
|
D1665
|
47080
|
|
47612
|
|
|
|
47838
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1965 |
87E 86A 87E 86A OC CF CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/03/1965 15/01/1966 28/08/1966 17/02/1973 29/06/1974 09/10/1976 15/05/1988 01/08/1999 |
01/08/1999 |
D1666
|
47081
|
|
47606
|
|
|
|
47842
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1965 |
87E 86A 87E D02 OC CF CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Birmingham Division Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/03/1965 15/01/1966 28/08/1966 02/12/1972 30/03/1974 09/10/1976 15/05/1988 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1667
|
47082
|
|
47626
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/03/1965 |
87E 86A 87E CF CF BR W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
06/03/1965 15/01/1966 28/08/1966 12/05/1973 11/1981 04/10/1987 01/06/2004 |
01/06/2004 |
D1668
|
47083
|
|
47633
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/03/1965 |
86A 87E 86A 82A 86A 87E CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
13/03/1965 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 31/08/1967 12/05/1973 01/11/1990 |
01/11/1990 |
D1669
|
47084
|
|
47538
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1965 |
87E 86A 87E 86A 82A 86A 87E CF BS CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
20/03/1965 11/04/1965 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 27/07/1968 11/05/1974 21/09/1974 04/10/1987 01/09/1990 |
01/09/1990 |
D1670
|
47085
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/03/1965 |
86A 87E 86A 82A 81A SF CF CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Stratford Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
20/03/1965 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 01/05/1966 15/01/1967 11/10/1975 04/10/1987 12/06/1988 18/02/2000 |
18/02/2000 |
D1671
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/03/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
27/03/1965 18/04/1966 |
18/04/1966 |
D1672
|
47086
|
|
47641
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/03/1965 |
86A 82A OC CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
27/03/1965 01/05/1966 07/07/1973 09/10/1976 01/07/2003 |
01/07/2003 |
D1673
|
47087
|
|
47624
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/04/1965 |
86A 82A OC CF BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
03/04/1965 01/05/1966 06/10/1973 09/10/1976 04/10/1987 01/11/1998 |
01/11/1998 |
D1674
|
47088
|
|
47653
|
|
|
|
47808
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/04/1965 |
86A 82A 81A CF BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
05/04/1965 01/05/1966 14/06/1969 09/10/1976 15/05/1988 01/09/2003 |
01/09/2003 |
D1675
|
47089
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/04/1965 |
86A 82A 81A CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
10/04/1965 01/05/1966 14/06/1969 09/10/1976 21/06/1987 |
21/06/1987 |
D1676
|
47090
|
|
47623
|
|
|
|
47843
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/04/1965 |
86A 82A 30A 87A 82A OC BR OC CF |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Stratford Landore Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton |
16/04/1965 01/05/1966 04/01/1969 12/12/1970 27/01/1973 06/10/1973 10/11/1973 06/07/1974 09/10/1976 |
|
D1677
|
47091
|
|
47647
|
|
|
|
47846
|
|
|
57308
|
|
|
|
24/04/1965 |
86A 82A 30A 87A BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Stratford Landore Bristol Bath Road |
24/04/1965 01/05/1966 04/01/1969 12/12/1970 08/11/1975 |
|
D1678
|
47092
|
|
47534
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/04/1965 |
86A 87E 81A BS CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/04/1965 27/07/1968 15/03/1969 06/10/1973 04/10/1987 01/06/1991 |
01/06/1991 |
D1679
|
47093
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/05/1965 |
86A 87E 81A BR SF SF
W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Stratford Stratford
Withdrawn |
01/05/1965 09/11/1968 25/01/1969 08/03/1975 11/10/1975 26/07/1981 14/10/1987 05/01/1988 |
05/01/1988 |
D1680
|
47094
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/05/1965 |
86A 81A 82A 86A CD CF CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/05/1965 09/11/1968 16/10/1971 02/09/1972 11/10/1975 05/1977 04/10/1987 24/02/1992 |
24/02/1992 |
D1681
|
47095
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/05/1965 |
86A 81A LE BS CF CD BS BS CF BS TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Landore Bescot Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Bescot Bescot Cardiff Canton Bescot Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/05/1965 09/11/1968 09/06/1973 23/06/1973 28/09/1974 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 10/07/1976 01/1977 04/10/1987 30/11/2004 |
30/11/2004 |
D1682
|
47096
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/10/1963 |
81A 2B WL D02 82A CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
31/10/1963 09/05/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 29/06/1974 22/09/1995 |
22/09/1995 |
D1683
|
|
|
47485
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/10/1963 |
81A 2B WL D02 W |
Old Oak Common (New) Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
31/10/1963 09/05/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/10/1993 |
06/10/1993 |
D1684
|
47097
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/11/1963 |
81A 2B WL D02 86A BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/11/1963 09/05/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 11/05/1974 05/1977 04/04/1990 |
04/04/1990 |
D1685
|
47098
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/11/1963 |
2B 16C 2B WL D02 86A TI W |
Oxley (New) Derby Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/11/1963 21/12/1963 11/01/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 04/10/1987 22/06/1991 |
22/06/1991 |
D1686
|
47099
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/11/1963 |
2B WL D02 86A W |
Oxley (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
08/11/1963 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 12/11/1991 |
12/11/1991 |
D1687
|
47100
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/11/1963 |
2B WL D02 D05 D02 86A TI IM SF CD SF W |
Oxley (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Tinsley Immingham Stratford Crewe Diesel Stratford Withdrawn |
16/11/1963 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 08/12/1973 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 12/02/1978 04/10/1987 17/07/1991 |
17/07/1991 |
D1688
|
47101
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/11/1963 |
2B 16C 2B WL D02 86A W |
Oxley (New) Derby Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
21/11/1963 21/12/1963 04/01/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 13/03/1989 |
13/03/1989 |
D1689
|
|
|
47486
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/11/1963 |
82A 2B WL D02 W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
21/11/1963 09/05/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/07/1987 |
06/07/1987 |
D1690
|
47102
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/11/1963 |
86A 2B WL D02 TI IM SF CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Oxley Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Tinsley Immingham Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/11/1963 09/05/1964 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 12/02/1978 22/09/1995 |
22/09/1995 |
D1691
|
47103
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/11/1963 |
86A 81A 5A WL D02 IM CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common (on loan) Crewe Diesel Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Immingham Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
29/11/1963 12/02/1966 27/03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 10/05/1975 14/07/1987 |
14/07/1987 |
D1692
|
47104
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/11/1963 |
82A 5A 5A WL D02 BR BS BR CF R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Bescot (on loan) Bristol Bath Road (returned from loan) Cardiff Canton Reinstated Withdrawn |
30/11/1963 12/02/1966 27/03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 14/09/1974 05/1977 05/05/1988 10/06/1988 |
10/06/1988 |
D1693
|
47105
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/12/1963 |
82A 5A 5A WL D02 40B CF W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Immingham Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
06/12/1963 12/02/1966 27/03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 28/04/1973 10/05/1975 13/12/1993 |
13/12/1993 |
D1694
|
47106
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1963 |
81A 86A 81A 5A 5A WL D02 D05 D02 BR BS BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Bescot (on loan) Bristol Bath Road (returned from loan) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/12/1963 12/10/1964 15/01/1966 12/02/1966 27/03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 24/06/1972 23/12/1972 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 05/10/1974 05/1977 29/02/1988 |
29/02/1988 |
D1695
|
47107
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1963 |
2B 52B 16C 2B 81A 86A 5A 5A WL D02 IM BS TI W |
Oxley (New) Heaton Derby Oxley Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Immingham Bescot Tinsley Withdrawn |
11/12/1963 14/12/1963 21/12/1963 04/01/1964 09/05/1964 12/10/1964 12/02/1966 03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 28/07/1973 01/02/1975 04/10/1987 22/06/1991 |
22/06/1991 |
D1696
|
47108
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/12/1963 |
16C 2B 81A 86A 5A 5A WL D02 D05 D02 W |
Derby (New) Oxley Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
12/12/1963 11/01/1964 09/05/1964 12/10/1964 12/02/1966 03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 24/06/1972 11/11/1972 17/03/1994 |
17/03/1994 |
D1697
|
47109
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/12/1963 |
86A 87E 86A 5A 5A WL D02 D05 D02 TI SF BS W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Tinsley Stratford Bescot Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 13/04/1964 07/03/1965 12/02/1966 03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 24/06/1972 10/02/1973 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 07/12/1974 10/08/1987 |
10/08/1987 |
D1698
|
47110
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/01/1964 |
81A 86A 5A 5A WL D02 D05 D02 W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel (on loan) Crewe Diesel (loan made permanent) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
13/01/1964 12/10/1964 12/02/1966 03/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 24/06/1972 07/10/1972 02/05/1989 |
02/05/1989 |
D1699
|
47111
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/12/1963 |
81A 82A WL D02 BR BS BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Bescot (on loan) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/12/1963 21/02/1965 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 05/10/1974 05/1977 28/02/1986 |
28/02/1986 |
D1700
|
47112
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/01/1964 |
81A 82A WL D02 BR BS BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Bescot (on loan) Bristol Bath Road (returned from loan) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
13/01/1964 07/03/1965 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 11/05/1974 24/08/1974 05/10/1974 05/1977 22/11/1991 |
22/11/1991 |
D1701
|
47113
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/01/1964 |
81A WL D02 SF CD W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/01/1964 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 04/10/1987 18/10/1987 19/01/1988 |
19/01/1988 |
D1702
|
47114
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/11/1965 |
41A 40B 30A W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Stratford Withdrawn |
04/11/1965 07/11/1970 29/05/1971 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1703
|
47115
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1965 |
41A 32A 30A 41A 30A W |
Tinsley (New) Norwich Thorpe Stratford Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
17/09/1965 26/04/1969 11/10/1969 14/02/1970 29/05/1971 09/04/1991 |
09/04/1991 |
D1704
|
47116
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1966 |
41A 32A 30A 41A 30A W |
Tinsley (New) Norwich Thorpe Stratford Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
21/07/1966 14/06/1969 11/10/1969 14/02/1970 08/01/1972 27/07/1990 |
27/07/1990 |
D1705
|
47117
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/11/1965 |
41A 32A 30A 41A 55A 52A 34G 30A W |
Tinsley (New) Norwich Thorpe Stratford Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Finsbury Park Stratford Withdrawn |
04/11/1965 07/06/1969 11/10/1969 14/02/1970 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 06/05/1972 17/07/1991 |
17/07/1991 |
D1706
|
47118
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1965 |
41A 32A 30A 41A 55A 40B 52A 30A CD ED W |
Tinsley (New) Norwich Thorpe Stratford Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Immingham Gateshead Stratford Crewe Diesel Eastfield Withdrawn |
31/12/1965 22/02/1969 11/10/1969 14/02/1970 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 28/10/1972 09/12/1972 18/10/1987 15/05/1988 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1707
|
|
|
47487
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/01/1964 |
81A 82A WL D02 CD W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/01/1964 20/02/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 15/05/1988 07/12/1988 |
07/12/1988 |
D1708
|
47119
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/01/1964 |
81A WL D02 D05 D02 BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
18/01/1964 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 08/05/1971 10/08/1974 07/12/1974 15/05/1992 |
15/05/1992 |
D1709
|
47120
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/01/1964 |
2B 81A WL D02 SF W |
Oxley (New) Old Oak Common Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stratford Withdrawn |
17/01/1964 09/05/1964 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 04/10/1987 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1710
|
47121
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/01/1964 |
81A WL D02 BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
20/01/1964 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 07/12/1974 24/09/1996 |
24/09/1996 |
D1711
|
47122
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/01/1964 |
81A WL D02 BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
20/01/1964 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 07/12/1974 03/09/1987 |
03/09/1987 |
D1712
|
47123
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1964 |
2B 82A 82A WL D02 BR CF W |
Oxley (New) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/01/1964 09/05/1964 15/01/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 06/10/1973 07/07/1991 |
07/07/1991 |
D1713
|
|
|
47488
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/01/1964 |
2B 86A 82A WL D02 W |
Oxley (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
28/01/1964 09/05/1964 11/07/1965 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 30/06/2008 |
30/06/2008 |
D1714
|
47124
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/02/1964 |
81A WL D02 BR CF W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
01/02/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 07/12/1974 05/06/1989 |
05/06/1989 |
D1715
|
47125
|
|
47548
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/02/1964 |
81A 2B 81A WL D02 D05 D02 87A 82A CF SF IM TI CF LE |
Old Oak Common (New) Oxley Old Oak Common Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Stratford Immingham Tinsley Cardiff Canton Landore |
08/02/1964 28/02/1964 21/03/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 06/02/1971 01/05/1971 13/05/1972 06/10/1973 10/11/1973 12/01/1974 09/03/1974 07/12/1974 05/1977 |
|
D1716
|
|
|
47489
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/02/1964 |
2B 81A WL D02 87A 86A BS W |
Oxley (New) Old Oak Common Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Landore Cardiff Canton Bescot Withdrawn |
18/02/1964 21/03/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 13/05/1972 15/09/1973 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1717
|
47126
|
|
47555
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/02/1964 |
81A WL D02 87A 86A SF IM CD W |
Old Oak Common (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Landore Cardiff Canton Stratford Immingham Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/02/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 13/05/1972 10/11/1973 12/01/1974 15/06/1974 01/01/1999 |
01/01/1999 |
D1718
|
47127
|
|
47539
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/02/1964 |
86A 82A WL D02 87A 86A TI IM CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Landore Cardiff Canton Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
18/02/1964 11/07/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 13/05/1972 10/11/1973 12/01/1974 20/04/1974 01/09/1996 |
01/09/1996 |
D1719
|
47128
|
|
47656
|
|
|
|
47811
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1964 |
86A 82A WL D02 BR CF LA CF BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
25/02/1964 11/07/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 09/11/1974 02/1977 03/1978 15/05/1988 |
|
D1720
|
47129
|
|
47658
|
|
|
|
47813
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/03/1964 |
82A WL D02 86A BR LE BR LE BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road |
06/03/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 12/10/1974 11/10/1975 05/1977 15/05/1988 |
|
D1721
|
47130
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/03/1964 |
87E 82A WL D02 41A SF TI W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
06/03/1964 07/03/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 30/12/1972 12/01/1974 04/10/1987 04/03/1988 |
04/03/1988 |
D1722
|
47131
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/03/1964 |
82A WL D02 86A BR LE CF LE W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Withdrawn |
13/03/1964 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 12/10/1974 10/01/1976 05/1977 23/02/1987 |
23/02/1987 |
D1723
|
47132
|
|
47540
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/03/1964 |
82A WL D02 86A BR TI CD LE CD OC W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Tinsley Crewe Diesel Landore Crewe Diesel Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
17/03/1964 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 10/11/1973 03/08/1974 09/11/1974 01/05/1977 15/05/1988 01/05/1998 |
01/05/1998 |
D1724
|
47133
|
|
47549
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/03/1964 |
82A WL D02 BR GD HO YK TO SF CD W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Gateshead Holbeck (MR) York (North) Toton Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/03/1964 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 07/12/1974 11/01/1975 08/03/1975 06/09/1981 01/11/1981 15/05/1988 01/08/1991 |
01/08/1991 |
D1725
|
|
|
47490
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/03/1964 |
82A WL D02 CD W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/03/1964 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 08/05/1976 01/07/2000 |
01/07/2000 |
D1726
|
47134
|
|
47622
|
|
|
|
47841
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/03/1964 |
86A 82A WL D02 82A LE ED |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Eastfield |
24/03/1964 11/07/1965 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 12/10/1974 15/05/1988 |
|
D1727
|
47135
|
|
47664
|
|
|
|
47819
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/04/1964 |
81A 82A WL D02 40B SF BR W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Immingham Stratford Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
09/04/1964 20/02/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 24/02/1973 11/01/1975 15/05/1988 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1728
|
47136
|
|
47621
|
|
|
|
47839
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/04/1964 |
86A 87E 82A WL ML D16 D02 D05 86A 82A LE BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road |
21/04/1964 04/05/1964 21/02/1965 06/05/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 11/11/1972 05/1977 15/05/1988 |
|
D1729
|
47137
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/04/1964 |
87E 82A WL ML D16 D02 D05 86A 82A LE W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Withdrawn |
09/04/1964 07/03/1965 06/05/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 11/11/1972 05/1977 03/08/1987 |
03/08/1987 |
D1730
|
47138
|
|
47607
|
|
|
|
47821
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/04/1964 |
86A 82A WL ML D16 D02 D05 86A 82A LA BR BR TI |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Tinsley |
28/04/1964 11/07/1965 14/10/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 11/11/1972 01/1977 25/02/1978 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 |
|
D1731
|
47139
|
|
47550
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1964 |
86A 86A WL ML D16 D05 D02 ED |
Cardiff Canton (New) Cardiff Canton Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Eastfield |
16/06/1964 31/08/1967 14/10/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 30/11/1974 |
|
D1732
|
47140
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/04/1964 |
86A 87E 82A WL ML D16 D05 86A BR CF LE CF LA BR TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/04/1964 22/06/1964 07/03/1965 14/10/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 08/02/1975 10/05/1975 11/10/1975 02/1977 26/11/1977 04/10/1987 29/02/1988 |
29/02/1988 |
D1733
|
47141
|
|
47614
|
|
|
|
47853
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1964 |
81A 82A WL ML D16 D05 D02 40B ED HA ED |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Immingham Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield |
12/06/1964 14/05/1967 14/10/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 04/04/1970 06/03/1971 24/03/1973 11/05/1974 21/06/1975 29/05/1976 |
|
D1734
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/05/1964 |
82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
23/05/1964 19/03/1965 |
19/03/1965 |
D1735
|
47142
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/05/1964 |
87E 86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 CF BR CF LA BR TI W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Tinsley Withdrawn |
23/05/1964 20/07/1964 16/05/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 12/05/1973 29/06/1974 09/11/1974 02/1977 26/11/1977 04/10/1987 28/04/1998 |
28/04/1998 |
D1736
|
47143
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/04/1964 |
86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 IM ED BS CF LA CF TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Immingham Eastfield Bescot Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
22/04/1964 16/05/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 02/06/1973 11/05/1974 07/12/1974 10/1976 01/1977 10/1977 04/10/1987 01/12/1989 |
01/12/1989 |
D1737
|
47144
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/05/1964 |
86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 41A HO ED BS ED ED BS CF LA CF TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Bescot Eastfield (on loan) Eastfield (loan made permanent) Bescot Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
25/05/1964 16/05/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 13/01/1973 19/05/1973 11/05/1974 01/12/1974 02/12/1974 16/12/1974 11/01/1975 10/1976 01/1977 10/1977 04/10/1987 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1738
|
47145
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1964 |
86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 CF LA CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/05/1964 13/06/1965 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 10/1976 01/1977 10/1977 01/02/2007 |
01/02/2007 |
D1739
|
47146
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/06/1964 |
87A 86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 D05 D02 86A OC CF LE CF LE TI W |
Neath (Court Sart) (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Tinsley Withdrawn |
04/06/1964 20/07/1964 13/06/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 20/12/1969 06/02/1971 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 12/10/1974 08/02/1975 10/05/1975 04/10/1987 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1740
|
47147
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1964 |
81A 86A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 86A OC CF LE W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Withdrawn |
12/06/1964 19/06/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 10/05/1975 28/04/1998 |
28/04/1998 |
D1741
|
47148
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/06/1964 |
86A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 86A OC BR LE BR LE W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Withdrawn |
09/06/1964 11/07/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 09/11/1974 10/1976 05/1977 22/07/1987 |
22/07/1987 |
D1742
|
47149
|
|
47617
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/05/1964 |
86A 82A WL WL D05 D16 D05 D02 ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/05/1964 15/01/1966 14/10/1967 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 03/03/1979 01/01/1998 |
01/01/1998 |
D1743
|
47150
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/06/1964 |
81A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 30A TI W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
19/06/1964 15/01/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 04/11/1972 04/10/1987 31/07/2008 |
31/07/2008 |
D1744
|
47151
|
|
47648
|
|
|
|
47850
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/06/1964 |
86A 81A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 CF LE W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Landore Withdrawn |
19/06/1964 15/01/1966 15/01/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 06/02/1971 01/06/1974 08/05/1976 01/10/1995 |
01/10/1995 |
D1745
|
47152
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/07/1964 |
81A 82A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 86A LE TI W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Landore Tinsley Withdrawn |
01/07/1964 31/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 20/12/1969 09/10/1971 08/05/1976 04/10/1987 31/07/2003 |
31/07/2003 |
D1746
|
47153
|
|
47551
|
|
|
|
47801
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/07/1964 |
81A 86A WL D05 D16 D05 D02 YK BR W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division York (North) Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
03/07/1964 31/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/02/1969 20/12/1969 07/12/1974 15/05/1988 01/06/2002 |
01/06/2002 |
D1747
|
47154
|
|
47546
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/07/1964 |
81A 82A WL D05 D02 D05 D02 86A BS YK ED W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Bescot York (North) Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/07/1964 31/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/05/1969 20/12/1969 09/10/1971 24/08/1974 09/11/1974 22/01/1978 01/06/1999 |
01/06/1999 |
D1748
|
47155
|
|
47660
|
|
|
|
47815
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/07/1964 |
81A 82A WL D05 D02 D05 D02 30A BR |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stratford Bristol Bath Road |
01/07/1964 07/03/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/05/1969 06/12/1969 18/11/1972 15/05/1988 |
|
D1749
|
47156
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/07/1964 |
82A WL D05 D02 D05 D02 40B SX TI W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Immingham Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
10/07/1964 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/05/1969 06/12/1969 14/04/1973 19/05/1973 04/10/1987 31/01/2005 |
31/01/2005 |
D1750
|
47157
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/07/1964 |
82A WL D05 D02 D05 D02 D05 86A LE TI W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Landore Tinsley Withdrawn |
07/07/1964 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/05/1969 20/12/1969 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 10/05/1975 04/10/1987 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1751
|
47158
|
|
47634
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/07/1964 |
87E 82A 86A 81A 86A WL D05 D02 D05 D02 30A IM W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
14/07/1964 07/03/1965 28/03/1965 01/05/1966 30/10/1966 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/10/1969 18/12/1971 28/10/1972 10/1977 01/03/2001 |
01/03/2001 |
D1752
|
47159
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1964 |
87E 82A 86A 87E D02 CF LA BR W |
Landore (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Birmingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
21/07/1964 07/03/1965 28/03/1965 01/11/1969 14/04/1973 15/09/1973 02/1977 10/1977 17/05/1988 |
17/05/1988 |
D1753
|
|
|
47491
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1964 |
2B 87E 82A 86A 82A
CD |
Oxley (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel |
21/07/1964 12/10/1964 07/03/1965 28/03/1965 16/08/1969 05/05/1973 08/05/1976 |
|
D1754
|
47160
|
|
47605
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/08/1964 |
87E 86A 87E 86A D02 D05 D02 IM SF IM SF HA CD W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Immingham Stratford Immingham Stratford Haymarket Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
19/08/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1967 18/03/1968 14/09/1968 20/12/1969 08/01/1972 09/06/1973 11/01/1975 27/11/1977 29/01/1978 21/06/1981 22/05/1988 01/12/2003 |
01/12/2003 |
D1755
|
47161
|
|
47541
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/08/1964 |
87E 86A 87E D05 D02 D05 D02 D05 86A YK SF HA YK W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton York (North) Stratford Haymarket York (North) Withdrawn |
14/08/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1967 22/06/1968 08/02/1969 06/12/1969 20/12/1969 11/07/1970 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 27/11/1977 22/01/1978 29/01/1978 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1756
|
47162
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/09/1964 |
87E 86A 87E D05 82A 86A 87E 30A IM SF W |
Landore (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Landore Stratford Immingham Stratford Withdrawn |
04/09/1964 07/03/1965 15/01/1967 20/07/1968 04/01/1969 15/03/1969 01/11/1969 12/12/1970 10/1977 31/05/1981 14/01/1987 |
14/01/1987 |
D1757
|
47163
|
|
47610
|
|
|
|
47823
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1964 |
86A 87E D05 82A 87E 30A HA |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Stratford Haymarket |
17/09/1964 15/01/1967 27/07/1968 29/12/1968 15/03/1969 12/12/1970 21/06/1981 |
|
D1758
|
47164
|
|
47571
|
|
|
|
47822
|
|
|
57305
|
|
|
|
23/05/1964 |
41A 40B 34G 41A 31B 30A 41A 51L 30A YK |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley March Stratford Tinsley Thornaby Stratford York (North) |
23/05/1964 13/06/1964 24/10/1964 21/11/1964 09/01/1965 23/04/1966 18/05/1968 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 27/11/1977 |
|
D1759
|
47165
|
|
47590
|
|
|
|
47825
|
|
|
|
57601
|
|
|
25/08/1964 |
41A 34G 31B 30A 41A 51L 30A IM |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park March Stratford Tinsley Thornaby Stratford Immingham |
25/08/1964 14/11/1964 09/01/1965 23/04/1966 18/05/1968 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 10/1977 |
|
D1760
|
|
|
47492
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/09/1964 |
41A 31B 30A 34G 30A CE W |
Tinsley (New) March Stratford Finsbury Park Stratford Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
08/09/1964 28/11/1964 23/04/1966 08/10/1966 06/05/1972 19/05/1973 01/02/1999 |
01/02/1999 |
D1761
|
47166
|
|
47611
|
|
|
|
47837
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1964 |
41A 34G 31B 34G IM TI CF BR W |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park March Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
01/09/1964 21/11/1964 09/01/1965 29/10/1966 11/08/1973 11/05/1974 15/03/1975 15/05/1988 01/11/1991 |
01/11/1991 |
D1762
|
47167
|
|
47580
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1964 |
41A 31B 40B 34G 30A FP IM TI SF TI IM TI SF W |
Tinsley (New) March Immingham Finsbury Park Stratford Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
01/09/1964 09/01/1965 09/09/1967 12/10/1968 10/03/1973 19/05/1973 11/08/1973 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 02/05/1976 10/1977 27/11/1977 29/01/1978 01/04/2004 |
01/04/2004 |
D1763
|
47168
|
|
47572
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/09/1964 |
41A 31B 41A 31B 40B 34G D02 41A FP IM TI IM TI W |
Tinsley (New) March Tinsley March Immingham Finsbury Park Birmingham Division Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
12/09/1964 24/10/1964 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 09/09/1967 12/10/1968 08/01/1972 09/09/1972 19/05/1973 11/08/1973 11/05/1974 10/1977 27/11/1977 01/06/1999 |
01/06/1999 |
D1764
|
47169
|
|
47581
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/09/1964 |
41A 31B 34G 30A FP IM TI W |
Tinsley (New) March Finsbury Park Stratford Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/09/1964 09/01/1965 29/10/1966 10/03/1973 19/05/1973 11/08/1973 11/05/1974 01/11/2000 |
01/11/2000 |
D1765
|
47170
|
|
47582
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1964 |
41A 31B 55A 52A 34G 41A 34G 30A IM OC W |
Tinsley (New) March Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Stratford Immingham Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/10/1964 09/01/1965 19/06/1965 23/04/1966 28/10/1967 13/12/1969 21/03/1970 06/01/1973 16/05/1976 04/10/1987 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1766
|
47171
|
|
47592
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/09/1964 |
41A 55H 55A 52A 34G 41A 34G 55A 30A CF BR W |
Tinsley (New) Neville Hill Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Holbeck (MR) Stratford Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
22/09/1964 27/02/1965 27/03/1965 23/04/1966 28/10/1967 11/10/1969 21/03/1970 04/11/1972 10/03/1973 30/11/1974 04/10/1987 01/12/2000 |
01/12/2000 |
D1767
|
47172
|
|
47583
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1964 |
41A 30A 41A 55A 52A 34G 55B 41A 34G 40B 52A 40B SF IM OC W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Finsbury Park York (North) Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead Immingham Stratford Immingham Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
29/10/1964 27/02/1965 19/06/1965 10/07/1965 10/09/1966 28/10/1967 11/10/1969 15/11/1969 21/03/1970 11/07/1970 06/05/1972 24/06/1972 10/05/1975 10/1977 04/10/1987 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1768
|
47173
|
|
47573
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/10/1964 |
41A 40B 41A 30A 41A 34G 41A 34G 55B 40B 52A 40B TI W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park York (North) Immingham Gateshead Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
30/10/1964 27/02/1965 09/10/1965 30/06/1966 18/05/1968 24/05/1969 18/10/1969 21/03/1970 11/07/1970 10/10/1970 06/05/1972 10/06/1972 11/05/1974 01/05/2001 |
01/05/2001 |
D1769
|
47174
|
|
47574
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1964 |
41A 40B 41A 40B 34G 41A 51L 40B IM TI SF W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Immingham Finsbury Park Tinsley Thornaby Immingham Immingham Tinsley Stratford Withdrawn |
22/10/1964 27/02/1965 09/10/1965 30/06/1966 29/10/1966 08/06/1968 03/08/1968 02/05/1970 11/08/1973 11/05/1974 06/09/1981 01/12/1996 |
01/12/1996 |
D1770
|
47175
|
|
47575
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1964 |
41A 41A 30A 41A 51L 30A 40B 41A 40B TI BR |
Tinsley (New) Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Thornaby Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Bristol Bath Road |
05/10/1964 11/09/1965 23/04/1966 18/05/1968 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 29/05/1971 10/07/1971 02/09/1972 12/07/1975 04/10/1987 |
|
D1771
|
47176
|
|
47576
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/10/1964 |
41A 64B 41A 30A 40B 40B 41A 40B TI W |
Tinsley (New) Haymarket Tinsley Stratford Immingham Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
14/10/1964 10/07/1965 23/10/1965 14/05/1966 30/06/1966 29/05/1971 10/07/1971 04/11/1972 12/07/1975 01/11/1996 |
01/11/1996 |
D1772
|
47177
|
|
47599
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1964 |
41A 30A 41A IM TI TI W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Tinsley Withdrawn |
05/10/1964 23/04/1966 29/05/1971 09/03/1974 02/05/1976 15/05/1988 01/08/1995 |
01/08/1995 |
D1773
|
47178
|
|
47588
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/09/1965 |
41A 41A 34G 41A 34G 40B 41A SF BS W |
Tinsley
Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Stratford Bescot Withdrawn |
15/09/1965 02/10/1965 29/01/1966 16/04/1966 08/10/1966 01/11/1969 21/03/1970 11/07/1970 10/07/1971 12/01/1974 07/12/1974 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1774
|
47179
|
|
47577
|
|
|
|
47847
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/10/1964 |
41A 30A 55A 30A HO KY |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Knottingley |
19/10/1964 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 07/10/1972 01/02/1976 29/02/1976 |
|
D1775
|
47180
|
|
47584
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/10/1964 |
41A 34G 40B 52A 30A IM TI IM TI BR W |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
23/10/1964 28/10/1967 01/11/1969 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 08/03/1975 02/05/1976 05/1977 27/11/1977 04/10/1987 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1776
|
47181
|
|
47578
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1964 |
41A 34G 30A 55A 30A IM TI IM TI |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park Stratford Holbeck (MR) Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley |
22/10/1964 29/01/1966 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 02/05/1976 05/1977 27/11/1977 |
|
D1777
|
47182
|
|
47598
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/11/1964 |
41A 30A 55A 30A CD TO W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Stratford Crewe Diesel Toton Withdrawn |
06/11/1964 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 07/10/1972 12/10/1974 07/1981 01/11/2001 |
01/11/2001 |
D1778
|
47183
|
|
47579
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/10/1964 |
41A 30A 55A 40B TI IM YK W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Immingham Tinsley Immingham York (North) Withdrawn |
23/10/1964 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 07/10/1972 06/10/1973 09/03/1974 27/11/1977 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1779
|
47184
|
|
47585
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1964 |
41A 30A 41A FP W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Tinsley Finsbury Park Withdrawn |
29/10/1964 23/04/1966 09/10/1971 19/05/1973 01/02/2004 |
01/02/2004 |
D1780
|
47185
|
|
47602
|
|
|
|
47824
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/10/1964 |
41A 30A 55A 30A BR LE CF CD W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Stratford Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
30/10/1964 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 10/03/1973 10/11/1973 13/07/1974 20/07/1974 15/05/1988 01/09/2003 |
01/09/2003 |
D1781
|
47186
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1964 |
41A 30A 55A 30A CF W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Holbeck (MR) Stratford Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
07/11/1964 23/04/1966 08/05/1971 10/03/1973 10/11/1973 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1782
|
|
47301
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1964 |
41A 30A 40B 41A 40B 55G SF TI W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Knottingley Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
14/11/1964 23/04/1966 30/06/1966 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 23/01/1971 06/09/1981 01/11/1981 31/01/2003 |
31/01/2003 |
D1783
|
|
47302
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/11/1964 |
41A 40B 41A 40B 41A 55G IM W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Knottingley Immingham Withdrawn |
14/11/1964 30/06/1966 09/11/1968 11/07/1970 07/11/1970 10/03/1973 04/10/1981 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1784
|
|
47303
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/11/1964 |
41A 40B 41A IM W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
07/11/1964 30/06/1966 09/11/1968 09/11/1975 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1785
|
|
47304
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/12/1964 |
41A 40B 41A 51L 41A KY SF IM W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Thornaby Tinsley Knottingley Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
09/12/1964 30/06/1966 09/11/1968 08/03/1969 01/08/1970 29/02/1976 06/09/1981 01/11/1981 16/06/2000 |
16/06/2000 |
D1786
|
|
47305
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/11/1964 |
41A 40B TI W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
26/11/1964 30/06/1966 07/07/1973 31/01/2003 |
31/01/2003 |
D1787
|
|
47306
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/11/1964 |
41A 41A 40B 40B CE IM TO TI W |
Tinsley (New) Tinsley Immingham Immingham Crewe Diesel Immingham Toton Tinsley Withdrawn |
26/11/1964 07/05/1966 30/06/1966 12/08/1967 02/06/1973 06/07/1974 07/06/1975 04/10/1987 31/05/2006 |
31/05/2006 |
D1788
|
|
47307
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/12/1964 |
41A 50A 41A 51L 41A IM TI IM W |
Tinsley (New) York (North) Tinsley Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
09/12/1964 07/05/1966 16/07/1966 08/03/1969 01/08/1970 11/10/1975 09/11/1975 30/11/1979 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1789
|
|
47308
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/11/1964 |
41A 51L 55G W |
Tinsley (New) Thornaby Knottingley Withdrawn |
27/11/1964 08/03/1969 30/10/1971 31/01/2004 |
31/01/2004 |
D1790
|
|
47309
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1964 |
41A 51L 55G TI W |
Tinsley (New) Thornaby Knottingley Tinsley Withdrawn |
10/12/1964 12/10/1968 30/10/1971 04/10/1987 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1791
|
|
47310
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1964 |
41A 50A 41A 40B 51L 41A 55G W |
Tinsley (New) York (North) Tinsley Immingham Thornaby Tinsley Knottingley Withdrawn |
10/12/1964 07/05/1966 16/07/1966 11/07/1970 08/01/1972 06/05/1972 10/03/1973 28/02/2004 |
28/02/2004 |
D1792
|
|
47311
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1965 |
41A 30A 51L TI IM W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
14/01/1965 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 12/01/1974 11/10/1975 22/11/1991 |
22/11/1991 |
D1793
|
|
47312
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1964 |
41A IM W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Withdrawn |
11/12/1964 11/10/1975 28/02/2003 |
28/02/2003 |
D1794
|
|
47313
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1964 |
41A D16 41A TE W |
Tinsley (New) Nottingham Division Tinsley Thornaby Withdrawn |
11/12/1964 07/01/1967 04/02/1967 10/1977 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1795
|
|
47314
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/01/1965 |
41A 30A 51L 41A CD TI W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Thornaby Tinsley Crewe Diesel Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/01/1965 18/05/1968 31/01/1970 06/05/1972 25/05/1974 03/08/1974 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1796
|
|
47315
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/01/1965 |
41A 30A 51L 41A TO TO |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Thornaby Tinsley Toton Toton |
08/01/1965 18/05/1968 31/01/1970 06/05/1972 25/05/1974 11/1981 |
|
D1797
|
|
47316
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B 51L 30A 51L TI W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Thornaby Stratford Thornaby Tinsley Withdrawn |
06/01/1965 11/12/1965 29/01/1966 12/10/1968 03/05/1969 21/06/1969 19/05/1973 31/12/2007 |
31/12/2007 |
D1798
|
|
47317
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57003
|
|
|
|
|
29/01/1965 |
41A 41C 41A D16 41A 30A TI ED HA BR CF BS CD |
Tinsley (New) Wath Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Stratford Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bescot Crewe Diesel |
29/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 04/02/1967 04/03/1967 18/05/1968 19/05/1973 11/05/1974 21/06/1975 24/07/1976 07/08/1976 10/1976 11/1981 |
|
D1799
|
|
47318
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1965 |
41A 41C 41A 30A 51L TI ED HA CF BS CD W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Tinsley Stratford Thornaby Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Cardiff Canton Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
21/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 18/05/1968 31/01/1970 19/05/1973 11/05/1974 21/06/1975 07/08/1976 10/1976 11/1981 30/07/1993 |
30/07/1993 |
D1800
|
|
47319
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1965 |
41A 41C 41A 40B ED KY W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Tinsley Immingham Eastfield Knottingley Withdrawn |
14/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 04/06/1966 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 14/07/2000 |
14/07/2000 |
D1801
|
|
47320
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 WL D05 41A D05 D05 D02 D16 TO W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Tinsley Stoke Division (on loan) Stoke Division (loan made permanent) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Toton Withdrawn |
14/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 28/12/1968 03/08/1969 10/08/1969 09/05/1970 11/07/1970 11/1981 10/08/1993 |
10/08/1993 |
D1802
|
|
47321
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 WL D05 41A D05 D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Tinsley Stoke Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
22/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 28/12/1968 06/12/1969 11/07/1970 22/09/1995 |
22/09/1995 |
D1803
|
|
47322
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57002
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 WL D05 41A D05 D16 |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Tinsley Stoke Division Nottingham Division |
21/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 28/12/1968 11/10/1969 11/07/1970 |
|
D1804
|
|
47323
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/02/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 WL D05 D16 D05 D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
16/02/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 20/12/1969 09/05/1970 30/06/2003 |
30/06/2003 |
D1805
|
|
47324
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 WL D05 D16 BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Bescot Withdrawn |
21/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 15/02/1969 11/1981 17/07/1992 |
17/07/1992 |
D1806
|
|
47325
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/01/1965 |
41A 41C 40B D16 ML WL D05 D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Immingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
26/01/1965 11/12/1965 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 07/03/1996 |
07/03/1996 |
D1807
|
|
47326
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 CF W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
25/01/1965 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 04/10/1987 31/08/2006 |
31/08/2006 |
D1808
|
|
47327
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 CF W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
30/01/1965 07/01/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 15/02/1969 04/10/1987 19/02/1993 |
19/02/1993 |
D1809
|
|
47328
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/01/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
27/01/1965 18/11/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 15/02/1969 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1810
|
|
47329
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57011
|
|
|
|
|
09/02/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 IM |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Immingham |
09/02/1965 18/11/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/11/1969 15/05/1988 |
|
D1811
|
|
47330
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57312
|
|
|
|
09/02/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 D02 TO |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Toton |
09/02/1965 09/12/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/11/1969 08/05/1971 07/07/1973 |
|
D1812
|
|
47331
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/02/1965 |
D16 ML WL D05 D16 D02 D02 TO IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Birmingham Division Toton Immingham Withdrawn |
02/02/1965 09/12/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 10/10/1970 08/05/1971 07/07/1973 15/05/1988 31/07/2005 |
31/07/2005 |
D1813
|
|
47332
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57007
|
|
|
|
|
22/02/1965 |
D16 5A 2E WL ML D16 ML WL D05 D16 D02 TO BS TO BS IM |
Nottingham Division (New) Crewe North Saltley Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Toton Bescot Toton Bescot Immingham |
22/02/1965 27/02/1965 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 30/09/1967 09/12/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 15/03/1969 10/10/1970 07/07/1973 12/01/1974 11/10/1975 08/11/1975 15/05/1988 |
|
D1814
|
|
47333
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1965 |
D16 2E WL ML D16 ML WL D05 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Saltley Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
25/02/1965 08/05/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 30/09/1967 09/12/1967 16/03/1968 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 21/01/2000 |
21/01/2000 |
D1815
|
|
47334
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/02/1965 |
D16 5A 2E WL ML D16 WL D05 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Crewe North Saltley Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
18/02/1965 27/02/1965 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 30/09/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1816
|
|
47335
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/02/1965 |
D16 WL D05 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
09/02/1965 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1817
|
|
47336
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/03/1965 |
D16 D05 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
01/03/1965 14/09/1968 06/12/1969 28/06/1993 |
28/06/1993 |
D1818
|
|
47337
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57602
|
|
|
18/02/1965 |
D16 D05 D02 D05 CD TI |
Nottingham Division (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Tinsley |
18/02/1965 14/09/1968 06/12/1969 08/07/1972 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 |
|
D1819
|
|
47338
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
D16 D02 D05 CD TI W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Tinsley Withdrawn |
12/02/1965 14/09/1968 06/11/1971 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 30/04/2007 |
30/04/2007 |
D1820
|
|
47339
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/02/1965 |
D16 D05 D02 D05 CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/02/1965 12/10/1968 06/12/1969 06/11/1971 04/10/1987 21/01/2000 |
21/01/2000 |
D1821
|
|
47340
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1965 |
D16 D05 D02 D16 D05 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
10/03/1965 23/11/1968 06/12/1969 11/07/1970 06/11/1971 01/06/1998 |
01/06/1998 |
D1822
|
|
47341
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D05 D16 D02 D16 D02 D05 BS |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Bescot |
05/03/1965 07/01/1967 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 15/02/1969 12/07/1969 11/07/1970 10/10/1970 06/11/1971 10/1976 |
|
D1823
|
|
47342
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D05 D16 D02 D05 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
05/03/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 15/02/1969 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 25/11/1988 |
25/11/1988 |
D1824
|
|
47343
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D02 D05 TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Toton Withdrawn |
10/03/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 10/11/1973 29/06/1992 |
29/06/1992 |
D1825
|
|
47344
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/03/1965 |
D16 ML D16 CE TO CD CD IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Immingham Withdrawn |
22/03/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 11/08/1973 08/06/1974 10/1976 15/05/1988 01/07/1999 |
01/07/1999 |
D1826
|
|
47345
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/03/1965 |
D16 D15 D16 ML D16 CE TO CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/03/1965 20/03/1965 17/04/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 11/08/1973 09/03/1974 30/06/2006 |
30/06/2006 |
D1827
|
|
47346
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/03/1965 |
D16 CE TO CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
18/03/1965 02/06/1973 11/08/1973 09/03/1974 28/01/1998 |
28/01/1998 |
D1828
|
|
47347
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57004
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1965 |
D16 D15 D16 D14 D16 CE TO CD |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division Nottingham Division London (Midland) Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel |
10/03/1965 02/10/1965 18/12/1965 18/12/1965 05/02/1966 02/06/1973 13/10/1973 09/02/1974 |
|
D1829
|
|
47348
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1965 |
D16 CE TO CD IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Immingham Withdrawn |
05/03/1965 12/05/1973 10/11/1973 09/02/1974 15/05/1988 30/11/2006 |
30/11/2006 |
D1830
|
|
47349
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57603
|
|
|
18/03/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D05 D16 D05 D16 CE |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel |
18/03/1965 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/01/1970 11/07/1970 22/07/1972 10/02/1973 12/05/1973 |
|
D1831
|
|
47350
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57005
|
|
|
|
|
27/04/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D05 D16 D05 |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division |
27/04/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 07/01/1970 07/11/1970 08/07/1972 |
|
D1832
|
|
47351
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/04/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D05 D16 D05 |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division |
07/04/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 25/04/1970 23/01/1971 06/05/1972 |
|
D1833
|
|
47352
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/04/1965 |
D16 ML D16 41A 40B D05 D02 D05 D16 D05 TO CD IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Tinsley Immingham Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Toton Crewe Diesel Immingham Withdrawn |
27/04/1965 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 28/12/1968 06/12/1969 23/01/1971 09/10/1971 06/11/1971 06/05/1972 28/02/1976 10/1976 15/05/1988 14/07/2000 |
14/07/2000 |
D1834
|
|
47353
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/03/1965 |
D16 2E WL ML D16 D05 D16 D05 CW CD TO CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Saltley Western Lines (LMR) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
31/03/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 15/03/1969 06/11/1971 05/02/1972 11/05/1974 10/01/1976 28/02/1976 10/1976 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1835
|
|
47354
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/04/1965 |
D16 ML D16 ML D16 D05 CD CD CW TO CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Stoke Division Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
30/04/1965 08/10/1966 11/03/1967 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 15/03/1969 06/10/1973 09/03/1974 11/05/1974 10/1976 11/1978 31/03/2003 |
31/03/2003 |
D1836
|
|
47355
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/04/1965 |
D16 87E D16 ML D16 ML D16 40B D05 CD TO CD |
Nottingham Division (New) Landore (on loan) Nottingham Division (returned from loan) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Immingham Stoke Division Cricklewood East Toton Crewe Diesel |
07/04/1965 05/06/1965 18/09/1965 08/10/1966 11/03/1967 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 06/12/1969 13/10/1973 10/05/1975 11/1978 |
|
D1837
|
47187
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57006
|
|
|
|
|
04/05/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 TO |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Toton |
04/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 10/1976 |
|
D1838
|
47188
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/05/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 TO TO W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Toton Toton Withdrawn |
10/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 10/1976 07/1981 31/08/2005 |
31/08/2005 |
D1839
|
47189
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/04/1965 |
5A WL D05 D02 D05 TO TO
W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Toton Toton
Withdrawn |
21/04/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/07/1968 23/11/1968 10/1976 07/1981 17/05/1988 16/03/1989 |
16/03/1989 |
D1840
|
47190
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 D02 D05 W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
29/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/07/1968 23/11/1968 11/11/1994 |
11/11/1994 |
D1841
|
47191
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/04/1965 |
5A WL D05 D02 D05 W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
27/04/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/07/1968 23/11/1968 25/06/1987 |
25/06/1987 |
D1842
|
47192
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/05/1965 |
5A WL D05 D02 D05 W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Withdrawn |
14/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/07/1968 20/07/1968 18/05/1988 |
18/05/1988 |
D1843
|
47193
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/05/1965 |
5A WL D05 W |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Withdrawn |
21/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1844
|
47194
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/05/1965 |
5A WL D05 |
Crewe North (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division |
22/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 |
|
D1845
|
47195
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/05/1965 |
5A WL D05 W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Withdrawn |
26/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 |
D1846
|
47196
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/05/1965 |
5A WL D05 W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Withdrawn |
29/05/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 24/02/1994 |
24/02/1994 |
D1847
|
47197
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 ED CD CF W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Eastfield Crewe Diesel Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
05/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 11/05/1974 18/05/1974 12/06/1988 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1848
|
47198
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 CF W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
05/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/06/1988 20/04/1989 |
20/04/1989 |
D1849
|
47199
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 TO CD W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
12/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 28/02/1976 20/07/1987 |
20/07/1987 |
D1850
|
47200
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 TO BS CD W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Toton Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
19/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 10/1976 04/10/1987 31/12/2007 |
31/12/2007 |
D1851
|
47201
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1965 |
5A WL D05 TO BS CW CD W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Toton Bescot Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
12/06/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 08/11/1975 10/1976 04/10/1987 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1852
|
47202
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/07/1965 |
5A WL D05 TO BS CW W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Toton Bescot Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
25/07/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 02/06/1973 12/10/1974 10/1976 25/03/1987 |
25/03/1987 |
D1853
|
47203
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/07/1965 |
5A WL D05 D01 D05 D01 BS CW CD W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division London Division Stoke Division London Division Bescot Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
26/07/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 09/09/1972 11/11/1972 12/10/1974 28/02/1976 04/10/1987 27/03/1989 |
27/03/1989 |
D1854
|
47204
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57012
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1965 |
5A WL D05 D16 D01 CD TO CD |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel |
02/07/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 07/01/1970 06/05/1972 10/1976 26/02/1978 04/10/1987 |
|
D1855
|
47205
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/08/1965 |
5A WL D05 D16 D01 CD CW CD TO CD W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 07/01/1970 06/05/1972 12/01/1974 11/05/1974 28/02/1976 26/02/1978 04/10/1987 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1856
|
47206
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57605
|
|
|
06/08/1965 |
5A WL D05 D16 D01 CE ED |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Crewe Diesel Eastfield |
06/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 07/01/1970 06/05/1972 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 |
|
D1857
|
47207
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/08/1965 |
5A WL D05 D16 D05 D16 D05 ED HA ED TI W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
06/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 10/01/1970 11/04/1970 09/05/1970 03/04/1971 11/05/1974 21/06/1975 07/02/1976 04/10/1987 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1858
|
47208
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/08/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 D16 D05 ED HA ED
W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield
Withdrawn |
13/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 09/10/1971 11/05/1974 21/06/1975 29/05/1976 31/10/1979 27/01/1980 |
27/01/1980 |
D1859
|
47209
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57604
|
|
|
21/08/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 D16 D01 D05 91W CD IM HA TI |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Stoke Division To Western Region / GWR Crewe Diesel Immingham Haymarket Tinsley |
21/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 03/04/1971 21/08/1971 23/02/1974 02/03/1974 20/04/1974 21/06/1981 04/10/1987 |
|
D1860
|
47210
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/08/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 D16 D01 D05 ED |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Stoke Division Eastfield |
28/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 24/07/1971 09/09/1972 11/05/1974 |
|
D1861
|
47211
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/08/1965 |
5A WL D02 D05 D16 D05 ED TI W |
Crewe Diesel (New) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/08/1965 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 09/10/1971 11/05/1974 04/10/1987 31/05/2003 |
31/05/2003 |
D1862
|
47212
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/05/1965 |
41A 40B 55A 41A 40B TE W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Immingham Thornaby Withdrawn |
13/05/1965 09/09/1967 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 26/07/1981 31/01/2004 |
31/01/2004 |
D1863
|
47213
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/06/1965 |
41A 40B 55A 41A 40B GD TI W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Immingham Gateshead Tinsley Withdrawn |
11/06/1965 09/09/1967 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 10/01/1970 04/10/1981 04/10/1987 31/08/2005 |
31/08/2005 |
D1864
|
47214
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/05/1965 |
41A 40B 55A 40B CD W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Holbeck (MR) Immingham Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/05/1965 09/09/1967 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 12/10/1974 11/11/1994 |
11/11/1994 |
D1865
|
47215
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
41A 34G 40B 55A 40B GD TI W |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Holbeck (MR) Immingham Gateshead Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/05/1965 25/11/1967 04/10/1969 11/10/1969 06/12/1969 04/10/1981 04/10/1987 01/03/1991 |
01/03/1991 |
D1866
|
47299
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
41A 30A 34G 40B IM W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Finsbury Park Immingham Immingham Withdrawn |
28/05/1965 07/01/1967 25/11/1967 27/09/1969 04/10/1981 01/04/1999 |
01/04/1999 |
D1867
|
47217
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1965 |
41A 34G 41A 34G 40B GD W |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead Withdrawn |
02/07/1965 10/12/1966 07/01/1967 03/06/1967 11/10/1969 04/10/1981 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1868
|
47218
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
41A 51L 52A 52A 55A 41A 34G 41A 34G 41A 34G 40B |
Tinsley (New) Thornaby Gateshead Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham |
28/05/1965 25/09/1965 02/10/1965 09/10/1965 29/01/1966 19/02/1966 05/03/1966 16/04/1966 10/12/1966 25/02/1967 03/06/1967 23/08/1969 |
|
D1869
|
47219
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/06/1965 |
41A 40B W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Withdrawn |
17/06/1965 09/09/1967 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1870
|
47220
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/06/1965 |
41A 40B TI W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
11/06/1965 09/09/1967 04/10/1987 02/07/1993 |
02/07/1993 |
D1871
|
47221
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1965 |
41A 40B 34G 40B TE |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Finsbury Park Immingham Thornaby |
18/06/1965 09/09/1967 17/05/1969 16/08/1969 26/07/1981 |
|
D1872
|
47222
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/06/1965 |
41A 55A 41A 34G 40B 30A 40B W |
Tinsley (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
17/06/1965 19/02/1966 19/03/1966 25/11/1967 01/11/1969 31/01/1970 29/05/1971 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1873
|
47223
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
41A 55A 41A 34G 40B 30A 40B W |
Tinsley (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Finsbury Park Immingham Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
28/05/1965 19/03/1966 23/04/1966 25/11/1967 23/08/1969 31/01/1970 29/05/1971 31/01/2005 |
31/01/2005 |
D1874
|
47224
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1965 |
41A 34G 40B 30A 40B W |
Tinsley (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
18/06/1965 21/05/1966 27/09/1969 31/01/1970 29/05/1971 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1875
|
|
47356
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57001
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1965 |
40B 41A 40B CE TO CD |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel |
02/07/1965 09/10/1965 28/03/1970 12/05/1973 10/05/1975 11/1978 |
|
D1876
|
|
47357
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1965 |
41A 40B CE TO W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Crewe Diesel Toton Withdrawn |
18/06/1965 28/03/1970 12/05/1973 10/05/1975 11/05/2001 |
11/05/2001 |
D1877
|
|
47358
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/06/1965 |
41A 40B CE W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
11/06/1965 28/03/1970 12/05/1973 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1878
|
|
47359
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/06/1965 |
41A 40B 55G TE ED CD TO CD TO CF W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Knottingley Thornaby Eastfield Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Toton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/06/1965 28/03/1970 27/02/1971 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 30/11/1974 11/10/1975 10/1976 06/1977 15/05/1988 28/01/1998 |
28/01/1998 |
D1879
|
|
47360
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/07/1965 |
40B 41A 51L ED TE W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Thornaby Eastfield Thornaby Withdrawn |
07/07/1965 09/10/1965 02/05/1970 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1880
|
|
47361
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/02/1966 |
41A 51L 41A 40B TE W |
Tinsley (New) Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Thornaby Withdrawn |
10/02/1966 12/10/1968 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 06/10/1973 31/08/2004 |
31/08/2004 |
D1881
|
|
47362
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1965 |
41A 51L 41A 40B TE |
Tinsley (New) Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Thornaby |
18/06/1965 12/10/1968 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 06/10/1973 |
|
D1882
|
|
47363
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1965 |
40B 41A 40B 41A 40B TE TE W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Thornaby Thornaby Withdrawn |
02/07/1965 09/10/1965 12/10/1968 08/07/1972 07/10/1972 06/10/1973 21/06/1981 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1883
|
|
47364
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
40B 51L 41A 40B CE TO W |
Immingham (New) Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Toton Withdrawn |
09/07/1965 11/10/1969 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 11/10/1975 01/12/1998 |
01/12/1998 |
D1884
|
|
47365
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1965 |
40B 51L 41A 40B CE TO SF |
Immingham (New) Thornaby Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Toton Stratford |
06/07/1965 11/10/1969 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 11/10/1975 04/09/1988 |
|
D1885
|
|
47366
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
40B 30A 32A 40B 41A 40B TI CD TO SF W |
Immingham (New) Stratford Norwich Thorpe Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Crewe Diesel Toton Stratford Withdrawn |
09/07/1965 29/01/1966 26/03/1966 23/04/1966 09/09/1967 12/10/1968 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 11/10/1975 15/05/1988 28/01/1999 |
28/01/1999 |
D1886
|
|
47367
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/08/1965 |
40B 41A 40B CE W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
26/08/1965 09/09/1967 18/04/1970 12/05/1973 31/12/2002 |
31/12/2002 |
D1887
|
|
47368
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/08/1965 |
40B 41A 40B TI CD TI TE CD W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Crewe Diesel Tinsley Thornaby Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/08/1965 09/09/1967 07/10/1972 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 25/05/1974 06/1977 12/06/1988 31/10/2007 |
31/10/2007 |
D1888
|
|
47369
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/07/1965 |
41A 30A 40B CD TO CD CD TO |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Immingham Crewe Diesel Toton Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Toton |
30/07/1965 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 11/05/1974 11/10/1975 10/07/1976 10/1976 06/1977 |
|
D1889
|
|
47370
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/07/1965 |
41A 52A 51L 51L 41A 30A 40B W |
Tinsley (New) Gateshead Thornaby Thornaby Tinsley Stratford Immingham Withdrawn |
23/07/1965 24/07/1965 02/10/1965 09/10/1965 06/11/1965 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 01/01/2003 |
01/01/2003 |
D1890
|
|
47371
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57313
|
|
|
|
23/07/1965 |
41A 55G |
Tinsley (New) Huddersfield Hillhouse |
23/07/1965 25/11/1967 |
|
D1891
|
|
47372
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57314
|
|
|
|
06/08/1965 |
41A 91M 41A 56A 56A HM |
Tinsley (New) To London Midland Region Tinsley Knottingley (on loan) Knottingley (loan made permanent) Healey Mills |
06/08/1965 04/03/1967 18/03/1967 25/11/1967 25/11/1967 08/1979 |
|
D1892
|
|
47373
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/08/1965 |
41A D16 41A 55G W |
Tinsley (New) Nottingham Division Tinsley Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
06/08/1965 11/03/1967 29/04/1967 25/11/1967 05/06/1992 |
05/06/1992 |
D1893
|
|
47374
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/08/1965 |
40B 41A 55G W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
13/08/1965 04/06/1966 25/11/1967 31/07/1992 |
31/07/1992 |
D1894
|
|
47375
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
40B 41A 55A 55A 55A 41A 55A 56A 51L D05 51L KY |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Wakefield Thornaby Stoke Division Thornaby Knottingley |
03/12/1965 11/12/1965 12/02/1966 26/02/1966 26/03/1966 07/05/1966 16/07/1966 25/03/1967 30/10/1971 20/05/1972 08/07/1972 11/05/1974 |
|
D1895
|
|
47376
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1965 |
41A 55A 55A 55A 56A 51L KY TI W |
Tinsley (New) Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Wakefield Thornaby Knottingley Tinsley Withdrawn |
01/09/1965 12/02/1966 26/02/1966 26/03/1966 25/03/1967 30/10/1971 10/05/1975 15/05/1988 31/12/2002 |
31/12/2002 |
D1896
|
|
47377
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/09/1965 |
41A 30A 40B TI CF TI W |
Tinsley (New) Stratford Immingham Tinsley Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
07/09/1965 12/10/1968 31/01/1970 06/10/1973 10/11/1973 15/05/1988 31/07/2003 |
31/07/2003 |
D1897
|
|
47378
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/09/1965 |
41A 40B TI CF BS CF TI W |
Tinsley (New) Immingham Tinsley Cardiff Canton Bescot Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
02/09/1965 11/07/1970 06/10/1973 10/11/1973 10/1976 27/11/1976 15/05/1988 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1898
|
|
47379
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/08/1965 |
40B 41A 40B W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
24/08/1965 09/09/1967 11/07/1970 14/01/2000 |
14/01/2000 |
D1899
|
|
47380
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/08/1965 |
40B 41A 40B TI TO TI IM W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Toton Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
26/08/1965 09/09/1967 11/07/1970 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 25/05/1974 02/1977 30/07/1992 |
30/07/1992 |
D1900
|
|
47381
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/09/1965 |
40B 41A TO W |
Immingham (New) Tinsley Toton Withdrawn |
02/09/1965 09/09/1967 11/05/1974 05/06/1992 |
05/06/1992 |
D1901
|
47225
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57307
|
|
|
|
20/09/1965 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) |
20/09/1965 |
|
D1902
|
47226
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/10/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
06/10/1965 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1903
|
47227
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1965 |
86A CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
09/09/1965 10/1976 06/05/1993 |
06/05/1993 |
D1904
|
47228
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1965 |
86A D05 W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Stoke Division Withdrawn |
09/09/1965 13/05/1972 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1905
|
47229
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/09/1965 |
86A D02 D05 CF BS W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bescot Withdrawn |
23/09/1965 10/06/1972 08/07/1972 29/06/1974 27/11/1976 31/12/2006 |
31/12/2006 |
D1906
|
47230
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/10/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
07/10/1965 14/01/1987 |
14/01/1987 |
D1907
|
47231
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57010
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1965 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) |
17/09/1965 |
|
D1908
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/10/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
07/10/1965 12/08/1969 |
12/08/1969 |
D1909
|
47232
|
|
47665
|
|
|
|
47820
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/10/1965 |
86A BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
19/10/1965 15/05/1988 01/09/2003 |
01/09/2003 |
D1910
|
47233
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
22/10/1965 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 |
D1911
|
47234
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57315
|
|
|
|
26/10/1965 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) |
26/10/1965 |
|
D1912
|
47235
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/10/1965 |
86A TI W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
26/10/1965 04/10/1987 25/11/1988 |
25/11/1988 |
D1913
|
47236
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/10/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
28/10/1965 31/05/2006 |
31/05/2006 |
D1914
|
47237
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/11/1965 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) |
01/11/1965 |
|
D1915
|
47238
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
86A D05 CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
03/12/1965 14/10/1972 12/10/1974 05/10/2001 |
05/10/2001 |
D1916
|
47239
|
|
47657
|
|
|
|
47812
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/11/1965 |
86A BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road |
18/11/1965 15/05/1988 |
|
D1917
|
47240
|
|
47663
|
|
|
|
47818
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
86A BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road |
03/12/1965 15/05/1988 |
|
D1918
|
47241
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/11/1965 |
86A D05 CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
16/11/1965 22/07/1972 12/10/1974 30/06/2005 |
30/06/2005 |
D1919
|
47242
|
|
47659
|
|
|
|
47814
|
|
|
57306
|
|
|
|
22/11/1965 |
86A D05 CF BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
22/11/1965 19/08/1972 12/10/1974 15/05/1988 |
|
D1920
|
47243
|
|
47636
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/11/1965 |
86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Withdrawn |
30/11/1965 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1921
|
47244
|
|
47640
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
86A 70D 86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton |
03/12/1965 17/10/1966 27/07/1968 |
|
D1922
|
47245
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/12/1965 |
86A 70D 86A |
Cardiff Canton (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton |
09/12/1965 17/10/1966 09/09/1968 |
|
D1923
|
47246
|
|
47644
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/12/1965 |
86A 70D 86A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
16/12/1965 19/09/1966 27/07/1968 29/07/1968 01/10/2003 |
01/10/2003 |
D1924
|
47247
|
|
47655
|
|
|
|
47810
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/12/1965 |
86A 70D 86A 86A BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
20/12/1965 09/01/1967 27/07/1968 29/07/1968 15/05/1988 |
|
D1925
|
47248
|
|
47616
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/12/1965 |
82A 70D 86A 86A BR W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
22/12/1965 09/01/1967 09/12/1968 25/01/1969 04/10/1987 01/01/2004 |
01/01/2004 |
D1926
|
47249
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/01/1966 |
82A 70D 86A 86A CD BS CF BS CF TI W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Eastleigh Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Bescot Cardiff Canton Bescot Cardiff Canton Tinsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1966 09/01/1967 09/12/1968 25/01/1969 14/06/1975 08/05/1976 10/07/1976 07/08/1976 01/05/1977 04/10/1987 07/03/1996 |
07/03/1996 |
D1927
|
47250
|
|
47600
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/01/1966 |
82A 86A BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
31/01/1966 09/11/1968 04/10/1987 |
|
D1928
|
47251
|
|
47589
|
|
|
|
47827
|
|
|
57302
|
|
|
|
21/01/1966 |
82A 86A BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
21/01/1966 13/05/1972 04/10/1987 |
|
D1929
|
47252
|
|
47615
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/02/1966 |
82A BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Bristol Bath Road |
07/02/1966 04/10/1987 |
|
D1930
|
47253
|
|
47530
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/02/1966 |
82A 86A LE CD W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
12/02/1966 12/08/1972 24/11/1973 05/1977 01/11/1996 |
01/11/1996 |
D1931
|
47254
|
|
47651
|
|
|
|
47806
|
|
|
57309
|
|
|
|
21/02/1966 |
82A 86A BR BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road |
21/02/1966 19/08/1972 05/01/1981 15/05/1988 |
|
D1932
|
|
|
47493
|
|
47701
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/02/1966 |
82A LE BR HA ED W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Landore Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
24/02/1966 11/05/1974 05/1977 06/1977 04/10/1987 01/12/2003 |
01/12/2003 |
D1933
|
47255
|
|
47596
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/03/1966 |
82A D02 TI GD HO SF SF BR W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Birmingham Division Tinsley Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Stratford Stratford Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
02/03/1966 16/09/1972 07/07/1973 11/01/1975 08/03/1975 01/02/1976 21/06/1981 04/10/1987 01/04/1999 |
01/04/1999 |
D1934
|
47256
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/03/1966 |
82A 86A CF W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
18/03/1966 09/11/1968 04/10/1987 28/01/1999 |
28/01/1999 |
D1935
|
47257
|
|
47650
|
|
|
|
47805
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/03/1966 |
82A 86A BR |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road |
18/03/1966 30/09/1972 15/05/1988 |
|
D1936
|
|
|
47494
|
|
47706
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/03/1966 |
86A 82A 52A 82A LE BR HA ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Gateshead Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
26/03/1966 16/10/1971 08/01/1972 08/07/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 06/1977 04/10/1987 01/04/1995 |
01/04/1995 |
D1937
|
|
|
47495
|
|
47704
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/04/1966 |
86A 82A LE BR ED W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/04/1966 09/11/1968 11/05/1974 05/1977 04/10/1987 01/05/1997 |
01/05/1997 |
D1938
|
47258
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/04/1966 |
86A 82A LE CF W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Landore Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
27/04/1966 09/11/1968 12/10/1974 21/12/1974 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1939
|
|
|
47496
|
|
47710
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/04/1966 |
WL D05 D16 D05 D02 87A BR ED W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/04/1966 17/06/1968 15/03/1969 04/04/1970 06/11/1971 03/02/1973 05/1977 04/10/1987 01/06/1999 |
01/06/1999 |
D1940
|
|
|
47497
|
|
47717
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1966 |
WL D16 WL D05 D02 82A LE BR CD W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
16/06/1966 18/06/1966 23/07/1966 17/06/1968 06/11/1971 10/06/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 15/05/1988 01/09/1996 |
01/09/1996 |
D1941
|
|
|
47498
|
|
47711
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/07/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D02 82A LE BR ED W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield Withdrawn |
27/07/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 06/11/1971 13/05/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 04/10/1987 01/06/2000 |
01/06/2000 |
D1942
|
|
|
47499
|
|
47709
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1966 |
WL D16 WL D02 D05 D02 82A LE BR ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Nottingham Division (on loan) Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Eastfield |
16/06/1966 16/06/1966 16/07/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 06/11/1971 30/09/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 04/10/1987 |
|
D1943
|
|
|
47500
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/06/1966 |
WL D02 D16 D02 D05 D02 87A BR LE OC BR |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road |
27/06/1966 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 15/03/1969 06/12/1969 13/05/1972 31/03/1973 05/1977 26/11/1977 03/1978 15/05/1988 |
|
D1944
|
|
|
47501
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D02 |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division |
29/06/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/06/1972 |
|
D1945
|
|
|
47502
|
|
47715
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/06/1966 |
D16 WL D16 D14 D16 ML WL D02 D16 D05 82A LE BR LE ED W |
Nottingham Division (New) Western Lines (LMR) Nottingham Division London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Eastfield Withdrawn |
30/06/1966 15/10/1966 15/10/1966 24/12/1966 18/02/1967 11/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 15/03/1969 09/05/1970 19/08/1972 11/05/1974 05/1977 26/11/1977 04/10/1987 01/03/1997 |
01/03/1997 |
D1946
|
|
|
47503
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1966 |
D16 D16 ML WL D02 D05 D02 CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
06/07/1966 15/10/1966 11/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/03/1973 04/10/1987 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1947
|
|
|
47504
|
|
47702
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/07/1966 |
D16 D16 ML WL D02 D05 D02 87A 82A 87A ED W |
Nottingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Eastfield Withdrawn |
04/07/1966 15/10/1966 11/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/06/1972 16/12/1972 17/03/1973 05/05/1973 04/10/1987 01/04/2000 |
01/04/2000 |
D1948
|
|
|
47505
|
|
47712
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/08/1966 |
WL D02 D05 82A LE ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Eastfield |
01/08/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 22/07/1972 11/05/1974 04/10/1987 |
|
D1949
|
|
|
47506
|
|
47707
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D16 D01 82A LE ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Eastfield |
25/08/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 02/05/1970 03/04/1971 02/09/1972 11/05/1974 04/10/1987 |
|
D1950
|
47259
|
|
47552
|
|
|
|
47802
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/09/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D02 GD HO YK SF GD BR |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Gateshead Holbeck (MR) York (North) Stratford Gateshead Bristol Bath Road |
09/09/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/02/1973 07/12/1974 11/01/1975 08/03/1975 06/09/1981 01/11/1981 15/05/1988 |
|
D1951
|
|
|
47507
|
|
47716
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/10/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D02 LE OC ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Old Oak Common Eastfield |
14/10/1966 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 10/03/1973 23/06/1973 03/1978 04/10/1987 |
|
D1952
|
|
|
47508
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/10/1966 |
WL D02 D05 D16 D05 D02 87A CD LE OC BR W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Landore Crewe Diesel (on loan) Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
27/10/1966 17/06/1968 20/12/1969 25/04/1970 02/05/1970 07/04/1973 14/04/1973 07/1977 10/1977 03/1978 15/05/1988 14/05/1993 |
14/05/1993 |
D1953
|
|
|
47509
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/11/1966 |
WL D05 D02
LE OC CD W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division
Landore Old Oak Common Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
16/11/1966 17/06/1968 21/04/1973 05/05/1973 11/05/1974 03/1978 15/05/1988 27/11/1992 |
27/11/1992 |
D1954
|
|
|
47510
|
|
47713
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/11/1966 |
WL D16 WL D05 D16 D01 D16 D05 87A OC ED W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Nottingham Division Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Landore Old Oak Common Eastfield Withdrawn |
11/11/1966 12/11/1966 19/11/1966 17/06/1968 11/04/1970 03/04/1971 15/05/1971 26/06/1971 17/02/1973 03/1978 04/10/1987 01/07/1988 |
01/07/1988 |
D1955
|
|
|
47511
|
|
47714
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/11/1966 |
WL D16 ML WL D05 87A OC ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Landore Old Oak Common Eastfield |
29/11/1966 03/12/1966 11/03/1967 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 17/03/1973 11/1978 04/10/1987 |
|
D1956
|
47260
|
|
47553
|
|
|
|
47803
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/12/1966 |
WL D05 BS CD YK HA BR CD W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Bescot Crewe Diesel York (North) Haymarket Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
22/12/1966 17/06/1968 07/07/1973 10/08/1974 12/10/1974 12/02/1978 15/05/1988 22/05/1988 01/04/1995 |
01/04/1995 |
D1957
|
47261
|
|
47554
|
|
47705
|
|
|
|
|
57303
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
WL D05 BS ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Bescot Eastfield |
28/01/1967 17/06/1968 11/08/1973 04/10/1987 |
|
D1958
|
|
|
47512
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
WL D05 87A W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Landore Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 17/06/1968 28/04/1973 01/10/1991 |
01/10/1991 |
D1959
|
|
|
47513
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
WL D05 82A LE OC W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road Landore Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 17/06/1968 25/11/1972 12/05/1973 03/1978 28/02/2004 |
28/02/2004 |
D1960
|
|
|
47514
|
|
47703
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/11/1967 |
WL D05 D16 D05 ED |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Eastfield |
11/11/1967 17/06/1968 03/04/1971 05/02/1972 04/10/1987 |
|
D1961
|
|
|
47515
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/05/1968 |
WL D05 D02 D05 D16 D16 D05 CD W |
Western Lines (LMR) (New) Stoke Division Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Nottingham Division Stoke Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
03/05/1968 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 12/07/1969 03/04/1971 22/07/1972 10/02/1973 15/05/1988 28/03/1991 |
28/03/1991 |
D1962
|
47262
|
|
47608
|
|
|
|
47833
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/09/1965 |
86A 5A WL D05 BS CD CD W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Crewe Diesel Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Bescot Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
27/09/1965 20/02/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 11/08/1973 11/10/1975 15/05/1988 01/07/2000 |
01/07/2000 |
D1963
|
47263
|
|
47587
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1965 |
86A 5A WL D05 40B GD IM IS OC W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Crewe Diesel Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Immingham Gateshead Immingham Inverness Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
17/09/1965 20/02/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 27/01/1973 06/10/1973 09/03/1974 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 01/08/2003 |
01/08/2003 |
D1964
|
47264
|
|
47619
|
|
|
|
47829
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/09/1965 |
86A 5A WL D05 BS CD IM CD CD |
Cardiff Canton (New) Crewe Diesel Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Bescot Cricklewood East Immingham Crewe Diesel Crewe Diesel |
24/09/1965 20/02/1966 18/04/1966 17/06/1968 08/09/1973 10/11/1973 15/06/1974 06/07/1974 15/05/1988 |
|
D1965
|
47265
|
|
47591
|
|
|
|
47804
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/10/1965 |
86A WL D05 41A GD IM BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Tinsley Gateshead Immingham Bristol Bath Road |
02/10/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 10/02/1973 04/08/1973 09/03/1974 15/05/1988 |
|
D1966
|
47266
|
|
47629
|
|
|
|
47828
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/10/1965 |
86A WL D05 BR |
Cardiff Canton (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Bristol Bath Road |
02/10/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 15/05/1988 |
|
D1967
|
47267
|
|
47603
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/10/1965 |
86A WL D05 CF BR W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Western Lines (LMR) Stoke Division Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/10/1965 18/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/05/1977 04/10/1987 01/04/2000 |
01/04/2000 |
D1968
|
|
|
47516
|
|
47708
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/10/1965 |
64B IS HA ED W |
Haymarket (New) Inverness Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
16/10/1965 29/12/1973 29/06/1974 04/10/1987 01/04/1995 |
01/04/1995 |
D1969
|
47268
|
|
47595
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1965 |
64B 52A 64B ED |
Haymarket (New) Gateshead Haymarket Eastfield |
22/10/1965 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 04/09/1976 |
|
D1970
|
47269
|
|
47643
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1965 |
64B 52A 64B 52A ED HA ED HA W |
Haymarket (New) Gateshead Haymarket Gateshead Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
22/10/1965 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 06/05/1972 11/05/1974 25/10/1975 04/09/1976 02/1978 01/04/1991 |
01/04/1991 |
D1971
|
47270
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/10/1965 |
64B 52A 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
30/10/1965 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1972
|
47271
|
|
47604
|
|
|
|
47854
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/11/1965 |
64B 52A 64B ED |
Haymarket (New) Gateshead Haymarket Eastfield |
06/11/1965 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 15/05/1988 |
|
D1973
|
47272
|
|
47593
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/11/1965 |
64B 52A 64B |
Haymarket (New) Gateshead Haymarket |
10/11/1965 12/10/1968 11/10/1969 |
|
D1974
|
47273
|
|
47627
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/11/1965 |
64B BR W |
Haymarket (New) Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
13/11/1965 04/10/1987 01/03/2000 |
01/03/2000 |
D1975
|
|
|
47517
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/11/1965 |
64B 66A 64B ED W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/11/1965 26/08/1967 28/10/1967 15/05/1988 01/09/2003 |
01/09/2003 |
D1976
|
47274
|
|
47637
|
|
|
|
47826
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/11/1965 |
64B CD |
Haymarket (New) Crewe Diesel |
24/11/1965 15/05/1988 |
|
D1977
|
47275
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1965 |
52A 41A W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
11/12/1965 09/11/1968 07/09/1986 |
07/09/1986 |
D1978
|
47276
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/12/1965 |
52A 41A IM W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
04/12/1965 09/11/1968 04/10/1987 13/04/2001 |
13/04/2001 |
D1979
|
47277
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/12/1965 |
52A 55G IM W |
Gateshead (New) Knottingley Immingham Withdrawn |
11/12/1965 24/02/1968 04/10/1987 14/07/2000 |
14/07/2000 |
D1980
|
47278
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/12/1965 |
52A 41A W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
16/12/1965 09/11/1968 28/01/1999 |
28/01/1999 |
D1981
|
47279
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/12/1965 |
52A 41A W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
18/12/1965 09/11/1968 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1982
|
47280
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/12/1965 |
52A 41A D05 41A D05 W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Stoke Division Tinsley Stoke Division Withdrawn |
23/12/1965 08/03/1969 13/05/1972 20/05/1972 08/07/1972 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1983
|
47281
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/12/1965 |
52A 41A 34G 41A TO W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Finsbury Park Tinsley Toton Withdrawn |
30/12/1965 08/03/1969 17/05/1969 27/09/1969 10/1977 17/12/1998 |
17/12/1998 |
D1984
|
47282
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/01/1966 |
52A 41A 52A 41A W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Gateshead Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/01/1966 08/03/1969 17/05/1969 21/03/1970 17/09/1986 |
17/09/1986 |
D1985
|
47283
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/01/1966 |
52A 41A CF W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
17/01/1966 21/03/1970 06/1977 31/08/2004 |
31/08/2004 |
D1986
|
47284
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1966 |
52A 41A 52A 41A BR W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Gateshead Tinsley Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
21/01/1966 21/03/1970 06/05/1972 02/09/1972 06/1977 14/01/2000 |
14/01/2000 |
D1987
|
47285
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/01/1966 |
52A 41A 52A 55A 41A BR TI W |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Bristol Bath Road Tinsley Withdrawn |
29/01/1966 21/03/1970 06/05/1972 04/11/1972 10/03/1973 06/1977 04/10/1987 31/12/2004 |
31/12/2004 |
D1988
|
47286
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1966 |
52A 41A 52A 41A 52A KY HO TI BR TI |
Gateshead (New) Tinsley Gateshead Tinsley Gateshead Knottingley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Bristol Bath Road Tinsley |
26/02/1966 21/03/1970 06/05/1972 16/09/1972 28/10/1972 08/03/1975 07/06/1975 12/07/1975 06/1977 04/10/1987 |
|
D1989
|
47287
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1966 |
52A 50A 52A 51L W |
Gateshead (New) York (North) Gateshead Thornaby Withdrawn |
26/02/1966 10/09/1966 25/03/1967 07/10/1972 30/09/2004 |
30/09/2004 |
D1990
|
47288
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1966 |
50A 52A 51L W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Thornaby Withdrawn |
26/02/1966 25/03/1967 07/10/1972 22/09/1995 |
22/09/1995 |
D1991
|
47289
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/03/1966 |
50A 52A 51L |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Thornaby |
02/03/1966 25/03/1967 07/10/1972 |
|
D1992
|
47290
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
57316
|
|
|
|
15/03/1966 |
50A 52A 51L CD |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Thornaby Crewe Diesel |
15/03/1966 25/03/1967 07/10/1972 01/02/1975 |
|
D1993
|
47291
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/03/1966 |
50A 52A 55A 41A TE IM W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Thornaby Immingham Withdrawn |
26/03/1966 25/03/1967 04/11/1972 10/03/1973 01/1977 30/11/1979 25/08/1998 |
25/08/1998 |
D1994
|
47292
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/04/1966 |
50A 41A 50A 55A 56A 66A 56A 34G 41A KY W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley York (North) Holbeck (MR) Wakefield Polmadie Knottingley Finsbury Park Tinsley Knottingley Withdrawn |
16/04/1966 07/05/1966 16/07/1966 10/09/1966 25/03/1967 20/05/1967 12/08/1967 25/11/1967 13/09/1969 05/1977 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1995
|
47293
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/04/1966 |
50A 56A 34G 52A 41A TI BS TI W |
York (North) (New) Wakefield Finsbury Park Gateshead Tinsley Tinsley Bescot Tinsley Withdrawn |
23/04/1966 25/03/1967 25/11/1967 09/08/1969 04/11/1972 05/1977 10/1977 04/10/1987 28/02/2007 |
28/02/2007 |
D1996
|
47294
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/06/1966 |
50A 56A 34G 52A 41A TI BS SF W |
York (North) (New) Wakefield Finsbury Park Gateshead Tinsley Tinsley Bescot Stratford Withdrawn |
01/06/1966 25/03/1967 25/11/1967 09/08/1969 18/11/1972 05/1977 10/1977 06/09/1981 31/10/2002 |
31/10/2002 |
D1997
|
47295
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/06/1966 |
50A 56A 34G 52A 41A IM TI BS GD CF W |
York (North) (New) Wakefield Finsbury Park Gateshead Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Bescot Gateshead Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
03/06/1966 25/03/1967 25/11/1967 09/08/1969 02/12/1972 01/1977 02/1977 10/1977 01/11/1981 04/10/1987 31/01/2003 |
31/01/2003 |
D1998
|
47296
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1966 |
50A 52A 41A 34G 52A 41A GD HO KY W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Tinsley Finsbury Park Gateshead Tinsley Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Knottingley Withdrawn |
14/06/1966 25/03/1967 09/11/1968 29/03/1969 09/08/1969 30/12/1972 19/05/1973 08/03/1975 07/06/1975 31/07/2003 |
31/07/2003 |
D1999
|
47297
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/06/1966 |
50A 52A 41A 34G 52A TI SF YK TI W |
York (North) (New) Gateshead Tinsley Finsbury Park Gateshead Tinsley Stratford York (North) Tinsley Withdrawn |
25/06/1966 25/03/1967 09/11/1968 05/04/1969 09/08/1969 04/08/1973 29/02/1976 27/11/1977 04/10/1987 01/02/1999 |
01/02/1999 |