SR Bulleid "WCBB" Class 4-6-2
SR | BR | BR (TOPS) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
21C101 | 34001 | 06/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 22.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1967 | 22.35 | |||
21C103 | 34003 | 06/1945 | 20/09/1964 | 19.25 | 19.52 | ||||||
21C104 | 34004 | 06/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 22.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1967 | 22.35 | |||
21C105 | 34005 | 07/1945 | 02/10/1966 | 21.25 | 22.27 | ||||||
21C108 | 34008 | 09/1945 | 25/06/1967 | 21.75 | 22.10 | ||||||
21C109 | 34009 | 15/09/1945 | 02/10/1966 | 21.08 | 22.01 | ||||||
21C110 | 34010 | 09/1945 | 07/03/1965 | 19.5 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C112 | 34012 | 10/1945 | 11/12/1966 | 21.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1967 | 21.51 | |||
21C113 | 34013 | 10/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 21.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1967 | 22.01 | |||
21C114 | 34014 | 11/1945 | 21/03/1965 | 19.33 | 20.51 | ||||||
21C116 | 34016 | 11/1945 | 14/06/1964 | 18.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C117 | 34017 | 12/1945 | 02/10/1966 | 20.83 | 21.85 | ||||||
21C118 | 34018 | 12/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 21.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1968 | 22.35 | |||
21C121 | 34021 | 01/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 22.18 | |||
21C122 | 34022 | 01/1946 | 25/04/1965 | 19.25 | 19.59 | ||||||
21C124 | 34024 | 02/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 22.09 | |||
21C125 | 34025 | 03/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 22.02 | |||
21C126 | 34026 | 04/1946 | 18/09/1966 | 20.42 | 21.10 | ||||||
21C127 | 34027 | 04/1946 | 09/08/1964 | 18.33 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C128 | 34028 | 04/1946 | 31/05/1964 | 18.08 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C129 | 34029 | 05/1946 | 13/09/1964 | 18.33 | 18.77 | ||||||
21C131 | 34031 | 06/1946 | 07/02/1965 | 18.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1965 | 18.93 | |||
21C132 | 34032 | 06/1946 | 02/10/1966 | 20.33 | 20.93 | ||||||
21C134 | 34034 | 07/1946 | 02/07/1967 | 21 | 21.77 | ||||||
21C136 | 34036 | 07/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1968 | 21.60 | |||
21C137 | 34037 | 08/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 20.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 21.60 | |||
21C139 | 34039 | 09/1946 | 09/05/1965 | 18.67 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C140 | 34040 | 09/1946 | 02/07/1967 | 20.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 21.51 | |||
21C142 | 34042 | 10/1946 | 03/10/1965 | 19 | 19.51 | ||||||
21C144 | 34044 | 10/1946 | 21/05/1967 | 20.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 20.93 | |||
21C145 | 34045 | 10/1946 | 28/06/1964 | 17.67 | 18.59 | ||||||
21C146 | 34046 | 11/1946 | 10/10/1965 | 18.92 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C147 | 34047 | 11/1946 | 25/06/1967 | 20.58 | 20.93 | ||||||
21C148 | 34048 | 11/1946 | 13/03/1966 | 19.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1966 | 19.68 | |||
21C150 | 34050 | 12/1946 | 29/08/1965 | 18.67 | 19.01 | ||||||
21C152 | 34052 | 12/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 20.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1968 | 21.18 | |||
21C153 | 34053 | 01/1947 | 17/10/1965 | 18.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C156 | 34056 | 02/1947 | 07/05/1967 | 20.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 20.59 | |||
21C158 | 34058 | 03/1947 | 11/10/1964 | 17.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C159 | 34059 | 04/1947 | 29/05/1966 | 19.08 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
21C160 | 34060 | 04/1947 | 06/1967 | 20.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 21.10 | |||
21C162 | 34062 | 05/1947 | 13/07/1964 | 17.17 | 18.10 | ||||||
34071 | 04/1948 | 30/04/1967 | 19 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1967 | 19.43 | ||||
34077 | 07/1948 | 26/03/1967 | 18.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1967 | 19.10 | ||||
34082 | 09/1948 | Ramsgate | 24/04/1966 | 17.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1966 | 18.01 | |||
34085 | 11/1948 | 26/09/1965 | 16.83 | 17.42 | |||||||
34087 | 12/1948 | 09/07/1967 | 18.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 19.43 | ||||
34088 | 12/1948 | 19/03/1967 | 18.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 19.26 | ||||
34089 | 12/1948 | 09/07/1967 | 18.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 19.43 | ||||
34090 | 02/1949 | 09/07/1967 | 18.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 19.09 | ||||
34093 | 10/1949 | Bournemouth | 09/07/1967 | 17.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 18.43 | |||
34095 | 10/1949 | Ramsgate | 09/07/1967 | 17.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1968 | 18.51 | |||
34096 | 11/1949 | Ramsgate | 07/09/1964 | 14.83 | 15.34 | ||||||
34097 | 11/1949 | Ramsgate | 10/04/1966 | 16.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1966 | 16.84 | |||
34098 | 12/1949 | Ramsgate | 25/06/1967 | 17.5 | 17.93 | ||||||
34100 | 12/1949 | Ramsgate | 02/07/1967 | 17.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1967 | 17.84 | |||
34101 | 02/1950 | 17/07/1966 | 16.42 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
34104 | 04/1950 | 25/06/1967 | 17.17 | 17.51 | |||||||
34108 | 04/1950 | 25/06/1967 | 17.17 | 17.51 | |||||||
34109 | 05/1950 | 07/09/1964 | 14.33 | 16.60 |