Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4018 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22929 Week
» 87883 Month
» 290547 Year
» 3317400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Urie "N15" Class 4-6-0
Date |
Number (at time) |
Depot (at time) |
Code |
Details |
Ref |
Link |
Sun 08/08/1954 |
30790 |
71A |
|
11:04 Holiday Relief from Portsmouth Harbour - Leicester (G.C.) via Basingstoke and Banbury |
RO 9/1954 |
|
Sat 18/02/1961 |
30781 |
71B |
|
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. |
|
|
Sat 25/02/1961 |
30804 |
71A |
|
Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. |
|
|
Sat 25/02/1961 |
30781 |
71B |
|
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
|
Sun 26/11/1961 |
30782 |
71B |
|
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. |
SLS 1/1962 |
|